Red Hat, Inc. v. Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:09-cv-00549
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 27, 2016 at 4:23 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 1and1 Internet, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leydig Voit & Mayer, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H Michael Hartmann +1 312 616 5600 +1 312 616 5700 mhartmann@leydig.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T Wittmann +1 312 616 5600 +1 312 616 5700 bwittmann@leydig.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Wright Budwin +1 512 692 8700 +1 512 592 8744 jbudwin@mckoolsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Cawley +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 dcawley@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Austin Curry +1 214 978 4207 +1 214 978 4044 acurry@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Stevenson, III +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 tstevenson@mckoolsmith.com

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Conagra Foods, Inc. Conagra Foods, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Merchant & Gould, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen W Hinderaker +1 612 332 5300 +1 612 332 9081 ahinderaker@merchantgould.com
Space Christopher John Sorenson +6123325 300 336 4645 +1 612 332 9081 csorenson@merchantgould.com
ConocoPhillips Company ConocoPhillips Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2011 Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M Pivovar +1 650 843 5200 +1 650 857 0663 apivovar@cooley.com

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Lyn Keefe +1 650 213 0302 +1 650 213 8158 hkeefe@whitecase.com
No Logo Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

NYSE Euronext NYSE Euronext, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo R.L. Polk & Company, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "R.L. Polk & Co."

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/12/2010 Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Storm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/29/2011 PAUL V. STORM +1 214 347 4700 +1 214 347 4799 paulstorm@alliplaw.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Sungard Data Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, H.t.e., Inc.
Unknown Role, Caminus Corp

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

No Logo The Planet.com Internet Services, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Virgin America Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn H Pasahow +1 415 393 2000
Whole Foods Market, Inc. Whole Foods Market, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Wright Budwin +1 512 692 8700 +1 512 592 8744 jbudwin@mckoolsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Cawley +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 dcawley@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Austin Curry +1 214 978 4207 +1 214 978 4044 acurry@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Stevenson, III +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 tstevenson@mckoolsmith.com

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatrickstockton.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Gap, Inc. Gap, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "The Gap, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Alexander Lee +1 650 798 0300 +1 650 813 5002

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalie A. Bennett +1 312 984 7631 +1 312 984 7700 nbennett@mwe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Cannon Low +1 713 654 7632 +1 713 787 1440 jlow@mwe.com
No Logo 1and1 Internet, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leydig Voit & Mayer, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T Wittmann +1 312 616 5600 +1 312 616 5700 bwittmann@leydig.com
ConocoPhillips Company ConocoPhillips Company, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
No Logo Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

NYSE Euronext NYSE Euronext, Cross-Defendant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo R.L. Polk & Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "R.L. Polk & Co."

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Gap, Inc. Gap, Inc., Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "The Gap, Inc."
No Logo THE GO DADDY GROUP, INC., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/01/2010 Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo The Planet.com Internet Services, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

No Logo Virgin America Inc., Cross-Defendant
Whole Foods Market, Inc. Whole Foods Market, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Wright Budwin +1 512 692 8700 +1 512 592 8744 jbudwin@mckoolsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Cawley +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 dcawley@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Austin Curry +1 214 978 4207 +1 214 978 4044 acurry@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Stevenson, III +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 tstevenson@mckoolsmith.com

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

No Logo Bedrock Computer Technologies, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Wright Budwin +1 512 692 8700 +1 512 592 8744 jbudwin@mckoolsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Cawley +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 dcawley@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Austin Curry +1 214 978 4207 +1 214 978 4044 acurry@mckoolsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Stevenson, III +1 214 978 4000 +1 214 978 4044 tstevenson@mckoolsmith.com

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

No Logo Hesha Abrams, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by 7616 Burns Run

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hesha Abrams +1 214 415 8797 +1 214 550 2598 nancy@heshaabramsmediation.com
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

No Logo Richard Egan, Technical Advisor

Represented by O'Keefe, Egan & Peterman LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (377) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 374 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims for relief asserted by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC against Whole Foods Market, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice and all claims for relief asserted by Whole Foods Market, Inc. against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/19/2011. (kls, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    FINAL JUDGMENT. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that all claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit be DISMISSED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/19/2011. (kls, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS. Pursuant to the Parties Stipulation and good cause appearing therefore, it is hereby ordered that BEDROCK COMPUTER TECHNOLOGIES, LLCs (BEDROCK) claims against VIRGIN AMERICA INC. (VIRGIN AMERICA) and VIRGIN AMERICAS counterclaims against BEDROCK in the above-referenced action are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, except that VIRGIN AMERICA shall be entitled to assert that any patent asserted by BEDROCK is not infringed, is invalid or is unenforceable as an affirmative defense or counterclaim to any future claim of infringement respecting such patent in which it is a party. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees in connection with this action. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/18/2011. (kls, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Whole Foods Market, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
          STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Virgin America, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 370 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to submit closing documents is extended to 6-29-2011 as to Virgin America Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/30/11. cc:attys 6-30-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 368 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to submit closing documents is extended to 7-15-2011 as to Whole Foods Market, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/30/11. cc:attys 6-30-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Submit Closing Documents as to Virgin America, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Rackspace Hosting, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Submit Closing Documents as to Whole Foods Market, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 358 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All crossclaims and counterclaims in this action by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC against deft The Gap Inc are dismissed with prejudice, and all crossclaims and counterclaims by The Gap against Bedrock are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-22-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 357 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All crossclaims and counterclaims in this action by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC against defts The Go Daddy Group Inc and Godaddy.com Inc are dismissed with prejudice, and all crossclaims and counterclaims made by Go Daddy defts against Bedrock are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-22-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 356 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All crossclaims and counterclaims in this action by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC against deft Facebook Inc are dismissed with prejudice, and all crossclaims and counterclaims by Facebook against Bedrock Computer are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-22-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 355 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All crossclaims and counterclaims in this action by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC against deft 1&1 Internet Inc are dismissed with prejudice, and all crossclaims and counterclaims made by 1&1 Internet against Bedrock are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-22-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 363 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 354 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All claims and counterclaims in this action by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC against Red Hat Inc are dismissed with prejudice, and all claims and counterclaims by Red Hat are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-22-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 353 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All claims in this action between Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC and defts NYSE Euronext Inc and Rackspace Hosting Inc are dismissed with prejudice; all crossclaims and counterclaims by defts are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-22-11(mll, ) Modified on 6/22/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 352 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All claims in this action between Bedrock Computer Technologies and deft ConocoPhillips Company are dismissed with prejudice; all crossclaims and counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-22-11(mll, ) Modified on 6/22/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 351 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to submit closing documents is extended to 6-29-2011 as to Whole Foods Market Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/20/11. cc:attys 6-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 350 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to submit closing documents is extended to 6-29-2011 as to Virgin America Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/20/11. cc:attys 6-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Closing Documents as to Whole Foods Market, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Closing Documents as to Virgin America, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 345 Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED the deadline to submit closing documents is extended to and including June 17, 2011 as to Virgin America, Inc. and Whole Foods Market, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/13/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 347 Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED the deadline to submit closing documents is extended to and including June 17, 2011 as to The Gap, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/13/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Closing Documents as to The Gap, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE by ConAgra Foods, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Closing Documents as to Virgin America, Inc. and Whole Foods Market, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    5.10.11 Minute Entry - Settlement Conference: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Settlement Conference held on 5/10/2011. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 342 Motion to Stay. All deadlines with respect to Virgin America are hereby extended two weeks. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/23/11. cc:attys 5-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay JOINT MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY TO PURSUE SETTLEMENT by Virgin America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE by ConAgra Foods, Inc. for Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Hinderaker, Allen) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 333 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All claims in this action by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC against deft ThePlanet.com Internet Services Inc are dismissed with prejudice; all claims for relief asserted by ThePlanet.com against Bedrock are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/10/11. cc:attys 5-11-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $4,290.00 to Richard Egan, for services rendered and expenses incurred through 5-10-2011 as the Court's technical advisor, for a total amount of $8,580.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/11/11. cc:attys 5-11-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER that parties shall submit closing documents in this cause by 6-10-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/11/11. cc:attys 5-11-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 324 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Plaintiff and Cross-Claim Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by Virgin America Inc. re 329 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Crossclaim Defendant Virgin America's Statement in Response to the April 25, 2011 Status Conference (Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. re 330 Notice (Other) Notice of Position that a Markman Hearing is Necessary, and Response to Dkt. 330 (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 327 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Mediation Deadline. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the mediation deadline to be extended to and including June 30, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/6/2011. (kls, ) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal as to ThePlanet.com Internet Services, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, Red Hat, Inc. JOINT NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 4-5(d) AND ORDER DATED JANUARY 24, 2011 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Greskowiak, Stacie) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 324 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Plaintiff and Cross-Claim Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC NOTICE OF POSITION THAT NO HEARING IS NECESSARY TO RESOLVE ISSUES RELATED TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND INDEFINITENESS (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Whole Foods Market, Inc. - Red Hat and Cross-Claim Defendants' Supplemental Information in Follow-Up to The April 25, 2011 Status Conference (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER setting briefing schedule: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness due 5-05-2011; Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness due 5-09-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/29/11. cc:attys 4-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION TO EXTEND THE MEDIATION DEADLINE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. - Joint Notice of Estimated Amount of Time Requested for the Markman Hearing (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment - Plaintiff and Cross-Claim Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of R. Korn, # 2 Exhibit A to Korn Dec - H. Cohen Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B. to Korn Dec - US Patent No. 5,893,120, # 4 Exhibit C to Korn Dec - 8-10-98 Office Action Response, # 5 Exhibit D to Korn Dec - 1-10-11 Memorandum Opinion and Order by Judge Love, # 6 Exhibit E to Korn Dec - 10-7-10 Indefiniteness Presentation in Civ 09-269, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 322 , Sealed Patent Response. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 322 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Gap, Inc., Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Conoco Phillips Company, Red Hat, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc., Virgin America Inc., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services to 319 Claim Construction Brief, filed by The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Gap, Inc., Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Conoco Phillips Company, Red Hat, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc., Virgin America Inc., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from BRI - Defendants' Markman Presentation, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Kruse - Data Structures and Program Design, # 3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Nemes Depo Transcript, # 4 Exhibit D - ex Parte Reexam OA of 7-23-10, # 5 Exhibit E - PTO Communication of 2-22-11, # 6 Exhibit F - Excerpts from The American Heritage Dictionary, # 7 Exhibit G - Mikkelsen v. Zund Am Decision & Order, # 8 Exhibit H - New World Dictionary of Computer Terms)(Williams, E Danielle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2011: # 9 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacie Lynn Greskowiak on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Greskowiak, Stacie) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference via telephone for 4/25/2011 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/18/11. cc:attys 4-18-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stacie L. Greskowiak, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Exhibit A-6)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Crossclaim Defendant The Go Daddy Group, Inc's ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,, Third Party Defendant, The Go Daddy Group, Inc's ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,, by The Go Daddy Group, Inc..(LaCorte, Brian) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G Rhodes for Facebook, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 315 Motion to Amend/Correct Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/01/11. cc:attys 4-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 278 Claim Construction Chart - Unopposed Motion to Amend the P.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Jt. Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Amended Exhibit B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER ADOPTING 303 Report and Recommendations; overruling 308 Objections to the Report and Recommendations, and denying 131 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/30/11. cc:attys 3-30-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 308 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 300 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief Request for Leave to file a Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/11. cc:attys 3-25-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony P Miller on behalf of Rackspace Hosting, Inc. (Miller, Anthony) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul V Storm on behalf of Rackspace Hosting, Inc. (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Letter Brief filed by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to 303 Report and Recommendations by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (LaCorte, Brian) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Abbott Hargrave on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Hargrave, Ryan) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Letter Brief filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 302 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All claims for relief asserted between pltf and deft RL Polk & Co are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/11. cc:attys 3-08-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 299 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All claims between pltf and deft ConAgra Foods Inc are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/11. cc:attys 3-08-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 131 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by The Go Daddy Group, Inc., be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/02/11. cc:attys 3-03-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal as to R.L. Polk & Co. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 298 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The deadline to file a Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness is extended to 4-28-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/28/11. cc:attys 2-28-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief filed by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal as to ConAgra Foods, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 291 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of The Gap, Inc. (Thane, Joshua) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 294 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Neil J McNabnay; Chad Brian Walker; Carl Edward Bruce and Christopher B Hadley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/27/11. cc:attys 1-27-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson Gorham on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Gorham, Andrew) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Conoco Phillips Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel M Capoccia on behalf of Conoco Phillips Company (Capoccia, Rachel) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by The Go Daddy Group, Inc. of Change of Attorney Information (Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 290 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/24/11. cc:attys 1-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 170 Order Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, John) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marissa Rachel Ducca on behalf of Conoco Phillips Company (Ducca, Marissa) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 286 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Cannon Low on behalf of The Gap, Inc. (Low, John) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Extend Time re Certain Deadlines by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, John) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 282 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs and expenses relating to this litigation shall be borne solely by the party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/06/11. cc:attys 1-06-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 281 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft SunGuard Data Systems Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs and expenses relating to this litigation shall be borne soley by the party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/06/11. cc:attys 1-06-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE. The Court has posted a standing order regarding summary judgment motions, motions to strike expert testimony/Daubert motions, motions in limine, exhibits and deposition designations that can be found on the Courts website. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/5/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal as to SunGard Data Systems, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 279 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/30/10. cc:attys 12-30-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Regarding Certain Deadlines by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Sungard Data Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART [JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT]filed by Red Hat, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 ExhibitF)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 276 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/10. cc:attys 12-22-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 170 Order by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curry, John) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 263 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip M Aurentz on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Aurentz, Phillip) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Wayne Hejny on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Hejny, Scott) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 4-2 (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. - Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 4-2 (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 269 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/02/10. cc:attys 12-02-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Comply with Certain Deadlines by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Brian Walker on behalf of Conoco Phillips Company (Walker, Chad) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER appointing Richard D Egan to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/01/10. cc:attys 12-01-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC NOTICE OF AGREEMENT FOR PROPOSED TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Ann Bennett on behalf of The Gap, Inc. (Bennett, Natalie) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Keith James on behalf of The Gap, Inc. (James, Bryan) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO BEDROCK COMPUTER TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM), COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Conoco Phillips Company.(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 258 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Nicholas Bunch terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/23/10. cc:attys 11-23-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 255 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/22/10. cc:attys 11-22-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 254 Motion to Extend the First Mediation Deadline to 2-28-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/22/10. cc:attys 11-22-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 253 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/22/10. cc:attys 11-22-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for James Nicholas Bunch by Conoco Phillips Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/19/10. cc:attys 11-19-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 208 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/19/10. cc:attys 11-19-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION To extend first mediation deadline by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Lam) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (P.R. 4-1 and Paragraph 2 of Discovery Order) by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Sungard Data Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl Edward Bruce on behalf of Conoco Phillips Company (Bruce, Carl) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 249 Motion to Extend the Mediation Deadline. The deadline for parties to complete mediation is extended to 1-31-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/10/10. cc:attys 11-10-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Go Daddy Group, Inc. (LaCorte, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION Extend Mediation Deadline as to Bedrock Technologies, LLC, ConAgra Foods, Inc. and R.L. Polk & Co. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 247 Motion to Extend Time. The new deadline for mediation is extended to 1-22-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/01/10. cc:attys 11-02-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Extend the Deadline for Mediation by The Gap, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, John) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 243 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/25/10. cc:attys 10-26-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. - Plaintiff and Cross Claim Defendants' Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 4-1 (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Conoco Phillips Company (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Comply with P.R. 4-1 and paragraph 2 of the March 23, 2010 Discovery Order as to SunGard Data Systems Inc. and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 224 Response in Opposition to Motion by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and P.R, 3-4 (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Sungard Data Systems, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/10. cc:attys 10-20-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by R.L. Polk & Co. (R.L. Polk & Co.'s Notice of P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 Disclosures) (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by NYSE Euronext, Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Whole Foods Market, Inc. - Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc. of P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 (Wittmann, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Facebook, Inc. of P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 (Nguyen, Lam) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Virgin America Inc. Notice of P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 Disclosures (Kramer, Leslie) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by The Go Daddy Group, Inc. The Go Daddy Group, Inc.'s Notice of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (LaCorte, Brian) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by The Gap, Inc. Notice of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Lee, John) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by ConAgra Foods, Inc. re P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 208 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by The Go Daddy Group, Inc. re 131 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Defendant Go Daddy's Supplemental Citation of Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(LaCorte, Brian) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 227 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Steven Gardner; J Thad Heartfield; Russell A Korn; M. Dru Montgomery; E Danielle Thompson Williams; John C Alemanni and William H Boice terminated as Counsel for R.L. Polk & Co. Jennifer Doan, Emily Zelenock, and Andrew Grove added. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/10. cc:attys 10-12-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by R.L. Polk & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 207 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 206 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 208 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order and Counter-Motion for Entry of Defendants' Protective Order filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily J Zelenock on behalf of R.L. Polk & Co. (Zelenock, Emily) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew M Grove on behalf of R.L. Polk & Co. (Grove, Andrew) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of R.L. Polk & Co. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 203 Answer to Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 201 Response to Non-Motion by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 204 Response to Non-Motion by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 200 Response to Non-Motion, by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 194 Response to Non-Motion by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 195 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 199 Response to Non-Motion by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 198 Response to Non-Motion, by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 202 Response to Non-Motion, by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 189 Response to Non-Motion, by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 196 Response to Non-Motion by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 192 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint (Bedrock's Second Amended Answer and Third Party Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint (Bedrock's Second Amended Answer and Third Party Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Sungard Data Systems, Inc..(Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie A Kramer on behalf of Virgin America Inc. (Kramer, Leslie) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Bedrock Computer Technologies by Virgin America Inc.. (Shamilov, Saina) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Red Hat, Inc..(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - Rackspace Hosting, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Bedrock Computer Technologies Second Amended Answer, Counterclaim and Crossclaim by Rackspace Hosting, Inc.. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - R.L. Polk & Co.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Bedrock Computer Technologies Second Amended Answer, Counterclaim and Crossclaim by R.L. Polk & Co.. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - Whole Foods Market, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Bedrock Computer Technologies Second Amended Answer, Counterclaim and Crossclaim by Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - NYSE Euronext, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Bedrock Compuer Technologies Second Amended Answer, Counterclaim and Crossclaim by NYSE Euronext. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - ThePlanet.com Internet Services, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Bedrock Computer Technologies Second Amended Answer, Counterclaim and Crossclaim by The Planet.com Internet Services. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lam Khanh Nguyen on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Nguyen, Lam) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 1 & 1 Internet's Response to Bedrock's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc.. (Wittmann, Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              THE GAP, INC.'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO BEDROCK'S SECOND AMENDED CROSSCLAIM ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against The Gap, Inc. by The Gap, Inc..(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim ConocoPhillips Company's Response to Bedrock's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Conoco Phillips Company. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Go Daddy's Response to Bedrock's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Bedrock's 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Facebook, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by The Planet.com Internet Services Notice of Compliance (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lam Khanh Nguyen on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Nguyen, Lam) Modified on 9/3/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 187 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (ConAgra Foods Inc.'s Answer to Bedrock's Second Amended Crossclaim, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC) by ConAgra Foods, Inc.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Red Hat, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Sungard Data Systems, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Krieger, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company of Compliance re Initial Disclosures (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Virgin America Inc. THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT VIRGIN AMERICA INC.'S NOTICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Whole Foods Market, Inc. : Service of Initial Disclosures (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by The Planet.com Internet Services : Service of Initial Disclosures (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by The Gap, Inc. (Lee, John) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by R.L. Polk & Co. : Service of Initial Disclosures (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Rackspace Hosting, Inc. : Service of Initial Disclosures (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by NYSE Euronext : Service of Initial Disclosures (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Facebook, Inc. INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by The Go Daddy Group, Inc. (Notice of Initial Disclosure) (LaCorte, Brian) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc. (Wittmann, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Conoco Phillips Company (Bunch, James) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by ConAgra Foods, Inc. (Notice of Initial Disclosures) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Virgin America Inc. (Shamilov, Saina) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by The Go Daddy Group, Inc. re 131 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Defendant Go Daddy Group Inc.'s Notice of Request for Oral Argument (Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/06/10. cc:attys 7-06-10(mll, ) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 131 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan R. Yim, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct (Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Sungard Data Systems, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) Modified on 7/14/2010 (mll, ). (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam M Pivovar for Facebook, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. DENIED as to the Softlayer Defendants; GRANTED as to the Red Hat Defendants. The Court continues the Markman hearing in the Red Hat action to 3-10-2011 at 9:30 a.m. The Court orders the parties to meet and confer and submit an agreed Amended Docket Control Order with a revised schedule of deadlines by 7-06-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/29/10. cc:attys 6-30-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 131 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaCorte, Brian) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 4-2 (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              **FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 164 FOR CORRECT PLEADING.** NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R.4-2 (Cassady, Jason) Modified on 6/22/2010 (mll, ). (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 135 Answer to Crossclaim, Counterclaim,, by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 137 Answer to Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Red Hat, Inc. of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 4-2 (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 148 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order to extend the deadline to exchange Privilege Logs to 6/30/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/18/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 104 Answer to Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 106 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 108 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 110 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 111 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 112 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 114 Answer to Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 117 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 119 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 121 Answer to Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 44 Scheduling Order, by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Sungard Data Systems, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. re 144 Response to Motion, 142 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Defendants' Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Orders) MOTION to Amend/Correct (Defendants' Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Orders) MOTION to Amend/Correct (Defendants' Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Orders) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 97 Answer to Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 131 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan R. Yim, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Exhibit A.8, # 10 Exhibit A.9, # 11 Exhibit A.10, # 12 Exhibit A.11, # 13 Exhibit A.12, # 14 Exhibit A.13, # 15 Exhibit A.14, # 16 Exhibit A.15, # 17 Exhibit A.16, # 18 Exhibit A.17, # 19 Exhibit A.18, # 20 Exhibit A.19, # 21 Exhibit A.20, # 22 Exhibit A.21, # 23 Exhibit A.22, # 24 Exhibit A.23, # 25 Exhibit A.24, # 26 Exhibit A.25)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 142 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Defendants' Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Orders) MOTION to Amend/Correct (Defendants' Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Orders) MOTION to Amend/Correct (Defendants' Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Orders) filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J Kevin Fee for Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2010: # 1 Exhibit) (mll, ). (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct (Defendants' Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Orders) by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Sungard Data Systems, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dodd Cassady on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ConAgra Foods, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell A Korn on behalf of NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Korn, Russell) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Virgin America Inc..(Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 133 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting 133 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Neil J McNabnay terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/01/10. cc:attys 6-01-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Crossclaim Defendant's ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses, First COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by ConAgra Foods, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas P Canty for 1 & 1 Internet, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Regarding Neil J. McNabnay & J. Nicholas Bunch, MOTION to Substitute Attorney Brian W. LaCorte by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ben Butler, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Lane Jarvis, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Ron Hertz, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Teri Dhooge, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Lary Hartman, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William H Boice on behalf of NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Boice, William) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Virgin America Inc..( Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-1 AND P.R. 3-2 (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher B Hadley for Conoco Phillips Company. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sungard Data Systems, Inc. (Krieger, Paul) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian W LaCorte for The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(mll, ) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ConAgra Foods, Inc..( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Facebook, Inc..(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Whole Foods Market, Inc.'s ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Whole Foods Market, Inc..(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by R.L. Polk & Co. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          R.L. Polk & Co.'s ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by R.L. Polk & Co..(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yar R Chaikovsky on behalf of The Gap, Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Gap, Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The Gap, Inc.'s ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by The Gap, Inc..(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc. (Wittmann, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    1 & 1 Internet Inc.'s ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by 1 & 1 Internet, Inc..(Wittmann, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Sungard Data Systems, Inc..(Krieger, Paul) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rackspace Hosting, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Wells Fargo and Company for Rackspace Hosting, Inc.. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rackspace Hosting, Inc.'s ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Rackspace Hosting, Inc..(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Planet.com Internet Services (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The Planet.com Internet Service's ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by The Planet.com Internet Services.(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NYSE Euronext (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NYSE Euronext's ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by NYSE Euronext.(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul E Krieger on behalf of Sungard Data Systems, Inc. (Krieger, Paul) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of The Go Daddy Group, Inc. (Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 95 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order: Parties shall designate expert witnesses by 5-25-2011; Rebuttal experts designated by 6-15-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/21/10. cc:attys 5-21-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Timothy S Durst terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/21/10. cc:attys 5-21-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 4-1 (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Conoco Phillips Company FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Bunch, James) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC by Conoco Phillips Company.(Bunch, James) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alton Absher, III on behalf of NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Absher, Alton) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 44 Scheduling Order, by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of The Planet.com Internet Services (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Timothy S. Durst and Baker Botts LLP) by The Planet.com Internet Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal)(Durst, Timothy) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C Alemanni on behalf of NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Alemanni, John) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Gardner on behalf of NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Gardner, Steven) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Red Hat, Inc. Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 4-1 (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J Christopher Erb for 1 & 1 Internet, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Randy Yim on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Yim, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney H Michael Hartmann for 1 & 1 Internet, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert T Wittmann for 1 & 1 Internet, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher John Sorenson on behalf of ConAgra Foods, Inc. (Sorenson, Christopher) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan J Fletcher on behalf of ConAgra Foods, Inc. (Fletcher, Ryan) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen W Hinderaker on behalf of ConAgra Foods, Inc. (Hinderaker, Allen) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Red Hat, Inc. Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 3-3- and 3-4 (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,, by Red Hat, Inc.. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of 1 & 1 Internet, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of 1 & 1 Internet, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sungard Data Systems, Inc..( Glenn, James) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Hat, Inc.. The Planet.com Internet Services personally served on 4/2/2010 on registered agent Corporation Trust Company, answer due 4/23/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Go Daddy Group, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Planet.com Internet Services.( Durst, Timothy) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy S Durst on behalf of The Planet.com Internet Services (Durst, Timothy) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lynn H Pasahow on behalf of Virgin America Inc. (Pasahow, Lynn) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Rackspace Hosting, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.( Rambo, Rick) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rackspace Hosting, Inc..( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 1 & 1 Internet, Inc..( Wittmann, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Whole Foods Market, Inc..( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Hat, Inc.. Rackspace Hosting, Inc. served on 4/2/2010, answer due 4/23/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Hat, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. served on 4/2/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Hat, Inc.. Conoco Phillips Company served on 4/2/2010, answer due 4/23/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Hat, Inc.. ConAgra Foods, Inc. served on 4/2/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff Red Hat Inc shall have to 5-10-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to deft Bedrock Computer's First Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/10. cc:attys 4-21-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Nicholas Bunch on behalf of Conoco Phillips Company (Bunch, James) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Conoco Phillips Company (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,, by Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of NYSE Euronext (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NYSE Euronext.( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Facebook, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Hat, Inc.. NYSE Euronext personally served on 4/2/2010on Maria Garcia, answer due 4/23/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Hat, Inc.. Virgin America Inc. personally served on 4/2/2010 on Elena Bou, answer due 4/23/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Hat, Inc.. The Go Daddy Group, Inc. personally served on 4/5/2010 on Steve Morrisey, answer due 4/26/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Hat, Inc.. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company personally served on 4/2/2010 on Jeanne Williams, Paralegal for Nationwide, answer due 4/23/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CrossClaim/Third-Party Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Bedrock's CrossClaim/Third-Party Claim [Dkt. #30] re R.L. Polk & Co..( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of R.L. Polk & Co. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darren E Donnelly on behalf of Virgin America Inc. (Donnelly, Darren) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2011 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2010. Identify trial witnesses by 7/25/2011 Jury instructions due by 7/29/2011. Jury Selection set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Mediation Completion due by 7/21/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/13/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Virgin America Inc..( Shamilov, Saina) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of ConAgra Foods, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ConAgra Foods, Inc..( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of ConAgra Foods, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Hat, Inc.. 1 & 1 Internet, Inc. personally served Registered Agent United Corporate Services Inc on 4/2/2010, answer due 4/23/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Gap, Inc..( Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Docket Control Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Whole Foods Market, Inc. on 4/2/2010, by personal service; answer due: 4/23/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Sungard Data Systems, Inc. on 4/2/2010, by personal service; answer due: 4/23/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to R.L. Polk & Co. on 4/2/2010, by personal service; answer due: 4/23/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to The Gap, Inc. on 4/2/2010, by personal service; answer due: 4/23/2010. (mll, ) Modified on 4/8/2010 (mll, ). (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Whole Foods Market, Inc., and emailed to 3rd party pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, Facebook, Inc., NYSE Euronext, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, R.L. Polk & Co., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Sungard Data Systems, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, Virgin America Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc., and emailed to 3rd party pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Virgin America Inc., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Sungard Data Systems, Inc., 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, The Gap, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, First CROSSCLAIM against Virgin America Inc., Rackspace Hosting, Inc., NYSE Euronext, R.L. Polk & Co., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Sungard Data Systems, Inc., 1 & 1 Internet, Inc., Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, ConAgra Foods, Inc., Conoco Phillips Company, The Gap, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc., The Planet.com Internet Services, COUNTERCLAIM against Red Hat, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2010: # 2 Searchable Exhibit A) (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that the Court adopts deft Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC's proposal regarding the post-Markman deadlines in the Docket Control Order. Robert Faulkner and Hesha Abrams are appointed as mediators in this case. Parties shall refile their proposed Docket Control Order in accordance with the rulings made by the Court as reflected in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/23/10. cc:attys 3-24-10(mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/23/10. cc:attys 3-24-10(mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to submit their agreed docket control and discovery orders is extended to 3-22-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/17/10. cc:attys 3-17-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-1 AND P.R. 3-2 (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 03-15-2010. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 03-15-2010 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus pltf's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 03-05-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/05/10. cc:attys 3-05-10(mll, ) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        3.1.2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 3/1/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Wright Budwin on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Budwin, Joshua) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Red Hat, Inc.. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 3/1/2010 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/05/10. cc:attys 2-05-10(mll, ) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Red Hat, Inc. re 7 Order,, that Case is Ready for Scheduling Conference (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore Stevenson, III on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Stevenson, Theodore) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Curry, John) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Douglas A Cawley on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC (Parker, Robert) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Red Hat, Inc. by Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Russell A Korn for Red Hat, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William H Boice for Red Hat, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C Alemanni for Red Hat, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC.( Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET ORDER: The Court ORDERS the Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendant's answer or motion. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer and a list of any related cases previously filed in the Eastern District of Texas involving the same patent /patents. Entered by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/2009. (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Steven Gardner on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Gardner, John) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Hat, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Bedrock Computer Technologies LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002273960.), filed by Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 317 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?