Software Tree LLC v. Red Hat Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:09-cv-00097
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Dell, Inc. Dell, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Perot Systems Corp
Unknown Role, Quest Software, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2010 Michael C. Barrett +1 512 474 5201 +1 512 536 4598 mbarrett@fulbright.com
No Logo Genuitec, LLC, Counter-Claimant
Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Candice C. Decaire +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 cdecaire@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TONYA R. DEEM +1 336 607 7485 +1 336 734 2653 tdeem@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tiffany L Williams +1 404 815 6500 tiwilliams@kilpatrickstockton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Software Tree, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Navarro Huff, PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Shore Chan Bragalone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Bragalone +1 214 593 9110 +214 593 593 9111 jbragalone@ShoreChan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ari Benjamin Rafilson +1 214 593 9110 +1 214 593 9111 arafilson@shorechan.com
No Logo Louis Brucculeri, Technical Advisor
No Logo Robert W Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (419) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the pltf and defts each pay $9,215.29 to Lou Brucculeri for services rendered and expenses incurred through 9-11-2010 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $18,430.58. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/05/10. cc:attys 11-08-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Parties shall take nothing and all pending motions are DENIED as moot. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims are DISMISSED in their entirety. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/10. cc:attys 10-08-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal By and Between Plaintiff Software Tree, LLC and Defendant Red Hat, Inc. by Red Hat Inc., Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER that all pending motions in this civil action are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/10. cc:attys 9-30-10(mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 415 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
          Sealed Document. 9.28.2010 MINUTES. (rlf, ) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
            MOTION to Expedite - Defendant Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion for Expedited Briefing on its Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding Plaintiff's Improper Privilege Objections by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
              Emergency MOTION to Compel - Defendant Red hat, Inc.'s Renewed Emergency Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding Plaintiff's Improper Privilege Objections by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. re 320 Order, - Notice of Compliance with Court Order (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 351 Emergency MOTION Request for Clarification of Court's Order of August 11, 2010, Regarding Production of Emails re 320 Order,Emergency MOTION Request for Clarification of Court's Order of August 11, 2010, Regarding Production of Emails re 320 Order, by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Software Tree LLC 's Objections to Defendant's Fourth Amended Trial Exhibit List (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Software Tree LLC re 406 Notice (Other) Objections to Defendant's Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Software Tree LLC re 405 Notice (Other) Objections to Defendant's Amended Deposition Designations (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Joint Notice Regarding Motions in Limine (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. of Objections to Plaintiff's Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. of Objections and Rebuttal Designations to Plaintiff's Amended Initial Deposition Designations (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 404 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 380 SEALED MOTION RED HATS MOTION IN LIMINE No. 10 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Jennifer M. Rynell and Exhibits A-F, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2010: # 8 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 403 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 377 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT RED HAT, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE CONCERNING INVENTORS UN-WITNESSED HANDWRITTEN NOTES filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ari Rafilson and Exhibit A)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 381 SEALED MOTION RED HATS MOTION IN LIMINE No. 11 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ari Rafilson and Exhibits A & B)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 401 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 376 MOTION in Limine Motions in Limine Nos. 1-6 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Jennifer M. Rynell and Exhibits A & B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 400 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 382 SEALED MOTION RED HATS MOTION IN LIMINE No. 12 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Jennifer M. Rynell, # 2 Exhibit A-L, # 3 Exhibit M-Q)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2010: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Software Tree LLC re 384 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant Red Hat Inc.'s First and Second Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 398 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 378 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT RED HAT, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 397 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 379 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT RED HAT, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Jennifer M. Rynell and Exhibits A-E)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Red Hat Inc., Software Tree LLC re 393 Order, Set Hearings,, Proposed Pre-Trial Conference Agenda (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Software Tree LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 394 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 375 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Software Tree LLC's Motions in Limine filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 9/28/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. The parties shall submit an agenda setting forth the issues to be addressed at the pretrial conference no later than 9-24-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/22/10. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Plaintiff's Estimates of Time Requested for Jury Selection and Trial (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 388 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/21/10. cc:attys 9-21-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. - Red Hat's Notice of Estimated Trial Time (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER adopting 346 Report & Recommendations, and denying in part 235 Sealed Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief to Preserve Evidence. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/10. cc:attys 9-21-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct - Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER setting In Chambers Conference for 9/28/2010 12:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Lead trial counsel, local counsel, and a party representative are ordered to attend. The parties representative shall have full settlement authority and authority to consent to trial before Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/10. cc:attys 9-20-10(mll, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 386 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    SEALED Sur-Reply to Software Tree Motion for Sanctions 327 [Dkt. 327 filed as Combined Response to Dkt. 293, Red Hat Motion to Dismiss, and Motion for Sanctions], filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 9/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Proposed Order to Dkt. 375 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Software Tree LLC's Motions in Limine. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/22/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/18/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Plaintiff Software Tree's PreTrial Objections (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/18/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. Red Hat's Objections to Plaintiff's Pre-Trial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 382 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            SEALED MOTION RED HATS MOTION IN LIMINE No. 12 by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 381 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              SEALED MOTION RED HATS MOTION IN LIMINE No. 11 by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 380 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                SEALED MOTION RED HATS MOTION IN LIMINE No. 10 by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 379 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT RED HAT, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 378 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT RED HAT, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 377 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT RED HAT, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE CONCERNING INVENTORS UN-WITNESSED HANDWRITTEN NOTES by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Motions in Limine Nos. 1-6 by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 375 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Software Tree LLC's Motions in Limine by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Glenn E. Janik)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER that parties consider consenting to US Magistrate Judge John Love for this case to proceed to trial in October. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/10. cc:attys 9-17-10(mll, ) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 372 Motion to Withdraw, and withdrawing 361 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/15/10. cc:attys 9-16-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 361 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Software Tree, LLC's Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Indemnity-Related Documents from Defendant Red Hat, Inc. by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 370 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 361 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Software Tree, LLC's Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Indemnity-Related Documents from Defendant Red Hat, Inc. Plaintiff's Responses due by 9/20/2010, and Defendant's Replies due by 9/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/14/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 361 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Software Tree, LLC's Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Indemnity-Related Documents from Defendant Red Hat, Inc. by Red Hat Inc., Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 359 Motion for Leave to File Reply; granting 365 Request for Leave to File Sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/10/10. cc:attys 9-13-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. - Defendant's Notice of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 282 (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 358 Motion to Expedite Briefing. The following deadlines apply for briefing relating to Software Tree's Renewed Motion to Compel Regarding Indemnity-Related Documents: Sofware Tree will file its Renewed Motion to Compel Regarding Indemnity-Related Documents by 9-08-2010; Red Hat will file its Response by 9-13-2010; Sofware Tree will file its Reply by 9-16-2010; Red Hat will file its Sur-Reply by 9-20-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/10/10. cc:attys 9-10-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Software Tree, LLC's Reply to Red Hat, Inc.'s Reply to Software Tree, LLC's RESPONSE to 360 Red Hat, Inc.'s Reply to Software Tree, LLC's Response to DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/10/2010 (kls, ). Modified on 9/10/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 359 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Software Tree's Response to Red Hat, Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Alternative Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/10/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ***DISREGARD ENTRY - NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL*** Sealed Document. Plaintiff Software Tree's Sur-Reply to Red Hat's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(1) [Dkt 293] (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Timothy Kao)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/10/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Software Tree LLC of Compliance Regarding Objections to Defendant Red Hat, Inc.'s Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Rynell, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. - Notice of Compliance Regarding Red Hat's Objections to Software Tree LLC's Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/14/2010 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Software Tree, LLC's Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Indemnity-Related Documents from Defendant Red Hat, Inc. by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer M. Rynell, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2010: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 354 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) - Red Hat, Inc.'s Reply to Software Tree, LLC's Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority by Red Hat Inc.. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Software Tree's Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Software Tree, LLC's Renewed Motion to Compel Regarding Indemnity-Related Documents by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 354 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Software Tree LLC of Compliance Regarding Rebuttal Deposition Designations and Objections to Defendant's Deposition Designations (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. - Notice of Compliance Regarding Red Hat's Objections and Rebuttal Designations to Plaintiff's Amended Initial Deposition Designations (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. re 272 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101) (NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 353 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to 351 Emergency MOTION Request for Clarification of Court's Order of August 11, 2010, Regarding Production of Emails re 320 Order, filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ari Rafilson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 352 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 293 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION Request for Clarification of Court's Order of August 11, 2010, Regarding Production of Emails re 320 Order, by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Deem, Tonya) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2010: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. Red Hat, Inc.'s Amended and Restated Deposition Designations (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 347 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 293 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Responses due by 8/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/27/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER adopting 227 Report & Recommendations and denying 132 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/10. cc:attys 8-26-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 293 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence filed by Software Tree LLC, be denied in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/25/10. cc:attys 8-25-10(mll, ) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2010 re 272 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101) filed by Red Hat Inc., 234 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Non-Infringement Report of Dr. David A. Wilson filed by Software Tree LLC, 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion for and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 USC Section 305 filed by Red Hat Inc., 233 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Damages Opinion of Terry L. Musika filed by Software Tree LLC, 230 SEALED MOTION - Defendant Red Hat's Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 40-42 filed by Red Hat Inc., 231 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. William Iverson, and the Damages Calculations of Dr. Vander Veen That Are Based on Mr. Iverson's Opinions filed by Red Hat Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. re 319 Order on Motion to Compel Second Notice of Compliance with Court Order (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. re 319 Order on Motion to Compel Notice of Compliance with Court Order (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. re 317 Order on Sealed Motion, Notice of Compliance with Court Order (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 8/10/10 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 117 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/16/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2010. (sms, ) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 340 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Plaintiff Software Trees Sur-Reply to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32, and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 [Dkt 272]. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ari Rafilson)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. (Defendant Red Hat, Inc.'s Deposition Designations) (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Software Tree LLC of Compliance Regarding Deposition Designations (Rynell, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 328 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that Red Hat shall be allowed an additional 2 pages for its Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42, and Software Tree shall be allowed an additional 5 pages for its anticipated Sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/19/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 230 SEALED MOTION - Defendant Red Hat's Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 40-42, 272 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101), 231 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. William Iverson, and the Damages Calculations of Dr. Vander Veen That Are Based on Mr. Iverson's Opinions, 234 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Non-Infringement Report of Dr. David A. Wilson, 233 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Damages Opinion of Terry L. Musika, 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion for and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 USC Section 305 : Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Each party shall have 30 minutes per side, per motion, to present arguments to be considered. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/17/10. cc:attys 8-18-10(mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Red Hat Inc., Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 334 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document - Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law for Issues to be Tried to the Bench. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Pretrial Order by Red Hat Inc., Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 332 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document: Red Hat's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law for Issues to be Tried by the Bench. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Request for Daily Transcript and Real-Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real-Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2010 re 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence filed by Software Tree LLC, 269 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories from Defendant Red Hat, Inc., Brief in Support and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Software Tree LLC, 264 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER PRIVILEGE OBJECTIONS filed by Red Hat Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding Reply and Sur-Reply Briefs on Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 [Dkt. 272] by Red Hat Inc., Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 327 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 293 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 272 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101) filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 231 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. William Iverson, and the Damages Calculations of Dr. Vander Veen That Are Based on Mr. Iverson's Opinions filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Glenn Janik, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 230 SEALED MOTION - Defendant Red Hat's Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 40-42 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ari Rafilson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Affidavit of Tony Hosking, Ph.D.)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion for and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 USC Section 305 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 322 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 233 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Damages Opinion of Terry L. Musika, filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 234 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Non-Infringement Report of Dr. David A. Wilson filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER grantng in part 269 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories from Defendant Red Hat, Inc., Brief in Support and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Software Tree LLC. If parties cannot agree to the terms of producing the IRC logs, the parties may seek relief from the Court by 9-01-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/11/10. cc:attys 8-12-10(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part 269 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/11/10. cc:attys 8-11-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part 264 Sealed Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding pltf Software Tree LLC's Improper Privilege Objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/11/10. cc:attys 8-11-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part 235 Sealed Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief to Preserve Evidence. The Court orders deft Red Hat to provide pltf with an affidavit that properly characterizes the following four products: JBoss Enterprise Middleware System, JBoss Red Hat Application Stack, JBoss Seam, and JBoss Enterprise Portal Platform. Deft shall provide pltf with the affidavit by 8-23-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/11/10. cc:attys 8-11-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that the parties file Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by 8-17-2010 on the issues referenced at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/11/10. cc:attys 8-11-10(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 264 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER PRIVILEGE OBJECTIONS filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer M. Rynell, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 311 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/06/10. ccattys 8-06-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 264 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER PRIVILEGE OBJECTIONS filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 272 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101) filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ari Rafilson, # 2 Exhibit A-C)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 170 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 302 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/04/10. cc:attys 8-05-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the parties meet and confer on the Court's Charge and submit a proposed Charge to the Court by 8-06-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/04/10. cc:attys 8-05-10(mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 230 SEALED MOTION - Defendant Red Hat's Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 40-42 filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 2 Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 2 Part 4)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 307 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***SEALED DOCUMENT #307 REFILED UNSEALED AS DOCUMENT #308*** SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 230 SEALED MOTION Defendant Red Hat's Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 40-42 filed by Red Hat Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 2 Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 2 Part 4)(Deem, Tonya) Modified on 8/3/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 306 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 231 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. William Iverson, and the Damages Calculations of Dr. Vander Veen That Are Based on Mr. Iverson's Opinions filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 304 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 233 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Damages Opinion of Terry L. Musika filed by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion for and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 USC Section 305 filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Joint Motion to Exceed Page Limitations with Respect to the Reply and Sur-Reply to Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 40-42) by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER adopting 225 Memorandum Opinion and Order of the Magistrate Judge, and denying 241 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/10. cc:attys 8-02-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 300 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 234 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Non-Infringement Report of Dr. David A. Wilson filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer M. Rynell, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 294 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/29/10. cc:attys 7-29-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 298 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 294 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 293) filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 294 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 293) filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 296 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 295 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 264 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER PRIVILEGE OBJECTIONS filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer M. Rynell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 293) by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 293 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/27/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 289 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 264 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER PRIVILEGE OBJECTIONS, 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence; Responses due by 7/27/2010. Deft shall have to 8-02-2010 to submit a Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/27/10. cc:attys 7-27-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 269 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories from Defendant Red Hat, Inc., Brief in Support and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION to 227 Report and Recommendations, Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Reply in Further Support of its Objections to Report and Recommendation Denying Summary Judgment by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ari Rafilson)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence, 264 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER PRIVILEGE OBJECTIONS by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 241 MOTION for Reconsideration re 225 Memorandum & Opinion, - Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction MOTION for Reconsideration re 225 Memorandum & Opinion, - Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction filed by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 269 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories from Defendant Red Hat, Inc., Brief in Support and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey R. Bragalone with Exs. A-B, # 2 Affidavit of David Klausner with Exs. A-C)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 283 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/20/10. cc:attys 7-21-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 285 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 230 SEALED MOTION - Defendant Red Hat's Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 40-42 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ari Rafilson, # 2 Exhibit A-G, # 3 Exhibit H-Q, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion for and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 USC Section 305 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Timothy T. Wang with Exhs A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-G, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Red Hat's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, 65 [Dkt No. 129] by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 282 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer M. Rynell, # 2 Exhibit A-P)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 281 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 231 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. William Iverson, and the Damages Calculations of Dr. Vander Veen That Are Based on Mr. Iverson's Opinions filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Glenn E. Janik, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A1, # 4 Exhibit A2, # 5 Exhibit A3, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit B1, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 280 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 234 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Non-Infringement Report of Dr. David A. Wilson filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 279 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 233 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Damages Opinion of Terry L. Musika filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 269 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories from Defendant Red Hat, Inc., Brief in Support and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 271 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/19/10. cc:attys 7-19-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mitchell G Stockwell on behalf of Red Hat Inc. (Stockwell, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 242 Objection to Report and Recommendations - RHT's Reply in Further Support of its Objections to Report and Recommendation of US Magistrate Judge Denying Summary Judgment Under 35 USC Section 112 Para 2, 6 by Red Hat Inc.. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 241 MOTION for Reconsideration re 225 Memorandum & Opinion, - Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction MOTION for Reconsideration re 225 Memorandum & Opinion, - Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael T Morlock for Red Hat Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment (Red Hat's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101) by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28, 32 and 40-42 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 269 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories from Defendant Red Hat, Inc., Brief in Support and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Software Tree LLC. The Court grants the request for expedited hearing. Defendant's Response is due 7-19-2010. Pltf's Reply is due 7-22-2010. Deft's Surreply is due 7-27-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/13/10. cc:attys 7-14-10(mll, ) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories from Defendant Red Hat, Inc., Brief in Support and Request for Expedited Hearing by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer Rynell, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-F to the Declaration of Jennifer Rynell, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits G-S to the Declaration of Jennifer Rynell, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits T-W to the Declaration of Jennifer Rynell, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order with Expedited Briefing)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $2,279.56 to Lou Brucculeri for services rendered and expenses incurred as the technical advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $4,559.12. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/12/10. cc:attys 7-12-10(mll, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 266 Motion to Withdraw 266 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Docket No. 246 - Emergency Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/9/2010. (gsg) Modified on 7/9/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Docket No. 246 - Emergency Motion for Protective Order by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Dkt. 246 - Emergency Motion for Protective Order (Bragalone, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/7/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 264 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/27/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER PRIVILEGE OBJECTIONS by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 263 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 242 Objection to Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Denying Summary Judgment [Dkt 227] by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 241 MOTION for Reconsideration re 225 Memorandum & Opinion, - Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction MOTION for Reconsideration re 225 Memorandum & Opinion, - Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction filed by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 238 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant Red Hat, Inc.s Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint by Software Tree LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 222 Motion for Leave to File Supplement Infringement Contentions. Parties shall complete additional discovery by 7-26-2010; Defendant shall serve a supplemental report by 7-19-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/30/10. cc:attys 6-30-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 257 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence; Responses due by 7/6/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/30/10. cc:attys 6-30-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lubozynski, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2010: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 256 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED (CORRECTED DKT 250)REPLY to Response to Motion re 222 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ari Rafilson, # 2 Exhibit A-N)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 252 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/28/10. cc:attys 6-28-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 251 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/28/10. cc:attys 6-28-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 249 Motion for Extension of Time, and extending time by which Red Hat may respond to pltf's Motion up to and including 7-09-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/28/10. cc:attys 6-28-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Dkt 250] by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Dkt 250] by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DISREGARD ENTRY - TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY WITH CORRECTED ATTACHMENT*** SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 222 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ari Rafilson, # 2 Exhibit A-N)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/28/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File - Consent Motion to Extend the Deadline by Which Red Hat May Respond to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Protective Order by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 182 Sealed Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Plaintiff shall produce exhibits A, B, and D to the Oracle agreement and documents relating to the negotiation of the agreements with IBM and Kyrsagih Bros by 6-28-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/24/10. cc:attys 6-24-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER staying the 6-23-2010 deposition on written questions pending its ruling on pltf's emergency motion for protective order. Deft Red Hat Inc is ordered to respond to pltf's motion by 6-25-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/23/10. cc:attys 6-24-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***Withdrawn per order 267 ***Emergency SEALED MOTION Software Trees Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c) and Motion for Emergency Interim Relief Staying the Deposition on Written Questions of PicDS by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/9/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER adopting 178 Order on Sealed Motions, and overruling 189 Response/Objections to 178 Order filed by Software Tree LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/10. cc:attys 6-22-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 243 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence. Responses due by 6/30/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/21/2010. (kls, ) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 235 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lubozynski, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to 227 Report and Recommendations by Red Hat Inc.. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 225 Memorandum & Opinion, - Red Hat, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 237 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that the page limit for Red Hats Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity shall be exended to July 19, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/15/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 239 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 222 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Deem, Tonya) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2010: # 10 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Red Hat's ANSWER to 221 Amended Complaint, (Second Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against Software Tree LLC by Red Hat Inc..(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and to Extend Response Deadlines by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 218 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Software Tree LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 235 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/21/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief for Preservation of Evidence by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rynell Decl Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Rynell Decl Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Rynell Decl Part 3, # 4 Affidavit of Ari Rafilson, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/25/2010 (mll, ). (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 234 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Non-Infringement Report of Dr. David A. Wilson by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ari Rafilson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 233 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of the Damages Opinion of Terry L. Musika by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Glenn E. Janik, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part I, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part II, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. re 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion for and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 USC Section 305 (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 231 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION To Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. William Iverson, and the Damages Calculations of Dr. Vander Veen That Are Based on Mr. Iverson's Opinions by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 230 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION - Defendant Red Hat's Motion and Brief in Support for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 40-42 by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-1, # 5 Exhibit D-2, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F-1, # 8 Exhibit F-2, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I-1, # 12 Exhibit I-2, # 13 Exhibit I-3, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) Modified on 6/8/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. - Red Hat's Notice of Compliance Regarding Rebuttal Trial Witness List (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Notice of Compliance Regarding Rebuttal Trial Witness List (Rynell, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 132 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 for Indefiniteness Under 35 USC Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by Red Hat Inc., be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/01/10. cc:attys 6-02-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING TRIAL WITNESS LIST (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. The Court's claim interpretations are set forth in the table attached to this order as Appendix A. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/28/10. cc:attys 6-01-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Notice of Compliance Regarding Trial Witness List (Rynell, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 223 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 222 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit A-4, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C-1, # 7 Exhibit C-2, # 8 Exhibit C-3, # 9 Exhibit C-4)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND JURY DEMAND against Red Hat Inc., filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2010: # 3 Searchable Exhibit B) (mjc, ). (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sur-Reply of Red Hat, Inc. In Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Objections to March 31, 2010 Order 189 Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Love's March 31, 2010 Order" by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Deem, Tonya) Modified on 5/27/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript Redaction Request re 202 Transcript,,, by attorney Jeffrey Ray Bragalone. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaim of Defendant Red Hat, Inc. - ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Tree LLC by Red Hat Inc..(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 190 Sealed Motion for leave to amend answer. The Court orders deft's proposed amendedment be entered as its Second Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/20/10. cc:attys 5-20-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 216 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 182 SEALED MOTION - Motion of Defendant Red Hat, Inc. to Compel Plaintiff Software Tree, LLC to Produce Documents filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ari Rafilson)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF filed PLAINTIFF SOFTWARE TREES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES MARCH 31, 2010 ORDER by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey R. Bragalone)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew M Lubozynski for Red Hat Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Software Tree LLC re 202 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 212 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 190 SEALED MOTION For Leave to Amend the Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaim of Defendant Red Hat, Inc. filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 167 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/13/2010. (kls, ) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Glenn Edward Janik on behalf of Software Tree LLC (Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Marie Rynell on behalf of Software Tree LLC (Rynell, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 208 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 207 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 190 SEALED MOTION For Leave to Amend the Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaim of Defendant Red Hat, Inc. filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Winston O. Huff, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 201 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Frank W Leak, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/06/10. cc:attys 5-10-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven D Moore on behalf of Red Hat Inc. (Moore, Steven) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 204 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 182 SEALED MOTION - Motion of Defendant Red Hat, Inc. to Compel Plaintiff Software Tree, LLC to Produce Documents filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 189 Response to Non-Motion "Red Hat's, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's March 31, 2010 Order Regarding Disclousure of License Agreements by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/25/10 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services,Telephone number: (361) 949-2988. (26 pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2010. (tja, ) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Frank Leak) by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 197 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael C Barrett; Christopher Robert Benson; William Joseph Cornelius, Jr; Gilbert A Greene; Jennifer Parker Ainsworth and David Dean Bahler terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/28/10. cc:attys 4-29-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tiffany L Williams for Red Hat Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Carl E Sanders for Red Hat Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (s) by Dell, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahler, David) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 195 Sealed Response to Motion,.. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 195 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 182 SEALED MOTION - Motion of Defendant Red Hat, Inc. to Compel Plaintiff Software Tree, LLC to Produce Documents filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Winston Huff, # 2 Exhibit A part 1, # 3 Exhibit A part 2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E part 1, # 8 Exhibit E part 2, # 9 Exhibit E part 3, # 10 Exhibit E part 4, # 11 Exhibit E part 5, # 12 Exhibit F-K)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2010: # 13 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 192 Motion to Extend Deadline for Final Round of Mediation. The new deadline for final round of mediation is 5-25-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/26/10. cc:attys 4-26-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 191 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/26/10. cc:attys 4-26-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline for Final Round of Mediation by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 170 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 65 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 190 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION For Leave to Amend the Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaim of Defendant Red Hat, Inc. by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Leak, Frank) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 178 Order on Sealed Patent Motion, Order on Sealed Motion,, Plaintiff Software Tree's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's March 31, 2010 Order by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 184 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Software Tree LLC. Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each side shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/10. cc:attys 4-16-10(mll, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 183 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Software Tree LLC. Defendant Dell Inc is dismissed from this action with prejudice. Each side shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/10. cc:attys 4-16-10(mll, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 185 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for Defendants to file Motion(s) to Reconsider and/or Objection(s) to the Courts Provisional Claim Construction Order is be extended until and through fourteen days after the issuance of the Courts Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/13/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion(s) to Reconsider and/or Objection(s) to the Court's Provisional Claim Construction Order, Docket #177 by Dell, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Hewlett-Packard Company by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Dell, Inc. by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION - Motion of Defendant Red Hat, Inc. to Compel Plaintiff Software Tree, LLC to Produce Documents by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Deem, Tonya) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2010: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that pltf pay $18,838.80 and that defts collectively pay $18,838.80 to Lou Brucculeri for services rendered and expenses incurred through 3-31-2010 as technical advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $37,677.60. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/07/10. cc:attys 4-07-10(mll, ) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 179 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/05/10. cc:attys 4-05-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 170 Order Docket Control Order by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 123 Sealed Patent Motion for Protective Order to Quash Notices of Deposition of its In-House Counsel; granting in part 124 Sealed Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/31/10. cc:attys 3-31-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting forth claim constructions on a provisional basis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/29/10. cc:attys 3-31-10(mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 167 MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff Software Tree, LLC's Corrected Motion for Protective Order filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Red Hat Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support re 167 MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff Software Tree, LLC's Corrected Motion for Protective Order Plaintiff Software Tree's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Protective Order Seeking to Limit Discovery filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Winston Oliver Huff)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Candice C Decaire for Red Hat Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 167 MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff Software Tree, LLC's Corrected Motion for Protective Order filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Affidavit - Declaration of Tonya Deem)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 171 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 55 Motion to reset the trial setting; denying 88 Motion to Sever Defendant Hewlet-Packard Company's Patent Infringement Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/05/10. cc:attys 3-05-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 168 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/24/10. cc:attys 2-24-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Dell, Inc. re 132 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 for Indefiniteness Under 35 USC Section 112 Paragraph 2 of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 110 Order Docket Control Order by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahler, David) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff Software Tree, LLC's Corrected Motion for Protective Order by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Winston Oliver Huff, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 163 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and causes of action that were asserted or could have been asserted relating to US Patent No. 5,907,846 are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its respective costs and fees associated with all claims and counterclaims related to the 846 Patent. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/19/10. cc:attys 2-19-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Markman Hearing held on February 2, 2010 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kimberly Julian,Telephone number: 903-533-1172. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (127 pages). Redaction Request due 3/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2010. (rem, ) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION for Discovery Motion for Protective Order by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Winston Huff, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) Modified on 2/19/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Causes of Action Relating to U.S. Patent No. 5,907,846 by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahler, David) (Entered: 02/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Markman Hearing held on 2/2/2010; Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2010 re 132 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 for Indefiniteness Under 35 USC Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by Red Hat Inc. (Court Reporter Kimberly Julian.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 132 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 for Indefiniteness Under 35 USC Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Antony Hosking)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to P.R. 4-3 as to the '846 Patent by Software Tree LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bahler, David) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 158 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/26/10. cc:attys 1-26-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Defendants' Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief [Dkt #157] by Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sur-Reply CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas Schmidt)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 132 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 for Indefiniteness Under 35 USC Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas Schmidt)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to P.R. 4-3 as to the '846 Patent by Software Tree LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bahler, David) Modified on 1/26/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/10. cc:attys 1-25-10(mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Software Tree LLC of Compliance regarding Technical Tutorial (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Dell, Inc. of Compliance regarding Technology Tutorial (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 148 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/10. cc:attys 1-13-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Joint Notice of Time Requested for Markman Hearing (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to 114 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ari Rafilson, # 2 Affidavit of Antony Hosking)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Reply Claim Construction Brief by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rafilson, Ari) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 132 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 for Indefiniteness Under 35 USC Section 112 Paragraph 2 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ari Rafilson, # 2 Appendix of Antony Hosking)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 124 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 143 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Software Tree LLC, and dismissing with prejudice as to deft Genuitec LLC. Each side shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/10. cc:attys 1-07-10(mll, ) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 123 SEALED PATENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT RED HAT, INC. FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH NOTICES OF DEPOSITION OF ITS IN-HOUSE COUNSEL filed by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Genuitec, L.L.C. by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 142 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 124 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ari Rafilson)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 141 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 123 SEALED PATENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT RED HAT, INC. FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH NOTICES OF DEPOSITION OF ITS IN-HOUSE COUNSEL filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 128 Motion Request for Consideration of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/09. cc:attys 12-22-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 124 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 123 SEALED PATENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT RED HAT, INC. FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH NOTICES OF DEPOSITION OF ITS IN-HOUSE COUNSEL Plaintiff Software Tree's Response in Opposition to Motion of Defendant Red Hat, Inc. for Protective Order to Quash Notices of Deposition of Its In-House Counsel filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ari Rafilson, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 128 MOTION - Defendants' Request for Consideration of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 305 With Claim Construction filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tiewei Wang)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** RESPONSE in Opposition re 129 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion for and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 USC Section 305 filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Tiewei Wang)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/17/2009 (mjc, ). (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that pltf Software Tree LLC shall respond to 128 MOTION - Defendants' Request for Consideration of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 305 With Claim Construction filed by Red Hat Inc. Response to motion deadline is 12-16-2009. No further briefing will be allowed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/09. cc:attys 12-14-09(mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 130 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/09. cc:attys 12-14-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,163,776 for Indefiniteness Under 35 USC Section 112 Paragraph 2 by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leak, Frank) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Leak, Frank) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leak, Frank) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion for and Memorandum in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 USC Section 305 by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Leak, Frank) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION - Defendants' Request for Consideration of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Asserted Claims 32, 57-63, and 65 Under 35 U.S.C. Section 305 With Claim Construction by Red Hat Inc.. (Leak, Frank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 12/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order, 126 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 125 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 12/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order, 125 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit part 2, # 3 Exhibit part 3, # 4 Exhibit part 4)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION for Protective Order by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 123 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT RED HAT, INC. FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH NOTICES OF DEPOSITION OF ITS IN-HOUSE COUNSEL by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER appointing Louis Brucculeri, Esq., as technical advisor to the Court in this action, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/09. cc:attys 11-30-09(mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance With P.R. 4-1 (Rafilson, Ari) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Software Tree LLC of Joint Submission of Proposed Technical Advisor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Software Tree LLC of Compliance (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ari Benjamin Rafilson on behalf of Software Tree LLC (Rafilson, Ari) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. of Service of its First Amended Initial Disclosures (Leak, Frank) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Wayne Shore on behalf of Software Tree LLC (Shore, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C-1, # 4 Exhibit C-2, # 5 Exhibit C-3, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C-1, # 4 Exhibit C-2, # 5 Exhibit C-3, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O)(Shore, Michael) Edited docket text to change errata to exhibit for three exhibits per atty's office. Modified on 11/3/2009 (mjc, ). Modified on 11/4/2009 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 111 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall submit the names of their proposed technical advisors up to and including 11-20-2009. No further delays will be allowed due to the impending date of the Markman hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/09. cc:attys 11-02-09(mll, ) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Technical Advisors by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/13/09. cc:attys 10-14-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 108 Motion to Amend and Extend deadline to submit proposed Technical Advisors. The parties shall submit the names of their proposed technical advisors by 10-30-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/13/09. cc:attys 10-14-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 104 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bahler, David) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 88 MOTION to Sever Plaintiff's Motion to Sever Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Patent Infringement Counterclaims filed by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 103 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney David Alan Carman for Genuitec, LLC. Attorney Tonya Michelle Gray and Sean Wooden terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/08/09. cc:attys 10-08-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 102 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall submit the names of their proposed technical advisors by 10-09-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/09. cc:attys 10-07-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney [DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT GENUITEC, L.L.C.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL AND FOR TONYA M. GRAY AND SEAN WOODEN TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL] by Genuitec, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion to Withdraw and to Substitute)(Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Extend Deadline to Submit Proposed Technical Advisors by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 82 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 65 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. The Court will consider the '846 Patent in a separate Markman hearing on 4-29-2010 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are to submit an agreed Amended Docket Control Order that includes a reasonable schedule for the claim construction of the '846 Patent by 10-09-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/09. cc:attys 9-30-09(mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 98 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Proposed Technical Advisors deadline is reset to 10-06-2009. Initial Mediation to be completed deadline is reset to 11-09-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/28/09. cc:attys 9-29-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 MOTION to Sever Plaintiff's Motion to Sever Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Patent Infringement Counterclaims filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahler, David) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 97 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 96 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/23/09. cc:attys 9-23-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 92 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/22/2009 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/09. cc:attys 9-21-09(mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 91 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/09. cc:attys 9-21-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 65 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 82 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 65 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and for an Expedited Briefing ScheduleOpposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 65 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Bahler, David) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Software Tree LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 9/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Sever Plaintiff's Motion to Sever Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Patent Infringement Counterclaims by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 82 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 65 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and for an Expedited Briefing ScheduleOpposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 65 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Stipulated Protective Order by Software Tree LLC, Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Genuitec, LLC, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 79 Response to Non-Motion Software Tree's Counterclaims by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Bahler, David) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiewei Wang on behalf of Software Tree LLC (Wang, Tiewei) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 82 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Pltf shall file its response and supporting documents to HP's Opposed Motion for Entry of an Amended Docket Control Order by 9-11-2009 and deft HP shall file its reply and supporting documents by 9-16-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/09. cc:attys 9-03-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 65 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and for an Expedited Briefing Schedule by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahler, David) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. - Defendants' Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 4-2 (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 66 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 69 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 70 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 68 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Genuitec, L.L.C.'s Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Software Tree LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 55 Opposed MOTION of the Defendants to Reset the Trial Setting Software Tree, LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Reply in Further Support of Motion to Resent Trial Setting filed by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 73 Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. It is therefore ORDERED that the Docket Control Order is amended as listed: PR 4-2, Exchange of Preliminary Claim Construction and Extrinsic Evidence: Current Deadline: August 19, 2009, NEW DEADLINE: 8/24/2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/20/2009. (kls, ) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 53 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Software Tree LLC, Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Genuitec, LLC, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sean Wooden for Genuitec, LLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. - Defendants' Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Tree LLC by Dell, Inc.. (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Tree LLC by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bahler, David) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Tree LLC by Genuitec, LLC.(Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 Opposed MOTION of the Defendants to Reset the Trial Setting filed by Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Genuitec, LLC, Dell, Inc.. (Leak, Frank) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaim of Defendant Red Hat, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Software Tree LLC by Red Hat Inc..(Leak, Frank) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 64 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/09. cc:attys 8-10-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 53 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Software Tree LLC, Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Genuitec, LLC, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Docket Control Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Software Tree LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 Opposed MOTION of the Defendants to Reset the Trial Setting Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Reset the Trial Setting filed by Software Tree LLC. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. of Service of Defendants' Disclosure Pursuant to P.R. 4-1 (Deem, Tonya) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Genuitec, LLC (Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Software Tree LLC of Service of its Initial Disclosures (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company of Service of its Initial Disclosures (Bahler, David) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Red Hat Inc. of Service of its Initial Disclosures (Leak, Frank) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Dell, Inc. of Service of its Initial Disclosures (Barrett, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION of the Defendants to Reset the Trial Setting by Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Genuitec, LLC, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Robert Benson on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Benson, Christopher) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Identify trial witnesses by 5/4/2010, Jury instructions due by 7/2/2010, Mediation Completion due by 9/25/2009. Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2010. Markman Hearing set for 2/4/2010 09:30 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Motions due by 5/7/2010. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2010 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2009. Discovery due by 4/16/2010. Jury Selection set for 9/7/2010 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/2/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/25/09. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/25/2009. (gsg) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Amended Docket Control Order by Software Tree LLC, Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Genuitec, LLC, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Docket Control Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of the Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Software Tree LLC, Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Genuitec, LLC, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit B- Docket Control Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for pltf and defts to file their proposed Discovery and Docket Control orders is extended to 6-22-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/16/09. cc:attys 6-16-09(mll, ) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Software Tree LLC, Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Genuitec, LLC, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Software Tree LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER that the parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 6-15-09. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 6-15-09 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus pltf's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 6-05-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/09. cc:attys 6-3-09(mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the parties submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 6-15-09. For purposes of computing the time deadline under the local patent rules, the Court deems 6-15-09 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus pltf's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 6-05-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/02/09. cc:attys 6-2-09(mll, ) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry -- 6.1.2009 Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 6/1/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Joseph Cornelius, Jr on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company, Dell, Inc. (Cornelius, William) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winston Oliver Huff on behalf of Software Tree LLC (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company by Software Tree LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 28 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant Genuitec, L.L.C. by Software Tree LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to 18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant Dell, Inc. by Software Tree LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 24 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim to Defendant Red Hat, Inc. by Software Tree LLC.(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 6/1/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/21/09. cc:attys 4-21-09(mll, ) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tonya R Deem for Red Hat Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank W Leak, Jr for Red Hat Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William H Boice for Red Hat Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C Alemanni for Red Hat Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Steven Gardner on behalf of Red Hat Inc. (Gardner, John) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Software Tree LLC re 5 Order Plaintiff's Notice for Scheduling Conference (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Genuitec, LLC (Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORIGINAL ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Tree LLC by Genuitec, LLC.(Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett-Packard Company identifying Corporate Parent None for Hewlett-Packard Company. (Bahler, David) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Dell, Inc.. (Bahler, David) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Hat Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Red Hat Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Tree LLC by Red Hat Inc..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilbert A Greene on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael C Barrett on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Barrett, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Tree LLC by Hewlett-Packard Company.(Bahler, David) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Dean Bahler on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Bahler, David) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilbert A Greene on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Tree LLC by Dell, Inc..(Bahler, David) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Dean Bahler on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Bahler, David) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tonya Michelle Gray on behalf of Genuitec, LLC (Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Genuitec, LLC.( Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hewlett-Packard Company.( Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Red Hat Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dell, Inc..( Barrett, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael C Barrett on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Barrett, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Dell, Inc. on 3/4/2009, by personal service; answer due: 3/24/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Red Hat Inc. on 3/4/2009, by personal service; answer due: 3/24/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Hewlett-Packard Company on 3/4/2009, by personal service; answer due: 3/24/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Genuitec, LLC on 3/7/2009, by personal service; answer due: 3/27/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that pltf file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defts have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/05/09. cc:pltf 3-6-09(mll, ) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Red Hat Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Genuitec, LLC, Dell, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Software Tree LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement and Jury Demand against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001900556.), filed by Software Tree LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bragalone, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 229 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?