RightNow Technologies Inc v. Lodsys LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-00737
District Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 4:02 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rightnow Technologies, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William B. Kircher +1 816 474 5300

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox O'Neill & Shannon SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Hanrahan +1 414 273 3939 +1 414 273 3947 mjhanrahan@foslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Haldiman +1 314 480 1641 +1 314 480 1505 trademark@huschblackwell.com
v.
No Logo Lodsys, LLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Lodsys Holdings, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A Goldfarb +1 206 223 1600 +1 206 467 0298

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus, Sceales, Starke & Sawall, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron T. Olejniczak +1 414 271 7590 +1 414 271 5770 tmdocketing@andruslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kit W Roth +1 206 389 4522 kroth@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Donion Gill Huck & Goldfarb PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris Huck +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (kah)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by RightNow Technologies Inc. (Hanrahan, Michael)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
      BRIEF in Opposition filed by Lodsys LLC re 36 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss . (Olejniczak, Aaron)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
        Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hanrahan, Michael)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lodsys LLC (re: Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Declaration of Aaron Olejniczak, Proposed Order) (Olejniczak, Aaron)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of Aaron T. Olejniczak (in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer or Stay). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Lodsyss Disclosure of Asserted Claims against Sams West, Inc., # 2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement Contentions against Defendants Brother International Corporation, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement Contentions against Defendants Hewlett Packard Company, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Infringement Contentions against Defendants Hulu, LLC, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Infringement Contentions against Defendants Lexmark International, Inc, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Infringement Contentions against Defendants Novell, Inc, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Infringement Contentions against Defendants Samsung, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Infringement Contentions against Defendants Trend Micro Incorporated, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Lodsyss Infringement Contentions against Sams Club, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Complaint, Case No. 2:12-cv-284, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Complaint, Case No. 2:12-cv-286, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Complaint, Case No. 2:12-cv-287, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Complaint, Case No. 2:12-cv-288, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Complaint, Case No. 2:12-cv-289, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Complaint, Case No. 2:12-cv-290, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Complaint, Case No. 2:12-cv-291, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Opposition to Motion to Stay, Case No. 2:11-CV-283)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
              REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Lodsys LLC re 32 Expedite MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, 21 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer or Stay MOTION to Transfer Case . (Olejniczak, Aaron) Modified on 7/3/2012 (kah).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                Expedite MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                    BRIEF in Opposition filed by RightNow Technologies Inc re 21 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer or Stay MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Hanrahan, Michael)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Fowler on behalf of RightNow Technologies Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark D. Fowler (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fowler, Mark)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Buergi on behalf of RightNow Technologies Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Robert Buergi (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Buergi, Robert)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by David R Knudson on behalf of RightNow Technologies Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: David R. Knudson (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Knudson, David)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by James M Heintz on behalf of RightNow Technologies Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: James M. Heintz (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Heintz, James)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Aaron T Olejniczak (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lodsys LLC (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION of Aaron T. Olejniczak . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2011-06-10 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - 2011-02-11 Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C - 2011-05-31 Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D - 2011-07-21 Complaint, # 5 Exhibit E - 2011-07-05 Complaint, # 6 Exhibit F - 2012-02-01 Order, # 7 Exhibit G - 202-01-31 Motion, # 8 Exhibit H - 2012-05-10 Complaint, # 9 Exhibit I - 2012-05-10 Complaint, # 10 Exhibit J - 2012-05-10 Complaint, # 11 Exhibit K - 2012-05-10 Complaint, # 12 Exhibit L - 2012-05-12 Complaint, # 13 Exhibit M - 2012-05-12 Complaint, # 14 Exhibit N - 2012-05-12 Complaint, # 15 Exhibit O - Sam's screen shot)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                    BRIEF in Support filed by Lodsys LLC re 21 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer or Stay . (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer or Stay by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 5/17/2012 (kah).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lodsys LLC filed by RightNow Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(kah) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                          ORDER Granting Motion for Leave to Amend 13 and Denying as Moot Motion to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement 9 . (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Procedures) (cc: all counsel) ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                            BRIEF in Opposition filed by Lodsys LLC re 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment . (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                              REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Lodsys LLC re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION for More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(e) or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(e). (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lodsys LLC (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                    BRIEF in Opposition filed by RightNow Technologies Inc re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION for More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(e) . (Hanrahan, Michael)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by RightNow Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to Amend, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Second Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Second Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Second Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Second Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Second Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Second Amended Complaint)(Hanrahan, Michael)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed, by RightNow Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanrahan, Michael)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                          DISCLOSURE Statement by Lodsys LLC. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                            BRIEF in Support filed by Lodsys LLC re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION for More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(e). (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), MOTION for More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(e) by Lodsys LLC. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by RightNow Technologies Inc. (Hanrahan, Michael)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by RightNow Technologies Inc. Lodsys LLC served on 8/15/2011, answer due 9/6/2011. (Hanrahan, Michael)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by RightNow Technologies Inc (Hanrahan, Michael)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lodsys LLC filed by RightNow Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 5,999,908, # 2 Exhibit B - US Patent 7,133,834, # 3 Exhibit C - US Patent 7,222,078, # 4 Exhibit D - US Patent 7,620,565, # 5 Exhibit E - Infringement Letter, # 6 Exhibit F - Infringement Claim Chart, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hanrahan, Michael)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (mlm)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            DISCLOSURE Statement by RightNow Technologies, Inc.. (Hanrahan, Michael)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Lodsys, LLC by RightNow Technologies, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $350 receipt number 0757-1341925) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 5,999,908, # 2 Exhibit B - US Patent 7,133,834, # 3 Exhibit C - US Patent 7,222,078, # 4 Exhibit D - US Patent 7,620,565, # 5 Exhibit E - Infringement Letter, # 6 Exhibit F - Infringement Claim Chart, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons)(Hanrahan, Michael)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?