Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC v. Softlayer Technologies, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:09-cv-00269
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 2:55 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

AOL, Inc. AOL, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, BELL ATLANTIC CORP

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Google, Inc. Google, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Michael Briggs +1 650 614 7400

Represented by Potter Minton PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evette Dionna Pennypacker +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 evettepennypacker@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Antonio R. Sistos +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 antoniosistos@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Match.com, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Michael Briggs +1 650 614 7400

Represented by Potter Minton PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evette Dionna Pennypacker +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 evettepennypacker@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Match.com, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Michael Briggs +1 650 614 7400

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evette Dionna Pennypacker +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 evettepennypacker@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Antonio R. Sistos +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 antoniosistos@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Myspace, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel M Capoccia +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 rmcapoccia@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

PayPal, Inc. PayPal, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Davison +1 202 239 3933 tom.davison@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Storm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL V. STORM +1 214 347 4700 +1 214 347 4799 paulstorm@alliplaw.com
Yahoo, Inc. Yahoo, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Launch Media, Inc.
Google, Inc. Unknown Role, Google, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hortonworks, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Alexander Lee +1 650 798 0300 +1 650 813 5002
TERMINATED: 02/23/2010 Mark Christopher Nelson +1 214 259 0901 +1 214 259 0910 mark.nelson@snrdenton.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2010 Matthew D. Orwig +1 214 259 0990 +1 214 259 0910 matthew.orwig@snrdenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Cannon Low +1 713 654 7632 +1 713 787 1440 jlow@mwe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rachel M Capoccia +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 rmcapoccia@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

No Logo Cme Group Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Woodard Cook +1 214 922 3407 +1 214 922 3837 jason.cook@alston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Davison +1 202 239 3933 tom.davison@alston.com
No Logo Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Baxter +1 903 927 2111 +1 903 927 2622 sbaxter@mckoolsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Cawley +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 dcawley@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Austin Curry +1 214 978 4207 +1 214 978 4044 acurry@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Wayne Hejny +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 shejny@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary Tyson Snider +1 214 978 4048 +1 214 978 4044 rsnider@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Stevenson, III +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 tstevenson@mckoolsmith.com

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

No Logo Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Storm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL V. STORM +1 214 347 4700 +1 214 347 4799 paulstorm@alliplaw.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Intervenor
No Logo Richard Egan, Technical Advisor

Represented by O'Keefe, Egan & Peterman LLP

No Logo Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

No Logo Robert W Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (877) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 881 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    FINAL JUDGMENT. Bedrock shall pay Yahoos costs in the amount of $115,500 in accordance with Bedrock and Yahoos Agreed Bill of Costs 844 . All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/11. cc:attys 9-30-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
      LREF
      Blank 880 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 842 Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and for Attorney Fees and Costs; denying 845 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/11. cc:attys 9-30-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 878 Notice (Other) Yahoo!'s Response to Bedrock's Notice of Conclusion of Second Reexamination (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF SECOND REEXAMINATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER approving payment for services rendered by technical advisor Richard Egan, Austin TX. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/17/11. (leh, ) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              7.26.11 Minute Entry - Post Verdict Hearing: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Post-Verdict Motion Haring held on 7/26/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 868 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply and Surreply to Yahoo!'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity. ORDERED that Yahoo! is granted an extension of time through and including July 12, 2011, to file a reply in support of its Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity and Bedrock is granted an extension of time through and including July 18, 2011 to file a surreply. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/18/2011. (kls, ) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 869 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and For Attorneys' Fees and Costs. ORDERED that Yahoo! is granted an extension of time through and including July 12, 2011, to file a reply in support of its Motion to Declare This an Exceptional Case and For Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 [Dkt. No. 842] and Bedrock is granted an extension of time through and including July 18, 2011 to file a surreply. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/18/2011. (kls, ) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE in Support re 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Lee, John) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE in Support re 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 Yahoo!'s Reply ISO Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 (Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply and Surreply to Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 285) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) (Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File A Reply and Surreply to Yahoo!'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER denying 865 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying 866 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Motions are denied without prejudice if parties can agree on a schedule where all replies and surreplies are filed no later than 7-18-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/11. cc:attys 7-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 861 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                            Sealed Transcript from Trial Proceedings 5/10/11. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 5/10/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 120 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/9/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 325 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/29/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 201 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/29/11 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 176 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 856 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Sealed Transcript from 4/28/11 Afternoon Proceedings. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/28/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 180 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings Morning Session held on 4/28/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 181 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/27/11 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 198 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/27/11 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloaon/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 145 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 849 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 ; Responses due by 7/1/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/22/11. cc:attys 6-22-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 848 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) ; Responses due by 7/1/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/22/11. cc:attys 6-22-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 843 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document: 845 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed).. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13 - U.S. Patent 5,893,120 - PX-1, # 2 Exhibit 14 - 1996 NRL IPv6 code key.c - DX-36, # 3 Exhibit 15 - NRL Source Code - key.h - DX-35, # 4 Exhibit 16 - Information Disclosure Statement - 6/2010 - DX-147C, # 5 Exhibit 17 - Information Disclosure Statement -12-2010 - DX-147E, # 6 Exhibit 18 - Transaction History for Patent Application - DX-147G, # 7 Exhibit 19 - USPTO Notice of Intent to Issue - DX-147F, # 8 Exhibit 20 - Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for the '120 Patent - DX-147H, # 9 Exhibit 21 - US. Patent 5,287,499 - DX-66, # 10 Exhibit 22 - Telcordia documents re: patent application - DX-56, # 11 Exhibit 23 - Yahoo!'s 2004 10K Annual Statement - PX-248)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/22/2011
                                                                            MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity (Renewed) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Alexey Kuznetsov - DX-48, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Source Code - key.c - DX-37, # 4 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent 5,121,495 - DX-65, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Application Approval for Filing - DX-57, # 6 Exhibit 5 - U. S. Patent 6,119,214 - DX101, # 7 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent 4,996,663 - DX-64, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Donald Knuth, Sorting and Searching, vol. 3, of The Art of Computer Programming - DX-98, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Kruse, "Data Structures and Program Design" - DX-108, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Daniel F. Stubbs and Neil W. Webre, Data Structures with Abstract Data Types and Pascal - DX-118, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Kuznetsov email to Day re contact request - DX-436, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Absher email to Kuznetsov re Linux route.c question - DX-440, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Kuznetsov email to Absher re Linux route.c question - DX-441)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 844 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Yahoo!'s AGREED Bill of Costs)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 843 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: Exh. 26 to B. James Decl ISO 842 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2011: # 1 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ). (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/22/2011
                                                                                  Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Yahoo!'s Motion to Declare this an Exceptional Case and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 285 by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit B. James Decl., # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2011: # 27 Text of Proposed Order) (mll, ). (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 839 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are granted an extension to 6-06-2011 to file any post-verdict motions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/06/11. cc:attys 6-06-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 838 Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs. Yahoo! shall file its Bill of Costs no later than 6-06-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/11. cc:attys 6-03-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Verdict Motions by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Yahoo!'s Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Defendant Yahoo!'s Exhibit Lists Tendered During Trial (Bedrock v Yahoo!). (Main Document - Defendant's Exhibit List 1) (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Exhibit List 2, # 2 Defendant's Exhibit List 3, # 3 Defendant's Exhibit List 4, # 4 Defendant's Final List (not marked))(rlf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Plaintiff Bedrock's Exhibit Lists Tendered During Trial (Bedrock v Yahoo!). (Main Document - Plaintiff's Exhibit List 1) (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 2, # 2 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 3, # 3 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 4)(rlf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 835 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Sealed Document. JURY VERDICT IN ITS ENTIRETY (FOREPERSON SIGNATURE INCLUDED). (rlf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 834 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  JURY VERDICT. (rlf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Jury Instructions. (rlf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      5.10.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 5 (BEDROCK V YAHOO!): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial completed on 5/10/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        5.9.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL (BEDROCK V YAHOO!) - DAY 4: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 5/9/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 830 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 829 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc. The verdict rendered in this matter is VACATED and all claims for relief asserted by Bedrock against Google are DISMISSED with prejudice and all claims for relief asserted by Google against Bedrock are DISMISSED with prejudice. All atty's fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/18/11. cc:attys 5-19-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Google, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 828 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER that parties file all post-verdict motions by 6-03-2011. Any post-verdict motions will be heard 7-26-2011; set hearing on post-verdict motions for 7/26/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. The page limits of Local Rule CV-7(a)(1) apply to all post-verdict briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/10/11. cc:attys 5-11-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 817 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. All claims in this action by pltf against deft SofLayer Technologies Inc are dismissed with prejudice; all counterclaims by deft against pltf are dismissed without prejudice; each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/09/11. cc:attys 5-10-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 826 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 818 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Amazon.com Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/09/11. cc:attys 5-10-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 825 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION (Yahoo!'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Laches) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 824 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION Yahoo!, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment As a Matter of Law of No Willful Infringement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 823 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION Yahoo! Renewed Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law Regarding Damages by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 822 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s renewed Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Non-Infringement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 821 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 820 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. Declaration of Keith Ugone In Support of Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence Relevant to the Valuation of the Patent-In-Suit Relating to Intellectual Ventures and Acacia Research (Docket #802) (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 819 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence of Design-Arounds (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit B. James Decl., # 2 Errata Exh. A to B. James Decl., # 3 Affidavit Barrow Decl.)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Amazon.com, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal as to SoftLayer Technologies, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Joint Proposed Jury Instructions)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. Yahoo!s Amended Proposed Verdict Form (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          4.29.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 3 (BEDROCK V YAHOO!): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/29/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. Presented during trial on 4.27.11(rlf, ) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 812 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION to Redact the 4/12/2011 Afternoon Trial Transcript by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Menscher, # 2 Exhibit A - Transcript, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                4.28.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 2(BEDROCK V YAHOO!): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/28/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Pretrial Conference held on 4/26/2011, Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2011 re 756 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY YAHOO AND SOFTLAYER AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, 757 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Stephen Gray filed by Yahoo! Inc. (Court Reporter Kimberly Julian) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 809 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Motion for Judgment As A Matter Of Law Of No Willful Infringement by Yahoo! Inc.. (Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 808 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Motion for Judgment As A Matter Of Law Regarding Damages by Yahoo! Inc.. (Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 807 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Judgment Motion on Law regarding Non-Infringment by Yahoo! Inc.. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          4.27.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 1 (BEDROCK V YAHOO!): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/27/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 799 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft MySpace Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/11. cc:attys 4-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 798 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft AOL Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/11. cc:attys 4-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence of the Second Ex Parte Reexamination (Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 802 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence Relevant to Valuation of Patent-in-Suit Relating to Intellectual Ventures and Acacia Research. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 801 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence of Valuations by D. Garrod and R. Nemes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-1, # 5 Exhibit D-2, # 6 Exhibit D-3, # 7 Exhibit E)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 800 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Yahoo!'s Offer of Proof Concerning Exclusion of Evidence of Jonathan Koomey's Declaration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Koomey Decl.)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of MySpace Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of AOL Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. Yahoo!'s Proposed Jury Verdict Form (Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PROPOSED VERDICT FORM (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR*** Exhibit List Defendant Yahoo!'s Cumulative List of Exhibits Admitted on April 27, 2011 by Yahoo! Inc... (Bright, Christopher) Modified on 4/28/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List (NINTH AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ***Replaces Document 766 *** MOTION to Redact 676 Transcript,,, - Defendants' Motion to Redact Transcript (CORRECTED) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) Modified on 4/27/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List Google's Final List of All Admitted Exhibits by Google Inc... (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 750 Motion for Leave to File. Defts are allowed to identify an expert to testify regarding reexamintion procedures before the US Patent and Trademark Office. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/11. cc:attys 4-27-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRETRIAL HEARING held on 4/26/11 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kimberly J. Julian,Telephone number: 1-800-666-0763. (56 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2011. (tja, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Verdict held on 4/15/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 6 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 4/15/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 107 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 786 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Transcript. 4/14/11 Afternoon Session of Trial. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 4/14/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 111 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 4/14/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 183 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 783 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Transcript. 4/13/11 Afternoon Session of Trial. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 782 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Transcript. 4/13/11 Morning Session of Trial. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 4/13/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 182 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 4/13/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 61 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 779 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Transcript. 4/12/11 Afternoon Session of Trial (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 778 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Transcript. 4/12/11 Morning Session of Trial. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 4/12/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 230 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 4/12/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 43 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 775 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Transcript. 4/11/11 Afternoon Session of Trial. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 4/11/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 196 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 4/11/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 90 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 768 Sealed Patent Motion to Restrict Hours for Second Trial. The time limits stated apply to all issues in the case, whether tried to the jury or the Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/26/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 756 Sealed Patent Motion to Preclude Reliance on Documents and Facts Related to Performance Testing Produced by Yahoo After Close of Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 757 Sealed Motion for Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Stephen Gray. GRANTED to the extent that Stephen Gray may supplement his expert report to address the spinlock theory; DENIED as to the remainder of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/26/11. cc:attys 4-26-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 770 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 768 Yahoo!'s Response to Bedrock's Motion to Restrict Hours for Second Trial SEALED PATENT MOTION TO RESTRICT HOURS FOR SECOND TRIAL filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Bright, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, Yahoo!'s Notice of Third Amended Trial Witness List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Exhibit B - Yahoo!'s Third Amended Trial Witness List)(Lee, John) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 768 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION TO RESTRICT HOURS FOR SECOND TRIAL by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 735 MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Judge Love's Order Granting Bedrock's Motion For Leave To Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein [Doc No 666] MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Judge Love's Order Granting Bedrock's Motion For Leave To Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein [Doc No 666] filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DISREGARD ENTRY - DEFICIENT FOR CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE*** MOTION to Redact 676 Transcript,,, - Defendants' Motion to Redact Transcript by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) Modified on 4/26/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 765 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 753 Yahoo!'s Response in Opposition to Bedrock's Motion in Limine K SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AN UNACCEPTED OFFER FROM INTELLECTUAL VENTURES TO BUY THE BEDROCK PATENT AND THE FACT THAT ACACIA RESEARCH DECLINED TO MAKE AN OFFER filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Bright, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2011: # 8 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 4/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, Yahoo!'s Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Lee, John) (Entered: 04/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 4/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 756 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY YAHOO AND SOFTLAYER AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of B. James, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 04/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 4/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DISREGARD ENTRY - SHOULD BE EMAILED IN TO BE ATTACHED TO DOCUMENT #757*** Proposed Order SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 757 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Stephen Gray. (Bright, Christopher) Modified on 4/25/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 04/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 4/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended SEALED PATENT MOTION Yahoo!'s Amended Supplemental Motions in Limine by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Supplement B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF In Support of Excluding All References to both Reexamination as Addressed in Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4, and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine 'A' and 'I' by Yahoo! Inc.. (Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR ADVERSE INFERENCE BASED ON SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John C. Low ISO Motion, # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpts of February 9, 2011, Dep. of Dr. Mark Jones, # 3 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Opening Expert Report of Dr. Mark Jones, # 4 Exhibit C - Excerpts of April 5, 2011 Dep. of Roy Weinstein, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Low, John) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental SEALED MOTION in Limine by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Weinstein Supp. Report, # 2 Exhibit Weinstein Depo Excerpt)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 757 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Stephen Gray by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 756 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY YAHOO AND SOFTLAYER AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Hargrave, # 2 Exhibit A is a true and correct copy of a letter dated November 20, 2009 from Bedrocks counsel to Defendants counsel requesting documents, # 3 Exhibit B is a true and correct copy of a letter dated April 30, 2010 from Bedrocks counsel to Defendants counsel requesting documents, # 4 Exhibit C is a true and correct copy of a letter dated November 3, 2010 from Bedrocks counsel to Softlayers counsel noting Softlayers failure to produce documents related to server performance or testing, # 5 Exhibit D is a true and correct copy of Bedrocks 30(b)(6) Notice to Yahoo dated July 14, 2010, # 6 Exhibit E is a true and correct copy of Bedrocks 30(b)(6) Notice to Softlayer dated July 14, 2010, # 7 Exhibit F is a true and correct copy of Bedrocks Interrogatories No. 15-17 to Yahoo dated December 8, 2010, # 8 Exhibit G is a true and correct copy of Bedrocks Interrogatories No. 15-17 to Softlayer dated December 8, 2010, # 9 Exhibit H is a true and correct copy of an email chain between Bedrocks counsel to Yahoos counsel requesting 30(b)(6) witnesses dated Nov. 15, 2010, # 10 Exhibit I is a true and correct copy of a letter from Yahoos counsel to Bedrocks counsel dated December 6, 2010 confirming Yahoos 30(b)(6) witnesses, # 11 Exhibit J is a true and correct copy of Yahoos Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Fifth Set of Interrogatories dated January 12, 2011, # 12 Exhibit K is a true and correct copy of Softlayers Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Fifth Set of Interrogatories dated January 12, 2011, # 13 Exhibit L is a true and correct copy of Yahoos production, YAHOO00522352-53, produced on March 11, 2011, # 14 Exhibit M is a true and correct copy of Softlayers production, SOF0063880-3926, produced on April 21, 2011, # 15 Exhibit N is a true and correct copy of portions of the transcript from the motion hearing on April 4, 2011, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER ON DEFENDANTS OPPOSED MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. MARK JONES (DKT. NO. 667) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Low, John) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 754 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION For Leave to Supplement Expert Report of Dr. Howard Cohen by Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 753 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AN UNACCEPTED OFFER FROM INTELLECTUAL VENTURES TO BUY THE BEDROCK PATENT AND THE FACT THAT ACACIA RESEARCH DECLINED TO MAKE AN OFFER by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 752 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 713 SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 722 Joint SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 120 PATENT (DKT. NO. 659)Joint SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 120 PATENT (DKT. NO. 659)Joint SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 120 PATENT (DKT. NO. 659) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File - Defendants' Unopposed Renewed Motion for Leave to Serve an Expert Report Regarding Reexamination Procedures in teh United States Patent and Trademark Office by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of N. Godici, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant Google's Exhibit Lists Tendering During Trial (Bedrock v Google). (Main Document - Defendant's Exhibit List 1) (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Exhibit List 2, # 2 Defendant's Exhibit List 3, # 3 Defendant's Exhibit List 4, # 4 Defendant's Final List of All Admitted Exhibits)(rlf, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff Bedrock's Exhibit Lists Tendered During Trial (Bedrock v Google). (Main Document - Plaintiff's Exhibit List 1) (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 2, # 2 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 3, # 3 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 4, # 4 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 5)(rlf, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 747 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. JURY VERDICT IN ITS ENTIRETY. (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 746 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JURY VERDICT. (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Jury Instructions. (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      4.15.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 5 (BEDROCK V GOOGLE): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial completed on 4/15/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $5,342.29 to Richard Egan for services rendered and expenses incurred through 3-31-2011 as the Court's technical advisor, for a total amount of $10,684.58. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/19/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 742 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AN UNACCEPTED OFFER FROM INTELLECTUAL VENTURES TO BUY THE BEDROCK PATENT AND THE FACT THAT ACACIA RESEARCH DECLINED TO MAKE AN OFFER by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 735 MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Judge Love's Order Granting Bedrock's Motion For Leave To Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein [Doc No 666] MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Judge Love's Order Granting Bedrock's Motion For Leave To Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein [Doc No 666] Yahoo and Amazon Notice of Joinder re Weinstein Report (Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 740 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to the Magistrate Judges Order on Yahoo!s motion to Strike the Late-Disclosed Expert Opinion of Dr. Mark Jones by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit N. Bennett Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                4.14.2011 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 4 (BEDROCK V GOOGLE): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/14/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  4.13.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 3 (BEDROCK V GOOGLE): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/13/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 737 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION For Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Non-Infringement - RENEWED by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 736 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Damages - RENEWED by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Judge Love's Order Granting Bedrock's Motion For Leave To Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein [Doc No 666] by AOL Inc, Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Karasik, Louis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 734 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Invalidity by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 733 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Defendant Google Inc.'s Offer of Proof Concerning the Exclusion of Evidence of the Divorce Proceedings of David Garrod and Richard Nemes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Divorce Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit B - Garrod Depo Trans, # 3 Exhibit C - Prenuptial Agreement, # 4 Exhibit D-1 - Excerpt of Nemes Trans, # 5 Exhibit D-2 - Exceprt of Nemes Trans, # 6 Exhibit D-3 - Exceprt of Nemes Trans, # 7 Exhibit E - Excerpt of Weinstein Trans)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              4.12.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 2 (BEDROCK V GOOGLE): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/12/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                4.11.11 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 1(BEDROCK V GOOGLE): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/11/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 730 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' DAUBERT MOTION AGAINST MARK JONES (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4, # 5 Attachment 5, # 6 Attachment 6)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List (Ninth Amended Trial Exhibit List) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 728 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION Google's Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 727 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION Google's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by AOL Inc re 665 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion for Clarification and/or Reconsideration of Judge Love's Order Denying Summary Judgment Regarding the Legal Issue of Whether Mere Capability is Sufficient for Infringement of Claims 1-2 of the '120 Patent (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 725 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Notice of Expert Report. (Attachments: # 1 Godici Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit A - Godici CV, # 3 Exhibit B - Case Experience, # 4 Exhibit C - List of Materials Considered)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List (Eighth Amended Trial Exhibit List) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 715 .***Joint SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 120 PATENT (DKT. NO. 659) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John C. Low, # 2 Exhibit A of Low Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B-1 of Low Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B-2 of Low Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C of Low Declaration, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion)(Low, John) Modified on 4/12/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 721 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER ON DEFENDANTS COMBINED DAUBERT AND RULE 26(A) MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. MARK JONES (DKT. NO. 657) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John C. Low, # 2 Exhibit A to Low Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion)(Low, John) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration Of And Objections To Judge Love's Order Denying, In Part, Defendants' Motion To Exclude and/or Strike Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Louis A. Karasik In Support of Defendants' Objections To And Motion For Reconsideration Of Judge Love's Order Denying Motion to Strike Expert Report of Roy Weinstein (DOC.#656), # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). Modified on 4/12/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List - 5th Amended by Google Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Google's 5th Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List (Seventh Amended Trial Exhibit List) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2011 re 694 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM LUCAS PEREIRA AT TRIAL filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, 693 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY GOOGLE AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, 667 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Mark Jones filed by Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Court Reporter Carla Sims.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (mjm ) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 716 Filed: 4/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude and/or Strike the Supplemental Expert Report and Opinion of Roy Weinstein by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A- Koomey Statement, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 722 .*** SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 120 PATENT (DKT. NO. 659) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - John C. Low, # 2 Exhibit A of Low Decl. ISO Def's Mot., # 3 Exhibit B-1of Low Decl. ISO Def's Mot., # 4 Exhibit B-2 of Low Decl. ISO Def's Mot., # 5 Exhibit C of Low Decl. ISO Def's Mot., # 6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Low, John) Modified on 4/12/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 714 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC to 710 Sealed Patent Document, filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 713 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (DKT. NO. 659) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Alton Absher, # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from 3-17-11 Motions Hearing, # 3 Exhibit B - MSJ re Invalidity Presentation, # 4 Exhibit C - Excerpts of route.c file from Linux kernel v2.0.1, # 5 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Williams Expert Report, # 6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jeffay w/attached Expert Report, # 7 Exhibit F - Excerpts from Jones Rebuttal Expert Report re Validity, # 8 Exhibit G - Excerpts from Alexey Kuznetsov Depo Transcript, # 9 Exhibit H - Excerpts from Jones Expert Report re Infringement, # 10 Exhibit I - Excerpts from Jones Depo Transcript, # 11 Exhibit J - Emails between Kuznetsov and Absher, # 12 Exhibit K - Bedrock's ICs to Softlayer re RHEL 5, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by E Danielle Thompson Williams re 676 Transcript,,,. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/07/11. cc:attys 4-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 710 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (Trial Brief) - Google Inc.'s Identification of Two Documents and Related Testimony It Would Offer at Trial in Response to Bedrock's New Damages Theory [CORRECTED VERSION]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defs Ex. 184, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Chavey Depo Trans, # 3 Exhibit C - Defs Ex. 190, # 4 Exhibit D - Excerpts of Waychison Depo Trans)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 694 Sealed Patent Motion to Preclude Testimony from Lucas Pereira at Trial; granting 697 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to File One Additional Motion in Limine After the Deadline. The Court also grants the motion in limine, precluding any evidence, testimony, or references to alleged unethical or controversial actions by Google that may implicate or may have implicated personal privacy. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/05/11. cc:attys 4-06-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 710 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT.***SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (Trial Brief) - Google Inc.'s Identification of Two Documents and Related Testimony It Would Offer at Trial in Response to Bedrock's New Damages Theory. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defs Ex. 184, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Chavey depo trans, # 3 Exhibit C - Defs Ex. 190, # 4 Exhibit D - Exceprts of Waychison depo trans)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 4/6/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 667 Motion to Strike 693 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY GOOGLE AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY ; granting 693 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/5/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 706 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Panel A - Bedrock v Google: Jury Questionnaires 1-7; (Attachments: # 1 Jury Questionnaires 8-14, # 2 Jury Questionnaires 15-21)(rlf, ) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 705 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Panel B - Bedrock v Softlayer: Jury Questionnaires - 1-7; (Attachments: # 1 Jury Questionnaires - 8-14, # 2 Jury Questionnaires - 15-21)(rlf, ) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      4.4.11 Jury Selection Bedrock v Google (Panel A) Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 4/4/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        4.4.11 Jury Selection - Bedrock v Softlayer, et al (Panel B) Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection held on 4/4/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List Defendants' Second Amended Trial Exhibit List by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Defendants' Second Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Lee, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            3rd Amended Trial Witness List Witness List by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - 3rd Amended Trial Witness LIst)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List 3rd Amended Trial Exhibit List by Google Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Google's 3rd Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 699 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 693 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY GOOGLE AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A - Google's 1st set of ROGS, # 3 Exhibit B - Bedrock's Resp to 1st set of ROGS, # 4 Exhibit C - Bedrock's 1st Supp Resp to 1st set of ROGS, # 5 Exhibit D - Excerpts from 10/7/10 Hrg Transcript, # 6 Exhibit E - Bedrock's 1st Supp Resp to 1st set of ROGS, # 7 Exhibit F - Bedrock's Consolidated Resp to 1st set of ROGS, # 8 Exhibit G - Google Bates Labeled Docs, # 9 Exhibit H - 11/3/10 email from Briggs to Curry, # 10 Exhibit I - 1/4/11 email from Pennypacker to Cassady, # 11 Exhibit J - Google's Resp to 6th set of ROGS, # 12 Exhibit K - 3/30/11 excerpts of Waychison rough trans, # 13 Exhibit L - 3/29/11 excerpts of Pereira rough trans, # 14 Exhibit M - 3/31/11 email from Aurents to Briggs, # 15 Exhibit N - 3/29/11 excerpts of Chavey rough trans, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 698 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 694 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM LUCAS PEREIRA AT TRIAL filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A- Google's Trial Witness List, # 3 Exhibit B - Google's Amended Trial Witness List, # 4 Exhibit C - Google's 3rd Amended Trial Witness List, # 5 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Amended Initial Disclosures, # 6 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Second Amended Initial Disclosures, # 7 Exhibit F - Bates Labeled Documents, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 4/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to File One Additional Motion in Limine After the Deadline for Motions in Limine by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Google MIL No. 17, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 696 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. BEDROCK COMPUTER TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S NOTICE OF CONVENANT NOT TO SUE GOOGLE, INC. FOR CERTAIN CLAIMS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that Google respond to 694 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM LUCAS PEREIRA AT TRIAL filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, and 693 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY GOOGLE AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. Google shall respond to both motions no later than 12:00 p.m. CST on 4-04-2011. In addition, both motions are set to be heard at the pretrial hearing on 4-04-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/01/11. cc:attys 4-01-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 694 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM LUCAS PEREIRA AT TRIAL by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 693 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO PERFORMANCE TESTING PRODUCED BY GOOGLE AFTER CLOSE OF DISCOVERY by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan A. Hargrave, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 669 Sealed Motion to Strike Bedrock's Late-Disclosed Expert Opinion on Bedrock's Infringement Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/31/11. cc:attys 3-31-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 664 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; granting 666 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Report of Roy Weinstein; denying 668 Motion for Leave to Serve an Expert Report Regarding Reexamination Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/31/11. cc:attys 3-31-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 665 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration filed by AOL Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/31/11. cc:attys 3-31-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 666 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT OF ROY WEINSTEIN TO CONFORM IT TO THE COURT'S DAUBERT RULING, 686 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, of Joinder (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 687 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 669 SEALED MOTION MOTION TO STRIKE BEDROCKS LATE-DISCLOSED EXPERT OPINION ON BEDROCKS INFRINGEMENT CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TAKE LIMITED EXPERT DISCOVERY ON THIS LATE-DISCLOSED OPINION filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 686 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 666 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT OF ROY WEINSTEIN TO CONFORM IT TO THE COURT'S DAUBERT RULING filed by AOL Inc, Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A - "An Analytical Solution...", # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 685 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 664 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE J filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 668 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Serve an Expert Report for Reexamination Procedures in the United States Patent and TrademarkOffice filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 681 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Authorization to File Under Seal)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 665 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 681 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 667 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Mark Jones filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER regarding Motions in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/30/11. cc:attys 3-30-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 567 Motion for Relief from Trial in Observance of Passover Holidays; granting 568 Motion for Relief from Trial in Observance of Passover Holidays. GRANTED to the extent the Court discussed trial dates at the 3-24-2011 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/30/11. cc:attys 3-30-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 570 Sealed Motion for Separate Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/30/11. cc:attys 3-30-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 677 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Transcript. (rem, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 3/17/11 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: D. Keith Johnson,Telephone number: (903) 533-1172. (166 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (tja, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 627 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING (DKT. NO. 542) AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc. The Court will carry the above Motion and Objections to consider along with evidence to be presented at trial. Any time dedicated to the presentation of evidence on standing will be subtracted from the overall time allotted to each side for trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/30/11. cc:attys 3-30-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 587 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Phillip Aurentz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 587 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE, 604 Amended SEALED MOTION Defendants' Amended Motions in Limine ADDITIONAL BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #4 [DKT. NO. 604] AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE A AND I [DKT. NO. 587] filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Capoccia, Rachel) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/29/11. cc:attys 3-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting trial time limits. Voir dire for the Softlayer trial will begin at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Leonard Davis. Voir dire for the Google trial will begin at 12:30 p.m., also before Judge Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/28/11. cc:attys 3-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying in part 587 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; granting in part 604 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/28/11. cc:attys 3-29-11 (mll, ) Modified on 3/29/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 669 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION MOTION TO STRIKE BEDROCKS LATE-DISCLOSED EXPERT OPINION ON BEDROCKS INFRINGEMENT CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TAKE LIMITED EXPERT DISCOVERY ON THIS LATE-DISCLOSED OPINION by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Yahoo!'s Motion to Strike, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John C. Low In Support of Yahoo!s Motion to Strike or Take Limited Expert Discovery, # 3 Exhibit A to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 4 Exhibit B1 to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 5 Exhibit B2 to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 6 Exhibit C1 to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 7 Exhibit C2 to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 8 Exhibit D to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 9 Exhibit E to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 10 Exhibit F to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 11 Exhibit G to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion, # 12 Exhibit H to Low Decl. ISO Yahoo! Motion)(Low, John) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION for Leave to Serve an Expert Report for Reexamination Procedures in the United States Patent and TrademarkOffice by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of H. Lien, # 2 Exhibit A - USPTO Notice of Intent, # 3 Exhibit B - Form PTO 1449, # 4 Exhibit C - Order re Request for Ex Parte Reexam, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Mark Jones by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit A - Email from A. Hendershot, # 3 Exhibit B - Supplemental Report of Jones, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT OF ROY WEINSTEIN TO CONFORM IT TO THE COURT'S DAUBERT RULING by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed SEALED MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2011: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 664 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE J by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 647 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. All claims for relief asserted between pltf and deft Match.com LLC are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/28/11. cc:attys 3-28-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 661 Sealed Patent Motion to File One Additional Motion in Limine. Exhibit A shall be refiled as a motion. Defts shall respond no later than 3-30-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/28/11. cc:attys 3-28-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ONE ADDITIONAL MOTION IN LIMINE AFTER THE DEADLINE FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part and deferring in part 587 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; granting in part, denying in part and deferring in part 604 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/11. cc:attys 3-25-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., be denied; and 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/11. cc:attys 3-25-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting pre-trial deadlines. If the parties find the need for an additional pre-trial hearing, the parties shall notify the Court no later than 3-30-2011. If a hearing is necessary, the parties shall submit an agenda of the matters to be heard at the pre-trial hearing to be held on 4-04-2011 at 2:30 p.m. The agenda shall be submitted no later than 3-30-2011. If there are any motions to be heard on 4-04-2011 that are not already before the Court,such motions shall be filed no later than 3-28-2011, and any responses shall be filed by 3-30-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/11. cc:attys 3-25-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 558 Sealed Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/11. cc:attys 3-25-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2011. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 635 Motion to Withdraw Motions in Limine. Defts' Amended Motions in Limine Numbers Two and Nine (contained in 604 Motion in Limine) are hereby withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER sealing 629 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yahoo! Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 636 Motion for Entry of Stipulation of the Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 583 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Serve Late Response to Yahoo!'s Request for Admissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot 590 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 644 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline for Three Fact Witness Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 637 Agreed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Match.com, LLC by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J - Objections to Plaintiff's Counter Deposition Designations by Defendants, SoftLayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., and AOL Inc.)(Low, John) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 645 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. Defendants' Notice of Corrected Exhibits 8 and 9 to Amended Motions in Limine (Docket #604). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 9)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadline for 3 Fact Witness Depositions by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Google Inc. re 578 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Google's 2nd Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 589 Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Motions in Limine. Defts are granted leave to file eleven Motions in Limine to be heard at the Pre-trial Conference on 3-24-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 579 Proposed Pretrial Order,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J to Proposed Joint Pretrial Order; Objections by Defendants, SoftLayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., MySpace, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., and AOL Inc.)(Low, John) Modified on 3/23/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 640 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 604 Amended SEALED MOTION Defendants' Amended Motions in Limine filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Exhibit A.8, # 10 Exhibit A.9, # 11 Exhibit A.10, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Exhibit C, # 14 Exhibit D, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit F, # 17 Exhibit G, # 18 Exhibit H, # 19 Exhibit I, # 20 Exhibit J, # 21 Exhibit K, # 22 Exhibit L, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 589 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Motions in Limine (Notice Regarding Defendants' Motions In Limine) (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC re 578 Proposed Pretrial Order, of Filing Exhibits to Proposed Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J - Objections to Amended Counter Depo Designations, # 2 Exhibit N - Objections to 2nd Amended Trial Witness List)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION in Limine (Agreed Motions in Limine) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION For Entry Of Stipulation Of The Parties by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 604 Amended SEALED MOTION Defendants' Amended Motions in Limine (Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Defendants' Motions In Limine Numbers Two and Nine) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS TO JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F-2, # 2 Exhibit I)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC re 578 Proposed Pretrial Order, NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS TO JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F-2, # 2 Exhibit I)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 553 MOTION to Dismiss GOOGLE INC.'S AND MATCH.COM, LLC'S COUNTERCLAIMS (DKT. NOS. 476 AND 477) filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 604 Amended SEALED MOTION Corrected Exhibits 8 and 9 to Defendants' Amended Motions in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 9)(Bright, Christopher) Modified on 3/23/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 630 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 629 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John C. Low ISO Yahoo!'s Motion in Opposition to Bedrock Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions, # 2 Exhibit A to Low Dec. ISO Yahoo!'s Motion in Opposition to Bedrock Motion to Withdraw Deemed Admissions)(Low, John) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List (Amended) by Google Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Amended Exhibit List)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 627 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING (DKT. NO. 542) AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, Defendants' Notice of Filing Additional Attachments to Final PreTrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Lee, John) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC's Exhibit List by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Capoccia, Rachel) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 578 Proposed Pretrial Order, 618 Additional Attachments to Main Document.. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Exhibit L)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF ESTIMATED TRIAL TIME (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. - Defendants' Notice of Estimated Trial Time (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 3/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit M)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 3/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC re 578 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit M)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Google Inc. of Objections to Plaintiff's Pre-trial Disclosures (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document: 578 Proposed Pretrial Order,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Exhibit M)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, Defendants Objections and Counter Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H)(Lee, John) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DISREGARD ENTRY - WRONG DOCKET EVENT - TO BE REFILED*** Exhibit List (Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC's Pre-Trial Disclosures-Exhibit List) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Capoccia, Rachel) Modified on 3/21/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Austin D Tarango for Google Inc., Match.com, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew J Bramhall for Google Inc., Match.com, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 612 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Corrected Amended Exhibit B to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Lee, John) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 579 Proposed Pretrial Order, - Notice of Amended Exhibit B to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2011 re 558 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc.. (Court Reporter Keith Johnson.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 600 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/17/11. cc:attys 3-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that deft Yahoo file a response re 583 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE LATE RESPONSE TO YAHOO!'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW ITS DEEMED ADMISSIONS TO YAHOO!'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC; Response due 3-22-2011 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/17/11. cc:attys 3-18-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 608 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 587 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 589 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Motions in Limine filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 605 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended SEALED MOTION Defendants' Amended Motions in Limine by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher) Modified on 3/28/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Daniel Powell on behalf of Google Inc., Match.Com LLC (Powell, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 602 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. PLAINTIFF BEDROCK COMPUTER TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S NOTICE OF COVENANT NOT TO SUE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 601 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Jones, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capoccia, Rachel) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Appendix A to Exhibit B, # 4 Appendix B to Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Appendix A to Exhibit B, # 4 Appendix B to Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 597 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. BEDROCK'S PRELIMINARY PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND BENCH-TRIAL ISSUES REGARDING BEDROCK'S OWNERSHIP OF U.S. PATENT NO, 5,893,120 (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 596 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND PROPOSED LIST OF BENCH-TRIAL ISSUES REGARDING DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF LACHES (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 595 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING LACHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $1,511.25 to Richard Egan, for services rendered and expenses incurred through 2-28-2011 as the Court's technical advisor, for a total amount of $3,022.50. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 584 Motion for Extension of Time. Defts shall have to 3-15-2011 to file Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on the issue of Laches. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 585 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that Bedrock file their response to defts' Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Motions in Limine by 3-18-2011, 12:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 590 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION Defendants Motions in Limine to Exclude Inadmissable Evidence by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants Motion for Leave to Exceed Ten Motions in Limine by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 558 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 587 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) Modified on 3/29/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 586 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason D. Cassady, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law on the Issue of Laches by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 583 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE LATE RESPONSE TO YAHOO!'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW ITS DEEMED ADMISSIONS TO YAHOO!'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason D. Cassady, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 577 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Bedrock to file its findings of fact and conclusions of law is extended to 3-15-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/14/11. cc:attys 3-14-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 572 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/14/11. cc:attys 3-14-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 571 Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule Regarding Emergency Motion for a Separate Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/14/11. cc:attys 3-14-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 3/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Pretrial Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Pretrial Order FOR GOOGLE AND MATCH.COM by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2011: # 7 Text of Proposed Order Corrected) (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 576 Sealed Document by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 576 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Proposed Statements of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding Plaintiff's Lack of Ownership of U.S. Patent 5,893,120. (Briggs, Todd) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. Identification of Prior Art Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. § 282 (Briggs, Todd) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 574 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryan James In Support of Defendants' Reply to Bedrock's Response In Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 2 Exhibit A to James Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to James Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to to James Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to to James Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to to James Declaration)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 573 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alan Whitehurst, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 174 Order by AOL Inc, Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule Regarding AOL & MySpace's Sealed Emergency Motion for a Separate Trial by AOL Inc, MySpace Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 570 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion for Separate Trial Pursuant to Magistrate Judge Love's Trial Plan Order [Dkt. No. 540] by AOL Inc, MySpace Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Pearson on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Pearson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION from Trial in Observance of Passover Holidays by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Relief from Trial in Observance of Passover Holiday by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: 564 Reply to Response to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Low Decl. in Support of Dkt. No. 564)(Low, John) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document: 564 Reply to Response to Motion,.. (Low, John) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 473 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to State a Claim for Willful Infringement in Response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition 410 filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Yahoo!, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss re Plaintiff's Claim of Willful Patent Infringement)(Low, John) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF TRIAL OPTION (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 562 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G to Pennypacker Declaration, # 2 Exhibit H to Pennypacker Declaration, # 3 Ugone Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A to Ugone Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 561 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B to Pennypacker Declaration, # 2 Exhibit C to Pennypacker Declaration, # 3 Exhibit D to Pennypacker Declaration, # 4 Exhibit E to Pennypacker Declaration, # 5 Exhibit F to Pennypacker Declaration)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 560 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 559 SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein. (Attachments: # 1 Pennypacker Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A (part 1 of 3) to Pennypacker Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A (part 2 of 3) to Pennypacker Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A (part 3 of 3) to Pennypacker Declaration)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 559 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION -- Defendants Joint Motion to Exclude and/or Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 558 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION -- Defendants' Combined Daubert and Rule 26(A) Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Mark Jones by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Briggs Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Briggs Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Briggs Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Briggs Declaration, # 5 Jeffay Declaration, # 6 Exhibit A to Jeffay Declaration, # 7 Schultz Declaration, # 8 Exhibit A to Schultz Declaration, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 551 Notice of filing Joint Juror Questionnaire filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Yahoo! Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., AOL Inc. The Questionnaire is approved and shall be mailed to the venire panel along with the summons for completion prior to the scheduled 4-04-2011 jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-09-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 555 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-09-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER adopting 372 Report & Recommendations and denying 283 Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness; adopting 369 Memorandum Opinion and Order of the Magistrate Judge, with clarifications; denying 431 Sealed Motion for Reconsideration. All objections are overruled. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/11. cc:attys 3-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss GOOGLE INC.'S AND MATCH.COM, LLC'S COUNTERCLAIMS (DKT. NOS. 476 AND 477) by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. of Second Amended Trial Witness List (Low, John) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Notice of Filing of Joint Juror Questionnaire) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 2/16/11 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christy Humphries, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 533-1172. (79 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/31/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2011. (tja, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank G Smith, III on behalf of AOL Inc, MySpace Inc. (Smith, Frank) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 485 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief for Leave to File Daubert and Rule 26(a) Motions to Exclude Testing Testimony of Bedrock's Expert Dr. Mark Jones; granting 486 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief for Leave to File a Motion to Exclude, or in the alternative, to Strike the Expert Report and Opinions of Roy Weinstein. The briefing schedule for the above discussed motions shall be expedited. Defts shall file their Motions no later than 3-09-2011; Bedrock shall respond no later than 3-14-2011; both motions are set for hearing on 3-17-2011 at 9:00 a.m. Denying 480 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief for Leave to file a motion to strike any evidence or argument offered by Google Inc relating to the availability of non-infringing alternatives; however, Google is ordered to produce Laurent Chavey for an additional three hours of deposition to discuss the allegedly non-infringing code implemented by Google; 484 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief for Leave to file a Motion to Exclude Capability Testimony of Dr Mark Jones - remains under further consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/04/11. cc:attys 3-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 431 SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 472 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 476 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 477 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 471 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC.(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 452 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL Inc, Softlayer Technologies, Inc., be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/04/11. cc:attys 3-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 541 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 452 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit 18)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting trial procedure in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/02/11. cc:attys 3-02-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 505 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 507 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement; denying 508 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying as moot 509 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/02/11. cc:attys 3-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 469 Answer to Amended Complaint by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 470 Answer to Amended Complaint by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 505 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Leave to File AOL's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 527 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/01/11. cc:attys 3-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 534 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 462 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Phillip Aurentz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Declaration of Dr. Mark Jones, # 10 Exhibit 1, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 533 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 463 SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2011: # 4 Declaration of Dr. Mark Jones) (kls, ). (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 473 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to State a Claim for Willful Infringement in Response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition 410 filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 531 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 530 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 529 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 528 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. - Notice of Service of Amazon.com Inc.'s Second Amended Trial Witness List (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. - Notice of Service of Softlayer Technologies, Inc's Second Amended Trial Witness List (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 440 Objection to Report and Recommendations, - Defendants' Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by MySpace Inc. Of Amended Trial Witness List (Karasik, Louis) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL Inc Of Amended Trial Witness List (Karasik, Louis) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 431 SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC of Service of 2nd Amended Trial Witness Lists (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 518 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 517 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 516 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 515 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Letter Brief filed by Google Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER adopting 352 Memorandum Opinion and Order of the US Magistrate Judge, and denying 377 Sealed Patent Motion for reconsideration. All objections are overruled and all motions for reconsideration are denied. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/23/11. cc:attys 2-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 497 Motion for Extension of Time. The Mediation deadline is extended to 3-04-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/23/11. cc:attys 2-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 506 Motion to Expedite. Pltf shall respond to AOL's Motion for Leave to file Motion for Summary Judgment no later than 3-01-2011. AOL's reply will be due by 3-04-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/23/11. cc:attys 2-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 511 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 452 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Hargrave, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING REBUTTAL TRIAL WITNESS LIST (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule Regarding Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations to File Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 507 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan L. Whitehurst, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule Regarding Its Emergency Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency SEALED MOTION for Leave to File AOL's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 for Lack of Performance by AOL Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by MySpace Inc. Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Karasik, Louis) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Match.Com LLC of Compliance Regarding Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Briggs, Todd) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Google Inc. of Compliance Regarding Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Briggs, Todd) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. of Compliance Regarding Yahoo Inc.'s Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Low, John) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by AOL Inc of Compliance Regarding Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Whitehurst, Alan) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Softlayer Technologies, Inc.'s Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. of Compliance regarding Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $2,047.50 to Richard Egan for services rendered and expenses incurred through 1-31-2011 as the Court's technical advisor, for a total amount of $4,095.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/18/11. cc:attys 2-18-11(mll, ) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that parties submit a proposed jury questionnaire of no more than one page to the Court by 3-07-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/18/11. cc:attys 2-18-11(mll, ) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot 347 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/18/11. cc:attys 2-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 492 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 377 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Love's December 28, 2010 Order filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 491 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Status Conference held on 2/16/2011, Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2011 re 347 MOTION to Stay filed by Match.com, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Google Inc., MySpace Inc., Amazon.com Inc., AOL Inc. (Court Reporter Christy Humphries.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 367 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, and denying as moot 364 Motion for Leave to Depose Third-Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/15/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 482 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/15/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 367 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) (Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc. re 364 MOTION for Leave to Depose Third-Party Alan Cox - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 486 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 485 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 484 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DISREGARD. SEE ENTRY 484 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT.*** Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal)(Whitehurst, Alan) Modified on 2/15/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 431 SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 480 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 440 Objection to Report and Recommendations, by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC of Service of Amended Trial Witness List (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC of Compliance Regarding Trial Witness List (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. of Amended Trial Witness List (Low, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to State a Claim for Willful Infringement in Response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition 410 by Yahoo! Inc.. (Low, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by AOL Inc.(Whitehurst, Alan) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant MySpace Inc.'s ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC by MySpace Inc..(Karasik, Louis) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint, by Amazon.com Inc..(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 410 Amended Complaint, by Softlayer Technologies, Inc..(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by MySpace Inc. Trial Witness List (Karasik, Louis) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by AOL Inc AOL Trial Witness List (Whitehurst, Alan) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. - Notice of Compliance Regarding Amazon.com Inc.'s Trial Witness List (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Softlayer Technologies, Inc. - Notice of Compliance re Softlayer Technologies, Inc.'s Trial Witness List (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 461 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/9/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 463 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION Joint Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement re Non-Infringment of '120 Patent by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit B. James Decl. ISO MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 1 to B. James Decl., # 3 Affidavit Cohen Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 4 Exhibit Exh. A to Cohen Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 5 Affidavit S. Gray Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 6 Errata Exh, 1 to Gray Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 7 Affidavit K. Jeffay Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 8 Exhibit Exh, A to Jeffay Decl. ISO Defs MSJ re Non-Infringement, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120 by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan L. Whitehurst in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,893,120, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 174 Order by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 457 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Bedrock to file its response to defts' Objections to the Report and Recommendations is extended to 2-14-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Curry, John) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 367 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 440 Objection to Report and Recommendations, by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. (Notice of Filing Collateral Proceeding Pursuant to Local Rule 42(a)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 453 Sealed Patent Document, Joint Stipulation and Request for Order Regarding Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/7/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 454 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 377 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Love's December 28, 2010 Order filed by Google Inc., Match.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 453 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SEALED JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM GOOGLE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 452 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Briggs, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 451 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SEALED STIPULATION (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 382 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief for leave to file a motion for summary judgment of non-infringement; denying 398 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - concerning non-infringement filed by AOL Inc; denying 388 Sealed Patent Document - request regarding insufficient evidence to establish inequitable conduct and unclean hands; denying 387 Sealed Patent Document - request regarding insufficient evidence to establish lack of standing; denying 390 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - request concerning non-infringement filed by Google Inc.; denying 385 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request regarding patent-eligible subject matter; granting 386 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment of invalidity of all asserted claims of the 120 patent; denying 389 Sealed Patent Document request regarding equitable estoppel; denying 383 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment on the issue of damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/01/11. cc:attys 2-02-11(mll, ) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cheryl A Berry for Google Inc., Match.com, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 448 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 377 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Love's December 28, 2010 Order filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL-TIME REPORTING OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 446 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Karasik, Louis) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Karasik, Louis) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 443 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. - Defendants' Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real-Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION to 372 Report and Recommendations - Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendations of U.S. Magistrate Judge by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 439 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael T Morlock for Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 437 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Letter Brief filed by Google Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 436 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 347 MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2011 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Client representatives with the authority to agree/stipulate to any proposed agreements with regard to a trial plan should be present at the hearing so that any such stipulations or agreements may be binding and made on the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/28/11. cc:attys 1-28-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 433 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 367 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion For Extension of Time to Complete Limited Discovery From Timely-Subpoenaed Third Parties) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Hejny, Scott) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 364 MOTION for Leave to Depose Third-Party Alan Cox filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Phillip Aurentz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Aurentz, Phillip) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 431 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order on Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 369) by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rosemary Tyson Snider on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Snider, Rosemary) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 400 Sealed Motion to Strike, or Alternatively to Limit pltf's Patent Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/27/11. cc:attys 1-27-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 425 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/27/11. cc:attys 1-27-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 427 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 426 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Corrected Declaration of C. Bright ISO Yahoo!'s Reply in Support of Its Emergency Motion to Strike(Bennett, Natalie) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 426 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 400 Emergency SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion to Strike, or in the Alternatively to Limit, Plaintiff's Patent Infringement Contentions filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bright Decl ISO Reply, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Bennett, Natalie) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopp. Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Reply in support of Emergency Motion to Strike by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Natalie) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 263 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. Bedrock shall produce the documents cited in this Order to all defts no later than 2-02-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/26/11. cc:attys 1-26-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 358 Sealed Patent Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/26/11. cc:attys 1-26-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 405 Motion to Substitute Mediator. Hesha Abrams is SUBSTITUTED as Mediator for Judge Robert Faulkner. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/25/11. cc:attys 1-26-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 421 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSIVE LETTER BRIEF by Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., AOL Inc, Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc. to 387 Sealed Patent Document - LETTER BRIEF on Lack of Standing and Failure to Join Necessary Parties filed by Amazon.com Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., AOL Inc, Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 347 MOTION to Stay filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 418 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 417 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 416 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 415 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 414 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 413 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 412 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 411 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 409 .***AMENDED COMPLAINT against AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., CME Group Inc., CitiWare Technology Solutions, LLC, Google Inc., Match.com, Inc., MySpace Inc., PayPal Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 1/25/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 410 .***AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 1/25/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 408 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 348 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Greskowiak, Stacie) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 348 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Greskowiak, Stacie) Modified on 1/24/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 406 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 400 Emergency SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion to Strike, or in the Alternatively to Limit, Plaintiff's Patent Infringement Contentions filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION Substitute Mediator by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 404 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING PER THE COURT'S ORDER (DKT. NO. 352) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mikhail Lotvin, # 2 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that pltf has to 5:00 p.m. 1-24-2011 to file its reply re 358 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/19/11. cc:attys 1-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 401 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule. The Court orders pltf to respond to Yahoo's Emergency Motion to Strike 400 no later than 5:00 p.m. on 1-24-2011. A reply, if any, shall be submitted no later than 1-26-2011, and a surreply shall be filed no later than 1-28-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/19/11. cc:attys 1-20-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Expedite Yahoo!'s Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule regarding Emergency Motion to Strike by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Emergency SEALED MOTION Yahoo!'s Emergency Motion to Strike, or in the Alternatively to Limit, Plaintiff's Patent Infringement Contentions by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Chaikovsky Decl. ISO Emergency Motion to Strike, # 2 Affidavit James Decl. ISO Emergency Motion to Strike, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B1, # 5 Exhibit B2, # 6 Exhibit B3, # 7 Exhibit B4, # 8 Exhibit B5, # 9 Exhibit B6, # 10 Exhibit B7, # 11 Exhibit B8, # 12 Exhibit C1, # 13 Exhibit C2, # 14 Exhibit C3, # 15 Exhibit D1, # 16 Exhibit D2, # 17 Exhibit D3, # 18 Exhibit D4, # 19 Exhibit D5, # 20 Exhibit D6, # 21 Supplement D7, # 22 Exhibit D8, # 23 Exhibit E, # 24 Exhibit F, # 25 Exhibit G, # 26 Exhibit H, # 27 Exhibit I, # 28 Exhibit J, # 29 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 01/14/11. cc:attys 1-18-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 398 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AOL's Letter Brief Regarding Noninfringement)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 1/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of AOL Inc (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 1/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of MySpace Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC (Curry, John) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. Fourth Amended Disclosures (Bright, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by MySpace Inc. Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Karasik, Louis) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 392 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 347 MOTION to Stay filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. [CORRECTED] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 392 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 347 MOTION to Stay filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert) Modified on 1/13/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief filed by Google Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 389 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 388 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 387 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Whitehurst, Alan) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Karasik, Louis) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Karasik, Louis) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Match.Com LLC, MySpace Inc., Softlayer Technologies, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 384 .***Letter Brief filed by AOL Inc, MySpace Inc. (Karasik, Louis) Modified on 1/13/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 343 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?