Kumar v. Shinseki
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 5:10-cv-00738
District Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 8:45 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arvind Kumar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ricky J. Poole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricky James Poole +1 210 525 7988 +1 210 525 7987 rpoole@alamocityattorney.com
v.
No Logo Eric K. Shinseki, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259 jared.bennett@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Alyson A. Berg +1 559 497 4000 +1 559 497 4099 alyson.berg@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Bradley M. Bole +1 407 648 7514 +1 407 648 7588 bradley.bole@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Brigham John Bowen +1 202 514 6289 +1 202 616 8470 Brigham.Bowen@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Steven Yale Bressler +1 202 305 0167 +1 202 616 8470 steven.bressler@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Jennifer Waugh Corinis +1 813 301 3082 +1 813 274 6200 jennifer.corinis@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Lynn Trinka Ernce +1 916 554 2720 +1 916 554 2900 lynn.trinka.ernce@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Christopher Randall Hall +1 202 514 4778 +1 202 616 8202 christopher.hall@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Kimberly Lynn Herb +1 202 305 8356 +1 202 616 8470 kimberly.l.herb@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Nicholas P. Llewellyn +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 2777 nicholas.llewellyn@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Jeffrey E. Nelson +1 801 325 3250 Jeff.Nelson@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Tomoko Onozawa +1 212 637 2721 +1 212 637 2686 tomoko.onozawa@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Scott H. Park +1 407 648 7500 +1 407 648 7588 scott.park@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Yohance Asim Pettis +1 813 274 6000 +1 813 274 6200 yohance.pettis@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Joseph Cuauhtemoc Rodriguez +1 210 384 7305 +1 210 384 7312 joe.rodriguez@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Shaw-Meadow +1 210 384 7355 +1 210 384 7312 rob.shaw-meadow@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Erik Kenneth Stegeby +1 202 616 4119 +1 813 274 6200 kenneth.stegeby@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Wesley D. Wedemeyer +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 2777 wesley.wedemeyer@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Angela Givens Williams +1 601 973 2822 Angela.Williams3@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Veterans Administration

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Elizabeth J. Martin +1 314 845 5050 +1 314 845 5057 elizabeth.martin4@va.gov
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 0794
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 4/10/2012 1:00PM before Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth. Jury Trial set for 4/10/2012 1:00 PM before Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth. Discovery due by 1/31/2012. Motions due by 2/10/2012.. Signed by Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth. (rf) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Harry Lee Hudspeth for all proceedings. Chief Judge Fred Biery no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (rf) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
      FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Eric K. Shinseki. (rf) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (rf) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
          WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by Eric K. Shinseki Defendant's Designations. (Shaw-Meadow, Robert) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
            Exhibit List Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibit List by Arvind Kumar.. (Poole, Ricky) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
              DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Arvind Kumar. (Poole, Ricky) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                Witness List by Arvind Kumar Designation of Potential Witnesses. (Poole, Ricky) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Vacation by Eric K. Shinseki (Shaw-Meadow, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's First Amended Answer by Eric K. Shinseki. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Amended Answer)(Shaw-Meadow, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Arvind Kumar. (Poole, Ricky) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Eric K. Shinseki. (Shaw-Meadow, Robert) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Fred Biery: Pretrial Conference held on 5/11/2011 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Chris Poage.)(rf) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                            ADR Report Filed - Joint by Eric K. Shinseki, Arvind Kumar(Shaw-Meadow, Robert) Modified on 5/2/2011, to add filer (rf). (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (rf) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER:( ADR Report Deadline due by 5/2/2011., Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2011., Discovery due by 1/27/2012., Motions due by 2/29/2012.), Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (rf ) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Status Conference set for 5/11/2011 8:30 AM before Chief Judge Fred Biery.). Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (rf) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                    Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Parties Proposed Discovery Plan and Rule 26(f) Report by Eric K. Shinseki and Arvind Kumar. (Shaw-Meadow, Robert) Modified on 4/8/2011 to add plaintiff as a filer (ga). (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (rf) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Eric K. Shinseki.(Shaw-Meadow, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE by Arvind Kumar to Show Cause Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Poole Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order Order)(Poole, Ricky) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arvind Kumar. Eric K. Shinseki (U.S. Atty) served on 12/29/2010, answer due 2/28/2011. (Poole, Ricky) Modified on 1/4/2011, to edit text (rf). (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Arvind Kumar. Show Cause Response due by 1/10/2011.. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (rf) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Summons Issued as to Eric K. Shinseki, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kh2) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                  COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 500008794) filed by Arvind Kumar. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and receipt)(rf) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?