Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Hynix Semiconductor Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-01145
District Judge Richard A Jones, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 7:29 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Intellectual Ventures, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Intellectual Ventures I LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Black Lowe & Graham, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen M. Bierman +1 206 381 3300 +1 206 381 3301 bierman@lowegrahamjones.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence D Graham +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 graham@blacklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin W. Hattenbach +1 310 277 1010 bhattenbach@irell.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian David Ledahl +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 bledahl@irell.com
No Logo Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Black Lowe & Graham, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen M. Bierman +1 206 381 3300 +1 206 381 3301 bierman@lowegrahamjones.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence D Graham +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 graham@blacklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin W. Hattenbach +1 310 277 1010 bhattenbach@irell.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian David Ledahl +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 bledahl@irell.com
v.
Acer America Corporation Acer America Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Acer America Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Lootens Chyz +1 206 623 1745 +1623778 +16 623 7789 llc@hcmp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis David Peterson +1 206 623 1745 +1623778 +16 623 7789 ldp@hcmp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Wu +1 206 623 1745 amw@hcmp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Robert Kaufman +1 404 815 6500
No Logo Acer Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Lootens Chyz +1 206 623 1745 +1623778 +16 623 7789 llc@hcmp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis David Peterson +1 206 623 1745 +1623778 +16 623 7789 ldp@hcmp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Wu +1 206 623 1745 amw@hcmp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Robert Kaufman +1 404 815 6500
No Logo Adata Technology (U.S.A.) Co., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
No Logo A-data Technology Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Adata Technology Co., Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
No Logo Asus Computer International Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
No Logo Asustek Computer, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
Best Buy Company, Inc. Best Buy Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Best Buy Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by AIKEN, ST LOUIS & SILJEG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Philip Hansen +1 206 624 2650 +1624659 +16 624 6595 hansen@aiken.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
Dell, Inc. Dell, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Perot Systems Corp
Unknown Role, Quest Software, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
No Logo Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Lootens Chyz +1 206 623 1745 +1623778 +16 623 7789 llc@hcmp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis David Peterson +1 206 623 1745 +1623778 +16 623 7789 ldp@hcmp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Wu +1 206 623 1745 amw@hcmp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George E Badenoch +1 212 908 6185 gbadenoch@kenyon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G Berkowitz +1 212 425 7200 mberkowitz@kenyon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Cordero Prey +1 212 425 6408 +1 212 425 5288 RCordero@kenyon.com
No Logo Elpida Memory, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie Lootens Chyz +1 206 623 1745 +1623778 +16 623 7789 llc@hcmp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis David Peterson +1 206 623 1745 +1623778 +16 623 7789 ldp@hcmp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M. Wu +1 206 623 1745 amw@hcmp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George E Badenoch +1 212 908 6185 gbadenoch@kenyon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G Berkowitz +1 212 425 7200 mberkowitz@kenyon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Cordero Prey +1 212 425 6408 +1 212 425 5288 RCordero@kenyon.com
Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
No Logo Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
No Logo Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
Kingston Technology Company, Inc. Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Kingston Technology Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
No Logo Logitech International S.a., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
No Logo Logitech, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore J. Angelis +1 206 370 8101 +1 206 623 7022 theo.angelis@klgates.com
No Logo Nanya Techonology Corporation, USA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSON YOUNG PUTRA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Todaro +1 206 624 6800 +1 206 682 1415 todaro@pypfirm.com
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Green Dot Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Darby & Darby PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David K Tellekson +1 206 262 8900 +1 206 262 8901 dtellekson@darbylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L Jacobson +1 206 389 4510 rjacobson@fenwick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Ware +1 206 389 4531 +1 206 389 4511 jware@fenwick.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
REPORT/AO120 and the parties' Notice of Voluntary dismissal, docket 60 on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (CL) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Adata Technology (U.S.A.) Co., Ltd., Adata Technology Co., Ltd., Asus Computer International Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Dell, Inc., Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Kingston Technology Co., Inc., Logitech International S.A., Logitech, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Acer America Corp. and Acer, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Bankruptcy Court Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 1504, 1515, 1517, 1520, and 1521 Recognizing Foreign Representatives and Foreign Main Proceeding ; filed by Defendants Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attached Order)(Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Bankruptcy Court Order Granting Provisional Relief to Elipida Memory, Inc. ; filed by Defendants Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Order)(Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Nanya Techonology Corporation, USA, filed by Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court directs the clerk to TERMINATE Pantech Co., Ltd. and Pantech Wireless, Inc. as parties. The court GRANTS the motion to stay. Dkt. # 54 . (CL) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Pantech Co., Ltd. and Pantech Wireless, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                REPLY, filed by Defendants Acer America Corp., Acer, Inc., Adata Technology (U.S.A.) Co., Ltd., Adata Technology Co., Ltd., Asus Computer International Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Dell, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Kingston Technology Co., Inc., Logitech International S.A., Logitech, Inc., TO RESPONSE to 54 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) DefendantsJoint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) DefendantsJoint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) Defendants (Angelis, Theodore) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Amended Complaint by parties re 26 Amended Complaint,. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                    PRAECIPE to attach document (Notice of Appearance) of David K. Tellekson, Robert L. Jacobson, and Jeffrey A. Ware re 58 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Jacobson, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC, to 54 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) DefendantsJoint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) DefendantsJoint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) Defendants. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Joinder JOINING 54 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) DefendantsJoint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) DefendantsJoint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) Defendants, by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Jacobson, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert L Jacobson on behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Jacobson, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Joinder JOINING 54 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) DefendantsJoint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) DefendantsJoint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) Defendants, by Defendant Nanya Techonology Corporation, USA. (Cronin, William) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William F Cronin on behalf of Defendant Nanya Techonology Corporation, USA. (Cronin, William) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Theodore J. Angelis filed by Defendants Acer America Corp., Acer, Inc., Adata Technology (U.S.A.) Co., Ltd., Adata Technology Co., Ltd., Asus Computer International Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Dell, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Kingston Technology Co., Inc., Logitech International S.A., Logitech, Inc. re 54 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) DefendantsJoint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) DefendantsJoint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) Defendants (Angelis, Theodore) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Final Resolution of ITC Investigation for (Certain) Defendants by Defendants Acer America Corp., Acer, Inc., Adata Technology (U.S.A.) Co., Ltd., Adata Technology Co., Ltd., Asus Computer International Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Dell, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hynix Semiconductor America Inc., Hynix Semiconductor Inc., Kingston Technology Co., Inc., Logitech International S.A., Logitech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/7/2011, (Angelis, Theodore) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER by Richard A. Jones, United States District Judge. A court order is not necessary, but the court nonetheless GRANTS the stipulation (Dkt. # 52) to extend the answer deadline, and also GRANTS the stipulation insofar as it regards certain Defendants accepting service of the summons and the original and amended complaint and waiving any defense based on insufficient process or insufficient service of process. (CL) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING FOR DEFENDANTS NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION AND NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, USA by parties. (Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                        ORDER re 46 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Christopher M Scott for Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., and Elpida Memory, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) (CL) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                          ORDER re 45 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Rose Cordero Prey for dfts Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., and Elpida Memory, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) (CL) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                            ORDER re 44 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Thomas R Makin for dfts Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., and Elpida Memory, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) (CL) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                              ORDER re 43 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Matthew G Berkowitz for dfts Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., and Elpida Memory, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) (CL) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                ORDER re 42 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS George E Badenoch for dfts Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., and Elpida Memory, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher M. Scott FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2554850. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rose Cordero Prey FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2554846. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas R. Makin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2554838. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew G. Berkowitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2554835. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY George E. Badenoch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2554830. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by parties. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to seal, docket no. 14 . The statements (Dkt. # 16 ) shall remain under seal. (CL) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION Continuing Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading, Acceptance of Service, and Waiver of Certain Defenses for Defendants Elpida Memory, Inc. and Elpida Memory (USA) Inc. by parties. (Peterson, Louis) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION Continuing Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading, Acceptance of Service, and Waiver of Certain Defenses by parties. (Angelis, Theodore) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Amended Complaint by parties re 26 Amended Complaint,. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Responsive Pleading to Amended Complaint by parties. (Hansen, David) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        ORDER re 34 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Craig R. Kaufman for Acer America Corp. and for Acer, Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Craig R. Kaufman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Acer America Corp., Acer, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2533462. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Acer, Inc. for Acer America Corp.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Summons Issued electronically sent to attorney as to defendant(s) Nanya Techonology Corporation, USA. (MD) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Summons Issued electronically sent to attorney as to defendant(s) Nanya Techonology Corporation, USA. (MD) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Nanya Techology Corporation and Nanya Technology Corporation USA by Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Laurie Lootens Chyz on behalf of Defendants Acer America Corp., Acer, Inc.. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Laurie Lootens Chyz on behalf of Defendants Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc.. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge Pechman recuses herself in the above- titled action and this case is reassigned in rotation to the Honorable Richard A. Jones, United States District Judge. The cause number in this case is changed to C11-1145RAJ which reflects the initial of the Judge to which this case was reassigned, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Elpida Memory, Inc. for Elpida Memory (USA) Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Robert S. Lasnik recused. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. (KERR) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc. re 20 Notice of Appearance. (Hansen, David) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Philip Hansen on behalf of Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Hansen, David) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Laurie Lootens Chyz on behalf of Defendants Acer America Corp., Acer, Inc., Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc.. (Chyz, Laurie) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re Responsive Pleadings by parties. (Hansen, David) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ellen M Bierman on behalf of Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Bierman, Ellen) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT Federal Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC re 14 MOTION to Seal Federal Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Joseph F. Chernesky filed by Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC re 14 MOTION to Seal Federal Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Federal Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/29/2011, (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ORDER re 8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gunnar B. Gundersen for Intellectual Ventures I LLC, and for Intellectual Ventures II LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ORDER re 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ellisen S. Turner for Intellectual Ventures I LLC, and for Intellectual Ventures II LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elliot N. Brown for Intellectual Ventures I LLC, and for Intellectual Ventures II LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin W. Hattenbach for Intellectual Ventures I LLC, and for Intellectual Ventures II LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian D. Ledahl for Intellectual Ventures I LLC, and for Intellectual Ventures II LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gunnar B. Gundersen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2490808. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ellisen S. Turner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2490798. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elliot N. Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2490785. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin W. Hattenbach FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2490776. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian H. Ledahl FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2490771. (Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A PATENT provided via ad hoc notice to the Patent Office(MKB) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to defendant all Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons, # 17 Summons)(MKB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2011: # 18 Summons) (MKB). (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-2488778), filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120), # 8 Summons Acer America Corp., # 9 Summons Acer Inc., # 10 Summons Asustek Computer Inc., # 11 Summons Asus Computer International Inc., # 12 Summons ADATA Technology Co., Ltd., # 13 Summons ADATA Technology (U.S.A.) Co., Ltd., # 14 Summons Best Buy Corp., # 15 Summons Dell, Inc., # 16 Summons Elpida Memory Inc., # 17 Summons Elpida Memory (USA) Inc., # 18 Summons Hewlett-Packard Company, # 19 Summons Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc., # 20 Summons Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., # 21 Summons Kingston Technology Co., Inc., # 22 Summons Logitech, Inc., # 23 Summons Logitech International S.A., # 24 Summons Pantech Co., Ltd., # 25 Summons Pantech Wireless, Inc., # 26 Summons Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.)(Graham, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 358 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?