Innovation First, Inc et al v. Urban Trend, LLC et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00934
District Judge Ed Kinkeade, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Ed Kinkeade
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Innovation First Labs, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly D Hine +1 214 292 4052 kdh@fr.com
Space J Kristopher Long +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 klong@fr.com
No Logo Innovation First, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly D Hine +1 214 292 4052 kdh@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Kristopher Long +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 klong@fr.com
v.
No Logo Michael Stoll, Defendant

Represented by Shannon, Gracey, Ratliff & Miller, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul F Gianni +1 214 245 3097
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W Romney +1 214 245 3062 +1 214 245 3097 mromney@shannongracey.com
No Logo Robert G Kushner, Defendant

Represented by Shannon, Gracey, Ratliff & Miller, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul F Gianni +1 214 245 3097
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W Romney +1 214 245 3062 +1 214 245 3097 mromney@shannongracey.com
No Logo Urban Trend LLC, Defendant

Represented by Shannon, Gracey, Ratliff & Miller, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul F Gianni +1 214 245 3097
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W Romney +1 214 245 3062 +1 214 245 3097 mromney@shannongracey.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Timeline
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 23 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss: This Case is DISMISSED with prejudice with each party to bear its owns costs and fees. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/10/2011) (twd) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Innovation First Labs, Inc., Innovation First, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Hine, Kelly) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE: The Court has been notified that this case has settled. The parties are therefore directed to file the necessary dismissal papers (a stipulation of dismissal) with the Clerk's Office within 20 days from the date of this order. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/17/2011) (mfw) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER Setting Deadlines as to 15 Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively Motion to Vacate Judgment. Responses due by 2/14/2011, Replies due by 3/10/2011. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/31/2011) (chmb) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2011 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 1/24/2011) (tln) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney. (see order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 1/20/2011) (twd) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: This case is hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Paul D.Stickney for a settlement conference. (see order) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/19/2011) (tln) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Robert G Kushner, Michael Stoll, Urban Trend, LLC. (Romney, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
Appendix in Support filed by Robert G Kushner, Michael Stoll, Urban Trend, LLC re 15 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Motion to Vacate Judgment and Supporting Brief (Romney, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Motion to Vacate Judgment filed by Robert G Kushner, Michael Stoll, Urban Trend, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Romney, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The hearing to prove damages is RESET for 1/18/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/8/2010) (dnc) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 12 MOTION for Default Judgment against Robert G Kushner, Michael Stoll, Urban Trend, LLC. Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/4/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. (see order) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/26/2010) (tln) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Default Judgment against Robert G Kushner, Michael Stoll, Urban Trend, LLC filed by Innovation First, Inc, Innovation First Labs, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration(s) of Kelly D. Hine in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants, # 2 Exhibit(s) A of Kelly Hine's Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order) (Hine, Kelly) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court's records reflect that the Clerk has entered default against Michael Stoll, Urban Trend, LLC, and Robert G Kushner. Therefore, Plaintiffs are hereby directed to move for default against Michael Stoll, Urban Trend, LLC, and Robert G Kushner within 30 days from the date of this order. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/6/2010) (chmb) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Robert G Kushner. (axm) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default filed by Innovation First Labs, Inc., Innovation First, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A Declaration of Kelly D. Hine, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default) (Hine, Kelly) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovation First Labs, Inc., Innovation First, Inc Return of Service on Robert G. Kushner (Hine, Kelly) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael Stoll, Urban Trend, LLC. (dnc) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
Request for Clerk to issue Plaintiffs' Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendants Urban Trend, LLC and Michael Stoll filed by Innovation First Labs, Inc., Innovation First, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Proposed Order Entry of Default) (Hine, Kelly) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Michael Stoll; served on 7/20/2010. (mfw) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Urban Trend, LLC ; served on 7/13/2010. (jrb) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Robert G Kushner, Michael Stoll, Urban Trend, LLC. (mfw) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Innovation First Labs, Inc., Innovation First, Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innovation First International, Inc. for Innovation First Labs, Inc., Innovation First, Inc. (Hine, Kelly) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Robert G Kushner, Michael Stoll, Urban Trend, LLC filed by Innovation First, Inc, Innovation First Labs, Inc.. Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 0539-3256672) (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s)) (Hine, Kelly) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 202 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?