District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Texas Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Securities and Exchange Commission v. Cuban
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-02050-D
District Judge Sidney A Fitzwater, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 3, 2017 at 1:27 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Duane Thompson +1 309 793 1160 +7939 793 793 9048

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

v.
No Logo Mark Cuban, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian D Nysenbaum +1 202 296 7353 bnysenbaum@bhfs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph C Ferrara +1 202 383 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie A Maria +1 202 346 8065 +1 202 346 8102 lmaria@dl.com

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George E Anhang +1 202 346 8000 +1 202 986 8102 geanhang@dl.com
Space Henry Winchester Asbill +1 202 986 8141 +1 202 956 3263 hasbill@dl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A Best +1 202 346 8735 +1 202 346 8102 sbest@dl.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Rankin Clark , +1 212 259 7163 +1 212 259 6333 crclark@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/09/2010 Kiprian E Mendrygal +1 214 740 8400 +1 214 740 8800 kmendrygal@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/05/2011 Stephen Michael Ryan +1 202 585 6500 +1 202 585 6600 sryan@manatt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/09/2010 Paul Edward Coggins +1 214 740 8000 +1 214 740 8800 pcoggins@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lyle Roberts +1 703 734 3100
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (309) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013 Exhibit
Exhibit List Defendant's Exhibit List from Jury Trial held 09/30/13 to 10/16/13 by Mark Cuban. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Court's Exhibit/Witness List
    Court's Exhibit List from Jury Trial held 09/30/13 to 10/16/13. SEC's Exhibit's list. (chmb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Judgment*Court Filing
      JUDGMENT in favor of Mark Cuban against Securities and Exchange Commission. Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov/Court Records). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/16/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Court's Exhibit/Witness List
        CERTIFICATION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS from Jury Trial held 9/30/2013-10/16/2013. (ykp)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Jury Notes
          Jury Notes. (ykp)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Vol 9 Trial Proceedings held on 10/16/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (21 pages) Redaction Request due 5/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2014. (pjw) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Jury Charge
              Jury Charge. (ykp)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Vol 8 Trial Proceedings held on 10/15/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (304 pages) Redaction Request due 5/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2014. (pjw) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 277 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                  ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: 9th day of Jury Trial Begun on 10/16/2013. Jury deliberations begin. Jury note hearing held. Jury verdict returned for the deft. Jury polled and excused. Written judgment to follow. Jury trial ends. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rourke with Jan Folena, Duane Thompson, Jennifer Brandt, Christian Schultz and Adam Aderton; Defense - Thomas Melsheimer, Lyle Roberts, George Anhang, Chris Clark and Steve Best. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - :21. (chmb)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Vol 7 Trial Proceedings held on 10/9/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (304 pages) Redaction Request due 5/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2014. (pjw) (Main Document 291 replaced on 5/9/2014) (twd). (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 276 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                      ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: 8th day of Jury Trial Begun on 10/15/2013. Testimony continued. SEC closes case. Cuban rests and closes case. Court excused Juror no. 3 due to illness and with no objections from the parties. Charge conference held. Closing arguments. Court's charge to the jury. Jury excused to begins deliberations. Jury recessed for the day to return at 9:00am on Wed, Oct 16, 2013 to deliberate. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rourke with Jan Folena, Duane Thompson, Jennifer Brandt, Christian Schultz and Adam Aderton; Defense - Thomas Melsheimer, Lyle Roberts, George Anhang, Chris Clark and Steve Best. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 5:37. (chmb)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Vol 6 Proceedings held on 10/8/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (269 pages) Redaction Request due 5/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2014. (pjw) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Excerpts of Kara Novaco Brockmeyer filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Deposition Testimony Excerpts) (Melsheimer, Thomas)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Vol 5 Trial Proceedings held on 10/7/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (301 pages) Redaction Request due 5/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2014. (pjw) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Trial Brief
                              TRIAL BRIEF in Response to Plaintiff's Trial Brief Regarding Court's Contemplated Charge to the Jury by Mark Cuban. (Roberts, Lyle)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Vol 4 Trial Proceedings held on 10/3/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (285 pages) Redaction Request due 5/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2014. (pjw) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Trial Brief
                                  ***Please Disregard per attorney, please see document [274] for image*** TRIAL BRIEF in Response to Plaintiff's Trial Brief Regarding Court's Contemplated Charge to the Jury by Mark Cuban. (Roberts, Lyle) Modified on 10/15/2013 (ndt).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Vol 3 Trial Proceedings held on 10/2/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (254 pages) Redaction Request due 5/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2014. (pjw) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: 10/14/2013 Trial Brief
                                      TRIAL BRIEF re Contemplated Jury Charge by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Aderton, Adam)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Vol 2 Trial Proceedings held on 10/1/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (264 pages) Redaction Request due 5/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2014. (pjw) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 271 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                          ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: 7th day of Jury Trial Begun on 10/9/2013. Deft's testimony continued. Adjourned until Tuesday, Oct 15, 2013 at 9:00am. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rourke with Jan Folena, Duane Thompson, Jennifer Brandt, Christian Schultz and Adam Aderton; Defense - Thomas Melsheimer, Lyle Roberts, George Anhang, Chris Clark and Steve Best. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 5:37. (chmb)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            (Document Restricted) Notice of Filing of SEALED Electronic Transcript of Sealed Vol. 1 Voir Dire Proceedings held on 9/30/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. (413 pages) (pjw) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 270 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                              ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: 6th day of Jury Trial Begun on 10/8/2013. Deft testimony continues. Adjourned until Wednesday, Oct 9, 2013 at 9:00am. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rourke with Jan Folena, Duane Thompson, Jennifer Brandt, Christian Schultz and Adam Aderton; Defense - Thomas Melsheimer, Lyle Roberts, George Anhang, Chris Clark and Steve Best. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 5:23. (chmb)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Pretrial Proceedings held on 9/25/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (129 pages) Redaction Request due 5/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2014. (pjw) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013, Terminated: 10/7/2013 ~Motion for Judgment
                                                  MOTION for Judgment As a Matter of Law filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Memorandum of Law of Defendant Mark Cuban In Support of His Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, # (2) Exhibit(s) Appendix to Cuban's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, # (3) Proposed Order) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 268 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                    ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: 5th day of Jury Trial Begun on 10/7/2013. Plaintiff's testimony continued. Plaintiff's rest case. Deft's testimony begins. Adjourned until Tuesday, Oct 8, 2013 at 9:00am. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rourke with Jan Folena, Duane Thompson, Jennifer Brandt, Christian Schultz and Adam Aderton; Defense - Thomas Melsheimer, Lyle Roberts, George Anhang, Chris Clark and Steve Best. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 5:30. (chmb)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 267 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                      ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: 4th day of Jury Trial Begun on 10/3/2013. Plaintiff testimony continued. Adjourned until Monday, October 7, 2013 at 9:00am. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rourke with Jan Folena, Duane Thompson, Jennifer Brandt, Christian Schultz and Adam Aderton; Defense - Thomas Melsheimer, Lyle Roberts, George Anhang, Chris Clark and Steve Best. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 5:42. (chmb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Trial Brief
                                                        TRIAL BRIEF in Opposition to Admission of Extrinsic Hearsay Evidence by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 265 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                          ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: 3rd day of Jury Trial Begun on 10/2/2013. Plaintiff's testimony continued. Adjourned until Thursday, Oct 3, 2013 at 9:00am. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rourke with Jan Folena, Duane Thompson, Jennifer Brandt, Christian Schultz and Adam Aderton; Defense - Thomas Melsheimer, Lyle Roberts, George Anhang, Chris Clark and Steve Best. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 5:14. (chmb)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 264 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                            ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: 2nd day of Jury Trial Begun on 10/1/2013. Opening statements. Plaintiff's Testimony begins. Adjourned until Wednesday, Oct 2, 2013 at 9:00am. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rourke with Jan Folena, Duane Thompson, Jennifer Brandt, Christian Schultz and Adam Aderton; Defense - Thomas Melsheimer, Lyle Roberts, George Anhang, Chris Clark and Steve Best. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 6:05. (chmb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [262] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin J. Cross. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/1/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013, Terminated: 10/1/2013 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kevin J. Cross (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5597017) filed by Michael E. Storck (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Exhibit(s) Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit(s) Certificate of Service). Party Michael E. Storck, Non-Party added. (Cross, Kevin)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Trial Brief
                                                                  Opposition to [259] Defendant Mark Cuban's Trial Memorandum Regarding June 2004 Hearsay Emails of David Goldman by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Aderton, Adam) Document linkage and text modified on 10/2/2013 (twd).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Jury Roll
                                                                    (Document Restricted) Jury Roll. (aaa)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Trial Brief
                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF Defendant Mark Cuban's Trial Memorandum Regarding June 2004 Hearsay Emails of David Goldman by Mark Cuban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Jury Selection
                                                                        ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: Jury Selection only held on 9/30/2013. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rourke with Jan Folena, Duane Thompson, Jennifer Brandt, Christian Schultz and Adam Aderton; Defense - Thomas Melsheimer, Lyle Roberts, George Anhang, Chris Clark and Steve Best. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 7:01. (chmb)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                          ADVISORY TO COUNSEL re in limine rulings made at pretrial conference. (Chief Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            PRETRIAL ORDER. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/25/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                              ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: Pretrial Conference held on 9/25/2013. Adjourned until Monday, September 30, 2013 at 9:00am. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rourke with Jan Folena, Duane Thompson, Jennifer Brandt, Christian Schultz and Adam Aderton; Defense - Thomas Melsheimer, Lyle Roberts, George Anhang, Chris Clark and Steve Best. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 2:27. (chmb)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 256 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [254] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dean M. Conway. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/24/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 255 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [253] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christian D. H. Schultz. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/24/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013, Terminated: 9/24/2013 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Dean M. Conway filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Brandt, Jennifer) Modified on 9/24/2013 (ndt).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013, Terminated: 9/24/2013 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Brandt, Jennifer) Modified on 9/24/2013 (ndt).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                        OBJECTION filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [226] Pretrial Disclosures, [236] Designation of Deposition (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                          RESPONSE filed by Mark Cuban re: [241] MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 250 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [239] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina P. Skinner. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/24/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 249 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [238] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew E. Tomback. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/24/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Designation of Deposition
                                                                                                OBJECTION to [235] Deposition Counter-Designations by Mark Cuban. (Best, Stephen) Modified on 9/24/2013 (skt).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 247 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Appendix/Brief/Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                  (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: [245] Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, [246] Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/17/2013) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Brandt, Jennifer)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 246 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection
                                                                                                    (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: [233] Motion in Limine (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/17/2013) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Brandt, Jennifer) Modified on 9/24/2013 (skt).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 245 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection
                                                                                                      (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: [233] Motion in Limine (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/17/2013) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Brandt, Jennifer) Modified on 9/24/2013 (skt).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                        Consolidated RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Mark Cuban re: [221] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Irrelevant Director and Officer Stock Sales, Pay-to-Hold Activity, and Stock Purchase Agreements, [222] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Rank Speculation Relating to Cubans Meritless Quid Pro Quo Allegations (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle) Modified on 9/24/2013 (skt).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Mark Cuban re: [223] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant Cuban from Offering Improper Hearsay Testimony and Inadmissible Extrinsic Evidence at Trial (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle) Modified on 9/24/2013 (skt).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Mitchell Kopin re [241] MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena (Shank, David)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013, Terminated: 10/16/2013 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena filed by Mitchell Kopin with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Shank, David)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [233] MOTION in Limine (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Index, # (2) Appendix) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013, Terminated: 9/24/2013 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christina P. Skinner (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5576568) filed by Mitchell Kopin (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service) (Skinner, Christina)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013, Terminated: 9/24/2013 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Andrew E. Tomback (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5576248) filed by Mitchell Kopin (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service). Party Mitchell Kopin added. (Tomback, Andrew)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Designation of Deposition
                                                                                                                      Designation of Deposition by Mark Cuban. (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Designation of Deposition
                                                                                                                        Designation of Deposition by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                          Exhibit List Index by Mark Cuban. (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013, Terminated: 10/16/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Melsheimer, Thomas) Modified on 9/18/2013 (skt).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [230] Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion in Limine and Exhibits Under Seal filed by Mark Cuban. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/17/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Proposed Jury Charge/Instructions
                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Mark Cuban. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Special Verdict Form) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [227] Pretrial Disclosures, (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Mark Cuban. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                      Trial Materials and Pretrial Disclosures filed by Mark Cuban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Attachment A - Witness List, # (2) Exhibit(s) Attachment B - Deposition Designations, # (3) Exhibit(s) Attachment C - Exhibit List) (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                        Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures filed by Mark Cuban. (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re [223] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant Cuban from Offering Improper Hearsay Testimony and Inadmissible Extrinsic Evidence at Trial, [221] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Irrelevant Director and Officer Stock Sales, Pay-to-Hold Activity, and Stock Purchase Agreements, [222] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Rank Speculation Relating to Cubans Meritless Quid Pro Quo Allegations (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION filed by Mark Cuban re: [207] Pretrial Disclosures, [218] Pretrial Disclosures (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A - Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations, # (2) Attachment B - Objections to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013, Terminated: 10/16/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant Cuban from Offering Improper Hearsay Testimony and Inadmissible Extrinsic Evidence at Trial filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013, Terminated: 10/16/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Preclude Rank Speculation Relating to Cubans Meritless Quid Pro Quo Allegations filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013, Terminated: 10/16/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Irrelevant Director and Officer Stock Sales, Pay-to-Hold Activity, and Stock Purchase Agreements filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                    Local Rule 26.2 Pretrial Disclosures filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Attachment B, # (3) Attachment C, # (4) Attachment D, # (5) Attachment E) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [208] Pretrial Disclosures (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Objections to Proposed Trial Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit(s) Objections to Proposed Deposition Designations) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: 9/13/2013 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Order on Motion to Extend TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [216] MOTION to Extend Time to exchange and list demonstrative aids filed by Mark Cuban, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/11/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013, Terminated: 9/11/2013 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend Trial Setting Order filed by Mark Cuban, Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Roberts, Lyle) Modified on 9/12/2013 (skt).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures filed by Mark Cuban. (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying [204] MOTION for Use of Jury Questionnaire and Additional Attorney Voir Dire filed by Mark Cuban. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/10/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Mark Cuban re: [204] MOTION Use of Jury Questionnaire (Melsheimer, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Cashion Thomas on behalf of Mark Cuban. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Thomas, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer D Brandt for Jan M. Folena on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Brandt, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [209] Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Jan M. Folena. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/4/2013) (skt)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013, Terminated: 9/4/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Jan M. Folena filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Proposed Order) (Brandt, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures filed by Mark Cuban. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) LIST OF TRIAL DOCUMENTS & EXHIBITS) (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Pretrial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Attachment B, # (3) Attachment C) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [204] MOTION Use of Jury Questionnaire (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Mark Cuban re [204] MOTION Use of Jury Questionnaire Appendix in Support of Defendant Mark Cuban's Motion for Use of Jury Questionnaire and Additional Attorney Voir Dire and Supporting Brief (Melsheimer, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013, Terminated: 9/10/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Use of Jury Questionnaire and Additional Attorney Voir Dire filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Melsheimer, Thomas) Docket text modified on 8/13/2013 (twd).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2013 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/12/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [201] Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Mark Cuban. Attorney Leslie A Maria terminated. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/12/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/11/2013, Entered: 8/11/2013, Terminated: 8/12/2013 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Mark Cuban (Maria, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying [149] MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Reports of Clemens Sialm filed by Mark Cuban; denying as moot [160] MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of Marc I. Steinberg under FRE 702 filed by Securities and Exchange Commission; granting in part and denying in part [161] MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Erik R. Sirri Pursuant to FRE 702 filed by Securities and Exchange Commission; and denying as moot [162] MOTION to Exclude Opinions, Testimony and Report of Plaintiff SEC's Expert Thomas Lee Hazen filed by Mark Cuban. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/23/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [198] MOTION TO WITHDRAW. IT IS ORDERED that attorney Toby M. Galloway is relieved of any further representation of Plaintiff in the above captioned matter. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/31/2013) (twd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013, Terminated: 5/31/2013 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Brandt, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer D Brandt on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Brandt, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [195] Notice (Other) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: [194] Order on Motion for Leave to File,, filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Authority) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [193] MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Mark Cuban. Defendant's May 17, 2013 motion for leave to file notice of supplemental authority is granted, and he is granted leave to file the notice that accompanies his motion. Plaintiff may file a response to the notice of supplemental authority no later than May 28, 2013, or at such later date as the court approves on the parties' agreement or on plaintiff's motion. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/20/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013, Terminated: 5/20/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Index to Appendix, # (2) Appendix, # (3) Notice of Supplemental Authority, # (4) Proposed Order) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 192 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [190] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela M. Papalaskaris. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/9/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [189] Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Mark Cuban. Attorney Brian D Nysenbaum terminated. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/9/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013, Terminated: 5/9/2013 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Angela M. Papalaskaris (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5290361) filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Papalaskaris, Angela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013, Terminated: 5/9/2013 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Nysenbaum, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The court's 4/23/2013 order (document no. [185]) filed under seal is hereby unsealed. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/8/2013) (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: 5/7/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Stephen A Best on behalf of Mark Cuban. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 Sealed and/or Ex Parte OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order on In Camera Inspection. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/23/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) Modified restriction level on 5/8/2013 per [188] Order (axm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/30/2013 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1525, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/22/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: 4/1/2013 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [179] MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Mark Cuban. The court will reset the trial after considering the parties' proposed trial dates. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/1/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 182 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY filed by Mark Cuban re: [179] MOTION to Continue Trial (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 181 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [179] MOTION to Continue Trial (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 180 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part [141] Motion to Compel, and denying Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling Regarding SEC Interview Notes and Summaries filed by Mark Cuban. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/15/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013, Terminated: 4/1/2013 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Attachment, # (2) Proposed Order) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying [145] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mark Cuban; granting [157] Motion for Leave to File Reply Appendix in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mark Cuban.(Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/5/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Oral Argument Proceedings held on 1/18/2013 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (58 pages) Redaction Request due 3/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2013. (pjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Lyle Roberts and George E Anhang on behalf of Mark Cuban. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Roberts, Lyle) Docket text modified per counsel request on 1/25/2013 (twd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2013 re [145] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mark Cuban. re: [145] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Taken under advisement. Written order for follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O'Rouke, Adam Aderton and Duance Thompson; Defense - Stepehn A. Best, Lyle Roberts, Thomas Melsheimer, Brian Nysenbaum and George E. Anhang. (Court Reporter: Pamela Wilson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :50. (chmb) Modified on 2/6/2013 (chmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY filed by Mark Cuban re: [162] MOTION to Exclude Opinions, Testimony and Report of Plaintiff SEC's Expert Thomas Lee Hazen (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [161] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Erik R. Sirri Pursuant to FRE 702 (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [160] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Report of Marc I. Steinberg under FRE 702 (Attachments: # (1) Index to Appendix, # (2) Declaration(s) of Adam S. Aderton, # (3) Exhibit(s) 1-2) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Mark Cuban re: [161] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Erik R. Sirri Pursuant to FRE 702 (Attachments: # (1) Index to Appendix, # (2) Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Mark Cuban re: [160] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Report of Marc I. Steinberg under FRE 702 (Attachments: # (1) Index to Appendix, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [162] MOTION to Exclude Opinions, Testimony and Report of Plaintiff SEC's Expert Thomas Lee Hazen (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL SETTING: Jury Trial continued to two-week docket of 6/17/2013. US Courthouse, Courtroom 1525, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/9/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Order Setting Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2013 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1525, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. re: [145] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/9/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE: The court will convene oral argument on [145] defendant's July 13, 2012 motion for summary judgment at a date and time specified after considering the schedules of the court, counsel, and the parties. Counsel are requested to confer regarding their availability on the following dates: December 10, 11, 12, 17, 18 (morning), 19, and 20, 2012. In none of these dates is available, they may also suggest dates in January 2013 when both parties are available. Their response should be set out in a letter or other filing, which may be signed by one attorney on behalf of counsel for both parties. The court will issue an argument calendar after considering the response. (Chief Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [164] Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: [161] Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Erik R. Sirri Pursuant to FRE 702, [162] Motion to Exclude Opinions, Testimony and Report of Plaintiff SEC's Expert Thomas Lee Hazen, [160] Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Report of Marc I. Steinberg under FRE 702 filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/1/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 180 Filed: 3/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part 141 Motion to Compel, and denying Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling Regarding SEC Interview Notes and Summaries filed by Mark Cuban. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/15/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012, Terminated: 11/1/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: [161] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Erik R. Sirri Pursuant to FRE 702, [162] MOTION to Exclude Opinions, Testimony and Report of Plaintiff SEC's Expert Thomas Lee Hazen , [160] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Report of Marc I. Steinberg under FRE 702 filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Thompson, Duane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Modify Hearings/Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing/Deadline Modification per [165] Order. Responses due by 11/20/2012, Replies due by 12/4/2012 re: [160] Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Report of Marc I. Steinberg under FRE 702; [161] Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Erik R. Sirri Pursuant to FRE 702; [162] Motion to Exclude Opinions, Testimony and Report of Plaintiff SEC's Expert Thomas Lee Hazen. (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY filed by Mark Cuban re: [157] MOTION for Leave to File Reply Appendix in Support of Mr. Cuban's Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof (Melsheimer, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012, Terminated: 7/23/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Exclude Opinions, Testimony and Report of Plaintiff SEC's Expert Thomas Lee Hazen filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law, # (2) Index to Appendix, # (3) Appendix - Attachments A-B, # (4) Attachments C-D, # (5) Attachments E-F, # (6) Attachment G, # (7) Attachment H - Part 1, # (8) Attachment H - Part 2, # (9) Proposed Order) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012, Terminated: 7/23/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Erik R. Sirri Pursuant to FRE 702 filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Indext to Appendix, # (2) Declaration(s) of Kevin P. O'Rourke, # (3) Exhibit(s) 1 to 8, # (4) Proposed Order) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012, Terminated: 7/23/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Report of Marc I. Steinberg under FRE 702 filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Index to Appendix, # (2) Declaration(s) of Adam S. Aderton, # (3) Exhibit(s) 1-2, # (4) Exhibit(s) 3-5, # (5) Proposed Order) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Mark Cuban re: [149] MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Reports of Clemens Sialm (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [157] MOTION for Leave to File Reply Appendix in Support of Mr. Cuban's Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012, Terminated: 3/5/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply Appendix in Support of Mr. Cuban's Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A - Appendix Index, # (2) Exhibit(s) A-1 Reply Appendix - Pt 1 (1-34), # (3) Exhibit(s) A-2 Reply Appendix - Pt 2 (35-54), # (4) Exhibit(s) A-3 Reply Appendix - Pt 3 (55-76), # (5) Exhibit(s) A-4 Reply Appendix - Pt 4 (77-148), # (6) Exhibit(s) A-5 Reply Appendix - Pt 5 (149-226), # (7) Proposed Order) (Melsheimer, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: On September 28, 2012 defendant Mark Cuban filed [155] an appendix in support of his summary judgment reply brief. Because Cuban did not first obtain leave of court to file the appendix, the court will not consider it in deciding his summary judgment motion. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/3/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Mark Cuban re [154] Reply (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Reply Appendix 1 of 5 (1-34), # (2) Exhibit(s) Reply Appendix 2 of 5 (35-54), # (3) Exhibit(s) Reply Appendix 3 of 5 (55-76), # (4) Exhibit(s) Reply Appendix 4 of 5 (77-148), # (5) Exhibit(s) Reply Appendix 5 of 5 (149-226)) (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by Mark Cuban re: [145] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [149] MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Reports of Clemens Sialm (Attachments: # (1) Index to Appendix, # (2) Declaration(s) of Kevin P. O'Rourke, # (3) Exhibit(s) 1-3, # (4) Exhibit(s) 4-10) (Thompson, Duane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Leslie A Maria on behalf of Mark Cuban. (Maria, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [150] Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/12/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Modify Hearings/Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadlines/hearings set re [149] Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, [145] Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 9/28/2012. Responses due by 9/28/2012. (see doc. [151] for image) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012, Terminated: 9/12/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Thompson, Duane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012, Terminated: 7/23/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Reports of Clemens Sialm filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law, # (2) Index to Appendix, # (3) Appendix, # (4) Proposed Order) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [145] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Index, # (2) Declaration(s) of Kevin P. O'Rourke, # (3) Exhibit(s) 1 to 4-1, # (4) Exhibit(s) 4-2, # (5) Exhibit(s) 5 to 6, # (6) Exhibit(s) 7 to 9, # (7) Exhibit(s) 10, # (8) Exhibit(s) 11, # (9) Exhibit(s) 12 to 14, # (10) Exhibit(s) 15, # (11) Exhibit(s) 16, # (12) Exhibit(s) 17 to 18, # (13) Exhibit(s) 19 to 24, # (14) Exhibit(s) 25-1, # (15) Exhibit(s) 25-2, # (16) Exhibit(s) 26 to 37, # (17) Exhibit(s) 38 to 44, # (18) Exhibit(s) 45 to 50, # (19) Exhibit(s) 51 to 65, # (20) Exhibit(s) 66 to 70, # (21) Exhibit(s) 71) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Mark Cuban re [145] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Appx Part 1 of 26, # (2) Appx Part 2 of 26, # (3) Appx Part 3 of 26, # (4) Appx Part 4 of 26, # (5) Appx Part 5 of 26, # (6) Appx Part 6 of 26, # (7) Appx Part 7 of 26, # (8) Appx Part 8 of 26, # (9) Appx Part 9 of 26, # (10) Appx Part 10 of 26, # (11) Appx Part 11 of 26, # (12) Appx Part 12 of 26, # (13) Appx Part 13 of 26, # (14) Appx Part 14 of 26, # (15) Appx Part 15 of 26, # (16) Appx Part 16 of 26, # (17) Appx Part 17 of 26, # (18) Appx Part 18 of 26, # (19) Appx Part 19 of 26, # (20) Appx Part 20 of 26, # (21) Appx Part 21 of 26, # (22) Appx Part 22 of 26, # (23) Appx Part 23 of 26, # (24) Appx Part 24 of 26, # (25) Appx Part 25 of 26, # (26) Appx Part 26 of 26) (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mark Cuban re [145] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012, Terminated: 3/5/2013 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY filed by Mark Cuban re: [141] Third MOTION to Compel and Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling Regarding SEC Interview Notes and Summaries (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Index, # (2) Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: 6/27/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [141] Third MOTION to Compel and Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling Regarding SEC Interview Notes and Summaries (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Index, # (2) Appendix Part 1, # (3) Appendix Part 2) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STATUS REPORT and Estimate of Trial Length filed by Mark Cuban, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012, Terminated: 3/15/2013 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Third MOTION to Compel and Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling Regarding SEC Interview Notes and Summaries filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Index to Appendix, # (4) Appendix Pt. 1 (1-103), # (5) Appendix Pt. 2 (104-206), # (6) Appendix Pt. 3 (207-209)) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Attorney Change of Address, dated June 1, 2012 on June 1, 2012. (Clark, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Christopher J Clark on behalf of Mark Cuban. (Clark, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: 5/17/2012 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING: [137] JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 6/8/2012. The original terms of the Scheduling Order shall remain in effect in all other respects. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/17/2012) (cea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Modify Hearings/Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing/Deadline Modification: Status report due by 6/8/2012. (Reset per [138] Order. (twd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012, Terminated: 5/17/2012 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [130] Order, [135] Order on Motion to Continue, [117] Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Scheduling Order filed by Mark Cuban, Allen Ferrell, Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Nysenbaum, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: 4/10/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Trial set for two-week docket beginning April 8, 2013 before Chief Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/10/2012) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Modify Hearings/Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Modification per [136] Order. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2013 before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (mcrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: 4/2/2012 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [132] MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order re: [130] Scheduling Order, [117] Amended Scheduling Order filed by Mark Cuban. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/2/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Modify Hearings/Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadlines/hearings terminated and reset. Motions due by 7/13/2012. Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2012. (see doc. [135] for image) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by Mark Cuban re: [132] MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [132] MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012, Terminated: 4/2/2012 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order re: [130] Scheduling Order, [117] Amended Scheduling Order filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Nysenbaum, Brian) Modified on 3/15/2012 (skt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 131 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part [111] Motion to Compel filed by Mark Cuban, and granting [121] Motion to Compel filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/10/2012). (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER. (See order for specifics.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/13/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Submission of an Agreed Proposed Order Pursuant to the Court's December 30, 2011 Order by Mark Cuban, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Modify Hearings/Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadlines Modification per [130] Order: Discovery due by 3/16/2012. Status Report due by 3/16/2012. Motions due by 4/13/2012. (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: 12/30/2011 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [123] MOTION to Compel Defendant's Appearance for Deposition filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Defendant Mark Cuban shall appear for his deposition on a date between February 1 and 16, 2012 that is mutually agreeable to the parties. If a party unreasonably fails to agree to a particular date during this period, the party will be subject to sanctions. The parties must agree on the deposition date no later than January 13, 2012 and must promptly submit a proposed order for the court's consideration. (See order for other provisions and specifics.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/30/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: 12/29/2011 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [123] MOTION to Compel Defendant's Appearance for Deposition (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: 12/22/2011 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [121] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Cover Page, # (2) Index to Appendix, # (3) Declaration of Kevin P. O'Rourke, # (4) Appendix 1, # (5) Appendix 2, # (6) Appendix 3) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: 12/22/2011 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Mark Cuban re: [123] MOTION to Compel Defendant's Appearance for Deposition (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Index, # (2) Appendix) (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER SETTING BRIEFING DEADLINES. Any response to [123] plaintiff's December 15, 2011 motion to compel defendant Mark Cuban to appear for deposition must be filed no later than December 22, 2011 at 4:00 p.m. CST. Plaintiff may file a reply brief no later than December 29, 2011 at 4:00 p.m. CST. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/16/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Modify Hearings/Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Setting Deadlines as to [123] Motion to Compel Defendant's Appearance for Deposition per [124] Order. Responses due by 12/22/2011. Replies due by 12/29/2011. (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: 12/15/2011, Terminated: 12/30/2011 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Defendant's Appearance for Deposition filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Cover Page, # (2) Index to Appendix, # (3) Declaration of Kevin P. O'Rourke, # (4) Appendix in Support, # (5) Proposed Order) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: 12/13/2011 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Mark Cuban re: [121] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Index, # (2) Appendix Part 1 of 2, # (3) Appendix Part 2 of 2) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: 11/22/2011, Terminated: 2/10/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Index and Declaration of Kevin P. O'Rourke, # (2) Appendix Part 1, # (3) Appendix Part 2, # (4) Proposed Order) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letter Rogatory). (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court will issue letters rogatory seeking the testimony of Daniel Bertrand. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to forward the original Letters of Request bearing the signature and seal of this Court to the appropriate judicial authorities in Quebec, Canada. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/9/2011) (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT SUBMISSION REGARDING LETTERS ROGATORY (RESPONSE) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Mark Cuban re: [110] Order, (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit(s) Request for Foreign Assistance) (Aderton, Adam) Modified Filer and Text on 11/10/2011 (egb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER granting [116] Joint MOTION to Amend [102] Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/1/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines per Order [117]: Rebuttal Expert Witnesses Disclosures due by 12/2/2011; Discovery due by 2/17/2012; Summary Judgment Motions due by 3/23/2012;. Status Report due by 2/17/2012. (bdg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/1/2011 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [102] Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Mark Cuban re: [111] Amended Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER terminating [105] Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Mark Cuban. This motion has been superseded by [111] the 09/28/2011 Amended Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Mark Cuban. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/25/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re [112] Response/Objection to Defendant Mark Cuban's Amended Second Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) 1-10, # (2) Exhibit(s) 11-14, # (3) Exhibit(s) 15-25) (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [105] Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/10/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Amended Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Appendix Part 1 (1-101), # (4) Appendix Part 2 (102-175), # (5) Appendix Part 3 (176-281)) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: To facilitate consideration of [108] plaintiff's September 20, 2011 motion for the court to issue letters rogatory for taking depositions and production of documents in Canada, and [109] defendant's September 22, 2011 joinder in plaintiff's motion and alternate proposed letters rogatory, the court enters this order. (See order for specifics.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/27/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/22/2011 Motion to Join
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joinder in Securities and Exchange Commission's [108] Motion for the Court to Issue Letters Rogatory and Alternate Proposed Letters Rogatory filed by Mark Cuban. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Roberts, Lyle) Modified on 9/22/2011 (skt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/9/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Requesting International Assistance for Discovery filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A - Request for International Assistance - Ontario, # (3) Exhibit B - Request for International Assistance - Quebec) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [106] Consent MOTION to Extend Time for Briefing filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. The deadline for filing Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to the Defendant Mark Cuban's Second Motion to Compel Production of Documents is extended to and including October 7, 2011. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/19/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/19/2011 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Extend Time for Briefing filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/25/2011 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Appendix - Part 1 (1 - 101), # (4) Appendix - Part 2 (102 - 175), # (5) Appendix - Part 3 (176 - 259)) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting [93] Motion filed by Securities and Exchange Commission to strike affirmative defense of unclean hands. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/18/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Leslie A Maria on behalf of Mark Cuban. (Maria, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [101] Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [83] Scheduling Order filed by Mark Cuban, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/10/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/10/2011 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [83] Scheduling Order filed by Mark Cuban, Securities and Exchange Commission (Nysenbaum, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines per document #102: Discovery due by 11/30/2011. Motions due by 4/30/2012. Status Report due by 11/30/2011. (skt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [99] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan D. Nysenbaum. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/6/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/6/2011 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Bryan D. Nysenbaum (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3920176) filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [97] MOTION to Extend Time Expert Disclosure filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. The Scheduling Order dated January 6,2011 [83] is hereby amended as follows: 1) Section II. B is amended to change the deadline for expert disclosures from June 1, 2011 to June 15, 2011, and 2) Section II.C is amended to change the deadline for rebuttal expert disclosures from August 1, 2011 to August 15, 2011. The original terms of the Scheduling Order shall remain in effect in all other respects. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/4/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/4/2011 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Extend Time Expert Disclosure filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Expert Extension, # (2) Proposed Order) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [93] MOTION to Strike [88] Amended Answer to Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support) (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix in Support re [94] RESPONSE filed by Mark Cuban (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Mark Cuban re: [93] MOTION to Strike [88] Amended Answer to Complaint (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/18/2011 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike [88] Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [91] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George E. Anhang. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/8/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/8/2011 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney George E. Anhang (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3708762) filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Anhang, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [89] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leslie A. Maria. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/8/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/8/2011 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Leslie A. Maria (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-3705108) filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Maria, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to [1] Complaint filed by Mark Cuban (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Notice of Correction of Signature Omission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in [86] Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement filed by Mark Cuban. (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mark Cuban. (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint filed by Mark Cuban. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Best, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Duane Thompson on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Thompson, Duane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2011. Discovery due by 9/30/2011. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2011. Motions due by 2/1/2012. Status Report due by 9/30/2011. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/6/2011) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [81] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen M. Ryan terminated. Stephen M. Ryan is withdrawn as an attorney of record for defendant Mark Cuban in this civil action. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/5/2011) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/5/2011 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Ryan, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Report and Proposal filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Aderton, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Appeal Record Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appeal Record Not Returned. Electronic copy of record recycled. (svc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Order for Scheduling Order ProposalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/22/2010. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/22/2010) (chmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None USCA Judgment/Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to [48] Notice of Appeal, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Case remanded to the district court for further proceedings. Issued as Mandate: 11/15/10. Judgment of the District Court is vacated, and the cause is remanded to the Court of first instance for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Each party to bear its own costs on appeal. (svc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Opinion of USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opinion of USCA (certified copy) in accordance with USCA judgment re [48] Notice of Appeal, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Judgment dismissing the case vacated and REMAND to the court of first instance for further proceedings. (svc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying without prejudice [41] Motion for Attorney Fees; denying without prejudice [64] Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice [65] Motion to Compel; and denying without prejudice [71] Motion for Protective Order (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/21/2010) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [71] MOTION for Protective Order (Karr, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  E-Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-Mail re: [74] Response/Objection bounced back on 5/10/10 from hasbill@dl.com. Corrective action taken: Received an e:Mail from firm that Mr. Asbill is no longer with Dewey & LeBoeuf. Modified notice to "N".. (cab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Mark Cuban re: [71] MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: # (1) Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY filed by Mark Cuban re: [65] MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # (1) Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [65] MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s)) (Karr, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/21/2010 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit(s) Part 1 of 2, # (3) Exhibit(s) Part 2 of 2, # (4) Proposed Order) (Karr, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: [65] MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Part 1 of 3, # (2) Exhibit(s) Part 2 of 3, # (3) Exhibit(s) Part 3 of 3) (Karr, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Mark Cuban re: [64] MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents (Attachments: # (1) Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Substitute Counsel filed by Mark Cuban (Melsheimer, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Melsheimer on behalf of Mark Cuban. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mark Cuban re [65] MOTION to Compel CORRECTED (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1, # (2) Appendix Part 2) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/21/2010 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel filed by Mark Cuban with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Appendix App part 1, # (3) Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/21/2010 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by Securities and Exchange Commission with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Text of Proposed Order) (Karr, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [62] Joint MOTION to Extend Time/Schedule for Discovery and Supplemental Briefing on Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/18/2010) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/18/2010 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Extend Time /Schedule for Discovery and Supplemental Briefing on Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Mark Cuban (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [60] Motion for Protective Order. (See order for specifics.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/15/2010) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/15/2010 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Karr, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [54] application of Thomas J. Karr, Esquire on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission to appear pro hac vice. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/4/2010) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  E-Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-Mail re: [58] Order on Motion to Extend Time bounced back on 2/15/2010 from mendrygal@fr.com. Corrective action taken: Faxed NEF and order. (drh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Order on Motion to Extend TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [57] Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Discovery Schedule. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/11/2010) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010, Terminated: 2/11/2010 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Discovery Schedule filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Karr, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Transfer of the Appellate Record to Mark Cuban (jmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Transfer of the Appellate Record to Securities and Exchange Commission (jmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas J Karr on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Pro Hac Vice Application) (Karr, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Order on Motion to Extend TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [52] Motion to Extend Time for Discovery and Supplemental Briefing on Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses. (See order for specifics.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/22/2010) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010, Terminated: 1/22/2010 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Discovery and Supplemental Briefing on Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Mark Cuban (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DELETED*** Docketed in Wrong Case ORDER of USCA as to [48] Notice of Appeal, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Appellant's motion for stay pending appeal is GRANTED pending further order of the court. (jmr) Modified on 1/15/2010 (jmr).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum Opinion and Order. By this memorandum opinion and order, the court establishes a discovery period and a supplemental briefing schedule on defendant Mark Cuban's August 28, 2009 motion for attorney's fees and expenses [41]. The discovery must be completed no later than February 1, 2010. No later than 21 days after the discovery period is completed, Cuban may file a supplemental brief and evidence appendix in support of his motion. No later than 21 days after Cuban files these materials, the SEC may file a supplemental brief and, if applicable, evidence appendix. No later than 14 days after the SEC files its response, Cuban may file a supplemental reply brief. The court will decide the motion under the procedure allowed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 43(c). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/4/2009) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL Record on Appeal Certified to US Court of Appeals, 5th Circuit re [48] Notice of Appeal, - USCA5 Number: 09-10996. 1 sealed transcript. (jmr) Modified on 11/5/2009 (jmr).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Record on Appeal Certified to US Court of Appeals, 5th Circuit re [48] Notice of Appeal, - USCA5 Number: 09-10996. 3 vol. electronic record. (jmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY Brief in Support of re: [41] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Mark Cuban (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA5 Case Number 09-10996 for [48] Notice of Appeal filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (klm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009, Terminated: 11/19/2010 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to [40] Judgment by Securities and Exchange Commission. T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re [41] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Robert B. Kaplan, # (2) Exhibit 1-3, # (3) Exhibit 4-7, # (4) Exhibit 8-13) (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER: The court in its discretion will permit defendant to file a reply brief in support of his August 28, 2009 motion for attorneys fees and expenses. The reply brief must be filed no later than October 28, 2009. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/11/09) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [43] Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff's response brief is due by 9/30/2009. Plaintiff shall advise the court with reasonable promptness whether it opposes extending defendant's reply deadline to October 28, 2009. This may be done by letter or by telephone call to chambers. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/4/09) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Response/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Mark Cuban re [43] MOTION for Leave to File Response Pursuant to Rule 54(d)(2)(C) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009, Terminated: 9/4/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Response Pursuant to Rule 54(d)(2)(C) filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mark Cuban re [41] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Tabs 1-3, # (2) Appendix Tab 4, # (3) Appendix Tabs 5-8, # (4) Appendix Tabs 9-17) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009, Terminated: 9/21/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Mark Cuban (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: 8/14/2009 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Mark Cuban against Securities and Exchange Commission dismissing action with prejudice. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/13/2009) (caw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: 8/14/2009 Order on Motion to Alter JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [38] Motion to Alter Judgment [see Order]. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/13/2009) (caw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009, Terminated: 8/13/2009 ~Motion to Alter Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT in favor of Mark Cuban against Securities and Exchange Commission. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/13/2009) (caw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum Opinion and Order granting Defendant's motion to dismiss with prejudice as no amended complaint has been filed. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/13/2009) (caw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE and Request Pursuant to re: [33] Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EDITORIAL CORRECTION to Page 27 re [33] Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Attachments: # (1) PAGE 27) (caw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Opinion and Order granting [11] Motion to Dismiss filed by Mark Cuban. The SEC is granted 30 days from the date of this memorandum opinion and order to file an amended complaint. (See Order for specifics) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/17/09) (skt) (caw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument Proceedings held on 5/26/2009 before Judge Sidney Fitzwater. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela J. Wilson, Telephone number 214.662.1557. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. Redaction Request due 7/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2009. (pjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater: Motion Hearing held on 05/26/2009 re [11] Motion to Dismiss filed by Mark Cuban. Oral argument heard. Taken under advisement. Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kevin O. O'Rourke with Toby Galloway; Defense - Ralph C. Ferrara with Paul C. Coggins and Lyle Roberts. (Court Reporter Pam Wilson.) Time in Court: 56 minutes. NO PDF ATTACHED - THIS IS A VIRTUAL MINUTE ENTRY. (ple)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2009 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater as to [11] Motion to Dismiss. See Order (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/17/09) (svc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [14] Motion for Judicial Notice. Defendant's request for oral argument of his January 14, 2009 motion to dismiss is granted. Counsel are directed to contact the court concerning their availability for oral argument. Once a date is selected, the court will issue an order addressing the details of argument. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/16/09) (tln)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AGREED ORDER: Plaintiff's 4/1/2009 Notice of Subpoena on Non-Party for the Production of Documents shall be removed from the Court's file and stricken form the Court's electronic case filing system. The Clerk is therefore directed to strike from the electronic case filing system the filing previously designated as document number 28. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/3/09) (klm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***STRICKEN PER 4/3/09 ORDER***NOTICE of Subpoena on Non-Party for the Production of Documents filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Galloway, Toby) Modified on 4/3/2009 (svc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY Brief in Support of re: [11] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Appendix) (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re [11] MOTION to Dismiss (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2010. Discovery due by 2/1/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2009. Motions due by 3/1/2010. Status Report due by 2/1/2010. (see order) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 02/17/09) (lmp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: 2/12/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Report and Proposal filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Set/Reset Deadlines as to [11] Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/27/2009. Replies due by 3/20/2009. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/6/09) (jrb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED DOCUMENT by Allen Ferrell. Amendment to [21] Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (klm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE filed by Allen Ferrell, et al in Support of [11] MOTION to Dismiss. (svc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [19] Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Brief must be filed electronically or on paper within five business days of the date of this order. (see order) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/3/2009) (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Allen Ferrell. (klm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [17] Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/10/2009. Responses due by 2/17/2009. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/23/09) (klm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009, Terminated: 1/23/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: [11] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Order for Scheduling Order ProposalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/16/2009. (see order) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/15/09) (klm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mark Cuban. (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009, Terminated: 4/16/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Judicial Notice re [11] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Cuban (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-5) (Roberts, Lyle) .
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Appendix in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix in Support filed by Mark Cuban re [12] Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mark Cuban re [11] MOTION to Dismiss (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009, Terminated: 7/17/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Cuban (Roberts, Lyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: 12/9/2008 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mark Cuban. Waiver sent on 11/20/2008. (O'Rourke, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Order for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Lyle Roberts for Mark Cuban. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/4/08) (skt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: 12/2/2008 Order for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Christopher J Clark for Mark Cuban. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/1/08) (klm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Order for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Ralph C Ferrara for Mark Cuban. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/25/08) (jyg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Order for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Julie M Riewe for Securities and Exchange Commission. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/17/2008) (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Order for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Kevin P O'Rourke for Securities and Exchange Commission. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/17/2008) (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Order for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Adam S Aderton for Securities and Exchange Commission. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/17/2008) (axm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Mark Cuban. (jyg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Securities and Exchange Commission. (jyg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Mark Cuban filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (jyg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 660 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?