Haney v. Blumenauer et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00989
District Judge Garr M. King, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 1:03 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Azonia Haney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Azonia Haney
v.
No Logo A Richard Walje, Defendant
No Logo Advance Publications, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Time Warner Telecom Inc.
No Logo Ally Financial Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amanda Fritz, Defendant
No Logo American City Business Journals, Defendant
No Logo Angelo Mazlo, Defendant
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ben S Bernanke"
No Logo BLACKROCK FUND, Defendant
No Logo Bonnie Krieger, Defendant
No Logo Brent Gale, Defendant
No Logo Brian T. Moynihan, Defendant
No Logo Charles T Munger, Defendant
No Logo Cornia Bergeland, Defendant
No Logo Dan Salzman, Defendant
No Logo Dania Johnson, Defendant
No Logo David De Brunner, Defendant
No Logo David Rockefeller, Defendant
No Logo David Sokol, Defendant
No Logo David Viniar, Defendant
No Logo Douglas L Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Stuver, Defendant
No Logo Earl Blumenauer, Defendant
No Logo Edward P O'Keefe, Defendant
No Logo Energy Power Holdings LLC,, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen International Aviation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Federal Reserve Bank, Defendant
Officially listed as "Federal Reserve System"
No Logo Fidelity National Title Financial, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gary Blackmer, Defendant
General Motors Acceptance Corporation General Motors Acceptance Corporation, Defendant
No Logo George Madison, Defendant
No Logo Golden West Financial Corporation, Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs & Co."
No Logo Gregg Kantor, Defendant
No Logo Gregory K Palm, Defendant
No Logo Gregory E Abel, Defendant
No Logo Henry Kissinger, Defendant
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary Rodham Clinton"
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"
No Logo International Council for Local Environmental Issues, Defendant
No Logo International Monetary Fund, Defendant
Dimon, Jamie Dimon, Jamie, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jamie Dimon"
No Logo Jane Peverett, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Merkley, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey D Sapiro, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey S. Cogan, Defendant
No Logo Jen Coney, Defendant
No Logo John A. Kitzhaber, Defendant
No Logo John R. Kroger, Defendant
No Logo Johns, Thomas, Defendant
No Logo John Savage, Defendant
No Logo Joyce Fred, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "JP Morgan Chase"
No Logo Julie Davie, Defendant
No Logo Kyle Knoll, Defendant
No Logo Lavonne Griffin-Valade, Defendant
No Logo Lee Hullinger, Defendant
No Logo Linda Barnett, Defendant
No Logo Linda Meng, Defendant
No Logo Manhatten Bank USA National Assoc., Defendant
No Logo Marc Williams, Defendant
No Logo Marilyn Bergsma, Defendant
No Logo Mark C Moench, Defendant
No Logo Mary Nekuda, Defendant
No Logo Mid Atlantic, Defendant
No Logo Mike Reese, Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Services-Systems Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nancy F Cody, Defendant
No Logo Neil Mc Farlane, Defendant
No Logo Neuberger Berman, Defendant
No Logo Newhouse News Group, Defendant
No Logo Nicholas Fish, Defendant
No Logo Northwest Natural, Defendant
No Logo Oregon Public Employees Retirement System, Defendant
No Logo Oregonian, Defendant
No Logo Pacificorp, Defendant
No Logo Pamela Strobel, Defendant
No Logo Parnassus Investments, Defendant
No Logo Patrick J Goodman, Defendant
No Logo Penny Evans, Defendant
No Logo Peter T. Sadowski, Defendant
No Logo Portland Development Commission, Defendant
No Logo Portland Police Bureau, Defendant
No Logo R. Patrick Reiten, Defendant
No Logo Randy Leonard, Defendant
No Logo Raymond R. Quirk, Defendant
No Logo Recontrust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elleanor H. Chin +1 503 778 5278 +1 503 778 5499 elleanorchin@dwt.com
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard B Cheney"
No Logo Ron Wyden, Defendant
No Logo Sam Adams, Defendant
No Logo Samuel Newhouse, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Sandy Mc Donnell, Defendant
No Logo Selig A. Zises Partners, Defendant
State Street Corporation State Street Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Stephen M Cutler, Defendant
No Logo Timothy V Geithner, Defendant
No Logo Tri-Co Metropolitan Transportation District of Oregon, Defendant
U.S. Bank, NA U.S. Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Bank National Association"
No Logo UNIFUND, Defendant
No Logo US Bankcorp, Defendant
No Logo Vanguard Group, Defendant
No Logo Vena Mc Coy, Defendant
No Logo Wachovia Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wachovia"
No Logo Wedge Abels, Defendant
No Logo William J Clinton, Defendant
No Logo World Savings, Defendant
No Logo Zalane Nunn, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance of Gregory A. Chaimov appearing on behalf of ReconTrust and Bank of America, N.A. Filed by on behalf of ReconTrust (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judgment. Signed on 9/15/2011 by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      OPINION AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Plaintiff has failed to state a claim in her Amended Complaint and this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 9/15/2011 by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
        Amended Complaint.Filed by Azonia Haney against All Defendants. (sd) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Preliminary Injunction Hearing held before Judge Garr M. King. Formal Order to follow. Plaintiff not present. Greg Chainmov present as counsel for defendant Bank of America and Recon Trust. Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Garr M. King presiding. (pc) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
            Letter from Plaintif Azonia Haney. Requesting telephone protocol for the Thursday September 15, 2011 Hearing. Filed by Azonia Haney. (sd) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
              Whistleblower First Response re: Restraining Order [TRO] 9 Filed by Azonia Haney. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 and 2) (sd) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 6 is GRANTED. I enjoin the sale of 8707 SE 347th Avenue, Boring, Oregon 97009-9749 on September 2, 2011. The Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect until at least September 15 at 8:30 AM, at which time I have set a preliminary injunction hearing. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all affected parties. Plaintiff is additionally directed to file and serve her Amended Complaint prior to the hearing on September 15. Until then, I accept that the defendants will be those identified in her Motion, and not those identified in her initial Complaint. The Clerk is directed to wait until plaintiff has filed her Amended Complaint to correct the docket identifying the proper defendants. Signed on 9/1/2011 by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MINUTES of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Sale 6 . Motion is taken under advisement as of this date. Order - Setting Oral Argument for 9/15/2011 at 08:30AM in Portland Courtroom 9A before Judge Garr M. King. Azonia Haney, Present as Pro Se Plaintiff. Court Reporter: Jill Erwin. Judge Garr M. King presiding. (pc) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                    Affidavit of Azonia Haney in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (# 6 ). Filed by Azonia Haney. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A & B) (eo) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                      Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Sale. Filed by Azonia Haney. (eo) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Order - Setting a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 6 for 9/1/2011 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King. (mja) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          OPINION AND ORDER: Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Motion-USDC Directive re Verified Complaint 2 . Signed on 8/24/2011 by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Garr M. King. (sd) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                              Motion Entitled by Plaintiff as: Directive: Any and/or All Foreclosure to be U.S. Constitutionally Contract Resolution: Owen M. Panner's Court Oral Argument requested. Filed by Azonia Haney. (sd) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                Complaint. ( NO Filing Fee, NO IFP). Jury Trial Requested: Yes.Filed by Azonia Haney against All Defendants. (sd) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 250 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?