Personal Audio, LLC v. Amazon Digital Services, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00655
District Judge Ron Clark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 21, 2016 at 11:34 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Personal Audio LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 31 Joint Motion for Dismissal. Pltf's claims against defts Amazon.com Inc and Amazon Digital Services Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Defts' counterclaims against pltf are dismissed without prejudice. Attorney's fees, costs of court and expenses will be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/21/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 29 Defendant's Motion for Redaction. All requested redactions concern what Amazon characterizes as highly confidential financial information, relating to the accused product and Amazon's litigation budget.Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/21/12. (mrp, ) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION FOR REDACTION by Amazon Digital Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Betty) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
          ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** Unopposed SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT AMAZON DIGITAL SERVICES, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR REDACTION by Amazon Digital Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Betty) Modified on 6/18/2012 (bjc, ). (Entered: 06/15/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Service of Infringement Contentions by Personal Audio, LLC (Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 6/14/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 06/13/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER regarding the possible appointment of Dr. Frank Shipman as a technical advisor to the court. Any objections to this appointment should be lodged by 6/6/12. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/30/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Case Management Conference held on 5/24/2012. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER. If necessary, a Claim Construction Hearing will be held at 9:00 on 11/20/12. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2013 at 9:00 AM. Jury Selection/Trial set for 12/3/2013 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/24/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                    REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                      ANSWER to 12 Counterclaim by Personal Audio, LLC.(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                        Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kelly C Hunsaker for Amazon Digital Services Inc and Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid). (tkd, ) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by 4/13/12. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2012 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 2/13/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Betty Hong Chen on behalf of Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Chen, Betty) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Robert Rueckheim on behalf of Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Indranil Mukerji on behalf of Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Mukerji, Indranil) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Charles Elacqua on behalf of Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Elacqua, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J McKeon on behalf of Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (McKeon, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Personal Audio, LLC by Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc..(Cordell, Ruffin) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Personal Audio, LLC. Amazon Digital Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc. waiver sent on 12/15/2011, answer due 2/13/2012. (tkd, ) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Burgess on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Burgess, Daniel) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Allen Prange on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Prange, David) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick M Arenz on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Arenz, Patrick) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Annie Huang on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Huang, Annie) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cyrus A Morton on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Morton, Cyrus) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob M. Holdreith on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Holdreith, Jacob) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald J Schutz on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Schutz, Ronald) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Ron Clark for all further proceedings pursuant to GO 11-11. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 11/22/11. (pkb, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Personal Audio, LLC (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                COMPLAINT against Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. for infringement of US Patent No. 6,199,076 and US Patent No. 7,509,178 ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3334506.), filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 11/23/2011 (pkb, ). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 402 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?