Gemini IP, LLC v. Computer Sciences Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-00036
District Judge Richard A. Schell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Computer Sciences Corporation Computer Sciences Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryant Carroll Boren, Jr. +1 650 739 7501 +1 650 739 7601 bryant.c.boren@bakerbotts.com
No Logo Fidelity Information Services, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
No Logo Fiserv Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris Manning & Martin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Guy Harrison +1 404 233 7000 +1 404 365 9532 bharrison@mmmlaw.com
No Logo Grouplink Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413

Toggle Switch Represented by Trask, Britt & Rosa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H Dickson Burton +1 801 532 1922 hdburton@traskbritt.com
Ingersoll-Rand Company Ingersoll-Rand Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Loeb & Loeb LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Laura Ann Wytsma +1 310 282 2000 +1 310 282 2200 lwytsma@loeb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Livetime Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
Novell, Inc. Novell, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com
Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Zappos.com, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Eric Hopenfeld +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 james.hopenfeld@ropesgray.com
No Logo Gemini IP, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Agility IP Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xiang Long +1 650 227 4800 longxiang@agilityiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theresa Elise Norton +1 650 227 4800 +1 650 318 3483 tess@agilityiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xiang Long +1 650 227 4800 longxiang@agilityiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theresa Elise Norton +1 650 227 4800 +1 650 318 3483 tess@agilityiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica Mucchetti +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 mmucchetti@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Carl Otteson +1 408 291 2750 +1 650 318 3483 jim@agilityiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica Mucchetti +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 mmucchetti@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Carl Otteson +1 408 291 2750 +1 650 318 3483 jim@agilityiplaw.com
No Logo Connectwise, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dominic Kouffman +1 813 227 6553 +1 813 229 0134 dominic.kouffman@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo NTR North America LLC, Consol Defendant
Sony Electronics, Inc. Sony Electronics, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Nese +1 202 220 4256 +1 202 220 4201 bnese@kenyon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis V. Popovski +1 212 908 6078 +1 212 425 5288 LPopovski@kenyon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T Cy Walker +1 202 220 4200 +1 202 220 4201 cwalker@kenyon.com

Represented by Ramey and Flock

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

No Logo Venti Solutions, LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Hanes
No Logo Live Person, Inc., Consol Counter Claimant

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (202) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Novell, Inc. (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Germer, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Novell, Inc. (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE by Novell, Inc. (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Black, Seth) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 167 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Certain Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 164 Motion to Dismiss Xerox Corporation Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 118 Stipulation of Dismissal. ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 169 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Against Novell Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 169 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant, Novell, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled PATENT IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and dated November 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 157 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Michael Pridham terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 173 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant, LiveTime Software, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled PATENT IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and dated November 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 170 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Gemini IP, LLC, and defendant, GroupLink Corporation are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled PATENT IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and dated November 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 160 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP, LLC, ConnectWise, Inc. and ConnectWise, Inc. terminated.All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Gemini IP, LLC, and defendant, ConnectWise, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled, PATENT IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and dated August 16, 2011. ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER finding as moot 110 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement; finding as moot 136 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint; granting 172 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Venti Solutions, LLC are hereby dismissed Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 115 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP, LLC, Sony Electronics Inc terminated. Defendant Sony Electronics, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled, PATENT IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and dated July 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 114 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company and Ingersoll-Rand Company terminated. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Gemini IP, LLC, and defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company are hereby dismissed without prejudice. It is ORDERED that this court retains jurisdiction over this matter for purposes of enforcingthe settlement. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 174 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC and Defendants GFI Software Ltd. and GFI Software Development, Ltd. are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 141 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Gemini IP, LLC, and defendant, LivePerson, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled PATENT IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and dated August 23, 2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 161 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 166 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ellen M Padilla terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 165 Joint Motion for Extension of Certain Discovery Deadlines as between Gemini and the Settling Defendants. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 146 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Monica Mucchetti Eno terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Novell, Inc. to file its response to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is extended from August 15, 2011 to August 17, 2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 134 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The date for LivePerson to serve a response to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint up to and including September 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 123 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/30/12. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Defendants GFI Software Ltd. and GFI Software Development, Ltd. Without Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant LiveTime Software, Inc. With Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Venti Solutions, LLC Without Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE by Gemini IP, LLC of Dismissal of Defendant Venti Solutions, LLC Without Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 12/27/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant GroupLink Corporation With Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Novell, Inc. With Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Certain Discovery Deadlines as Between Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC and Defendants Novell, Inc., Livetime Software, Inc. and Grouplink Corp. (FOURTH) by Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Seth) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Certain Deadlines as Between Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC and Defendants Novell, Inc., Livetime Software, Inc. and Grouplink Corp. (Third) by Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Seth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/7/2011) (cm, ). (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Ellen M. Padilla) by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Joint MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF CERTAIN DISCOVERY DEADLINES AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF GEMINI IP, LLC AND DEFENDANTS NOVELL, INC., LIVETIME SOFTWARE, INC. AND GROUPLINK CORP. (Second) by LiveTime Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Xerox Corporation Without Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Caine, David) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                PLAINTIFF GEMINI IP, LLCS ANSWER TO GROUPLINK COPORATION'S COUNTERCLAIMS ANSWER to 154 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Certain Deadlines as Between Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC and Defendants Novell, Inc., Livetime Software, Inc. and Grouplink Corp. by LiveTime Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE by Grouplink Corporation of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Burton, H) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE by LiveTime Software, Inc. of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pridham, David) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 136 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                PLAINTIFF GEMINI IP, LLC'S ANSWER to 143 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant LiveTime by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  GroupLink's ANSWER to 120 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Grouplink Corporation.(Burton, H) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Grouplink Corporation (Burton, H) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 136 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Venti Solutions, LLC. (Hanes, Richard) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC's ANSWER to 137 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Novell by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          (Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC's Answer to Defendant Zerox's Counterclaims) ANSWER to 133 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, 5 Amended Complaint, ANSWER to 133 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, 5 Amended Complaint by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Additional Attachments to Main Document: 147 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norton, Theresa) Modified on 9/7/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document: 147 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 136 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF GEMINI IP LLCS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT VENTI SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Theresa E. Norton In Support Plaintiff Gemini IP LLC's Opposition to Defendant Venti Solutions, LLC's Motion to Dismiss)(Norton, Theresa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ). (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL)(Eno, Monica) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney H Dickson Burton for Grouplink Corporation. Fee paid. (pad, ) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LiveTime Software, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for LiveTime Software, Inc.. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 120 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by LiveTime Software, Inc..(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Gemini IP, LLC, Grouplink Corporation, LiveTime Software, Inc., Novell, Inc., Venti Solutions, LLC, Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant LivePerson, Inc. With Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Gemini IP, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Grouplink Corporation (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint re Grouplink Corporation.(Findlay, Eric). (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 120 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP LLC, Gemini IP, LLC by Novell, Inc..(Black, Seth) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Venti Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanes, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/17/2011) (cm, ). (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 120 Amended Complaint, by Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Seth) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 120 Amended Complaint, by LivePerson, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 120 Amended Complaint, (Second Amended), COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Xerox Corporation.(Moore, Steven) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Grouplink Corporation on 8/1/2011, answer due: 8/22/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to LiveTime Software, Inc. on 8/1/2011, answer due: 8/22/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Ingersoll-Rand Company of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices on behalf of Laura Wytsma (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - Certain Discovery Deadlines by Gemini IP, LLC, Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven D Moore on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Moore, Steven) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Fiserv, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Harrison, Bryan) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 100 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP, LLC. It is ORDERED that all claims in this case between plaintiff, Gemini IP, LLC, and defendant Fiserv, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 8/3/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Certain Discovery Deadlines) by Gemini IP LLC, Gemini IP, LLC, Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Seth) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LiveTime Software, Inc.. (pad, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Grouplink Corporation. (pad, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Grouplink Corporation, LiveTime Software, Inc., Novell, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ConnectWise, Inc., LivePerson, Inc., Venti Solutions, LLC, filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B)(Otteson, James) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT(replaces documents 116 & 117) against ConnectWise, Inc., Grouplink Corporation, LivePerson, Inc., LiveTime Software, Inc., Novell, Inc., Venti Solutions, LLC, Xerox Corporation, filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Otteson, James) Modified on 7/29/2011 (pad, ). (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE)(Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ***DISREGARD ERROR IN DOCUMENT. ATTORNEY TO REFILE***AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT (REPLACES DOCUMENT 116) against ConnectWise, Inc., Novell, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Venti Solutions, LLC, Xerox Corporation, Grouplink Corporation, LiveTime Software, Inc., filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Otteson, James) Modified on 7/28/2011 (lhj, ). (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ***DISREGARD ERROR IN DOCUMENT ATTORNEY TO REFILE***AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Computer Sciences Corporation, Fidelity Information Services, Inc., Fiserv, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Novell, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Xerox Corporation, Zappos.com, Inc., filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Otteson, James) Modified on 7/28/2011 (lhj, ). (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice)(Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company Without Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ***SUR-REPLY TO REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (DOCUMENT NUMBER 254 ) FILED IN CONSOLIDATED CASE 4:07CV521 - FILED IN THIS CASE PURSUANT TO ORDER 375 ENTERED IN CONSOLIDATED CASE 4:07CV521***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 110 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gemini IP LLC. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ***REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION (DOCUMENT NUMBER 241 ) FILED IN CONSOLIDATED CASE 4:07CV521 - FILED IN THIS CASE PURSUANT TO ORDER 375 ENTERED IN CONSOLIDATED CASE 4:07CV521***REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Venti Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Tony Delollis)(baf, ) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ***RESPONSE TO MOTION (DOCUMENT NUMBER 216 ) FILED IN CONSOLIDATED CASE 4:07CV521 - FILED IN THIS CASE PURSUANT TO ORDER 375 ENTERED IN CONSOLIDATED CASE 4:07CV521***RESPONSE to Motion re 110 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Xiang Long Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O)(baf, ) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ***MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCUMENT NUMBER 203 ) FILED IN CONSOLIDATED CASE 4:07CV521 - FILED IN THIS CASE PURSUANT TO ORDER 375 ENTERED IN CONSOLIDATED CASE 4:07CV521*** MOTION to Dismiss by Venti Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Verification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(baf, ) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Computer Sciences Corporation (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Kubehl, Douglas) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery -- Joint Motion For Extension Of Certain Discovery Deadlines As Between Gemini IP, LLC and Liveperson, Inc. by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Zappos.com, Inc. Request for Termination of Electonic Notices (Siegel, Todd) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:( Mediation Completion due by 3/2/2012.), (Markman Hearing set for 1/19/2012 01:30 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell., Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2011 01:30 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell.) Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2012 01:30 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell. Amended Pleadings due by 9/26/2011. Discovery due by 5/25/2012. Expert Witness List due from Plaintiff by 3/30/2012 and Defendant by 4/27/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2011. Motions due by 6/5/2012. Motions in Limine due by 8/3/2012. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/23/2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 94 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP, LLC, Fidelity Information Services, Inc. and Fidelity Information Services, Inc. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Gemini IP, LLC, and defendant Fidelity Information Services, Inc., are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. re 88 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gemini IP, LLC, Zappos.com, Inc. and Zappos.com, Inc. all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Gemini IP, LLC, and defendant Zappos.com, Inc., are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 97 Motion to Dismiss. The above-entitled cause and all claimsagainst CSC by Gemini and against Gemini by CSC herein are dismissed, with prejudice to the re-filing of same, except all claims of patent invalidity by CSC against Gemini shall be dismissed without prejudice to the re-filing of same. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the Motion to Extend Time be granted and that Ingersoll Rand be given to and including June 29, 2011 to serve its Initial Disclosures, and respond, object or otherwise answer any pending discovery. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Having considered the matter, the Court GRANTS the motion [de #89] and extends the date for CSC to serve its Initial Disclosures to June 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/18/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Fiserv, Inc. Without Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER)(Norton, Theresa) Modified on 7/15/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Xerox Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Computer Sciences Corporation, Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED [Proposed] Scheduling Order [Patent Case] by Gemini IP, LLC. (Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Serve Initial Disclosures and Respond, Object or Otherwise Answer Any Pending Discovery by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Fidelity Information Services, Inc. Without Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***PLEASE DISREGARD - NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION ENTERED - ATTORNEY TO REFILE***STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Fidelity Information Services, Inc. Without Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 6/17/2011 (baf, ). (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Novell, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Black, Seth) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Gemini IP, LLC Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLC's Notice of Rule 26(a)(1) Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Symantec Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Computer Sciences Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Zappos.com, Inc. Without Prejudice by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** Submission of by Gemini IP, LLC [Proposed] Scheduling Order (Patent Case). (Norton, Theresa) Modified on 6/24/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Novell, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Attachmate Group, Inc. for Novell, Inc., Novell, Inc.. (Black, Seth) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Schell: Scheduling Conference held on 6/1/2011. (Court Reporter Jerry Kelley.) (baf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Settlement by Fidelity Information Services, Inc., Zappos.com, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Gemini IP, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company, Zappos.com, Inc. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING FISERV, INC.S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ALLOW COUNSEL TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TELEPHONICALLY 77 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 5/17/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jordan A Sigale for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (pad, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura Ann Wytsma for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (fee paid) (cm, ) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear at Case Management Conference Telephonically by Fiserv, Inc.. (Harrison, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ). (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David R Wright for Novell, Inc.. (fee paid) (cm, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Seth W Black for Novell, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sterling A Brennan for Novell, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James E Hopenfeld on behalf of Fidelity Information Services, Inc. (Hopenfeld, James) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James E Hopenfeld for Zappos.com, Inc.. (cm, ) (Main Document 72 replaced on 5/5/2011) (cm, ). (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE, ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/23/2011., Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2011 01:30 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell). Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/27/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLCs ANSWER to 59 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant Computer Sciences Corporation's Counterclaims by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLCs ANSWER to 53 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Defendant Novell's Counterclaims by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLCs ANSWER to 55 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant Symantec's Counterclaims by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Gemini IP, LLC PLAINTIFF GEMINI IP, LLC'S NOTICE OF READINESS TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE (Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLCs ANSWER to 50 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim to Defendant Zappos' Counterclaims by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLCs ANSWER to 39 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim to Defendant Xerox's Counterclaims by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLCs ANSWER to 51 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim to Defendant Ingersoll-Rand's Counterclaims by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLCs ANSWER to 44 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim to Defendant Fiserv, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff Gemini IP, LLCs ANSWER to 36 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim to Defendant FidelityS Counterclaims by Gemini IP, LLC.(Otteson, James) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Symantec Corporation on 2/8/2011, answer due: 3/1/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Louis Germer on behalf of Novell, Inc. (Germer, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Computer Sciences Corporation's ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Computer Sciences Corporation.(Boren, Bryant) Modified on 4/8/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Computer Sciences Corporation (Boren, Bryant) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell Jon Crain on behalf of Computer Sciences Corporation (Crain, Russell) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Symantec Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Symantec Corporation. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint, (First Amended), COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Symantec Corporation.(Craft, Roger) Modified on 4/8/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Novell, Inc. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint 5 Complaint, :Defendant Novell, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Novell, Inc..(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 4/7/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 5 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond. Symantec Corporation is given to and including April 7, 2011 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/6/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 5 Complaint, (First Amended), COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 5 Complaint, (First Amended), COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Zappos.com, Inc..(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ellen M Padilla on behalf of Symantec Corporation (Padilla, Ellen) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Nelson on behalf of Symantec Corporation (Nelson, David) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand plc for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** RESPONSE to 5 Amended Complaint and Counterclaim by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Findlay, Eric) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fiserv, Inc. (Harrison, Bryan) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 5 (First Amended), COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Fiserv, Inc..(Harrison, Bryan) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/7/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 5 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zappos.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc., for Zappos.com, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** RESPONSE to 5 Amended Complaint and Counterclaim by Zappos.com, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xerox Corporation (Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint As Amended, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Xerox Corporation.(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Novell, Inc.(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fidelity Information Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. for Fidelity Information Services, Inc.. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 5 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemini IP, LLC by Fidelity Information Services, Inc..(Gardner, Allen) Modified on 4/1/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Fiserv, Inc. on 2/8/2011, answer due: 3/1/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Zappos.com, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Computer Sciences Corporation.( Kubehl, Douglas) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Computer Sciences Corporation on 2/10/2011, answer due: 3/3/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Fidelity Information Services, Inc. on 2/11/2011, answer due: 3/4/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Ingersoll-Rand Company on 2/11/2011, answer due: 3/4/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Zappos.com, Inc. on 2/10/2011, answer due: 3/3/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Xerox Corporation on 2/9/2011, answer due: 3/2/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Symantec Corporation on 2/10/2011, answer due: 3/3/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Novell, Inc. on 2/15/2011, answer due: 3/8/2011. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fiserv, Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd M Siegel on behalf of Zappos.com, Inc. (Siegel, Todd) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Zappos.com, Inc..( Siegel, Todd) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Computer Sciences Corporation.( Kubehl, Douglas) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including March 31, 2011 re Fidelity Information Services, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant Xerox Corporation's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise respond to the Complaint.(Phipps, Charles) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Novell, Inc..( Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Caine on behalf of Gemini IP, LLC (Caine, David) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Symantec Corporation.(Findlay, Eric). (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Zappos.com, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Xerox Corporation. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Symantec Corporation. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Novell, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Ingersoll-Rand Company. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Fiserv, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Fidelity Information Services, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Computer Sciences Corporation. (cm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gemini IP, LLC identifying Other Affiliate TechDev Holdings, LLC for Gemini IP, LLC. (Otteson, James) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Gemini IP, LLC, filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Otteson, James) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Xiang Long on behalf of Gemini IP, LLC (Long, Xiang) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theresa Elise Norton on behalf of Gemini IP, LLC (Norton, Theresa) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Otteson on behalf of Gemini IP, LLC (Otteson, James) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Computer Sciences Corporation, Fidelity Information Services, Inc., Fiserv, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Novell, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Xerox Corporation, Zappos.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2857573.), filed by Gemini IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A U.S. Patent No. 6,177,932, # 2 Exhibit B Reexamination Certificate, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 373 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?