Walker v. Alta Colleges, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00894
District Judge Lee Yeakel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 7:30 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Courtland Walker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by James Hoyer Newcomer & Smiljanich

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jillian L. Estes +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 jestes@jameshoyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Christian Hoyer +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 choyer@jameshoyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole C. Mayer +1 813 286 4100 +1 813 286 4174 nmayer@jameshoyer.com
v.
No Logo Alta Colleges, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacy L. Brainin +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 stacy.brainin@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel H. Gold +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 daniel.gold@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Rogers +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 chris.rogers@haynesboone.com
No Logo TRAV Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacy L. Brainin +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 stacy.brainin@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel H. Gold +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 daniel.gold@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Rogers +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 chris.rogers@haynesboone.com
No Logo Wesgray Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacy L. Brainin +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 stacy.brainin@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel H. Gold +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 daniel.gold@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Rogers +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 chris.rogers@haynesboone.com
No Logo Westwood College, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacy L. Brainin +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 stacy.brainin@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel H. Gold +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 daniel.gold@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Rogers +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 chris.rogers@haynesboone.com
No Logo Melissa Rothrock, Movant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (175) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
Exhibit Letter to attorneys instructing parties to pick up their exhibits. (mh, ) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
    EXHIBIT RECEIPT by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (mh, ) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
      Exhibit Letter to the attorneys instructing parties to pick up their exhibits. (mh, ) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
        Appeal Record Returned/Disposed by USCA: 161 Notice of Appeal (mh, ) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
          Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Dismissing Notice of Appeal,, filed by Courtland Walker, Melissa Rothrock, 161 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) filed by Melissa Rothrock pursuant to the joint stipulation of the parties. (mh, ) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to 169 Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, ) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
              STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Alta Colleges, Inc., Melissa Rothrock, TRAV Corporation, Courtland Walker, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                Letter from USCA Fifth Circuit confirming rec't of Supplemental Certified Record on Appeal. (klw, ) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                  Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re Notice of Appeal,, (mh, ) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                    Acknowledgement Receipt for Record on Appeal by Jonathan B. Cohen. re 164 Appeal Record Transmitted (mh, ) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                      Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re Notice of Appeal,, (mh, ) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                        Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to Mr. Jonathan B. Cohen. re Notice of Appeal,, (mh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                          Request from Jonathan B. Cohen from James, Hoyer, Newcomer, Smiljanich & Yanchunis, PA for the physical copy of the electronic record on appeal. (klw, ) (Main Document 163 replaced on 9/13/2011) (klw, ). (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                            TRANSCRIPT IS UNNECESSARY FOR APPEAL PURPOSES filed by Melissa Rothrock (mh, ) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Appeal of Order entered by District Judge 160 by Melissa Rothrock.( Filing fee $ 455 receipt number 0542-3860071) (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER DENYING 155 Plaintiff Walker' and Rothrock's Amended Opposed Joint Motion for Permissive Intervention and Substitution of Class Representative. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Melissa Rothrock, Courtland Walker, re 155 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 153 Opposed MOTION Plaintiff Courtland Walker And Melissa Rothrocks Opposed Joint Motion For Intervention And Substitution Of Class RepresentativeOpposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 153 Opposed MOTION Plaintiff Courtland Walker And Melissa Rothrocks Opposed Joint Motion For Intervention And Substitution Of Class Representative filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker, 153 Opposed MOTION Plaintiff Courtland Walker And Melissa Rothrocks Opposed Joint Motion For Intervention And Substitution Of Class Representative filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER GRANTING 157 Motion for John A. Yanchunis to withdraw as counsel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, ) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Withdraw by Melissa Rothrock, Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Melissa Rothrock, Courtland Walker (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                          Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 153 Opposed MOTION Plaintiff Courtland Walker And Melissa Rothrocks Opposed Joint Motion For Intervention And Substitution Of Class Representative by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Intervenor-Plaintiffs Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B Consent and Declaration of Melissa Rothrock, # 3 Exhibit C Consent of Courtland Walker, # 4 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc., re 153 Opposed MOTION Plaintiff Courtland Walker And Melissa Rothrocks Opposed Joint Motion For Intervention And Substitution Of Class Representative filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                              Opposed MOTION Plaintiff Courtland Walker And Melissa Rothrocks Opposed Joint Motion For Intervention And Substitution Of Class Representative by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consent and Declaration of Melissa Rothrock, # 2 Exhibit Consent of Courtland Walker, # 3 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER FROM USCA-5th Circuit denying petitioner Courtland Walker's permission to appeal order denying class certification signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Signed by Circuit Judges: DENNIS, CLEMENT, AND ELROD(mh, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Amended 42 Motion to Certify Class Action. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, ) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Supplemental Post-Hearing Brief regarding 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class, by Courtland Walker. (jk, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER GRANTING 148 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs Supplemental Post-Hearing Brief In Support Of Plaintiffs Amended Motion For Class Certification. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jk, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Supplemental Post-Hearing Brief In Support Of Plaintiffs Amended Motion For Class Certification by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Supplemental Post-Hearing Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 10-07-10, Proceedings Transcribed: Continuation of Class Certification Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denver B Roden, RPR, RMR, Telephone number: (214) 753-2298. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/30/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2011. (Roden, Denver) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                            Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 09-23-10, Proceedings Transcribed: Certification Hearing (Afternoon). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denver B Roden, RPR, RMR, Telephone number: (214) 753-2298. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/30/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2011. (Roden, Denver) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL Post-Hearing MEMORANDUM in opposition to 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc. (mc2, ) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER GRANTING 143 Motion for Leave to File supplement al post-hearing brief. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mc2, ) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Opposed MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL POST-HEARING BRIEF by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL POST-HEARING BRIEF, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 10/18/10, Proceedings Transcribed: Oral Argument in Closing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-916-5143. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. (Rodriguez, Arlinda) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2010 re 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class filed by Courtland Walker (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(td) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc., re 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker DEFENDANTS' POST-HEARING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Memorandum in Support, filed by Courtland Walker, re 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF CLASS CERTIFICATION (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Plaintiff's Exhibit List for Class Certification Hearing held 10/7/2010.(td) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Defendants' Exhibit List for Class Certification Hearing held 10/7/2010.(td) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Witness List re: Motions hearing held 10/7/2010. (td) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Motion Hearing continued on 10/7/2010 re 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class filed by Courtland Walker (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Set Motion Hearing for 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class ( Motion Hearing recessed until 10/18/2010 03:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel.). (Court Reporter Denver Roden.)(mc2, ) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Transcript filed of Proceedings held on September 23, 2010, Proceedings Transcribed: Class Certification Hearing (Morning Proceedings). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: (512)916-5564. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/25/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2011. (Reznik, Lily) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 09-23-10, Proceedings Transcribed: Excerpt of Stipulation From Class Certification Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denver B Roden, RPR, RMR, Telephone number: (210) 271-0660. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/25/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2011. (Roden, Denver) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 09-23-10, Proceedings Transcribed: Excerpt From Class Certification Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denver B Roden, RPR, RMR, Telephone number: (210) 271-0660. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/25/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2011. (Roden, Denver) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          STIPULATION Regarding Admissibility of Class Certification Hearing Exhibits by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Courtland Walker, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc. (mc2, ) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER DENYING 113 Motion to exclude; DENYING 120 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mc2, ) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2010 re 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class filed by Courtland Walker (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Motion Hearing for 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class ( Motion Hearing recessed until 10/7/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel.). (Court Reporter Denver Roden.)(mc2, ) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Courtland Walker, re 113 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Linda S. Mullenix filed by Defendant Westwood College, Inc., Defendant Wesgray Corporation, Defendant Alta Colleges, Inc., Defendant TRAV Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Mayer, Nicole) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Exhibit List Plaintiff's Third Amended Exhibit List for Class Certification Hearing by Courtland Walker.. (Mayer, Nicole) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Exhibit List Plaintiff's Second Amended Exhibit List for Class Certification Hearing by Courtland Walker.. (Mayer, Nicole) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 103 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Courtland Walker. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mc2, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 100 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Westwood College, Inc., Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mc2, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Exhibit List Plaintiffs Amended Exhibit List For Class Certification Hearing by Courtland Walker.. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 122 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Sealed Exhibits to 99 Response in Opposition to Motion to Certify Class. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12 - 25, # 2 Exhibit C 1 -17, # 3 Exhibit 18 - 35) (dm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 100 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 120 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Sealed Opposed Motion to Strike Report and Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert, W. Amon Burton Jr. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 103 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to W. Christian Hoyer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mc2, ) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Proposed Findings of Fact by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc. DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING. (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Witness List by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc. DEFENDANTS' LIST OF WITNESSES TO TESTIFY BY DEPOSITION AT CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING. (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Witness List by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc. DEFENDANTS' WITNESS LIST FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING. (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Exhibit List DEFENDANTS' EXHIBIT LIST FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc... (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Linda S. Mullenix by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit a)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc., re 103 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Courtland Walker, re 42 plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Plaintiff's Amended Motion For Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Cohen, Jonathan) Modified on 9/16/2010 to correct linkage to motion (mc2, ). (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class ( Motion Hearing reset for 9/23/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel.). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mc2, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Christian Hoyer (fee $ 25 receipt number 100007707) on behalf of Courtland Walker. (mc2, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List Plaintiffs Exhibit List For Class Certification Hearing by Courtland Walker.. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Proposed Findings of Fact by Courtland Walker Plaintiffs Proposed Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Witness List by Courtland Walker Plaintiffs List Of Witnesses To Testify By Deposition. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Witness List by Courtland Walker Plaintiffs Witness List For Class Certification Hearing. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Proposed Findings of Fact by Courtland Walker Plaintiffs Proposed Stipulated Facts. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order On Motion to Seal, # 2 Sealed Document Plaintiffs Opposed Motion To Strike Report And Exclude Testimony Of Defendants Expert, W. Amon Burton, Jr, # 3 Proposed Order) (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 101 Order on 100 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document by Daniel H. Gold on behalf of Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc. (Gold, Daniel) Modified on 9/3/2010 to add link (klw, ). (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING 100 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mc2, ) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Sealed Document Exhibit B (1-11) to Opposition to Class Certification, # 3 Sealed Document Exhibit B (12-25) to Opposition to Class Certification, # 4 Sealed Document Exhibit C (1-17) to Opposition to Class Certification, # 5 Sealed Document Exhibit C (18-35) to Opposition to Class Certification) (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc., re 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit D)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 97 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Christopher C. Casper. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jk, ) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher C. Casper (fee $ 25 receipt number 100007454) on behalf of Courtland Walker. (mc2, ) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Plaintiffs Designation Of Rebuttal Class Certification Expert by Courtland Walker re 95 Notice (Other) (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Defendants' Designation of Class Certification Experts by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc. (Rogers, Christopher) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Set Evidentiary Hearing re: 42 Amended MOTION to Certify Class, for 9/23/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Scheduling Order by Courtland Walker, Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Westgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc. (Yanchunis, John) Modified on 7/8/2010 to add filers (mc2, ). (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER dismissing 84 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Westwood College, Inc., Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, 79 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Courtland Walker.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mc2, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING without prejudice to refiling 86 Motion for leave to take additional 30(b)(6) depositions Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mc2, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Pretrial Conference held on 7/6/2010 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(mc2, ) Modified on 8/13/2010 to correct hearing date (mc2, ). (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING 87 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mc2, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART 40 Motion for Protective Order; GRANTING 41 Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART 53 Motion to Compel; GRANTING 80 Motion for Protective Order...to the extent any relief requested in any of the parties' discovery motions has not been explicitly granted herein, it is DENIED.... Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (jg3, ) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Sealed Document Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Proposed Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Sealed Document Exhibit A to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 5 Sealed Document Exhibit B to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 6 Sealed Document Exhibit C to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 7 Sealed Document Exhibit D to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 8 Sealed Document Exhibit E to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 9 Sealed Document Exhib it F to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 10 Sealed Document Exhibit G to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) (Yanchunis, John) Modified on 7/6/2010 to correct docket event type and seal documents(jk, ). (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take Additional 30(b)(6) Depositions by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc., re 80 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Westwood College, Inc., Defendant Wesgray Corporation, Defendant Alta Colleges, Inc., Defendant TRAV Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit M)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits B-K)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 80 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Westwood College, Inc., Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, 81 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Westwood College, Inc., Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Courtland Walker, re 80 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Westwood College, Inc., Defendant Wesgray Corporation, Defendant Alta Colleges, Inc., Defendant TRAV Corporation (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Sealed Document Exhibits I and J to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order) (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A- Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits B - K)(Gold, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2010: # 3 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibits I & J) (jk, ). (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Estes, Jillian) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to 75 Supplement, Reply in Support of Defendants' Opening Supplemental Brief on Discovery Issues by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Rogers, Christopher) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript filed of Proceedings held on April 30, 2010, Proceedings Transcribed: Motions Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: (512)916-5564. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2010. (Reznik, Lily) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE Plaintiffs Response In Opposition To Defendants Supplemental Brief On Discovery Issues to 75 Supplement, by Courtland Walker. (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT Defendants' Opening Supplemental Brief on Discovery Issues by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix, Part 1, # 2 Appendix Appendix, Part 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Christopher) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Motion Hearing held on 4/30/2010 re 40 MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Scope of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Courtland Walker; 53 MOTION to Compel filed by Westwood College, Inc., Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation; 41 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas For The Depositions Of Jessica Mackenzie And Laurie Mackenzie And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law filed by Courtland Walker (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter ERO.)(mm5, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 71 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (mm5, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 69 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (mm5, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Sealed Document Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Protective Order) (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Courtland Walker, re 40 MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Scope of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker Plaintiff's REDACTED Reply (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Sealed Document Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Compel) (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Courtland Walker, re 53 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant Westwood College, Inc., Defendant Wesgray Corporation, Defendant Alta Colleges, Inc., Defendant TRAV Corporation Plaintiff's REDACTED Response to Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 67 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED (Unredacted) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Courtland Walker, re 53 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant Westwood College, Inc., Defendant Wesgray Corporation, Defendant Alta Colleges, Inc., Defendant TRAV Corporation Plaintiffs Response To Defendants Motion To Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) Modified on 4/30/2010 to restrict access (mm5, ). Modified on 7/6/2010 (jk, ). (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Courtland Walker, re 41 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas For The Depositions Of Jessica Mackenzie And Laurie Mackenzie And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker Plaintiffs Reply To Opposition To Motion To Quash The Depositions Of Jessica Mackenzie And Laurie Mackenzie (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 65 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED (Unredacted) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Courtland Walker, re 40 MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Scope of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker Plaintiffs Reply To Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Protective Order To Limit Scope Of Discovery (Yanchunis, John) Modified on 4/30/2010 to restrict access (mm5, ). Modified on 7/6/2010 (jk, ). (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 57 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (mm5, ) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 40 MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Scope of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law; 41 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas For The Depositions Of Jessica Mackenzie And Laurie Mackenzie And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law; and 53 MOTION to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (mm5, ) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to 59 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Daniel H. Gold: re 59 Response in Opposition to Motion, (td) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc., re 58 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply OPPOSED EXPEDITED Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply OPPOSED EXPEDITED Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Estes, Jillian) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines to Extend Deadline for Opposition to Class Certification by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 53 MOTION to Compel filed by Westwood College, Inc., Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, 51 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Westwood College, Inc., Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to 51 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 51 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (mm5, ) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc., re 41 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas For The Depositions Of Jessica Mackenzie And Laurie Mackenzie And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Sealed Opposition Portions, # 2 Sealed Document Sealed Appendix Portions) (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc., re 40 MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Scope of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Courtland Walker Redacted Version (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibits A-G, # 2 Appendix Exhibit H, # 3 Appendix Exhibits I-M, # 4 Appendix Exhibits N-S)(Gold, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2010: # 5 Sealed Document Sealed Portions of Opposition, # 6 Sealed Document Sealed portions of Appendix) (jk, ). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole C. Mayer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: 40 MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Scope of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Courtland Walker; and 41 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas For The Depositions Of Jessica Mackenzie And Laurie Mackenzie And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law filed by Courtland Walker. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (mm5, ) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint by Westwood College, Inc..(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint by Wesgray Corporation.(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint by TRAV Corporation.(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint by Alta Colleges, Inc..(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole C. Mayer (Filing fee $ 25.00; receipt number 100006045) on behalf of Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mm5, ) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION to Certify Class by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas For The Depositions Of Jessica Mackenzie And Laurie Mackenzie And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Proposed Order First Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Order Second Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Scope of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc. amending, filed by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D)(Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2010 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2010 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Courtland Walker, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint Proposed Scheduling Order) by Alta Colleges, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Courtland Walker, Wesgray Corporation, Westwood College, Inc.. (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING IN PART 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (mm5, ) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 25 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Certify, filed by Westwood College, Inc., Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc., RAV Corporation. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (mm5, ) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Westwood College, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc., re 25 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Certify ClassOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendant Westwood College, Inc., Defendant Wesgray Corporation, Defendant Alta Colleges, Inc., Defendant TRAV Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Westwood College, Inc..(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Wesgray Corporation.(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by TRAV Corporation.(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Alta Colleges, Inc..(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Courtland Walker, re 25 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Certify ClassOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendant Westwood College, Inc., Defendant Wesgray Corporation, Defendant Alta Colleges, Inc., Defendant TRAV Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Extension of Time, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION to Certify Class by Westwood College, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Certify Class by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Courtland Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Westwood College, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc., re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Westwood College, Inc., Defendant Wesgray Corporation, Defendant Alta Colleges, Inc., Defendant TRAV Corporation (Gold, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Courtland Walker, re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Westwood College, Inc., Defendant Wesgray Corporation, Defendant Alta Colleges, Inc., Defendant TRAV Corporation Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E)(Estes, Jillian) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan B. Cohen. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm, ) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan B. Cohen (Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 428103) on behalf of Courtland Walker. (jk, ) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John A. Yanchunis. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John A. Yanchunis (Filing fee $ 25.00; receipt number 100004790) on behalf of Courtland Walker. (mm5, ) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Compliance with Order [Doc. # 5] by Westwood College, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(McNeil, Barry) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jillian Levy Estes. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stacy L. Brainin. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel H. Gold. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Rogers. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (mm5, ) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jillian L. Estes (Filing fee $ 25.00; receipt number 100004776)on behalf of Courtland Walker. (mm5, ) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Westwood College, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc.. (McNeil, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss by Westwood College, Inc., TRAV Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix of Authorities)(McNeil, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/Correspondence to counsel John Yanchunis, Jillian Estes, and Jonathan Cohen regarding non-admission status. (tdk, ) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that the removing parties supplement the record with state court filings. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (tdk, ) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel H. Gold ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 100004676) by on behalf of Westwood College, Inc., Trav Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and receipt)(tdk, ) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stacy L. Brainin ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 100004675) by on behalf of Westwood College, Inc., Trav Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and receipt)(tdk, ) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Rogers ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 100004677) by on behalf of Westwood College, Inc., Trav Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and receipt)(tdk, ) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $350 receipt number 100004674), filed by Westwood College, Inc., Trav Corporation, Wesgray Corporation, Alta Colleges, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Original Petition, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, Supplement to civil cover sheet, and receipt)(tdk, ) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 723 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?