Candela Corporation, et al v. Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 9:06-cv-00277
District Judge Ron Clark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 12:44 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Candela Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/27/2007 Leora Ben-Ami +1 212 878 8000 +1 212 878 3140
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Gordon White +1 713 787 1400

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/27/2007 Gasper J LaRosa +1 212 836 8000 +1 212 836 6527 glarosa@kayescholer.com
TERMINATED: 04/27/2007 Howard S Suh +1 212 836 8000 +1 212 836 6352 hsuh@kayescholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Gary Kitchen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Scott Kitchen +1 903 938 7200 +1 888 314 6035 gkitchen@gkadr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Baxter +1 903 927 2111 +1 903 927 2622 sbaxter@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara Jill Bindler +1 214 978 4944 +1 214 978 4044 jbindler@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven John Pollinger +1 512 692 8702 +1 512 692 8744 spollinger@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alfredo Silva +1 214 978 4212 +1 214 978 4044 asilva@mckoolsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC - Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ada Elene Brown +1 214 978 4088 +1 214 978 4044 aebrown@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gretchen Kristen Curran +1 512 692 8700 +1 512 692 8744 gcurran@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Robert Jacobs +1 214 978 4089 +1 214 978 4044 sjacobs@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary Tyson Snider +1 214 978 4048 +1 214 978 4044 rsnider@mckoolsmith.com
No Logo The General Hospital Corporation, D/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Gordon White +1 713 787 1400

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Gary Kitchen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Scott Kitchen +1 903 938 7200 +1 888 314 6035 gkitchen@gkadr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Baxter +1 903 927 2111 +1 903 927 2622 sbaxter@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara Jill Bindler +1 214 978 4944 +1 214 978 4044 jbindler@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ada Elene Brown +1 214 978 4088 +1 214 978 4044 aebrown@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gretchen Kristen Curran +1 512 692 8700 +1 512 692 8744 gcurran@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven John Pollinger +1 512 692 8702 +1 512 692 8744 spollinger@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alfredo Silva +1 214 978 4212 +1 214 978 4044 asilva@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary Tyson Snider +1 214 978 4048 +1 214 978 4044 rsnider@mckoolsmith.com
No Logo Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Cynosure, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by BECK REDDEN & SECREST LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Beck +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 dbeck@brsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Alan Cleveland +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 tcleveland@brsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Ann Flores +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 mflores@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T Gutkoski +1 617 526 6000
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (257) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Candela Corporation NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    FINAL JUDGMENT that Plaintiffs Candela Corporation and The GeneralHospital Corporation, d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, shall TAKE NOTHING from its claims against Defendant Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Claims 11, 12, 13, and 14 of United States Patent No. 5,810,801 are declared INVALID. Costs shall be taxed against Plaintiffs. All relief not granted specifically granted herein is DENIED. This is a Final Judgment disposing of all claims, and is appealable. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/29/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 01/03/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 259 Motion to Dismiss certain claims and counterclaims. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/2/09. (djh, ) (Entered: 01/03/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER denying 249 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting 253 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/30/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation, Massachusetts General Hospital. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 10/1/08, 10/6-7/08 before Judge Clark requested by Dr. Bruce Sand, MD (djh, ) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Opposition re 253 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Final Judgment) filed by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER that the parties' 255 Joint motion for entry of final exhibit lists and exhibits is denied. The parties shall submit electronic copies of their exhibits to the Deputy Clerk within 3 days business dayas of this Order. Exhibits that are to remain under seal shall be submitted on a separate disk. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/28/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                  Exhibit List Joint Motion For Entry Of Final Exhibit Lists And Exhibits by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 249 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON PALOMAR'S INVALIDITY DEFENSES filed by Candela Corporation. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Final Judgment) by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 249 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON PALOMAR'S INVALIDITY DEFENSES filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                          Exhibit List by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.. (fal, ) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                            Exhibit List by Candela Corporation.. (fal, ) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON PALOMAR'S INVALIDITY DEFENSES by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 248 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                JURY VERDICT. (fal, ) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                  LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 247 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                  SEALED Jury Notes. (fal, ) Modified on 10/15/2008 (fal, ). (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                    Jury Instructions. (fal, ) Modified on 10/15/2008 (fal, ). (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER re: replacement of hard copies of exhibits. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/10/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                        Trial Witness List. (fal, ) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial Day Seven completed on 10/7/2008. Jury returned verdict in favor of the Defendant. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial Day Six held on 10/6/2008. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial Day Five held on 10/3/2008. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Vol. 7, held on 10/7/2008 before Judge Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891 CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/29/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/10/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2009. (clb, ) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Vol. 6, held on 10/6/2008 before Judge Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891 CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. (clb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Vol. 5, held on 10/3/2008 before Judge Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891 CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. (clb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Vol. 4, held on 10/2/2008 before Judge Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891 CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. (clb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Vol. 3, held on 10/1/2008 before Judge Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891 CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. (clb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Vol. 2, held on 9/30/2008 before Judge Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409/654-2891 CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. (clb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Vol. 1, held on 9/29/2008 before Judge Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891 CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. (clb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Hearing held on 9/25/2008 before Judge Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891 CBickhamRMRCRR@gt.rr.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. (clb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc re 200 Proposed Jury Instructions, Defendant Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Supplemental Proposed Final Jury Instructions (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial Day Four held on 10/2/2008. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial Day Three held on 10/1/2008. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial - Day Two held on 9/30/2008. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial - Day One held on 9/29/2008. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Selection held in Lufkin on 9/29/2008. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2008: # 1 minutes) (djh, ). (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Final Pretrial Conference held in Lufkin on 9/25/2008. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc (Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/29/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 223 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSION OF DAVIS DECLARATON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT PALOMAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S DISCLOSURE OF PRIOR ART TO BE RELIED UPON AT TRIAL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Exhibit List Defendant's Third Supplemental Exhibit List by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc re 203 Notice (Other) First Amended Proposed Jury Verdict Form Of Defendant Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 09/28/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc re 201 Sealed Document,, Defendant Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Amended Objections to Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 09/28/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 217 Filed: 9/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Defendant's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Exhibits and Deposition Excerpts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 09/28/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Candela Corporation. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER denying 174 Defendant Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/24/08. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ada Elene Brown on behalf of The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation (Brown, Ada) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation re 184 Proposed Pretrial Order, 196 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT PALOMAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY TO BE OFFERED AT TRIAL (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation re 198 Proposed Jury Instructions PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED AMENDMENTS TO THE JOINT PROPOSED PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED SEPTEMBER 12, 2008 (DKT. NO. 198) (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/21/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation re 200 Proposed Jury Instructions, PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED AMENDMENTS TO SECTIONS III, IV, V, VI, VII AND XII OF THE JOINT PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED SEPTEMBER 12, 2008 (DKT. 200) (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Amended Proposal for Claim Term Chart, # 2 Plaintiffs' Amended Proposal for Appendix A)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/21/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation re 203 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FORM OF VERDICT (DKT. NO. 203) (Attachments: # 1 AMENDED ATTACHMENT A)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/21/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation re 184 Proposed Pretrial Order, PLAINTIFFS' SUBSTITUTED AMENDED ASSERTIONS FOR SECTIONS III, IV, V, AND VI OF THE JOINT PROPOSED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER (DKT. NO. 184) (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/21/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation re 200 Proposed Jury Instructions, NOTICE OF AMENDMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSAL FOR CLAIM TERM CHART AND PROPOSAL FOR APPENDIX A (Attachments: # 1 Claim Term Chart, # 2 Appendix A)(Snider, Rosemary) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rosemary Tyson Snider on behalf of The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation (Snider, Rosemary) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfredo Leopoldo Silva on behalf of The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation (Silva, Alfredo) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Scott Kitchen on behalf of The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation (Kitchen, Gary) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation re 184 Proposed Pretrial Order, PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation PLAINTIFFS' SUBMISSION OF THE PARTIES' FORMS OF VERDICT (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Proposed Findings of Fact by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' TRIAL EXHIBITS, DEPOSITION EXTRACTS AND WITNESSES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSAL FOR APPENDIX A, # 2 PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSAL FOR CLAIM TERM CHART, # 3 Appendix DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR APPENDIX A, # 4 DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR CLAIM TERM CHART)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 199 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 181 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 197 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.PARTIES' JOINT SUBMISSION OF SUMMARY OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation re 184 Proposed Pretrial Order, PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT PALOMAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY TO BE OFFERED AT TRIAL (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation re 184 Proposed Pretrial Order, PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT PALOMAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S COUNTER DESIGNATIONS (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION NOTICE OF JOINT STIPULATION RELATING TO CERTAIN MOTIONS IN LIMINE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE***SEALED NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation re 181 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE, 182 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant's Motions in Limine PARTIES' JOINT SUBMISSION OF SUMMARY ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 9/12/2008 (sm, ). Modified on 9/12/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 192 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 182 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant's Motions in Limine filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gretchen K. Harding, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 189 Defendant Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.s Unopposed Motion to File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/10/08. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gretchen Kristen Harting on behalf of The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation (Harting, Gretchen) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 189 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave To File A Reply In Support Of Its Motion for Summary Judgment by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 188 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 174 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas E. Milner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Affidavit Laura A. Handley, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9 Part 1, # 15 Exhibit 9 Part 2, # 16 Exhibit 9 Part 3, # 17 Exhibit 9 Part 4, # 18 Exhibit 10, # 19 Exhibit 11, # 20 Exhibit 12, # 21 Exhibit 13, # 22 Exhibit 14, # 23 Exhibit 15, # 24 Exhibit 16, # 25 Exhibit 17, # 26 Exhibit 18, # 27 Exhibit 19 Part 1, # 28 Exhibit 19 Part 2, # 29 Exhibit 19 Part 3, # 30 Exhibit 19 Part 4, # 31 Exhibit 19 Part 5, # 32 Exhibit 20, # 33 Exhibit 21, # 34 Exhibit 22, # 35 Exhibit 23, # 36 Exhibit 24, # 37 Exhibit 25, # 38 Exhibit 26 Part 1, # 39 Exhibit 26 Part 2, # 40 Exhibit 26 Part 3, # 41 Exhibit 26 Part 4, # 42 Exhibit 26 Part 5, # 43 Exhibit 26 Part 6, # 44 Exhibit 26 Part 7, # 45 Exhibit 26 Part 8, # 46 Exhibit 26 Part 9, # 47 Exhibit 27, # 48 Exhibit 28 Part 1, # 49 Exhibit 28 Part 2, # 50 Exhibit 29, # 51 Exhibit 30, # 52 Exhibit 32, # 53 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part 144 Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc motion for partial summary judgment. Plas Candela Corp and The General Hospital Corp dba Massachusetts General Hospital's claims regarding active inducement of infringement with respect to Palomar's Lux 154OZ handpiece are dismissed. That Candela will be limited to damages on its active inducement of infringement claims for the '999 patent which occurred after 6/13/06. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/5/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 145 Dft Palomar Medical Technologies Inc's motion for summary judgment of invalidity. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/5/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER than wasting time writing a lengthy order on the eve of trial, the court will dismiss the motions 178 180 and 183 and instead point the parties toward the Federal Rules of Evidence, and this court's scheduling order which although having been amended numereous times at the request of the parties, has been in effect since 3/23/07. Evidence will be admitted if it has been timely disclosed or produced, and a proper predicate for admissibility is laid. Both sides are cautioned against lodging objections to clearly admissible evidence included in the exhibit lists. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/5/8. (djh, ) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Pretrial Order JOINT PROPOSED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 183 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 180 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT UPDATING DAMAGES CALCULATION THROUGH DATE OF TRIAL AND TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR EXHIBIT LIST, 178 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE UPDATED EXPERT REPORTS OF THOMAS E. MILNER and DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ITS OWN SUCH SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTS filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant's Motions in Limine by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 181 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT UPDATING DAMAGES CALCULATION THROUGH DATE OF TRIAL AND TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR EXHIBIT LIST by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 179 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 178 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE UPDATED EXPERT REPORTS OF THOMAS E. MILNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 178 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE UPDATED EXPERT REPORTS OF THOMAS E. MILNER by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc Of Prior Art Under 35 U.S.C. Section 282 (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc Defendant's Notice Of Request For Daily Transcript And Real Time Reporting Of Trial Proceedings (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 174 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Michelle A. Flores in Support of Defendant's Motion, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that the dft may file a short motion for summary judgment on the issue described in the letter, not to exceed 10 pages on or before Friday, 8/22/08 at 4:00 pm. Plas' response shall not exceed 12 pages. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/19/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re presenting witnesses and compiling exhibit lists. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/7/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          *** CORRECTION TO TIME ON AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER-- Docket Call and Final Pretrial at 10:30 am ** (djh, ) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2008 at 010:30 AM before Judge Ron Clark. Jury instructions due by 9/12/2008 Jury Selection set for 9/29/2008 at 10:30AM before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/7/08. (ljw, ) Modified on 8/7/2008 (ljw, ). (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER On Agreed Terms that the jury shall be instructed in accordance with the courts interpretation of the disputed claim terms in the 801, '497, and '999 patents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 8/6/08. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM Opininion and Order construing claim terms of U S Patent NOS 5,810,801; 6,120,497 and 6,659,999. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 8/6/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven John Pollinger on behalf of The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation (Pollinger, Steven) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER CERTIFIED RECORDS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc of Intent to Offer Certified Records (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that the parties have agreed to a jury instruction and trial testimony on the future damages without the benefie of supplemental damages expert reports or additional depositions on this issue with the following provisos herein. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/29/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 144 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgments of No Direct Infringement and No Pre-Suit Damages filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 59, # 2 Exhibit 60)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 160 Response to Non-Motion, 158 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF JULY 9, 2008 by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE To Plaintiffs' Response To The Court's Order Of July 9, 2008 by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc to 158 Notice (Other) filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Flores, Michelle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2008: # 1 Certificate of Authorization) (ljw, ). (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 144 SEALED PATENT MOTION Reply Brief In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgments Of No Direct Infringement And No Pre-Suit Damages filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Declaration of Michelle A. Flores, # 2 Exhibit 55, # 3 Exhibit 56, # 4 Exhibit 57, # 5 Exhibit 58, # 6 Exhibit 59, # 7 Exhibit 60, # 8 Exhibit 61, # 9 Exhibit 62, # 10 Exhibit 63, # 11 Exhibit 64, # 12 Exhibit 65, # 13 Exhibit 66, # 14 Exhibit 67, # 15 Exhibit 68)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Candela Corporation of it's Response to the Court's Order of July 9, 2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order of July 9, 2008)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 157 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 145 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Failure to Enable the Claims of the Asserted Patents filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 148 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/16/08. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 155 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 153 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Laura A. Handley, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas E. Milner, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 154 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 152 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Craig Tolliver, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22 Part 1, # 25 Exhibit 22 Part 2, # 26 Exhibit 22 Part 3, # 27 Exhibit 22 Part 4, # 28 Exhibit 23, # 29 Exhibit 24, # 30 Exhibit 25, # 31 Exhibit 26, # 32 Exhibit 27, # 33 Exhibit 28, # 34 Exhibit 29, # 35 Exhibit 30, # 36 Exhibit 31, # 37 Exhibit 32, # 38 Exhibit 33, # 39 Exhibit 34, # 40 Exhibit 35, # 41 Exhibit 36, # 42 Exhibit 37, # 43 Exhibit 38, # 44 Exhibit 39, # 45 Exhibit 40, # 46 Exhibit 41, # 47 Exhibit 42, # 48 Exhibit 43, # 49 Exhibit 44, # 50 Exhibit 45, # 51 Exhibit 46, # 52 Exhibit 47, # 53 Exhibit 48, # 54 Exhibit 49, # 55 Exhibit 50 Part 1, # 56 Exhibit 50 Part 2, # 57 Exhibit 50 Part 3, # 58 Exhibit 50 Part 4, # 59 Exhibit 51, # 60 Exhibit 52 Part 1, # 61 Exhibit 52 Part 2, # 62 Exhibit 53, # 63 Exhibit 54, # 64 Exhibit 55, # 65 Exhibit 56, # 66 Exhibit 57, # 67 Exhibit 58)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 153 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 145 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Failure to Enable the Claims of the Asserted Patents filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 152 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 144 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgments of No Direct Infringement and No Pre-Suit Damages filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that within 10 days of the date of this order the parties shall notify the court of any objections to this proposed procedure by outlining the reasons why it may not be appropriate in this particular case. Absence of objections from the parties, the parties should instruct their damages experts to consider ongoing royalty rates or other future damages. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/9/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 148 MOTION to Strike 144 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgments of No Direct Infringement and No Pre-Suit Damages PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (DKT. NO. 144) FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER by Candela Corporation. (Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 7/3/2008 (djh) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 148 MOTION to Strike 144 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgments of No Direct Infringement and No Pre-Suit Damages PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (DKT. NO. 144) FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER MOTION to Strike 144 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgments of No Direct Infringement and No Pre-Suit Damages PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (DKT. NO. 144) FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 144 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgments of No Direct Infringement and No Pre-Suit Damages PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (DKT. NO. 144) FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document 144 Sealed Patent Motion. CD containing exhibit number 23 to document 144 which was rejected by the electronic court filing system due to an "embedded application" in the file in which Palomar attorney's could not file it electronically. Copies have been sent to Judge Clark via mail and the CD will be retained in Lufkin Division.(djh, ) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 145 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Failure to Enable the Claims of the Asserted Patents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32 Part 1, # 33 Exhibit 32 Part 2, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 145 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Failure to Enable the Claims of the Asserted Patents by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Lawrence S. Bass, M.D. in Support)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 144 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgments of No In Direct Infringement and No Pre-Suit Damages by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle A. Flores in Support, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 50, # 50 Exhibit 51, # 51 Exhibit 52, # 52 Exhibit 53, # 53 Exhibit 54, # 54 Errata 23 Part 1, # 55 Exhibit 46, # 56 Exhibit 49)(Flores, Michelle) Modified on 6/24/2008 (djh, ). (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/29/2008 10:30 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Judge Ron Clark. (fal, ) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2008 10:30 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. (fal, ) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 140 Deft's unopposed motion to continue. Thecurrent deadline will be extended until July 9, 2008. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/7/08. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadline Insofar As It Concerns One Third-Party Witness - Unopposed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Hema Sundaram, M.D., # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        The Court will limit Palomar to two motions for summary judgment, namely the two described in its letter brief in the section entitled Palomars First Motion for Summary Judgment as a Matter of Right. The court sees no benefit in allowing motions based on constructions which have not been made. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/5/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPROVED APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Julie S Turner for Candela Corporation. Receipt #9-3-890 Paid $25.00 (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that this case is set for final pretrial hearing on 9/5/08 at 9:00 am in Beaumont, Tx with jury selection on 9/9/08 at 10:30 am in Lufkin, Tx. The Court allocates 18 hours to pla and 18 hours dft in which to present their respective cases. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/13/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Jury Selection and Trial RESET for 9/9/2008 10:30 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Judge Ron Clark. (fal, ) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 9/5/2008 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. (fal, ) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 117 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Keith F. Giblin on 5/12/2008. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 124 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave. Candela will have until the expert discovery deadline of June 9, 2008 to take the deposition of these third party physicians. Signed by Judge Keith F. Giblin on 5/12/2008. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 131 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For Leave. Plaintiffs' will supplement and amend the expert reports of Robert Sherwin and Thomas E. Milner on or before May 26, 2008. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/2/2008. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT AND AMEND THE EXPERT REPORTS OF ROBERT A. SHERWIN AND THOMAS E. MILNER, PH.D. by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:setting case specific deadlines including Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2008 01:30 PM and Jury Selection set for 9/15/2008 10:30AM before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/1/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 129 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 117 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR'S 30(B)(6) WITNESS TO ANSWER QUESTIONS AS TO WHICH HE WAS IMPROPERLY INSTRUCTED NOT TO ANSWER SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR'S 30(B)(6) WITNESS TO ANSWER QUESTIONS AS TO WHICH HE WAS IMPROPERLY INSTRUCTED NOT TO ANSWER SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR'S 30(B)(6) WITNESS TO ANSWER QUESTIONS AS TO WHICH HE WAS IMPROPERLY INSTRUCTED NOT TO ANSWER SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR'S 30(B)(6) WITNESS TO ANSWER QUESTIONS AS TO WHICH HE WAS IMPROPERLY INSTRUCTED NOT TO ANSWER filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaraton of Craig Tolliver# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part 115 Dft Palomar Sealed Medical Technologies, Inc. The plas will produce 30(b)(6) designee of pla Candela Corp to testify regarding the conception and reduction to practice of the patents -in-suits. Mr. Puorro, Dr. Anderson, and Pla MGH's 30(b)(b) designee will be produced for deposition within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Keith F. Giblin on 4/24/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 119 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE CERTAIN THIRD-PARTY PHYSICIAN DEPOSITIONS AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 119 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE CERTAIN THIRD-PARTY PHYSICIAN DEPOSITIONS AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Craig N. Tolliver# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 117 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR'S 30(B)(6) WITNESS TO ANSWER QUESTIONS AS TO WHICH HE WAS IMPROPERLY INSTRUCTED NOT TO ANSWER filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 119 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE CERTAIN THIRD-PARTY PHYSICIAN DEPOSITIONS AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation.(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 115 SEALED PATENT MOTION Expedited Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce An Adequately Prepared Corporate Representative for Candela's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and to Compel Other Witnesses for Deposition Testimony filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the final pretrial is scheduled for 7/7/08 with jury selection and trial set for 7/14/08 at 10:30 am. Further ORDERED that by 4/21/08 at 4:00 pm the parties shall each submitt to the court an estimate of the time that pary needs to complete the presentation of testimony in this case. Statements should not be filed with the clerk, but should be submitted only to the Court. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/4/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 119 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE CERTAIN THIRD-PARTY PHYSICIAN DEPOSITIONS AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Sam Baxter# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17# 19 Exhibit 18# 20 Exhibit 19# 21 Exhibit 20# 22 Exhibit 21# 23 Exhibit 22# 24 Exhibit 23# 25 Exhibit 24# 26 Exhibit 25# 27 Exhibit 26# 28 Exhibit 27# 29 Exhibit 28# 30 Exhibit 29# 31 Exhibit 30# 32 Exhibit 31# 33 Exhibit 32# 34 Exhibit 33# 35 Exhibit 34# 36 Exhibit 35# 37 Exhibit 36# 38 Exhibit 37# 39 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 118 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 115 SEALED PATENT MOTION Expedited Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce An Adequately Prepared Corporate Representative for Candela's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and to Compel Other Witnesses for Deposition Testimony SEALED PATENT MOTION Expedited Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce An Adequately Prepared Corporate Representative for Candela's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and to Compel Other Witnesses for Deposition Testimony filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alfredo Silva# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 117 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR'S 30(B)(6) WITNESS TO ANSWER QUESTIONS AS TO WHICH HE WAS IMPROPERLY INSTRUCTED NOT TO ANSWER by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Craig N. Tolliver# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I Part 1# 11 Exhibit I Part 2# 12 Exhibit J# 13 Exhibit K# 14 Exhibit L# 15 Exhibit M# 16 Exhibit N# 17 Exhibit O# 18 Exhibit P# 19 Exhibit Q# 20 Exhibit R# 21 Exhibit S# 22 Exhibit T# 23 Exhibit U# 24 Exhibit V# 25 Exhibit W# 26 Exhibit X# 27 Exhibit Y# 28 Exhibit Z# 29 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 111 Sealed Patent Motion to compel. Signed by Judge Keith F. Giblin on 3/31/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION Expedited Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce An Adequately Prepared Corporate Representative for Candela's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and to Compel Other Witnesses for Deposition Testimony by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT RESPONSE Defendant Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Opposition to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 111 SEALED PATENT MOTION EXPEDITED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF INFORMATION UPON WHICH PALOMAR'S PROPOSED EXPERT DR. BASS RELIES FOR HIS OPINION filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Lawrence S. Bass in Support# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 112 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant's Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint# 3 Exhibit A to Palomar Medical Technologies. Inc.'s Amended Answer and Counterclaims)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 111 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION EXPEDITED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF INFORMATION UPON WHICH PALOMAR'S PROPOSED EXPERT DR. BASS RELIES FOR HIS OPINION by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Craig N. Tolliver# 2 Exhibit 1 Part 1# 3 Exhibit 1 Part 2# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4# 7 Exhibit 5# 8 Exhibit 6# 9 Exhibit 7# 10 Exhibit 8# 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 106 Motion to amend scheduling order as stated herein. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/20/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 106 MOTION to Expedite Extension of Upcoming Interim Deadlines Reply in Support of its Motion filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Beck, David) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 106 MOTION to Expedite Extension of Upcoming Interim Deadlines filed by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite Extension of Upcoming Interim Deadlines by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that the Court finds it necessary to implement procedures applying to future motions to be submitted in this case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/8/08. (djh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE REGARDING REPLY [DKT NO. 101] OF PALOMAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S ASSERTED INABILITY TO GO FORWARD WITH DAMAGES-RELATED 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION ON MARCH 3, 2008. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alfredo Silva# 2 Exhibit 31# 3 Exhibit 32# 4 Exhibit 33)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 103 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 96 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RELATING TO JOHNSON & JOHNSON DEVICES filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 101 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 97 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR TO PRODUCE DAMAGES-RELATED DOCUMENTS, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DAMAGES EXPERT REPORT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED REPORT, AND REQUEST FOR AN EXPEDITED H filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alfreda Silva# 2 Exhibit 28# 3 Exhibit 29# 4 Exhibit 30)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 96 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RELATING TO JOHNSON & JOHNSON DEVICES filed by Candela Corporation. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NEED CERT TO FILE DOC UNDER SEALSEALED PATENT OPPOSITION to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 97 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR TO PRODUCE DAMAGES-RELATED DOCUMENTS, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DAMAGES EXPERT REPORT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED REPORT, AND REQUEST FOR AN EXPEDITED H filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Cerveny# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Flores, Michelle) Modified on 2/25/2008 (djh, ). (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 98 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to re 96 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RELATING TO JOHNSON & JOHNSON DEVICES filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 97 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR TO PRODUCE DAMAGES-RELATED DOCUMENTS, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DAMAGES EXPERT REPORT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED REPORT, AND REQUEST FOR AN EXPEDITED HEARING by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alfredo Silva# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17# 19 Exhibit 18# 20 Exhibit 19# 21 Exhibit 20# 22 Exhibit 21# 23 Exhibit 22# 24 Exhibit 23# 25 Exhibit 24# 26 Exhibit 25# 27 Exhibit 26# 28 Exhibit 27# 29 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2008 (fal, ). (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PALOMAR TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RELATING TO JOHNSON & JOHNSON DEVICES by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Craig N. Tolliver# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 94 Response to Non-Motion, 93 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Supplemental Evidence Regarding Claim Construction by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 93 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO PALOMAR'S SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PALOMAR'S SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION linked to Main Document: 70 Claim Construction Brief,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part 87 Scheduling Order 33 . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/17/07. (djh, ) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 91 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 87 SEALED PATENT MOTION AND MEMORANDUM TO EXTEND CASE SCHEDULE BY THREE MONTHS filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 90 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 87 SEALED PATENT MOTION AND MEMORANDUM TO EXTEND CASE SCHEDULE BY THREE MONTHS filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G)(Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE OF UPDATED DISCLOSURE OF INDIVIDUALS LIKELY TO HAVE DISCOVERABLE INFORMATION (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc Notice of Service of Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Beck, David) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION AND MEMORANDUM TO EXTEND CASE SCHEDULE BY THREE MONTHS by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N)(Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED REFERRAL ORDER re 25 Order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/30/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 76 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT PALOMAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AND TESTIMONY filed by Candela Corporation. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 78 Claim Construction Brief PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO PALOMAR'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OF "THERMAL INJURY" by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 76 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT PALOMAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AND TESTIMONY filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Beck, David) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 78 Claim Construction Brief , Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Claim Construction of "Thermal Injury" by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Flores, Michelle) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith F. Giblin : Markman Hearing held on 11/13/2007. (Court Reporter Wendell Parks) (ksd ) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation.PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ON "THERMAL INJURY" (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Gordon White on behalf of The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation (White, Travis) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 76 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT PALOMAR MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AND TESTIMONY by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Craig N. Tolliver# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Candela Corporation JOINT NOTICE REGARDING ADDITONAL AGREEMENT ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION TERM (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing scheduled for November 8, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Ron Clark is RESCHEDULED to November 13, 2007 at 08:00 a.m. in Ctrm 1 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (sal) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Tutorial scheduled for November 6, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Ron Clark is RESCHEDULED to November 13, 2007 at 8:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin in Courtroom #1, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow, Beaumont. (sal) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that the parties are to confer by October 29, 2007 and determine which additional claim terms can be agreed upon, and which are unclear or ambiguous terms or words of art, which are actually in dispute and require construction by the court. The parties shall notify the court of any new agreements on claim terms by 4:00 P.M. on October 31. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/20/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLAINTIFF'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit 2)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L)(Beck, David) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT PLAINTIFFS'CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E Part 1# 6 Exhibit E Part 2# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc of Appearance of Timothy Cleveland (Beck, David) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc Change of Firm of Michelle A. Flores to Foley & Lardner, LLP (Beck, David) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura A Handley on behalf of Candela Corporation (Handley, Laura) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation.(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (Approved - fees paid) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Debra D Nye for Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (kjr, ) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc of Change of Firm for John T. Gutkoski (Beck, David) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 58 Answer to Complaint (Answer to Counterclaims of Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.) by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation, Candela Corporation. (Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.(Beck, David) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GOVERNING MARKMAN HEARING. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/26/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-3 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.(Beck, David) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, filed by The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital, Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc of Compliance With P-R 4-2(a) and the Court's Scheduling Order (Beck, David) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Candela Corporation, Massachusetts General Hospital NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Candela Corporation, Massachusetts General Hospital (Tolliver, Craig) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc of Invalidity Contentions and Production of Documents (Beck, David) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Privilege Logs. The time is extended to 6/15/07. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/31/07. (kjr, ) Modified on 7/16/2007 (kjr, ). (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Privilege Logs by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Beck, David) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/23/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Protective Order by Candela Corporation, Massachusetts General Hospital. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Protective Order# 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Enter Amended Protective Order)(Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Shumaker on behalf of Candela Corporation, Massachusetts General Hospital (Shumaker, John) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 44 Motion to Withdraw . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/27/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Candela Corporation of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Massachusetts General Hospital of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw Kaye Scholer, LLP as Counsel of Record by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pierre Jean Hubert on behalf of Candela Corporation, Massachusetts General Hospital (Hubert, Pierre) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Nasya Tolliver on behalf of Candela Corporation, Massachusetts General Hospital (Tolliver, Craig) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Robert Jacobs on behalf of Candela Corporation, Massachusetts General Hospital (Jacobs, Scott) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David J Beck on behalf of Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc (Beck, David) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Counterclaim by Candela Corporation and Massachusetts General Hospital.(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 4/20/2007 (kjr, ). (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 37 Motion to Amend P.R. 3-1 Disclosures. Candela is to serve its Amended Infringement Contentions within three business days of the entry of this order. The granting of this request shall not serve as a basis for an extension of any other deadline . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/14/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct Disclosures Under P.R.3-1 by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 35 Motion to Amend and resetting certain deadlines. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/11/07. (djh, ) Modified on 4/16/2007 (kjr, ). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 33 Scheduling Order, by Massachusetts General Hospital. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark : Case Management Conference held in Beaumont on 3/23/2007. Trial set for July, 2008. The Court will enter a scheduling order. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (bca, ) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting case-specific deadlines, including possible tutorial at 10:00 am on 11/6/07; claim construction hearing at 10:00 am on 11/8/07; docket call and final pretrial at 1:30 pm on 7/8/08; date parties should be prepared to try case is 7/8/08; jury selection at 9:00 am on 7/14/08. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/23/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mara Jill Bindler on behalf of Candela Corporation, Massachusetts General Hospital (Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (Approved - fees paid) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gasper J LaRosa for Candela Corporation. (kjr, ) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (Approved - fees paid) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Howard S Suh for Candela Corporation. (kjr, ) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (Approved) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas F Fleming for Candela Corporation (fees paid). (kjr, ) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR ALREADY DOCKETED SEE 14 ***APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Leora Ben-Ami for Candela Corporation. (FEE PAID) (ch, ) Modified on 3/20/2007 (ch, ). (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (APPROVED) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexandra C Fennell for Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Rcpt 9-1-583 $25) (djh, ) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (APPROVED) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John T Gutkoski for Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Rcpt 9-1-582 $25) (djh, ) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that discovery disputes and discovery motions, as well as certain other motions filed in this case, shall be REFERRED, at the discretion of, or in the absence of, the undersigned, to United States Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/12/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc of Agreed Proposal of Deadlines (Beck, David) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs, First COUNTERCLAIM of Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. against all plaintiffs by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.(Beck, David) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 6 Motion to Change Venue . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/22/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Initial Disclosures)(Beck, David) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File substitute sur-reply in response to dft's motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a). Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/15/07. (djh, ) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S AGREED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUBSTITUTE SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404 (a) by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Change Venue SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) filed by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Baxter, Samuel) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2007 (kjr, ). (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc, filed by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The clerk is directed to file the amended complaint attached to Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/7/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (APPROVED) APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Leora Ben-Ami for Candela Corporation. (djh, ) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL AS AN ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFF by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit 2# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Counterclaim by Candela Corporation.(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Patricia Davis# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E)(Beck, David) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Initial Rule 16 Management Conference set for 3/23/2007 01:30 PM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/19/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/19/07. (djh, ) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Candela Corporation by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc.(Beck, David) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Change Venue by Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Knight)(Beck, David) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candela Corporation. Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc served on 12/21/2006, answer due 1/10/2007. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (kjr, ) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc. and returned to atty for service (kjr, ) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Candela Corporation (kjr, ) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Palomar Medical Technologies, Inc (Filing fee $ 350 - rcpt 2-1-2162) , filed by Candela Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kjr, ) Modified on 12/20/2006 (kjr, ). (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?