Personal Audio, LLC v. Apple, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 9:09-cv-00111
District Judge Ron Clark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 5:27 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARLAND T. STEPHENS +1 212 790 9090
No Logo Coby Electronics Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Coby Electronics Corp.,"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/28/2009 Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Archos, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Claudia Wilson Frost +1 713 276 7648 +1 713 276 7673 claudia.frost@pillsburylaw.com
TERMINATED: 05/17/2010, PRO HAC VICE David Jakopin +1 650 233 4790 +1 866 741 1874 david.jakopin@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Sirius Xm Radio Inc., Defendant

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benu Mehra
No Logo Xm Satellite Radio Inc., Defendant
No Logo Personal Audio LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

No Logo Dr. Frank Shipman, Technical Advisor
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (556) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 567 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit dismissing the appeals as to 523 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE,, filed by Personal Audio, LLC, 561 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE filed by Apple, Inc pursuant to the parites "Joint Dismissal Agreement". Each side shall bear its own costs. Issued as Mandate: January 5, 2012. (dlc, ) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER that the parties' 565 Joint Motion for Judgment of Dismissalis granted. All claims asserted by Plaintiff Personal Audio LLC against Defendant Apple, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. All counterclaims asserted by Apple against Personal Audio are dismissed without prejudice. Attorney's fees, costs of court, and expenses shall be borne by the party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/21/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Dismiss -- Joint Motion for Judgment of Dismissal Between Plaintiff, Personal Audio, LLC and Defendant, Apple, Inc. by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 563 parties' Joint Motion to Withdraw exhibits. PX 10, 11, 12, and 13 are WITHDRAWN from the record. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/8/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
          Joint SEALED MOTION to Withdraw Exhibits from the Record by Apple, Inc., Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elacqua, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from Federal Circuit re 561 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE filed by Apple, Inc.. Federal Circuit Case Number 2012-1067 (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 522 Judgment,, 559 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-3283985. (Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 523 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE,, by Personal Audio, LLC (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER denying 557 Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/27/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER denying 556 Plaintiff Personal Audio, LLC's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/26/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law pursuant to FRCP 50(b) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law -- Personal Audio, LLC's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Charles Goehringer on 9/22/11 as to 552 Order on Sealed Patent Motion. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 554 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                            AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 523 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE,, by Personal Audio, LLC (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                              BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in the amount of $145,959.03. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Annie Huang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Category A, # 4 Category B, # 5 Category C, # 6 Category D, # 7 Category E, # 8 Category F, # 9 Category G)(ljw, ) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/21/2011) (ljw, ). (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER denying 549 Plaintiff Personal Audio, LLC's Sealed Motion for New Trial on Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(a). Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/19/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                  PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Filing - Declaration of Annie Huang, # 2 Amended Filing - Exhibit A, # 3 Amended Filing - Category A, # 4 Amended Filing - Category B, # 5 Amended Filing - Category C, # 6 Amended Filing - Category D, # 7 Amended Filing - Category E, # 8 Amended Filing - Category F, # 9 Amended Filing - Category G)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER denying 548 the parties' Joint Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/16/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 549 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio's Motion for a New Trial on Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(a) by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                        Joint MOTION for Reconsideration re 529 Order on Motion to Unseal Document, Order on Sealed Motion,, by Apple, Inc., Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                          PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Annie Huang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Category A, # 4 Category B, # 5 Category C, # 6 Category D, # 7 Category E, # 8 Category F, # 9 Category G)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC --- Personal Audio's Notice Regarding Transcript of Proceedings --- (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Arenz, Patrick) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 523 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, filed by Personal Audio, LLC. USCA Case Number 2011-1574 (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 11 of 11, held on 7-8-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 10 of 11, held on 7-7-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 9 of 11, held on 7-6-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 8 of 11, held on 7-5-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 7 of 11, held on 7-1-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 6 of 11, held on 6-30-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 5 of 11, held on 6-29-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 4 of 11, held on 6-28-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 3 of 11, held on June 27, 2011 before Judge Christina Bickham. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 2 of 11, held on 6-24-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 1 of 11 held on June 23, 2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference held on 6-21-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 6-14-2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 5-10-2010 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 530 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Sealed Transcript.June 21, 2011, conference in chambers. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 525 Motion to Unseal. The Clerk is directed to unseal Docs.# 228, 230, 335, 429, 433, 434, 436, 437, 438, 439, 506, 513 and 518. Ordered that the parties' Joint 526 Sealed Motion to seal certain trial exhibits is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/8/2011. (bjc) cc: F Laurents (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER on parties' objections regarding the Court's July 12, 2011 order on replacemtn of exhibits. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/8/2011. (bjc) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Josh A Krevitt on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Krevitt, Josh) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Joint SEALED MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by Apple, Inc., Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Prange Decl., # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Affidavit Ginsburg Decl., # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Agreed MOTION to Unseal Document 506 Order on Sealed Motion, 513 Order on Sealed Patent Motion AND DKT NOS. 228, 230, 335, 429, 433, 434, 436, 437, 438, 439, 518 (unable to select these dkt nos from list provided) by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (bjc, ). (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Charles Goehringer on 8/29/11 as to 518 Order on Sealed Patent Motion. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 292 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 494 Order, 512 Order, 492 Memorandum & Opinion, Order, 358 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 515 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Strike, 258 Order, 330 Order, 418 Sealed Order, 419 Sealed Order, 430 Sealed Order, 437 Sealed Order, 469 Jury Instructions, 470 Jury Verdict by Personal Audio, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-3200239. (Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 8/30/2011 (tkd, ). (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 522 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            FINAL JUDGMENT that Plaintiff Personal Audio, Inc. shall recover of and from Defendant Apple, Inc: In the amount of Eight Million Dollars ($8,000,000.00) in damages found by the jury for infringement; Pre-judgment interest from June 25, 2003 through August 30, 2011 in the amount of Four Million One Hundred Eighty Two Thousand Three Hundred Thirty One Dollars ($4,182,331.00); Post-judgment interest on the entire sum calculated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961 at the rate of 0.11%; and Costs of court. All relief not specifically granted herein is denied. This is a Final Judgment and is appealable. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/30/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Joint Notice of Prejudgment Interest Calculation -- (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Charles Goehringer on 8/25/11 as to 513 Order on Sealed Patent Motion. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Garland Stephens on 8/15/11 as to 506 Order on Sealed Motion. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part 479 Personal Audio's Sealed Motion for Prejudgment Interest. Apple shall pay prejudgment interest on the jury's lump sum award of $8,000,000 in damages, for the period between June 25, 2003 through the date of final judgment, at the prime rate, compounded quarterly. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/23/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc) ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW Re: Laches. Because the court finds that Personal Audio has burst the laches presumption, and that Apple has not met its burden of demonstrating the second laches element by a preponderance of the evidence, Apple's laches defense is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/23/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 510 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren B Fletcher; William F Lee; Kerry Begley and Mark C Fleming are withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/22/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER denying 497 Personal Audio's Motion for an Ongoing Royalty Pursuant to 283 & denying as moot 503 Apple's Motion to Strike Personal Audio's Motion for an Ongoing Royalty Pursuant to Section 283. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/22/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Joint Notice of Objections Pursuant to the Courts July 12, 2011 Order by Personal Audio, LLC (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying 481 Personal Audio's sealed motion for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/19/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Order granting in part and denying in part Apple, Inc.'s motions for judgment as a matter of law made on the record at trial. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/19/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 497 MOTION for an Ongoing Royalty Pursuant to §283 Addressing Personal Audios Right to Exclude and Apples Willful Infringement, and an Accounting filed filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Paice Verdict, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for William F. Lee, Mark C. Fleming, Lauren B. Fletcher, and Kerry Begley by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fletcher, Lauren) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 509 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 481 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 508 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion re 479 SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Prejudgment Interest filed by Apple, Inc.. (Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 507 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT -- Personal Audio's Response to the Court's Request for Record Citations Regarding "Repeat All" Mode. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part 482 Defendant Apple, Inc.s Sealed Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/9/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 505 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY (Personal Audio's Surreply in Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions) to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 482 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 503 MOTION to Strike 497 MOTION for an Ongoing Royalty Pursuant to §283 Addressing Personal Audios Right to Exclude and Apples Willful Infringement, and an Accounting filed MOTION to Strike 497 MOTION for an Ongoing Royalty Pursuant to §283 Addressing Personal Audios Right to Exclude and Apples Willful Infringement, and an Accounting filed --- Personal Audio's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Strike Personal Audio's Motion for an Ongoing Royalty --- filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 497 MOTION for an Ongoing Royalty Pursuant to §283 Addressing Personal Audios Right to Exclude and Apples Willful Infringement, and an Accounting filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 502 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 481 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) -- REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit 45, # 3 Exhibit 46, # 4 Exhibit 47, # 5 Exhibit 48, # 6 Exhibit 49, # 7 Exhibit 50)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      APPROVED APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William F Lee for Apple, Inc.. (receipt #TXE9-93) (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        APPROVED APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lauren B Fletcher for Apple, Inc.. (receipt #TXE9-93) (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          APPROVED APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kerry Begley for Apple, Inc.. (receipt #TXE9-93) (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            APPROVED APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark C Fleming for Apple, Inc.. (receipt #TXE9-93) (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for an Ongoing Royalty Pursuant to §283 Addressing Personal Audios Right to Exclude and Apples Willful Infringement, and an Accounting filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order)(Schutz, Ronald) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 496 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 482 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G-Trial Tr)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 495 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT REPLY --- Personal Audio's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Prejudgment Interest --- to Response to PATENT Motion re 479 SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Prejudgment Interest filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of D. Burgess, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 460 Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/29/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ORDER denying as moot 461 Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The August 8, 2011 final pre-trial hearing, August 9, 2011 jury selection and trial, and all associated pretrial deadlines [see Doc. #293, Am. Scheduling Order at 5-6] are cancelled. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/29/11.(ljw, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: LUMP SUM DAMAGES. Personal Audio's motion for JMOL that Apple failed to support its damages position regarding a lump sum license is denied. Personal Audio's July 14, 2011 letter request that the court hold the scheduled second trial on the iPod Touch, iPhone, and iPad product lines, or in the alternative a new trial on damages, is likewise denied. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/29/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE, COURT WILL RE-FILE CORRECTED ORDERORDER granting in part and denying in part 460 Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/29/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 7/29/2011 (ljw, ). (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE, COURT WILL RE-FILE CORRECTED ORDERORDER denying as moot 461 Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The August 8, 2011 final pre-trial hearing, August 9, 2011 jury selection and trial, and all associated pretrial deadlines [see Doc. #293, Am. Scheduling Order at 5-6] are cancelled. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/29/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 7/29/2011 (ljw, ). (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE, COURT WILL RE-FILE CORRECTED ORDER MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: LUMP SUM DAMAGES. Personal Audio's motion for JMOL that Apple failed to support its damages position regarding a lump sum license is denied. Personal Audio's July 14, 2011 letter request that the court hold the scheduled second trial on the iPod Touch, iPhone, and iPad product lines, or in the alternative a new trial on damages, is likewise denied. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/29/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 7/29/2011 (ljw, ). (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 488 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 479 SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Prejudgment Interest filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl ISO Response to Personal Audio's MOT for Prejudgment Interest, # 2 Exhibit A to Elacqua Decl ISO Response to Personal Audio's MOT for Prejudgment Interest, # 3 Exhibit B to Elacqua Decl ISO Response to Personal Audio's MOT for Prejudgment Interest, # 4 Exhibit C to Elacqua Decl ISO Response to Personal Audio's MOT for Prejudgment Interest, # 5 Exhibit D to Elacqua Decl ISO Response to Personal Audio's MOT for Prejudgment Interest, # 6 Affidavit Ugone Decl ISO Response to Personal Audio's MOT for Prejudgment Interest, # 7 Exhibit 1 to Ugone Decl ISO Response to Personal Audio's MOT for Prejudgment Interest, # 8 Exhibit 2 to Ugone Decl ISO Response to Personal Audio's MOT for Prejudgment Interest, # 9 Exhibit 3 to Ugone Decl ISO Response to Personal Audio's MOT for Prejudgment Interest, # 10 Text of Proposed Order PO ISO Apple's Response to Personal Audio's MOT for Prejudgment Interest)(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 487 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 481 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Elacqua Decl., # 3 Exhibit 1 (Trial Tr. Excerpts), # 4 Exhibit 2 (06/23/10 Elacqua Email), # 5 Exhibit 3 (CMC Tr. Excerpts), # 6 Exhibit 4 (Status Conf. Tr. Excerpts), # 7 Exhibit 5 (06/19/11 Elacqua Email), # 8 Exhibit 6 (04/07/11 Email from Court), # 9 Exhibit 7 (Almeroth 2nd Amended Rpt Excerpts), # 10 Exhibit 8 (12/16/10 Response to Ltr Brief), # 11 Exhibit 9 (Wicker Amended Rpt Excerpts), # 12 Exhibit 10 (Novacek Depo Tr. Excerpts), # 13 Exhibit 11 (Email attaching Original Pascarella Subpoena), # 14 Exhibit 12 (Email attaching Amended Pascarella Subpoena), # 15 Exhibit 13 (09/02/10 Elacqua Email), # 16 Exhibit 14 (09/01/10 Elacqua Email), # 17 Exhibit 15 (06/29/10 Elacqua Email), # 18 Exhibit 16 (Apple 7th Amended Resp. To 1st Set of ROGs No. 6 Excerpts))(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 486 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 482 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions --- Personal Audio's Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions --- filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Annie Huang, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 485 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Apple's Notice of Filing, # 2 Exhibit A to Ltr to Court re Second Trial, # 3 Exhibit B to Ltr to Court re Second Trial, # 4 Exhibit C to Ltr to Court re Second Trial, # 5 Exhibit D to Ltr to Court re Second Trial, # 6 Exhibit E to Ltr to Court re Second Trial, # 7 Exhibit F to Ltr to Court re Second Trial, # 8 Exhibit G to Ltr to Court re Second Trial, # 9 Exhibit H to Ltr to Court re Second Trial)(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 460 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Apple, Inc.. (Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 483 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Apple's Reply to Personal Audio's Laches Filings [Doc. #467-468]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22 (Trial Tr. Excerpts), # 2 Exhibit 23 (Logan Dep. Vol. 1 Tr. Excerpts), # 3 Exhibit 24 (DX-253), # 4 Exhibit 25 (Logan Dep. Vol. 2 Tr. Excerpts), # 5 Exhibit 26 (PA Infringement Contention Ex. B Excerpts), # 6 Exhibit 27 (PX1059 - PX1061))(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 482 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION for Sanctions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Motorola license, # 2 Exhibit B-Related license documents, # 3 Exhibit C-Logan Depo Tr, # 4 Exhibit D-Goesslng subpoena, # 5 Exhibit E-Gotuit subpoena, # 6 Exhibit F-Trial Tr, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 481 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Dispositive Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs (SEALED) by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6 Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 6 Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38, # 41 Exhibit 39, # 42 Exhibit 40, # 43 Exhibit 41, # 44 Exhibit 42, # 45 Exhibit 43, # 46 Exhibit 44, # 47 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Notice of Filing Letter to Honorable Ron Clark -- (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Honorable Ron Clark, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 479 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Prejudgment Interest by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Declaration of James Nawrocki, # 3 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 421 Order on Sealed Patent Motion, Notice of Compliance (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Re: Replacement of Hard Copies of Exhibits. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/12/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 476 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Jury Notes #1-7. (fal, ) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Trial Witness List. (fal, ) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Trial Exhibit List. (fal, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2011: # 1 Appendix Agreed Exhibit Pages) (fal, ). (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List. (fal, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2011: # 1 Appendix Agreed Exhibit Pages) (fal, ). (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial completed on 7/8/2011. Jury found for Plaintiff in the amount of $8,000,000.00. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial held on 7/7/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 470 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    JURY VERDICT. (fal, ) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Jury Instructions. (fal, ) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 468 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. -- Personal Audios Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law -- (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 464 Sealed Patent Document,,,,,,, --- Personal Audio, LLCs Response to Apples Trial Citations Relating to the Equitable Trial --- by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Arenz, Patrick) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Garland Stephens on 6/28/11 as to receiving 424 , 429 , 430 & [433-439]. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC of Letter to Judge Clark regarding Motorola (Attachments: # 1 DX-132)(Arenz, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 464 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 17 Exhibit 17 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 18 Exhibit 18 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 19 Exhibit 19 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 20 Exhibit 20 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense, # 21 Exhibit 21 to Apple's NOT of Transcript Citations ISO Laches Defense)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial held on 7/6/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial held on 7/5/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Amend the Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 460 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summary of Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law)(Arenz, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ). (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 7/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple, Inc., Personal Audio, LLC. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial held on 7/1/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2011: # 1 ) (fal, ). (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial held on 6/30/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial held on 6/29/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Charles Goehringer on 6/23/11 as to receiving Sealed Documents 424 , 429 , 430 & [433-439]. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial held on 6/28/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial held on 6/27/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC of Its Intent to Offer Certified Records (Arenz, Patrick) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Intent to Offer Certified Records (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Trial held on 6/24/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Jury Selection and Trial held on 6/23/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 446 Emergency MOTION for Sanctions to Exclude Evidence and Argument Relating to the Tax Status of Personal Audio filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Trial Transcript Excerpt), # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 446 Emergency MOTION for Sanctions to Exclude Evidence and Argument Relating to the Tax Status of Personal Audio Daniel R. Burgess filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Affidavit of James D. Logan, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Arenz, Patrick) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 446 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION for Sanctions to Exclude Evidence and Argument Relating to the Tax Status of Personal Audio by Personal Audio, LLC. (Arenz, Patrick) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Garland Stephens on 6/16/11 as to 418 Sealed Order, 416 Sealed Order & 419 Sealed Order. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike and Objections to PX-10 through PX-13 ("Made for iPod" Documents) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A (PX-010 through PX-013), # 3 Exhibit B (Apple MFi Website), # 4 Exhibit C (Production Letter), # 5 Exhibit D (MFi Signed Document), # 6 Exhibit E (MFi Signed Document))(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple, Inc., Personal Audio, LLC. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Final Pre-Trial Order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/22/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 439 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 327 Apple's Non-Primary Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/22/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 229 Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/22/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc, ). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER on Personal Audio's Motions in Limine 366 , 367 , 369 , 370 , 371 , 372 , 373 , 374 , 375 , 376 , 377 , 378 , 379 , 380 , 381 , 382 & 383 . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/21/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc, ). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Ruling on 408 Personal Audio's Representative Objections to Apple's Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/21/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC on 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Ruling on 398 Apple's Objections to Personal Audio's Witnesses. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/21/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc, ). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC On 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Ruling on 406 Personal Audio's Objections to Apple's Witnesses. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/21/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 432 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. Notice of Compliance re Pretrial Hearing Ruling on PX-34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Burgess Email, # 2 Exhibit 2-Elacqua Email, # 3 Exhibit 3-Healey Email, # 4 Exhibit 4-Samoilova Depo, # 5 Exhibit 5-Huang Email, # 6 Exhibit 6-Access Softek Subpoena)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 368 Apple, Inc.'s Motion for Clarification of the Court's May 18, 2011 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/21/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 6/21/2011 (leh, ). (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 328 Apple's Non-Primary Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/21/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Charles Goehringer on 6/16/11 as to 416 & 418 Sealed Orders. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 427 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE -- Personal Audio's Opposiiton to Apple's Bench Memorandum Regarding Table 5 of Mr. Nawrocki's Expert Report -- by Personal Audio, LLC to 426 Sealed Document, filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 426 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Apple's Bench Memorandum re Exclusion of Table 5 of Nawrocki's Expert Report (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Ugone Report, # 2 Exhibit 2-Correspondence, # 3 Exhibit 3-2nd Amd Ex List, # 4 Exhibit 4-Table 5, # 5 Exhibit 5-APP-PA01494333, # 6 Exhibit 6-Nawrocki Report, # 7 Exhibit 7-APP-PA01493751)(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 425 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Betty Hong Chen on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Chen, Betty) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 6/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Robert Rueckheim on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part 413 Personal Audio, LLC's Motion For Sanctions. It is ordered that on or before July 15, 2011, Defendant Apple, Inc. shall pay a fine of Ten Thousand Dollars ($10,000) to the Fines and Restitution Account of the Court. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/16/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Motion Hearing held on 6/14/2011 re 413 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Motion for Sanctions filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 417 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 413 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Motion for Sanctions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl, # 2 Exhibit 1-Elacqua email, # 3 Exhibit 2-CMC Tr, # 4 Exhibit 3-Elacqua Ltr, # 5 Exhibit 4-Elacqua Ltr, # 6 Exhibit 5-Elacqua Ltr, # 7 Exhibit 6-Elacqua Ltr, # 8 Exhibit 7-Elacqua email, # 9 Exhibit 8-Elacqua Ltr, # 10 Exhibit 9-Elacqua Ltr, # 11 Exhibit 10-Elacqua Ltr, # 12 Exhibit 11-Production summary, # 13 Exhibit 12-Almeroth Rpt, # 14 Exhibit 13-Apple presentation, # 15 Exhibit 14-Digital Audio Primer, # 16 Exhibit 15-Product brief, # 17 Exhibit 16 (pt 1)-Maverick presentation, # 18 Exhibit 16 (pt 2)-Maverick presentation, # 19 Exhibit 17-Wicker Rpt, # 20 Exhibit 18-Fadell Depo, # 21 Exhibit 19-Marketing Doc, # 22 Exhibit 20-Amd Initial Disclosure, # 23 Exhibit 21-Robbin Depo, # 24 Exhibit 22-iTunes Help, # 25 Exhibit 23-SoundJam manual, # 26 Exhibit 24-Exec Review, # 27 Exhibit 25-Exec Review, # 28 Exhibit 26-Kickoff meeting, # 29 Exhibit 27-Product proposal, # 30 Exhibit 28-Goessling Depo)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 412 Emergency MOTION -- Personal Audios Motion for EMERGENCY Consideration of its Motion for Sanctions -- filed filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 412 Motion for Emergency Consideration of Motion for Sanctions. Defendant Apple is ORDERED to file a response to 413 Motion for Sanctions at or before 9:00 am on 6/14/11. A telephone hearing on the motion for sanctions is set for 6/14/11 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/10/11. (leh, ) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 413 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audios Motion for Sanctions by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION -- Personal Audios Motion for EMERGENCY Consideration of its Motion for Sanctions -- filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Personal Audio, LLC's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 6/8/2011 (ljw, ). (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Joint Preliminary Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit - Joint Proposed Jury Verdict Form)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 409 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE and Chart to Personal Audio's Motions in Limine re 380 , 373 , 382 , 366 , 376 , 370 , 383 , 371 , 381 , 379 , 372 , 375 , 378 , 367 , 377 , 374 , 369 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 408 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. re Personal Audio's Objections and Apple's Responses to Defendant's Exhibit List to 385 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 407 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 384 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine Nos. 16-21 Relating to Damages Issues filed by Personal Audio, LLC. -- Personal Audios Opposition to Defendant Apples Motions in Limine Nos. 16-21 Relating to Damages Issues --- (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Annie Huang, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 406 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. re Personal Audio's Objections and Apple's Responses to Apple's Witness List to 385 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Goessling Depo, # 2 Exhibit B-Pascarella Depo, # 3 Exhibit C-Dillon Depo)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 405 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 380 SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#6) Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Exclude Evidence of Non-Licensing Events Related to Valuations, Assignments, Offers from Third Parties, an Auction, and a Discussion Regarding Personal Audio's Patent Portfo filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl, # 2 Exhibit A-Logan Depo, # 3 Exhibit B-Ugone Report, # 4 Exhibit C-Logan Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit D-Call email, # 6 Exhibit E-Fry minutes, # 7 Exhibit F-Interrogatory Resp, # 8 Exhibit G-Logan email, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 404 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 379 SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#10) Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Exclude Apple's Agreements with E-Data Corp., Digeo, Inc., Mr. Hakan Lans, Memory Control Enterprise, and VNM Inc. filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl, # 2 Exhibit A-Elacqua Email, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 403 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 386 SEALED MOTION in Limine 1-15 re Non-Damages Issues, 384 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine Nos. 16-21 Relating to Damages Issues --- PERSONAL AUDIO'S CHART RESPONSES TO APPLE'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE --- filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 402 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 386 SEALED MOTION in Limine 1-15 re Non-Damages Issues -- PERSONAL AUDIO's OPPOSITION OT APPLE'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS 1-15 RELATED TO NON-DAMAGES ISSUES -- filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Prange, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 401 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 373 SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#5) Personal Audio's Motion to Exclude Apple from Introducing Evidence regarding Micro Touch Stock Purchases filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 400 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 370 SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#13) Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument regarding Apples Characterization of USB and FireWire Protocol Communications filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl, # 2 Exhibit A-Almeroth Report, # 3 Exhibit B-Wysocki Depo Tr, # 4 Exhibit C-Kelly Depo Tr, # 5 Exhibit D-Boettcher Depo Tr, # 6 Exhibit E-Wicker Depo Tr, # 7 Exhibit F-USB Spec, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 399 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 371 MOTION in Limine : (#4) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apple From Introducing Excerpts From DanielGoesslings Deposition Involving and About the Sound Blaster Manual filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Elacqua Decl., # 3 Exhibit DX115 Excerpt ('076 FH), # 4 Exhibit DX116 Excerpt ('178 FH), # 5 Exhibit A - Goessling Depo Tr. Excerpt)(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 398 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S OBJECTIONS AND PLAINTIFF PERSONAL AUDIO LLCS RESPONSES TO PERSONAL AUDIOS WITNESSES, DEPOSITION EXTRACTS, AND TRIAL EXHIBITS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 374 MOTION in Limine : (#16) Personal Audio LLCs Motion to Exclude Evidence Regarding Apples Equitable Defenses In Front of the Jury filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Apple's Opp to PA MIL 16)(Elacqua, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 396 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 366 SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#3) Personal Audio's Motion in Limine to Exclude Apple from Introducing Evidence to Support Its Prosecution Laches or Laches Defenses SEALED PATENT MOTION : filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Elacqua Decl., # 3 Exhibit A - Email from Court, # 4 Exhibit B - Apple's 6th Amended Response to ROG 1, # 5 Exhibit C - Lancaster Depo Tr. Excerpt)(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 395 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 367 MOTION in Limine : Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Reexamination of the 178 Patent filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Elacqua Decl., # 3 Exhibit DX-117 (ACP), # 4 Exhibit A - USPTO Inter Partes Data)(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 394 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 376 MOTION in Limine : (#9) Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Separate Patentability filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl, # 2 Exhibit A-Ugone Report, # 3 Exhibit B-Almeroth Report, # 4 Exhibit C-US 5,802,289, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 393 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 383 MOTION in Limine (#1) Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Eugene Novaceks Undisclosed Demonstration of the DAD System, 372 MOTION in Limine : (#12) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Eugene Novacek MOTION in Limine : filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Elacqua Decl., # 3 Exhibit DX-001 Excerpt (DAD Manual), # 4 Exhibit A - Apple's Initial Disclosures, # 5 Exhibit B - Almeroth Amended Rebuttal Rpt Excerpt, # 6 Exhibit C - Wicker Amended Rpt Excerpt, # 7 Exhibit D - Novacek Dep. Ntc, # 8 Exhibit E - Novacek Dep. Tr. Excerpt)(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 382 MOTION in Limine : (#15) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apple From Using Any Demonstrative Exhibits in Opening Statements Not Previously Disclosed or Any Previously Objected to Exhibits MOTION in Limine : (#15) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apple From Using Any Demonstrative Exhibits in Opening Statements Not Previously Disclosed or Any Previously Objected to Exhibits filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Apple's Resp to MIL No. 15)(Elacqua, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 381 MOTION in Limine : (#14) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apple From Changing Its Invalidity Theory at Trial By Relying on Section 102(a) MOTION in Limine : (#14) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apple From Changing Its Invalidity Theory at Trial By Relying on Section 102(a) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl ISO Apple's Resp to MIL No. 14, # 2 Exhibit A to Elacqua Decl ISO Apple's Resp to MIL No. 14, # 3 Text of Proposed Order re Apple's Resp to MIL No. 14)(Elacqua, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 375 MOTION in Limine : (#11) Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument that Personal Audios Status as a Non-Practicing Entity Affects Any Damages Calculation MOTION in Limine : (#11) Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument that Personal Audios Status as a Non-Practicing Entity Affects Any Damages Calculation, 369 MOTION in Limine : (#17) Personal Audio's Motion to Preclude the Use of Prejudicial and Derogatory Labels regarding Patent Holders filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl ISO Apple's Resp to MIL Nos. 11 and 17, # 2 Exhibit A to Elacqua Decl ISO Apple's Resp to MIL Nos. 11 and 17, # 3 Text of Proposed Order re Apple's Resp to MIL Nos. 11 and 17)(Elacqua, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 389 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 378 SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#8) Personal Audios Motion to Exclude Improperly Withheld Allegations Concerning SongCatcher and Apples Marking Defense filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl, # 2 Exhibit A-Mullendore Email, # 3 Exhibit B-Stephens Ltr, # 4 Exhibit C-Arenz Ltr, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 377 MOTION in Limine : (#7) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apples NewsComm Thesis Because It Is Not Prior Art MOTION in Limine : (#7) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apples NewsComm Thesis Because It Is Not Prior Art filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl., # 2 Exhibit A-Geraci Decl, # 3 Exhibit B-May 5, 2010 Arenz Ltr, # 4 Exhibit C-May 6, 2010 Elacqua Email, # 5 Exhibit D-June 7, 2010 Arenz Ltr, # 6 Exhibit E-June 7, 2010 Elacqua Email, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 368 Opposed MOTION Clarification of May 18, 2011 Order re 358 Order on Motion for Reconsideration --- Personal Audio, LLCs Opposition to Apples Motion for Clarification --- filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 386 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION in Limine 1-15 re Non-Damages Issues by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl of Ben Elacqua, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A-Almeroth 3rd Am Inf Rpt, # 4 Exhibit B-Almeroth Tr, # 5 Exhibit C-Almeroth Inf Rpt, # 6 Exhibit D-PA Infringement Contentions, # 7 Exhibit E-PA Am Rog Resp, # 8 Exhibit F-Call Tr, # 9 Exhibit G-Logan Tr, # 10 Exhibit H-Almeroth Am Inv Rpt, # 11 Exhibit I-Fadell Tr, # 12 Exhibit J-Ng Tr, # 13 Exhibit K-AOP Orrick Agmt, # 14 Exhibit L-Sadler Decl, # 15 Exhibit M-AOP Subpoena, # 16 Exhibit N-Mtn to Quash Tr, # 17 Exhibit O-Call Depo Ex 8, # 18 Exhibit P-Apple Supp Rsp to RFA, # 19 Exhibit Q-FCBA Model Inst, # 20 Exhibit R-ND Cal Model Inst, # 21 Exhibit S-PA Priv Log)(Stephens, Garland) Modified on 6/1/2011 (ljw, ). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Pretrial Order : JOINT FINAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine Nos. 16-21 Relating to Damages Issues by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Elacqua Decl., # 3 Exhibit A - Nawrocki Report Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit B - Peterson Report Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit C - Goessling Dep. Tr. Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit D - Call Dep. Tr. Excerpts, # 7 Exhibit E - Ugone Report Excerpt, # 8 Exhibit F - Ugone Dep. Ex. 237, # 9 Exhibit G - Ugone Dep. Ex. 238, # 10 Exhibit H - Ugone Dep. Ex. 239, # 11 Exhibit I - Elacqua Email, # 12 Exhibit J - Huang Email, # 13 Exhibit K - Logan Dep. Tr. Vol. II Excerpt, # 14 Exhibit L - Logan Dep. Tr. Vol. I Excerpt, # 15 Exhibit M - Suppl Nawrocki Report Excerpt, # 16 Exhibit N - Ugone Dep. Tr. Excerpt, # 17 Exhibit O - MPEG LA Web Excerpts, # 18 Exhibit P - SISVEL Web Excerpts, # 19 Exhibit Q - mp3licensing Web Excerpts, # 20 Exhibit R - VIA Web Excerpts, # 21 Exhibit S - Peterson Dep. Tr. Excerpt)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine (#1) Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Eugene Novaceks Undisclosed Demonstration of the DAD System by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Burgess, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine : (#15) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apple From Using Any Demonstrative Exhibits in Opening Statements Not Previously Disclosed or Any Previously Objected to Exhibits by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine : (#14) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apple From Changing Its Invalidity Theory at Trial By Relying on Section 102(a) by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 380 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#6) Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Exclude Evidence of Non-Licensing Events Related to Valuations, Assignments, Offers from Third Parties, an Auction, and a Discussion Regarding Personal Audio's Patent Portfolio by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Annie Huang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 379 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#10) Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Exclude Apple's Agreements with E-Data Corp., Digeo, Inc., Mr. Hakan Lans, Memory Control Enterprise, and VNM Inc. by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Annie Huang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 378 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#8) Personal Audios Motion to Exclude Improperly Withheld Allegations Concerning SongCatcher and Apples Marking Defense by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Annie Huang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine : (#7) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apples NewsComm Thesis Because It Is Not Prior Art by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine : (#9) Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Separate Patentability by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Burgess, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine : (#11) Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument that Personal Audios Status as a Non-Practicing Entity Affects Any Damages Calculation by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine : (#16) Personal Audio LLCs Motion to Exclude Evidence Regarding Apples Equitable Defenses In Front of the Jury by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 373 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#5) Personal Audio's Motion to Exclude Apple from Introducing Evidence regarding Micro Touch Stock Purchases by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine : (#12) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Eugene Novacek by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Burgess, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine : (#4) Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Exclude Apple From Introducing Excerpts From DanielGoesslings Deposition Involving and About the Sound Blaster Manual by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 370 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#13) Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Argument regarding Apples Characterization of USB and FireWire Protocol Communications by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Prange, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine : (#17) Personal Audio's Motion to Preclude the Use of Prejudicial and Derogatory Labels regarding Patent Holders by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION Clarification of May 18, 2011 Order re 358 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine : Personal Audio LLCs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Reexamination of the 178 Patent by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Burgess, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 366 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION : (#3) Personal Audio's Motion in Limine to Exclude Apple from Introducing Evidence to Support Its Prosecution Laches or Laches Defenses by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Personal Audio's Amended Notice of its Intent to Offer Certified Records (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Indentification of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 USC 282 (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Construing "Separately Stored" Limitation. The jury will be instructed in accordance with the court's interpretation of the "separately stored" limitation in the '178 patent. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/23/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 362 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document (Notice of Supp Authority in Support of MSJ Noninfringement (Dkt # 326). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Almeroth Deposition)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 361 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY -- Personal Audio, LLC's Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement -- to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 326 SEALED MOTION PRIMARY Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel R. Burgess, # 2 Exhibit 54, # 3 Exhibit 55, # 4 Exhibit 56, # 5 Exhibit 57, # 6 Exhibit 58)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 360 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY -- Personal Audio, LLCs Surreply Brief in Opposition to Apples Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity --- to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 328 SEALED MOTION Non-Primary MSJ of Invalidity filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that by June 3, 2011, at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall each submit to the court an estimate of the time that party needs to complete the presentation of testimony in this case. The required statements should not be filed with the clerk. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/20/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 302 Personal Audio, LLC's Notice of Objections to the Court's Claim Construction and Request for Reconsideration on Two Issues. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/18/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Intent to Offer Certified Records (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Personal Audios Notice to Offer Certified Records -- (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 346 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/11/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 328 SEALED MOTION Non-Primary MSJ of Invalidity, 326 SEALED MOTION PRIMARY Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement re Request for Oral Hearing (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 353 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 328 SEALED MOTION Non-Primary MSJ of Invalidity filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P, # 2 Exhibit Q, # 3 Exhibit R, # 4 Exhibit S, # 5 Exhibit T)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Gregory Strand on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Strand, Brian) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 351 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 326 SEALED MOTION PRIMARY Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 231 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Almeroth, 232 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Experts Nawrocki and Peterson Supplement to Motions to Exclude (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Garland Stephens on 5/6/11 as to 340 Order on Sealed Motion. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Re: Presenting Witnesses and Compiling Exhibit Lists. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/6/1. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Charles Goehringer on 5/5/11 as to 340 Order on Sealed Motion. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 338 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,,, 337 Response to Motion, 339 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 345 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 232 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Experts Nawrocki and Peterson -- Personal Audio, LLCs Response to Apples Second Notice (Doc. #334) and Further Notice (Doc.#341) of Supplemental Authority Concerning Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs Damages Experts James J. Nawrocki and Dr. Robert Peterson -- filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 344 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 328 SEALED MOTION Non-Primary MSJ of Invalidity Personal Audio, LLCs Submission Supplementing the Factual Record In Opposition To Apples Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Second Declaration of Kevin C. Almeroth, # 2 Exhibit C)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Garland Stephens on 4/27/11 as to 332 Order on Sealed Patent Motion. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Charles Goehringer on 5/2/11 as to 335 Order on Sealed Patent Motion. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 232 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Experts Nawrocki and Peterson Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 339 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION -- Personal Audio, LLC's Response Brief In Opposition to Apples Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity re 328 SEALED MOTION Non-Primary MSJ of Invalidity filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Kevin C. Almeroth, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Declaration of Patrick M. Arenz, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Personal Audio, LLCS Opposition to Apple Inc.S Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement -- SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 326 SEALED MOTION PRIMARY Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Kevin Almeroth, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Declaration of David A. Prange, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38, # 41 Exhibit 39, # 42 Exhibit 40, # 43 Exhibit 41, # 44 Exhibit 42, # 45 Exhibit 43, # 46 Exhibit 44, # 47 Exhibit 45, # 48 Exhibit 46, # 49 Exhibit 47, # 50 Exhibit 48, # 51 Exhibit 49, # 52 Exhibit 50, # 53 Exhibit 51, # 54 Exhibit 52, # 55 Exhibit 53)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 327 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement -- Personal Audio, LLCs Stipulation to Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Charles Goehringer on 4/26/11 as to 332 SEALED Order. (ljw, ) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 221 Personal Audio's Motion to Compel a Deposition of Apple Concerning Willful Infringement and Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/26/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 Doc# 529.*** (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 232 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Experts Nawrocki and Peterson 2nd Notice of Supplemental Authority ISO Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to 2nd Not of Supp Authority ISO Nawrocki and Peterson Daubert Motion)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER on Limitations of Trial Time. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/22/11. (leh, ) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 329 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/15/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Re: Future Damages. The parties should be prepared to address the issue of future damages at trial as set forth in this order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/15/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend 293 Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) Modified on 4/15/2011 (leh, ). (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 328 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION Non-Primary MSJ of Invalidity by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl ISO Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 2 Exhibit A to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 3 Exhibit B to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 4 Exhibit C to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 5 Exhibit D to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 6 Exhibit E to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 7 Exhibit F to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 8 Exhibit G to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 9 Exhibit H to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 10 Exhibit I to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 11 Exhibit J to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 12 Exhibit K to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 13 Exhibit L to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 14 Exhibit M to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 15 Exhibit N to Apple MSJ Invalidity, # 16 Exhibit O to Apple MSJ Invalidity)(Stephens, Garland) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2011: # 17 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ). (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 327 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Benjamin Elacqua, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Stephens, Garland) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2011: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ). (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 326 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION PRIMARY Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Benjamin Elacqua, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13)(Stephens, Garland) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2011: # 15 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ). (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC : Certification of Dispute Regarding Confidentiality of Deposition Transcript (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 324 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED SURREPLY to Reply to Motion re 312 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Compel Source Code Production filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc. re Prior Art (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 302 MOTION for Reconsideration re 258 Order, 293 Order, Scheduling Order, Personal Audio, LLCs Notice of Objections to The Courts Claim Construction and Request for Reconsideration on Two Issues MOTION for Reconsideration re 258 Order, 293 Order, Scheduling Order, Personal Audio, LLCs Notice of Objections to The Courts Claim Construction and Request for Reconsideration on Two Issues filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 321 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT REPLY: Personal Audio, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Source Code Production to Response to PATENT Motion re 312 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Compel Source Code Production filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David A. Prange, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O, # 6 Exhibit P)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that the parties shall each submit to the court an estimate of the time that the party needs to complete the presentation of testimony in this case by 4/11/11 at 4:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/14/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 319 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 312 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Compel Source Code Production filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Elacqua Declaration ISO Responsive Brief to Mot to Compel, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from February 7, 2011 Hearing Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt from January 11, 2011 Hearing Transcript)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 302 MOTION for Reconsideration re 258 Order, 293 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,, Personal Audio, LLCs Notice of Objections to The Courts Claim Construction and Request for Reconsideration on Two Issues MOTION for Reconsideration re 258 Order, 293 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,, Personal Audio, LLCs Notice of Objections to The Courts Claim Construction and Request for Reconsideration on Two Issues --- Personal Audio, LLCs Reply Brief In Support of its Request for Reconsideration on Two Issues filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 302 MOTION for Reconsideration re 258 Order, 293 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,, Personal Audio, LLCs Notice of Objections to The Courts Claim Construction and Request for Reconsideration on Two Issues MOTION for Reconsideration re 258 Order, 293 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,, Personal Audio, LLCs Notice of Objections to The Courts Claim Construction and Request for Reconsideration on Two Issues filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Notice of Service (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 313 Personal Audio's Motion for Expedited Consideration of its Emergency Motion to Compel Source Code Production. Apple shall file its response to Personal Audio's motion to compel 312 within the time period provided by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/25/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 313 MOTION to Expedite : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Expedited Consideration of Its Emergency Motion to Compel Source Code Production filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Expedite : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Expedited Consideration of Its Emergency Motion to Compel Source Code Production by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 312 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Compel Source Code Production by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Kevin Almeroth, # 3 Declaration of Daniel Burgess, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 311 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Personal Audio, LLC to 308 Sealed Document --- Personal Audio, LLCs Response to Defendant Apple, Inc.s Notice of Supplemental Authority Concerning Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs Damages Experts James J. Nawrocki and Dr. Robert Peterson filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 310 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Personal Audio, LLCs Reply Claim Construction Brief Regarding the Separately Stored Claim Language (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Notice of Election of Claims (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 308 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion to Exclude Testimony of Experts Nawrocki and Peterson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Peterson Deposition Excerpts)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 307 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Apple's Responsive Claim Construction Brief for "Separately Stored" Limitation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 20, 2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 11, 2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 25, 2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 7, 2011 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2011. (clb, ) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Objections to The Courts Claim Construction and MOTION for Reconsideration re 292 Order denying motion for summary judgment on indefiniteness by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1Attachment A, # 2 Declaration of D Prange, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 2/14/2011 (tkd, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2011: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (leh, ). (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 300 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Motion Hearing held on 2/9/2011 via teleconference re 295 SEALED PATENT MOTION : PERSONAL AUDIO LLCS MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Personal Audio, LLC, 296 MOTION to Expedite : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Expedited Consideration of Its Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 295 Personal Audio's motion for a two-week extension of time and granting 296 Motion to Expedite Consideration. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/9/11. (ljw, ) Modified on 2/9/2011 (ljw, ). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Personal Audio, LLC. - Personal Audio Opening Claim Construction Brief Regarding "Separately Stored" Claim Language (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel R. Burgess, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Expedited Consideration of Its Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ). (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 295 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION : PERSONAL AUDIO LLCS MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Almeroth)(Goehringer, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ). (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 294 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to PATENT Motion: Personal Audio, LLCs Surreply Brief Regarding Apples Motion to Compel Continued Deposition of James Logan re 259 SEALED MOTION To Compel Deposition of James Logan filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit Y, # 3 Exhibit Z)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER: Docket Call and Final Pretrial for the first trial is set for 6/21/2011 at 9:30 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Jury Selection and Trial are set for 6/23/2011 at 9:30 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Docket Call and Final Pretrial for the second trial are set for 8/8/2011 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Jury Selection and Trial are set for 8/9/2011 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. The 273 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Apple, Inc. is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/2/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 164 Motion for Summary Judgment on Indefiniteness. The jury will be instructed in accordance with the court's interpretation of the disputed claim terms in the '076 and '178 patents. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/30/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re Filing of Letter on Representative Claims (Attachments: # 1 Letter re Representative Claims)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 273 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Notice of Withdrawl of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 287 Status Conference Notice of Compliance (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC : Notice of Filing a Letter Regarding Representative Claims at Trial (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Status Conference held on 1/20/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 286 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 259 SEALED MOTION To Compel Deposition of James Logan filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Notice of Compliance (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 283 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion re 229 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 282 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion - Plaintiff Personal Audio, LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Experts James J. Nawrocki and Dr. Robert Peterson re 232 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Experts Nawrocki and Peterson filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Annie Huang, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 281 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion - Personal Audio, LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Apple's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Kevin Almeroth filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 280 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion re 240 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Keith Ugone filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Status Conference held on 1/11/2011. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 278 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION: Personal Audio, LLC's Opposition Brief to Apple's Motion to Compel Continued Deposition of James Logan re 259 SEALED MOTION To Compel Deposition of James Logan filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of P Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 277 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPROVED APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin M Barnes for Apple, Inc.. (Receipt # 9-33 $100) (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 275 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion: Personal Audio LLCs Reply in Support of its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment re 229 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel Burgess, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 1/7/2011 (ljw, ). (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 274 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 273 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl ISO Mtn of Noninfringement, # 2 Exhibit A - Comparison Chart of Claim Constructions, # 3 Exhibit B - Almeroth Infringement Report, # 4 Exhibit C - Excerpts fr Almeroth Infringement Report, # 5 Exhibit D - Excerpts fr Almeroth Infringement Report, # 6 Exhibit E - Excerpts fr Almeroth Infringement Report, # 7 Exhibit F - Logan Depo Transcript, # 8 Exhibit G - Call Depo Transcript, # 9 Exhibit H - Apple's 5th Amd Objs and Resps to PA Rog No 2, # 10 Exhibit I - Wicker Rebuttal Report, # 11 Exhibit J - Depo Excerpts Cited in Wicker Report, # 12 Text of Proposed Order Granting Apple's Mtn of Noninfringement)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 272 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPROVED APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kelly C Hunsaker for Apple, Inc.. Receipt #9-32 $100.00 (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 271 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl ISO Opp to Mot for Reconsideration, # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpts fr Boettcher Depo Tr, # 3 Exhibit B - Excerpts fr Kelly Depo Tr, # 4 Exhibit C - PO re Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials, # 5 Exhibit D - Transcript fr Case Mgmt Conference, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Denying Mot for Reconsideration)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 270 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 232 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Experts Nawrocki and Peterson filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 269 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 231 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Almeroth filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 268 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 240 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Keith Ugone filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 266 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to file motions for summary judgment is extended to January 5, 2011. The deadline for Personal Audio to file a reply in support of its motion for partial summary judgment is extended to January 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/3/11. (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 62 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings,,,, and Extension of Time by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 265 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY Brief Concerning Its Motion to Compel A Deposition of Apple Concerning Willful Infringement and Injunctive Relief filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaraton of Patrick M. Arenz, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 264 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 240 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Keith Ugone filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl ISO Opp to Mot to Exclude Ugone Rebuttal Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpts fr Ugone Rebuttal Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit B - Excerpts fr Wicker Expert Report, # 4 Exhibit C - Excerpts fr Nawrocki Expert Report, # 5 Exhibit D - Logan email re Playlist Patent, # 6 Exhibit E - Logan email re Bidding Arrangement)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 263 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 229 SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Elacqua Decl., # 3 Exhibit 1 (10-07-2010 Call Dep. Tr.), # 4 Exhibit 2 (10-08-2010 Call Dep. Tr.), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Reexam OA), # 6 Exhibit 4 (178 Patent FH), # 7 Exhibit 5 (Wicker Invalidity Rpt), # 8 Exhibit 6 (Wicker Rebuttal Rpt), # 9 Exhibit 7 (Almeroth Reexam Decl.), # 10 Exhibit 8 (Logan Dep Tr.), # 11 Exhibit 9 (Goessling Dep. Tr.))(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 262 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 261 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION: Personal Audio, LLC's Opposition to Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Experts James J. Nawrocki and Dr. Robert Peterson re 232 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Experts Nawrocki and Peterson filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of A Huang, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 260 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION: Personal Audio, LLC's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Kevin Almeroth re 231 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Almeroth filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of D. Prange, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 259 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION To Compel Deposition of James Logan by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - PA's Objs to Apple 30b6 Depo Notice, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Logan Decl ISO PA's Resp to Mtn to Transfer, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Arenz letter to Stephens, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Logan Depo Transcripts, # 5 Exhibit 5 - SongCatcher webpages, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Morton email to Elacqua, # 7 Affidavit Elacqua Decl ISO Mtn to Compel Logan Depo, # 8 Text of Proposed Order re Mtn to Compel Logan Depo)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIM TERMS of US Patent Nos. 6,199,076 and 7,509,178. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/21/10. (leh, ) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 255 MOTION to Expedite : PERSONAL AUDIO, LLCS MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF ITS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 256 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr Almeroth, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dr Almeroth, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Dr Almeroth, # 4 Appendix A)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite : PERSONAL AUDIO, LLCS MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF ITS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 254 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26, # 2 Exhibit 27, # 3 Exhibit 28, # 4 Exhibit 29, # 5 Exhibit 30, # 6 Exhibit 31, # 7 Exhibit 32, # 8 Exhibit 33, # 9 Exhibit 34, # 10 Exhibit 35, # 11 Exhibit 36)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 253 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 19, # 5 Exhibit 20, # 6 Exhibit 21, # 7 Exhibit 22, # 8 Exhibit 23, # 9 Exhibit 24, # 10 Exhibit 25)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 252 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 Part 3, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 10, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit 13, # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibit 15)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 251 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 5 Part 2)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 250 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2: Expert Report of Dr Wicker, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Dr. Wicker Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Dr. Wicker Report, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Dr. Wicker Report)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 249 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1 to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 2 Exhibit A part 2 to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 3 Exhibit A part 3 to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 4 Exhibit B to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 5 Exhibit C to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 6 Exhibit D to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 7 Exhibit E to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 8 Exhibit F to Dr. Almeroth Report)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 248 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 51 to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 2 Exhibit 52 to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 3 Exhibit 53 to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 4 Exhibit 54 to Dr. Almeroth Report, # 5 Exhibit 55 to Dr. Almeroth Report)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 247 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 41 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 2 Exhibit 42 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 3 Exhibit 43 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 4 Exhibit 44 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 5 Exhibit 45 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 6 Exhibit 46 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 7 Exhibit 47 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 8 Exhibit 48 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 9 Exhibit 49 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 10 Exhibit 50 to Dr Almeroth Report)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 246 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 2 Exhibit 32 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 3 Exhibit 33 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 4 Exhibit 34 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 5 Exhibit 35 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 6 Exhibit 36 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 7 Exhibit 37 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 8 Exhibit 38 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 9 Exhibit 39 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 10 Exhibit 40 to Dr Almeroth Report)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 245 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 244 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 2 Exhibit 12 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 3 Exhibit 13 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 4 Exhibit 14 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 5 Exhibit 15 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 6 Exhibit 16 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 7 Exhibit 17 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 8 Exhibit 18 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 9 Exhibit 19 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 10 Exhibit 20 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 11 Exhibit 21 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 12 Exhibit 22 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 13 Exhibit 23 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 14 Exhibit 24 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 15 Exhibit 25 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 16 Exhibit 26 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 17 Exhibit 27 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 18 Exhibit 28 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 19 Exhibit 29 to Dr Almeroth Report, # 20 Exhibit 30 to Dr Almeroth Report)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION Personal Audio's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2010 Order and to Further Supplement Infringement Contentions by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of D Prange, # 3 Exhibit 1: Expert Report of Dr Almeroth, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Dr Almeroth's Report, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Dr Almeroth's Report, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Dr Almeroth's Report, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Dr Almeroth's Report, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Dr Almeroth's Report, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Dr Almeroth's Report, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Dr Almeroth's Report, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Dr Almeroth's Report, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Dr Almeroth's Report, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Dr Almeroth's Report)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott A Penner for Apple, Inc.. Paid Reciept #9-24 $100.00 (ljw, ) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 242 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Stephens Declaration ISO Opposition to PA's Mtn to Compel A Depo, # 2 Exhibit A - Apple's 11/22/10 Ltr Brief to Court, # 3 Exhibit B - 10/27/10 Logan Depo Transcript, # 4 Exhibit C - 11/22/10 Apple Objs and Resp to 7th 30b6 Depo Notice, # 5 Exhibit D - PA's 12/06/10 Ltr Brief to Court, # 6 Exhibit E - 11/22/10 PA's 3rd Am Answers to 1st Set of Rogs, # 7 Exhibit F - Personal Audio Patent Assignment, # 8 Exhibit G - 04/22/10 Apple's 3rd Am Resp to PA's 1st Set of Rogs, # 9 Exhibit H - 10/08 Call Depo Transcript, # 10 Exhibit I - 12/02/10 SynQor Order re Willful Infringement, # 11 Exhibit J - 05/03/10 PA Resp to Common Rogs)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 238 Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The deadline for expert discovery is extended to January 28, 2011. This order shall not be used as a basis to extend any other deadlines. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/10/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 240 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Keith Ugone by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of D Burgess, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support re 238 Unopposed MOTION re 209 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct to Amend the Scheduling Order Personal Audio Consent Document To Apples Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Deadline filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION re 209 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct to Amend the Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 237 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 212 MOTION to to Exclude the Dad System filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 233 Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Its Sur-Reply Brief to Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Exclude the DAD System. The deadline for Apple to file its sur-reply is extended to December 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/7/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 234 Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Its Response Brief to Personal Audio, LLCs Motion to Compel a Deposition of Apple Concerning Willful Infringement and Injunctive Relief. The deadline for Apple to file its response is extended to December 13, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/7/10. (ljw, ) (Main Document 235 replaced on 12/7/2010) (ljw, ). (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION To Extend The Deadline To File Its Response Brief To Personal Audio, LLC's Motion To Compel A Deposition Of Apple Concerning Willful Infringement And Injunctive Relief by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION re 212 MOTION to to Exclude the Dad System To Extend The Deadline To File Apple's Sur-Reply Brief To Personal Audio's Motion To Exclude The DAD System by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 232 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Experts Nawrocki and Peterson by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Nawrocki expert report, # 2 Exhibit B - Peterson expert report, # 3 Exhibit C - Goessling depo excerpt, # 4 Exhibit D - patent assignment, # 5 Exhibit E - patent assignment, # 6 Exhibit F - Gordon letter, # 7 Exhibit G - Logan depo, # 8 Exhibit H - Meeting notes, # 9 Exhibit I - Settlement agreement, # 10 Exhibit J - Settlement agreement, # 11 Exhibit K - Exh 31 to Ugone expert report, # 12 Exhibit L - Excerts from webpage and production re Global Fund, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 231 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Almeroth by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - PA response to letter brief, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 4/15/10 iPhone Infringement Contentions, # 3 Exhibit 3 - P.R. 3-1 Disclosure, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 2/1/10 iPhone Infringement Disclosure, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt from Almeroth Report, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Apple's 6th Amd Response to Rog 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 152 Plaintiff Personal Audio, LLC's Sealed Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions & denying 167 Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Sealed Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/2/10. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc, ). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 DOC# 529.*** (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 229 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT MOTION : Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of P Arenz, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER striking 224 Personal Audio, LLC's Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment & striking 226 Personal Audio, LLC's Sealed Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff may re-file a motion for summary judgment on a single topic on or before December 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/30/10. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/9/2011 (bjc, ). ***UNSEALED PER ORDER OF RC ON 9/8/2011 #529.*** (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 225 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Daubert Motions. The deadline to file Daubert motions is extended to December 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/24/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION -- Personal Audio, LLC's Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of P. Arenz, # 3 Exhibit 1-10, # 4 Exhibit 11-20, # 5 Exhibit 21-30, # 6 Exhibit 31-38)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 12/1/2010 (ljw, ). (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment] filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of P Arenz, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 12/1/2010 (ljw, ). (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 223 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 212 MOTION to to Exclude the Dad System filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of C Morton, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O, # 6 Exhibit P, # 7 Exhibit Q, # 8 Exhibit R, # 9 Exhibit S, # 10 Exhibit T, # 11 Exhibit U, # 12 Exhibit V)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 219 Apple's Motion to Modify the Deadline to File Motions for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Invalidity. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed within two weeks of the court's order construing the disputed claim terms of the patents-in-suit. The parties are reminded that each side is limited to only one summary judgment motion without leave of court. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/22/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 221 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT MOTION (Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Compel a Deposition of Apple Concerning Willful Infringement and Injunctive Relief by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of P Arenz, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 219 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment -- Personal Audio, LLCs Opposition to Apples Motion to Extend the Summary Judgment Deadline for Non-Infringement and Invalidity filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 218 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to 212 MOTION to Exclude the Dad System filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Stephens, Garland) Modified on 11/10/2010 (leh, ). (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Apple's Objections to Order on Proposed Procedure for Submitting to the Jury a Question on Future Damages. Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 214 Order : Personal Audio, LLC's Response to the Courts Consideration of Submitting The Issue of Future Damages to the Jury by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 215 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 213 MOTION to Expedite -- Personal Audio, LLCs Contingent Motion for Expedited Consideration of its Motion to Exclude the DAD System filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER for parties to submit to the Court within 10 days, any objections to the proposed procedure regarding a future damages question for a jury. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/27/10. (leh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Personal Audio LLC's Motion to Exclude the DAD System by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 10/28/2010 (leh, ). (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to to Exclude the Dad System by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of C Morton, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B Part 1, # 5 Exhibit B Part 2, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 10/28/2010 (leh, ). (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 211 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Surreply to Motion to Compel Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Benjamin Elacqua, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Benjamin Elacqua)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Annie Huang on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Huang, Annie) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 206 Apple, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/14/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 208 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 204 SEALED MOTION - Personal Audio, LLCs Motion To Compel Production Of Relevant Documents From Apple CEO Steven Jobs filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of P Arenz, # 2 Exhibit T, # 3 Exhibit U, # 4 Exhibit V, # 5 Exhibit W)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 207 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 204 SEALED MOTION - Personal Audio, LLCs Motion To Compel Production Of Relevant Documents From Apple CEO Steven Jobs filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 62 Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION -- SECOND STIPULATION REGARDING UNANNOUNCED PRODUCTS by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 204 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION - Personal Audio, LLCs Motion To Compel Production Of Relevant Documents From Apple CEO Steven Jobs by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Claim Construction Hearing held on 8-31-2010 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 10/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2010. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 8-19-2010 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 10/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2010. (clb, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Markman Hearing held on 8/31/2010. A written order will be entered. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (Attachments: # 1 Court's Exhibits) (fal, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 192 Notice (Other) - Notice of Filing Letter by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter, # 2 Exhibit Exh A to Letter)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2010 re 195 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr Almeroth filed by Apple, Inc., 196 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Almeroth filed by Apple, Inc.. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 195 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr Almeroth filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel R. Burgess, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Personal Audio and Apples Joint Patent Rule 4-5(d) Claim Construction Charts filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Almeroth by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr Almeroth by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Stephens, Garland) Modified on 8/13/2010 (leh, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2010: # 7 Proposed Order) (leh, ). (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Compliance re Technology Tutorial (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to 191 Notice of Technology Synopsis (Narrative). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Technology Synopsis)(Prange, David) Modified on 8/12/2010 (leh, ). (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Filing Letter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Technology Synopsis (Narrative) by Personal Audio, LLC (Prange, David) Modified on 8/12/2010 (leh, ). (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Sirius XM Radio, Inc., XM Satellite Radio, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF filed Defendant Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Claim Construction Brief Relating To Dr. Kevin Almeroth by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elacqua Decl., # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 167 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Opposition and Response to Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions -- Personal Audio's Surreply Brief to Apple's Motion to Strike Personal Audio's Infringement Contentions filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 186 Unopposed Motion for an Extension to Serve the Technology Synopses Until August 11, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/2/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for an Extension to Serve the Technology Synopses Until August 11, 2010 by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Indefiniteness under 35 USC 112 -- Personal Audio's Sur-Reply to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment on Indefiniteness filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 184 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Personal Audio, LLC to 163 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of P Arenz, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 152 SEALED MOTION Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringment Contentions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 167 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Opposition and Response to Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION regarding Unannounced Products by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Notice of Service of Personal Audio's Supplemental Infringement Contentions for Apple iPad (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 176 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Defendant Apple may supplement the record with Dr. Almeroth's deposition testimony before August 4, 2010. Plaintiff Personal Audio may supplement the record with deposition testimony from any declarant relied on by Apple in Apple's summary judgment reply before August 4, 2010. This order shall not be used as a basis to extend any other deadline. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/21/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Indefiniteness under 35 USC 112 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 173 Joint Motion for Judgment of Dismissal Without Prejudice. All claims by Plaintiff Personal Audio, LLC against Defendant Sirius XM Radio, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice & all counterclaims by Sirius XM Radio, Inc. against Personal Audio, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Each party bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/19/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc., Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. Apple's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl of Elacqua ISO brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, part 1, # 4 Exhibit B, part 2, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Indefiniteness under 35 USC 112 filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Almeroth, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Morton, Cyrus) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sirius XM Radio Inc. by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order /Proposed Judgment)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 152 SEALED MOTION Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringment Contentions -- Personal Audio's Reply Concerning Its Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 171 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 167 SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Opposition and Response to Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit / Declaration of P Arenz, # 2 Exhibit R, # 3 Exhibit S, # 4 Exhibit T, # 5 Exhibit U)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER appointing Dr. Frank Shipman as technical advisor to the court. The parties shall deliver copies of 142 & 159 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statements, and Plaintiff shall deliver a copy of its opening claim construction brief 163 to Dr. Shipman by July 16, 2010. The parties shall also deliver copies of their responsive and reply claim construction briefs, the technology synopsis, and the Patent Rule 4-5(d) joint claim construction chart to Dr. Shipman on the date these submissions are filed by the parties per the Scheduling Order 62 . Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/9/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Allen Prange on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Prange, David) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 152 SEALED MOTION Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringment Contentions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Opposition and Response to Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Benjamin Elacqua, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F-1, # 8 Exhibit F-2, # 9 Exhibit F-3, # 10 Exhibit F-4, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting deadlines for the parties to provide supplemental infringement contentions. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/1/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on June 9, 2010 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the COURT REPORTER. Redaction Request due 7/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2010. (clb, ) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment on Indefiniteness under 35 USC 112 by Apple, Inc., Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Morton, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Affidavit Declaration of Almeroth, # 13 Exhibit A)(Morton, Cyrus) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Sirius XM Radio, Inc. re 161 Response to Non-Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 161 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE by Sirius XM Radio, Inc. to 158 Status Report, filed by Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Caplan, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Personal Audio, LLC, Sirius XM Radio, Inc. Notice and Joint Report re Conference of Counsel re Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Sirius XM Radio, Inc. re 142 Claim Construction Chart of Amended Exhibits A and B (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT -- PERSONAL AUDIO'S STATUS UPDATE REGARDING SIRIUS XM by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit P Arenz, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 153 Apple's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete its Rolling Production of Documents. The deadline for Defendant Apple, Inc. to complete it's continued rolling mandatory disclosures, other than information directed solely towards damages, is extended from June 15, 2010 to July 2, 2010. This order shall not be used as a basis to extend any other deadline. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/17/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 154 Apple's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move Certain Deadlines Set Forth in the Courts June 9 and 10, 2010 Orders. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/17/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Re: Motion Procedures. The court finds it necessary to implement procedures applying to future motions to be submitted in this case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/17/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION re 147 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, 146 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, for Extension of Time to Move Certain Deadlines by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Rolling Production by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 152 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringment Contentions by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Affidavit C Morton, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Archos, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 149 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Its Rolling Production. The deadline for Sirius XM Radio, Inc. to complete it's continued rolling mandatory disclosures, other than information directed solely towards damages, is extended from June 15, 2010 to June 25, 2010. This order shall not be used as a basis to extend any other deadline. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/14/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Sirius' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete its Rolling Production) by Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Re: Technical Advisor. The court will permit any party to lodge any objections to this appointment by June 18, 2010. Such objections may be filed under seal and in camera. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/11/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Governing Markman Hearing: The hearing is set for 8/31/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ron Clark. Lead counsel for the parties shall meet and confer in an attempt to agree on representative claims and representative products in this case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/10/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 143 Apple, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Apple's deadline to supplement Personal Audio's Interrogatory Nos. 2, 9, 10, and 11 is extended from June 11, 2010 to June 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/9/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Status Conference held via telephone on 6/9/2010. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Letter to Judge Clark prior to Conference Call set for 06/09/2010 at 2pm and Index 1&2 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Index 1, # 2 Exhibit - Index 2)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION EXTEND TIME TO COMPLY WITH THE COURTS JUNE 1, 2010 ORDER re 139 Order on Motion to Compel by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc., Personal Audio, LLC, Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Burgess on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Burgess, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 138 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kimberly G Miller withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/1/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part 95 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/1/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 136 Apple, Inc. et al's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The deadline for the parties to submit their Joint Claim Construction/Pre-Hearing Statement is extended to June 4, 2010. The deadline for the Opening Claim Construction Brief is extended to June 30, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/26/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, 62 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings,,,, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (Letter to Judge Clark Pursuant to Court's May 10, 2010 Order (Dkt. 124). (Attachments: # 1 Birks Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A Part 1 to Birks Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A Part 2 to Birks Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A Part 3 to Birks Declaration, # 5 Exhibit A Part 4 to Birks Declaration, # 6 Exhibit A Part 5 to Birks Declaration, # 7 Exhibit B to Birks Declaration, # 8 Exhibit C to Birks Declaration, # 9 Exhibit D to Birks Declaration, # 10 Exhibit E to Birks Declaration, # 11 Caplan Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 1 to Caplan Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 2 to Caplan Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 3 to Caplan Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 4 to Caplan Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 5 to Caplan Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 6 to Caplan Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 7 to Caplan Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 8 to Caplan Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 9 to Caplan Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 10 to Caplan Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 11 to Caplan Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 12 to Caplan Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 13 to Caplan Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 14 to Caplan Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 15 to Caplan Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 16 to Caplan Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 17 to Caplan Declaration, # 29 Exhibit 18 Caplan Declaration, # 30 Exhibit 19 to Caplan Declaration, # 31 Exhibit 20 to Caplan Declaration, # 32 Exhibit 21 to Caplan Declaration, # 33 Exhibit 22 to Caplan Declaration, # 34 Exhibit 23 to Caplan Declaration, # 35 Exhibit 24 to Caplan Declaration, # 36 Exhibit 25 to Caplan Declaration, # 37 Exhibit 26 to Caplan Declaration)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC - Notice of Service of Personal Audio's iPad Infringement Contentions to Apple Inc. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 128 Personal Audio, LLC and Defendant Archos Inc.'s Joint Motion to Dismiss. Personal Audio's pending claims against Archos, and Archos's pending counterclaims against Personal Audio, are dismissed with prejudice. Costs and expenses relating to this litigation between PersonalAudio and Archos only, including attorney's fees, will be borne by the party incurring the same. All relief not expressly granted herein as applies to these two parties is denied. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/17/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA for the Federal Circuit Order that the Petition for Writ of Mandamus is denied. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 131 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Plaintiff Personal Audio, LLC's Answer to Defendant Sirius XM Radio, Inc.'s Amended Answers, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 130 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Plaintiff Personal Audio, LLC's Answer to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Second Amended Answers, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document: Certificate of Service to 128 Joint MOTION for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Between Plaintiff, Personal Audio, LLC and Defendant, Archos, Inc... (Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 5/14/2010 (bjc, ). (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Between Plaintiff, Personal Audio, LLC and Defendant, Archos, Inc. by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 105 Personal Audio, LLC's Motion for Leave to Amend. The denial of the motion to consolidate is without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/13/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 122 Personal Audio, LLC and Defendant Coby Electronics Corp.'s Joint Motion to Dismiss. Personal Audio's pending claims against Coby, and Coby's pending counterclaims against Personal Audio, are dismissed with prejudice. Costs and expenses relating to this litigation, including attorney's fees, will be borne by the party incurring the same. All relief not expressly granted herein as applies to these two parties is denied. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/11/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 123 Personal Audio, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions. Personal Audio shall serve infringement contentions for the iPad on Defendant Apple, Inc. by May 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/11/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re Personal Audio, LLC's 113 letter brief concerning Sirius XM Radio, Inc.'s production of source code for the accused products. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/10/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File -- Personal Audio, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions -- filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaration of C Morton, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss -- Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims between Personal Audio, LLC and Coby Electronics, Corp. by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Telephone Conference held on 5/10/2010. Written Orders will be entered. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 120 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion re 95 MOTION to Compel -- Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Apple, Inc -- filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ben Elacqua, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 105 MOTION to Amend/Correct -- Personal Audio's Motion for Leave to Add XM Satellite Radio, Inc as a Party, or in the Alternative to Consolidate -- Personal Audio, LLC's Reply Brief Regarding Its Motion to Add Sirius XM Satellite Radio, Inc. as a Party, or in the Alternative to Consolidate filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 118 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials. Agreed MOTION 115 for Protective Order filed by Sirius XM Radio, Inc., Coby Electronics Corp., Apple, Inc., Personal Audio, LLC, & Archos, Inc. is granted. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/6/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 117 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Sirius XM Radio, Inc. re 113 Notice (Other) (Response Letter to Judge Ron Clark) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 116 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 105 MOTION to Amend/Correct -- Personal Audio's Motion for Leave to Add XM Satellite Radio, Inc as a Party, or in the Alternative to Consolidate filed by Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mahra, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Apple, Inc., Archos, Inc., Coby Electronics Corp.,, Personal Audio, LLC, Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 95 MOTION to Compel -- Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Apple, Inc -- filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaration of P Arenz, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O, # 6 Exhibit P, # 7 Exhibit Q, # 8 Exhibit R, # 9 Exhibit S, # 10 Exhibit T, # 11 Exhibit U, # 12 Exhibit V, # 13 Exhibit W, # 14 Exhibit X)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Letter to Honorable Ron Clark (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 112 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (Defendant Sirius XM, Inc.'s Amended Answers, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff Personal Audio, LLC's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement). (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 111 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. Apple's Second Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 95 MOTION to Compel -- Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Apple, Inc -- filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ben Elacqua in Support of Response, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 108 Unopposed Motion to Extend. The deadline for the parties to exchange their preliminary claim constructions and extrinsic evidence will be May 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/23/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, 62 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings,,,, by Apple, Inc., Archos, Inc., Coby Electronics Corp.,, Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 79 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/20/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT -- Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement -- against Apple, Inc., Archos, Inc., Coby Electronics Corp.,, Sirius XM Radio, Inc., XM Satellite Radio, Inc., filed by Personal Audio, LLC.(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct -- Personal Audio's Motion for Leave to Add XM Satellite Radio, Inc as a Party, or in the Alternative to Consolidate by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit -- P Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Notice of Service of Personal Audio's Supplemental Infringement Contentions to Apple Inc (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Notice of Service of Personal Audio's Privilege Log (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 100 Motion to Postpone re Coby Electronics Corp and Archos Inc. If the parties are unable to reach a final settlement agreement, pltf shall serve its Rule 3-1(g) supplemental infringement contentions on the respective party two business days after impasse, but no later than 5/14/10. Order also granting 101 Motion to Postpone re Serius XM Radio Inc. Pltf shall serve its Rule 3-1(g) supplemental infringement contentions by 5/14/10. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/16/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION TO POSTPONE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS FOR SIRIUS XM RADIO INC by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION TO POSTPONE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS FOR ARCHOS, INC. AND COBY ELECTRONICS by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: 98 Reply to Response to Motion,.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 79 MOTION for Protective Order To Prevent Litigation Counsel From Advising Reexamination Counsel filed by Apple, Inc., Archos, Inc., Coby Electronics Corp.,, Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc., Archos, Inc., Coby Electronics Corp.,, Sirius XM Radio, Inc. pursuant to P.R. 4-1 (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Personal Audio, LLC -- Notice of Personal Audio's Rule 4-1 Disclosures (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel -- Personal Audio, LLC's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Apple, Inc -- by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaration of P Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B Part 1, # 4 Exhibit B Part 2, # 5 Exhibit B Part 3, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 79 MOTION for Protective Order To Prevent Litigation Counsel From Advising Reexamination Counsel -- Personal Audio, LLC's Response to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Arenz, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D Part 1, # 7 Exhibit D Part 2, # 8 Exhibit D Part 3, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Archos, Inc. (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Sirius XM Radio, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Coby Electronics Corp., Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Sadler, Rodger) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Personal Audio, LLC - Notice of Personal Audio's Mandatory Disclosures (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit notice of docketing misc. case number 932. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit ORDER on Petition for Writ of Mandamus. It is directed that Personal Audio, LLC must respond no later than March 31, 2010. (ljw, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wasif H Qureshi on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Qureshi, Wasif) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Sirius XM Radio, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry T. Yen on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Yen, Jerry) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Archos, Inc. (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Coby Electronics Corp., (Sadler, Rodger) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc. re PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order To Prevent Litigation Counsel From Advising Reexamination Counsel by Apple, Inc., Archos, Inc., Coby Electronics Corp.,, Sirius XM Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Elacqua Decl., # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C Part 1, # 6 Exhibit C Part 2, # 7 Exhibit C Part 3, # 8 Exhibit C Part 4, # 9 Exhibit C Part 5, # 10 Exhibit C Part 6, # 11 Exhibit D Part 1, # 12 Exhibit D Part 2, # 13 Exhibit D Part 3, # 14 Exhibit D Part 4, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit F, # 17 Exhibit G, # 18 Exhibit H Part 1, # 19 Exhibit H Part 2, # 20 Exhibit I, # 21 Exhibit J Part 1, # 22 Exhibit J Part 2, # 23 Exhibit J Part 3, # 24 Exhibit K, # 25 Exhibit L, # 26 Exhibit M)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: 3/3/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 77 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Order deadlines are modified as follows: Pla will supplement its infringement contentions by 4/15/2010. Parties to exchange proposed terms for construction and Identify any claim element governed by 35 USC 112, 6(P.R.4-1) by 4/8/2010.Parties to exchange preliminary proposed claim contruction and extrinsic evidence supporting same 5/3/2010. Joint claim construction and prehearing statement to be filed (P.R. 4-3) by 5/28/2010. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/3/2010. (bjc, ) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct -- PERSONAL AUDIO, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER -- by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Redacted Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Redaction of 64 Transcript of January 25, 2010, Case Management Conference. (clb, ) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Order on Motion to RedactTranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 74 Motion to Redact portions of 64 Transcript of the January 25, 2010 case management conference. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/22/2010. (bjc, ) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Motion to Redact Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Redact 64 Transcript,,, by Apple, Inc., Sirius XM Radio, Inc., Coby Electronics Corp.,, Archos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Letter Pursuant to Request by the Court at the Case Management (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter)(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Order on Motion to Change VenueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 50 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/11/10. (tkd, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Sirius XM Radio, Inc. of Intent to Request Redaction (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Rodger Andrew Sadler re 64 Transcript,,,. (Sadler, Rodger) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Archos, Inc. re 64 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC -- Notice of Filing (Letter to Honorable Judge Clark regarding Inter Partes reexamination petition filed by Apple) -- pursuant to Court's Request at Case Management Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Garland T Stephens re 64 Transcript,,,. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Personal Audio, LLC -- Notice of Personal Audio's Disclosure of Asserted Claims & Infringement Contentions (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 50 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion To Transfer Venue filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference held on January 25, 2010 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 2/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2010. (clb, ) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 50 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion To Transfer Venue filed by Apple, Inc., Sirius XM Radio, Inc., Coby Electronics Corp.,, Archos, Inc.. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/26/2010. Join additional parties by 3/1/2010. Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 2/23/11. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/16/2011. Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/31/2010 at 10:00 am and Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2011 at 9:00 am all to be held in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Jury Selection and Trial set for 3/14/2011 at 10:30 am in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/26/10. (djh, ) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benu Mehra for Sirius XM Radio, Inc. (Fee Paid) (djh, ) (djh, ). (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark A Baghdassarian for Sirius XM Radio, Inc. (Fee Paid) (djh, ) (djh, ). (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan S Caplan for Sirius XM Radio, Inc. (Fee Paid) (djh, ) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Pretrial Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Case Management Conference held on 1/25/2010. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 50 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion To Transfer Venue filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Arenz, # 3 Exhibit A Part I, # 4 Exhibit A Part II, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Declaration of Case, # 16 Exhibit A, # 17 Exhibit B, # 18 Exhibit C, # 19 Exhibit D, # 20 Declaration of Call, # 21 Declaration of Logan)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 388 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?