Alec L. v. Jackson
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-02203
District Judge Edward M. Chen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 4:28 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alec L., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Johnson. Larson & Schaller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer J. Middleton +1 541 683 2506 +1 541 683 3149 jmiddleton@chantilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
No Logo Garrett S., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
No Logo Grant, S., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
No Logo Janet Wallace, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
No Logo Kids vs. Global Warming, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
No Logo Madeline W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
No Logo Nina Grove, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
No Logo Valerie Serrels, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
No Logo Victoria Loorz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
No Logo WildEarth Guardians, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
No Logo Zoe J., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Olsen +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061
v.
No Logo Gary F. Locke, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kenneth L. Salazar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo Leon E. Panetta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lisa P. Jackson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Secretary of Defense Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo Steven Chu, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo Thomas J. Vilsack, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo Dr. James E. Hansen, Amicus Curiae
No Logo National Association of Manufacturers, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel R Miller +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 smiller@flk.com

Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (141) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
Case electronically transferred to the District of Columbia; new case no. 1:11-cv-02235 (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
    Brief for Amicus Curiae Law Professors - Exhibit A filed byAlec L.. (Middleton, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
      Declaration of Jennifer J. Middleton Amicus Counsel - Exhibit B filed byAlec L.. (Middleton, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
        Proposed Order by Alec L.. (Middleton, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
          MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Alec L.. Responses due by 12/21/2011. Replies due by 12/28/2011. (Middleton, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 131 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 95 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2011 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 12/1/2011) re 95 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Thomas J. Vilsack, Gary F. Locke, Kenneth L. Salazar, Lisa P. Jackson, Leon E. Panetta. Court took matter under submission and will issue order (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/1/2011) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                Notice Regarding Proposed Video Recording of December 15, 2011 Motion Hearing. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/25/2011, Entered: None
                  REPLY (re 97 MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, ) filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/25/2011) (Entered: 11/25/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                    REPLY (re 95 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) ) filed bySteven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTIFICATION OF REQUEST TO VIDEO RECORD December 15, 2011 Motion Hearing as part of Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 1, 2011, all parties must complete the attached Party Response to Request for Video Recording and email it to cameras@cand.uscourts.gov.(Attachments: # 1 Party Response to Request for Video Recording) (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                        REPLY (re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 123 filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Gregg, Ragu-Jara) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                          REPLY (re 64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim ) filed bySteven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/21/2011) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                            *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 125 . *** REPLY (re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Gregg, Ragu-Jara) (Filed on 11/21/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                              REPLY (re 65 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Gregg, Ragu-Jara) (Filed on 11/21/2011) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                Proposed Order re 118 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/18/2011) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                  Declaration of Victoria Loorz in Support of 118 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/18/2011) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                    Declaration of Julia A. Olson in Support of 118 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/18/2011) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE (re 95 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) ) in Opposition filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/18/2011) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                        STATEMENT in Support re 95 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Gregg, Ragu-Jara) (Filed on 11/18/2011) Modified on 11/21/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 114 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Galpern) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James E. Hansen re 107 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                              MOTION of Daniel Galpern for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611066953) filed by James E. Hansen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Hanson (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE (re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Corrected Filing filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Declaration of Daniel Galpern in Support of 107 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed byJames Hanson. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Proposed Order re 107 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief by James Hanson. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                        EXHIBITS re 108 Exhibits Exhibit 1 to Proposed Brief Amicus Curiae filed byJames Hanson. (Related document(s) 108 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                          EXHIBITS re 107 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed byJames Hanson. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by James Hanson. Responses due by 11/28/2011. Replies due by 12/5/2011. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE (re 64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim ) in Opposition filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE (re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) in Opposition filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Declaration of Julia A. Olson in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 100 Reply to Opposition/Response, Second Declaration filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 24 , 100 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Declaration of Julia A. Olson in Support of 102 Opposition/Response to Motion, to NAM's Motion to Intervene filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 102 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE (re 65 MOTION to Intervene ) by NAM filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Intervention)(Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Declaration of Pushker Kharecha, Ph.D. in Support of 100 Reply to Opposition/Response, 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Supplemental filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 100 , 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY (re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE (re 97 MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, ) Proposed Intervenor-Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike, or, in the Alternative, Administrative Motion to Allow Filing of the NAM's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion and to Set Date for Plaintiffs' Reply Brief filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/10/2011) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Partially Granting Defendants' 96 Motion for Administrative Relief and Setting Hearing Date for Defendants' 95 Motion to Transfer and Resetting Hearing Dates for (1) Plaintiffs' 24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; (2) Defendants' 64 Motion to Dismiss; (3) Intervenor's 65 Motion to Intervene; (4) Intervenor's 67 Motion to Dismiss; and (5) Plaintiffs' 97 Motion to Strike. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, filed by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/18/2011. Replies due by 11/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julia A. Olson, # 2 Proposed Order)(Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Shorten Time and for Administrative Relief to Set Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue for Novemeber 28, 2011 filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/18/2011. Replies due by 11/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER re 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Buente) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066440.) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Sorenson) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Mongaven) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 77 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Martella) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Guerra) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 75 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Gregg) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Filed in error (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 68 Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief and Setting (1) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (2) Intervenor's Motion to Intervene, and (3) Intervenor's Motion to Dismiss for Same Time as Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motions set for Hearing on 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/3/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Proposed Order
                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, Denying Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Association of Manufacturers. (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/2/2011) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                          Declaration of Steven Messner in Support of 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, The National Association of Manufacturers Motion to Intervene and Opposition to Plaintiffs; Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/2/2011) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                            Declaration of W. David Montgomery, PhD in Support of 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, The National Association of Manufacturers Motion to Intervene and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/2/2011) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                              Declaration of William J. Warren-Hicks, PhD in Support of 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, The National Association of Manufacturers' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/2/2011) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Proposed Intervenor's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/2/2011) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Association of Manufacturers re 75 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 76 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    MOTION of Quin M. Sorenson for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 334611066446) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      MOTION of Karen K. Mongoven for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066447) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        MOTION of Roger R. Martella, Jr. for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066444) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                          MOTION of Joseph R. Guerra for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066445) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                            MOTION of Ragu-Jara Gregg for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066442) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                              MOTION of David T. Buente, Jr. for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066440) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting Defendants' 64 Motion To Dismiss by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/1/2011) Modified on 11/2/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Granting Defendants' 68 Motion For Administrative Relief To Set Hearing Date On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Same Date As Hearing On Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/1/2011) Modified on 11/2/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed bySteven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by National Association of Manufacturers Corporate Disclosure Statement (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by National Association of Manufacturers (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Shorten Time and to Set Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Same Day as Hearing on Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion -- Administrative Relief Sought filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by National Association of Manufacturers. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Dr. Chad Moutray in Support of 65 MOTION to Intervene filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Related document(s) 65 ) (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene filed by National Association of Manufacturers. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/21/2011. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2011) Modified on 11/1/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 4(m) (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: 10/13/2011 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER on Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 10/31/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: 10/12/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Attorney General served on 10/7/11. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: 10/12/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. U.S. Attorney served on 10/7/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: 10/12/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Steven Chu served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011; Lisa P. Jackson served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011; Gary F. Locke served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011; Leon E. Panetta served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011; Kenneth L. Salazar served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011; Thomas J. Vilsack served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: 10/12/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Steven Chu, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/12/2011) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians of Curing Service on Defendants Pursuant to Rule 4(i)(4)(B) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 10/11/2011) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) ) filed bySteven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/7/2011) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Beers Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney pro hac vice)(Beers, Thomas) (Filed on 10/7/2011) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: 10/4/2011 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Beers) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT A of the 42 Declaration of Alec Loorz in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 , 42 , 43 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 46 Declaration in Support,, Julia A. Olson, Exhibit N filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Steven W. Running, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 46 Declaration in Support,, Julia A. Olson, Exhibit M filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 46 Declaration in Support,, Julia A. Olson, Exhibit L filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 46 Declaration in Support,, Julia A. Olson filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Julia A. Olson in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Arjun Makhijani, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Camille Parmesan, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 42 Declaration in Support, Alec Loorz filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Alec Loorz in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Lise Van Susteren, M.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Kevin E. Trenberth, Sc.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of James Gustave Speth in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Sivan Kartha, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Stefan Rahmstorf, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jonathan Overpeck, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Madeleine MacGillivray Wallace in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of David B. Lobell, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Pushker Kharecha, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Nelson Kanuk in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Zoe Johnson in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jaime Lynn Butler in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Ove Hoegh-Guldberg, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Grant Serrels in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Garrett Serrels in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Paul Epstein, M.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/12/2011. Replies due by 10/19/2011. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION of Thomas J. Beers for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064990) filed by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Steven Chu served on 8/4/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Kenneth L. Salazar served on 8/8/2011, answer due 8/29/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Thomas J. Vilsack served on 8/4/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Robert M. Gates served on 8/10/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Lisa P. Jackson served on 8/4/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace . Gary F. Locke served on 8/4/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/29/2011. Replies due by 10/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 9/15/2011) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Application re 12 Case Management Scheduling Order, Motion to Vacate, filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 9/15/2011) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/11/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/11/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: 8/10/2011 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE the court has reviewed the motion for related case and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on August 5, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011 Clerk's Notice of Impending ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 7 Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUANCE OF FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SUBSEQUENTLY A CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINES PURSUANT TO ADR SCHEDULING ORDER by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 8/3/2011) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUANCE OF FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SUBSEQUENTLY A CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINES PURSUANT TO ADR SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 8/3/2011) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: 8/2/2011 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 8/2/2011) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: 8/2/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 8/2/2011) Modified on 8/3/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Steven Chu, Leon E. Panetta, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. Filed by Madeline W., Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S., Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace, Zoe J.. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 7/27/2011) Modified on 7/28/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611059475.) filed byMadeline W., Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S., Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Zoe J., Janet Wallce. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to 95 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a). Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2011 03:45 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to 65 MOTION to Intervene, 64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, 97 MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support,, 67 MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/21/2011. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***Deadlines terminated (10/21 motion hearing #15 reset to 11/21 at 2:00 pm.). (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 179 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?