Ellingwood v. Bank of the West
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-01773
District Judge John C. Coughenour, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 2:44 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Judge Eve Ellingwood, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judge Eve Ellingwood +1 702 782 1306 eejudgeeve79@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Abigail Lubliner, Defendant
No Logo AIG, Defendant
No Logo Alan Blumenthal, Defendant
Greenspan, Alan Greenspan, Alan, Defendant
Officially listed as "Alan Greenspan"
No Logo American Contractors Indemnity Company, Defendant
No Logo Arnold Schwazenegger, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Gallagher Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Attorney William Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo Bank of the West, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo Batya Lubliner, Defendant
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ben Bernanke"
No Logo Bessemer Trust, Defendant
No Logo Brown Brothers Harriman 7 & Co, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn Diddel, Defendant
No Logo Catherine Cortez Masto, Defendant
No Logo Chabd of Southern Nevada, Defendant
No Logo Chubb Insurance Co., Defendant
Officially listed as "Chubb Insurance Company"
Citigroup Management Corporation Citigroup Management Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Citibank"
No Logo City Of Beverly Hills, Defendant
No Logo City Of Las Vegas, Defendant
No Logo Community Foundation of Broward County, Defendant
No Logo Congresswoman Nancy Pelosi, Defendant
No Logo Country of Israel, Defendant
No Logo Don Close, Defendant
No Logo Donald Soffer, Defendant
No Logo Dr David Trylovich, Defendant
No Logo Dr Pedro Rubio, Defendant
No Logo Dr Robert Detje, Defendant
No Logo Dr Robert Earl, Defendant
No Logo Dr Terry Pfau, Defendant
No Logo Dr. James Fabe, Defendant
No Logo Estelle Lubliner, Defendant
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Defendant
Officially listed as "Federal Reserve Board"
No Logo Gary Lubliner, Defendant
No Logo George Soros, Defendant
No Logo Gerry Serino, Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs"
No Logo Governor Jerry Brown, Defendant
No Logo Helen Sternlight Fabe, Defendant
No Logo Herb Herbert Fry, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Soffer, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Greenberg, Defendant
No Logo John Diddel, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Sternlight, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "JP Morgan"
No Logo Judy Franklin, Defendant
No Logo Larry Hillis, Defendant
No Logo Las Vegas Citizens Review Board, Defendant
No Logo Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Lord Jacob Rothschild, Defendant
No Logo Los Angeles County Probation Department, Defendant
No Logo M Rothschild, Defendant
No Logo Marilyn Stuart, Defendant
No Logo Mary Roy, Defendant
No Logo McFadden Insurance Agency, Defendant
No Logo Michael Schulman, Defendant
No Logo Michelle Obama, Defendant
No Logo Nevada State Board of Dental Examiners, Defendant
No Logo Penny Detje, Defendant
No Logo Rabbi Shea Harlig, Defendant
No Logo Red Hills Community Association, Defendant
No Logo Richard Govitz, Defendant
No Logo RORY REID, Defendant
No Logo Ruth Sternlight, Defendant
No Logo Safeco Insurance Company Of America, Defendant
No Logo Senator Harry Reid, Defendant
No Logo Senator Mary Landrieu, Defendant
No Logo Shirley Murray, Defendant
No Logo State of Nevada, Defendant
No Logo Stirling Club, Defendant
No Logo Travelers Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Turnberry Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Turnberry Palace Homeowners Association, Defendant
No Logo Turnberry Place Community Association, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Government"
No Logo University Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo Valerie Jarrett, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (1) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 1 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT against All Defendant(s) (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA 44859), filed by Judge Eve Ellingwood. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RE) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
    LREF

    Statistics

    This case has been viewed 114 times.

    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
    Space
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
     
    PlainSite
    Sign Up
    Need Password Help?