District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Wisconsin Western District Court Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit United States Supreme Court

Herrington, Pamela v. Waterstone Mortgage Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Western District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00779-bbc
District Judge Barbara B. Crabb, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2020 at 7:22 PM ST (8.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pamela Herrington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Getman & Sweeney, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matt Dunn +1 845 255 9370 mdunn@getmansweeney.com
Space Matthew Thomas Dunn +1 845 255 9370 +1 845 255 8649 mdunn@getmanlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dan Charles Getman +1 845 255 9370 +1 845 255 8649 dgetman@getmansweeney.com
v.
No Logo Waterstone Mortgage Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Offit, Kurman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell B. Berger +1 443 738 1549 +1 301 575 0335 rberger@offitkurman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jesse Carter Ferrantella +1 858 652 3100 +1 858 652 3101 jesse.ferrantella@ogletree.com
Space Timothy L. Johnson +1 858 652 3100 +1 858 652 3101 tim.johnson@ogletreedeakins.com
Space Spencer C Skeen +1 877 507 7452 +1 877 509 9090 spencer.skeen@ogletreedeakins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ari Karen +1 202 344 4000 +1 202 344 8300 akaren@venable.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Office Madison
Filed 11/18/2011
Jury Demand None
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Dane
Terminated 3/16/2012
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 17-3609[]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags APPEAL,CLOSED
  Entries (202) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Brief in Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Declaration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Brief in Opposition
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Brief in Opposition
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Brief in Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Brief in Opposition
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Brief in Support
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Reopen Case
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Response to Proposed Findings of Fact
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Brief in Opposition
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Brief in Support
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Reopen Case
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Brief in Opposition
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Brief in Reply
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Objection to Motion - Miscellaneous Case
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 153 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                  Designation of Record on Appeal by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [139] Notice of Appeal. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Brief in Opposition
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Transcript Request Form
                                                                      Transcript Request Form by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 151 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Declaration
                                                                          Declaration of Tim L. Johnson filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in Support of Response re: [136] Motion for Attorney Fees, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Time Entries Relating to Motion for Sanctions, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Time Entries Prior to July 5, 2017, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Time Entries Relating to Clerical Tasks) (Skeen, Spencer) Modified on 1/4/2018: Added exhibit descriptions. E-mail to counsel. Disregard future entries. (lak)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 150 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Brief in Opposition
                                                                            Brief in Opposition by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [136] Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Pamela Herrington. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 149 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Response Stating No Opposition
                                                                              Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [142] Motion to Stay filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (Dunn, Matthew)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None USCA Judgment
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 148 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [147] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Post-Arbitration Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Brief in Opposition due 1/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/28/2017. (kwf)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 157 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 147 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017, Terminated: 12/28/2017 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Post-Arbitration Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 146 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [145] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Waterstone's Motion to Stay Execution on Judgment Pending Appeal. Brief in Opposition due 1/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/27/2017. (kwf)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 145 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017, Terminated: 12/27/2017 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                            Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Waterstone's Motion to Stay Execution on Judgment Pending Appeal by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Dunn, Matthew)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 154 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                                                USCA Case Number 17-3609 for [139] Notice of Appeal, filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (kwf)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                                                  USCA Case Number 17-3609 for [139] Notice of Appeal, filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (kwf)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Set Briefing Deadlines
                                                                                                    Set Briefing Deadlines as to [136] Motion for Attorney Fees (Post Arbitration Attorneys Fee and Cost). Response due 12/29/2017. (kwf)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 144 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                      Declaration of Eric Egenhoefer filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in Support re: [142] Motion to Stay, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - December 22, 2017 Bond) (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Brief in Support
                                                                                                      Brief in Support of [142] Motion to Stay Execution on Judgment Pending Appeal by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                        Motion to Stay Execution on Judgment Pending Appeal by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 12/29/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Transmission of Short Record to Seventh Circuit
                                                                                                          Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order, Opinion and Order, Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: [139] Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # (1) Order No.: 57, # (2) Opinion and Order No.: 133, # (3) Judgment, # (4) Docket Sheet) (lak)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 140 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Appeal Information Packet
                                                                                                            Appeal Information Packet. (lak)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation as to [133] Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment, Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Sanctions, [57] Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, [135] Judgment. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 0758-2163669 paid. No Docketing Statement filed. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                Declaration of Matt Dunn filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [136] Motion for Attorney Fees, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Arbitration Fee Brief, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Lodestar Calculation and Billing Records) (Dunn, Matthew) Modified on 12/21/2017. (lak)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                  Declaration of Carolyn Mow filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [136] Motion for Attorney Fees. (Dunn, Matthew) Modified on 12/21/2017: Caption. (lak)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                    Motion for Attorney Fees (Post Arbitration Attorneys Fee and Cost) by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. (Dunn, Matthew)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 judgment
                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT in favor of Pamela Herrington against Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in the amount of $10,566,790.00. (BBC/PAO) (arw)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017, Terminated: 12/11/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                        Motion for Entry of Final Judgment re:[133] Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment, Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Sanctions, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Final Judgment) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Order on Motion to Enforce JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part [99] Motion to Enforce Judgment of Arbitration Award; granting in part and denying in part [112] Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, or, in the Alternative, to Modify the Award; denying [118] Motion to Stay; denying [125] Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/4/2017. (kwf)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 supplement
                                                                                                                            Supplement to [99] Motion to Enforce Judgment filed by Pamela Herrington, [125] Motion for Sanctions filed by Pamela Herrington, [112] Motion to Vacate filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation, [118] Motion to Stay filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Waterstone Amended Complaint) (Dunn, Matthew)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Brief in Reply
                                                                                                                              Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington in Support of [125] Motion for Sanctions. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                Declaration of Spencer C. Skeen filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in Opposition re: [125] Motion for Sanctions, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Email from Counsel) (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                  Brief in Opposition by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [125] Motion for Sanctions, filed by Pamela Herrington. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Eric Egenhoefer filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in Support of Brief in Reply re: [112] Motion to Vacate, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Photograph, # (2) Exhibit B - Photograph) (Skeen, Spencer) Modified on 8/27/2017: Linked to the correct motion. Caption/case number. (lak)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Brief in Reply
                                                                                                                                    Brief in Reply by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in Support of [112] Motion to Vacate. (Skeen, Spencer) Modified on 8/27/2017: Linked to the correct motion. (lak)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set Briefing Deadlines
                                                                                                                                      Set Briefing Deadlines as to [125] Motion for Sanctions. Brief in Opposition due 9/13/2017. Brief in Reply due 9/25/2017. (kwf/jmm)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                        Brief in Support of [125] Motion for Sanctions, by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017, Terminated: 12/4/2017 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                          Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Partial Final Award, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Decision and Partial Final Award on Damages, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Partial Final Award on Attorneys Fees, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Final Award, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Sanctions Order, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Order on Contempt Motion, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Waterstone Objection to Arbitrator George C. Pratt, with Exhibits, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Claimants' Response to Waterstone's Disqualification Motion, # (9) Exhibit 9 - ARC Decision in Herrington v. Waterstone Mtg. Corp., # (10) Exhibit 10 - Getman Email to Skeen re: Stipulation on Double Counting) (Getman, Dan) Modified on 8/24/2017. (lak)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: 8/18/2017 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                            Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [118] Motion to Stay filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Partial Final Award on Clause Construction) (Dunn, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Dan Getman filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington in Opposition re: [112] Motion to Vacate. (Getman, Dan) Modified on 8/16/2017. (lak)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [112] Motion to Vacate, filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Arbitrator Pratt Bio, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Class Certification Award, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Partial Final Award on Attorneys Fees, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Decision on Erroneous Addresses, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Decision on Motion for Interim Relief, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Order on Separation Agreement, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Order on Hearing Arrangements, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Objection to Arbitrator Pratt, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Reply to Arbitrator Pratt Objection, # (10) Exhibit 10 - AARC Decision re: Disqualification, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Partial Final Award on Liability, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Decision and Partial Final Award on Damages, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Final Award, # (14) Exhibit 14 - Email re: stipulation, # (15) Exhibit 15 - Nov. 2, 2012 Order, # (16) Exhibit 16 - Photograph of Ari Karen, # (17) Exhibit 17 - Trial Stipulation, # (18) Exhibit 18 - Order on Questionnaire, # (19) Exhibit 19 - Order on Four Dispositive Motions, # (20) Exhibit 20 - Final Litigation Plan, # (21) Exhibit 21 - Certified Hearing Transcript Pages 1, 2, 291, 292, 293, 594, 595, 596, 777, 778, 779, 938, 939, 940, 1116, 1117, 1118 and 1341) (Getman, Dan) Modified on 8/16/2017: Removed duplicate text, etc. (lak)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [120] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Russell B. Berger and Ari Karen terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/14/2017. (voc)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017, Terminated: 8/14/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 8/18/2017. (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017, Terminated: 8/11/2017 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Support re: [118] Motion to Stay by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (Skeen, Spencer) Modified on 8/11/2017: Corrected docketing event. Motion termed. (lak)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017, Terminated: 12/4/2017 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Stay by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 8/18/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order to Motion to Stay) (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                          Brief in Support of [112] Motion to Vacate, by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set Briefing Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                            Reset Briefing Deadlines as to [112] Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, or, in the Alternative, to Modify the Award. Brief in Opposition due 8/15/2017. Brief in Reply due 8/25/2017. (kwf/jmm)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Stephanie Ziebell filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [112] Motion to Vacate. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Kevin Allen filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [112] Motion to Vacate. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Eric Egenhoefer filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [112] Motion to Vacate, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Photographs as to Conditions Observed During the Hearing) (Skeen, Spencer) Modified on 7/26/2017. (lak)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Ari Karen filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [112] Motion to Vacate, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Waterstone Mortgage Corporation Loan Employment Agreement, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Decision with Respect to Class Certification Motion, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Herrington's November 15, 2013 Letter to Arbitrator Pratt with Exhibits 1, 2 and 3, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Waterstone's November 19, 2013 Brief in Opposition, # (5) Exhibit 5 - November 26, 2013 Reply to Claimants' Opposition, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Arbitrator's November 29, 2013 Order, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Arbitrator's approved cover letter and questionnaire, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Arbitrator's March 4, 2014 Class Certification Award, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Arbitrator's April 13, 2017 Partial Final Award, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Arbitrator's June 12, 2017 Partial Final Award on Damages, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Arbitrator's July 5, 2017 Decision, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Arbitrator's July 5, 2017 Final Award) (Skeen, Spencer) Modified on 7/26/2017. (lak)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017, Terminated: 12/4/2017 Motion to vacate
                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, or, in the Alternative, to Modify the Award by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 8/1/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Disregard. See [117]., # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Skeen, Spencer) Modified on 7/26/2017. (lak)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Kevin Allen filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [99] Motion to Enforce Judgment. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Stephanie Ziebell filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [99] Motion to Enforce Judgment. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Eric Egenhoefer filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [99] Motion to Enforce Judgment, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Photos) (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Ari Karen filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [99] Motion to Enforce Judgment, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Waterstone Mortgage Corporation Loan Employment Agreement, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Decision with Respect to Class Certification Motion, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Herrington's November 15, 2013 Letter to Arbitrator Pratt with Exhibits 1, 2 and 3, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Waterstone's November 19, 2013 Brief in Opposition, # (5) Exhibit 5 - November 26, 2013 Reply to Claimants' Opposition, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Arbitrator's November 29, 2013 Order, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Arbitrator's Approved Cover Letter and Questionnaire, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Arbitrator's March 4, 2014 Class Certification Award, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Arbitrator's April 13, 2017 Partial Final Award, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Arbitrator's June 12, 2017 Partial Final Award on Damages, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Arbitrator's July 5, 2017 Decision, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Arbitrator's July 5, 2017 Final Award) (Skeen, Spencer) Modified on 7/26/2017. (lak)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                              Brief in Opposition by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [99] Motion to Enforce Judgment, filed by Pamela Herrington. (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [105] Motion to Admit Spencer Skeen Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/25/2017. (lak)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017, Terminated: 7/25/2017 Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Admit Spencer Skeen Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2073006.) by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Skeen, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [102] Motion to Admit Timothy Johnson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/20/2017. (kwf)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Support of [99] Motion to Enforce Judgment of Arbitration Award by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017, Terminated: 7/20/2017 Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Admit Timothy Johnson Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2070254.) by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [100] Motion to Admit Jesse Ferrantella Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/19/2017. (kwf)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017, Terminated: 7/19/2017 Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Admit Jesse Ferrantella Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2070014.) by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Ferrantella, Jesse)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017, Terminated: 12/4/2017 Motion to Enforce Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Enforce Judgment of Arbitration Award by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. Response due 7/25/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award, # (2) Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Partial Final Award on Clause Construction, # (4) Exhibit 3 - Class Certification Award, # (5) Exhibit 4 - Order on Four Dispositive Motions, # (6) Exhibit 5 - Partial Final Award on Liability, # (7) Exhibit 6 - Decision and Partial Final Award on Damages, # (8) Exhibit 7 - Decision and Partial Final Award on Attorneys Fees and Costs, # (9) Exhibit 8 - Final Award) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017, Terminated: 7/19/2017 Motion to Enforce Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                Disregard; see [99]. Modified on 7/19/2017. (kwf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 order on motion to reopen caseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [93] Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/21/14. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Brief in Sur-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief in Sur-Reply by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [93] Motion to Reopen Case filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A Leslies Poolmart, Inc. & Keith Cunningham, an Individual, 198 L.R.R.M. (BNA) 1292, 2014 WL 204208, (N.L.R.B. Div. of Judges Jan. 17, 2014), # (2) Certificate of Service) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Support of [93] Motion to Reopen Case and Certify Orders by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [93] Motion to Reopen Case filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014, Terminated: 2/21/2014 motion to reopen case
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Reopen Case and Certify Orders (ECF Nos. 57 & 92) Pursuant to 28 USC Sec 1292(b) by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 2/11/2014. (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 order on motion to reopen caseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [82] Motion to Reopen Case ; denying [83] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/28/14. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Brief in Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief in Reply by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in Support of [83] Motion for Reconsideration, (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [83] Motion for Reconsideration, filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation, [82] Motion to Reopen Case filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Arb. Order, # (2) Exhibit B - Questionnaire, # (3) Exhibit C - Arb. Demand, # (4) Exhibit D - Def. Arb. Brief, # (5) Exhibit E - Arb. Award, # (6) Exhibit F - Rule 11 Ltr., # (7) Exhibit G - New Emp. Agreement, # (8) Exhibit H - Arb. Order TRO, # (9) Exhibit I - Arb. Order Fees, # (10) Exhibit J - Employee Aff., # (11) Exhibit K - Arb. Order Class Mot., # (12) Exhibit L - Arb. Order Corrective Ltr., # (13) Exhibit M - Def. Ltr. to Arb., # (14) Exhibit N - Def. Request for Stay, # (15) Exhibit O - Arb. Order on Stay, # (16) Exhibit P - Arb. Order on Arb. Compensation, # (17) Exhibit Q - NLRB Complaint, # (18) Certificate of Service) (Getman, Dan) Modified on 12/23/2013 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [85] and [86] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/16/13. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [84] Stipulation to Extend Plaintiff's Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Reopen Case and Motion for Reconsideration and Proposed Order. Brief in Opposition due 12/20/2013. Brief in Reply due 1/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/16/13. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Support of [86] Motion for TRO by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for TRO) (Berger, Russell) Requested attorney file the findings of fact as an individual docket entry with exhibits as appropriate on 12/17/2013 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013, Terminated: 12/16/2013 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013, Terminated: 12/16/2013 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disregard. See docket entry [86]. Requested attorney refile documents in support as individual docket entries with any exhibits attached and named as required on 12/16/2013 (jaf). Modified on 12/17/2013 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013, Terminated: 12/16/2013 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation to Extend Plaintiff'sTime to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Reopen Case and Motion for Reconsideration and Proposed Order. by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013, Terminated: 1/28/2014 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's Order Requiring that Other Employees be Allowed to Join Plaintiff in Arbitration by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 12/12/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Employment Agreement, # (2) Case Law, # (3) Opinion & Order, # (4) Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013, Terminated: 1/28/2014 motion to reopen case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Reopen Case by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 12/12/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [80] Motion to Withdraw [73] and [74] Motions to reopen case and vacate order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/28/13. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013, Terminated: 5/28/2013 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Withdraw [73] Motion to Reopen Case , [74] Motion to Vacate Order on Attorney's Fees Re Motion for Corrective Letter by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 5/23/2013. (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: 5/15/2013 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [74] Motion to Vacate,, filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation, [73] Motion to Reopen Case filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set Briefing Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Briefing Deadlines as to [74] Motion to Vacate Order on Attorney's Fees Re Motion for Corrective Letter, [73] Motion to Reopen Case . Brief in Opposition due 5/17/2013. Brief in Reply due 5/24/2013. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [77] Stipulation for to Stay Defendant's Motion to Reopen Case (DKT. NO. [73]) and Motion to Vacate Order on Attorney's Fees Re Motion for Corrective Letter (DKT. NO. [74]) . Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/21/13. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/21/2013, Terminated: 2/22/2013 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation for to Stay Defendant's Motion to Reopen Case (DKT. NO. 73) and Motion to Vacate Order on Attorney's Fees Re Motion for Corrective Letter (DKT. NO. 74) by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Mediation Stipulation, # (2) Certificate of Service) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [75] Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response re [74] Motion to Vacate Order on Attorney's Fees Re Motion for Corrective Letter and [73] Motion to Reopen Case Response due 2/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/7/13. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013, Terminated: 2/7/2013 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation for an extension of time for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant's Motion to Vacate Order on Attorney's Fees Re Motion for Corrective Letter (Docket#74) by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. (Dunn, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013, Terminated: 5/28/2013 Motion to vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Vacate Order on Attorney's Fees Re Motion for Corrective Letter by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 2/7/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Final Award on Clause Construction, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Employment Agreement, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Charge Alleging Unfair Labor Practice, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Amendment to Agreement, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Cover Letter, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Amendment, # (7) Exhibit 7 - TRO and Preliminary Injunction, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Reconsideration Order, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Order on Attorney Fees, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Order Compelling Payment, # (11) Text of Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell) Modified on 2/1/2013 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013, Terminated: 5/28/2013 motion to reopen case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Reopen Case by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 2/7/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 order on motion to reopen caseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [60] Motion to Reopen Case ; denying [61] Motion to Vacate ; denying [64] Motion for Review of Arbitrator's Decision and Order on Claimant's Application for Protective Order, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction and Order with Respect to Reconsideration . Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/3/12. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Brief in Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington in Support of [64] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, [61] Motion to Vacate As Ordered By The Court. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Brief in Support of [64] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief on the Jurisdiction of this Court to Review the Decisions of the Arbitrator by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Berger, Russell) Modified on 11/14/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting briefing on [64] Motion for Review of Arbitrator's Decision and Order on Claimant's Application for Protective Order, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction and Order with Respect to Reconsideration. Brief in Reply due 11/13/2012. Brief in Surreply due 11/20/2012. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/5/12. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Brief in Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief in Reply by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in Support of [64] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to its Application for Review of Arbitrator's Decision and Order on Claimant's Application For Protective Order, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction and Order with Respect to Reconsideration (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Order on Corrective Letter) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/28/2012, Entered: 10/28/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [64] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Counsel for Acting General Counsel's Statement of Position, pp. 2-3, # (2) Exhibit B - Waterstone's Letter Motions, and Plaintiffs' Responses, # (3) Exhibit C - All briefing and Exhibits Before the Arbitrator, # (4) Certificate of Service) (Getman, Dan) Modified on 10/29/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [65] Stipulation to extend Plaintiff's time to respond to Defendant's Motion for Review of Arbitrator's Decision. Brief in Opposition due 10/29/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/15/12. (rep) Modified on 11/5/2012 (llj).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012, Terminated: 10/15/2012 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation to extend Plaintiff's time to respond to Defendant's Motion for Review of Arbitrator's Decision and Order on Claimant's Application for Protective Order, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction and Order with Respect to Reconsideration by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: 10/8/2012, Terminated: 12/3/2012 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Review of Arbitrator's Decision and Order on Claimant's Application for Protective Order, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction and Order with Respect to Reconsideration by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 10/15/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Waterstone Loan Originators Emp Agr, # (2) Exhibit 2 - January 26, 2012 letter from NLRB, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Complaint and Notice of Hearing, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Egenhoefer letter to Loan Originators, # (5) Exhibit 5 - July 23, 2012 Amendment to Loan Originator Emp Agr, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Arbitrator's Decision and Order on Claimant's Application for Protective Order, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Arbitrator's Order with Respect to Reconsideration Request, # (8) Text of Proposed Order ) (Berger, Russell) Modified on 10/9/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: 9/4/2012 Brief in Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief in Reply by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in Support of [61] Motion to Vacate, (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [60] Motion to Reopen Case, filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation, [61] Motion to Vacate, filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A AAA Biography, # (2) Exhibit B Bryant Arb. Dec., # (3) Exhibit C Passow Arb. Dec., # (4) Exhibit D Morton's Arb. Dec., # (5) Exhibit E Bryant Ct. Dec., # (6) Exhibit F Morton's Ct. Dec.) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set Briefing Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to [60] Motion to Reopen Case , [61] Motion to Vacate Arbitrator's Partial Final Award On Clause Construction. Brief in Opposition due 8/27/2012. Brief in Reply due 9/4/2012. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/10/2012, Terminated: 12/3/2012 Motion to vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Vacate Arbitrator's Partial Final Award On Clause Construction by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 8/17/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Partial Final Award on Clause Construction, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Loan Originator Employment Agreement, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Order Following Initial Hearing Held on May 25, 2012, # (4) Text of Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell) Modified on 8/13/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/10/2012, Terminated: 12/3/2012 motion to reopen case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Reopen Case by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 8/17/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Partial Final Award on Clause Construction, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Order) (Berger, Russell) Modified on 8/13/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: 5/29/2012 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington (Attachments: # (1) Consent to Sue of William R. Howe) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Pamela Herrington filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [51] Motion for Conditional Certification of Class (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Contact List, # (2) Exhibit 2 - January 2011Loan Officer Employment Agreement, # (3) Exhibit 3 - April 3011 Loan Originator Employment Agreement) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part [13] Motion to Dismiss ; granting [35] Motion for Leave to File a surreply brief; denying as moot [15] Motion to Strike ; denying as moot [18] Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's claims must be resolved through arbitration. This case is administratively closed subject to reopening on motion of any party if issues remain for resolution after the arbitration has been completed. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/16/12. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Support of [51] Motion for Conditional Certification of Class by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of SK Holt-Clark filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [51] Motion for Conditional Certification of Class (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Kendel DeBlieck filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [51] Motion for Conditional Certification of Class (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Disregard. See docket entry [58]. Requested attorney refile with exhibits as separate attachments on 3/19/2012 (jaf). Modified on 3/20/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Matthew Dunn filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [51] Motion for Conditional Certification of Class (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2 - Administrator's Interpretation, # (2) Exhibit 3 - About Waterstone, # (3) Exhibit 4 - Annual report, # (4) Exhibit 5 - Offices, # (5) Exhibit 6 - LO by State, # (6) Exhibit 7 - Guevara Order) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012, Terminated: 3/16/2012 Motion for Conditional Certification of Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Conditional Certification of Class and to Issue Notice by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. Brief in Opposition due 4/6/2012. Brief in Reply due 4/16/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Notice) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Pamela Herrington filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [44] Order on Motion to Dismiss (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 3 to [46] Response to Order filed by Pamela Herrington Order in Owen v. Bristol Care, WDMO 11-04258-CV-FJG (Getman, Dan) Modified on 3/12/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit 2 to [46] Response to Order filed by Pamela Herrington Charge (Getman, Dan) Modified on 3/12/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Disregard. See docket entry [50]. Requested attorney refile as Declaration on 3/12/2012 (jaf). Modified on 3/13/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Response to Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response re: [44] Order on Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Response to Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response re: [44] Order on Motion to Dismiss Supplemental Memorandum of Law by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Charge)) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that parties to file supplemental briefs addressing the question whether this court has authority to entertain the parties' dispute by 3/9/12. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/2/12. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief in Opposition by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [37] Motion to Compel filed by Pamela Herrington (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Matthew Dunn filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [39] Motion to Stay, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Email Getman to defense counsel) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [39] Motion to Stay, filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Russell B. Berger filed by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [39] Motion to Stay, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Interrogatories, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Request for Production of Documents, # (3) Exhibit 3 - 2/14/12 Letter, # (4) Exhibit 4 - 2/23/12 E-Mail) (Berger, Russell) Modified on 2/24/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012, Terminated: 3/16/2012 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Stay Discovery by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 3/1/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Interrogatories, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Production of Documents and ESI to Waterstone, # (3) Exhibit 3 - 2-14-12 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel, # (4) Exhibit 4 - 2-23-12 Email from Plaintiff's Counsel, # (5) Text of Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Matthew Dunn filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [37] Motion to Compel (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiffs' Discovery Demands, # (2) Exhibit Email from Karen to Getman, # (3) Exhibit Letter from Dunn to Karen, # (4) Exhibit email from Dunn to Berger) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012, Terminated: 3/16/2012 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 3/1/2012. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief in Opposition by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [35] Motion for Leave to File, filed by Pamela Herrington (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: 1/20/2012, Terminated: 3/16/2012 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for PERMISSION TO FILE A SUR-REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. Response due 1/27/2012. (Attachments: # (1) PLAINTIFFS SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 13)) (Getman, Dan) Modified on 1/23/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012 Pretrial Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 3/16/2012. Motion for Conditional Certification of Class due 3/16/2012. Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23 due 6/1/2012. Dispositive Motions due 11/30/2012. Settlement Letters due 4/26/2013. Motions in Limine due 4/26/2013. Response to Motion due 5/10/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2013 at 03:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/3/2013 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/19/12. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 Brief in Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief in Reply by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in Support of [18] Motion to Strike , for Protective Order, and for Sanctions (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 Brief in Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Reply by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation in Support of [13] Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion for Costs (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington (Attachments: # (1) Consent to Sue of Kendel DeBlieck) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Discovery Plan (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 1/13/2012 [:20] (skv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/11/2012 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [27] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Brief in Reply due 1/17/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/11/2012. (arw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington (Attachments: # (1) Consent to sue of William L. Coleman) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012, Terminated: 1/11/2012 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 1/17/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: 1/9/2012 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [15] Motion to Strike, [22] Brief in Opposition to [13] Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # (1) Decision From the National Labor Relations Board: D.R. Horton, Inc., Case 12-CA-25764) (Getman, Dan) Modified on 1/10/2012. (jaf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: 1/4/2012 Brief in Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington in Support of [15] Motion to Strike. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: 1/4/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Dan Getman, Esq. filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [13] Motion to Dismiss. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: 1/4/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Pamela Herrington filed by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [13] Motion to Dismiss. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [13] Motion to Dismiss by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Employment Arbitration Rules, # (2) Exhibit - Herrington Declaration; see also [23], # (3) Exhibit - Waterstone Website, # (4) Exhibit - Email from AAA re Hourly Rates, # (5) Exhibit - Getman Declaration; see also [24], # (6) Exhibit - Demand Letter) (Getman, Dan) Requested attorney refile declarations as separate docket entries on 1/4/2012. (jaf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington re: [18] Motion to Strike filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - 12/27/11 E-Mail) (Getman, Dan) Modified on 1/4/2012 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text of Proposed Order to [18] Motion to Strike filed by Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Berger, Russell) Modified on 12/28/2011 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief in Support of [18] Motion to Strike, for Protective Order and for Sanctions by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Getman Letter, # (2) Exhibit B - Email_Pickering, # (3) Exhibit C - Plf's Counsel's website) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011, Terminated: 3/16/2012 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Strike, for Protective Order and for Sanctions by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Response due 1/3/2012. (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Opposition by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation re: [15] Motion to Strike,, filed by Pamela Herrington re Defendant's Claim for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Employment Agreement, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief in Support of [15] Motion to Strike, by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington (Getman, Dan) Modified on 12/15/2011 (jaf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011, Terminated: 3/16/2012 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Strike Defendants claim for attorneys fees and costs and prohibit Defendant from seeking attorneys fees or costs from Plaintiff Herrington for her filing of this action in Court re: [13] MOTION TO DISMISS or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion for Costs by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. Response due 12/21/2011. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter from Defense Counsel, # (2) Exhibit - Employment Agreement, # (3) Exhibit - Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel, # (4) Exhibit - Plaintiff's Demand, # (5) Exhibit - Defendant's Website, # (6) Exhibit - Employment Arbitration Rules, # (7) Text of Proposed Order) (Getman, Dan) Modified on 12/15/2011. (jaf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: 12/13/2011 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief in Support of [13] Motion to Dismiss, Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Employment Agreement) (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011, Terminated: 3/16/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion for Costs by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Brief in Opposition due 1/3/2012. Brief in Reply due 1/12/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss; see also [14], # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Berger, Russell) Requested attorney refile brief as separate docket entry on 12/13/2011. (jaf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: 12/9/2011 Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [7] Motion to Admit Russell B. Berger Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/9/11. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: 12/9/2011 Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [6] Motion to Admit Ari Karen Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/9/11. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set Pretrial or Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2012 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington (Attachments: # (1) Consent to Sue of SK Holt Clark) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Waterstone Mortgage Corporation served on 12/5/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011, Terminated: 12/9/2011 Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Admit Russell B. Berger Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-893259.) by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Berger, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011, Terminated: 12/9/2011 Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Admit Ari Karen Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-893240.) by Defendant Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Karen, Ari)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [4] Motion to Admit Matthew Dunn Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/1/11. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011, Terminated: 12/1/2011 Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Admit Matthew Dunn Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-889592.) by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Dunn, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/28/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT , Pamela Herrington against Waterstone Mortgage Corporation. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0758-886417.), filed by Pamela Herrington. (Attachments: # (1) JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons) (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Standard Attachments Sent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: NORTC, Briefing Guidelines, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order on Dispositive Motions. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting [1] Motion to Admit Dan Getman Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/18/11. (rep)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011, Terminated: 11/18/2011 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Admit Dan Getman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-882632.) by Plaintiff Pamela Herrington. (Getman, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 3,584 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?