Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Lexmark International, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:11-cv-00495
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 10:51 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Belkin International, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo BMW North America, LLC, Counter-Claimant
Dish Network Corporation Dish Network Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.
No Logo Garmin International, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Garmin USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "General Motors LLC"
Officer/Director, General Motors Co
Officer/Director, Panamsat Corp
Officer/Director, Lennox International Inc.
No Logo Lexmark International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net
No Logo Novatel Wireless, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Ricoh Americas Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Viewsonic Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Vizio, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Counter-Claimant
ZTE USA, Inc. ZTE USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant
ZTE Solutions, Inc. ZTE Solutions, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Belkin International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter John Chassman +1 713 787 1623 +1 713 787 1440 chassmanp@howrey.com
No Logo BMW North America, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph P. Lavelle +1 202 783 0800 +1 202 383 6610 lavellej@howrey.com
No Logo Brother International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo D-link Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Daimler North America Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Richard DeFosse +1 202 508 8000 +1 202 661 7374 jonathan.defosse@shearman.com
Space Scott W Doyle +1 202 508 8000 +1 202 508 8100 scott.doyle@shearman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Augustine Phillips +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 larryphillips@siebman.com
Space Clyde Moody Siebman +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 siebman@siebman.com
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Officer/Director, Oec Medical Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genpact Ltd.
Officer/Director, Gei, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sportstech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Superior Essex Inc.
Officer/Director, Genworth Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenwater Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, Genicom Corp
Officer/Director, Imatron Inc.
Officer/Director, Paine Webber Group Inc
Officer/Director, Regal Beloit Corp
Officer/Director, Lockheed Martin Corp
Officer/Director, Lunar Corp
Officer/Director, Mecon Inc
Officer/Director, Positron Corp
Officer/Director, GE India Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, Heller Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Regency Energy Partners LP
Officer/Director, Regency LP Acquirer, L.P.
Officer/Director, Aircraft Services CORP
Officer/Director, Townsquare Media, LLC
Officer/Director, Antares Capital Corp
Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc. Officer/Director, Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bear Newco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Officer/Director, Greenwich Air Services Inc
Officer/Director, Marquette Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xoom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Plug Power, Inc.
Officer/Director, Harmon Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Thermoview Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hpsc, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ionics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Idx Systems Corp
Officer/Director, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr. +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 wlackey@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Motors Company"
Officer/Director, General Motors Co
Officer/Director, Panamsat Corp
Officer/Director, Lennox International Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Jvc Americas Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

No Logo Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Warriner +1 512 482 6800 +1 512 482 6859 jim.warriner@klgates.com
No Logo Novatel Wireless Technology, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Warriner +1 512 482 6800 +1 512 482 6859 jim.warriner@klgates.com
No Logo Novatel Wireless, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Warriner +1 512 482 6800 +1 512 482 6859 jim.warriner@klgates.com
No Logo Ricoh Americas Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

No Logo Tomtom Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian H Pandya +1 202 719 7457 +1 202 719 7049 bpandya@wileyrein.com
No Logo Viewsonic Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ya-Chiao Chang +88 627 712 3233 +88 622 704 6791 ychang@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Robert Adamo +1 312 862 2671 +1 312 862 2200 kradamo@kirkland.com
No Logo Vizio, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Defendant

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Xerox Corporation Xerox Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., ThirdParty Defendant
Officer/Director, Spansion Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd Investments, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd (u.s.) Holdings, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Coghlan Crowson et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rickey Lawrence Faulkner +1 903 758 5543 +1 903 753 6989 rfaulkner@ccfww.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reeves & Brightwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kim Brightwell +1 512 334 4500 +1 512 334 4492 kbrightwell@reevesbrightwell.com
Space Ryan Pierce +1 512 334 4503 +1 512 334 4492 rpierce@reevesbrightwell.com
Broadcom Corporation Broadcom Corporation, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kell Corrigan Mercer +1 512 472 5456 +1 512 479 1101 kell.mercer@huschblackwell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth M Banzhoff +1 303 291 2300 +1 303 291 2400 ebanzhoff@perkinscoie.com
Space Amanda J. Tessar +1 303 344 1122 +1 303 291 2487 atessar@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., ThirdParty Defendant
No Logo Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordan L. Hirsch +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 jordan.hirsch@wilmerhale.com
Qualcomm, Inc. Qualcomm, Inc., ThirdParty Defendant
Officially listed as "Qualcomm Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Andrew Dyson +1 713 651 5391 +1 713 651 5246 paul.dyson@nortonrosefulbright.com
Space Sheila Kadura +1 512 536 3027 +1 512 536 4598 sheila.kadura@nortonrosefulbright.com
Space Richard Stephen Zembek +1 713 651 5283 +1 713 651 5246 rzembek@fulbright.com
No Logo RPX Corporation, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Alan Keeling +1 713 651 2687 +1 713 651 2700 kevin@keelingonline.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aldo A. Badini +1 212 294 4601 +1 212 294 4700 abadini@winston.com
Space Diana L. Hughes +1 415 591 6904 +1 415 591 1400 dhughes@winston.com
Space John R Keville +1 713 651 2600 +1 713 651 2700 jkeville@winston.com
Space Ian L Papendick +1 415 591 6905 +1 415 591 1400 ipapendick@winston.com
Space Susannah P. Torpey +1 212 294 4690 +1 212 294 4700 STorpey@winston.com
No Logo Stmicroelectronics, Inc., ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephanie Rene' Barnes +1 214 387 9100 +1 214 387 9125 stephaniebarnes@siebman.com
No Logo D-link Systems, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 dgunter@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF S. J. CHRISTINE YANG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victoria Der-Lung Hao , +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 vhao@sjclawpc.com
Space Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by S J Christine Yang Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duncan Palmatier +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 dpalm@dpalmlaw.com
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Consol Defendant
Officer/Director, Oec Medical Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genpact Ltd.
Officer/Director, Gei, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sportstech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Superior Essex Inc.
Officer/Director, Genworth Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenwater Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, Genicom Corp
Officer/Director, Imatron Inc.
Officer/Director, Paine Webber Group Inc
Officer/Director, Regal Beloit Corp
Officer/Director, Lockheed Martin Corp
Officer/Director, Lunar Corp
Officer/Director, Mecon Inc
Officer/Director, Positron Corp
Officer/Director, GE India Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, Heller Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Regency Energy Partners LP
Officer/Director, Regency LP Acquirer, L.P.
Officer/Director, Aircraft Services CORP
Officer/Director, Townsquare Media, LLC
Officer/Director, Antares Capital Corp
Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc. Officer/Director, Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bear Newco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Officer/Director, Greenwich Air Services Inc
Officer/Director, Marquette Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xoom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Plug Power, Inc.
Officer/Director, Harmon Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Thermoview Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hpsc, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ionics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Idx Systems Corp
Officer/Director, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutton McAughan Deaver PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A Andrews +1 713 800 5700 +1 713 800 5699 jandrews@smd-iplaw.com
Space Robert James McAughan, Jr. +1 713 800 5700 +1 713 800 5699 bmcaughan@smd-iplaw.com
Space Craig Evan Walter +1 713 800 5706 +1 713 800 5699 cwalter@smd-iplaw.com
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "General Motors LLC"
Officer/Director, General Motors Co
Officer/Director, Panamsat Corp
Officer/Director, Lennox International Inc.
No Logo Jvc Americas Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cedric Lloyd Allen +1 214 922 3400 +1 214 922 3899 cedric.allen@alston.com
Space Yitai Hu +1 650 838 2000 +1 650 838 2001 yitai.hu@alston.com
Space Michael J Newton +1 214 922 3400 +1 214 922 3899 mike.newton@alston.com
Space Elizabeth Hannah Rader +1 650 838 2008 +1 650 838 2001 elizabeth.rader@alston.com
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Consol Defendant
No Logo Tomtom Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrienne Gail Johnson +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 ajohnson@wileyrein.com
Space Paul M Kim +1 202 719 7413 +1 202 719 7049 pkim@wileyrein.com
Space James H. Wallace, Jr. +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7207 jwallace@wileyrein.com
No Logo David Keyzer, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by 5170 Golden Foothill Parkway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Keyzer +1 916 243 5259 +1 916 404 0436 david@keyzerlaw.com
No Logo Richard Egan, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Keefe, Egan & Peterman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D Egan +1 512 347 1611 +1 512 347 1615 regan@oepelaw.com
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, ThirdParty Plaintiff
Officially listed as "General Motors, LLC"
Officer/Director, General Motors Co
Officer/Director, Panamsat Corp
Officer/Director, Lennox International Inc.
No Logo GM Components Holdings, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff
No Logo James Knowles, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Knowles Mediations

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W Knowles +1 903 534 3800 +1 903 534 3806 jimk@knowlesmed.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (789) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 761 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Paul Harper terminated as counsel for ZTE and ECF notifications are to be terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/2/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Harper, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 07/02/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
          ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ZTE (USA) Inc.(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv525), ZTE Solutions Inc.(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv525). (Miller, Anthony) Modified on 7/2/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/26/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. The Court ORDERS Defendants ZTE, ViewSonic, Dish, and Ricoh to each pay Technical Advisor David Keyzer $914.34 by 7-14-2014. If Defendants have not paid as ordered by 7-14-2014, the Court ORDERS any non-paying party to attend a show cause hearing on 7-21-2014 at 1:30 p.m., to explain its failure to comply with a Court Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 755 Motion to Stay Deadlines. The Court ORDERS Norman and Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC to submit closing documents by 5-14-2014. Should closing documents not be filed by 5-14-2014, the Court ORDERS that by 5-15-2014 parties file a Joint Affidavit from Defendant's Corporate Representatives and Plaintiff explaining why settlement has not been finalized, and why closing documents have not been filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/12/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 746 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. All claims and counter claims by and between Volkswagen and third-party defendants Advanced Micro Devices and RPX Corporation are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/22/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER denying as moot 706 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/22/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 751 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that all proceedings, including deadlines and related motions, as between Norman and MBUSA are STAYED up to and including Wednesday, April 30, 2014. All other deadlines as to other defendants in related cases remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/22/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                            Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines between Plaintiff and Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 745 Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing Volkswagen Group of America Inc as a party to this civil action; denying as moot 663 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counter claims by and between Norman and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc in this action are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/31/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER adopting 705 Report & Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge; granting in part and denying in part 659 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/31/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER adopting 741 Report & Recommendations; granting 683 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 684 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 685 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER denying as moot 660 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO Advanced Micro Devices Inc and RPX Corporation by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                          OBJECTION to 741 Report and Recommendations by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by ViewSonic Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Wells, Richard) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 740 Motion to Stay all deadlines pending between Norman IP Holdings, LLC and Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for 45 days. Proposed Orders of dismissal shall be submitted by 4/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/5/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 683 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s First Amended Third-Party Complaint filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., recommending the motion be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/28/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/26/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Compliance by Norman IP Holdings, LLC re 736 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 734 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for ZTE Defendants. Everett Upshaw and the Law Office of Everett Upshaw, PLLC are withdrawn as counsel for ZTE and ECF notifications to the same are to be terminated in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/18/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 732 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/18/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 733 Motion for Protective Order and entering First Amended Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/18/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and to Terminate ECF Notifications by ZTE (USA) Inc.(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv525). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Upshaw, Everett) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 First Amended Protective Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 730 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Xerox Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant Xerox Corporation by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        OBJECTION to 727 Report and Recommendations by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE to 719 Notice (Other) Sur-Reply to AMD's Notice of Recent Authority filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 663 MOTION to Dismiss NORMAN'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DKT. 657) filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., be granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/21/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting in part 724 Motion for Leave to File Reply Response. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc is GRANTED leave to file a Sur-Reply to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.'s Reply 725 , if necessary, by 12-02-2013, but shall not thereafter file any additional briefing with regard to Doc. No. 719 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/13/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE to 721 Response to Non-Motion Reply to Volkswagen's Response to Notice of Recent Authority in Support of AMD's Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Volkswagen's Response to Notice of Recent Authority in Support of AMD's Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 720 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/08/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 706 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE to 719 Notice (Other) AMD's Notice of Recent Authority in Support of Its Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to AMD's Notice of Recent Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss (dkt # 719) by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. of Recent Authority in Support of AMD's Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss (Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 716 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Deron R Dacus terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/29/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 706 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 712 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting in part and denying in part 713 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting in part and denying in part 714 Motion to Amend/Correct. Defendants are ordered to coordinate on common topics to avoid duplicative or gratuitously repetitive questions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/25/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 272 Order by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct 272 Order by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeFosse, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct 272 Order by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 706 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 708 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant DISH Network LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/18/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                OBJECTION to 705 Report and Recommendations by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Stipulation by Dish Network Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Markman Hearing held on September 19, 2013 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-590-1096. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (96 pages). Redaction Request due 10/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2014. (rem, ) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 659 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ZTE (USA) Inc., Dish Network Corporation, Xerox Corporation, DISH Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, be granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/30/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 684 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Amended Third-Party Action Against AMD filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 683 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s First Amended Third-Party Complaint filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Markman Hearing held on 9/19/2013. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Supplemental Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 685 Opposed MOTION to Stay and, Alternatively, For Scheduling Applicable to AMD filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 683 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s First Amended Third-Party Complaint filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 684 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Amended Third-Party Action Against AMD filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan Pierce)(Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 665 Report and Recommendations and granting 569 Motion to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/9/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 685 Opposed MOTION to Stay and, Alternatively, For Scheduling Applicable to AMD filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 685 Opposed MOTION to Stay and, Alternatively, For Scheduling Applicable to AMD filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 684 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Amended Third-Party Action Against AMD filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 683 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s First Amended Third-Party Complaint filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2013: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 690 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James W Coutu terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER adopting 654 Report and Recommendations; granting 494 Motion to Dismiss; granting 546 Motion to Dismiss; granting 548 Motion to Dismiss; granting 570 Motion to Dismiss; granting 583 Motion to Dismiss. All objections are overruled and the motion for reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/27/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - James W. Coutu by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 688 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendants ZTE (USA) Inc and ZTE Solutions Inc are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS ZTE (USA) INC. AND ZTE SOLUTIONS, INC. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 675 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 675 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Qualcomm Incorporated. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Stay and, Alternatively, For Scheduling Applicable to AMD by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Amended Third-Party Action Against AMD by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Chris Jacobs, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s First Amended Third-Party Complaint by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ryan Pierce, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 660 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 679 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 660 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Sur-Replies due by 8/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/07/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 659 MOTION to Dismiss the Sixth Amended Complaint filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 660 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 663 MOTION to Dismiss NORMAN'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DKT. 657) filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. of Change of Firm Name (Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT pursuant to dkt # 665 against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to 654 Report and Recommendations by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 660 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - Supplemental Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper filed by Dish Network Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, # 2 Exhibit N)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 660 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by Dish Network Corporation. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 659 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 663 MOTION to Dismiss NORMAN'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DKT. 657) filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 9, 2013 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill McFadden,Telephone number: 903-593-3213. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2013. (tlh, ) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 660 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 659 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 663 MOTION to Dismiss NORMAN'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DKT. 657) filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 9, 2013 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Toni Hudson,Telephone number: 361-949-2988. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/9/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2013. (tlh, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 569 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., be granted, and that Volkswagen be allowed to amend its complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 662 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Massimo Ciccarelli and Justin S. Cohen terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss NORMAN'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DKT. 657) by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ZTE (USA) Inc.(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv525), ZTE Solutions Inc.(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv525). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ciccarelli, Massimo) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 660 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Cooper, Monte) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 41(b), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) AND 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE by Dish Network Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Vivek Khemka, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2013 re 632 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of the July 1 Document Production Deadline filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., 576 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Xerox Corporations First Amended Complaint Against Broadcom filed by Broadcom Corporation, 546 MOTION to Dismiss filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc., 608 MOTION To Set A Case Schedule Subject To Motion To Dismiss filed by Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, 569 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., 548 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, 619 MOTION To Set A Case Schedule Subject To Motion To Dismiss by Qualcomm, Inc. filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, 494 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, 570 MOTION to Dismiss Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., 629 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by ZTE Solutions Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., Dish Network Corporation, Xerox Corporation, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., DISH Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, 583 MOTION to Dismiss Xerox Corporation's First Amended Third Party Complaint Against Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT (Sixth) against Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 USPAT5530597, # 2 Exhibit 2 USPAT5502689, # 3 Exhibit 3 USPAT5592555, # 4 Exhibit 4 USPAT5608873, # 5 Exhibit 5 USPAT5771394)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot 576 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by RPX Corporation for proceedings held on July 9, 2013 before Judge Hon. John D. Love.. (Hughes, Diana) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the following Motions be granted: 546 MOTION to Dismiss filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc., 548 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint filed by Qualcomm Incorporated, 494 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, 570 MOTION to Dismiss Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., 583 MOTION to Dismiss Xerox Corporation's First Amended Third Party Complaint Against Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. The related third party claims are dismissed without prejudice. All pending Third-Party Motions to Set a Case Schedule 608 and 619 are DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of termination of electronic notices by Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Novatel Wireless Technology, Inc., Novatel Wireless, Inc. (Warriner, James) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Dish Network Corporation for proceedings held on 7/9/2013 before Judge Love.. (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Vizio, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot 632 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part 629 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The document production deadline pursuant to discovery order is extended to 11-01-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for Motions hearing held on 7/9/2013 before Judge John Love. (tlh, ) (Main Document 647 replaced on 7/10/2013) (tlh, ). (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***AMENDED COMPLAINT (Sixth) against Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 7/11/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 636 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant VIZIO Inc are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All counterclaims and defenses of Defendant Vizio against Norman are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 635 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Third-Party Plaintiff Xerox against Third-Party Defendant Broadcom are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Xerox Corporation (Torkelson, John) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 451 Motion to Dismiss; denying 506 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 551 Motion to Dismiss; denying 552 Motion to Dismiss; denying 587 Motion to Strike; granting 598 Motion for Leave to File Its Fifth Amended Complaint. Parties should refile any motion directed at the fifth amended complaint or answer the complaint by 7/12/2013. Responses by Norman must be filed by 7/22/2013, and replies must be filed by 7/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/3/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 608 MOTION To Set A Case Schedule Subject To Motion To Dismiss filed by Infineon Technologies North America Corporation. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Alan Keeling on behalf of RPX Corporation (Keeling, Kevin) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 569 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 638 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 637 Response in Opposition to Qualcomm's Motion to Set Aside Case Schedule Subject to the Court's Ruling on its Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 619 MOTION To Set A Case Schedule Subject To Motion To Dismiss by Qualcomm, Inc. filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant VIZIO, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Defendant Broadcom Corporation by Xerox Corporation. (Carter, Edgar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (bjc, ). (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Everett McClyde Upshaw on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc.(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv525), ZTE Solutions Inc.(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv525) (Upshaw, Everett) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 583 MOTION to Dismiss Xerox Corporation's First Amended Third Party Complaint Against Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of the July 1 Document Production Deadline by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 629 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 629 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by Broadcom Corporation. (Banzhoff, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 608 MOTION To Set A Case Schedule Subject To Motion To Dismiss filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 570 MOTION to Dismiss Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 583 MOTION to Dismiss Xerox Corporation's First Amended Third Party Complaint Against Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Carter, Edgar) Modified on 6/25/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 569 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan Pierce)(Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 576 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Xerox Corporations First Amended Complaint Against Broadcom Corporation filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 587 Opposed MOTION to Strike 557 Amended Complaint, filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 598 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to File Its Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 583 MOTION to Dismiss Xerox Corporation's First Amended Third Party Complaint Against Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 570 MOTION to Dismiss Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION To Set A Case Schedule Subject To Motion To Dismiss by Qualcomm, Inc. by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zembek, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2013: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 616 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/12/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 615 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/12/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 606 Response in Opposition to Motion, (as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.) by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Mercer, Kell) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 603 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Mercer, Kell) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 610 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 569 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD; Responses due by 6/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 552 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. 519) for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 576 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Xerox Corporations First Amended Complaint Against Broadcom filed by Broadcom Corporation. (Banzhoff, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 551 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint With Brief in Support (Partial) filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 569 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 587 Opposed MOTION to Strike 557 Amended Complaint, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION To Set A Case Schedule Subject To Motion To Dismiss by Infineon Technologies North America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 569 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Dec. of Ryan Sheehan, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 570 MOTION to Dismiss Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 546 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 548 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 583 MOTION to Dismiss Xerox Corporation's First Amended Third Party Complaint Against Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Certificate of Initial Disclosures (Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv508) NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 552 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. 519) for Failure to State a Claim filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 576 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Xerox Corporations First Amended Complaint Against Broadcom filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to File Its Fifth Amended Complaint by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 551 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint With Brief in Support (Partial) filed by Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. (Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 590 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 569 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD; Responses due by 6/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/24/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 589 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 570 MOTION to Dismiss Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint; Responses due by 6/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/24/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 548 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint filed by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Zembek, Richard) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 546 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 569 MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 570 MOTION to Dismiss Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv508) Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Solomita, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION to Strike 557 Amended Complaint, by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 552 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. 519) for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 551 MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint With Brief in Support (Partial) filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 581 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Xerox Corporation's First Amended Third Party Complaint Against Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 574 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 552 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. 519) for Failure to State a Claim; Responses due by 5/17/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 382 Third Party Complaint by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 568 Stipulation, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, ZTE (USA) Inc., Dish Network Corporation, Xerox Corporation, DISH Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/14/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 548 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Broadcom Corporation Notice Of Compliance With Rule 26(a)(1) (Banzhoff, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 546 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Third Party MOTION to Dismiss Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Xerox Corporations First Amended Complaint Against Broadcom by Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banzhoff, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2013: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth M Banzhoff on behalf of Broadcom Corporation (Banzhoff, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 552 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. 519) for Failure to State a Claim by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DEFICIENT FILING. DISREGARD.*** Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (as to Xerox Corporation Third-Party Claim) re Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.( Mercer, Kell) Modified on 5/14/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 562 Motion for Extension of Time to File. RPX's response to the third-party complaint of Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. is due 30 days after Volkswagen files its answer and third-party complaint in response to Norman IP Holdings, LLC's Fifth Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/10/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. (Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Pierce, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Concerning Defendants' Response To Fifth Amended Complaint by Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 561 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant Ricoh Americas Corporation and all counterclaims of Defendant against Norman are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/08/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re 451 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint DEFENDANT DISH NETWORK LLC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF NORMAN IP'S THIRD, FOURTH AND FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINTS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(7) AND RULE 19 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by Dish Network Corporation. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by BMW North America, LLC(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv510) Requesting Termination of ECF Notices (Stein, Andrew) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by BMW North America, LLC(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv510) Requesting Termination of ECF Notices (Lavelle, Joseph) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jordan L Hirsch on behalf of Infineon Technologies North America Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4127888. (Hirsch, Jordan) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Third-Party Complaint by RPX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Badini, Aldo) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT RICOH AMERICAS CORPORATION by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 494 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 558 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 451 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint; Replies due by 5/8/2013. Norman's sur-reply to Dish's Motion to Dismiss will now be due by 5-20-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/03/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 451 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint by Dish Network Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT (Fifth Amended Complaint) against Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv523), Xerox Corporation(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv524), ZTE (USA) Inc.(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv525), ZTE Solutions Inc.(Severed into Civil Action 6:12cv525), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Summersgill on behalf of Infineon Technologies North America Corporation (Summersgill, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 553 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 451 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint; Replies due by 5/3/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/30/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 540 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant ViewSonic are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 451 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint by Dish Network Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. 519) for Failure to State a Claim by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint With Brief in Support (Partial) by Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT against Broadcom Corporation, Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., filed by Xerox Corporation.(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Incorporated (Zembek, Richard) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint by Qualcomm Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zembek, Richard) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 494 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Infineon Technologies North America Corporation. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Rene' Barnes on behalf of STMicroelectronics, Inc. (Barnes, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Andrew Dyson on behalf of Qualcomm Incorporated (Dyson, Paul) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 539 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 451 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint; Replies due by 4/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/24/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/24/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Third-Party Claim) re Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.( Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice of Defendant ViewSonic Corporation by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 451 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint by Dish Network Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 507 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Docket Control Order by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Lexmark International, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Feher, Eugene) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 531 Motion for Extension of Time. RPX's motion or answer in response to the operative third-party complaint of Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., shall be due 30 days after Volkswagen files its response to Norman IP Holdings, LLCs Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc. Request for Termination fo Electronic Notices (Redmond, Megan) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Belkin International, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Belkin International, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Chassman, Peter) Modified on 4/16/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 506 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Third-Party Complaint by RPX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Badini, Aldo) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 526 Motion for Extension of Time. Dish's reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss 451 shall be extended to 4-25-2013 and Norman's sur-reply to Dish's Motion to Dismiss will now be due on or before 5-06-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 525 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant BMW of North America, LLC are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..( Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 494 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 451 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint and Stipulation by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 520 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Lexmark International Inc are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs, fees and expenses incurred in this action, and all rights of appeal are waived. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 517 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Belkin International Inc are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Broadcom Corporation.( Tessar, Amanda) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.( Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (and Stipulation) by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT (Fourth) against Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sheila Kadura on behalf of Qualcomm Incorporated (Kadura, Sheila) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT BELKIN INTERNATIONAL, INC. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot 415 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/4/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 451 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 509 Motion to Dismiss. All claims by pltf against deft GM Corporation are DISMISSED with prejudice, and all counterclaims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/02/13. cc:attys 4-03-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 504 Motion to Dismiss. All claims by pltf against defts Garmin International, Inc. and Garmin USA, Inc., are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/02/13. cc:attys 4-03-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 508 Motion to Withdraw 508 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 450 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED]. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/2/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 449 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss by General Motors LLC, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 450 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED] by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/01/13. cc:attys 4-01-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Broadcom Corporation (Tessar, Amanda) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice of Defendants Garmin International, Inc. and Garmin USA, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Xerox Corporation of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Torkelson, John) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Per Order 511 , Docket Text Corrected to: REPLY to Response to Motion re 449 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Ricoh Americas Corporation. (Siebman, Clyde) Modified on 4/3/2013 (mjc, ). Previous docket entry: REPLY to Response to Motion re 450 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED] filed by Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Ricoh Americas Corporation. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Belkin International, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-4(a) (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot 435 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 470 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Dish Network Corporation OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING P.R. 3-4(a) (Cooper, Monte) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 488 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Novatel Wireless Inc are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection with this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/26/13. cc:attys 3-27-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by General Motors LLC, General Motors, LLC (Hsu, Sean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Infineon Technologies North America Corporation (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Infineon Technologies North America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 472 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant DISH Network LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings' Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(7). Response is due 4/4/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/25/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 464 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 464 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 415 MOTION to Intervene. Responses due by 3/22/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/25/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 417 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to complaint. Answer to complaint due by 3/26/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/25/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint re Advanced Micro Devices, Inc..( Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is ordered to amend its complaint within 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Novatel Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warriner, James) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DEFICIENT FILING. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. SEE ENTRY 502 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT.*** REPLY to Response to Motion re 450 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED] filed by Dish Network Corporation, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Ricoh Americas Corporation. (Siebman, Clyde) Modified on 4/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Susannah P Torpey on behalf of RPX Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4058309. (Torpey, Susannah) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ian L Papendick on behalf of RPX Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4058291. (Papendick, Ian) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Diana Lee Hughes on behalf of RPX Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4058248. (Hughes, Diana) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aldo A Badini on behalf of RPX Corporation (Badini, Aldo) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RPX Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Charles River Partnership XIII, L.P., Other Affiliate Index Ventures Growth I (Jersey) L.P., Other Affiliate Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC for RPX Corporation. (Keville, John) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Third-Party Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Third-Party Complaint re RPX Corporation.(Keville, John) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R Keville on behalf of RPX Corporation (Keville, John) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Infineon Technologies North America Corporation on 3/5/2013, by personal service; answer due: 3/26/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. on 3/5/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to RPX Corporation on 3/5/2013, by personal service; answer due: 3/26/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Qualcomm Incorporated on 3/5/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to STMicroelectronics, Inc. on 3/5/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. on 3/5/2013, by personal service; answer due: 3/26/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 451 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Third-Party Claim) re Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.( Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 435 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed and Supplemental Partial Motion to Dismiss) by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re STMicroelectronics, Inc..( Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 219 Motion to Change Venue and Transfer Claims against BMW of North America LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/15/13. cc:attys 3-18-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 195 Motion to Sever and Transfer Claims against General Motors LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/15/13. cc:attys 3-18-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 270 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Unopposed Motion To Amend Docket Control Order by Dish Network Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion To Amend Docket Control Order)(Cooper, Monte) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2013: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC of Compliance Regarding Submission of Technology Tutorial (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 415 MOTION to Intervene by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Qualcomm Incorporated.( Zembek, Richard) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 459 Motion to Reschedule Markman Hearing. The Markman hearing scheduled for 3-19-2013 is RESCHEDULED to 9-19-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/15/13. cc:attys 3-15-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PLAINTIFF'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by General Electric Company of Request for Termination of Electronic Notice (Walter, Craig) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION Motion to Reschedule Markman Hearing by BMW North America, LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 458 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibits (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Claim Construction Chart per P.R. 4-5(d) (Attachments: Exhibit 1 - Claim Chart) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 449 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2009 Markman Order, # 2 Exhibit 2010 Markman Order, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Dr Marc Levitt, # 4 Exhibit Amendment and Request for Reconsideration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Compliance Regarding the Parties Estimated Time for Markman Hearing (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Freescale Semiconductor, Inc..( Mercer, Kell) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Broadcom Corporation.( Tessar, Amanda) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Tessar on behalf of Broadcom Corporation (Tessar, Amanda) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP's Third Amended Complaint by Dish Network Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Khemka, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Cooper, # 3 Exhibit A - Infringement Contentions Cover Pleading, # 4 Exhibit B - Claim Chart D1, # 5 Exhibit C - Claim Chart D2, # 6 Exhibit D - Claim Chart D3, # 7 Exhibit E - Claim Chart D4, # 8 Exhibit F - Claim Chart D5, # 9 Exhibit G - 1/3/13 Email, # 10 Exhibit H - 3/1/13 Email, # 11 Exhibit I - 3/7/13 Email, # 12 Exhibit J - ARM Webpage, # 13 Exhibit K - Press Release, # 14 Exhibit L - Imagination Tech Webpage, # 15 Exhibit M - 3/7/13 Email, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER 511 .*** MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [REDACTED] by BMW North America, LLC, Belkin International, Inc., Dish Network Corporation, General Motors LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Ricoh Americas Corporation, Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Hsu, # 2 Exhibit A - Claim Chart I1, # 3 Exhibit B - Claim Chart I2, # 4 Exhibit C - Claim Chart I3, # 5 Exhibit D - '689 Patent, # 6 Exhibit G - File History of the '873 Patent, # 7 Exhibit I - '873 Patent, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) Modified on 4/2/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 449 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by BMW North America, LLC, Belkin International, Inc., Dish Network Corporation, General Motors LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Ricoh Americas Corporation, Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Hsu, # 2 Exhibit A - Claim Chart I1, # 3 Exhibit B - Claim Chart I2, # 4 Exhibit C - Claim Chart I3, # 5 Exhibit D - '689 Patent, # 6 Exhibit E - Grumlose Deposition Transcript, # 7 Exhibit F - Hendrickson Deposition Transcript, # 8 Exhibit G - '873 File History, # 9 Exhibit H - Dettmer Deposition Transcript, # 10 Exhibit I - '873 Patent, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Norman's ANSWER to 409 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, filed by Volkswagen by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC re: Disputes Over Privileged Documents (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Dish Network Corporation re: Disputes Over Privileged Documents (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Norman's ANSWER to 436 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by BMW by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Norman's ANSWER to 430 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Xerox by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Norman's ANSWER to 411 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Ricoh by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by TomTom, Inc., of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Kim, Paul) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 365 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment of indefiniteness filed by General Motors LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/04/13. cc:attys 3-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. on 2/22/2013, by personal service; answer due: 3/15/2013. (Summons on a Third-Party Complaint) (mll, ) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Broadcom Corporation on 2/22/2013, by personal service; answer due: 3/15/2013. (Summons on a Third-Party Complaint) (mll, ) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Norman's ANSWER to 406 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by ZTE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Qualcomm Incorporated, RPX Corporation, STMicroelectronics, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es), # 4 Summons(es), # 5 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 393 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by BMW North America, LLC.(Lavelle, Joseph) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION to Dismiss (Renewed and Supplemental Partial Motion to Dismiss) by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      General Motors LLC's ANSWER to 393 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by General Motors LLC.(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 422 Motion Amend Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/1/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 420 Motion to amend docket control order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/1/2013. (gsg) Modified on 3/1/2013 (gsg, ). (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Xerox Corporation ANSWER to 393 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Xerox Corporation.(Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 416 Motion to Seal Document 380 Answer to Amended Complaint. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall seal Garmins Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/28/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 428 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT GARMIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S AND GARMIN USA, INC.'S ANWSER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT #393). (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Steven Torkelson on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Torkelson, John) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 426 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Original Answer to Third Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims of Defendant Belkin International, Inc. (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation Regarding Privileged Documents (Solomita, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by BMW North America, LLC Compliance Regarding Privilege Logs (Lavelle, Joseph) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by ViewSonic Corporation of Compliance Regarding Privilege Log (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION To Amend Docket Control Order re 270 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Dish Network Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc. of Compliance as to Privilege Logs (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 270 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Regarding Privileged Documents (Smith, Susan) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC of Compliance Regarding Privilege Logs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Norman's Third Amended Complaint by ViewSonic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 380 Answer to Amended Complaint by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene by GM Components Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Third Party Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER for parties to meet and confer and jointly submit to the Court and technical advisor by 3/12/2013 a claim construction chart on computer disk listing each party's proposed construction for each of the terms to be addressed at the Markman hearing, including any terms purported to be indefinite. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/26/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER appointing David Keyzer as technical advisor. Richard Egan terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/25/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Xerox Corporation of Return of Summons for Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. (Carter, Edgar) Modified on 2/25/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ricoh Americas Corporation's ANSWER to 393 Amended Complaint, Second Corrected Third Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Ricoh Americas Corporation.(Solomita, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by D-Link Systems, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 393 Amended Complaint,, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, RPX Corporation, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM to Second Corrected Third Amended Complaint against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Smith, Susan) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION to Intervene by GM Components Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Third Party Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) Modified on 2/25/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., filed by General Motors, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 393 Amended Complaint, Second Corrected, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc..(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 404 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant VIZIO to answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint, Corrected Third Amended Complaint and Second Corrected Third Amended Complaint is extended to 3-26-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/22/13. cc:attys 2-22-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 393 Amended Complaint, by Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolegraff, William) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Norman's ANSWER to 383 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by General Motors LLC by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 401 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant D-Link Systems are hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/19/13. cc:attys 2-20-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant D-Link Systems, Inc. with prejudice by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by ViewSonic Corporation Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Wells, Richard) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 396 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Novatel Wireless, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Third AmendedComplaint, Corrected Third Amended Complaint, and Second Corrected Third Amended Complaint is extended to 3-26-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/13. cc:attys 2-15-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 392 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for defendant Lexmark International Inc to answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint and Corrected Third Amended Complaint is extended to 3-26-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/13. cc:attys 2-15-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief 365 Filed by General Motors LLC filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply Letter Brief)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Novatel Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warriner, James) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Norman's Third Amended Complaint, Corrected Third Amended Complaint and Second Corrected Third Amended Complaint (CORRECTED MOTION) by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2013: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DEFICIENT FILING. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by General Motors LLC re 365 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief Reply in Support of Letter Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply Letter Brief)(Hsu, Sean) Modified on 2/15/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND CORRECTED) against BMW North America, LLC, Belkin International, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Dish Network Corporation, Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., General Motors LLC, Lexmark International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Novatel Wireless, Inc., Ricoh Americas Corporation, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Norman's Third Amended Complaint by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Belkin International, Inc. re 365 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief Defendant Belkin International, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in the Moving Defendants' Letter Brief Request to File Motion for Summry Judgment of Indefiniteness of Claim 5 of the '689 Patent (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT (CORRECTED) against All Defendants, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER appointing Richard Egan as the technical advisor to the Court, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/11/13. cc:attys 2-12-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 365 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by General Motors LLC Filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 377 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/11/13. cc:attys 2-11-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 376 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/11/13. cc:attys 2-11-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DEFICIENT FILING. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT. SEE ENTRY 388 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Letter Brief filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 2/12/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMW North America, LLC, Belkin International, Inc., Brother International Corporation, D-Link Systems, Inc., Daimler North America Corporation, Dish Network Corporation, Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., General Motors LLC, Lexmark International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Novatel Wireless Technology, Inc., Novatel Wireless, Inc., Ricoh Americas Corporation, ViewSonic Corporation, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by General Motors LLC.(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Defendant Xerox Corporation against Broadcom Corporation, Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., filed by Xerox Corporation.(Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC Regarding P.R. 3-4(a) (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 380 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PER ORDER 429 AMENDED ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc..(Bunt, Robert) Modified on 3/1/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc. JOINT NOTICE REGARDING PROPOSED TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Richard Egan CV)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DEFICIENT FILING. INCORRECT FORMAT. DISREGARD. 1 BUSINESS DAY TO REFILE.*** RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 365 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by General Motors LLC Filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, General Motors LLC filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, General Motors LLC. (Shiu, Chester) Modified on 2/12/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 270 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, 348 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 340 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 317 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 270 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, 298 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 313 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 348 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by General Motors LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Ricoh Americas Corporation, Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomita, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by General Electric Company of Request for Termination of Electronic Notice (McAughan, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 363 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant VIZIO to comply with P.R. 3-4(a) is extended to 3-26-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/04/13. cc:attys 2-04-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 360 Motion for Extension of Time. ViewSonic's deadline to comply with P.R. 3-4(a), is extended through 2-15-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/04/13. cc:attys 2-04-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 359 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to propose a technical advisor is extended to 2-08-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/04/13. cc:attys 2-04-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 358 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant Lexamark to comply with P.R. 3-4(a) is extended to and including 3-26-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/04/13. cc:attys 2-04-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 356 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant, D-Link Systems, Inc., is granted an extension of time through 2-15-2013 to comply with P.R. 3-4(a). Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/04/13. cc:attys 2-04-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 342 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/04/13. cc:attys 2-04-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot 146 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/04/13. cc:attys 2-04-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-4(a) (Solomita, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. Of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Brief filed by General Motors LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter Brief to Court)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by BMW North America, LLC, Belkin International, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Dish Network Corporation, Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Ricoh Americas Corporation, ViewSonic Corporation, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement per P.R. 4-3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim Term Chart per P.R. 4-3(b))(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Comply with P.R. 3-4(a) by Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolegraff, William) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by General Motors LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AS TO P.R. 3-4(a) (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File for ViewSonic to Comply with P.R. 3-4(a) by ViewSonic Corporation, ViewSonic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSE TECHNICAL ADVISOR by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File for Lexmark to Comply with P.R. 3-4(A) by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time for Lexmark to Comply with P.R. 3-4(A))(Feher, Eugene) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 353 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant General Electric Company are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Allcounterclaims of GE against Plaintiff are dismissed as moot. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-01-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline to Comply with P.R. 3-4(a) by D-Link Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AS TO P.R. 3-4(a) (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Norman's ANSWER to 347 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Belkin by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant General Electric Company by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Settled as to Defendant D-Link; Suspended as to Defendant ZTE(Knowles, James) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Settled as to Defendant Novatel; Suspended as to Defendants Xerox, Ricoh, and Dish(Knowles, James) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Suspended as to Defendant General Motors(Knowles, James) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Settled as to Defendants Vizio, Inc. and Lexmark International Inc.(Knowles, James) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 346 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/13. cc:attys 1-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Amended ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Belkin International, Inc..(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 340 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 270 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Ricoh Americas Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomita, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Suspended as to Defendant Volkswagen(Knowles, James) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Suspended as to Defendants Belkin, BMW, Mercedes, and Garmin(Knowles, James) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Settlement Joint of Norman IP's Claims Against General Electric Company by General Electric Company (Andrews, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 340 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 270 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Dish Network Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Service of P.R. 4-2 Preliminary Proposed Claim Constructions (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 327 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/14/13. cc:attys 1-15-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BMW North America, LLC, Belkin International, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Dish Network Corporation, Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., General Motors LLC, Lexmark International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Novatel Wireless, Inc., Ricoh Americas Corporation, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. Defendants' Joint Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-2 (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by General Motors LLC Notice of Compliance re no current disputes as to claims of privileged documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Court)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Novatel Wireless, Inc. No Privilege Log Disputes (Warriner, James) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Xerox Corporation of Compliance regarding Privilege Logs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Letter to Court)(Arnett, James) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. Notice of Compliance re no current disputes as to claims of privileged documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Letter to Court)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by ViewSonic Corporation Defendant ViewSonic Corporation's Notice of Compliance re no current disputes as to claims of privilege documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Utley, Jay) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First Amended ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Belkin International, Inc..(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Belkin International, Inc. Defendant Belkin International, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance re no current disputes as to claims of privilege documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Letter to Court)(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by TomTom, Inc., Request for Termination of ECF Notices (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Mediation with Defendant ViewSonic - Suspended(Knowles, James) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 328 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice all claims of Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC against Defendant TomTom. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/11/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss TomTom by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 270 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by BMW North America, LLC, Belkin International, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Dish Network Corporation, Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., General Motors LLC, Lexmark International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Novatel Wireless, Inc., Ricoh Americas Corporation, TomTom, Inc.,, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 325 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant D-Link Systems, Inc.s deadline to comply with P.R. 3-4(a) is extended to 2-01-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-07-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Comply with P.R. 3-4(a) by D-Link Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 323 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant Ford are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/02/13. cc:attys 1-03-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ford by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Christopher Rusnak on behalf of Novatel Wireless, Inc. (Rusnak, Eric) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by JVC Americas Corporation to Terminate Electronic Service for Counsel (Newton, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Norman IP Holdings, LLC Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-1 (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BMW North America, LLC, Belkin International, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Dish Network Corporation, Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., General Electric Company, General Motors LLC, Lexmark International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Novatel Wireless, Inc., Ricoh Americas Corporation, TomTom, Inc.,, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. Defendants' Joint Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-1 (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BMW North America, LLC, Belkin International, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Dish Network Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., General Electric Company, General Motors LLC, Lexmark International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Ricoh Americas Corporation, TomTom, Inc.,, ViewSonic Corporation, Vizio, Inc., Xerox Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. P.R. 3-3 and 3-4(b) (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 314 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/18/12. cc:attys 12-18-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. PR 3-3 and 3-4(b) (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Novatel Wireless, Inc. P.R. 3-3 & 3-4(b) (Warriner, James) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 270 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, 298 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 313 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by BMW North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2012: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 308 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/11/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 310 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that Garmins deadline to amend its pleadings and join additional parties is extended up to and including January 10, 2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/11/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/11/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Pleadings and Join Additional Parties by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Protective Order MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 270 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, 298 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Ford Motor Company, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Evan Walter on behalf of General Electric Company (Walter, Craig) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Massimo Ciccarelli on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. (Ciccarelli, Massimo) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/20/12. cc:attys 11-20-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Motion for Entry of Order Regarding E-Discovery by Belkin International, Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul M Kim on behalf of TomTom, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3872219. (Kim, Paul) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 303 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** MOTION for Limited Admission by TomTom, Inc.,. (Kim, Paul) Modified on 11/14/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Cohen on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. (Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 299 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims. Norman IP Holding's claims against deft Garmin International Inc for infringement of patent 5,592,555 (as set forth in Count Three of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint) and Garmin's counterclaims with respect to patent 5,592,555 are dismissed without rejudice. Each side will bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/12. cc:attys 10-22-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 297 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/12. cc:attys 10-15-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Belkin International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 295 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Ricoh Americas Corporation with respect to U.S. Patent No. 5,771,394 are herebydismissed without prejudice. RACs counterclaims against Norman with respect to U.S. Patent No. 5,771,394 are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees in connection with those claims. The remaining claims in this case between Norman and RAC shall continue unaffected by this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/11/12. cc:attys 10-11-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Ricoh Americas Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomita, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: 9/20/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: 9/20/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: 9/20/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 476 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?