Gemini IP LLC v. Citrix Systems Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:07-cv-00521
District Judge Richard A. Schell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 1:45 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

AT&T Services, Inc. AT&T Services, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Bomgar Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Eric Hopenfeld +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 james.hopenfeld@ropesgray.com
No Logo Citrix Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Getgo, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
Space Thomas Howard Reger, II +1 214 292 4084 +1 214 747 2091 reger@fr.com
No Logo Genesys Conferencing, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry C Marcus +1 212 415 8700 +1 212 415 8701 hmarcus@morganfinnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Cawley +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 dcawley@mckoolsmith.com
No Logo Genesys S.a., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry C Marcus +1 212 415 8700 +1 212 415 8701 hmarcus@morganfinnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Cawley +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 dcawley@mckoolsmith.com
No Logo Gfi-usa, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com
No Logo Imeet, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK V. CAMPAGNA +1 404 581 8978 +1 404 581 8330 mcampagna@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Joseph Najim +1 404 581 8263 +1 404 581 8330 snajim@jonesday.com
International Business Machines Corporation International Business Machines Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "International Business Machines Corp."
No Logo Landesk Software Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidson, Berquist, Klima & Jackson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Daniel Berquist +1 703 894 6402 +1 703 894 6430 jay.berquist@davidsonberquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Scott Davidson +1 571 765 7701 +1 571 765 7200 sdavidson@davidsonberquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Lee Jackson +1 703 894 6403 +1 703 894 6430 dlj@davidsonberquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe Tidwell & McCoy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Claud Tidwell +1 903 868 1933 +1 903 892 2397 jct@wtmlaw.net
No Logo Live Person, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

No Logo Netspoke, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK V. CAMPAGNA +1 404 581 8978 +1 404 581 8330 mcampagna@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Joseph Najim +1 404 581 8263 +1 404 581 8330 snajim@jonesday.com
No Logo Premiere Global Services, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK V. CAMPAGNA +1 404 581 8978 +1 404 581 8330 mcampagna@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Joseph Najim +1 404 581 8263 +1 404 581 8330 snajim@jonesday.com
No Logo Saba Software Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo SBC Internet Services, Inc., d/b/a AT&T Internet Services, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Zoho Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.

Represented by AT&T, Inc.

Avaya, Inc. Avaya, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Avocent Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidson, Berquist, Klima & Jackson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Daniel Berquist +1 703 894 6402 +1 703 894 6430 jay.berquist@davidsonberquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Scott Davidson +1 571 765 7701 +1 571 765 7200 sdavidson@davidsonberquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Lee Jackson +1 703 894 6403 +1 703 894 6430 dlj@davidsonberquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe Tidwell & McCoy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Claud Tidwell +1 903 868 1933 +1 903 892 2397 jct@wtmlaw.net
Best Buy Company, Inc. Best Buy Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Best Buy Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David H. Judson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Judson +1 972 385 2018 +1 253 369 3141 mail@davidjudson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rickey L. Faulkner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Rickey Lawrence Faulkner +1 903 212 3100 +1 903 212 3102 rick@faulknerlawoffice.com
No Logo Connectwise, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dominic Kouffman +1 813 227 6553 +1 813 229 0134 dominic.kouffman@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Elsinore Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo LogMein Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David H. Judson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Judson +1 972 385 2018 +1 253 369 3141 mail@davidjudson.com
No Logo N*able Technologies, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "N-able Technologies Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo NTR North America LLC, Defendant
No Logo NTRglobal, Defendant
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE GREGORY S. AROVAS , +1 212 446 4781 +1 212 446 4900 greg.arovas@kirkland.com
Space Brandon Hugh Brown +1 415 439 1670 +1 415 439 1500 brandon.brown@kirkland.com
PRO HAC VICE Lov Goel +1 650 859 7074 +1 650 859 7500 lov.goel@kirkland.com
PRO HAC VICE Christian Chadd Taylor +1 415 439 1823 +1 415 439 1500 ctaylor@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe Tidwell & McCoy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark McCoy +1 972 712 3530 +1 972 712 3540 cmccoy@wtmlaw.net
Space David Vincent Overcash +1 972 712 3530 +1 972 712 3540 david.overcash@wtmlaw.net
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE GREGORY S. AROVAS , +1 212 446 4781 +1 212 446 4900 greg.arovas@kirkland.com
Space Brandon Hugh Brown +1 415 439 1670 +1 415 439 1500 brandon.brown@kirkland.com
PRO HAC VICE Lov Goel +1 650 859 7074 +1 650 859 7500 lov.goel@kirkland.com
PRO HAC VICE Christian Chadd Taylor +1 415 439 1823 +1 415 439 1500 ctaylor@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe Tidwell & McCoy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark McCoy +1 972 712 3530 +1 972 712 3540 cmccoy@wtmlaw.net
Space David Vincent Overcash +1 972 712 3530 +1 972 712 3540 david.overcash@wtmlaw.net
Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE GREGORY S. AROVAS , +1 212 446 4781 +1 212 446 4900 greg.arovas@kirkland.com
Space Brandon Hugh Brown +1 415 439 1670 +1 415 439 1500 brandon.brown@kirkland.com
PRO HAC VICE Lov Goel +1 650 859 7074 +1 650 859 7500 lov.goel@kirkland.com
PRO HAC VICE Christian Chadd Taylor +1 415 439 1823 +1 415 439 1500 ctaylor@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe Tidwell & McCoy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark McCoy +1 972 712 3530 +1 972 712 3540 cmccoy@wtmlaw.net
Space David Vincent Overcash +1 972 712 3530 +1 972 712 3540 david.overcash@wtmlaw.net
Sony Corporation of America Sony Corporation of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Nese +1 202 220 4256 +1 202 220 4201 bnese@kenyon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis V. Popovski +1 212 908 6078 +1 212 425 5288 LPopovski@kenyon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T Cy Walker +1 202 220 4200 +1 202 220 4201 cwalker@kenyon.com

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Sony Electronics, Inc. Sony Electronics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Nese +1 202 220 4256 +1 202 220 4201 bnese@kenyon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis V. Popovski +1 212 908 6078 +1 212 425 5288 LPopovski@kenyon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T Cy Walker +1 202 220 4200 +1 202 220 4201 cwalker@kenyon.com

Represented by Ramey and Flock

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

No Logo Venti Solutions, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Hanes
No Logo Zenith Infotech Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David H. Judson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H Judson +1 972 385 2018 +1 253 369 3141 mail@davidjudson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilan D Barzilay +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 ibarzilay@seyfarth.com
No Logo Gemini IP, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Agility IP Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xiang Long +1 650 227 4800 longxiang@agilityiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theresa Elise Norton +1 650 227 4800 +1 650 318 3483 tess@agilityiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel F Perez +1 214 969 2777 + 214 969 4343 dperez@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/28/2008 Michael J Newton +1 214 922 3400 +1 214 922 3899 mike.newton@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/01/2008 Amy Elizabeth LaValle +1 212 351 3873 +1 212 351 6375 alavalle@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Clyde Moody Siebman +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 siebman@siebman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler, Andrew Wesley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2010 Todd Y Brandt +1 903 753 9300 +1 903 553 0403 brandt@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams, Morgan & Amerson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/28/2008 J. Mike Amerson +1 713 934 7000 +1 713 934 7011 mamerson@wmalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica Mucchetti +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 mmucchetti@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Carl Otteson +1 408 291 2750 +1 650 318 3483 jim@agilityiplaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (377) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL)(Eno, Monica) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC for Termination of Electronic Notices (McCoy, Clark) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - It is ORDERED that civil action number 4:07cv521 is consolidated into civil action number 4;11cv36. The clerk of the court is hereby directed to docket all future filing in case 4:11cv36. It is further ORDERED that the clerk of court shall close case 4:07cv521. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER GRANTING 363 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Initial Dislcosures and all Outstanding Discovery Objections and Responses. The deadline is extended to 6/22/2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER UPON STIPULATION GRANTING 364 Stipulation filed by Gemini IP LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - GRANTING 370 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - GRANTING 367 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC With Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Best Buy Co., Inc. for Termination of Electronic Notices (Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                    ***PLEASE DISREGARD - NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION ENTERED - ATTORNEY FILED IN WRONG CASE***NOTICE by Gemini IP LLC Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC's Notice of Rule 26(a)(1) Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Norton, Theresa) Modified on 6/17/2011 (baf, ). (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant N-able Technologies Inc. Without Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Zoho Corporation of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                          NOTICE by GFI USA, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION Stipulation between Gemini IP, LLC and Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., and Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures and all Outstanding Discovery Objections and Responses by Sony Electronics Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Shannon) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant NTR North America, LLC With Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE by AT&T Services Inc., AT&T, Inc., SBC Internet Services, Inc., d/b/a AT&T Internet Services of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Clonts, David) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Schell: Scheduling Conference held on 6/1/2011. (Court Reporter Jerry Kelley.) (baf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Avaya Inc (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Green, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - GRANTING 356 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 6/1/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by LivePerson, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Bomgar Corporation With Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - GRANTING 353 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 6/1/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of ConnectWise, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants AT&T Services, Inc. and SBC Internet Services, Inc. d/b/a AT&T Internet Services Without Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Settlement by Bomgar Corporation (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - GRANTING 347 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/31/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - GRANTING 338 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/31/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - GRANTING 340 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/31/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - GRANTING 339 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/31/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant GFI USA, Inc. With Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Sony Electronics Inc (Dacus, Shannon) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Vincent Overcash on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Overcash, David) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJDUICE GRANTING 337 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. It is ORDERED that all claims in this case between plaintiff, Gemini IP, LLC and defendants Best Buy Co., Inc. and Zenith Infotech, Ltd are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that all attorney's fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/20/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE GRANTING 336 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. It is ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Gemini IP, LLC, and defendant, LogMeIn, Inc., are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled "PATENT IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT" and dated 4/25/2011. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/20/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE by Gemini IP LLC Plaintiff's Notice of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Saba Software, Inc. With Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Avaya Inc. With Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant ZOHO Corporation With Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc. and Zenith Infotech, Ltd. Without Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant LogMeIn, Inc. With Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE - The Court hereby directs the parties to confer as required by FRCP 269f) no later than 5/9/2011 and file a Rule 26 Meeting Joint Written Report due by 5/23/2011. Management Conference set for 6/1/2011 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/27/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - GRANTING 333 Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC, and defendant, LANDesk Software, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/7/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy S Teter on behalf of N-able Technologies Incorporated, NTR North America LLC (Teter, Timothy) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 238 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that defendant AT&T Inc. has up to and including 1/26/2011 to answer, mover or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 145 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel Francisco Perez terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 208 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that defendant Bomgar Corporation had up to and including 2/1/2011 to answer, mover or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 294 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between Gemini and IBM are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 165 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Douglas A Cawley terminated for Genesys S.A. d/b/a/ Genesys Conferencing. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 283 Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC, and defendant Elsinore Technologies, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, subject to the terms of a Patent License and Settlement Agreement date 1/25/2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 223 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that defendant Elsinore Technologies, INc. had until 1/18/2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 232 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant GFI USA, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including 1/26/2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 242 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended up to and including 1/23/2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 264 Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that all claims asserted in this suit between plaintiff and the Genesys Conferencing, Inc. and Genesys S.A., d/b/a Genesys conferencing are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 218 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant NTR Global is hereby DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. NTR North America, LLC is hereby substituted for NTR Global as a named defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 287 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. N-able Technologies Incorporated shall have until 3/2/2011 to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 296 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. N-able Technologies Incorporated shall have until 3/9/2011 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 260 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tonya M. Gray terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 256 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice Defendant AT&T, Inc. ; GRANTING 256 Motion to Substitute Party AT&T Services, Inc. and SBC Internet Services, Inc. d/b/a AT&T Internet Services. AT&T, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 192 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that Samsung Defendants shall have until 3/2/2011 to file and serve their responses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 204 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew W. Spangler terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 170 Motion to Withdraw 146 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. It is ORDERED that docket number 146 is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 225 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 203 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 1/12/2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brandon H Brown for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,Brandon H Brown for Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.,Brandon H Brown for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lov Goel (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steve P Hassid for Zoho Corporation. (lhj, ) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Gemini IP LLC Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC's Notice of Readiness to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference (Otteson, James) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ***REPLACES DOCUMENT 303 ***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian Chadd Taylor on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Taylor, Christian) Modified on 3/9/2011 (lhj, ). (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ***REPLACES DOCUMENT 304 *** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harper S Batts on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Batts, Harper) Modified on 3/9/2011 (lhj, ). (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by N-able Technologies Incorporated (Mead, Lowell) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  N-able Technologies Inc.'s ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by N-able Technologies Incorporated.(Mead, Lowell) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ***DISREGARD ATTORNEY TO REFILE***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clark McCoy on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (McCoy, Clark) Modified on 3/9/2011 (lhj, ). (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ***DISREGARD ATTORNEY TO REFILE***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clark McCoy on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (McCoy, Clark) Modified on 3/9/2011 (lhj, ). (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (McCoy, Clark) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Defendant Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd's Answer and Affirmative Defenses in Response to Gemini's Amended Complaint ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd..(McCoy, Clark) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics America, Inc. for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (McCoy, Clark) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America's Answer and Affirmative Defenses in Response to Gemini's Amended Complaint ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC.(McCoy, Clark) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (McCoy, Clark) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses in Response to Gemini's Amended Complaint ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(McCoy, Clark) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 144 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond (Second Unopposed Motion) by N-able Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Caine on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Caine, David) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss International Business Machines Corporation with Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC's ANSWER to 277 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Bomgar's Counterclaims by Gemini IP LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 258 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFF GEMINI IP, LLCS ANSWER TO DEFENDANT GFI USA, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS by Gemini IP LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 273 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFF GEMINI IP, LLCS ANSWER TO DEFENDANT ZOHO CORPORATIONS COUNTERCLAIMS by Gemini IP LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 262 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFF GEMINI IP, LLCS ANSWER TO DEFENDANT AT&TS COUNTERCLAIMS by Gemini IP LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas W Lathram for Zoho Corporation. (lhj, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arthur J Behiel for Zoho Corporation. (lhj, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 144 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by N-able Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ConnectWise, Inc. (Kouffman, Dominic) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by ConnectWise, Inc..(Kouffman, Dominic) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dominic Kouffman for ConnectWise, Inc. (FEE PAID) (bsw, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Elsinore Technologies, Inc. by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC's Answer to Defendant IBM's Counterclaims ANSWER to 247 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Gemini IP LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NTRglobal (Teter, Timothy) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NTR North America, LLC ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by NTRglobal.(Teter, Timothy) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zenith Infotech Ltd. (Judson, David) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bomgar Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Bomgar Corporation. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by Bomgar Corporation.(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Best Buy Co., Inc. (Judson, David) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LogMeIn, Inc. (Judson, David) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zoho Corporation (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by Zoho Corporation.(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lewis V Popovski on behalf of Sony Electronics Inc (Popovski, Lewis) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Nese on behalf of Sony Electronics Inc (Nese, Bryan) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by T Cy Walker on behalf of Sony Electronics Inc (Walker, T) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Electronics Inc (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by Sony Electronics Inc.(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 235 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC's Answer to Defendant LivePerson, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Gemini IP LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: 1/27/2011 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 240 Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Corporation of America are hereby DISMISSSED from this action without prejudice; Sony Electronics, Inc. is hereby substituted as named defendant in this action in place of defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Corporation of America. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 1/27/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: 1/27/2011 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to ConnectWise, Inc. on 1/20/2011, answer due: 2/10/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: 1/27/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Genesys Conferencing, Inc. and Genesys S.A. d/b/a Genesys Conferencing Without Prejudice by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/27/2011 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to N-able Technologies Incorporated on 1/7/2011, answer due: 1/28/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by AT&T Services Inc., SBC Internet Services, Inc., d/b/a AT&T Internet Services.(Clonts, David) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SBC Internet Services, Inc., d/b/a AT&T Internet Services identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc., Other Affiliate AT&T Mobility LLC, Other Affiliate AT&T Mobility Corporation, Other Affiliate SBC Long Distance, LLC, Other Affiliate SBC Alloy Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BLS Cingular Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc. for SBC Internet Services, Inc., d/b/a AT&T Internet Services. (Clonts, David) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by NTRglobal. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Services Inc.. (Clonts, David) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by GFI USA, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GFI USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GFI USA Holding Company, Inc. for GFI USA, Inc.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice AT&T, Inc., Joint MOTION to Substitute Party AT&T Services, Inc. and SBC Internet Services, Inc. by AT&T, Inc., Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clonts, David) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Clonts on behalf of AT&T, Inc. (Clonts, David) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 203 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Gemini IP LLC'S Sur-reply to Defendant Venti Solutions, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Gemini IP LLC. (Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theresa Elise Norton on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by Zenith Infotech Ltd..(Judson, David) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David H Judson on behalf of Zenith Infotech Ltd. (Judson, David) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: 1/19/2011 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to ConnectWise, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Matthew Hawkins on behalf of International Business Machines Corp. (Hawkins, Paul) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by International Business Machines Corp. (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by International Business Machines Corp..(Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLCs Complaint up to and including January 25, 2011 by Elsinore Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by Best Buy Co., Inc..(Judson, David) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by LogMeIn, Inc..(Judson, David) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David H Judson on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc. (Judson, David) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 144 Amended Complaint,, by Genesys Conferencing Inc, Genesys SA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 203 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Venti Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Tony DeLollis)(Hanes, Richard) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendants Sony Corp and Sony Corp of America and Substitute Sony Electronics, Inc. as Defendant by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***PLEASE DISREGARD - ATTORNEY FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE***Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendants Sony Corp and Sony Corp of America and Substitute Sony Electronics, Inc. as Defendant by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). Modified on 1/12/2011 (baf, ). (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 144 Amended Complaint,, by AT&T, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clonts, David) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Bomgar Corporation (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LivePerson, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for LivePerson, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by LivePerson, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven M Bauer on behalf of LivePerson, Inc. (Bauer, Steven) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re International Business Machines Corp..( Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 144 Amended Complaint,, by GFI USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kimberly A Mottley for LivePerson, Inc. (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Corporation of America.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Zenith Infotech Ltd.( Barzilay, Ilan) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack P Smith, III on behalf of Avaya Inc (Smith, Jack) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Avaya Inc identifying Other Affiliate TPG Capital, Other Affiliate Silver Lake Partners for Avaya Inc. (Green, Christopher) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to N-able Technologies Incorporated (by and through its registered agent The Corporation Trust Company). (baf, ) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 216 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Venti Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanes, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by Avaya Inc.(Green, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Elsinore Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James E Hopenfeld for Bomgar Corporation (FEE PAID). (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B)(baf, ) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION ENTERED - REQUEST EXCEEDS THE NUMBER OF DAYS THAT THE CLERK CAN GRANT - ATTORNEY MUST FILE A MOTION***Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Genesys Conferencing Inc, Genesys SA.( Hardin, Roy) Modified on 1/6/2011 (baf, ). (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Best Buy Co., Inc..( Faulkner, Rickey) Modified on 1/6/2011 (baf, ). (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION ENTERED - REQUEST EXCEEDS THE NUMBER OF DAYS THAT THE CLERK CAN GRANT - ATTORNEY MUST FILE A MOTION***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including January 18, 2011 re Elsinore Technologies Inc. (Jones, Michael) Modified on 1/6/2011 (baf, ). (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendant NTR Global and Substitute NTR North America, LLC as Defendant by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T, Inc..( Clonts, David) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 203 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Gemini IP LLC's Opposition to Defendant Venti Solutions LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Xiang Long Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Otteson, James) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Elsinore Technologies Inc. on 11/19/2010, answer due: 12/10/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to GFI USA, Inc. on 11/22/2010, answer due: 12/13/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Venti Solutions, LLC on 11/22/2010, answer due: 12/13/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. on 11/18/2010, answer due: 12/9/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/29/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LogMeIn, Inc..( Judson, David) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/29/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Genesys Conferencing Inc, Genesys SA.( Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/28/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory S Arovas for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,Gregory S Arovas for Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.,Gregory S Arovas for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (FEE PAID). (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B)(baf, ) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 144 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Bomgar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LANDesk Software Inc (Tidwell, James) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Xiang Long on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Long, Xiang) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Mucchetti Eno on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Eno, Monica) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: 12/13/2010, Terminated: 3/28/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Venti Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Verification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanes, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: 12/13/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GFI USA, Inc..( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard W. Hanes for Venti Solutions, LLC (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lewis V Popovski for Sony Corporation of America (FEE PAID RECEIPT #6-1012). (baf, ) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bryan Nese for Sony Corporation of America (FEE PAID RECEIPT #6-1012). (baf, ) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney T Cy Walker for Sony Corporation of America (FEE PAID RECEIPT #6-1012). (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(baf, ) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/9/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 169 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC's Answer to Defendant Saba's Counterclaims by Gemini IP LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Zenith Infotech Ltd..( Barzilay, Ilan) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Corporation of America.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re International Business Machines Corp..( Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LivePerson, Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension)(McCoy, Clark) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to International Business Machines Corp. on 11/18/2010, answer due: 12/9/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to ConnectWise, Inc. on 11/17/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Zenith Infotech Ltd. on 11/17/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC on 11/17/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Best Buy Co., Inc. on 11/15/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to LogMeIn, Inc. on 11/17/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Avaya Inc on 11/16/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to NTRglobal on 11/16/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Sony Corporation on 11/17/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to AT&T, Inc. on 11/15/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Zoho Corporation on 11/17/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to LivePerson, Inc. on 11/18/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to N-able Technologies Incorporated on 11/18/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T, Inc..( Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NTRglobal.( Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Avaya Inc.( Green, Christopher) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Best Buy Co., Inc..( Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Otteson on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Otteson, James) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LogMeIn, Inc..( Judson, David) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to International Business Machines Corp.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant LANDesk Software, Inc.'s ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, by LANDesk Software Inc.(Tidwell, James) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 146 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Saba's ANSWER to 144 Amended Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by Saba Software Inc.(Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint re Genesys Conferencing Inc, Genesys SA.( Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Elsinore Technologies Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Elsinore Technologies Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: 11/11/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Genesys Conferencing Inc, Genesys SA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Elsinore Technologies Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Avaya Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Best Buy Co., Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Bomgar Corporation. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ConnectWise, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to GFI Software Development, Ltd.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to GFI USA, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LivePerson, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LogMeIn, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to N-able Technologies Incorporated. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to NTRglobal. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Zoho Corporation. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Corporation of America. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Venti Solutions, LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Zenith Infotech Ltd.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***MOTION WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO ORDER 314 ***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 3/28/2011 (baf, ). (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Genesys Conferencing Inc, Genesys SA, LANDesk Software Inc, Saba Software Inc, Avaya Inc, Best Buy Co., Inc., Bomgar Corporation, ConnectWise, Inc., Elsinore Technologies Inc., GFI Software Ltd., GFI USA, Inc., GFI Software Development, Ltd., LogMeIn, Inc., N-able Technologies Incorporated, NTRglobal, Venti Solutions, LLC, Zoho Corporation, Zenith Infotech Ltd., LivePerson, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, AT&T, Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, filed by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - The Court set a deadline of 11/3/2010 for the Plaintiff to file an amended complaint naming any new defendants. After the new defendants have filed an answer, all counsel shall confer in an effort to reach an agreement on a scheduling order which shall be submitted to the Court. The Court indicated that the dates of 11/9/2011 or 11/17/2011 are possible dates for a markman hearing in this case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 10/31/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference (30 pages) held on October 13, 2010, before Judge Richard Schell. Court Reporter: Jerry Kelley, JerryKelleyCRR@aol.com Telephone number: 214-872-4829. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be purchased from the Court Reporter or viewed at the court's public terminal before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be purchased from the Court Reporter or PACER. Redaction Request due 11/8/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2011. (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Schell: Status Conference held on 10/13/2010. (Court Reporter Jerry Kelley.) (bss, ) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl C Scherz on behalf of Genesys Conferencing Inc, Genesys SA (Scherz, Carl) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Harry C Marcus for Genesys Conferencing Inc,Harry C Marcus for Genesys Conferencing Inc,Harry C Marcus for Genesys SA,Harry C Marcus for Genesys SA (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roy William Hardin on behalf of Genesys Conferencing Inc (Hardin, Roy) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY - ATTORNEY TO REFILE***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roy William Hardin on behalf of LANDesk Software Inc (Hardin, Roy) Modified on 10/8/2010 (baf, ). (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/13/2010 11:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell. (cm, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Gemini IP LLC of Readiness for Status Conference (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 133 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd Y Brandt terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 6/9/2010. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Ellsworth Davis, III on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: 4/5/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Gemini IP LLC. (Pridham, David) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Wesley Spangler on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DISREGARD ERROR IN DOCUMENT ATTORNEY TO REFILE***STATUS REPORT by Gemini IP LLC. (Pridham, David) Modified on 3/8/2010 (lhj, ). (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 126 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Clyde Moody Siebman terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 11/12/2009. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: 11/11/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 11/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by Gemini IP LLC. (Pridham, David) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. The parties shall file joint status reports every 4 months or upon further action by the PTO, whichever occurs first; and the next joint status report is due on 8/1/2009. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/2/2009. (pad, ) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT (Corrected) by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Pridham, David) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Gemini IP LLC. (Pridham, David) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Gemini IP LLC. (Pridham, David) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT - Pursuant to Court Order 106 Order on Motion to Stay, the parties are to jointly file a monthly status report informing the Court of the status of this case. The Court relaxes the requirement of a monthly status report and hereafter requests that the parties jointly file a status report quarterly beginning on December 15, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/18/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT (Joint) by LANDesk Software Inc, Saba Software Inc, Genesys SA, Genesys Conferencing Inc, Gemini IP LLC. (Tidwell, James) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Regarding Reexamination Proceedings by LANDesk Software Inc. (Jackson, Donald) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 112 Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC and the Premiere dfts are hereby dismissed with prejduice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled "PATENT LICENSE AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT" dated 6/30/2008. It is further ORDERED that all atty's fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. The Premiere dfts hereby dismissed are Premiere Global Serivces, Inc., Netspoke, Inc. and iMeet, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/26/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 114 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael J Newton terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/26/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 111 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Mike Amerson and Danny Lloyd Williams terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/26/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Reexamination Proceeding by LANDesk Software Inc. (Jackson, Donald) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Premiere Defendants by Premiere Global Services Inc, Netspoke Inc, iMeet Inc, Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REPRESENTATION) by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Patent Office Reexamination Proceeding by LANDesk Software Inc. (Jackson, Donald) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Patent Office Reexamination Proceeding by LANDesk Software Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PTO Decision on Reexam Request)(Jackson, Donald) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 107 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amy Elizabeth LaValle terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/1/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 92 Motion to Stay - It is ORDERED that this action is STAYED until the pending reexamination proceedings of the patent-in-suit (US Patent No. 6,177,932) are completed by the United States Patent and Trademark Office. The alternative request in the Motion is DENIED AS MOOT. The parties are further ORDERED to jointly file a monthly status report on the 15th day of every month informing the court of the status of this case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/14/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Continue Certain Claim Construction Dates by LANDesk Software Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Jackson, Donald) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 98 Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that all claims of action asserted in this suit between Gemini and Citrix are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to the right of the parties to assert in the future any such claims subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement between Gemini and Citrix. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/7/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 92 MOTION to Stay This Action While The United States Patent and Trademark Office Reassesses The Patentability of the Patent-In-Suit Or, In The Alternative, Pending The Outcome of An Early Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Responses due by 4/8/2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/7/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 90 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by LANDesk Software, Inc. by Gemini IP LLC. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 92 MOTION to Stay This Action While The United States Patent and Trademark Office Reassesses The Patentability of the Patent-In-Suit Or, In The Alternative, Pending The Outcome of An Early Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Saba Software, Inc. (Unopposed) filed by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by LANDesk Software Inc Defendants' Notice of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Jackson, Donald) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 92 MOTION to Stay This Action While The United States Patent and Trademark Office Reassesses The Patentability of the Patent-In-Suit Or, In The Alternative, Pending The Outcome of An Early Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Citrix Systems, Inc. (Stipulated) by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Genesys SA, Genesys Conferencing Inc Notice of Filing Responses to Gemini's First Set of Document Requests (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 82 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Genesys S.A. and Genesys Conferencing, Inc. by Gemini IP LLC. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by LANDesk Software Inc Notice of Joinder in Motion to Stay by LANDesk, the Genesys Defendants, and the Premiere Defendants (Jackson, Donald) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED*** Additional Attachments to Main Document: 92 MOTION to Stay This Action While The United States Patent and Trademark Office Reassesses The Patentability of the Patent-In-Suit Or, In The Alternative, Pending The Outcome of An Early Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity.. (Abrahamsen, Robert) Modified on 3/18/2008 (pad, ). (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 92 MOTION to Stay This Action While The United States Patent and Trademark Office Reassesses The Patentability of the Patent-In-Suit Or, In The Alternative, Pending The Outcome of An Early Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (March 17, 2008 Declaration of Robert M. Abrahamsen) filed by Saba Software Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21)(Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay This Action While The United States Patent and Trademark Office Reassesses The Patentability of the Patent-In-Suit Or, In The Alternative, Pending The Outcome of An Early Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Saba Software Inc. (Abrahamsen, Robert) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2008 (pad, ). (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed - Genesys SA d/b/a Genesys Conferencing served on 2/14/2008, answer due 3/5/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by LANDesk Software Inc.(Tidwell, James) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 87 Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3//6/2008. (pad, ) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Paten Rules 3-1 and 3-2 as to Defendant Citrix Systems Inc. The Plaintiff's deadline to comply shall be extended to 3/17/2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/6/2008. (pad, ) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Entry of Protective Order by LANDesk Software Inc. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Protective Order)(Tidwell, James) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 as to Defendant Citrix Systems, Inc. by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Consent Form and Notice of Case Assignment sent electronically to Genesys SA, Genesys Conferencing Inc (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Case Assignment) (baf, ) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Saba Software Inc of Filing of Ex Parte Reexamination Request with the United States Patent and Trademark Office (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Request for Ex Parte Reexamination# 2 Exhibit Ex. A to Ex Parte Request for Reexamination (Patent No. 6,493,447)# 3 Exhibit Ex. B to Ex Parte Request for Reexamination (Patent No. 6,295,551)# 4 Exhibit Ex. C to Ex Parte Request for Reexamination (Patent No. 6,256,620)# 5 Exhibit Ex. D to Ex Parte Request for Reexamination (Patent No. 6,070,185))(Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Genesys Conferencing Inc identifying Genesys S.A. as Corporate Parent. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by Genesys SA, Genesys Conferencing Inc.(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Genesys SA identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Gemini IP LLC Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Saba Software Inc of Service of Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures (Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by LANDesk Software Inc (Tidwell, James) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Premiere Global Services Inc, Netspoke Inc, iMeet Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (Najim, Samuel) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Mike Amerson on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Amerson, J) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Williams, Danny) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 69 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Gemini IP LLC. It is ORDERED that all claims or causes of action asserted in this suit against dfts Mitel Networks Corp and Inter-Tel (Delaware), Inc are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that all attys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/20/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Genesys Conferencing Inc (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Scheduling set for 5/4/2009.,Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2008;any responsive pleading may be filed within 14 days after service of an amended pleading.,Fact Discovery due by 12/15/2008.,Expert Witness List due by 11/21/2008 by the party with the burden of proof and by 12/5/2008 by the party without the burden of proof; Each party shall have 15 days to object to any other party's expert witnesses.,Depositions of Expert Witnesses shall be completed prior to 1/7/2009.,Joinder of Parties due by 3/14/2008.,Deadline for the parties to comply with FRCP 26(a)(1) is 2/22/2008.,Joint Proposed Jury instructions and Verdict Form due by 2/27/2009.,Mediation Completion due by 9/30/2008;notify the court of the name, address, and telephone number of the atty-mediator by 8/1/2008.,Motions to transfer, motions to remand, motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions shall be filed by 1/16/2009.,Pretrial disclosure shall be made by the plaintiff by 1/23/2009 and by the defendants by 1/30/2009.,Joint Final Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2009.,Subject to the convenience of the Court's calendar, a Claim Construction Hearing shall be held on 8/13/2008. Motions in Limine shall be filed by 2/27/2009. Plaintiff estimates trial to take 5 days. Defendants estimate trial to take 10 days. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/19/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's deadline to comply with Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 as to Defendant Citrix Systems, Inc. shall be extended to 3/3/2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/20/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Schell: Scheduling Conference held on 2/19/2008. (Court Reporter Jerry Kelley.) (dm, ) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gemini IP LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 as to Defendant Citrix Systems, Inc. by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/18/2008, Entered: 2/18/2008 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Gemini IP LLC of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Genesys Conferencing Inc.( Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Martin Abrahamsen on behalf of Saba Software Inc (Abrahamsen, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Gemini IP LLC (Report of Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(LaValle, Amy) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2008 (baf, ). (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 48 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Citrix Systems, Inc. by Gemini IP LLC. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot 45 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/8/2008. (pad, ) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that Avocent Corp are dismissed w/out prej to the right of the Plaintiff to assert claims in the future. All attys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/8/2008. (pad, ) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Inter-Tel (Delaware), Inc response to Plaintiff's Complaint extended to 2/25/2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/8/2008. (pad, ) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 41 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Premiere Global Services, Inc., Netspoke, Inc., and iMeet, Inc. by Gemini IP LLC. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Inter-Tel by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Francisco Perez on behalf of Gemini IP LLC (Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 45 MOTION to Dismiss by Avocent Corporation filed by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gemini IP LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J Scott Davidson for Avocent Corporation and LANDesk Software Inc (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Donald Lee Jackson (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Berquist (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Consent Form and Notice of Case Assignment sent electronically to Premiere Global Services Inc, Netspoke Inc, iMeet Inc (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Case Assignment) (baf, ) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Consent Form and Notice of Case Assignment sent electronically to LANDesk Software Inc, Citrix Systems Inc (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Case Assignment) (baf, ) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Citrix Systems Inc identifying None as Corporate Parent. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CITRIX SYSTEMS, INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by Citrix Systems Inc.(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Avocent Corporation (Tidwell, James) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LANDesk Software Inc (Tidwell, James) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Avocent Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Saracino Declaration# 2 Jackson Declaration# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tidwell, James) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by LANDesk Software Inc.(Tidwell, James) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time for Genesys Conferencing Inc to respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint up to and including February 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 01/15/08. (lhj, ) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Genesys Conferencing, Inc. by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by Premiere Global Services Inc, Netspoke Inc, iMeet Inc.(Najim, Samuel) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Premiere Global Services Inc, Netspoke Inc, iMeet Inc (Najim, Samuel) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel J Najim on behalf of Premiere Global Services Inc, Netspoke Inc, iMeet Inc (Najim, Samuel) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed - Inter-Tel (Delaware) Incorporated served on 12/26/2007, answer due 1/15/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed - Avocent Corporation served on 12/26/2007, answer due 1/15/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed - LANDesk Software Inc served on 12/26/2007, answer due 1/15/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, the deadline is extended to 2/14/2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 1/8/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Gemini IP LLC. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, for Defendant Inter-Tel (Delaware), Incorporated by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed - Genesys Conferencing Inc served on 12/26/2007, answer due 1/15/2008. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Genesys Conferencing Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Avocent Corporation. (kls, ) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Inter-Tel (Delaware) Incorporated. (kls, ) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to LANDesk Software Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE - Management Conference set for 2/19/2008 at 2:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman) before Judge Richard A. Schell. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/11/2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/19/2007. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline is extended until 1/14/2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/18/2007. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, Citrix's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond Responses due by 1/16/2008. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/18/2007. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Citrix Systems Inc Notice of Appearance by Neil J. McNabnay for Citrix (Reger, Thomas) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Consent Form and Notice of Case Assignment sent electronically to Saba Software Inc (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Case Assignment) (baf, ) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007, Terminated: 12/18/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, Citrix's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond by Citrix Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reger, Thomas) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Premiere Global Services Inc, Netspoke Inc, iMeet Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campagna, Mark) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Saba Software Inc (Foster, James) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant Saba Software, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC by Saba Software Inc.(Foster, James) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James John Foster on behalf of Saba Software Inc (Foster, James) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gemini IP LLC. Citrix Systems Inc served on 11/26/2007, answer due 12/17/2007. (kls, ) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gemini IP LLC. Premiere Global Services Inc served on 11/26/2007, answer due 12/17/2007. (kls, ) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gemini IP LLC. Saba Software Inc served on 11/26/2007, answer due 12/17/2007. (kls, ) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gemini IP LLC identifying Plutus IP, LLC as Corporate Parent. (LaValle, Amy) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Consent Form and Notice of Case Assignment sent electronically to Gemini IP LLC (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Case Assingment) (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Netspoke Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Premiere Global Services Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Genesys Conferencing Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Inter-Tel (Delaware) Incorporated. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Saba Software Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to iMeet Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Genesys SA. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LANDesk Software Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Avocent Corporation. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Mitel Networks Corporation. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Citrix Systems Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Avocent Corporation, LANDesk Software Inc, Saba Software Inc, Genesys SA, Genesys Conferencing Inc, Premiere Global Services Inc, Netspoke Inc, iMeet Inc, Citrix Systems Inc, Mitel Networks Corporation, Inter-Tel (Delaware) Incorporated (Filing fee $ 350;receipt #4-2-1937), filed by Gemini IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(baf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 382 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?