IP Navigation Group, LLC et al v. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00556-DF-CE
District Judge David Folsom, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 5:59 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bright Response, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Clean With Computers LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Cushion Technologies, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo EMS Technologies, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Gemini IP, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Granicus IP LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo IP Navigation Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens, Love, Hill & Holt, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Phillip Love +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 greg@stevenslove.com
No Logo Lsc Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Manufacturing Systems Technologies, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo NXN Tech, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo SFA Systems, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Specialist Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo St Sales Tech Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Techdev Holdings LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo TS Media Tech IP, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo TT IP, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
Cisco Systems, Inc. Cisco Systems, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Lumera Corp
Unknown Role, Control4 Corp
Unknown Role, Mavenir Systems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mulesource, Inc.
Unknown Role, Aquantia Corp
Unknown Role, Active Voice Corp
Unknown Role, Starent Networks Corp

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Office Marshall
Filed 12/13/2010
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Dallas
Terminated 5/24/2011
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER; The Unopposed Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. All claims asserted by Plaintiffs against Defendant are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/24/11. (mrm, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/24/2011 Motion to Dismiss
    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Bright Response LLC, Clean With Computers LLC, Cushion Technologies LLC, EMS Technologies LLC, Gemini IP LLC, Granicus IP LLC, IP Navigation Group LLC, LSC Holdings LLC, Manufacturing Systems Technologies LLC, SFA Systems LLC, ST Sales Tech Holdings LLC, Specialist Technologies LLC, TS Media Tech IP LLC, TT IP LLC, Techdev Holdings LLC, nXn Tech LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [17] Motion for Extension of Time to File response to Motion to Dismiss is extended to 5/27/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/10/2011. (ch, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/10/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by IP Navigation Group LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
          ORDER granting [12] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on April 26, 2011. (jml)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/24/2011 Sealed Motion +
            SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint (Corrected) by Cisco Systems Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: [15] SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-1, # (2) Exhibit A-2, # (3) Exhibit A-3, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G)(Davis, Thomas) Modified on 4/26/2011 (ehs, ).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/26/2011 Sealed Motion +
                ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #[15]*** SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Cisco Systems Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick) Modified on 4/26/2011 (ehs, ).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/26/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Cisco Systems Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cisco Systems, Inc. has until and through April 25, 2011, to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/13/11. (ehs, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/13/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cisco Systems Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Cisco Systems Inc. deadline is extended to 4/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/14/2011. (ch, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/14/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cisco Systems Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Cisco Systems Inc deadline is extended to 3/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/30/2011. (ch, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/31/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cisco Systems Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by nXn Tech LLC, Bright Response LLC, Gemini IP LLC, IP Navigation Group LLC, TS Media Tech IP LLC, LSC Holdings LLC, Manufacturing Systems Technologies LLC, Granicus IP LLC, EMS Technologies LLC, ST Sales Tech Holdings LLC, Cushion Technologies LLC, TT IP LLC, Specialist Technologies LLC, Techdev Holdings LLC, SFA Systems LLC, Clean With Computers LLC. Cisco Systems Inc served on 12/20/2010 by CM RRR c/o Corporation Service Co, answer due 2/10/2011. (ehs, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cisco Systems, Inc.(Rambo, Rick)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of IP Navigation Group, LLC (Love, Gregory)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Cisco Systems, Inc.. (ehs, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against Cisco Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2799453.), filed by nXn Tech, LLC, Bright Response, LLC, Gemini IP, LLC, IP Navigation Group, LLC, TS Media Tech IP, LLC, LSC Holdings, LLC, Manufacturing Systems Technologies, LLC, Granicus IP, LLC, EMS Technologies, LLC., ST Sales Tech Holdings LLC, Cushion Technologies, LLC., TT IP, LLC, Specialist Technologies, LLC, TechDev Holdings, LLC, SFA Systems, LLC, Clear With Computers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2010: # (2) Civil Cover Sheet (Signed)) (ch, ).
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 703 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?