Hamad v. Gates et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00591
District Judge Marsha J. Pechman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 12:47 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adel Hassan Hamad, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PUBLIC INTEREST LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/06/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hank L Balson +1 206 838 1800 +1 206 838 3330 hbalson@pilg.org
TERMINATED: 03/06/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy S. Chupp +1 206 447 0103 nchupp@pilg.org

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLAMETTE UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW LAW CLINIC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gwynne L Skinner +1 503 370 6140 gskinner@willamette.edu
v.
No Logo Adolph McQueen, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Bantz J. Craddock, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Bruce Vargo, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Daniel K McNeill, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Donald H Rumsfeld, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Esteban Rodriguez, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Geoffrey D. Miller, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Gordon R England, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Gregory J Ihde, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Harry B. Harris, Jr., Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo James M MCGarrah, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo James T Hill, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Jay Hood, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Defendant
No Logo John Doe #2, Defendant
No Logo John Does 3-100, Defendant
No Logo Mark H. Buzby, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Bumgarner, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Glenn Mullen, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Nelson Cannon, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Paul Wolfowitz, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Peter Pace, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Richard Bowman Myers, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Wade, Dennis, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (130) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 131 Filed: 4/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 123 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    MODIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Motions terminated: 128 Stipulated MOTION to Modify Protective Order filed by Daniel K McNeill, Harry B. Harris, Jr., Robert M Gates, James T Hill, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
      Stipulated MOTION to Modify Protective Order by Defendants Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Daniel K McNeill. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/16/12, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 124 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdrawal and Substitute Attorney. Attorney Hank L Balson and Nancy S. Chupp terminated; Attorney Gwynne L. Skinner substituted, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
          REPLY, filed by Defendant Robert M Gates, TO RESPONSE to 123 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Amendment Claim in His Second Amended Complaint (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 125 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
            RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad, to 123 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Amendment Claim in His Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
              MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/24/2012, (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 123 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Amendment Claim in His Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Robert M Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/17/2012, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                  LREF
                  Blank 122 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                  Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Adel Hassan Hamad.(Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                    LREF
                    Blank 121 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS 111 112 . The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend. Any amended complaint must be filed within thirty (30) days of this Order, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 118 Stipulated Motion Staying Discovery, Trial Date, and Related Dates pending outcome of Defendant's Motion to dismiss and th United States Notice of substitution and Motion to dismiss, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Gwynne L Skinner for Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad from March 23, 2012 to March 30, 2012. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                          Joint Stipulated MOTION to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/17/2011, (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 112 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Amendment Claim ; filed by Defendant Robert M Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 116 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                              REPLY, filed by Defendant Robert M Gates, TO RESPONSE to 112 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Amendment Claim (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                LREF
                                Blank 115 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                REPLY, filed by Defendant United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 111 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 114 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad, to 112 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Amendment Claim. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 113 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad, to 111 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Amendment Claim by Defendant Robert M Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/2/2011, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/2/2011, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Substitution of the United States as Sole Defendant on Claims for Relief I-VI ; filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER denying 107 Stipulated Motion for briefing schedule by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *20 day* Jury Trial is set for 7/30/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 8/26/2011, Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2011, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/3/2012, Motions due by 2/1/2012, Discovery completed by 3/2/2012, Dispositive motions due by 4/2/2012, Settlement conference to be held by 5/31/2012, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 6/25/2012, Motions in Limine due by 6/25/2012, Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2012, Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Trial briefs to be submitted by 7/25/2012, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 7/25/2012, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                Stipulated MOTION for a Scheduling Order Regarding Oppositions and Replies to Subsequent Rule 12 Motions by Defendant Robert M Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/28/2011, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER Denying Pltf's 97 Motion to Certify and Denying Pltf's 99 Motion to Stay Proceedings by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(TF) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad, TO RESPONSE to 99 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE, by Defendant Robert M Gates, to 99 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad, TO RESPONSE to 97 MOTION to Certify Orders of Dismissal as Final (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                          RESPONSE, by Defendant Robert M Gates, to 97 MOTION to Certify Orders of Dismissal as Final. (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER Granting 100 the Parties' Stipulated Motion for a Scheduling Order Regarding Subsequent Rule 12 Motions, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (CL) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Stipulated MOTION for a Scheduling Order Regarding Subsequent Rule 12 Motions by Defendant Robert M Gates. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/29/2011, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Skinner Declaration in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal of Issues of Personal Jurisdiction, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal) Noting Date 7/15/2011, (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 96 Plaitiff's Motion for Leave to File amended complaint by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Certify Orders of Dismissal as Final by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/8/2011, (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Gwynne Skinner in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/17/2011, (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS HILL, MCNEILL, AND HARRIS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION re 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, for Transfer, and Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support Thereof. Defendants James T Hill and Daniel K McNeill, Harris terminated, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY, filed by Defendants Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Daniel K McNeill, TO RESPONSE to 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, for Transfer, and Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support Thereof (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 91 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to file a reply brief and for an enlargement of pages by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER - Plaintiff submitted three exhibits which violate the Courts protective order. (Dkt. No. 82.) Plaintiff has since submitted redacted versions of Exhibit C, D, and McNeills Affidavit. (Dkt. No. 88, 89, and 90.) The Court, therefore, ORDERS the clerk to seal the three Exhibits submitted in error under Dkt. No. 86. re: 86 Response to Motion filed by Adel Hassan Hamad by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (documents sealed)(MD) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief and for Enlargement of Pages by Defendants Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Daniel K McNeill. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/22/2011, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  REDACTION to 86 Response to Motion,,,, Exhibit C, McNeill Responses to Interrogs and RPs by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    REDACTION to 86 Response to Motion,,,, Affidavit by Defendant Dan K. McNeill with third page, Affidavit by Defendant James T. Hill by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit by Defendant James T. Hill)(Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      REDACTION to 86 Response to Motion,,,, Affidavit by Defendant Dan K. McNeill, Affidavit by Defendant James T. Hill by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) Modified on 3/18/2011 (ELS). (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        REDACTION to 86 Response to Motion,,, exhibit D,Defendant Vice Admiral Harry B. Harris, Jr.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad, to 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, for Transfer, and Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support Thereof, 77 MOTION Motion for Clarification Regarding November 2, 2010 Order re 74 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Add and Terminate Parties,,,, MOTION Motion for Clarification Regarding November 2, 2010 Order re 74 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Add and Terminate Parties,,,,. (Attachments: # 1SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit Hill Affidavit, # 2SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit McNeill Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Gwynne Skinner, # 4 Exhibit Ex A, Gates Resp. to Interrogs, # 5 Exhibit Ex B, Hill Resp. to Interrogs, # 6SEALED PER COURT ORDER DATED 3/22/11 - Exhibit Ex C, McNeill Resp. to Interrogs and RPs,SEALED DOCUMENT # 7 Exhibit Ex D, Harris Resp. to Interrogs, # 8 Exhibit Ex E, Army Resp. to FOIA Request, # 9 Exhibit Ex F, J.T.Hill Pages from Website)(Skinner, Gwynne) Attachment #7 re-filed as redacted. See document 87 Modified on 3/18/2011 (VB). Modified on 3/18/2011 (ELS). Modified on 3/22/2011 (MD). (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER- Having reviewed the parties joint status report (Dkt. No. 84), the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file its supplemental brief regarding personal jurisdiction within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this Minute Order, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER - The Court ORDERS the parties to submit a joint status report within ten (10) days of this order regarding the status of jurisdictional discovery and whether any motions to dismiss based on jurisdiction should be expected. Upon receipt of the joint status report, the Court will determine an appropriate deadline for filing subsequent motions for preliminary defenses, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RS) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Stipulated MOTION for a Protective Order by Defendants Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Daniel K McNeill, Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/21/2011, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DISCOVERY PLAN Filed by Defendants Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Daniel K McNeill, Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad.(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER - re: 76 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration ; 77 Defendant's Motion for clarification by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2010, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/7/2010, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/14/2010 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) Modified on 11/10/2010 (RM). Docketed in error. (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION Motion for Clarification Regarding November 2, 2010 Order re 74 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Add and Terminate Parties,,,, by Defendants Robert M Gates, James T Hill, Daniel K McNeill. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/8/2010, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re 75 Notice of Corrected Image/Document to Allow Additional Jurisdictional Discovery by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/5/2010, (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 74 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Add and Terminate Parties,,. (Service of corrected image is attached). (MD) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER denying TRANSFER of CASE TO DISTRICT COURT OF DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA - granting in part and denying in part 68 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Nelson Cannon, Bantz J. Craddock, Wade Dennis, John Doe, 2, John Doe 1, John Does 3-100, Gordon R England, Harry B. Harris, Jr., Jay Hood, Gregory J Ihde, James M MCGarrah, Adolph McQueen, Geoffrey D. Miller, Michael Glenn Mullen, Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald H Rumsfeld, Bruce Vargo, Paul Wolfowitz, Michael Bumgarner and Mark H. Buzby terminated, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2010: # 1 CORRECTED IMAGE/ORDER) (MD). Modified on 11/2/2010 (MD). (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY, filed by Defendants Michael Bumgarner, Mark H. Buzby, Nelson Cannon, Bantz J. Craddock, Wade Dennis, Gordon R England, Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Jay Hood, Gregory J Ihde, James M MCGarrah, Daniel K McNeill, Adolph McQueen, Geoffrey D. Miller, Michael Glenn Mullen, Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald H Rumsfeld, Bruce Vargo, Paul Wolfowitz, TO RESPONSE to 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, for Transfer, and Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support Thereof (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      PRAECIPE re 71 Response to Motion, by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of PJ and Improper Venue, # 2 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer)(Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad, to 68 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, for Transfer, and Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support Thereof. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 69 Stipulated Motion to extend time for defendants' motion to dismiss/transfer for lack of jurisdiction and improper venue by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jursidiction and Improper Venue by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/8/2010, (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, for Transfer, and Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support Thereof by Defendants Michael Bumgarner, Mark H. Buzby, Nelson Cannon, Bantz J. Craddock, Wade Dennis, Gordon R England, Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Jay Hood, Gregory J Ihde, James M MCGarrah, Daniel K McNeill, Adolph McQueen, Geoffrey D. Miller, Michael Glenn Mullen, Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald H Rumsfeld, Bruce Vargo, Paul Wolfowitz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/17/2010, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE striking telephone conference set for 8/10/2010. (RM) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 65 Stipulated Motion for Staggered briefing and Memorandum of Points and Authority in support thereof, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Stipulated MOTION Unopposed Motion for Staggered Briefing and Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support Thereof by Defendants Michael Bumgarner, Mark H. Buzby, Nelson Cannon, Bantz J. Craddock, Wade Dennis, Gordon R England, Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Jay Hood, Gregory J Ihde, James M MCGarrah, Daniel K McNeill, Adolph McQueen, Geoffrey D. Miller, Michael Glenn Mullen, Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald H Rumsfeld, Bruce Vargo, Paul Wolfowitz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/4/2010, (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul Elias Werner on behalf of Defendants Michael Bumgarner, Mark H. Buzby, Nelson Cannon, Bantz J. Craddock, Wade Dennis, Gordon R England, Robert M Gates, Harry B. Harris, Jr., James T Hill, Jay Hood, Gregory J Ihde, James M MCGarrah, Daniel K McNeill, Adolph McQueen, Geoffrey D. Miller, Michael Glenn Mullen, Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald H Rumsfeld, Bruce Vargo, Paul Wolfowitz. (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference regarding joint status report set for 8/10/2010 at 04:00 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 20.. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad for all defendants. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Gregory J Ihde. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Daniel K McNeill. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Esteban Rodriguez. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Bruce Vargo. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Wade Dennis. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Michael Bumgarner. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Nelson Cannon. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Adolph McQueen. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Mark H. Buzby. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Harry B. Harris, Jr.. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Jay Hood. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Geoffrey D. Miller. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Bantz J. Craddock. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) James T Hill. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Michael Glenn Mullen. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Peter Pace. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Richard Bowman Myers. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) James M MCGarrah. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Gordon R England. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Paul Wolfowitz. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Donald H Rumsfeld. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued by electronically as to defendant(s) Robert M Gates. (MD) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Gregory J. Ihde by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Daniel McNeill by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Esteban Rodriguez by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Bruce Vargo by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Wade Dennis by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Michael Bumgarner by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Nelson Cannon by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Adolph McQueen by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Mark H. Buzby by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Harry B. Harris by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Jay Hood by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Geoffrey D. Miller by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Bantz Craddock by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to James T. Hill by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Michael Glenn Mullen by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Peter Pace by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Richard B. Myers by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to James McGarrah by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Gordon England by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Paul Wolfowitz by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Donald Rumsfeld by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Robert Gates by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: At the request of counsel for plaintiff, the deadline for filing the Joint Status Report is extended to 8/6/2010. All other FRCP 26-related dates are adjusted accordingly. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2010, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/22/2010, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/29/2010, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad re 9 Complaint,, certificate of service of summons and complaint to US Attorney West. Dist. Wash.. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad re 9 Complaint,, Certificate of service of summons and complaint to USDOJ. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons re-Issued as to United States/US Department of Justice in Washington DC and USA Office in Seattle, WA. (mailed summons to attorney Gwynne L. Skinner)(MD) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS U.S. Attorney for the Western District of Washington by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Attorney General of the United States by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Richard Bowman Myers, Peter Pace, Michael Glenn Mullen, James T Hill, Bantz J. Craddock, Geoffrey D. Miller, Jay Hood, Harry B. Harris, Jr., Mark H. Buzby, Adolph McQueen, Nelson Cannon, Michael Bumgarner, Wade Dennis, Bruce Vargo, Esteban Rodriguez, Daniel K McNeill, Gregory J Ihde, John Doe 1, John Doe, 2, John Does 3-100, Robert M Gates, Donald H Rumsfeld, Paul Wolfowitz, Gordon R England, James M MCGarrah (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # IFP), filed by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad.(MD) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Judge Theiler(MD) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 1 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Adel Hassan Hamad, referred to Judge Mary Alice Theiler, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to U.S. Attorney General by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) Modified on 4/19/2010 -issued summons and mailed to pltf's cnsl(MD). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to U.S. Attorney by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) Modified on 4/19/2010 -issued summons and mailed to pltf's cnsl(MD). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRAECIPE to attach document (Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and consent) Consent and and Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gwynne L Skinner for Adel Hassan Hamad, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gwynne L. Skinner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Adel Hassan Hamad (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000002034001. (Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Adel Hassan Hamad. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, # 3 Application for Pro Hac Vice)(Skinner, Gwynne) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 179 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?