EMS Technologies, LLC. v. General Electric Company et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00032
District Judge David Folsom, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 11:44 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

General Electric Company General Electric Company, Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Paul Yetter +1 713 238 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Terrazas +1 214 855 8000 kterrazas@fulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter Coleman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Ryan Johnson +1 512 533 0150 +1 512 533 0120 cjohnson@yettercoleman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter, Warden & Coleman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M. Morrow +1 713 632 8000 +1 713 632 8002 tmorrow@ywcllp.com
No Logo Johnson Controls, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by BECK REDDEN & SECREST LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joe W. Redden, Jr. +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 jredden@brsfirm.com
No Logo Rockwell Automation, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by BECK REDDEN & SECREST LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joe W. Redden, Jr. +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 jredden@brsfirm.com
No Logo Allen-bradley Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY John M Hintz +1 212 596 9000 jhintz@fishneave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Hintz +1 212 596 9000 jhintz@fishneave.com
No Logo Allen-bradley Company, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Hintz +1 212 596 9000 jhintz@fishneave.com
No Logo Allen-Bradley Technical Services Inc, Defendant

Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Hintz +1 212 596 9000 jhintz@fishneave.com
No Logo Authorized Installers Network LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Munsch Hardt Kopf Harr & Dinah PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick W Addison, III +1 214 855 7570 +1 214 855 7584 raddison@munsch.com
Space Nolan Cornelius Knight +1 214 855 7516 +1 214 978 5347 nknight@munsch.com
No Logo Authorized Integrators Network LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Munsch Hardt Kopf Harr & Dinah PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick W Addison, III +1 214 855 7570 +1 214 855 7584 raddison@munsch.com
Space Nolan Cornelius Knight +1 214 855 7516 +1 214 978 5347 nknight@munsch.com
No Logo Green Box Technology, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Douglas Schumann +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 dschumann@fenwick.com
No Logo Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC, Defendant

Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY John M Hintz +1 212 596 9000 jhintz@fishneave.com
No Logo Rockwell Software, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY John M Hintz +1 212 596 9000 jhintz@fishneave.com
No Logo Silver Spring Networks, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Douglas Schumann +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 dschumann@fenwick.com
No Logo EMS Technologies, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Agility IP Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas T Carmack +1 650 227 4800 +1 650 318 3483 tom@agilityiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler, Andrew Wesley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Y Brandt +1 903 753 9300 +1 903 553 0403 brandt@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Carl Otteson +1 408 291 2750 +1 650 318 3483 jim@agilityiplaw.com
No Logo Gail Peterson, Mediator
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (231) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 231 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in the suit between plaintiff, EMS Technologies, LLC, and defendant, General Electric Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled Settlement and License Agreement and dated December 13, 2011. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/21/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulated) by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Irvin E Tyan for EMS Technologies LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-826) (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 3, 2011, Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/30/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2012. (Crawford, Libby) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER amending docket control order, ( Discovery due by 12/6/2011., Expert Witness List due by 12/19/2011., Motions due by 2/3/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2012.), Motions terminated: 227 Joint MOTION to Establish Remaining Dates in the Docket Control Order filed by EMS Technologies LLC.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/21/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION to Establish Remaining Dates in the Docket Control Order by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caine, David) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER denying 207 Letter Brief, defendant's request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment of invalidity. filed by General Electric Company. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 11/14/2011. (sm, ) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Tutorial and Markman Hearing held on 11/3/2011, Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2011 re 186 SEALED MOTION EMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (lfs, ) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER denying 214 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Newly Proposed Constructions, orin the Alternative, Request for Additional Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on November 2, 2011. (rml, ) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Johnson Controls Inc, Rockwell Automation Inc Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Redden, Joe) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Johnson Controls Inc, Rockwell Automation Inc Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 214 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Newly Proposed Constructions, or in the Alternative, Request for Additional Briefing filed by General Electric Company. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 214 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Newly Proposed Constructions, or in the Alternative, Request for Additional Briefing filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsh, Philip) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                              Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company (Attachments: # 1 Reply Letter Brief)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER that Plaintiffs response, if any, be filed no later than Friday, October 28, 2011 at 5:00 PM and Dfts reply, if any, no later than October 31, 2011 re: 214 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Newly Proposed Constructions, or in the Alternative, Request for Additional Briefing filed by General Electric Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/25/2011. (sm, ) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER REFERRING MOTION to the Honorable Caroline M. Craven for decision: 214 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Newly Proposed Constructions, or in the Alternative, Request for Additional Briefing filed by General Electric Company. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/25/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Newly Proposed Constructions, or in the Alternative, Request for Additional Briefing by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - (EMS 4-2(a) and (B) Disclosures), # 2 Exhibit 2 - (10/19/11 Email from D. Caine), # 3 Exhibit 3 - (10/20/11 Email from K. Terrazas), # 4 Exhibit 4 - (10/21/11 Email from A. Spangler), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                      JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Caine, David) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                        Letter Brief filed by EMS Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Marsh, Philip) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER resets technical tutorial, ( Class Certification Hearing set for 11/3/2011 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom). Each side will have up to 15 minutes to present technical tutorial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/13/2011. (sm, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER REFERRING MOTION to the Honorable Caroline M. Craven for decision: 186 SEALED MOTION EMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by EMS Technologies LLC. The Court hereby REFERS the above-captioned case to the Honorable Caroline M. Craven for purposes of claim construction. (Markman Hearing set for 11/3/2011 09:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/12/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 208 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott A Keller terminated as counsel for Defendant General Electric, Co.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/11/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Scott) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company (Attachments: # 1 Letter Brief)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Letter Brief)(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 10/6/2011 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                      SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by EMS Technologies LLC to 201 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion,, 195 Claim Construction Brief, filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration of Philip W. Marsh), # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Marsh, Philip) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***REPLY to 195 Claim Construction Brief, filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Philip W. Marsh, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Marsh, Philip) Modified on 10/4/2011 (ch, ). (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 202 Sealed Patent Motion for leave to File a Second Surreply. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/30/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to File Second Surreply in Support of its Opposition to EMS' Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Second Surreply, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 201 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE (RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONTRUCTION BRIEF) by General Electric Company to 195 Claim Construction Brief, filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - US 6,169,979, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Transcript - Robert H. Schulte - 1/20/2011, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcript - Keith H. Wietecki - 1/19/2011, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Deposition Transcript - John N. Bartunek - 3/14/2011, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition Transcript - Jerome D. Johnson - 12/7/2010, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Am. in Resp. to Office Action Oct. 4, 1999, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Deposition Transcript - Todd Brandt - 08/25/2010)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 200 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Sealed Document. EMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING EXHIBIT S TO THE DECELARATION OF DAVID A. CAINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGMENT CONTENTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Caine, David) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of General Electric Company (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 198 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 186 SEALED MOTION EMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 197 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip William Marsh on behalf of EMS Technologies LLC (Marsh, Philip) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 196 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Service): 195 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Caine, David) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration of David A. Caine), # 2 Exhibit (Exh. 1 to Declaration), # 3 Exhibit (Exh. 2 to Declaration), # 4 Exhibit (Exh. 3 to Declaration), # 5 Exhibit (Exh. 4 to Declaration), # 6 Exhibit (Exh. 5 to Declaration), # 7 Exhibit (Exh. 6 to Declaration))(Caine, David) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 194 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT; filed by EMS Technologies LLC, General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(mrm, ) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 193 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 188 Motion for Leave to File the Amended Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. (see Local Rule 7(k)). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/12/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 192 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Ryan Johnson on behalf of General Electric Company (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 191 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott A Keller on behalf of General Electric Company (Keller, Scott) Modified on 9/9/2011 (ehs, ). (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 190 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by EMS Technologies LLC re 186 SEALED MOTION EMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Notice of Errata) (Caine, David) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 189 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 186 SEALED MOTION EMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Supplemental Declaration of David A. Caine), # 2 Exhibit V, # 3 Exhibit W, # 4 Exhibit X, # 5 Exhibit Y)(Caine, David) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement, # 2 Exhibit A to Amended Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 187 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 186 SEALED MOTION EMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - EMS's Disclosure, # 2 Exhibit 2 - October 12, 2010 email, # 3 Exhibit 3 - October 26, 2010 email, # 4 Exhibit 4 - November 9, 2010 email, # 5 Exhibit 5 - February 14, 2011 email, # 6 Exhibit 6 - March 4, 2011 letter, # 7 Exhibit 7 - July 25, 2011 email, # 8 Exhibit 8 - EMS's Amended Disclosure, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Claim Chart for U.S. Patent No. 6,169,979, # 10 Exhibit 10 - EMS's Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 186 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            SEALED MOTION EMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF DAVID A. CAINE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF EMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, # 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, # 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, # 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, # 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT I, # 11 Exhibit EXHIBIT J, # 12 Exhibit EXHIBIT K, # 13 Exhibit EXHIBIT L, # 14 Exhibit EXHIBIT M, # 15 Exhibit EXHIBIT N, # 16 Exhibit EXHIBIT O, # 17 Exhibit EXHIBIT P, # 18 Exhibit EXHIBIT Q, # 19 Exhibit EXHIBIT R, # 20 Exhibit EXHIBIT S, # 21 Exhibit EXHIBIT T, # 22 Exhibit EXHIBIT U)(Caine, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2011: # 23 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by EMS Technologies LLC Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement) (Caine, David) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Caine, David) Modified on 8/2/2011 (ch, ). (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 183 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER; The Court therefore hereby ORDERS that the Clerk shall UNSEAL the Court's July 14, 2011 Order (Dkt. No. 179 ). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/28/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 182 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE by EMS Technologies LLC re 181 Order, NOTICE RE ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY (Caine, David) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 181 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER; ORDERS the parties to confer and to submit to the Court by Notice, within 21 days of this Order, a proposed redacted version of the Order with confidential information redacted as the parties feel appropriate. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/18/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Xiang Long on behalf of EMS Technologies LLC (Long, Xiang) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER; denying 172 Sealed Patent Motion for sum jgm of invalidity. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/14/2011. (sm, ) Modified on 7/28/2011 (mrm, ). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 178 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Certificate of Authority to Seal): 177 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,,. (Caine, David) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 177 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 172 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DAVID A. CAINE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF EMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY, # 2 Exhibit CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBIT 7, # 3 Exhibit CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBIT 8, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 9, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 10, # 6 Exhibit EXIBIT 11, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 12, # 8 Exhibit CONFDIENTIAL EXHIBIT 13 PART 1, # 9 Exhibit CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBIT 13 PART 2, # 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT 14)(Caine, David) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 176 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 172 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Chart comparing modules of XA/21TM, # 2 Exhibit 3- Excerpts from EMS Technologies, LLCs P.R. 3-1(c) Claim Chart as to XA/21 Instrumentalities (June 11, 2010), # 3 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from XA/21 SCADA EMS brochure found by EMS, # 4 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from XA/21 overview brochure found by EMS, # 5 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Defendants Invalidity Contentions (August 9, 2010), # 6 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from EMS Supplemental P.R. 3-1(c) Claim Chart for GE GridIQ, Smart Meters, and XA/21 (March 9, 2011), # 7 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice (April 27, 2011), # 8 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiffs Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice (January 28, 2011), # 9 Exhibit 22 - Excerpts from executed contract, # 10 Exhibit 37 - Second Declaration of Mike Unum, # 11 Exhibit 38 - Business Records Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 39 - Declaration of Kevin Terrazas)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 172 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Caine, # 2 Exhibit Exh 1 to Caine Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exh 2 to Caine Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exh 3 to Caine Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Confidential Exh 4 to Caine Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Confidential Exh 5 to Caine Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exh 6 to Caine Declaration, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Caine, David) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 174 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 172 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY. (Exhibits 23 - 36) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 23 - Excerpts from Statement of Work, Vol. 1 (GE 054571-601 and GE 054625-629) (April 1992), # 2 Exhibit 24 - Excerpts from Statement of Work, Vol. 2 (GE 030912-933 and GE 030953-954) (April 1992), # 3 Exhibit 25 - Oglethorpe Power Corp.s Acceptance of Proposal by Harris Corp. (GE 054601) (April 6, 1992), # 4 Exhibit 26 - Oglethorpe Power Corp.s purchase order for XA/21 system (GE 031909-22), # 5 Exhibit 27 - Press release announcing Harris Corp.s sale to Oglethorpe Power Corp. (GE 109370-71) (July 31, 1992), # 6 Exhibit 28 - Southern California Edison purchase order (GE 070930-935) (May 18, 1992), # 7 Exhibit 29 - Ohio Edison purchase order for XA/21 system (GE 127056-061) (June 26, 1992), # 8 Exhibit 30 - Excerpts from Purchase Agreement between Ohio Edison and Harris Controls (GE 127213, GE 127229, GE 127230-237 and GE 127241-248) (June 26, 1992), # 9 Exhibit 31 - Executed contract between Orange & Rockland Utilities, Inc. and Harris Controls GE 058931-46) (August 6, 1992), # 10 Exhibit 32 - Excerpts from list of deliverables (GE 061008, GE 061010-023, and GE 061025-046) (Sept. 15, 1992), # 11 Exhibit 33 - Purchase order issued by Orange & Rockland Utilities, Inc. to Harris Controls (GE 061005-06) (Oct. 2, 1992), # 12 Exhibit 34 - Affidavit of Mike Unum, # 13 Exhibit 35 - Business Records Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 36 - Affidavit of Thomas Morrow)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 172 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY. (Exhibits 8 - 22) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice (April 27, 2011), # 2 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiffs Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice (January 28, 2011), # 3 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts from Harris Corporation proposal to Minnesota Power (GE 019033-038, GE 019044-081) (December 1, 1989), # 4 Exhibit 11 - Harris Corporation formal bid letter to Minnesota Power (GE 018968) (December 1, 1989), # 5 Exhibit 12 - Excerpts from Agreement between Harris Corporation and Minnesota Power (GE 017962, GE 018883-892, GE 018910-915, and GE 018962-967) (June 28, 1990), # 6 Exhibit 13 - Purchase Order executed by Minnesota Power to Harris Corporation (GE 011917-924) (June 28, 1990), # 7 Exhibit 14 - Orders Secured and Commission Statement for Sale (GE 011914) (June 30, 1990), # 8 Exhibit 15 - Purchase Order executed by Central Louisiana Electric Cooperative (CLECO) to Harris Corporation (GE 111451-52) (August 9, 1991), # 9 Exhibit 16 - Contract between Central Louisiana Electric Cooperative (CLECO) and Harris Corp. (GE 111453-455) (August 5, 1991), # 10 Exhibit 17 - Letter from Harris Corp. to CLECO (GE 016474-75) (Feb. 12, 1991), # 11 Exhibit 18 - Letter from CLECO to Harris Corp. (GE 014940-45) (Dec. 11, 1992), # 12 Exhibit 19 - Excerpts from Harris Corporation proposal to Louisville Gas & Electric (LG&E) (GE 051587-591) (July 3, 1991), # 13 Exhibit 20 - Contract Amendment between Louisville Gas & Electric and Harris Corp. (GE 040843-853) (April 1992), # 14 Exhibit 21 - Harris Corporation invoice to Louisville Gas & Electric (GE 042020-21) (December 3, 1991), # 15 Exhibit 22 - Excerpts from executed contract between Harris Corporation and San Diego Gas & Electric (GE 019644-667) (January 17, 1992))(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 172 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 6,169,979, # 3 Exhibit 2 - EMS Technologies, LLCs Disclosure of Asserted Claims (June 11, 2010), # 4 Exhibit 3 - EMS Technologies, LLCs P.R. 3.1(c) claim chart (June 11, 2010), # 5 Exhibit 4 - XA/21 SCADA EMS brochure found by EMS, # 6 Exhibit 5 - XA/21 overview brochure found by EMS, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Defendants Invalidity Contentions (August 9, 2010), # 8 Exhibit 7, part 1 - EMS Supplemental Infringement Contentions (March 9, 2011), # 9 Exhibit 7, part 2 - EMS Supplemental Infringement Contentions (March 9, 2011), # 10 Exhibit 7, part 3 - EMS Supplemental Infringement Contentions (March 9, 2011), # 11 Exhibit 7, part 4 - EMS Supplemental Infringement Contentions (March 9, 2011))(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 171 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER denying request re: 166 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company, granting request re: 165 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/23/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 170 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed
                                                                                                                            Sealed Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sealed Reply Letter Brief)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                              Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Letter Brief (XA/21))(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 168 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed
                                                                                                                                Sealed Letter Brief filed by EMS Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Caine, David) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                  Letter Brief filed by EMS Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Opposition Letter Brief regarding Summary Judgment on XA21 Control System)(Caine, David) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: 4/19/2011 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                    Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: 4/19/2011 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/18/2011 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company (Ward, Thomas) Modified on 4/19/2011 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/18/2011 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Letter Brief filed by General Electric Company (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 4/19/2011 (ch, ). (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas T Carmack on behalf of EMS Technologies LLC (Carmack, Thomas) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Caine on behalf of EMS Technologies LLC (Caine, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Otteson on behalf of EMS Technologies LLC (Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: 3/29/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, granting 158 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by EMS Technologies LLC., Attorney William Ellsworth Davis, III terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/29/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 154 Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/28/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 155 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by EMS Technologies LLC, Greenbox Technology Inc and Silver Spring Networks Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/24/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: 2/21/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by EMS Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certain Deadlines by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 152 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants SSN and Greenbox shall have until March 4, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/8/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shamilov, Saina) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                  ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shamilov, Saina) Modified on 2/7/2011 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by General Electric Company of Service of Disclosures Pursuant to P.R.4-2(a) and (b) (Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by EMS Technologies LLC of Compliance (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 4-2(a) and (b). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/1/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Comply with P.R. 4-2(a) and (b) by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 145 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; ORDERED that Defendants SSN and Greenbox shall have until February 4, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/7/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 126 Amended Complaint, by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion)(Shamilov, Saina) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 143 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/14/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 126 Amended Complaint, by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shamilov, Saina) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by General Electric Company of Service of Second Supplemented Initial Disclosures (Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, granting 140 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulated) filed by EMS Technologies LLC., Johnson Controls Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/3/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulated) by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 138 Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/24/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION to Extend Certain Deadlines by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft. Silver Spring Networks, Inc. andGreenbox Technology, Inc. deadline is extended to 12/7/2010. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/19/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 126 Amended Complaint,, by Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shamilov, Saina) Modified on 11/17/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 134 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of General Electric Company by EMS Technologies LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: 11/12/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    General Electric's ANSWER to 126 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against EMS Technologies LLC by General Electric Company.(Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 132 Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions. Plaintiff shall have up to and including November 9, 2010 to amend its infringement contentions regarding newly identified accused products of Defendant General Electric Company. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/10/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct its Infringement Contentions by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 130 Motion for Extension of Time to File its Answer to General Electric Co.'s Amended Answer and Counterclaims is extended up to and including November 15, 2010. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/8/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to General Electric Co.'s Amended Answer and Counterclaims by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/2/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document: 126 Amended Complaint,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Allen-Bradley Company, Allen-Bradley Company Inc, Allen-Bradley Company LLC, Allen-Bradley Technical Services Inc, Authorized Installers Network LLC, Authorized Integrators Network LLC, General Electric Company, Greenbox Technology Inc, Johnson Controls Inc, Rockwell Automation Inc, Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC, Rockwell Software Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc, filed by EMS Technologies LLC.(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint)(Sacksteder, Michael) Modified on 11/2/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by General Electric Company of Service of Supplemented Initial Disclosures (Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against EMS Technologies LLC by General Electric Company.(Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Dismiss and ORDERS that pla may amend its complaint within 21 days of this order. Dfts motion is DENIED as to direct infringement but GRANTED as to indirect infringement. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/12/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 120 Motion appointing Pete Peterson as mediator. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/10/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION Appoint Pete Peterson as Mediator by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 118 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/8/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 103 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,,,,, by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by EMS Technologies LLC of Compliance (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by General Electric Company of Compliance with P.R. 3-4 Obligations (Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by General Electric Company of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 Obligations for Defendants General Electric Company, Greenbox Technologies, Silver Springs Networks, and Johnson Controls, Inc. (Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc of Compliance with P.R. 3-4 Obligations (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: 8/12/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of EMS Technologies LLC (Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by General Electric Company Supplemental Notice of Service of Third-Party Subpoenas (Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by General Electric Company of Service of Third-Party Subpoenas (Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/12/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Johnson Controls Inc of service of a subpoena on Central Rural Electric Cooperative (Hintz, John) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by General Electric Company of Firm Name Change (Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Johnson Controls Inc in Compliance with FRCP 26(a)(1) and with the Court's Docket Control Order (103) (Redden, Joe) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by EMS Technologies LLC Notice of Initial Disclosure (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by General Electric Company (Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:( Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2012 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom., Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2010., Joinder of Parties due by 10/25/2010., Jury Selection set for 3/6/2012 in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom.), (Technical Tutorial set for 11/2/2011 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom., Markman Hearing set for 11/3/2011 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/14/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by EMS Technologies LLC of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Relief filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by EMS Technologies LLC, General Electric Company, Greenbox Technology Inc, Johnson Controls Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc of Filing of Revised Proposed Docket Control Order per Judge Folsom's Instructions (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hintz, John) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/10/2010 Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Johnson Controls Inc per Judge Folsom's instructions given at June 2 conference. (Hintz, John) Modified on 6/10/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, granting 97 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by EMS Technologies LLC., Attorney Todd Y Brandt terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/7/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: motion practice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/3/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/2/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Scheduling Conference held on 6/2/2010. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Relief filed by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED # 93 ***REPLY to Response to Motion re 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Relief filed by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael) Modified on 6/2/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of General Electric Company (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Allen-Bradley Company Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by EMS Technologies LLC, General Electric Company, Greenbox Technology Inc, Johnson Controls Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc re 88 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting -- filing of a revised Exhibit C (stipulated Protective Order) (Hintz, John) Modified on 5/26/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B, proposed Discovery Order, # 3 Exhibit C, stipulated Protective Order)(Hintz, John) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Relief filed by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Alternate Order)(Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, granting 83 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice filed by EMS Technologies LLC., Rockwell Automation Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/14/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 64 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Johnson Controls, Inc. by EMS Technologies LLC. (Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 62 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of General Electric Company by EMS Technologies LLC. (Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Relief Responses due by 5/24/2010. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Relief by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of EMS Technologies LLC (Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER and DISCOVERY ORDER Setting a scheduling conference in Texarkana, Texas. Parties are directed to meet and confer no later than May 12, 2010 21 days before conference. (Signed by Judge Folsom on 4/30/2010) (sm, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 76 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice all claims and counterclaims between pla and Dft Authorized Integrators Network. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/30/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 75 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice dft Authorized Installers. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/30/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants Authorized Installers Network, LLC and Authorized Integrators Network, LLC shall have until Monday, May 10, 2010 to answer or otherwise respond in this matter.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/29/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010, Terminated: 5/12/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Relief by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Authorized Installers Network LLC, Authorized Integrators Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knight, Nolan) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Terrazas on behalf of General Electric Company (Terrazas, Kevin) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R Paul Yetter on behalf of General Electric Company (Yetter, R) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by General Electric Company of Appearance for Kevin J. Terrazas (Morrow, Thomas) Modified on 4/23/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by General Electric Company of Appearance for R. Paul Yetter (Morrow, Thomas) Modified on 4/23/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rockwell Automation Inc (Redden, Joe) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Johnson Controls Inc (Redden, Joe) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against EMS Technologies LLC by Rockwell Automation Inc.(Redden, Joe) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against EMS by Johnson Controls Inc.(Redden, Joe) Modified on 4/22/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Electric Company (Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against EMS Technologies LLC by General Electric Company.(Morrow, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants Silver Spring Networks, Inc. and Greenbox Technology, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including April 26, 2010. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/21/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Third Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Silver Spring Networks, Inc. and Greenbox Technology, Inc.)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Ellsworth Davis, III on behalf of EMS Technologies LLC (Davis, William) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dfts Authorized Installers Network LLC and Authorized Intergrators Network LLC deadline is extended to 4/26/2010. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/12/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Authorized Installers Network LLC, Authorized Integrators Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knight, Nolan) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, granting 54 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss filed by EMS Technologies LLC., Allen-Bradley Company LLC, Allen-Bradley Technical Services Inc, Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC, Rockwell Software Inc, Allen-Bradley Company and Allen-Bradley Company Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/6/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/4/2010, Entered: 4/4/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Saina Shamilov on behalf of Silver Spring Networks Inc (Shamilov, Saina) (Entered: 04/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: 4/2/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by EMS Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ruffin B Cordell and firm of Fish & Richardson terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/29/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by Johnson Controls Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/22/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/22/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Grossman for Allen-Bradley Company,Robert Grossman for Allen-Bradley Company Inc,Robert Grossman for Allen-Bradley Company LLC,Robert Grossman for Allen-Bradley Technical Services Inc,Robert Grossman for Johnson Controls Inc,Robert Grossman for Rockwell Automation Inc,Robert Grossman for Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC,Robert Grossman for Rockwell Software Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5256 (ch, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas J McCormack for Allen-Bradley Company,Thomas J McCormack for Allen-Bradley Company Inc,Thomas J McCormack for Allen-Bradley Company LLC,Thomas J McCormack for Allen-Bradley Technical Services Inc,Thomas J McCormack for Johnson Controls Inc,Thomas J McCormack for Rockwell Automation Inc,Thomas J McCormack for Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC,Thomas J McCormack for Rockwell Software Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5256 (ch, ) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Greenbox Technology Inc, Silver Spring Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Plead)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Allen-Bradley Company, Allen-Bradley Company Inc, Allen-Bradley Company LLC, Allen-Bradley Technical Services Inc, Johnson Controls Inc, Rockwell Automation Inc, Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC, Rockwell Software Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order extending time to answer, move, or otherwise plead)(Hintz, John) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Hintz on behalf of Allen-Bradley Company, Allen-Bradley Company Inc, Allen-Bradley Company LLC, Allen-Bradley Technical Services Inc, Johnson Controls Inc, Rockwell Automation Inc, Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC, Rockwell Software Inc (Hintz, John) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: 3/17/2010 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge T. John Ward recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/17/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 4/22/10. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/16/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, or Move or Otherwise Respond by General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Authorized Installers Network LLC and Authorized Integrators Network LLC deadline is 4/12/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/10/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, or Response by Authorized Installers Network LLC, Authorized Integrators Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knight, Nolan) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nolan Cornelius Knight on behalf of Authorized Installers Network LLC, Authorized Integrators Network LLC (Knight, Nolan) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frederick W Addison, III on behalf of Authorized Installers Network LLC, Authorized Integrators Network LLC (Addison, Frederick) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Allen-Bradley Technical Services Inc.( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Allen-Bradley Company Inc.( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Allen-Bradley Company LLC.( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Allen-Bradley Company.( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rockwell Software Inc.( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC.( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rockwell Automation Inc.( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laurence F Pulgram for Silver Spring Networks Inc and Greenbox Technology Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5210 (ch, ) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Douglas Schumann on behalf of Greenbox Technology Inc (Schumann, David) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Douglas Schumann on behalf of Silver Spring Networks Inc (Schumann, David) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Greenbox Technology Inc.( Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Silver Spring Networks Inc.( Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Greenbox Technology Inc (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Silver Spring Networks Inc (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (filing on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company) re General Electric Company.( Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Johnson Controls Inc.(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Authorized Installers Network, LLC, D/B/A/ GE Home Technologies served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR on GE Home Technologies c/o Stanley Matysiak, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Authorized Integrators Network, LLC, D/B/A/ GE Home Technologies, D/B/A AIN Group, D/B/A Authorized Integrators Network, and D/B/A AIN served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR on Stanley Matysiak, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Greenbox Technology Inc served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR on Incorporating Services Ltd, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Silver Spring Networks, Inc. served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR on Incorporating Services Ltd, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Allen-Bradley Technical Services, Inc. served on 1/29/2010 by CM RRR on CT Corporation System, answer due 2/19/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Allen-Bradley Company, Inc. served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR on The Corporation Trust Co, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Allen-Bradley Company, LLC served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR on The Corporation Trust Co, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Allen-Bradley Company served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR on The Corporation Trust Co, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Rockwell Software, Inc. served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR on The Corporation Trust Company, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR on The Corporation Trust Company, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Rockwell Automation Inc. served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR to The Corporation Trust Company, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. Johnson Controls, Inc. served on 1/29/2010 by CM RRR c/o Jerome D Okarma, answer due 2/19/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. General Electric Company served on 2/1/2010 by CM RRR on The Corporation Trust Center, answer due 2/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMS Technologies, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent TechDev Holdings, LLC for EMS Technologies, LLC.. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Allen-Bradley Company, (Attachments: # 1 Allen-Bradley Company Inc, # 2 Allen-Bradley Company LLC, # 3 Allen-Bradley Technical Services Inc, # 4 Authorized Installers Network LLC, # 5 Authorized Integrators Network LLC, # 6 General Electric Company, # 7 Greenbox Technology Inc, # 8 Johnson Controls Inc, # 9 Rockwell Automation Inc, # 10 Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC, # 11 Rockwell Software Inc, # 12 Silver Spring Networks Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Authorized Installers Network, LLC, D/B/A/ GE Home Technologies, Authorized Integrators Network, LLC, D/B/A/ GE Home Technologies, D/B/A AIN Group, D/B/A Authorized Integrators Network, and D/B/A AIN. (Attachments: # 1 Authorized Integrators Network)(ehs, ) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to EMS Technologies, LLC. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Allen-Bradley Company, Allen-Bradley Company, Inc., Allen-Bradley Technical Services, Inc., Greenbox Technology Inc, General Electric Company, Authorized Installers Network, LLC, D/B/A/ GE Home Technologies, Authorized Integrators Network, LLC, D/B/A/ GE Home Technologies, D/B/A AIN Group, D/B/A Authorized Integrators Network, and D/B/A AIN. (Attachments: # 1 Allen-Bradley Technical Services Inc, # 2 General Electric Company (GE), # 3 Greenbox Technology Inc. (GreenBox), # 4 Intergrators Network, LLC, # 5 Network LLC, # 6 Allen-Bradley Company Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Rockwell Automation Inc., Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC, Rockwell Software, Inc., Allen-Bradley Company, LLC, Silver Spring Networks, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Johnson Controls, # 2 Rockwell Automation Inc, # 3 Rockwell Automation International, # 4 Rockwell Software, # 5 Silver Spring Networks Inc)(ehs, ) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Rockwell Automation Inc., Rockwell Automation International Holdings LLC, Rockwell Software, Inc., Allen-Bradley Company, Allen-Bradley Company, LLC, Allen-Bradley Company, Inc., Allen-Bradley Technical Services, Inc., Silver Spring Networks, Inc., Greenbox Technology Inc, General Electric Company, Authorized Installers Network, LLC, D/B/A/ GE Home Technologies, Authorized Integrators Network, LLC, D/B/A/ GE Home Technologies, D/B/A AIN Group, D/B/A Authorized Integrators Network, and D/B/A AIN, Johnson Controls, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002330387.), filed by EMS Technologies, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 253 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?