Premier International Associates, LLC. v. Microsoft Corp. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00396
District Judge David Folsom, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Cellco Partnership, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Pleasant Valley State Prison

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P Anderson

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P. Anderson +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 kanderson@wileyrein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian H Pandya +1 202 719 7457 +1 202 719 7049 bpandya@wileyrein.com
Dell, Inc. Dell, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Dell International L.l.c.
Dell Computer Corporation Officer/Director, Dell Computer Corporation
Officer/Director, Perot Systems Corp
Officer/Director, Quest Software, Inc.
VMware, Inc. Officer/Director, VMware, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/05/2010 Michael C. Barrett +1 512 474 5201 +1 512 536 4598 mbarrett@fulbright.com
TERMINATED: 05/05/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Robert Benson +1 512 536 3003 +1 512 536 4598 cbenson@fulbright.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Lenovo (United States), Inc. Lenovo (United States), Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, PRO HAC VICE Russell B. Hill +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 hillr@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Mansi H. Shah +1 312 324 1790 +1 312 324 1001 mshah@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
Lg Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc. Lg Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 James A Fussell, III +1 202 626 7713 +1 202 783 2331 fussell@fr.com
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Microsoft Corp."
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2009 David J Healey +1 713 877 1515

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
Motorola, Inc. Motorola, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Broadcast.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Nextel Partners Inc
Officer/Director, Sps Spinco Inc
Officer/Director, Vocera Communications, Inc.
Officer/Director, Shotspotter, Inc.
Officer/Director, Tut Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Clearwire Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Brian K Erickson +1 512 457 7059 +1 512 457 7001 brian.erickson@dlapiper.com
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Wayne Manford Harding +1 512 457 7000 +1 512 457 7001 wayne.harding@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Napster, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Steven Mark Geiszler +1 214 259 0951 +1 214 259 0910 steven.geiszler@dentons.com

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Google, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/11/2009 John L LaBarre +1 650 214 3728 +1 650 618 1806 jlabarre@google.com
Real Networks Real Networks, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Real Networks, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Mark Geiszler +1 214 259 0951 +1 214 259 0910 steven.geiszler@dentons.com

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Google, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/11/2009 John L LaBarre +1 650 214 3728 +1 650 618 1806 jlabarre@google.com
No Logo Rhapsody International Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Boudreau cboudreau@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Marie Champion +1 212 351 5361 +1 212 351 5281 achampion@gibsondunn.com
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2009 Robert A. Auchter +1 202 862 1009 +1 202 862 1093 RAuchter@deweyballantine.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Brian K Erickson +1 512 457 7059 +1 512 457 7001 brian.erickson@dlapiper.com
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Wayne Manford Harding +1 512 457 7000 +1 512 457 7001 wayne.harding@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2009, PRO HAC VICE Anthony W. Shaw +1 202 862 1000 +1 202 862 1093 ashaw@deweyballantine.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2009 Robert A. Auchter +1 202 862 1009 +1 202 862 1093 RAuchter@deweyballantine.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Brian K Erickson +1 512 457 7059 +1 512 457 7001 brian.erickson@dlapiper.com
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Wayne Manford Harding +1 512 457 7000 +1 512 457 7001 wayne.harding@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/03/2009, PRO HAC VICE Anthony W. Shaw +1 202 862 1000 +1 202 862 1093 ashaw@deweyballantine.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
SanDisk Corporation SanDisk Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Sandisk Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Keith Bryan Davis +1 214 220 3939 +1 214 969 5100 kbdavis@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Thomas L Giannetti +1 212 596 9000
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott F Partridge +1 713 229 1569 +1 713 229 7769 scott.partridge@bakerbotts.com
Viacom, Inc. Viacom, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Blockbuster, Inc.
Officer/Director, New Viacom Corp.
Officer/Director, Redstone Sumner M
CBS Outdoor Americas Inc. Officer/Director, CBS Outdoor Americas Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Steven Mark Geiszler +1 214 259 0951 +1 214 259 0910 steven.geiszler@dentons.com

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Google, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/11/2009 John L LaBarre +1 650 214 3728 +1 650 618 1806 jlabarre@google.com
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Time Warner Telecom Inc.
Officer/Director, Ncr Corp
Officer/Director, At Home Corp
Officer/Director, Interactive Network Inc /ca
Officer/Director, Net2phone, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mail.com, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Bryant Carroll Boren, Jr. +1 650 739 7501 +1 650 739 7601 bryant.c.boren@bakerbotts.com
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant

Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Lenovo (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. Lenovo (Singapore) Pte. Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lenovo Group LTD"

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, PRO HAC VICE Russell B. Hill +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 hillr@howrey.com
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Ruhi Kumar +1 213 452 1220 +1 213 452 1222 kumarr@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Mansi H. Shah +1 312 324 1790 +1 312 324 1001 mshah@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
LG Electronics USA, Inc. LG Electronics USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Jude McKeon +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 mckeon@fr.com
Nokia Corporation Nokia Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Nokia Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by The Roth Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Amanda Aline Abraham +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 aa@rothfirm.com
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Brendan Clay Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 br@rothfirm.com
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Carl R Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 cr@rothfirm.com
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sprint Nextel Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Michael O Cummings +1 212 841 1198 +1 212 441 9198 mcummings@cov.com
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Jeffrey B Elikan +1 202 662 5597 +1 202 778 5597 jelikan@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, PRO HAC VICE George F Pappas +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 778 5594 gpappas@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Toshiba America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott F Partridge +1 713 229 1569 +1 713 229 7769 scott.partridge@bakerbotts.com
Toshiba Corporation Toshiba Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Toshiba Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott F Partridge +1 713 229 1569 +1 713 229 7769 scott.partridge@bakerbotts.com
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Kevin P. Anderson +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 kanderson@wileyrein.com
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010 Brian H Pandya +1 202 719 7457 +1 202 719 7049 bpandya@wileyrein.com
No Logo Premier International Associates, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com

Represented by Cook Alex McFarron Manzo Cummings & Mehler, Ltd.

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Represented by Jones & Jones - Marshall

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by The Henry Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Claire Abernathy +1 903 230 9874 +1 903 230 9875 claire@dhenryfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vanek, Vickers & Masini, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Robert Moran, Jr. +1 312 224 1500 +1 312 224 1510 jmoran@vaneklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Michael Vanek +1 312 224 1500 +1 312 224 1510 jvanek@vaneklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A Vickers +1 312 224 1500 +1 312 224 1510 tvickers@vaneklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/29/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
No Logo Robert W Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (387) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/17/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Premier International Associates, LLC.(an Illinois Limited Liability Company), Real Networks, Inc.(a Washington Corporation), Rhapsody International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER, granting 385 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (David M. Mundt and Panasarn Aim Jirut) filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.., Attorney Panasarn Aim Jirut and David M Mundt terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/9/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (David M. Mundt and Panasarn Aim Jirut) by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          AGREED MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER:( Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2011 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom., Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2010., Discovery due by 4/15/2011., Joinder of Parties due by 7/8/2010., Jury instructions due by 9/19/2011, Jury Selection set for 10/4/2011 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2011.), granting 383 Joint MOTION To Modify Docket Control Order filed by Premier International Associates, LLC., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Rhapsody International Inc., Real Networks, Inc.., (Tutorial set for 9/15/2010 in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom., Markman Hearing set for 9/16/2010 in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/7/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION To Modify Docket Control Order by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Premier International Associates, LLC., Real Networks, Inc., Rhapsody International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Docket Control Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
              ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION To Modify Docket Control Order by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Premier International Associates, LLC., Real Networks, Inc., Rhapsody International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Control Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/3/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER - before the court is Parties Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-3 380 . The parties have reached agreement on all constructions, the parties request that the claim construction hearing dated 9/16/2010 be stricken. The court hereby CANCELS the Claim Construction Hearing previously set for 9/16/2010. The court also hereby CANCELS any technical tutorial associated therewith. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/7/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                  PARTIES' JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL PATENT RULE 4-3 filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Premier International Associates, LLC.(an Illinois Limited Liability Company), Real Networks, Inc.(a Washington Corporation), Rhapsody International Inc., Verizon Communications Inc.. (Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 376 Motion for Leave to File its Answers to Defendants Verizon Wireless and RealNetworks, Inc.'s Counterclaims. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/1/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                      AMENDED ANSWER to 358 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless' Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                        AMENDED ANSWER to 359 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant RealNetworks, Inc.'s Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Premier International Associates, LLC. (Plaintiff's Notice of P.R. 4-2 Disclosures) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Real Networks, Inc., Rhapsody International Inc. (Champion, Anne) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Real Networks, Inc. (Champion, Anne) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Rhapsody International Inc. (Champion, Anne) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to 368 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Premier International Associates, LLC..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sandisk Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(Lippetz, Gregory) Modified on 6/18/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 366 Motion for Leave to Extend the Deadline to File its Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims to Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement and Defendant Rhapsody International Inc.s Answer filed on June 14, 2010 is deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/15/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                          CORRECTED ANSWER to 350 Amended Complaint, Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Rhapsody International Inc..(Champion, Anne) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** ANSWER to 350 Amended Complaint, Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Rhapsody International Inc..(Champion, Anne) Modified on 6/14/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims by Rhapsody International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anne Champion)(Champion, Anne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Premier International Associates, LLC. (Notice of Amended P.R. 4-1 Disclosure) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Real Networks, Inc., Rhapsody International Inc. (Champion, Anne) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to 358 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Plaintiff's ANSWER to 359 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Real Networks, Inc., Rhapsody International Inc. (Champion, Anne) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document: 358 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                            REALNETWORKS, INC.S ANSWER to 350 Amended Complaint, Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC.(an Illinois Limited Liability Company) by Real Networks, Inc.(a Washington Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER to 350 Amended Complaint, (Third Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Rhapsody International Inc. waiver sent on 5/12/2010, per agreement of parties answer due 30 days from May 12, 1020 namely 6/11/10 (ehs, ) Modified on 5/19/2010 (ehs, ). (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Marie Champion on behalf of Real Networks, Inc.(a Washington Corporation), Rhapsody International Inc. (Champion, Anne) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles J Boudreau on behalf of Real Networks, Inc.(a Washington Corporation), Rhapsody International Inc. (Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Josh A Krevitt on behalf of Real Networks, Inc.(a Washington Corporation), Rhapsody International Inc. (Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 351 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Thad Heartfield; Michael C Barrett and Christopher Robert Benson terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/5/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 349 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/5/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (s) by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement) against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Real Networks, Inc., Rhapsody International Inc., filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  AGREED PROPOSED MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/8/2010. Jury Selection set for 10/4/2011 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/30/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 346 Motion for Extension of Time to modify docket control order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/30/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Modify the Docket Control Order by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Premier International Associates, LLC.(an Illinois Limited Liability Company), Real Networks, Inc.(a Washington Corporation), Verizon Communications Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- AGREED PROPOSED MODIFIED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Champion, Anne) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        ANSWER to 340 Amended Complaint, (to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Real Networks, Inc..(Champion, Anne) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWER to 340 Amended Complaint, (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Premier International Associates, LLC. (Notice of P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 Disclosures) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Marie Champion on behalf of Real Networks, Inc. (Champion, Anne) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 339 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/1/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement) against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Real Networks, Inc., filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Real Networks, Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless of LPR 4-1 Disclosures (Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Premier International Associates, LLC. (Notice of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 333 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eugene M Cummings and Konrad V Sherinian terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/12/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/12/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Real Networks, Inc., Premier International Associates, LLC., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Protective Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 330 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC., Lenovo Group LTD, and Lenovo (United States) Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/9/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER, granting 329 Agreed MOTION for Identification of Agreed Mediator filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.., Robert W Faulkner added ad mediator.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/9/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Premier International Associates, LLC., Lenovo Group LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Identification of Agreed Mediator by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER; re: general discovery order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/24/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:( Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2010., Joinder of Parties due by 4/20/2010., Jury instructions due by 9/19/2011, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2011.), ( Technical Tutorial set for 9/15/2010 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom., Markman Hearing set for 9/16/2010 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.) Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2011 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Jury Selection set for 10/4/2011 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/23/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 323 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC., Toshiba Corp., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.:, Toshiba Corp. and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/23/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION For Entry of Docket Control Order by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Docket Control Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Premier International Associates, LLC. (Plaintiff's Notice of Initial Disclosures) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Toshiba Corp., Premier International Associates, LLC., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Notice of Initial Disclosures) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 319 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC., Dell Inc.; Dell Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/19/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 318 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/19/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal by Premier International Associates, LLC., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Initial Disclosures, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 316 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC., Microsoft Corp., Microsoft Corp. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/12/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal by Premier International Associates, LLC., Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Rule 16 Management Conference held on 11/4/2009. (Court Reporter Melanie Harris.) (lfs, ) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Renee Holland on behalf of Dell Inc. (Holland, Sarah) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Docket Control Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for the purpose conducting the scheduling conference set for November 4, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint LENOVO GROUP LTD.'S ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PREMIER INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATES LLC'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by Lenovo Group LTD.(Hill, Russell) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 308 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/22/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 307 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC., Sprint Spectrum LP, Sprint Spectrum LP terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/22/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal by Premier International Associates, LLC., AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Premier International Associates, LLC., Sprint Spectrum LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS SPECIFIED HEREIN granting 303 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC., Toshiba America, Inc.; Verizon Communications Inc.; AT&T Inc. and Sprint Nextel Corp. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, granting 302 Stipulation of Dismissal; Napster, Inc., terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE granting 301 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Viacom Inc., Premier International Associates, LLC., Viacom Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 303 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Premier International Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal by Napster, Inc.,, Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal by Viacom Inc., Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Terminate Deadlines and HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, granting 296 Agreed MOTION to Extend The Date of the Scheduling Conference filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.., ( Scheduling Conference reset for 11/4/2009 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/14/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 297 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC., Motorola Inc.,, Motorola Inc., terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/14/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, granting 295 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John L. LaBarre filed by Viacom Inc., Napster, Inc.,, Real Networks, Inc.., Attorney John L LaBarre terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/11/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal by Motorola Inc.,, Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Extend The Date of the Scheduling Conference by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John L. LaBarre by Viacom Inc., Real Networks, Inc., Napster, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 292 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC and Nokia Inc., Nokia Corp. Nokia Corp. and Nokia Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/9/2009. (sm, ) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 291 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC. DISMISSING claims against Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc. and Samsung Electronics America Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/9/2009. (sm, ) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal by Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc., Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, granting 289 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sandisk Corp.., Sandisk Corp. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/3/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Sandisk Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: 8/4/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 287 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Premier International Associates, LLC., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.; LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.; and LG Electronics, Inc.; terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/4/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, AND DISCOVERY ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2009 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/3/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, granting 284 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.., Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/29/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by Premier International Associates, LLC.(an Illinois Limited Liability Company). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Order Lifting StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER LIFTING STAY, granting 275 MOTION To Lift The Stay of Proceedings filed by Premier International Associates, LLC... Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/27/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 275 MOTION To Lift The Stay of Proceedings filed by Premier International Associates, LLC. the Court will assume that Plaintiffs above-referenced motions are unopposed by those parties that have not filed a response unless such parties respond within five (5) days of this Order.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/17/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, granting 278 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert A. Auchter and Anthony W. Shaw filed by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc.., Attorney Robert A Auchter and Anthony W Shaw terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/3/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Sandisk Corp. re 275 MOTION To Lift The Stay of Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Galvan, Hilda) Modified on 6/3/2009 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 275 MOTION To Lift The Stay of Proceedings filed by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 278 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert A. Auchter and Anthony W. Shaw by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc. re 275 MOTION To Lift The Stay of Proceedings of No Opposition and Reservation of Rights (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Motorola Inc., re 275 MOTION To Lift The Stay of Proceedings of No Opposition and Reservation of Rights (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION To Lift The Stay of Proceedings by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, granting 272 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeffrey R. Cole filed by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc.., Attorney Jeffrey R Cole terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/23/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, granting 271 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeffrey R. Cole filed by Motorola Inc.,., Attorney Jeffrey R Cole terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/23/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: 4/22/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeffrey R. Cole by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: 4/22/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeffrey R. Cole by Motorola Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, granting 269 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Microsoft Corp.., Attorney Garland T Stephens; David J Healey and John R Lane terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/21/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Kevin Sean Kudlac on behalf of Microsoft Corp. (Kudlac, Kevin) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Premier International Associates, LLC. (Notice of Action in a Related Matter) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Abernathy, Nancy) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Premier International Associates, LLC. (Notice of Action in a Related Matter) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Abernathy, Nancy) Modified on 4/16/2009 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory L Lippetz on behalf of Sandisk Corp. (Lippetz, Gregory) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corp., Lenovo Group LTD Notice of Change of Contact Information (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER dismissing 220 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing 163 Motion to Dismiss. The Court has stayed this case pending reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 &6,763,345 by the U.S. Patent & Trademark Office. Dkt. No. 254. Because this case is stayed, theseMotions are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling once the reexaminationprocess is complete and the stay has been lifted. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/18/08. (mpv, ) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: 9/29/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 261 Motion To Allow Microsoft Corp. To File In The United States Patent and Trademark Office A Request For Inter Partes Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,763,345. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that MicrosoftCorp.s Agreed Motion To Allow Microsoft Corp. To File In the United States Patent AndTrademark Office A Request For Inter Partes Reexamination Of U.S. Patent No. 6,763,345 ishereby GRANTED in its entirety, and that the Microsoft Corp. shall be permitted to file an interpartes reexamination request in the Unites States Patent and Trademark Office for U.S. PatentNo. 6,763,345 that is substantively the same as Microsofts August 29, 2008 request forreexamination, with the one exception that the new reexamination request will be a request forinter partes reexamination. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/29/08. (mpv, ) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION To Allow Microsoft Corp. To File In The United States Patent and Trademark Office A Request For Inter Partes Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,763,345 by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, Matthew) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Lenovo Group LTD served on 7/9/2008 by KWONG, Chung-man, Bailiff's Assistant of the High Court of Hong Kong, answer due 7/29/2008. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, granting 257 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Rachel Adams filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.., Attorney Rachel A Adams terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/27/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ruhi Kumar for Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Lenovo Group LTD. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3902 (ch, ) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Rachel Adams by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Russell B Hill for Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Lenovo Group LTD. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3866 (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mansi S Shah for Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Lenovo Group LTD. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3866 (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that this case be STAYED. The stay will encompass discovery and motion practice unless leave of this Court is obtained. The parties shall notify the Court when the reexamination proceedings are complete - re 135 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/4/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Sprint Spectrum LP. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Viacom Inc.. (LaBarre, John) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Real Networks, Inc.. (LaBarre, John) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Napster, Inc.,. (LaBarre, John) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Acceptance Required for Stay by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc.. (Altersohn, Allison) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Motorola Inc.,. (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Samsung Electronics America Inc.. (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Stubbs, Samuel) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.'s Notice of Acceptance of Stipulation as a Condition to Stay Litigation by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Microsoft Corp.. (Healey, David) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Sandisk Corp.. (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Partridge, Scott) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re 234 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Dell Inc.. (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER OR COMPETING TERMS granting 236 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/28/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Protective Order or Competing Terms by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Viacom Inc., Real Networks, Inc., Napster, Inc.,, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Motorola Inc.,, Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc., Sandisk Corp., Premier International Associates, LLC., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, AT&T Mobility LLC, Sprint Spectrum LP, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Microsoft Corp., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR WRONG CASE***NOTICE by LG Electronics, Inc. Notice of Compliance (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 5/20/2008 (ehs, ). (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting as modified 135 Motion to Stay; granting as modified 141 Motion to Stay; It is further ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days, Defendants shall either (1) file with the Court a signed copy of the following stipulation, or (2) notify the Court in writing of their decision not to sign the following stipulation: It is further ORDERED that as to each Defendant entering into the stipulation, a stay of all proceedings shall ensue.. Signed by Judge Judge David Folsom on 5/19/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 230 Motion appointing Celeste Ingalls as international process server. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/14/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 220 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Service Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 4(m) filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Abernathy, Nancy) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER GRANTING 225 Consent MOTION For Entry of Docket Control Order filed by Premier International Associates, LLC. Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2008. Joinder of Parties due by 11/24/2008. Motions due by 11/18/2009. Pretrial Order due by 1/18/2010.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION To Appoint International Process Server by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 227 Motion for Extension of Time to submit Agreed Protective Order or Competing Terms, Parties shall be permitted to submit an agreed protective order or competing terms on 5/27/08. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Edwin Jones (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Protective Order or Competing Terms by Viacom Inc., Real Networks, Inc., Napster, Inc.,, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Motorola Inc.,, Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc., Sandisk Corp., Premier International Associates, LLC., AT&T Mobility LLC, Sprint Spectrum LP, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Microsoft Corp., Verizon Communications Inc., AT&T Inc., Dell Inc., Lenovo Group LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Premier International Associates, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION For Entry of Docket Control Order by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Docket Control Order)(Abernathy, Nancy) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 220 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Service Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 4(m) filed by Lenovo Group LTD. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 222 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server to Serve a Corporation in a Foreign Country. Crowe Foreign Services is appointed Special Process Server for the purpose of serving process on the dft Lenovo Group LTD in Hong Kong. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/30/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION To Appoint Special Process Server to Serve a Corporation in a Foreign Country by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 220 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Service Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 4(m) filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Abernathy, Nancy) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Service Under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 4(m) by Lenovo Group LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 217 Motion for Leave to Amend Its Identification Of Infringed Claims;. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/14/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Its Identification of Infringed Claims by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER regarding motion practice, the Court finds it necessary to implement procedures applying to future motions to be submitted in recently filed cases. This procedure is necessary to allow the Court to manage its docket in a timely fashion. The procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/10/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom : Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/2008, Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2008 re 135 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345 filed by Viacom Inc., Sandisk Corp., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Motorola Inc.,, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Nokia Corp., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Nokia Inc., Microsoft Corp., Dell Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Napster, Inc.,, Real Networks, Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., 163 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Premier International Associates, LLC. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Electronic Addresses (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. (Fussell, James) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael O Cummings for Sprint Nextel Corp. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 6-1-13304. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John R Lane for Microsoft Corp.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID)6-1-13301. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 163 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties : Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2008 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. The Court shall hear this matter after the scheduling conference and motion to stay. Each side shall have fifteen (15) minutes to present their arguments.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/2/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 206 Motion to Modify Date for Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3 - 1; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall identify the asserted claims that are allegedly infringed by each Defendant pursuant to P.R. 3-1(a) on or before April 3, 2008. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall comply with the remaining provisions of P-R. 3-1 on a date to be determined by the Court at the scheduling conference of April 7,2008.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/1/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 205 Motion to Modify Date for Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3 - 1; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall identify the asserted claims that are allegedly infringed by each Defendant pursuant to P.R. 3-1(a) on or before April 6, 2008. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall comply with the remaining provisions of P-R. 3-1 on a date to be determined by the Court at the scheduling conference of April 7,2008.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/31/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION To Modify Date for Disclosure Of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION To Modify Date for Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garland T Stephens on behalf of Microsoft Corp. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 135 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345 :Motion Hearing and Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2008 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side shall have 15 minutes to present their arguments. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/25/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 197 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessie Alliene Amos terminated as to Lenovo (United States) Inc. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/25/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 194 Motion for Leave to File. that the amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims filed byRealNetworks, Inc. on March 14, 2008 (and refiled on March 18, 2008) be entered in this case; ORDERED that Plaintiffs earlier response to RealNetworks, Inc.s Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims will be deemed to stand against RealNetworks, Inc.s first Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims; and Further ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendants Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties is denied as moot with respect to RealNetworks, Inc.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/25/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 193 Motion for Leave to File. The amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Napster, Inc. on March 14, 2008 (and refiled on March 18, 2008) be entered in this case; Plaintiffs earlier response to Napster, Inc.s Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims will be deemed to stand against these Napster, Inc.s first Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims. Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendants CounterclaimsAlleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties is denied as moot with respect to Napster, Inc.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/25/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 192 Motion for Leave to File. that the amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Viacom Inc. on March 14, 2008 (and refiled on March 18, 2008) be entered in this case; that Plaintiffs earlier response to Viacom Inc.s Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims will be deemed to stand against Viacom Inc.s first Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims; and Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendants Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties is denied as moot with respect to Viacom Inc.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/25/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting re 185 Consent MOTION IN RESPONSE TO PREMIER'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties. Amended answers filed by Microsoft, Samsung, and Motorola on March 14, 2008 be entered in this case; Premiers earlier response to Microsoft, Samsung, and Motorolas original answers and counterclaims will be deemed to stand against these amended answers and counterclaims; and further ORDERED that Premiers Motion to Dismiss Microsofts Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties is DENIED as moot with respect to Microsoft, Samsung, and Motorola. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/25/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Jessie A. Amos as Attorney by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark H Francis for Nokia Corp. and Nokia Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3613. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Susan A Kim for Nokia Corp. and Nokia Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3613. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint by Real Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer# 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint by Napster, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer# 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint by Viacom Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer# 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 135 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345 (Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay) filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties filed by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Motorola Inc.,, Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc..(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First Amended ANSWER to Complaint and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Motorola Inc.,.(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties and Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint filed by Real Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Answer# 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties and Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint filed by Napster, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Answer# 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008, Terminated: 3/25/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Consent MOTION IN RESPONSE TO PREMIER'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Motorola Inc.,, Premier International Associates, LLC., Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) Modified on 3/17/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties and Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint filed by Viacom Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Answer# 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint [Affirmative Defenses] and, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Microsoft Corp..(Healey, David) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss, Strike, or For a More Definite Statemetn of Certain Inequitable Conduct Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 135 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345 filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Viacom Inc., Real Networks, Inc., Napster, Inc.,, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., Motorola Inc.,, Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc., Sandisk Corp., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, AT&T Mobility LLC, Sprint Spectrum LP, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Microsoft Corp., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Sandisk Corp. (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, AND DISCOVERY ORDER; Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2008 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/10/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 135 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345 filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) Modified on 2/29/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Napster, Inc.'s Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Samsung Electronic Co., LTD's and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Counterclaim) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Dell Inc.'s Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Lenovo (United STates) Inc.'s Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.'s Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Motorola, Inc.'s Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Realnetworks, Inc.'s Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, inc.'s Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless' Counterclaim) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Viacom, Inc.'s Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Sandisk Corporation's Counterclaims) by Premier International Associates, LLC..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims Alleging Inequitable Conduct Against Unnamed Parties by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Order# 3 Alternative Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 155 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 135 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345 Responses due by 3/6/2008. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl R Roth on behalf of Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc. (Roth, Carl) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Aline Abraham on behalf of Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc. (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Clay Roth on behalf of Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc. (Roth, Brendan) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Allison H Altersohn for Nokia Corp. and Nokia Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3512 (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexas D Skucas for Nokia Corp. and Nokia Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3512 (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert F Perry for Nokia Corp. and Nokia Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3512 (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 135 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345 by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. identifying Toshiba America, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Partridge, Scott) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher K Dorsey for AT&T Mobility LLC.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3501 (ch, ) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William P Atkins for AT&T Mobility LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3501(ch, ) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sarah R Greene for AT&T Mobility LLC.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3501 (ch, ) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Fred T Grasso for AT&T Mobility LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3501 (ch, ) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (no parent corporation) filed by Microsoft Corp. (Healey, David) Modified on 2/7/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (no parent) filed by Nokia Corp. (Smith, Michael) Modified on 2/7/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying AT&T Inc as Corporate Parent. (Stubbs, Samuel) Modified on 2/7/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nokia Inc. identifying Nokia Holding Inc.; Nokia Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Napster, Inc., identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Real Networks, Inc. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Viacom Inc. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental MOTION to Stay re 135 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345 by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Sandisk Corp., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Microsoft Corp., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Healey, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. identifying Lenovo Technology (United Kingdrom) Limited as Corporate Parent. (Amos, Jessie) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Real Networks Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand of Premier International Associates, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Real Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Supplemental MOTION to Stay re 135 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345 by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Sandisk Corp., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Microsoft Corp., Dell Inc., Lenovo Group LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Healey, David) Modified on 2/6/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Microsoft Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Healey, David) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008, Terminated: 2/22/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,243,725 and 6,763,345 by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Viacom Inc., Real Networks, Inc., Napster, Inc.,, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Motorola Inc.,, Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc., Sandisk Corp., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, AT&T Mobility LLC, Sprint Spectrum LP, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Microsoft Corp., Verizon Communications Inc., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B - Part 1# 3 Exhibit B - Part 2# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Microsoft Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM S against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Healey, David) Modified on 2/6/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (LGE USA is parent corporation) filed by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/6/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/6/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (No Parent Corporation) filed by Motorola Inc., (Erickson, Brian) Modified on 2/6/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (No parent corp),, Samsung Electronics America Inc. (Parent corporation being Samsung ELectronics Co) (Erickson, Brian) Modified on 2/6/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc..(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dell Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint of Premier International Associates, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motorola, Inc's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Motorola Inc.,.(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nokia Corp..(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nokia Inc..(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC.(an Illinois Limited Liability Company) by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Viacom Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to First Amended Complaint of Premier International Associates, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Viacom Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint of Premier International Associates, COUNTERCLAIM Counterclaims against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Amos, Jessie) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Napster Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint of Premier International Associates, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Napster, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sandisk Corp. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Giannetti, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SanDisk Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint of Premier International Associates, COUNTERCLAIM Counterclaims against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Sandisk Corp..(Giannetti, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc..(Partridge, Scott) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Premier International Associates, LLC. by Sprint Spectrum LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Stubbs, Samuel) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of Viacom Inc. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Mark Geiszler on behalf of Viacom Inc. (Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 112 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Carl Roth terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/24/08. (mpv, ) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Verizon Communications Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A Hawes on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (Hawes, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott F Partridge on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (Partridge, Scott) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer;. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/3/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 101 Amended Complaint, (Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for all Defendants to Answer of Otherwise Respond) by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne Manford Harding on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Motorola Inc., (Harding, Wayne) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Erickson on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Motorola Inc., (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey R Cole on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Motorola Inc., (Cole, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert A Auchter for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., and Samsung Electronics America Inc (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12203 (ch, ) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony W Shaw for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., and Samsung Electronics America Inc. (FEE PAID) R-6-1-12203 (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document: 101 Amended Complaint,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement) against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, AT&T Mobility LLC, Sprint Spectrum LP, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., filed by Premier International Associates, LLC..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas L Giannetti on behalf of Sandisk Corp. (Giannetti, Thomas) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants, Dell Inc. Lenovo (United States) Inc., LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics USA Inc., Microsoft Corp., Motorola Inc., Napster Inc., Real Networks Inc., SanDisk Corp., Sprint Nextel Corp., Toshiba Corp., Toshiba America inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Viacom Inc., Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc., to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint is extended to 1/7/08. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/30/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, (Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for all Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond) by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - transferring this case to Judge David Folsom. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/26/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rachel A Adams for Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3253 (ehs, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2007 (ch, ). (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles J Boudreau on behalf of Viacom Inc., Real Networks, Inc., Napster, Inc., (Boudreau, Charles) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua Pond for LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3219. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 90 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Samuel Eugene Stubbs for AT&T Inc.. Attorney Bryant Carroll Boren, Jr. Christopher W. Kennerly and Kevin E. Cadwell terminated as atty for AT&T. Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/13/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Verizon Communication Inc. deadline is extended to 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/13/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Unopposed by Verizon Communications Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AT&T Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stubbs, Samuel) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2007 (ch, ). (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SanDisk Corp. deadline is extended to 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/8/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Motorola, Inc. deadline is extended to 12/3/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/7/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sprint Nextel Corp. deadline is extended to 12/3/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/7/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File. LG Electronics USA, Inc deadline is 12/03/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/7/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John L LaBarre on behalf of Viacom Inc., Real Networks, Inc., Napster, Inc., (LaBarre, John) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Sandisk Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond by LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKeon, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J McKeon on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (McKeon, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Motorola Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Franklin Jones, Jr on behalf of Premier International Associates, LLC. (Jones, Franklin) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George F Pappas for Sprint Nextel Corp. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11607 (ch, ) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason R Litow for Sprint Nextel Corp. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11607 (ch, ) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey B Elikan for Sprint Nextel Corp. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11607 (ch, ) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Verizon Communications Inc extended to 11/20/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for AT&T Inc /AT&T Mobility extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Unopposed by Verizon Communications Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, for AT&T, Inc. by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Wesley Spangler terminated as counsel for Premier International Associates, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Premier International Associates, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Premier International Associates, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Nokia Inc. served by Process Server on 9/25/2007, answer due 10/15/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline extended to 12/21/07 for deft's Nokia Corp and Nokia Inc . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/11/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Sprint Nextel Corp to answer, extended to 11/8/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/11/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Unopposed by Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, [Unopposed] by Sprint Nextel Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Viacom Inc. deadline is extended to 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/10/7. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Viacom Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Motorola, Inc. deadline is extended to 11/8/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/9/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Samsung Electronics America Inc., and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. deadline is extended to 1/7/08 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/9/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dell, Inc. deadline is extended to 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/9/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael C Barrett on behalf of Dell Inc. (Barrett, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Robert Benson on behalf of Dell Inc. (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, [Unopposed] by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, [Unopposed] by Motorola Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Microsoft Corporation deadline is extended to 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/5/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Lenovo Group LTD and Lenovo (US) Inc. deadline is extended to 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/5/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Verizon Communication Inc, deadline is extended to 10/30/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/5/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AT&T Inc. deadline is extended to 11/7/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/5/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Verizon Communications Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AT&T Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boren, Bryant) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian H Pandya for Verizon Communications Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3072. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James H Wallace, Jr for Verizon Communications Inc. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-3072. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin P Anderson for Verizon Communications Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3072. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Realnetworks, Inc. deadline is extended to 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/2/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Napster, Inc. deadline is extended to 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/2/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Mark Geiszler on behalf of Real Networks, Inc., Napster, Inc., (Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of Real Networks, Inc., Napster, Inc., (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Real Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Napster, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SanDisk Corp. deadline is extended to 11/8/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/27/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Davis on behalf of Sandisk Corp. (Davis, Keith) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by Sandisk Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension of Time)(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Sprint Nextel Corp. served by Process Server on 9/20/2007, answer due 10/10/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Real Networks, Inc.. Real Networks, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/14/2007, answer due 10/4/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Premier International Associates, LLC. (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Premier International Associates, LLC. (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey R Moran for Premier International Associates, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3023. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David P Germaine for Premier International Associates, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3023. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas A Vickers for Premier International Associates, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3023. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph M Vanek for Premier International Associates, LLC..(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3023 (ch, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Martin Goering for Premier International Associates, LLC., Panasarn Aim Jirut for Premier International Associates, LLC., David M Mundt for Premier International Associates, LLC., David Lesht for Premier International Associates, LLC., Eugene M Cummings for Premier International Associates, LLC., Konrad V Sherinian for Premier International Associates, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3015. (ch, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2007 (ch, ). (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 12/3/07 for defts Toshiba Corp and Toshiba America Inc . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/24/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Dell Inc. served by Process Server on 9/17/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Verizon Communications Inc. served by Process Server on 9/17/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Toshiba America, Inc. served by Process Server on 9/17/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Viacom Inc. served by Process Server on 9/17/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Napster, Inc., served by Process Server on 9/17/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2007 (ch, ). (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Microsoft Corp. served by Process Server on 9/17/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2007 (ch, ). (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. served by Process Server on 9/17/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Samsung Electronics America Inc. served by Process Server on 9/18/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Sandisk Corp. served by Process Server on 9/18/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Motorola Inc., served by Process Server on 9/18/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. Lenovo (United States) Inc. served by Process Server on 9/18/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. AT&T Inc. served by Process Server on 9/18/2007, answer due 10/9/2007. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond (unopposed) by Toshiba Corp., Toshiba America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1)(Partridge, Scott) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott F Partridge on behalf of Toshiba Corp., Toshiba America, Inc. (Partridge, Scott) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of Premier International Associates, LLC. (Parker, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Premier International Associates, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Premier International Associates, LLC. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge T. John Ward recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/14/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Premier International Associates, LLC. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Patent/Trademark Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.). (ch, ) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORIGINAL COMPLAINT WITH JURY TRIAL DEMAND against Lenovo (United States) Inc., Toshiba Corp., Toshiba America, Inc., Viacom Inc., Real Networks, Inc., Napster, Inc.,, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., Motorola Inc.,, Nokia Corp., Nokia Inc., Sandisk Corp., Microsoft Corp., Verizon Communications Inc., AT&T Inc., Sprint Nextel Corp., Dell Inc., Lenovo Group LTD (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Premier International Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, ) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 358 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?