Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation v. Morgan Stanley et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-06739
District Judge Denise L. Cote, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 5:45 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

v.
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
Morgan Stanley & Company Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc."
Director, Toy Biz, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pagemart Wireless, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vital Images, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xcyte Therapies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Websense, Inc.
Officer/Director, Silgan Holdings Inc.
Officer/Director, Msci Inc.
Officer/Director, Allegiance Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Wci Communities, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gramercy Capital Corp.
Officer/Director, Discover Financial Services
Officer/Director, Cadiz Land Co Inc
Officer/Director, Ivf America Inc /de
Officer/Director, Jefferson Smurfit Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Imre Corp
Officer/Director, Uniholding Corp
Officer/Director, Cardiac Pathways Corp
Officer/Director, Impsat Corp
Officer/Director, Allscripts Inc /il
Officer/Director, Allscripts Holding Inc
Officer/Director, Psf Group Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, Acquicor Technology Inc
Officer/Director, Constant Contact, Inc.
Officer/Director, Big Entertainment, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Digitalglobe, Inc.
Officer/Director, Remec, Inc.
Officer/Director, Golden Tan, Inc
Officer/Director, Ms Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, NB Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Lazarus Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Texas Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Innocoll Holdings plc
Officer/Director, Visions In Glass Inc
Officer/Director, Bloom Energy Corp
Officer/Director, Leisure Acquisition Corp.
Officer/Director, Rps Realty Trust
Officer/Director, Symix Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cfw Communications Co
Officer/Director, Saratogo Holdings I Inc
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Norman George +1 212 450 4103 +1 212 701 5103 nicholas.george@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Marion Morril +1 212 450 4776 +1 212 450 6032 jane.morril@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Stryker Weinstein +1 212 450 4972 +1 212 450 3972 brian.weinstein@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Norman George +1 212 450 4103 +1 212 701 5103 nicholas.george@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Marion Morril +1 212 450 4776 +1 212 450 6032 jane.morril@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Stryker Weinstein +1 212 450 4972 +1 212 450 3972 brian.weinstein@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Norman George +1 212 450 4103 +1 212 701 5103 nicholas.george@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Marion Morril +1 212 450 4776 +1 212 450 6032 jane.morril@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Stryker Weinstein +1 212 450 4972 +1 212 450 3972 brian.weinstein@dpw.com
No Logo Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Norman George +1 212 450 4103 +1 212 701 5103 nicholas.george@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Marion Morril +1 212 450 4776 +1 212 450 6032 jane.morril@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Stryker Weinstein +1 212 450 4972 +1 212 450 3972 brian.weinstein@dpw.com
No Logo Rbs Securities, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Rice , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 trice@stblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tiffany & Bosco, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Woll +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 dwoll@stblaw.com
No Logo Saxon Asset Securities Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Norman George +1 212 450 4103 +1 212 701 5103 nicholas.george@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Marion Morril +1 212 450 4776 +1 212 450 6032 jane.morril@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Stryker Weinstein +1 212 450 4972 +1 212 450 3972 brian.weinstein@dpw.com
No Logo Saxon Capital, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Norman George +1 212 450 4103 +1 212 701 5103 nicholas.george@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Marion Morril +1 212 450 4776 +1 212 450 6032 jane.morril@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Stryker Weinstein +1 212 450 4972 +1 212 450 3972 brian.weinstein@dpw.com
No Logo Saxon Funding Management LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Norman George +1 212 450 4103 +1 212 701 5103 nicholas.george@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Marion Morril +1 212 450 4776 +1 212 450 6032 jane.morril@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Stryker Weinstein +1 212 450 4972 +1 212 450 3972 brian.weinstein@dpw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (631) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/14/2014) (gr) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
    STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Alexander C. Frank, Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC, Craig S. Phillips, RBS Securities, Inc., Saxon Asset Securities Company, Saxon Capital, Inc., Saxon Funding Management LLC, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren, John E. Westerfield and WITHOUT costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. A January 8, 2014 Order addressed the use in these coordinated New York Actions of documents produced by FHFA in the Countrywide litigation, which is ongoing in California, to Bank of America (BofA") and Royal Bank of Scotland ("RBS") ("January 8 Order"). Through letters of January 14 and 23, and February 11, defense counsel who jointly represent BofA and Merrill Lynch request consideration of the January 8, 2014 Order. In a letter of February 13, FHFA opposes this request. For the following reasons, the request for reconsideration of the January 8 Order is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/14/2014) (gr) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 2/10/2014 re: Defendants respectfully request that the July 2, 2013 Order be lifted and that defendants and their counsel be permitted to interview former GSE, FHFA, and OFHEO employees who are willing to be interviewed and who are not represented by counsel in these matters. ENDORSEMENT: Any response from FHFA is due 2/14/2014. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/13/2014) (gr) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          Order granting 627 JOINT Motion to Stay Proceedings. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/10/2014) (gr) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 627 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
            JOINT MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC, Saxon Asset Securities Company, Saxon Capital, Inc., Saxon Funding Management LLC, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated January 31, 2014 re: Defendants' Servicer Subpoenas. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 1/23/2014 re: Letter in response to the Court's request at yesterday's telephone conference that the parties alert the Court whether there remains a dispute regarding FHFA's attempt to preclude Defendants' from obtaining in discovery a small group of documents from Freddie Mac's auditor, PricewaterhouseCoopers ("PwC"), that are relevant to, inter alia, Defendant's negative loss causation defenses and FHFA's burden of proving loss causing and damages in the fraud actions. ENDORSEMENT: The material being sought is not "consistent with the 6/17/13 Order", as represented in defense counsel's 1/17/14 letter. This application is denied. There is no need to revisit the 6/17/13 Order at this time. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/27/2014) (gr) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER...By letter of January 17, 2014, plaintiff FHFA requests that the Court schedule the Morgan Stanley action for trial beginning on September 29, 2014. Morgan Stanley and Credit Suisse oppose that request by letters of January 17 and January 19, respectively. It is hereby ORDERED that the HSBC action will be tried beginning on September 29, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that should the Goldman action be resolved by settlement or summary judgment, the Ally Financial action will be tried in its place, and should the Credit Suisse action be resolved, the Morgan Stanley action will be tried in its place.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if another action then scheduled to begin trial on September 29, 2014 is resolved by settlement or summary judgment, the Court will try in its place the Morgan Stanley action or the Ally Financial action, if one is not yet scheduled for a September 2014 trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer to address any scheduling issues related to the September trial schedule. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/22/2014) (gr) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 1/22/2014 at 05:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/21/2014) (gr) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 1/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Richard W. Clary dated January 19, 2014 re: FHFAs request to move up trial in the Morgan Stanley action to the Tranche 3 trial date of September 29, 2014. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 01/19/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from James P. Rouhandeh dated January 17, 2014 re: response to FHFA's January 17, 2014 request to move up trial in the Morgan Stanley action to Tranche 3 trial date. Document filed by Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC, Saxon Asset Securities Company, Saxon Capital, Inc., Saxon Funding Management LLC, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren.(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated 1/17/14 re: to respectfully request that the Court schedule the Morgan Stanley case for trial commencing on the September 29, 2014 trial date. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated January 13, 2014 re: Requesting that the Court Order Defendants to limit the "modified" subpoenas they served on CoreLogic on January 13, 2014. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10-1, # 11 Exhibit 10-2)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 1/13/2014 re: Defendants respectfully request that the July 2, 2013 Order be lifted and that defendants and their counsel be permitted to interview former GSE, FHFA, and OFHEO employees who are willing to be interviewed and (1) who are not represented by counse in these matters or (2) whose counsel consents for them to be interviewed. ENDORSEMENT: The attorneys for Merrill Lynch shall meet and confer with plaintiff's counsel regarding this request and bring an unresolved issue to the Court's attention. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/13/2014) (gr) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Thomas C. Rice dated 01/10/2014 re: January 7, 2014 Letter. Document filed by RBS Securities, Inc..(Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leigh Aaron Wasserstrom on behalf of RBS Securities, Inc.. (Wasserstrom, Leigh) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER. The Court and the parties in these coordinated actions have spent countless hours addressing the proper scope of discovery in this litigation. A significant portion of this time and effort has been devoted to identifying the proper scope of discovery to be provided to the defendants by FHFA insofar as it concerns the operations of the GSEs' Single Family businesses...(See Order) Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall not be permitted to use documents produced in the Countrywide action, but not the New York Actions, during discovery, motion practice, or trial in the New York Actions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the counsel for BofA is reminded that letters to this Court are limited in length to two pages. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/8/2014) (gr) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Thomas C. Rice dated 01/07/2014 re: Response to the January 6, 2014 Letter Submitted on Behalf of Plaintiff FHFA (with Exhibits A-D). Document filed by RBS Securities, Inc..(Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      STIPULATION REGARDING LOAN FILE AND GUIDELINE MATCHING. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/7/2014) (gr) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated January 6, 2014 re: the identification and Stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Exhibit 1 [Redacted])(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated January 6, 2014 re: Amended Originator and CoreLogic Subpoenas. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated 1/3/2014 re: Regarding the submission of Stipulations Regarding Loan Files and Guideline Matching ("Stipulations), FHFA seeks an extension until January 6, 2014 to submit an executed Stipulation. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/6/2014) (gr) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Manisha M. Sheth, Christine H. Chung, Richard A. Schirtzer, Michael A. Hanin dated 12/23/2013 re: FHFA requests a brief extension, until December 27, 2013, to submit executed Stipulations to the Court, together with the parties' stipulated Loan Files and Guidelines, in the Tranche 3 and 4 cases. ENDORSEMENT: Granted, nunc pro tunc. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/6/2014) (gr) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth, Michael A. Hanin dated 12/20/2013 re: Stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in Tranche 3 and 4. ENDORSEMENT: Granted, nunc pro tunc. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/6/2014) (gr) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 1/6/2014 re: RBS Single Family Subpoena. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated January 3, 2014 re: Request for an extension of time to file Stipulations Regarding Loan File and Guideline Matching. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated December 30, 2013 re: Submission of Stipulations Regarding Loan File and Guideline Matching. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated December 27, 2013 re: Submission of Stipulations Regarding Loan File and Guideline Matching. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated 12/23/13 re: Stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in Tranches 3 and 4. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated 12.20.13 re: Stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in Tranches 3 and 4. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 12.19.13 re: Use of Countrywide Documents in discovery, summary judgment and trial. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana W. Leung dated 12/19/13 re: Information Requested During Dec. 9, 2013 Hearing. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 12/18/2013 re: The Court's Order of this afternoon, granting ex parte FHFA's request for a protective order. ENDORSEMENT: The issues raised in the FHFA's letter have been the subject of countless applications to the Court. In the event the defendants sought to obtain this discovery despite those conferences and rulings, they should have made a prior application to the Court. In the event the parties reach agreement, that discovery may proceed. Otherwise, the Court will be available for any application on 1/6/14. Any communication with the Court by letter should be filed in accordance with this district's ECF rules. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/18/2013) (gr) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Christine H. Chung, Richard A. Schirtzer, Manisha M. Sheth, Michael A. Hanin dated 12/17/2013 re: Stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in Tranche 3 and 4. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/18/2013) (gr) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER...In a letter of December 17, the FHFA reports that the defendants have renewed their efforts to obtain from third parties, including originators and the due diligence vendor CoreLogic, documents that the Court has ruled they may not obtain in discovery from the GSEs. The FHFA seeks a protective order. It is hereby ORDERED that the defendants cease efforts to obtain from third parties the types of documents and information that this Court has previously ruled they may not obtain from the GSEs or others. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants shall promptly inform each third-party of whom they have made such requests that the third parties should not comply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants shall promptly amend their Rule 30(b)(6) deposition subpoenas and Rule 45 subpoenas to eliminate topics and document requests relating to the GSEs Single Family businesses, including those items listed in footnote 5 of the FHFA December 17 letter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer. If the parties reach agreement, they shall submit a joint proposal by January 6, 2014. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/18/2013) (gr) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER....Having considered the parties' written submissions, the November 22 transcript, the passage of time, and the centrality of this information to a critical defense in this action, it is hereby ORDERED that FHFA's Request is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Credit Suisse shall provide by January 10, 2014, a report on the status of its compliance with this Order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/18/2013) (gr) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated December 17, 2013 re: Stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated December 17, 2013 re: Defendants' Single Family Subpoenas. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            OPINION AND ORDER. FHFA's September 27, 2013 motion for partial summary judgment is granted. Defendants' November 1, 2013 motion to certify a question of law is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/16/2013) (gr) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE OF REMAINING ALTERNATIVE SETS. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/16/2013) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule)(gr) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                OPINION AND ORDER. The Individual Defendants' August 13, 2013 motion for partial judgment on the pleadings is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/10/2013) (gr) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth and Michael A. Hanin dated 12/6/2013 re: FHFA's Status Report re Depositions. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The FHFA and HSBC shall advise the Court this week if they fail to reach an agreement. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/9/2013) (gr) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated December 6, 2013 re: FHFA Deposition Status Update. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      DECLARATION of Beth A. Stewart in Support re: 557 Notice (Other). Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 557 Notice (Other) / Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Certify a Determinative Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia. Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING ADJUSTMENTS. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/6/2013) (gr) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 12/6/2013 re: FHFA's Response to Defendants' 11/15/2013 Request for Single Family Bulk Discovery. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Redacted, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated 12/6/2013 re: Single Family Flow Loans. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D - Redacted, # 5 Exhibit E - Redacted, # 6 Exhibit F - Redacted, # 7 Exhibit G - Redacted, # 8 Exhibit H - Redacted, # 9 Exhibit I - Redacted, # 10 Exhibit J - Redacted, # 11 Exhibit K - Redacted, # 12 Exhibit L - Redacted, # 13 Exhibit M - Redacted)(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine Chung, Manisha Sheth, Michael A. Hanin dated 12/3/2013 re: Stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in Tranche 3 and 4. ENDORSEMENT: The joint request for extension are approved. The requests that do not reflect consent will be approved if no objection is made by 12/5/13. (Signed by Judge Irving Ben Cooper on 12/4/2013) (gr) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Hanin dated 12/3/13 re: STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 11/15/2013 re: On behalf of all Defendants in the above-referenced Actions, we write regarding FHFA's objections to Clayton's production of documents showing the pre-purchase due diligence the GSEs performed on their own purchases of pools of Alt-A and subprime loans to determine whether those loans complied with originators' underwriting guidelines. ENDORSEMENT: Denied for the reasons stated in FHFA's 11/22 letter and stated in prior rulings in these actions. This request is untimely and does not meet the standards set for further document production in the Opinion of 6/28/13. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/25/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Kanchana Wangkeo Leung (Corrected) in Support re: 536 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B1, # 3 Exhibit B2, # 4 Exhibit B3, # 5 Exhibit B4, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 11/23/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 557 Notice (Other) / Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Certify A Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Kasowitz, Marc) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Kanchana Wangkeo Leung in Support re: 536 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B1, # 3 Exhibit B2, # 4 Exhibit B3, # 5 Exhibit B4, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D)(Leung, Kanchana) Modified on 11/26/2013 (db). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 536 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. / Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Loss Causation Defense Under the Virginia And D.C. Blue Sky Laws. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Kasowitz, Marc) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 536 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Selendy, Philippe) Modified on 11/26/2013 (kj). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: A Conference will be held to address the issues raised in a series of letters from defendants and any other open issues on 12/9/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/20/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Bradley A. Harsch in Support re: 572 Letter, 571 Letter, 573 Letter. Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68, # 69 Exhibit 69, # 70 Exhibit 70, # 71 Exhibit 71, # 72 Exhibit 72, # 73 Exhibit 73, # 74 Exhibit 74, # 75 Exhibit 75, # 76 Exhibit 76, # 77 Exhibit 77, # 78 Exhibit 78, # 79 Exhibit 79, # 80 Exhibit 80, # 81 Exhibit 81, # 82 Exhibit 82, # 83 Exhibit 83, # 84 Exhibit 84, # 85 Exhibit 85, # 86 Exhibit 86, # 87 Exhibit 87, # 88 Exhibit 88, # 89 Exhibit 89, # 90 Exhibit 90, # 91 Exhibit 91, # 92 Exhibit 92, # 93 Exhibit 93, # 94 Exhibit 94, # 95 Exhibit 95, # 96 Exhibit 96, # 97 Exhibit 97, # 98 Exhibit 98, # 99 Exhibit 99, # 100 Exhibit 100, # 101 Exhibit 101, # 102 Exhibit 102, # 103 Exhibit 103, # 104 Exhibit 104, # 105 Exhibit 105, # 106 Exhibit 106, # 107 Exhibit 107, # 108 Exhibit 108, # 109 Exhibit 109, # 110 Exhibit 110, # 111 Exhibit 111, # 112 Exhibit 112)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Richard H. Klapper dated November 15, 2013 re: November 15 Submissions - Bulk. Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Richard H. Klapper dated November 15, 2013 re: November 15 Submissions - Flow. Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Richard H. Klapper dated November 15, 2013 re: November 15 Submissions - Standard. Document filed by All Defendants.(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine Chung, Manisha Sheth and Michael A. Hanin dated 11/13/2013 re: Status Report on Depositions. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. Pursuant to the 11/15/13 letter from counsel from Credit Suisse, the FHFA and Credit Suisse shall advise the Court by November 22 if they are unable to reach an agreement. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/15/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 13-1122. Petitioners, through counsel, have filed a petition for a writ of mandamus seeking reversal of certain discovery rulings made by the district court in these coordinated cases. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the mandamus petition is DENIED because Petitioners have not demonstrated that they lack an adequate, alternative means of obtaining the relief they seek i.e., an appeal from a final judgment. See Linde v. Arab Bank, PLC, 706 F.3d 92, 107, 117-18 (2d Cir. 2013). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 11/12/2013. (nd) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated November 13, 2013 re: FHFA update on status of deposition discovery in the SDNY coordinated cases and request for targeted relief. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 : Individual Capacity Depositions of Defendants' Witnesses)(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 11/12/2013 re: We write on behalf of FHFA regarding its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Loss Causation Defense Under the Virginia and D.C. Blue Sky Laws...FHFA respectfully requests a four-day extension until November 22, 2013, to file its reply brief....Defendants do not object to FHFA's request for an extension. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/13/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (FHFA's request for four-day extension to file loss causation summary judgment reply brief) addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated November 12, 2013. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Leung, Kanchana) Modified on 11/13/2013 (db). (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 11/12/2013 re: We write to respond to the scheduling issue raised by FHFA with respect to the deposition of Peter Niculescu, the Executive Vice President in charge of Fannie Mae's Capital Markets group from 2002-2008. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel shall confer further to find dates other than 11/15 and 12/6. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/12/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 11.8.13 re: CLAYTON. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Plaintiff FHFA dated 11/5/2013 re: On behalf of Plaintiff FHFA, we write to update the COurt on the status of the production, identification, and stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in the Tranche 3 and 4 Actions, pursuant to the Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order dated February 27, 2013 (the "Supplemental ESO").ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (signature on page 4 of letter) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/8/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff shall serve any opposition to Defendants' motion to certify to the Supreme Court of Virginia the question of whether a loss causation defense exits under that State's Blue Sky law by by 11/22/2013. Any reply shall be served by 12/6/2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/7/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Beth Stewart dated 11/1/2013 re: We write on behalf of Defendants in the FHFA cases pursuant to Rule 4(A) of Your Honor's local rules regarding Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Loss Causation Defense Under the Virginia and D.C. Blue Sky Laws (the "Opposition"). ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall consult to determine whether FHFA requests that the material be redacted from the public filing. If so, FHFA shall provide a justification for its request by 11/14/13. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/7/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated November 5, 2013 re: FHFA Status Report re: Production, Identification and Stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in the Tranche 3 and 4 Actions. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Beth A. Stewart in Support re: 557 Notice (Other). Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 557 Notice (Other) / NOTICE of MOTION to Certify a Determinative Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia. Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order / Proposed Certification Order)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of MOTION to Certify a Determinative Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia. Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Deposition of Frank Vetrano. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/31/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 10/25/2013 re: Defendants' request that the deadline to respond be extended to November 1, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/29/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: In a letter of October 18, 2013, plaintiff FHFA raised a discovery dispute regarding document production from third-party Clayton Holdings LLC ("Clayton"). It is hereby ORDERED that a telephone Conference will be held with Clayton and the parties to address this issue on 10/24/2013 at 03:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/22/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 10/18/2013 re: Clayton. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              OPINION & ORDER re: 521 MOTION to Compel. filed by All Defendants. The defendants August 30, 2013 motion to compel production of documents withheld by FHFA on the basis of the bank examination and deliberative process privileges is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/16/2013) (djc) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from FHFA dated 10/17/2013 re: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Privileged Documents. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FHFA'S PRODUCTION OF THIRD-PARTY REPORTS AND COMMUNICATIONS RELATING TO FANNIE MAE'S ANTI-PREDATORY LENDING REVIEWS. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/16/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Attorneys for Plaintiff FHFA dated 10/15/2013 re:...we write to update the Court on the status of the production, identification, and stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in the Tranche 3 and 4 Actions, pursuant to the Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order dated 2/27/13... ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/16/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated October 15, 2013 re: FHFA Status Report re Production and Stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in Tranche 3 and 4. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' LOSS CAUSATION DEFENSE UNDER THE VIRGINIA AND D.C. BLUE SKY LAWS AND PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO SAME. Defendants will file their opposition to the Motion no later than 10/28/2103; and Plaintiff will file any reply to Defendant's opposition no later than November 18, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/15/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' October 3 application to depose Gussmann and Kenneweg for one day apiece without losing the opportunity to use a total of 41 deposition days for up to 26 deponents is granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/4/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 10/4/13 re: Defendants' Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. In a letter of October 2, 2013, defendants seek clarification of the Court's September 23, 2013 Order regarding depositions. This Order responds to the defendants' request for such "clarification." [See Order]. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/3/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 10/2/13 re: Deposition Order Clarification. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Andrew Frankel dated October 1, 2013 re: all Defendants' response to the September 17, 2013 cover letter from Philippe Z. Selendy, Eric Bruce and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung. Document filed by All Defendants.(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth and Michael A. Hanin dated 9/27/2013 re: Production and Stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in Tranche 3 and 4. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Endorsement located on page 3 of letter) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/30/2013) (gr) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Hanin dated September 27, 2013 re: FHFA Status Report re Production and Stipulation of Loan File. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Kanchana Wangkeo Leung in Support re: 536 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 536 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULE FOR TRANCHE 4. It is now ordered that the Schedule contained on Exhibit 1 of the [Proposed] Order Regarding the Revised Pretrial Schedule for Tranche 4 shall govern fact discovery, expert reports and expert discovery, and summary judgment briefing in FHFA v. HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., et al., 11 Civ. 6189..., FHFA v. Barclays Bank PLC, et al., 11 Civ. 6190..., FHFA v. First Horizon National Corp., et al., 11 Civ. 6193...,FHFA v. Nomura Holding America, Inc., et al., 11 Civ. 6201...,FHFA v. SG Americas, Inc., et al., 11 Civ. 6203...,and FHFA v. Morgan Stanley, et al., 11 Civ. 6739... See Exhibit 1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/25/2013) (gr) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 534 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. Before the Court is defendants' July 12, 2013 motion for reconsideration of the Court's June 28 Opinion and Order regarding legal standards applicable to the scope of discovery in these cases. For the following reasons, the motion for reconsideration is denied....(See Memorandum Opinion & Order) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/25/2013) (gr) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated 09/24/2013 re: Tranche 4 Defendants' Pretrial Schedule. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 521 MOTION to Compel.. Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER...that the defendants may take up to twenty-five "consensus" depositions so long as the total number of deposition days does not exceed 40. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the requests of the fraud defendants and First Horizon to take additional deposition is denied with the following exception: First Horizon may identify one additional Freddie Mac trader whom the defendants may depose for one day... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/23/2013) (gr) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. In a letter of 9/10/13, the defendants in these actions requested that document discovery be reopened in order to require FHFA to add three document custodians in connection with Fannie Mae's use of an automated valuation model or AVM. For the following reasons, this application is denied (See Order) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/23/2013) (gr) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael A. Hanin dated 9/20/2013 re: Pretrial Schedule Expert Disclosures. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jonathan B. Oblak dated 9.18.2013 re: Parties' Joint Update to the Court regarding Deposition Limits. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Oblak, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Hanin dated 09/18/2013 re: Parties' Joint Update to the Court regarding Deposition Limits. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 9/17/2013 re: FHFA's Response to Defendants' 9/10/13 Request for Reconsideration of the Decision re: Appraisal Bias Documents. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - REDACTED, # 2 Exhibit 2 - REDACTED, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - REDACTED)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: In two letters of September 9, the defendants make several requests regarding the deposition limit in these actions. First, all defendants request (1) that they be permitted to "use their remaining deposition days" flexibly, deposing individuals for either one day or two days, at the defendants' option, and (2) that they be afforded an additional ten deposition days. Second, the defendants in seven of these cases request the opportunity to take the depositions of ten more witnesses for their cases. The defendants do not indicate whether these two letters represent their final requests for additional depositions of FHFA. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer to determine whether both FHFA and the defendants agree that all parties may use their remaining deposition days "flexibly," so each day may be used for a single deposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants shall indicate whether the requests made in the two September 9 letters are their final requests for additional depositions of FHFA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall provide updates regarding these issues by September 18, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/13/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 09/12/2013 re: Defendants Requests for Additional Depositions (REDACTED). Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit B (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit C)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Andrew T. Frankel in Support re: 521 MOTION to Compel.. Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 521 MOTION to Compel. Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on the Basis of the Bank Examination and Deliberative Process Privileges (Redacted). Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel. Document filed by All Defendants.(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine Chung, Manisha Sheth, Erice Bruce and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 9/9/2013 re: FHFA concurs in Defendants' proposed redactions of the entirety of Exhibit H, as well as footnote 17 on page 15 of their Memorandum of Law. FHFA does not believe any additional redactions are necessary related to Defendants' recent filing. ENDORSEMENT: The redactions are approved. [Counsel to file the approved redations.] (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/11/2013) (gr) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 09/09/2013 re: In response to the August 13, 2013 cover letter from Andrew Frankel. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 502 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 9/3/13 re: FHFA Response to Defendants' 8/23/13 letter. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. On September 3, 2013, the Southern District of New York began allowing attorneys to file letters to the court electronically via ECF. This change is reflected in the current, newly revised version of this Courts individual practices in civil cases. Due to the volume of proposed redactions to letters in the above captioned actions, however, the individual practices are modified as follows. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties in the above-captioned actions shall file letters to the Court via ECF, with the following exception. Should a party wish to redact portions of a letter or file its accompanying exhibits under seal, the party may file the letter and any exhibits for which the party requests sealing in redacted form on ECF and simultaneously provide to Chambers via email an unredacted copy of the letter and all the supporting exhibits. Where the exhibits exceed ten pages, the parties must follow the procedure in the individual practices and submit hard copies to Chambers. Any emailed letter should indicate that a redacted version of the letter has been filed via ECF. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/4/2013) (gr) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Kanchana Wangkeo Leung (REDACTED) in Opposition re: 502 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit 2 (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED))(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 502 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. (REDACTED). Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Michael A. Hanin dated 8/20/2013 re: FHFA respectfully requests that its due date for disclosing its rebuttal set be extended, from August 26, 2013, the date set in the Court's June 19 Order, to September 9, 2013. RBSSI has consented to this request for a two-week extension. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/21/2013) (gr) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Christine H. Chung, Richard A. Schirtzer, Manisha M. Sheth, and Michael A. Hanin dated 8/16/2013 re: On behalf of Plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency ("FHFA"), we write to update the Court on the status of the production, identification, and stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in the Tranche 3 and 4 Actions, pursuant to the Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order dated February 27, 2013 (the "Supplemental ESO"). ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/19/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 506 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 432 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of June 28, 2013 Opinion and Order.. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Kasowitz, Marc) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of PENNY SHANE in Support re: 506 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 432 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of June 28, 2013 Opinion and Order.. Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 506 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 432 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of June 28, 2013 Opinion and Order.. Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIRMATION of PENNY SHANE in Support re: 506 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 432 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of June 28, 2013 Opinion and Order.. Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 506 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 432 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of June 28, 2013 Opinion and Order.. Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re; 432 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,, Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of June 28, 2013 Opinion and Order. Document filed by All Defendants.(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: (447 in 1:11-cv-06192-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings -- Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Evelyn Echevarria, Juliana C. Johnson, Douglas K. Johnson, (484 in 1:11-cv-06195-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings --Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion For Partial Judgment on The Pleadings. filed by Daniel B. Goodwin, Antoine Schetritt, Adam D. Glassner, William L. Maxwell, George E. Ellison, Mark I. Ryan, Juliaana Johnson, Michael J. Kula, Robert Caruso, George C. Carp, (456 in 1:11-cv-06189-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Neal Leonard, Todd White, Gerard Mattia, John Voigtman, (484 in 1:11-cv-06203-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings - Section 11 Individual Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Abner Figueroa, Arnaud Denis, Tony Tusi, Orlando Figueroa, (465 in 1:11-cv-06198-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings -- Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Mark Weiss, Daniel L. Sparks, Kevin Gasvoda, David J. Rosenblum, Jonathan S. Sobel, Michelle Gill, (597 in 1:11-cv-06188-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Donald Wilhelm, Thomas G. Lehmann, Stephen Fortunato, Brian Bernard, Diane Novak, Suzanne Krahling, David H. Zielke, David M. Duzyk, William A. King, Christine E. Cole, David Beck, Louis Schioppo, Jr., Edwin F. McMichael, Katherine Garniewski, Thomas W. Casey, Joseph T. Jurkowski, Jr., Rolland Jurgens, Richard Careaga, Larry Breitbarth, (449 in 1:11-cv-06201-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by John P. Graham, Nathan Gorin, N. Dante Larocca, John McCarthy, David Findlay, (443 in 1:11-cv-06200-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings -- Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Michael A. Marriott, Joseph M. Donovan, Carlos Onis, Andrew A. Kimura, Evelyn Echevarria, Jeffrey A. Altabef, Thomas Zingalli, Greg Richter, Juliana Johnson, (468 in 1:11-cv-06202-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings --Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion For Partial Judgment On The Pleadings. filed by Donald J. Puglisi, Donald C. Han, Brian T. Sullivan, Paul Park, Michael M. McGovern, Matthew Whalen, (437 in 1:11-cv-06190-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Paul Menefee, John Carroll, Michael Wade, (502 in 1:11-cv-06739-DLC) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Howard Hubler, David R. Warren, Steven S. Stern, Gail P. McDonnell On August 13, 2013, certain individual defendants in the above captioned cases filed a motion for partial judgment on the pleadings pursuant to Rule 12(c), Fed.R.Civ.P. It is hereby ORDERED that any opposition by plaintiff shall be served by August 30, 2013. Any reply shall be served by September 6,2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/14/2013) (djc) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Bradley A. Harsch in Support re: 502 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 502 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Section 11 Individual Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren. Responses due by 8/30/2013(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Andrew T. Frankel dated 8/2/2013 re: We write on behalf of Defendants in the above Actions to seek an order compelling FHFA to produce the documents withheld or redacted on the basis of a "bank examination" or "deliberative process" privilege.. ENDORSEMENT: If the dispute is about specific documents, the parties must meet and confer. If the defendants wish to litigate the application of the asserted privileges generally, they may bring a motion and should discuss a schedule for that motion with FHFA. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/12/2013) (gr) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Jon Corey and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 8/9/2013 re: On behalf of Plaintiff FHFA, we write to respond to Defendants' August 5, 2013 letter accusing FHFA of "fail[ing] to produce certain documents regarding appraisal bias" and requesting that FHFA collect and search the files of five additional Fannie Mae custodians. 8/5/13 Ltr. from P. Shane at 1-2. Defendants seek reconsideration of the Court's rulings regarding the scope of production of Fannie Mae appraisal bias documents and make an untimely request for additional document custodians. FHFA respectfully requests that the Court deny the application. ENDORSEMENT: The August 5 request for document production from five custodians based on an 10/20/07 article, which has been available to the Defendants since at least 2008, is untimely. Pursuant to rulings in December 2012, defendants have been given access to appraisal bias documents where appropriate. The defendants have not shown that document production should be reopened for this purpose. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/12/2013) (gr) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: In a letter of August 9, FHFA requested that portions of exhibit S to defendants' opening memorandum and exhibit E to defendants' reply memorandum be filed under seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the request to file portions of these exhibits under seal is granted. The parties shall file the briefing on defendant's motion for reconsideration with these two exhibits redacted by August 16, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/12/2013) (ama) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. In an Order of July 2, 2013, the Court directed Williams & Connolly to take various steps in connection with its asserted improper contact with represented witnesses, including providing to the Court on an ex parte basis a list of all witnesses represented by counsel for FHFA with whom Williams & Connolly has had ex parte contact. This information was provided in an exhibit accompanying a letter of July 8. In a letter of July 2, FHFA requested access to four categories of information in connection with this issue. It is hereby ORDERED that Williams & COnnolly shall by August 13, 2013 disclose to FHFA exhibit A to its letter of July 8, which was previously provided to the Court ex parte. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/9/2013) (gr) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: that a conference will be held on August 14, 2013 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/6/2013) (tn) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Richard A. Schirtzer in Support re: 456 Response,. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 Part I, # 7 Exhibit 6 Part II, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10 Part I, # 12 Exhibit 10 Part II, # 13 Exhibit 10 Part III, # 14 Exhibit 10 Part IV, # 15 Exhibit 10 Part V, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14, # 20 Exhibit 15, # 21 Exhibit 16, # 22 Exhibit 17, # 23 Exhibit 18, # 24 Exhibit 19, # 25 Exhibit 20)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of David B. Schwartz in Support re: 456 Response,. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of David B. Schwartz in Support re: 455 Memorandum of Law in Opposition,. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Leung, Kanchana) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Penny Shane in Support re: 454 Response. Document filed by Alexander C. Frank, Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC, Craig S. Phillips, Saxon Asset Securities Company, Saxon Capital, Inc., Saxon Funding Management LLC, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren, John E. Westerfield. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY re: 453 Reply Memorandum of Law / Reply Declaration of Penny Shane. Document filed by Alexander C. Frank, Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC, Craig S. Phillips, Saxon Asset Securities Company, Saxon Capital, Inc., Saxon Funding Management LLC, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren, John E. Westerfield. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Penny Shane in Support re: 452 Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Alexander C. Frank, Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC, Craig S. Phillips, Saxon Asset Securities Company, Saxon Funding Management LLC, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren, John E. Westerfield. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: On July 12, 2013, the Court received from defendant First Horizon a request to take two depositions of GSE witnesses beyond the twenty depositions allotted to defendants and to add an additional document custodian. FHFA opposed this request in a letter of July 18. It is hereby ORDERED that the requests in First Horizon's July 12 letter are denied without prejudice to renewal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants may jointly present any renewed request for additional depositions at such time as they are able to determine the total number of additional depositions that will be requested, rather than presenting such requests ad seriatim. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/31/2013) (mro) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Selendy, Richard Schirtzer, Christine Chung, Manisha Sheth and Michael Hanin dated 8/2/2013 re: On behalf of Plaintiff FHFA, we write to update the Court on the status of the production and indentification of loan files in the Tranche 3 and 4 Actions. We further write to provide the Court with an update on the status of the stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines in the Tranche 3 and 4 Actions, pursuant to the Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order dated 2/27/2013 (the "Supplemental ESO"). ENDORSEMENT: The agreements among the parties for extensions are approved. A status report regarding Homeward, Prospect and Nationstar shall be submitted on 8/9/2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/5/2013) (gr) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Pursuant to a stipulation of April 3, 2013, the FHFA's re-underwriting expert report for the JPMorgan action, No. 11 Civ. 6188 (DLC), is due August 23, 2013. In letters of July 29 and August 1, the FHFA and JPMorgan, respectively, address the schedule for that report, any rebuttal report, and for summary judgment practice. It is hereby ORDERED that the FHFA shall by August 5, 2013, submit a report that identifies for the JPMorgan action (1) the number of securitizations associated with Bear Stearns, WaMu, and the remainder of the JPMorgan action; (2) the number of such securitizations for which a re-underwriting expert report can be produced by August 23, 2013; and (3) the date(s) by which any supplemental re-underwriting expert report may be produced for the remaining securitizations. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/1/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Pursuant to an Order of February 27, 2013 1 the FHFA's re-underwriting expert report for Tranche 3 and 4 cases is due October 11, 2013. In letters of July 29 and July 31, the FHFA and defendants in the Tranche 3 and 4 cases, respectively, address the schedule for that report, any rebuttal report, and for summary judgment practice. It is hereby ORDERED that the FHFA shall by August 5, 2013, submit a report that identifies for each Tranche 3 and 4 case (1) the number of securitizations, (2) the number of securitizations for which a re-underwriting expert report can be produced by October 11, 2013, and (3) the date(s) by which any supplemental re-underwriting expert report may be produced for the remaining securitizations. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/1/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the requests to file these exhibits under seal are granted. The parties shall file the exhibits to their knowledge briefing with these three exhibits redacted by 8/5/2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/31/2013) (tro) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Christine H. Chung, Richard A. Schirtzer, Manisha M. Sheth, and Michael A. Hanin dated 7/15/2013 re: Counsel for plaintiff write to update the Court on the status of the production and identification of loan files in the Tranche 2, 3 and 4 Actions. Accordingly, FHFA and the HSBC Defendants jointly request an extension from 7/15/2013 until 7/19/2013 to complete the process of identifying and stipulating to Loan Files and Guideline documents for those Securitizations. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/30/2013) (tro) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING POTENTIALLY PRIVILEGED INFORMATION PRODUCED BY NON-PARTIES FDIC-RECEIVER AND ONEWEST BANK...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...So ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/30/2013) (tro) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 6/14/13 re: Tranche 3 and 4 Status Report. (abl) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Edward J. Bennett) dated 6/13/13 re: FHFA's 6/11 letter re GSE impairment/valuation calculations. (abl) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 6/11/13 re: UBS's 6/7 request for current GSE valuations of the certificates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(abl) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from UBS Defendants (Joseph N. Sacca) dated 6/7/13 re: Current GSE valuations of the at-issue certificates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(abl) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 6/5/13 re: Defendants' 5/30 request for GSE valuation models. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(abl) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Penny Shane) dated 6/3/13 re: FHFA's sur-reply regarding knowledge and other legal standards applicable to discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(abl) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 5/31/13 re: Status of production of loan files and guidelines. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Deutsche Bank dated 5/31/13 re: Status of production of loan files and guidelines. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Credit Suisse dated 5/31/13 re: Status of production of loan files and guidelines. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Bank of America dated 5/31/13 re: Status of production of loan files and guidelines. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from HSBC dated 5/31/13 re: Status of production of loan files and guidelines. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Morgan Stanley dated 5/31/13 re: Status report on loan files and guidelines. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 5/31/13 re: Defendants' 5/24 request to add Cindy Workman as a custodian. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Steven M. Cady) dated 5/30/13 re: Second update on status of Ocwen loan file production. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 5/30/13 re: Supplementation of FHFA's samples in the Tranche 3 and 4 actions. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Jonathan B. Oblak) dated 5/30/13 re: Defendants' requests in letters of 5/30. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants Bank of America and Merrill Lynch (Edward J. Bennett) dated 5/30/13 re: Recent GSE impairment/valuation calculations. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Steven M. Cady) dated 5/30/13 re: Status of Ocwen loan file production. (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Joseph N. Sacca) dated 5/30/13 re: GSE valuation models. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: On July 12, 2013, defendants filed a motion for reconsideration of the Court's June 28 Opinion and Order regarding knowledge and other legal standards as they apply to discovery in these cases. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall file its opposition by July 26, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any reply by defendants shall be filed by August 2, 2013. (Responses due by 7/26/2013, Replies due by 8/2/2013.) (Signed by Judge Judge Paul A. Crotty, Part I. for Denise Cote on 7/17/2013) (rsh). (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 5/29/13 re: Defendants' 5/24 request for additional deposition time. (abl) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Edward J. Bennett) dated 5/24/13 re: Request to submit an ex parte application for additional depositions. (abl) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Edward J. Bennett) dated 5/24/13 re: Procedure fo extending two-day deposition limit. (abl) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Penny Shane) dated 5/24/13 re: Adding Cindy Workman as a document custodian. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from JPMorgan Chase Defendants (Penny Shane) dated 5/23/13 re: Expert Scheduling Order disclosures. (abl) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Steven M. Cady) dated 5/23/13 re: Status of Ocwen loan file production. (abl) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from UBS defendants dated 5/22/13 re: request to adjust certain deadlines. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (abl) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re: 452 Memorandum of Law / Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Memorandum of Law Regarding Applicable Legal Standards. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Kasowitz, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 452 Memorandum of Law / Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Memorandum of Law Regarding Applicable Legal Standards. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Kasowitz, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to FHFA's SUR-REPLY. Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW Regarding Applicable Legal Standards and the Appropriate Standards for Discovery in light of the Applicable Legal Standards. Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW Regarding Applicable Legal Standards and the Appropriate Standards for Discovery in light of the Applicable Legal Standards. Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: In Orders of July 2 and 10, 2013, the Court directed the parties to indicate by 10:00 a.m. on July 12 whether any of the material in their briefing on knowledge and other legal standards required redaction from the public record despite the presumption of access that attaches to judicial documents. See Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 119-20 (2d Cir. 2006). On July 12, the parties indicated in separate letters that they did not view any of the material in the briefs as requiring redaction. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their briefing in unredacted form by July 15, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall advise the Court by July 26, 2013, whether in their view any material in the exhibits accompanying the briefs meets the standard described in the Court's Order of July 2 and therefore requires redaction. (Brief due by 7/15/2013.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/12/2013) (rsh) Modified on 7/16/2013 (rsh). (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Trials in FHFA v. Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., et al., 11 Civ. 6200 (DLC); FHFA v. Deutsche Bank AG, et al., 11 Civ. 6192 (DLC); and FHFA v. Goldman, Sachs & Co., et al., 11 Civ. 6198 (DLC) (the "Tranche 3" cases) are scheduled to begin on September 29, 2014. It is hereby ORDERED that if any of these trials do not occur because of settlement, or are conducted earlier due to a settlement in another one of these actions, one of these three Tranche 4 cases will be tried in its place: FHFA v. Morgan Stanley, et al., 11 Civ. 6739 (DLC); FHFA v. HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., et al., 11 Civ. 6189 (DLC); or FHFA v. Ally Financial Inc., et al., 11 Civ. 7010 (DLC). Ready for Trial by 9/29/2014. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/12/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 5/22/13 re: UBS disclosures and schedule adjustments. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Edward J. Bennett) dated 5/22/13 re: Defendants' Contention Interrogatory. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from UBS Defendants dated 5/22/13 re: Expert Scheduling Order disclosures. (abl) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 5/21/13 re: Defendants' Contention Interrogatory. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett re: I write in response to FHFA's letter to the Court of July 5, 2013 (the "FHFA Letter"), and in furtherance of Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference concerning FHFA's refusal to produce documents directly relevant to the Mortgage Loans that served as collateral for the Securities at issue in these matters (the "Mortgage Loans"). ENDORSEMENT: This application is denied. The defendants may renew a request if their review of the sample loan files provides a basis for a renewal request. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/10/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. On July 12, 2013, the Court issued an Order directing the parties to submit renewed, targeted requests for redactions to their briefing regarding knowledge and other legal standards by July 8. In a memo endorsement of July 8, the Court granted the parties' extension of this deadline to July 12. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall provide the submissions required by the July 2 Order by 10:00 AM on July 12, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/10/2013) (gr) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Jon Corey and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 7/8/2013 re: FHFA respectfully requests a short extension of time to respond to the Court's July 2, 2013 Order, such that the parties' responses would be due on Friday, July 12, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/8/2013) (gr) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Christine H. Chung, Richard A. Schirtzer, Manisha M. Sheth, and Michael A. Hanin dated 6/28/2013 re: On behalf of Plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency ("FHFA"), we write to update the Court on the status of the production, identification, and stipulation of loan files in the Tranche 3 and 4 Actions, pursuant to the Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order of February 27, 2013 (the "Supplemental ESO"), and in furtherance of FHFA's June 14, 2013 status report. ENDORSEMENT: The requests are granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/2/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 7/2/13 re: Williams & Connolly's contact with Robert Cope. (abl) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Richard H. Klapper dated 6/28/13 re: Williams & Connolly's contact with Robert Cope. (abl) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: ORDERED that the 98 current and former employees need not respond to the subpoenas until the Court issues a ruling on this dispute. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and, if the dispute remains live, shall appear for a telephone conference on Thursday, July 11, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/11/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/2/2013) (mt) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 7/1/13 re: Williams & Connolly's contact with Robert Cope. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 6/26/13 re: Williams & Connolly's contact with Robert Cope. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER...That the parties shall advise the Court by Monday, July 8, 2013, whether in their view any material in the briefs meets this standard and requires redaction. The Court will address this issue as it applies to the exhibits after the briefs are publicly filed. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/2/2013) (gr) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 6/25/2013 re: On behalf of all Defendants in these matters, we write to request a pre-motion conference, or in the alternative, an order compelling FHFA to produce certain documents referenced in the January 2006 Audit Report of Freddie Mac's Counterparty Credit Risk Management ("CCRM") group (the "CCRM Documents"). ENDORSEMENT: Denied, for the reasons stated in the FHFA's letter of June 27. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/2/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, pending an opportunity for counsel to be heard further, Williams & Connolly and any co-counsel for defendants represented by Williams & Connolly shall 1) Cease interviewing any current or former GSE employee identified in FHFA's initial disclosures. 2) Provide an ex parte list to this Court by Monday, 7/7/2013 of all such individuals it has already interviewed. 3) Secure all notes of the interviews of such individuals, including those from the interview of Mr. Cope, and seal them. 4) Not share with counsel for other defendants information learned from the interviews of such individuals until these issues are resolved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/2/2013) (tro) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Jon Corey and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 6/28/2013 re: FHFA's request for permission to move for a protective order re Defendants' non-party subpoenas. ENDORSEMENT: BoA shall respond by July 1, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/28/2013) (gr) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION & ORDER. Before the Court are defendants' memoranda of law regarding applicable legal standards and the appropriate standards for discovery in light of the applicable legal standards. The defendants have suggested over the course of this litigation that the Court's discovery rulings have been premised on a faulty definition of the "knowledge" defense that is available to them under Section 11 of the Securities Act of 1933 ("Securities Act"). In this briefing they address the legal standard for their affirmative defense that the plaintiff actually knew of the alleged misrepresentations in the Prospectus Supplements that governed its securities purchases. The defendants have taken this opportunity to address as well the legal standards for several of the elements and other defenses of the Securities Act claims in this litigation and to argue that the application of incorrect legal standards has deprived them of certain discovery from a portion of the plaintiff's business described below: the Single Family business. For the reasons stated below, the Court concludes that its previous discovery rulings have been made under the correct legal standards and need not be revisited. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/28/2013) (gr) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Moses Greenblatt on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Greenblatt, Joshua) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amber Trumbull Wallace on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Gerard Hardiman on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hardiman, Kevin) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth Michael A. Hanin dated 6/17/2013 re: On behalf of Plaintiff FHFA, we write regarding the Non-SLG Diligence Sets disclosed by the Tranche 3 and 4 Defendants, and FHFA's analysis of loans within such Sets, pursuant to the Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order dated 2/27/2013. FHFA respectfully requests that the schedule be adjusted to allow it time to respond to Deutsche Bank's and RBS's late disclosures be extended until 8/26/2013. Defendants Deutsche Bank and RBS have agreed to this extension. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/18/2013) (gr) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Penny Shane dated 6/17/2013 re: I write on behalf of Defendants in the above referenced actions to request an extension of time to file a response to FHFA's June 10, 2013 Sur-Reply In Opposition to Defendants' Memorandum of Law Regarding Applicable Legal Standards ("Sur-Reply"). The Court's current deadline to submit a response is June 18, 2013. Defendants respectfully request an extension to Thursday, June 20, 2013 in order to coordinate among Defendants. ENDORSEMENT: Granted., ( Responses due by 6/20/2013.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/18/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Penny Shane dated 6/17/2013 re: On behalf of Defendants in the above-referenced actions, we write to address FHFA's letter of June 13 concerning Defendants' request to extend the deposition of Michael Aneiro. ENDORSEMENT: The request for additional deposition time is denied. The Court has read the entire deposition and considered the defendants' arguments for additional time. The reason for this ruling will be placed on the record at a future conference. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/18/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Joseph N. Sacca dated 5/30/2013 re: On behalf of defendants in the above-referenced action ("Defendants"), we write to request that the Court order FHFA to produce functional copies of or access to all versions of the models, tools, and other systems (the "Models") Fannie Mae and Freddie Mac (the "GSEs") used in connection with their purchases of PLS during the period 2005 through 2007 in a form sufficient to reveal the inputs and assumptions incorporated into the Models. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. As explained in the June 5 letter from FHFA, this information is not currently accessible. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/17/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 6/13/2013 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court order FHFA to produce the GSE's impairment/valuation calculations for the at-issue Certificates after the third quarter of 2011. ENDORSEMENT: 1) The FHFA need only disclose the sale of Certificates at issue in this litigation; they shall have no duty to disclose information about the potential sales or analyses of potential sales. 2) The FHFA shall disclose its impairment calculation spreadsheets for each quarter through March 31, 2013. There shall be no obligation to disclose spreadsheets created after that date. There is no duty to disclose all documents supporting impairment analyses. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/17/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth, Michael A. Hanin dated 6/14/2013 re: On behalf of FHFA, we write to update the Court on the status of the prodcution, identification, and stipulatio of loan files in the Tranche 3 and 4 Actions, pursuant to the Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order of 2/27/13 and in furtherance of FHFA's 5/31/213 status report. ENDORSEMENT: The requests are granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/17/2013) (gr) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth, Michael A. Hanin dated 6/12/2013 re: We write on behalf of FHFA, in connection with this Court's Order of June 11, 2013 regarding the supplementation of certain of FHFA's samples in the Tranche 3 and 4 Actions. FHFA respectfully requests that it have until June 17, 2013 to disclose its supplement for AHMA 2005-1; Credit Suisse has consent to this request. FHFA further respectfully requests that it have until June 21, 2013 to disclose its supplement for ACE 2006-HE1; Deutsche Bank has consented to this request. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/13/2013) (gr) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Penny Shane) dated 6/3/13 re: FHFA's sur-reply in response to defendants' May 30 submission. ENDORSEMENT: The defendants may respond to any new material or arguments contained in the sur-reply by June 18, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/13/13) (abl) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER AMENDING THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR TRANCHES 3 AND 4. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/11/2013) (gr) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarmad Mostafa Khojasteh on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Khojasteh, Sarmad) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Ferris Cohen on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Cohen, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Elliott Filusch on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Filusch, Edward) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dorothy Anne Jarrell on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Jarrell, Dorothy) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hershey Stern on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Stern, Hershey) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jon Oblak and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 6/4/2013 re: We write on behalf of FHFA in response to Defendants' letter dated June 3, 2013, which requests that the Court provide Defendants with five consecutive days to depose Michael Aneiro. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency.(lmb) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Penny Shane dated 6/3/2013 re: For the reasons described in Defendants' May 24, 2013 letter and at the May 31 conference, Defendants request that the Court find "good cause" to extend the presumptive two-day limit to five days for Mr. Aneiro. ENDORSEMENT: The defendants have not shown good cause for an exception to the presumptive 2-day limit on the Aneiro deposition. Should there be any post-deposition application for additional time, the request should include the transcript of the deposition. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/4/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Steven M. Cady dated 6/3/2013 re: Defendants request a telephonic conference to discuss the status of FHFA's subpoena to Ocwen. ENDORSEMENT: The request for a conference is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/4/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Manisha M. Sheth, Christine H. Chung, Richard A. Schirtzer and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 6/4/2013 re: We write on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency ("FHFA") in response to Defendants' June 3, 2103 status update regarding Ocwen. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency.(lmb) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth, Michael A. Hanin dated 5/31/2013 re: On behalf of Plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency and pursuant to the Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order of February 27, 2013. we write to provide a status report concerning the production, identification, and stipulation of loan files in the Tranche 3 and 4 Actions. The parties respectfully seek a brief extension, until June 14, 2013, to finish meeting and conferring concerning these Sample Loan Files and to agree on the language of the stipulation they expect to reach. Most of the Tranche 3 and 4 Defendants have joined in this request and none have opposed it. The lone exception is Tranche 4 Defendant Morgan Stanley, who has requested an extension to June 17, 2013, two which FHFA also agrees. FHFA has also agreed that the cost-shifting deadline referred to in Paragraph 4 of the Supplemental ESO be extended until June 14 for each of these same Securitizations. FHFA has, accordingly, asked Defendants to meet and confer early next week about a schedule for these processes, with the goal of submitting a joint proposal to the Court by June 7, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: The requests are approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/4/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 5/24/2013 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court enter an order permitting them to make the partially ex parte submission described above. (lmb) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth, and Michael A. Hanin dated 5/28/2013 re: On behalf of Plaintiff the Federal Housing Finance Authority ("FHFA"), we write in response to Defendants' May 24, 2013 letter requesting leave to submit ex parte an application to increase the 20-deposition limit previously ordered by the Court. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency.(lmb) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: There are several outstanding discovery disputes in these cases, including issues surrounding defendants' production of information pursuant to the Expert Scheduling Orders, requests regarding the number of and time limits applicable to depositions, and proposals for the adjustment of certain deadlines. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held to discuss these issues on Friday, May 31, 2013, at 10:00 a.m., ( Status Conference set for 5/31/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/24/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Penny Shane dated 5/24/2013 re: We write to request an enlargement of time and pages for Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law Regarding Applicable Legal Standards and the Appropriate Standards for Discovery in Light of the Applicable Legal Standards. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The reply is due May 30, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/26/2013) (gr) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 405 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. In a conference held on May 24, 2013, counsel for third-party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ("Ocwen") indicated that Ocwen would complete production of the Loan Files in its possession by May 29. It is therefore necessary to adjust the deadlines in the Court's Order of May 21. In the event Ocwen does not complete its production by 5/29, the defendant shall move no later than June 3 to compel Ocwen to comply with their subpoenas and take all other steps necessary to ensure immediate production. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 5/31 deadline for identification of Loan Files applicable to the Sample Loans set in the Court's 2/27 Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order for Tranches 3 and 4 is hereby extended to June 7 as to those Loan Files produced by Ocwen after 5/22. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/24/2013) (gr) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCLOSURE PROTOCOL: IT IS HEREBY AGREED, by and among the parties to the above-captioned FHFA-related litigations presently pending before the Hon. Denise L. Cote, U.S.D.J., and the Hon. Alvin W. Thompson, U.S.D.J. in the United States District Courts for the Southern District of New York and Connecticut (the "FHFA Proceedings"), through their counsel, that the following provisions of this Order shall govern expert reports, disclosures and discovery with respect to testifying experts (each an "Expert") in the FHFA Proceedings: Notwithstanding Rule 26(a)(2)(B) and 26(b)(4) (or any other potentially applicable law, statute, regulation or rule), the parties shall not be required to disclose or produce in discovery or at any trial in the FHFA Proceedings any of the following documents or information (the "Excluded Information"): (a) drafts of any report, affidavit, declaration, written testimony, exhibit or disclosure prepared by or at the direction of the Expert, counsel or other agent of the party proffering the Expert, or others working under the supervision of or on behalf of the Expert in connection with the FHFA Proceedings or any other matter, regardless of the form in which such draft is recorded as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/23/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Steven M. Cady dated 5/23/13 re: Ocwen loan file production. ENDORSEMENT: A conference shall be held on Friday, May 24 at 10:30 a.m. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/23/13) (abl) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Jon Corey dated 5/21/2013 re: We write on behalf of FHFA to seek a continuance of the response date for Defendants' Fifth Set of Interrogatories, which are premature contention interrogatories served in violation of Local Rule 33.3(c). FHFA asks the Court to continue the date for FHFA's response to the close of fact discovery in each Action. ENDORSEMENT: The May 24 deadline is adjourned sine die pending a conference on this dispute. The defendants have advised that their written response will be submitted on May 23. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/22/2013) (gr) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: In letters of May 20 and 21, 2013, the parties in these actions provided updates on the status of the production of loan files by third-party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ("Ocwen"). In their letter, defendants indicated that Ocwen anticipates completing its production on May 22. It is hereby ORDERED that, in the event Ocwen does not complete its production by May 22, defendants shall move no later than May 27 to compel Ocwen to comply with their subpoenas and take all other steps necessary to ensure immediate production., ( Motions due by 5/27/2013.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/21/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth, Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 5/21/2013. We write on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency (FHFA) in response to Defendants May 20, 2103 status update regarding Ocwens production. Defendants reference two hard drives of loan files recently produced by Ocwen. Neither hard drive, however, alleviates the ongoing delays referenced in FHFAs May 10, 2013 letter. Indeed, the parties had been scheduled to receive one hard drive the day FHFA filed its May 10 letter, and the other hard drive was a replacement for a corrupt drive Ocwen produced in April. With respect to the 2,657 outstanding Sample Loan Files that actually are the subject of FHFAs May 10 letter, none has been produced. Although Ocwen anticipates making a production on May 22, over the last eight months, Ocwen has repeatedly failed to meet anticipated production dates. Further, waiting for another status update as Defendants propose jeopardizes the May 31, 2013 matching deadline in the Tranche 3 and 4 actions. As of today, the parties will have less than seven business days to determine how to address anyproduction issues, process and distribute the 2,657 Sample Loan Files, and meet and confer to reach agreement on matching the Sample Loan Files. (gr) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Steven M. Cady dated 5/20/2013 re: I write on behalf of relevant Defendants in response to the Court's May 13, 2013 order requiring Defendants to submit a status update on Ocwen's production by May 20, 2013. (gr) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Scott Waldman on behalf of RBS Securities, Inc. (Waldman, Craig) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth, Michael A. Hanin dated 5/16/2013. Reply in Further Support of Status Report re: Tranche 3 and 4 Non-SLG Sets. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Roberta A. Kaplan dated 5/13/2013. We represent Fitch, Inc. ("Fitch") in connection with the subpoena dated July 5,2012, which the Federal Housing Finance Authority ("FHFA") served on Fitch in the abovecaptioned actions (the "Fitch Subpoena"). We submit this letter pursuant to the Court's Order of May 7, 2013, in response to FHFA's letter of May 6, 2013 regarding the issue of reimbursement for costs relating to compliance with the Fitch Subpoena (the "May 6 letter").(gr) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Steven M. Cady dated 5/13/2013. I write on behalf of relevant defendants in response to Plaintiffs' May 10, 2013 letter regarding collection of loan files from non-party Ocwen Loan Services, LLC. (gr) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote dated 5/7/2013 from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth, Michael A. Hanin. On behalf of Plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency (FHFA), and in response to the Courts directive at the April 26, 2013 conference, we write to provide a status report concerning the adequacy of the disclosure of Non-SLG sets by the Tranche 3 and 4 Defendants (the Defendants) pursuant to the Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order for Tranches 3 and 4 dated February 27, 2013 (the Order). Since the conference on April 26, 2013, FHFA has met andconferred with each Tranche 3 and 4 Defendant bilaterally. Those discussions have made it possible to isolate the following specific areas of disagreement, and the particular Defendants with whom FHFA has the disagreement.(gr) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Edward J. Bennett dated 5/7/2013. We write in response to FHFAs May 3, 2013 letter to the Court regarding its documentproduction. FHFA states that its post-January 2013 production has been larger than FHFA anticipated due to a number of factors including Defendants requests for additional searches and productions of documents. and that it did not anticipate... the additional requests defendants [sic] would make. Undoubtedly the parties will continue to vigorously disagree about the scope of document production and its proper implications for the overall schedule, but FHFAs claim that Defendants are in any way the cause of the delays affecting its document production is simply not correct. (gr) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 392 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that, in the event the issues raised by FHFA in a letter dated May 15, 2013, remain outstanding after meet and confer sessions between the parties, a telephone conference will be held on Monday, May 20, 2013 at 2:30 p.m. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/16/2013) (gr) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' PRIVILEGE LOG DEADLINES. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/16/2013) (gr) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and Mark E. Kasowitz dated 5/14/2013 re: We write on behalf of Plaintiff FHFA to request a short extension of time to respond to Defendants' May 8 2013 Memorandum of Law Regarding Applicable Legal Standards and the Appropriate Standards for Discovery in Light of the Applicable Legal Standards such that FHFA's opposition brief would be due on Monday, May 20, and Defendants' reply brief would be due on Tuesday, May 28. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/15/2013) (gr) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Penny Shane dated 5/3/2013. I write on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("Chase Bank") to report on Chase Bank's response to subpoenas for loan records in Tranche 3 and 4 Actions where it is not a party. (gr) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Christine H. Chung, Kanchana Wangkeo Leung, and Manisha Sheth dated 5/3/2013. We write on behalf of Plaintiff FHFA to respond to the Courts request for information regarding FHFAs document production since January 2013. (gr) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Penny Shane dated 4/29/2013. On behalf of defendants in the above-referenced actions (Defendants), asrequested at the April 26, 2013 conference with the Court, we write to identify instances inwhich Defendants objected to the deposition limits the Court has set, under which FHFA maytake over 400 depositions of Defendants but Defendants may take only 20 shared depositions ofFannie Mae, Freddie Mac and FHFA/OFHEO. (gr) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. Having reviewed the parties' recent submissions in connection with two outstanding discovery issues to be addressed at a conference this week, the allocation of the costs associated with identification and indexing of Guidelines in the Ally action and the adequacy of defendants' disclosures regarding non-Supporting Loan Group sets, the Court has concluded that the conference can be conducted in less than an hour. Accordingly, it is hereby Ordered that a telephone conference will be held on May 17 2013 at 2:30 p.m.( Telephone Conference set for 5/17/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/14/2013) (gr) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Brian Markley dated 5/13/2013. I write on behalf of Standard & Poor's Financial Services, LLC ("S&P"), a non-party in the above-referenced actions, with respect to the eltter submitted on 5/6/2013 by plaintiff FHFA, requesting that S&P and two other non-party rating agencies bear their own costs of compliance with certain subpoenas issued by FHFA. For the reasons set forth below, and in a separte letter being submitted today by Moody's Investors Services, FHFA's request should be denied. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter dated May 13 2013 to Judge Cote)(gr) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION DEADLINES. This Order shall apply to all depositions taken after April 26, 2013 regardless of the date on which they were noticed. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/13/2013) (gr) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 5/10/13 re: production of outstanding Sample Loan Files from third-party servicer Ocwen. ENDORSEMENT: Any objection to the request, by a party to these actions, should be made by May 14 at noon. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/13/13) (abl) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from James P. Rouhandeh dated 4/30/2013. Pursuant to the Court's 2/27/2013 Supplemental Schedudling Order for Tranches 3 and 4 (the "ESCO"), the Morgan Stanley-related defendants ("Morgan Stanley") respectfully submit this status report on the production and identification of, and stipulation to, loan files and guidelines in the above-captioned action.(gr) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Adam Abensohn, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth, Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 4/30/2013. We write on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency (FHFA) to update the Court on the status of the parties efforts regarding the production, identification, and stipulation of Loan Files and Guidelines relating to FHFAs Sample Loans in the Tranche 3 and Tranche 4 Actions (together, the Actions).(gr) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Lauren A. Moskowitz dated 4/30/2013. Pursuant to paragraph 3 of the Courts February 27, 2013 SupplementalExpert Scheduling Order for Tranches 3 and 4 (the Tranche 3 and 4 ESO), defendants Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corporation, Asset Backed Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Acceptance Corporation, Andrew A. Kimura, Jeffrey A. Altabef, Evelyn Echevarria, Michael A. Marriott, Zev Kindler, Thomas E. Siegler, Thomas Zingalli, Carlos Onis, Steven L. Kantor, Joseph M. Donovan, Juliana Johnson and Greg Richter (collectively,Credit Suisse) submit this status report on the production and identification of, and stipulation to, Guidelines and Loan Files. (gr) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, at the request of counsel, the telephone conference to discuss the Rating Agencies' compliance with FHFA's subpoenas previously scheduled for May 15 at 10:30 a.m. is adjourned to May 20, 2013, at 11:30 a.m., ( Telephone Conference set for 5/20/2013 at 11:30 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/8/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Thomas C. Rice dated 4/26/2013. We write on behalf of RBS Securities Inc. (RBSSI) in the above-captioned actionsin response to Plaintiffs April 24 request that the Court order Defendants to complete production of documents and privilege logs by May 31, 2013. Document filed by RBS Securities, Inc.(gr) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redacted Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Jonathan B. Oblak and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 4/26/2013 re: We write on behalf of the Federal Housing Finance Agency (FHFA) in response to Defendants April 25, 2013 letter requesting that the Court require FHFA to designate a new Freddie Mac witness to testify further regarding Topic 9 of Defendants January 11, 2013 Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (30(b)(6) Notice). Document filed by FHFA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted, # 2 Exhibit Redacted, # 3 Exhibit Redacted)(gr) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from UBS Defendants (Robert A. Fumerton) dated 4/25/13 re: Deadlines for document production. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Penny Shane) dated 4/25/13 re: Further 30(b)(6) deposition of Freddie Mac. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 4/25/13 re: Freddie Mac AMO reviews. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from JPMorgan (Penny Shane) dated 4/25/13 re: FHFA's request that production of documents and privilege logs be complete by May 31. (abl) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Goldman Sachs (Richard H. Klapper) dated 4/25/13 re: FHFA's request that production of documents and privilege logs be complete by May 31. (abl) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Ally Securities (Devon M. Largio) dated 4/25/13 re: FHFA's request that production of documents and privilege logs be complete by May 31. (abl) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 4/24/13 re: Deadline for completion of document production and privilege logs. (abl) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that the Rating Agencies shall submit by May 13, 2013, letter briefs no longer than five pages regarding compliance with FHFA's subpoenas. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone conference to discuss this issue will be held on Wed., May 15 at 10:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that FHFA shall serve copies of this Order on the Rating Agencies. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/7/2013) (gr) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Counsel for Plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency ("FHFA") regarding the Court's request during the 4/262013 status conference that FHFA provide by today a status report concerning the Tranche 3 and 4 Defendants' disclosure pursuant to the Supplemental Expert Scheduling Order ated 2/27/2013. FHFA respectfully request that the Court permit FHFA an additional two business days, until 5/7/2013, to complete that process and submit the request status report. Defendants consent to this brief extension dated 5/3/2013 ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/6/2013) (gr) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth, and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 4/30/2013 re: As discussed in this letter, FHFA and Defendants in the Credit Suisse, Deutsche Bank, Goldman Sachs, Morgan Stanley, HSBC, Citi, Barclays, Nomura, and First Horizon cases respectfully request an extension until May 31, 2013 of (1) the deadline for the production, identification, and stipulation of the Loan Files and applicable Guidelines for all Securitizations; and (2) the date after which re-underwriting costs may be shifted based on the late production of Loan Files or Guidelines (set forth in Paragraph 4 of the Supplemental ESO). The parties can amend their proposed stipulations up to that same deadline. FHFA and SG Americas respectfully request an extension until May 13, 2013 and finally, FHFA and Ally respectfully request an extension until May 15, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: The requested extensions are approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/2/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that JPMorgan provide by May 3, 2013, a date by which it expects to complete production of the Loan Files mentioned in FHFAs April 30 status report. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/2/13)(abl) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: On May 1, 2013, the parties jointly submitted to the Court a proposed extension of the briefing schedule established in the Court's Order of April 30. It is hereby ORDERED that any brief on the legal issues mentioned in the Court's April 30 Order by defendants shall be served by May 8, 2013. Plaintiff's opposition shall be served by May 15, 2013. Defendants' reply shall be served by May 20, 2013, at noon. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/1/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 364 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: In a series of letters beginning April 5, 2013, the parties raised several outstanding discovery issues and requested a conference. A conference was held on April 26, but several issues remain outstanding. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephone conference will be held to address these issues on Wednesday, May 1 at 10:30 AM., ( Telephone Conference set for 5/1/2013 at 10:30 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/30/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: At a conference held on April 26, 2013, the Court discussed with defendants the possibility of their submitting briefing regarding knowledge and other legal standards in this case in advance of summary judgment practice. It is hereby ORDERED that any brief on these issues by defendants shall be served by May 3, 2013. Plaintiff's opposition shall be served by May 10, 2013. Defendants' reply shall be served by May 14, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/30/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: At a conference held on April 26, 2013, defendants raised the issue of inquiry notice, and the Court indicated that it would provide counsel with a reference to its discussion of inquiry notice in a previous opinion. Inquiry notice was addressed in the Court's May 4, 2012, opinion granting in part and denying in part the motion to dismiss the second amended complaint in the UBS Action, No. 11 Civ. 5201 (DLC), at page 19 et seq. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/29/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Christine H. Chung, Richard A. Schirtzer, Manisha M. Sheth, and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 4/26/2013 re: To allow sufficient time for the parties to collect, identify, and stipulate to these Remaining Sample Loans, FHFA respectfully requests that the deadline for production, identification, and stipulation of the Securitizations identified on Exhibit 1 be extended until May 31, 2013, except for those Securitizations related to the Bank of America action. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/26/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Christine H. Chung, Manisha M. Sheth and Michael A. Hanin dated 4/24/2013 re: Deadline for Completion of Document Production and Privilege Logs. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency.(gr) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 359 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Manisha Sheth) dated 3/25/13 re: UBS production of on-site originator reviews. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 358 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Sascha N. Rand dated 4/11/2013 re: Pursuant to the instructions received from Chambers on April 8, 2013 and the additional meet and confer discussions between the parties, we write on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency (FHFA) to update the Court regarding the status of Loan File production in the Tranche 2,3, and 4 Actions. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency.(gr) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Steven M. Cady on behalf of Defendants in the above-cationed actions dated 4/11/2013 re: After an opportunity to meet and confer with FHFA regarding FHFA's letter dated April 4, Defendants and FHFA have resolved the matters raised in FHFA's letter without the need for Court intervention. (gr) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Selendy, Richrd Schirtzer, Christine Chung, Manisha Sheth and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 4/10/2013 re: FHFA's Response to Defendants' 4/5/2013 letter re: 20 Deposition limit. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency.(gr) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Steven M. Cady dated 4/7/2013 re: I write on behalf of Defendants in the above-captioned actions in response to FHFA's letter to the Court dated 4/4/2013 regarding loan file collection. (gr) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Your Honor from Penny Shane dated 4/5/2013 re: Defendants in the above-referenced actions write in response to the Courts March 22 Order that [t]he parties shall confer and design a process for selecting deponents. (gr) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Sascha Rand dated 4/4/2013 re: to supplement its report of March 29, 2013 to report on the production of Loan Files and Guidelines in the Tranche 2, Tranche 3, and Tranche 4 Actions and topropose associated relief. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency.(gr) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Plaintiff's counsel dated 4/18/2013 re: Tranche 3 and 4 Defendants' Disclosures of Non-SLG sets. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit April 5, 2013 letter from Reginald Goeke to Kanchana Leung)(gr) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Plaintiff's counsel dated 3/28/2013 re: additional Freddie Mac 30(b)(6) designees. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition, # 2 Exhibit redacted, # 3 Exhibit redacted, # 4 Exhibit redacted, # 5 Exhibit redacted)(gr) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from plaintiff's counsel dated 3/28/2013 re: additional Fannie Mae 30(b)(6) designees. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit redacted, # 2 Exhibit redacted, # 3 Exhibit redacted, # 4 Exhibit redacted)(gr) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Phillip A. Sechler dated 3/26/2013 re: adequacy of plaintiff's 30(b)(6) designees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Pursuant to Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit Redacted Pursuant to Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Pursuant to Protective Order, # 4 Exhibit Redacted Pursuant to Protective Order, # 5 Exhibit Redacted Pursuant to Protective Order)(gr) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Robert A. Fumerton dated 3/26/2013 re: response to FHFA's 3/25/2013 letter. Document filed by GS Mortgage Securities Corp., UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC, UBS Americas Inc., UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., UBS Securities, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Declaration (redacted))(gr) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Penny Shane dated 3/26/2013 re:to write to request that the Court direct Plaintiff to designate an additional Fannie Mae Rule 30(b)(6) deposition witness (or witnesses) to testify on certain topics discussed below. Document filed by UBS Americas Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter, # 2 Exhibit Letter, # 3 Exhibit Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition, # 4 Exhibit FHFA's response to Rule 30(b)(6), # 5 Exhibit Redacted, # 6 Exhibit Redacted, # 7 Exhibit Redacted, # 8 Exhibit Redacted, # 9 Exhibit Redacted)(gr) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: In a series of letters beginning April 5, 2013, the parties raised several outstanding discovery issues and requested a conference. The parties could not agree on a time during the week of April 15, but were able to agree to a time the following week. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held to address these issues on Friday, April 26 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 15B, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York., ( Status Conference set for 4/26/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/17/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from the UBS Defendants dated 4/16/13 re: Additional proposed redactions to the Thacher Memorandum. ENDORSEMENT: These additional redactions are approved with one exception: The request to redact #5 is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/16/13) (al) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER regarding FHFA's objection to the designation of certain documents by defendant UBS as protected by the attorney-client privilege. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/16/13) (al) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FHFA'S PRODUCTION OF MEMORANDA RELATING TO FANNIE MAE'S ANTI-PREDATORY LENDING REVIEWS OF ORIGINATORS AND THE SECURITIZATIONS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff Federal Finance Housing Agency ("FHFA"), as conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae") and the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation ("Freddie Mac"), and each Defendant in the above-captioned actions ("the Parties"), by and through their undersigned counsel, as follows: Defendants agree that they will not assert, and it will not be deemed, that Plaintiff FHFA's production of memoranda summarizing Fannie Mae's anti-predatory lending reviews of Originators and memoranda summarizing Fannie Mae's post-purchase reviews of third party exception reports relating to the Securitizations (collectively "the Documents") is a waiver of any claim of privilege that FHFA may assert as to documents other than the Documents produced pursuant to this stipulation. All parties agree that they will not assert, and it will not be deemed, that either the production of the Documents or this stipulation constitutes evidence or an admission by any party that any documents other than the Documents are or are not covered by any privilege. With respect to any documents other than the Documents produced by Plaintiff FHFA pursuant to this Stipulation, all parties reserve their rights to make arguments concerning privileges, waiver of privileges, and the scope of any such waivers. No party takes a position on, and each reserves the right to oppose (on grounds other than privilege), the use of the Documents as evidence. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/15/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE PROVISION OF DILIGENCE LOAN INFORMATION TO NON-PARTIES: 1. If a Due Diligence File Custodian, including but not limited to the Due Diligence File Custodians identified in the attached Exhibit 1, requires Diligence Loan Information, including Non-Party Borrower Information, to identify and produce the requested due diligence files and related documents ("Confidential Diligence Loan Information"), the Due Diligence File Custodian may obtain the Confidential Diligence Loan Information as set forth in this Stipulation. 2. Any Confidential Diligence Loan Information that was designated by a Defendant as Confidential pursuant to the Protective Order may be disclosed by that Defendant to a Due Diligence File Custodian in accordance with Paragraph 11 of the Protective Order as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/15/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from James P. Rouhandeh dated 3/29/2013 re: Pursuant to the 2/27/13 Supplementel Expert Scheduling Order for Tranches 3 and 4, the Morgan Stanley-related defendants respectfully submit this status report on the production and identification of, and stipulation to, loan files and guidelines in this matter. Document filed by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC.(gr) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Selendy, Richard Schirtzer, Christine Chung, Manisha Sheth and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 3/29/2013 re: Pursuant to this Courts Order of March 4, 2013, we write on behalf of the Federal Housing. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association.(gr) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Lauren A. Moskowitz dated 3/29/2013 re: Pursuant to paragraph 3 of the Courts February 27, 2013 Supplemental, we this status report on the production and identification of, andstipulation to, Guidelines and Loan Files. Document filed by defendantsCredit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corporation, Asset Backed Securities Corporation, Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Acceptance Corporation, Andrew A. Kimura, Jeffrey A. Altabef, Evelyn Echevarria, Michael A. Marriott, Zev Kindler, Thomas E. Siegler, Thomas Zingalli, Carlos Onis, Steven L. Kantor, Joseph M. Donovan, Juliana Johnson and Greg Richter (collectively, Credit Suisse)(gr) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that the modifications to the schedules in these coordinated actions requested by FHFA and many defendants, as reflected in FHFA's 3/29/13 status report, are approved. (See Order for schedule) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/1/2013) (gr) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR MATERIALS PRODUCED BY HE LIQUIDATING TRUSTEE FOR PEOPLE'S CHOICE HOME LOAN, INC. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/1/2013) (gr) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/1/13) (abl) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/29/13) (abl) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S SECURITIES ACT CLAIMS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims under Section 12(a)(2) of the Securities Act against the underwriter defendants identified in Column 2 of the attached chart are dismissed without prejudice only as to those certificates identified in Column 3 of the attached chart, with each Party to bear its own fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that nothing in this Stipulation shall prejudice Plaintiff's ability to seek leave further to amend its complaint(s) to re-plead Section 12(a)(2) claims against an underwriter defendant identified in Column 2 of the attached chart as to those certificates identified in Column 3 of the attached chart, if Plaintiff discovers facts sufficient to state a claim that the underwriter defendant successfully solicited Fannie Mae or Freddie Mac to purchase the certificates identified in Column 3 of the attached chart. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/27/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from James P.Rouhandeh dated 3/15/2013 re: Respectfully submit this status report on the production, matching and stipulation to loan files and guidelines in the above-captioned action. Document filed by Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC.(gr) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy, Richard A. Schirtzer, Manisha M. Sheth and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 3/15/2013 re: we write on behalf of the Federal Housing Finance Agency (FHFA) to make an initial report on the production, matching, and stipulation to Loan Files and Guidelines in the Selected Actions. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, as Conservator for the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(gr) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION AND ORDER denying the UBS Defendants' application to require the Federal Housing Finanace Agency to pay either $250,000 or at least $85,000 of the cost incurred in identifying certain files produced by third parties. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/26/2013) (gr) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from defendant Credit Suisse (Keara A. Bergin) dated 3/22/13 re: status of loan file production by NationStar. (abl) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Phillip A. Sechler) dated 3/21/13 re: 30(b)(6) depositions. ENDORSEMENT: Denied for failure to indicate that defendants have exhausted the meet and confer process. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/22/13) (abl) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Non-UBS defendants (Edward J. Bennett) dated 3/21/13 re: the Court's March 19, 2013 Order regarding deposition coordination and scheduling. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall confer and design a process for selecting deponents. If the parties cannot agree between two competing proposals, the Court shall hear the parties. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/22/13) (al) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Citigroup Defendants may begin to exchange guideline matches on March 29, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by March 22, the defendants shall provide a report regarding the status of the production of Loan Files by NationStar. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/20/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: FHFA or a defendant may identify to its adversary the Loan Files and Guidelines to which it will stipulate, and seven days thereafter the adversary shall agree to the stipulation or provide specific reasons why it does not agree. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/19/13)(gr) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Manisha M. Sheth) dated 3/19/2013 re: Response to USB's 3/15/13 letter requesting extension of deadlines for fact and expert discovery. ENDORSEMENT: All defendants must cooperate in the scheduling of the FHFA (Fannie Mae; Freddie Mac) depositions. The limit on the depositions applies across all actions. The USB request to extend its discovery until 12/6 is denied. Fact discovery in the UBS action is extended to 8/30/13; expert discovery is extended to 9/4/13.(Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/19/2013)(gr) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from UBS Defendants (Robert A. Fumerton) dated 3/15/2013 re: Request by UBS Defendants for adjournment of interim deadlines in USB action.(gr) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from UBS Defendants (Robert Fumerton) dated 3/1/13 re: Production of Syron documents. (al) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA and JPMorgan Chase dated 2/28/13 re: Joint status report. (al) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/28/13 re: Tranche 3 and 4 status report. (al) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants in Tranche 3 and 4 cases (Amanda Davidoff) dated 2/28/13 re: Status report. (al) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 317 Motion for Kelly S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Kelly S. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8289721. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kelly) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The requested extension of the deadline for stipulations in the JPMorgan Chase Action to March 31, 2013, is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties to the following six Tranche 3 and 4 Actions submit by March 15, 2013, further reports on the status of production, matching, and stipulation to Loan Files and Guidelines: FHFA v. HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., et al., 11-cv-6189, FHFA v. Deutsche Bank AG, et al., 11-cv-6192, FHFA v. Citigroup, et al., 11-cv-6196, FHFA v. Goldman Sachs & Co., et al., 11-cv-6198, FHFA v. Morgan Stanley, et al., 11-cv-6739, and FHFA v. Ally Financial, Inc., et al., 11-cv-7010. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/4/2013) (ft) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/25/13 re: Proposed expert scheduling order for Tranche 3 and 4 cases. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (al) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR TRANCHES 3 AND 4:Summary Judgment Motions in Tranche 3 and 4 due by 1/24/2014. Opposition briefs shall be due by 3/21/2014 Reply briefs due by 4/11/2014. Expert Discovery shall be completed by 3/7/2014. See Scheduling Order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/27/2013) (gr) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants in Tranche 3 and 4 cases (David Woll) dated 2/25/13 re: Proposed expert scheduling order for Tranche 3 and 4 cases. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (al) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL: Except as specifically provided herein, this Deposition Protocol shall govern all oral and written discovery depositions of party and non-party fact witnesses (including depositions of Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses), taken in the above-captioned actions pending in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York (the "SDNY Actions" or the "Actions"), which were brought by the Federal Housing Finance Agency ("FHFA"), as conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae") and the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation ("Freddie Mac") (together, the "Government Sponsored Entities" or "GSEs") against defendants to the Actions (collectively, "Defendants") as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/25/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from UBS Defendants (Robert A. Fumerton) dated 2/22/13 re: FHFA's request for an extension of time to respond to interrogatories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/21/13 re: Application for an extension of time to respond to interrogatories. (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/20/13 re: Proposed supplemental expert scheduling order for tranche 3 and 4 cases. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/20/13 re: Defendants' request for additional Freddie Mac custodians. (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/20/13 re: Status report on outstanding discovery issues. (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Penny Shane) dated 2/20/13 re: FHFA's assertion of privilege over Fannie Mae reviews or actions based on third party loan level reviews. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants dated 2/20/13 re: Status report on outstanding discovery issues. (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Penny Shane) dated 2/20/13 re: Production of third party loan level reviews. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/20/13 re: Production of privilege logs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Manisha M. Sheth) dated 2/20/13 re: JPMorgan's delays in document production relating to successor liability claims. (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Manisha M. Sheth) dated 2/20/13 re: JPMorgan's delays in document production. (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from JPMorgan Chase (Penny Shane) dated 2/20/13 re: Document production relating to FHFA's successor liability claims. (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from UBS Defendants (Robert A. Fumerton) dated 2/20/13 re: Production of privilege logs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/20/13 re: UBS delays in deposition scheduling. (al) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/20/13 re: Defendants' request for production of GSE reviews of single-family due dilgence vendors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Jay B. Kasner) dated 2/20/13 re: Request to search custodial files of certain Freddie Mac employees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/20/13 re: Defendants' request for loan-level reviews of the securitizations. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/20/13 re: Defendants' request for 30(b)(6) testimony. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Goldman Sachs Defendants (Richard H. Klapper) dated 2/19/13 re: FHFA's request for information regarding Goldman's due diligence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Philippe Z. Selendy and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung) dated 2/19/13 re: Goldman Sachs' due diligence loans. (al) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Robert A. Fumerton) dated 2/15/13 re: Defendants' request for 30(b)(6) testimony. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: In a series of letters beginning February 1, the parties raised several issues related to discovery in this litigation and requested a conference. Conferences were held on February 7 and 14, but certain issues remain outstanding. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held to address these issues on Thursday, February 21 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 2/21/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 02/19/2013) (jcs) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/13/13 re: Defendants' request for single-family due diligence policies. (al) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Jon Corey) dated 2/13/13 re: Defendants' letter seeking 30(b)(6) deposition regarding Freddie Mac email preservation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Robert A. Fumerton) dated 2/13/13 re: FHFA's retention of documents from Freddie Mac. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Penny Shane) dated 2/13/13 re: Use of loan level information at GSEs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Christine H. Chung and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung) dated 2/13/13 re: letter from Goldman Sachs of 2/1 regarding due diligence loans. (al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Penny Shane) dated 2/13/13 re: Loan level reviews conducted by the GSEs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Richard H. Klapper) dated 2/13/13 re: Diligence provider reviews. (al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants dated 2/13/2013 re: Defendants' status report on outstanding discovery issues. (al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Richard H. Klapper) dated 2/13/13 re: GSEs' due diligence policies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: In a series of letters beginning February 1, the parties raised several issues related to discovery in this litigation and requested a conference. A conference was held on February 7, but certain issues remained outstanding at its conclusion. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held to address these issues on Thursday, February 14 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York., ( Status Conference set for 2/14/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/13/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Manisha M. Sheth) dated 2/12/13 re: Scheduling order for unstipulated loans in Merrill Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Manisha M. Sheth) dated 2/12/13 re: Scheduling order for unstipulated loans in UBS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Christine H. Chung and Michael Hanin) dated 2/12/13 re: Status update re due diligence loans. (al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/12/13 re: Tranche 3 and 4 expert schedule. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Tranche 3 and 4 Defendants (David J. Woll) dated 2/12/13 re: Proposed expert scheduling order. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Goldman Sachs (Richard H. Klapper) dated 2/12/13 re: FHFA's request of 2/1 that Goldman be ordered to compile data. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judges Cote and Thompson from FHFA dated 2/1/13 re: Expert scheduling in Tranche 3 and 4 cases. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from UBS (Robert A. Fumerton) dated 2/6/13 re: FHFA's letter of 2/1 re due diligence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from UBS (Penny Shane) dated 2/6/13 re: Deficiencies in FHFA's production of documents from Freddie Mac. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 2/6/13 re: Loss causation documents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Penny Shane) dated 2/6/13 re: FHFA's letter of 2/1 re due diligence. (al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from UBS (Robert A. Fumerton) dated 2/6/13 re: Status of reunderwriting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Sascha N. Rand) dated 2/6/13 re: UBS defendants' request for extension. (gr) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Defendants (Penny Shane et al.) dated 2/6/13 re: Letter from Ally of 2/5 re FHFA's production. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Counsel for FHFA dated 2/6/13 re: Defendants' letter of 2/4/13 re due diligence. (al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Kanchana Wangkeo Leung) dated 2/6/13 re: Letter from Ally of 2/5/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Ally (Robert J. Kopecky) dated 2/5/13 re: FHFA's response to interrogatories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Manisha M. Sheth) and JPMorgan Chase (Penny Shane) dated 2/1/13 re: Status report re matching in JPMorgan Chase. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Merrill Lynch (Ryan Scarborough) dated 2/5/13 re: Status update re loan file and guideline matching. (abl) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA (Manisha M. Sheth) dated 2/1/13 re: Loan file matching in UBS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit) (abl) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 259 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held to address the issues raised in these letters and any outstanding discovery issues on Thursday, February 7, at 9:30 AM (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/5/13) (abl) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard A. Klapper dated 2/4/13 re: FHFA's production of documents relating to causation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard H. Klapper dated 2/4/13 re: FHFA's production of documents relating to the GSEs' purchases of loans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit) (al) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Robert A. Fumerton dated 2/4/13 re: Responding to statements in FHFA's letter of February 1, 2013. Document filed by UBS Americas Inc. (al) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Christine H. Chung and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 2/1/13 re: Discovery relating to third party due diligence. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from David J. Woll dated 2/1/13 re: Expert scheduling for Tranche 3 and 4 cases. Document filed by Deutche Bank AG.(Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (al) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Manisha M. Seth dated 2/1/13 re: Loan file matching in Merrill Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(al) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Robert A. Fumerton dated 2/1/13 re: Status update on efforts to identify documents and underwriting guidelines relating to loan files in FHFA's proposed sample. (al) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Ryan Scarborough dated 2/1/13 re: Status of Merrill Lynch's efforts to identify and stipulate to loan files and underwriting guidelines applicable to FHFA's sample. (al) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED STIPULATION REGARDING ELECTRONIC SERVICE. IT IS HEREBY AGREED, by and between Plaintiff the Federal Housing Finance Agency, as Conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association and the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation ("Plaintiff"), and each defendant in the above-captioned actions ("Defendants"), through their undersigned counsel, to effectuate service in a more expeditious and efficient manner, as follows: 1. This Stipulation shall apply only to the service of Documents between the undersigned parties/attorneys, and not to their filing. Documents filed using the ECF system need not be separately emailed, subject to paragraph 4 of this Stipulation. "Document" shall be interpreted to include any exhibits or attachments to the document and shall include pleadings, correspondence, and discovery-related documents. 2. Plaintiff and Defendants agree that service may be effected on the relevant party by sending the Documents to all of the e-mail addresses for the relevant party listed in Exhibit A. 3. A Document served by e-mail that a party/attorney is required to sign may include the party's/attorney's actual signature or a signature block with the name of the signatory accompanied by "s/" or "/s/." 4. Documents filed under seal or Documents too large to be filed through the ECF system should be served via e-mail. 5. To the extent that a Document is too large to be delivered by email, the Document shall be served in hard copy or on electronic media via FedEx, overnight delivery, or hand delivery, with simultaneous e-mail notification of service by these other means. 6. Service effected pursuant to this Stipulation shall satisfy the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(b)(2)(E). Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(d) shall not apply to service effected under Rule 5(b)(2)(E) pursuant to this Stipulation. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/4/2013) (rjm) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to 80 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Alexander C. Frank, Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC, Craig S. Phillips, Saxon Asset Securities Company, Saxon Capital, Inc., Saxon Funding Management LLC, Steven S. Stern, David R. Warren, John E. Westerfield. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to 80 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Clary, Richard) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard A. Schirtzer and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 1/15/13 re: correcting a statement in FHFA's January 10, 2013 letter to the Court. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association. (abl) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard A. Schirtzer and Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 1/10/13 re: Discovery of documents relating to the GSEs' single family businesses. Document filed by The Federal Housing Finance Agency. (abl) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/11/2013) (djc) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Ann Moskowitz on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (Moskowitz, Lauren) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re: 80 Amended Complaint, Answer and Defenses to the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Howard Hubler, Gail P. McDonnell, Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC, Craig S. Phillips. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS VIRGINIA SECURITIES ACT CLAIMS: Now, therefore, It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's claims under section 13.1.522(A)(ii) of the VSA are dismissed as to the defendants identified in Column 2 of the attached chart and Plaintiff's derivative control-person claims under Section 13.1-522(c) of the VSA are dismissed as to the individual defendants identified in Column 3 of the attached chart. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/8/2013) (js) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER AMENDED COMPLAINT: that the time for the Morgan Stanley Defendants to answer the Amended Complaint in the above captioned matter is extended to, and includes, January 10, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/42013) (ja) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER re: (295 in 1:11-cv-06188-DLC) Letter, addressed to Your Honor from Counsel for the Fraud Defendants dated 1/2/2013 re: Seeking reconsideration of several recent discovery rulings. ENDORSEMENT: The rulings addressed in this letter were based on many factors. The parties were given a full opportunity to be heard. The application for reconsideration is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/4/2013) (ABL) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Your Honor from defendants' counsel in the fraud actions ("Fraud Defendants") dated 1/2/2013 seeking reconsideration of several recent dicovery rulings because they were based on a legal error concerning the applicable standard of discoverability and relevance. (gr) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re: 80 Amended Complaint, . Answer, Defenses, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Document filed by RBS Securities, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard Schirtzer and Kanchana Leung on behalf of the plaintiff dated 12/17/2012 re: mortgage fraud reports produced by the GSEs to OFHEO. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Edward Bennett on behalf of Bank of America and Merrill Lynch defendants dated 12/17/2012 re: mortgage fraud reports produced by the GSEs to OFHEO. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard Schirtzer and Kanchana Leung for the plaintiff dated 12/14/12 re: defendants' request for GSE compensation data. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard Klapper for all defendants dated 12/13/2012 re: defendants' request for GSE compensation data. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Selendy and others on behalf of FHFA dated 12/13/12 re: disputes regarding plaintiff''s document discovery requests. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Edward Bennett on behalf of defendants dated 12/13/12 re: FHFA's proposed revisions to deposition protocol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4A, # 5 Exhibit 4B)(gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Selendy and others on behalf of FHFA dated 12/13/12 re: revision to deposition protocol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard Klapper on behalf of all defendants dated 12/17/12 re: supplemental information in support of defendants' second request for non-PLS documents. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard Schirtzer and Kanchana Leung for FHFA dated 12/14/12 re: defendants' second set of requests for non-PLS documents. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard Klapper on behalf of all defendants dated 12/12/12 re: defendants' second set of requests for non-PLS documents. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Edward Bennett dated 12/17/12 re: source metadata. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Selendy et al. for the plaintiff dated 12/12/12 re: source metadata. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Edward Bennett for defendants dated 12/7/12 re: source metadata. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from N. Mahmood Ahmad for defendants dated 12/13/12 re: documents bearing on defendants' discovery requests related to GSE originator audits. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Christine Chung and Manisha Sheth for the plaintiff dated 12/13/12 re: GSE originator audits. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Edward Bennett dated 12/7/12 re: GSE originator audits. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard Schirtzer dated 12/13/12 re: GSE automated underwriting programs. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Edward Bennett dated 12/7/12 re: GSE automated underwriting programs. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Penny Shane dated 12/14/12 re: submission of defendants in further support of 12/7/12 discovery requests. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Richard Schirtzer and Kanchana Leung dated 12/13/12 re: plaintiff's response to defendants' 12/7/12 discovery requests. (gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Penny Shane dated 12/13/12 re: Supplemental exhibits in support of defendants' 12_7_12 discovery application. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit, # 43 Exhibit, # 44 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Penny Shane dated 12/7/2012 re: Defendants' single-family discovery requests. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(gr) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Hon. Denise Cote from Steven M. Cady dated 11/27/2012 re: writing to provide the Court an update on Plaintiff's and Defendants' joint efforts to secure loan files and underwriting guidelines relating to loans in Plaintiffs' sample. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Credit Rating Agency, # 2 Exhibit Letter to Due Deligence Firm)(gr) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Corrected Order Regarding Deposition Protocol (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/15/12) (SAH) (Entered: 12/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael S. Shuster dated 11/29/2012 re: Counsel writes to inform the Court that I am no longer a member of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP ("KBTF"), the firm acting as counsel to plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency ("FHF A") in the above-referenced matters. FHF A continues to be represented by KBTF, and no substitution of counsel has occurred nor has my new firm, Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP, been engaged to represent FHFA in these matters as co-counsel. Accordingly, Counsel respectfully requests that the Court enter an order removing me from the dockets and ECF distributions in connection with the above-referenced matters. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/5/2012) (js) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: These cases having been referred to me to oversee settlementdiscussions, it is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held toaddress the framework for these settlement discussions on Friday,January 11, 2013, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18D, United StatesCourthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. ( Settlement Conference set for 1/11/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/12/2012) (ago) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held to address the issues raised in defendants' December 7 letters and any outstanding discovery issues on Friday, December 14 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 15B, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than 10:00 AM on Thursday, December 13, defendants may submit any underlying documents that support their applications and the plaintiff shall submit its responsive letters and any supporting materials. Any submissions must comply with Rule 2C of this Courts Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/10/12) (SAH) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submission addressed to Judge Cote from all defendants dated 11/19/12 re: schedule for loan file re-underwriting and expert discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(gr) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Cote from FHFA dated 11/19/12 re: schedule for re-underwriting and expert discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Edward Bennett dated 11/19/12 re: plaintiff's production of documents. (gr) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from FHFA dated 11/19/12 re: status of discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Edward Bennett dated 11/19/2012 re: defendants' proposals regarding deposition protocol. (gr) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Selendy and others dated 11/19/2012 re: plaintiff's submission regarding deposition protocol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from all parties dated 11/19/12 Joint submission re deposition protocol. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(gr) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 197 Motion for Reconsideration. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/5/2012) (gr) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties: The time for each Defendant to answer or respond to the operative Complaint, to the extent not dismissed, in each respective action shall be extended by thirty (30) days beyond the time otherwise applicable under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/3/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 197 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 183 Memorandum & Opinion,,.. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Clary, Richard) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re; 183 Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION & ORDER: The above captioned actions are part of a suite of sixteen cases currently before this Court in which the Federal Housing Finance Agency ("FHFA" or "the Agency"), as conservator for Fannie Mae and Freddie Mac (together, the "Government Sponsored Enterprises" or "GSEs"), alleges misconduct on the part of the nation's largest financial institutions in connection with the offer and sale of certain mortgage-backed securities purchased by the GSEs in the period between 2005 and 2007. This Opinion addresses a joint motion by all defendants in fifteen actions to challenge the plaintiff's sampling methodology on the basis of Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, 509 U.S. 579 (1993). Accordingly, defendants' motion is denied. Defendants' October 26 motion to exclude is denied. (See Opinion & Order) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/3/2012) (ja) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL: Except as specifically provided herein, this Deposition Protocol shall govern all oral and written discovery depositions of party and non-party fact witnesses (including depositions of Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses), taken in the above-captioned actions pending in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York (the "SDNY Actions" or the "Actions"), which were brought by the Federal Housing Finance Agency ("FHFA"), as conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae") and the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation ("Freddie Mac") (together, the "Government Sponsored Entities" or "GSEs") against defendants to the Actions (collectively, "Defendants"). During the November 15, 2012 Conference in the SDNY Actions, and as previously indicated by the Court in the SDNY Actions in its May 15, 2012 order and at the June 13, 2012 hearing, the Court provided as follows with respect to oral and written discovery depositions of party and non-party fact witnesses (including depositions of Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses), to be taken in the Actions as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/27/2012) (djc) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM Attached to this Memorandum are blackline comparisons of the Courts November 26 Expert Scheduling Order with the parties respective submissions of November 19. These comparisons are provided as a courtesy to the parties and carry no controlling weight. Any issue related to the schedule or procedures for expert discovery in these cases is governed by the signed Order of November 26. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/27/12) (SAH) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The attached consolidated schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in these cases. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/26/12) (SAH) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER regarding the schedule for expert discovery. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/26/12) (SAH) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and others dated 11/14/12 re: defendants' request for production of documents related to plaintiff's forensic review of loan files. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(gr) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Jay B. Kasner dated 11/14/12 re: defendants' request for production of documents related to plaintiff's forensic review of loan files. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(gr) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and others dated 11/14/12 re: the status of discovery in FHFA Actions since Nov. 6, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(gr) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and others dated 11/14/12 re: re-underwriting and expert discovery schedules for cases in Trial Tranches 3 & 4. (gr) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from David Woll dated 11/14/12 re: re-underwriting and expert discovery schedules for cases in Trial Tranches 3 & 4. (gr) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and others dated 11/14/12 re: schedule governing loan reunderwriting and expert discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(gr) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and others dated 11/14/12 re: proposed deposition protocol. (gr) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants November 14 Submission On Expert Discovery And Deposition Protocol (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPINION AND ORDER: #102601 The defendants' July 13 motions to dismiss are granted with respect to: Plaintiff's claims of owner-occupancy and LTV-ratio fraud; Plaintiff's Virginia Securities Act claims for Certificates purchased before September 6, 2006; Plaintiff's Section 12(a)(2) and D.C. Blue Sky claims against RBS in connection with Certificates purchased from other parties. The motions to dismiss are denied in all other respects. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/19/2012) (rjm) Modified on 11/29/2012 (jab). (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE PROVISION OF LOAN TAPE INFORMATION TO NON-PARTIES. Plaintiff and Defendants, by and through their counsel of record hereby agree that Plaintiff shall establish and maintain an FTP site through which each Loan File Custodian will have access to the information as further specified in this stipulation and order primarily derived from loan tapes produced by Defendants for loans at issue in the Actions: (i) the entity that originated the loan or possesses the loan files; (ii) the Action in which the loan is at issue; (iii) the securitization that includes the loan; (iv) the loan number(s) for the loan; (v) the origination date for the loan; and (vi) the state where the mortgaged property is located. This information is publicly available, generally known, and not confidential or sensitive ("Non-Confidential Loan Tape Information"), and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/19/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Arnold Barnett, Ph.D. re: 149 Notice (Other) / Supplemental Declaration of Arnold Barnett, Ph.D. Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Lauren A. Moskowitz re: 149 Notice (Other) / Declaration of Lauren A. Moskowitz in Further Support of Defendants' Preliminary Daubert Motion to Exclude the October 10, 2012 Expert Report of Charles D. Cowan, Ph.D. Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY re: 149 Notice (Other) / Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Preliminary Daubert Motion to Exclude the October 10, 2012 Expert Report of Charles D. Cowan, Ph.D. Document filed by All Defendants. (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and others dated 11/5/12 re: Fannie Mae custodians. (gr) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and others dated 11/5/12 re: schedule for reunderwriting reports in non-UBS cases. (gr) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT of defendants regarding new and pending applications. (Certain exhibits filed under seal.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Penny Shane, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit, # 43 Exhibit, # 44 Exhibit, # 45 Exhibit, # 46 Exhibit, # 47 Exhibit, # 48 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and others on behalf of plaintiff Federal Housing Finance Agency dated 11/5/12 re: defendants' proposed motion to compel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Penny Shane dated 11/5/12 re: Proposed motion to compel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed motion, # 2 Memorandum in support, # 3 Declaration of Penny Shane)(gr) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and others dated 11/5/12 re: the status of the parties meet-and-confer sessions since October 15, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Philippe Z. Selendy and others dated 11/5/12 re: FHFA search terms and dates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Edward Bennett dated 10/26/12 re: FHFA search terms and dates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying discovery of privileged witness statements. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/9/12) (gr) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Jon Corey dated 11/8/12 re: privileged witness interviews. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(gr) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Amanda Davidoff dated 11/8/12 re: privileged witness interviews. Document filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit)(gr) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Jon Corey dated 11/6/12 re: privileged witness interviews. Document filed by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, AS CONSERVATOR FOR THE FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AND THE FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(gr) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 87 MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice Of Defendant Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC's Motion To Dismiss"). / Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude The October 10, 2012 Expert Report of Charles D. Cowan, Ph.D. Regarding Sampling Methodology. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Charles D. Cowan, Ph.D. In Response to Declaration of Arnold Barnett, Ph.D. in Opposition re: 87 MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice Of Defendant Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC's Motion To Dismiss").. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Nicholas F. Joseph in Opposition re: 87 MOTION to Dismiss ("Notice Of Defendant Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC's Motion To Dismiss").. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator For The Federal National Mortgage Association and The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Hanin, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Reginald R. Goeke dated 10/29/2012 re: response to the October 26, 2012 letter from FHFA. Document filed by Ally Financial Inc., GMAC Mortgage Group, Inc.(gr) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Kanchana Wangkeo Leung dated 10/26/2012 re: Request for appropriate relief against defendants AFL and GMACM. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(gr) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Philippe Selendy dated 11/5/2012 re: discovery disputes. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(gr) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Steven M. Cady dated 11/8/12 re: Bank of America subpoenas. Document filed by Bank of America Corporation.(gr) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Christine H. Chung dated 11/8/12 re: Bank of America subpoenas. Document filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator for the Federal National Mortgage Association. (gr) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Edward Bennett dated 11/5/12 re: Bank of America subpoenas. Document filed by Bank of America Corporation. (gr) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Christine Chung dated 10/28/12 re: Bank of America subpoenas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(gr) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that FHFAs October 28 application is granted. The Bank of America defendants shall forthwith withdraw the subpoenas served on the SEC and Zuckerman Spaeder, LLP. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/9/12)(SAH) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Concerning Modification of Defendants' Rule 45 Subpoenas Duces Tecum of Non-Party Originators. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/6/12) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E) (SAH) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT ORDER regarding coordination with FHFA v. RBS, 3:11-cv-01383-AWT (D. Conn.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/5/12, nunc pro tunc to 11/1/12) (SAH) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference will not be held over the telephone but will instead take place in-person tomorrow, November 6, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 15B of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/5/12)(SAH) (Entered: 11/05/2012)