IP Innovation, LLC. et al v. Red Hat Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00447
District Judge Randall R. Rader, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 26, 2016 at 9:19 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Novell, Inc. Novell, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

No Logo IP Innovation LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Technology Licensing Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Arnold White & Durkee, Technical Advisor
Officially listed as "Michael T McLemore"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Mclemore +1 210 598 8563
No Logo Robert W Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (273) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 249 Sealed Motion 246 Motion for costs. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 10/13/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER denying 248 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 10/13/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying - 254 Motion for Redations to the Trial Transcript. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 9/20/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 254 MOTION to Redact 242 Transcript,,, 237 Transcript,,, 236 Transcript,,, 235 Transcript,,, 238 Transcript,,, 241 Transcript,,, PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
          REPLY to Response to Motion re 254 MOTION to Redact 242 Transcript,,, 237 Transcript,,, 236 Transcript,,, 235 Transcript,,, 238 Transcript,,, 241 Transcript,,, filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 265 Motion to Seal Document ORDERED that the clerk remove Exhibits 1-6 to Dkt. No. 264 from the public file and restrict public access to them. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 7/20/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 266 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 264 Response in Opposition to Motion Responses due by 7/23/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 7/20/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 264 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 264 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 254 MOTION to Redact 242 Transcript,,, 237 Transcript,,, 236 Transcript,,, 235 Transcript,,, 238 Transcript,,, 241 Transcript,,, filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 254 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Dft Motion for Redactions of the Trial Transcripts. Deadline is extended to 7/15/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 7/2/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 254 MOTION to Redact 242 Transcript,,, 237 Transcript,,, 236 Transcript,,, 235 Transcript,,, 238 Transcript,,, 241 Transcript,,, by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 251 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 260 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                            SEALED Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply To Defendants' Motion For An Order Finding An Exceptional Case And Awarding Attorneys' Fees And Expenses Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. Section 285 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 249 SEALED MOTION for an Order Finding an Exceptional Case and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 USC 285 filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 6/15/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                              Plaintiffs' Reply In Support Of Their Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity Filed Under SealSEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 251 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 250 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Rule 50(a) (Pre-Verdict) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement (Renewed), Damages (Renewed), and Invalidity SEALED MOTION Defendants' Rule 50(a) (Pre-Verdict) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement (Renewed), Damages (Renewed), and Invalidity filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 249 SEALED MOTION for an Order Finding an Exceptional Case and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 USC 285 filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 248 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law, Or In The Alternative, For A New Trial filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 251 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Redact 242 Transcript,,, 237 Transcript,,, 236 Transcript,,, 235 Transcript,,, 238 Transcript,,, 241 Transcript,,, by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 253 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                          SEALED Plaintiffs' Response To Defendants' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 219 SEALED MOTION Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement and Damages, 250 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Rule 50(a) (Pre-Verdict) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement (Renewed), Damages (Renewed), and Invalidity SEALED MOTION Defendants' Rule 50(a) (Pre-Verdict) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement (Renewed), Damages (Renewed), and Invalidity filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 4/26 PM, # 2 Exhibit A - 4/27 AM, # 3 Exhibit A - 4/27 PM, # 4 Exhibit A - 4/28 PM, # 5 Exhibit A - 4/29 AM, # 6 Exhibit A - 4/29 PM, # 7 Exhibit A - 4/30, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit H, # 15 Exhibit I, # 16 Exhibit J, # 17 Exhibit K, # 18 Exhibit L, # 19 Exhibit M, # 20 Exhibit N, # 21 Exhibit O, # 22 Exhibit P)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 6/1/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 252 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                            SEALED Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion For An Order Finding An Exceptional Case And Awarding Attorneys Fees And Expenses Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. Sec. 285 - SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 249 SEALED MOTION for an Order Finding an Exceptional Case and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 USC 285 filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 4/27 A.M., # 2 Exhibit A - 4/27 P.M., # 3 Exhibit A - 4/29 P.M., # 4 Exhibit A - 4/30, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 5/28/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 251 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                              SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 4/26 PM, # 2 Exhibit A - 4/27 - AM, # 3 Exhibit A - 4/27 - PM, # 4 Exhibit A - 4/28 - AM, # 5 Exhibit A - 4/28 - PM, # 6 Exhibit A - 4/29 - AM, # 7 Exhibit A - 4/29 - PM, # 8 Exhibit A - 4/30 - AM, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2010: # 16 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 250 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                SEALED MOTION Defendants' Rule 50(a) (Pre-Verdict) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement (Renewed), Damages (Renewed), and Invalidity by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 249 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                  SEALED MOTION for an Order Finding an Exceptional Case and Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 USC 285 by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law, Or In The Alternative, For A New Trial by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. Responses due by 5/14/2010 (Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Infringement And Validity Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (4/26 PM), # 2 Exhibit A (4/27 AM), # 3 Exhibit A (4/27 PM), # 4 Exhibit A (4/28 AM), # 5 Exhibit A (4/28 PM), # 6 Exhibit A (4/29 AM), # 7 Exhibit A (4/29 PM), # 8 Exhibit A (4/30 AM), # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 5/17/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                        PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreed Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. of Intent to Redact Trial Transcripts (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. Notice of Service - Defendants' Final Trial Exhibits (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation re 231 Exhibit List OF SERVICE (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/30/10 Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/29/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/29/10 Morning Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/28/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/28/10 Morning Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Dollins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/10 Morning Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/26/10 Afternoon Session before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Collins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/26/10 Voir Dire Proceedings before Judge Randall Rader. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/D. Dollins/G. Fuller,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (lss, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Exhibit List Defendants' Final Trial Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 232 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Clarifying Final Judgment; judgment of non-infringement and invalidity is hereby entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 5/3/10. (poa, ) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS' FINAL EXHIBIT LIST by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS' SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS ADMITTED APRIL 30, 2010 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randall R. Rader: Third day of Jury Trial held on 4/28/2010. (Court Reporter Donna Collins.) (shd, ) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Exhibit List Defendants' Submission of Trial Exhibits Admitted April 30, 2010 by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. against IP Innovation, LLC.. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/30/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 226 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                SEALED Jury Notes. (jml) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 225 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  JURY VERDICT. (jml) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randall R. Rader: Second day of Jury Trial held on 4/27/2010. (Court Reporter Donna Collins.) (shd, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randall R. Rader: Jury Selection held on 4/26/2010; First day of Jury Trial held on 4/26/2010. (Court Reporter Donna Collins.) (shd, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        CLOSING JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/30/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS' SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS ADMITTED APRIL 29, 2010 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Exhibit List Defendants Submission of Trial Exhibits Admitted April 29, 2010 by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 219 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issues of Infringement and Damages by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Reiter, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS ADMITTED APRIL 28, 2010 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Exhibit List Defendants Submission of Trial Exhibits Admitted April 28, 2010 by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS NINTH AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS ADMITTED APRIL 27, 2010 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Exhibit List Defendants Submission of Trial Exhibits Admitted on April 27, 2010 by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS ADMITTED APRIL 26, 2010 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 211 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. Plaintiffs Bench Memorandum in Support of Allowing Dr. Zimmerman to Testify Regarding Dft's Infringement Through the Use of KDE Workspace Manager. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 4/26/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Eighth Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 201 Exhibit List Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Seventh Amended Trial Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List Defendants' Sixth Amended Trial Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by IP Innovation, LLC., Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc., Technology Licensing Corporation. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 196 Exhibit List, 186 Exhibit List, 202 Exhibit List, 192 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Objections To Defendants' Second Amended, Third Amended, Fourth Amended And Fifth Amended Exhibit Lists by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 203 Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' First Amended Deposition Designations by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER - the court enters this order sua sponte. Due to the voluminous exhibits expected to be tendered during the trial on this case the court ORDERS the following here ( see order for details). Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/23/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 203 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. Defendants' First Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List Defendants' Fifth Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Seventh Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 197 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Ordered that the parties complete the supplemental damages discovery process by 4/21/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/21/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 198 Exhibit List, 195 Exhibit List, 193 Exhibit List Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Fourth, Fifth, and Sixth Amended Exhibit Lists by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Damages Discovery Deadline) by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List Defendants' Fourth Amended Trial Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE : The attached jury questionnaire was sent to the potential jury members on Wednesday, April 14, 2010 (ch, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List Defendants' Third Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Jury Questionnaire (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - the parties are requested to file any objections to the proposed jury questionnaires by 5:00 p.m. (EST), Monday 4/12/2010. Absent objections, the jury questionnaires will be sent to the prospective jury members at the close of business today. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 4/12/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 156 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Defendants' Trial Exhibit List filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul K Vickrey for IP Innovation, LLC.,Paul K Vickrey for Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5278 (ch, ) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re 156 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Defendants' Trial Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Reply In Support Of Their Motion To Strike Defendants' Trial Exhibit List filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List Defendants' Second Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Exhibit List Defendants' Second Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... (LaValle, Amy) Modified on 3/30/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 182 Exhibit List Defendents' Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 110 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/29/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Third Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 156 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Defendants' Trial Exhibit List filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 172 Exhibit List Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Exhibit List by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Disclosure by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc. Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Trial Exhibit List (LaValle, Amy) Modified on 3/16/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental MOTION in Limine by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 161 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN ALLEGED REFERENCES AND COMBINATIONS OF ALLEGED REFERENCES filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Equitable Issues From Being Argued Before The Jury filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 174 Filed: 3/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 159 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Licenses And Settlement Agreements filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintffs'SEALED Responses to Defendants Red Hat, Inc. and Novell, Inc.'s Motions in Limine SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 162 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 3/15/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Second Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document:(CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE) 162 SEALED MOTION in Limine.. (LaValle, Amy) Modified on 3/12/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document:(CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE for 159, 160, 161) 161 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN ALLEGED REFERENCES AND COMBINATIONS OF ALLEGED REFERENCES, 159 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Licenses And Settlement Agreements, 160 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Equitable Issues From Being Argued Before The Jury.. (Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 3/12/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Defendants' Pretrial Objections (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' FIRST AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Hearing on Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment and Final Pretrial Conference following is set for 3/16/2010 10:00 AM @ the US Court of Appeals for Federal Circuit before Judge Randall R. Rader. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 147 Sealed Motion for Reconsideration of 1/14/09 order, Denying Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Misjoinder of inventors. The court hereby vacates its January 14th ruling denying Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment as moot and will issue a ruling on the merits of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 115 Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Myrom Zimmerman on the issue of Infringement and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 142 Sealed Motion to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Joseph Gemini. The parties shall complete this process by 4/19/2010. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 88 Motion to Strike Supplemental P.R. 3-1 Contentions and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/11/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION in Limine by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reiter, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2010: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 161 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN ALLEGED REFERENCES AND COMBINATIONS OF ALLEGED REFERENCES by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2010: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Equitable Issues From Being Argued Before The Jury by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To Exclude Certain Licenses And Settlement Agreements by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2010: # 11 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List Plaintiffs' First Amended Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 157 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 147 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of January 14, 2009 Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Misjoinder of Inventors filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Defendants' Trial Exhibit List by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER AMENDING DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Motions due by 3/10/2010., Responses to Motions due 3/12/2010. Jury Selection set for 4/26/2010 09:00AM before Judge Randall R. Rader. in Marshall, Texas., Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Randall R. Rader at the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Courtroom 201, Washington District of Columbia. All other deadlines contained in the Docket Control Order remain the same. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/5/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 114 Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Joseph Gemini. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 3/2/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 153 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED SURREBUTTAL IN OPPOSITION to Motion re 142 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation re 149 Notice of Disclosure Plaintiffs' Objections To Defendants' Deposition Counter-Designations (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 147 SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of January 14, 2009 Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Misjoinder of Inventors Plaintiffs' Response To Defendants Motion For Reconsideration filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 150 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 142 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Opening Deposition Testimony Designations (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation re 145 Notice of Disclosure Plaintiffs' Objections To Defendants' Deposition Designations (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 147 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration of January 14, 2009 Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Misjoinder of Inventors by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Amy E. LaValle, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 142 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. of Defendants' Exhibit List and Defendants' Deposition Designations (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation re 138 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order Plaintiffs' Opening Deposition Testimony Designations (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List for Plaintiffs by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 142 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Joseph Gemini by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation of Request of Daily Transcript of Court Proceedings (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Notice of Request of Daily Transcript of Court Preceedings (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph A Culig for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5156 (ch, ) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Corrected Joint Final Pretrial Order)(Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (sm, ). (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Proposed Pretrial Order Agreed Motion For Leave To File Corrected Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Corrected Joint Final Pretrial Order)(Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 1/21/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 131 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Douglas M Hall terminated as counsel for IP Innovation LLC and Technology Licensing Corporation. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/20/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1 Plaintiffs' Proposed Final Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit A-2, Plaintiffs' Proposed Verdict Form, # 3 Exhibit B-1, Defendants' Proposed Final Jury Instructions, # 4 Exhibit B-2, Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Final Pretrial Order by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Plaintiffs' Trial Witness List, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Defendants' Trial Witness List)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 101 Sealed Motion for Leave to Supplement Their P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions; denying as moot 110 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment on US Patent Nos. 5,072,412; 5,394,521,; and 5,533,183 for invalidity. Signed by Judge Randall R. Rader on 1/19/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Regarding Pretrial Conference (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion To Withdraw Douglas M. Hall As Counsel For IP Innovation LLC And Technology Licensing Corporation by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 130 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document:(Certificate of Authorization) 128 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. (Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 1/13/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***REPLACES # 126 *** SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Surreply In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Exclude The Testimony And Expert Report Of Dr. Myron Zimmerman by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 1/13/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 128 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 114 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Exhibit M, # 5 Exhibit N, # 6 Exhibit O, # 7 Exhibit P, # 8 Exhibit Q, # 9 Exhibit R)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L (1), # 5 Exhibit L (2), # 6 Exhibit L (3), # 7 Exhibit L (4))(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Myron Zimmerman on the Issue of Infringement filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) Modified on 1/13/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Myron Zimmerman on the Issue of Infringement filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Amy E. LaValle, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 123 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 114 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC. OF DISIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order TRANSFERRING case from the docket of Judge Leonard Davis to the docket of Randall R Rader (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 120 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 114 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Joseph Gemini filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 119 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 110 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, PART 1, # 7 Exhibit F, PART 2, # 8 Exhibit F, PART 3, # 9 Exhibit F, PART 4, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 115 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Myron Zimmerman on the Issue of Infringement Plaintiffs' Response To Defendants' Motion To Exclude The Testimony And Expert Report Of Dr. Myron Zimmerman filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 101 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement P. R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions Plaintiffs' Surreply In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Leave To Supplement Their P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 116 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 101 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement P. R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Myron Zimmerman on the Issue of Infringement by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Strike the Expert Report of Joseph Gemini by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC. OF SERVICE (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. (Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses) (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 109 Motion to Seal. Defendants may file their Motion for Summary Judgment and related confidential exhibits under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/09. cc:attys 11-17-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Amy E. LaValle, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on U.S. Patent Nos. 5,072,412, 5,394,521 and 5,533,183 for Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 116 and 35 U.S.C. § 102(f) & (g) by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 101 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement P. R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman and Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 7/28/09 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 69 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2010. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. (Identification of Trial Witnesses) (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Trial Witness List by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Hall, Douglas) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. (Service of Rebuttal Expert Reports) (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice Of Service (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 100 Motion to Seal. Defts may file their Motion for Leave and related confidential exhibits under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/09. cc:attys 11-02-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 101 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement P. R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Their P. R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Notice of Service of Expert Report of David A. Wilson, Ph.D. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation Notice of Service (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation (Hill, Jack) Modified on 10/20/2009 (ch, ). ( Modified per request from attorney) (Entered: 10/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 88 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' "Supplemental" P. R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 93 Motion for Leave to File. Defts may exceed the page limit for their Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Pltfs' Supplemental P.R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/09. cc:attys 9-15-09(mll, ) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 88 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' "Supplemental" P. R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration of Stephen Gray), # 2 Exhibit A)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (Exceed Page Limit for Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' "Supplemental" Infringement Contentions) by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/09. cc:attys 9-10-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hervey Mark Lyon on behalf of Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. (Lyon, Hervey) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 88 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' "Supplemental" P. R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' "Supplemental" P. R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. Responses due by 9/3/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court interprets the claim language in this case as set forth in this Order. The Court's claim interpretations are set forth in Appendix A. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/09. cc:attys 8-10-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry - 7.28.09 Markman Hrg for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 7/28/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - The Court has received Mr. McLemores invoice for services through July 29, 2009 in the amount of $24,000.00 and hereby ORDERS prompt payment to Mr. McLemore at 10333 Richmond Ave., Suite 1100, Houston, TX 77042 as follows: Plaintiff: $12,000.00 Defendant: $12,000.00 TOTAL: $24,000.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/30/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            P.R. 4-5(d) JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,072,412 for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,072,412 for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Joint Notice of Estimated Time for Markman Hearing (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to 79 Claim Construction Brief, filed by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,072,412 for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. Section 112 Paragraph 2 by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Amy E. LaValle in Support of Defendants Red Hat, Inc.'s and Novell, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration - U.S. Patent No. 5,072,412, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration - Excerpt from the Prosecution History of U.S. Patent No. 5,072,412, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 75 Joint Motion to Extend Early Mediation Deadline. The court DENIES the motion, but does EXTEND the pre-Markman mediation deadline until 6/15/09.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/1/09. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion To Extend Early Mediation Deadline by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER appointing Michael T McLemore as technical advisor, his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/27/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Technical Advisor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Opening Brief due 5/19/09. Response Brief and Summary Judgment motion for Indefiniteness due 6/12/09. Reply Brief and Response to Summary Judgment motion for Indefinieness due 6/30/09 and PR 4-5(d) Chart and Reply to Summary Judgment motion of Indefiniteness due 7/20/09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/24/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines) by Red Hat Inc., IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response ANSWER to 62 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply To Red Hat, Inc.'s Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response ANSWER to 63 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's' Reply to Novell, Inc.'s Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation.(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 66 Motion to Continue. Accordingly, the Court will re-set the Markman Hearing in this case for July 28, 2009 at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/8/09. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Continue Markman Hearing by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. of compliance with Patent Rule 4-2 (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. of Defendants' P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production and Paragraph 2 of Discovery Order Additional Disclosures (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Novell Inc..(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Red Hat Inc..(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC. Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance With Patent Rule 4-1 (Hall, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. of Patent Rule 4-1(a) Disclosures (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding the confidentiality of discovery materials, Motions terminated: 58 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Novell Inc., Red Hat Inc... Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/19/09. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time for Discovery. All parties deadline to comply with paragraph two of the court's 4/29/08 Discovery Order is 3/6/09 and Dft's deadline to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 is 3/6/09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/21/09. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery and Patent-Related Disclosures by Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Inc. of Initial Disclosures (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Novell Inc. of Initial Disclosures (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neema Jalali on behalf of all defendants (Jalali, Neema) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/21/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice Of Compliance With Initial Disclosures Pursuant To The Court's April 29, 2008 Discovery Order (Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance With Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Patent Rules 3-1 And 3-2 (Hall, Douglas) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadlines. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/16/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by IP Innovation, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/4/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion To Extend Discovery Deadlines by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Status Conferences held on 4/7/08 before Judges Leonard Davis and John Love. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/7/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2008. 13 pages. See 32 (sms, ) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/23/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Elizabeth LaValle on behalf of all defendants (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2009. Discovery due by 4/24/2009.,Exhibit List due by 4/12/2010. Markman Hearing set for 7/9/2009 09:30 AM (TYLER) before Judge Leonard Davis. Motions due by 3/15/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2010. Jury Selection set for 4/12/2010 09:00AM (TYLER) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2010 09:00 AM (TYLER) before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2010 09:00 AM (TYLER) before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/30/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/29/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. Notice of Agreement (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A. Discovery Order# 2 Appendix B. Docket Control Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties shall submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the court by 4/28/08.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/22/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Modify Date for Submission of Docket Control and Discovery Orders by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation, Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Pltf shall identify the asserted claims that they contend have been infringed, separately for each Defendant, pursuant to P.R. 3-1(a), on or before April 11, 2008. Plaintiffs shall comply with the remaining provisions of P.R. 3-1, as well as with P.R. 3-2, on or before May 30, 2008. Defendants shall comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 on or before July 29, 2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/11/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion To Modify Dates For Disclosures And Document Production Pursuant To P.R. 3-1, 3-2, 3-3, And 3-4 by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Paul) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - in accordance with the status conference held on 4/7/08, this case is set for Markman Hearing set for 7/9/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis., Jury Selection set for 4/6/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis., Jury Trial set for 4/12/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis., Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. The parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the court by 4/21/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/9/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love : Status Conference held on 4/7/2008. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference set for 4/7/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Magistrate Judge John D. Love in Tyler Courtroom.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/7/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 27 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to Red Hat, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Complaint by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Hall, Douglas) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply To Novell, Inc.'s Counterclaims To Complaint by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Hall, Douglas) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation re 17 Order, and Request for Scheduling Conference (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Red Hat Inc..(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Novell Inc..(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Hat Inc. identifying T Rowe Price Associates Inc (a subsidiary of the publicly held corporation of T Rowe Price Group Inc) and Legg Mason Inc as Corporate Parents. (Reiter, Mark) Modified on 2/4/2008 (mpv, ). (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Novell Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J Mahalek for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas M Hall for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Raymond P Niro for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arthur A Gasey for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph N Hosteny for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul C Gibbons for IP Innovation, LLC. and Technology Licensing Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12496 (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - the court orders the plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all dfts have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining dft's answer or motion. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/10/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for deft Red Hat Inc extended to 2/1/08 to file answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/7/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Novell Inc has until 2/1/08 to file answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/7/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of Novell Inc. (Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1Proposed Order)(Krevitt, Josh) Modified on 1/7/2008 (mpv, ). (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Novell Inc.. (Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Novell's Inc. deadline is extended to 1/7/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Novell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Josh A Krevitt on behalf of Red Hat Inc. (Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. Novell Inc. served on 11/5/2007, answer due 11/26/2007. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Red Hat, Inc. eadline is extended to 1/7/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/9/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. Red Hat Inc. served on 11/5/2007, answer due 11/26/2007. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Form AO 120)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Red Hat Inc., Novell Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1290837.), filed by IP Innovation, LLC., Technology Licensing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Civil Cover Sheet # 5 List of Parties)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 191 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?