Wolfram Alpha LLC et al v. Lodsys LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-00750
District Judge Lynn Adelman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 4:07 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wolfram Alpha LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradford J. Benjamin +1 312 840 7224 bbradford@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall O'Toole Gerstein Murray and Borun

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford P Lyerla +1 312 474 9556 +1 312 474 0448 blyerla@marshallip.com
No Logo Wolfram Research, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradford J. Benjamin +1 312 840 7224 bbradford@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall O'Toole Gerstein Murray and Borun

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford P Lyerla +1 312 474 9556 +1 312 474 0448 blyerla@marshallip.com
v.
No Logo Lodsys, LLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Lodsys Holdings, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus, Sceales, Starke & Sawall, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron T. Olejniczak +1 414 271 7590 +1 414 271 5770 tmdocketing@andruslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Donion Gill Huck & Goldfarb PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris Huck +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Goldfarb Gill Huck & Roth PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Goldfarb +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 goldfarb@kdg-law.com
Space Christopher M. Huck +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 huck@kdg-law.com
Space Kit W Roth +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 roth@kdg-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/15/12 granting 30 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice and without costs. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Lodsys Group LLC, Lodsys LLC, Wolfram Alpha LLC, Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyerla, Bradford)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Aaron T Olejniczak (Olejniczak, Aaron)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
        REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Lodsys Group LLC, Lodsys LLC re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(1) . (Olejniczak, Aaron)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
          BRIEF in Opposition filed by Wolfram Alpha LLC, Wolfram Research Inc re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(1) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E (1-7), # 6 Exhibit F)(Lyerla, Bradford)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/15/12 granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time. Wolfram's response to defendants' motion to dismiss due 5/16/12. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants Lodsys, LLC's and Lodsys Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) by Wolfram Alpha LLC, Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyerla, Bradford)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                BRIEF in Support filed by Lodsys Group LLC, Lodsys LLC re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(1) . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(1) by Lodsys Group LLC, Lodsys LLC. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wolfram Alpha LLC, Wolfram Research Inc. Lodsys Group LLC served on 4/19/2012, answer due 5/10/2012. (Lyerla, Bradford)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                      REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Lyerla, Bradford)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/19/12 granting 19 Motion to Withdraw Motion. Defendants' answer to Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment due 4/23/12. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Withdraw Motion and for Extension of Time by Lodsys Group LLC, Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Lodsys LLC, Lodsys Group, LLC filed by Wolfram Alpha LLC, Wolfram Research Inc.(Lyerla, Bradford)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/8/12 granting 16 Motion for Leave to File. Wolfram's amended complaint due within 10 days of this order (cc: all counsel) (dm)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Wolfram Alpha LLC, Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyerla, Bradford)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Reply Brief in Support of Motion
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Response to Motion
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Order
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Stipulation
                                        STIPULATION / Second Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Lodsys, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) by Lodsys LLC, Wolfram Alpha LLC, Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lyerla, Bradford)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Order Approving StipulationCourt Filing
                                          ORDER Approving 10 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs Response to Defendant Lodsys, LCC's Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1). The deadline which Wolfram must respond to Lodsys' Motion To Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) is extended to and including 12/2/2011. Signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/24/2011. (cc: all counsel)(nts)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 Stipulation
                                            STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Lodsys, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) (joint) by Lodsys LLC, Wolfram Alpha LLC, Wolfram Research Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lyerla, Bradford)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                              DISCLOSURE Statement by Lodsys LLC. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                BRIEF in Support filed by Lodsys LLC re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1). (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) by Lodsys LLC. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: 9/20/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J Bradford on behalf of Wolfram Alpha LLC, Wolfram Research Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Benjamin J. Bradford (Bradford, Benjamin)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                      DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Lyerla, Bradford)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                        Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by All Plaintiffs. (Lyerla, Bradford)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lodsys LLC waiver sent on 8/9/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (Lyerla, Bradford)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: 8/9/2011 Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner
                                                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (djd)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: 8/9/2011 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Lodsys LLC by Wolfram Alpha LLC, Wolfram Research Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $350 receipt number 0757-1343743) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Lyerla, Bradford)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 190 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?