AL-AULAQI v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-01469
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 11, 2016 at 11:59 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NASSER AL-AULAQI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pardiss Kebriaei +1 212 614 6452 +1 212 614 6499 pkebriaei@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo LEON C. PANETTA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Decklin Leary +1 202 514 3313 +1 202 616 8470 peter.leary@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Decklin Leary +1 202 514 3313 +1 202 616 8470 peter.leary@usdoj.gov
No Logo ADRIAN CRONAUER, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo ALFRED L. MICHAUD, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo ALLIED EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo ERIC ROJO, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo JACK W. KLIMP, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo JAMES J. CAREY, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo JOHN D ALTENBURG, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo NATIONAL DEFENSE COMMITTEE, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo NORMAN T. SAUNDERS, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo PETER J. REYNIERSE, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo STEVEN B. KANTROWITZ, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo THOMAS A. SMITH, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo VETERANS OF FOREIGN WARS OF THE US, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert Lawrence Fenster +1 303 634 4000 +1 303 634 4400 hfenster@mckennalong.com
No Logo WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
No Logo WILLIAM D. PIVARNIK, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Samp +1 202 588 0302 +1 202 588 0386 rsamp@wlf.org
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 15 defendants' motion to dismiss and denying 3 plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction as moot. See text of Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/7/10.(lcjdb1) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/7/10. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge John D. Bates held on 11/8/10; Page Numbers: 1 - 122. Date of Issuance:12/1/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bryan A. Wayne, Telephone number 202-354-3186, Court Reporter Email Address : bryanawayne@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2011.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/18/2010 Reply to opposition to Motion
        REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Leary, Peter) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT M. GATES served on 9/1/2010 (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BARACK H. OBAMA served on 9/10/2010 (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leary, Peter) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NASSER AL-AULAQI. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bernard Haykel, # 2 Declaration of Mary Ellen O'Connell, # 3 Declaration of Jonathan Manes)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Reply to opposition to Motion
                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NASSER AL-AULAQI. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bernard Haykel, # 2 Declaration of Mary Ellen O'Connell, # 3 Declaration of Jonathan Manes)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by NASSER AL-AULAQI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wizner, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 Amicus Brief
                      AMICUS BRIEF by ALLIED EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION, JOHN D ALTENBURG, JAMES J. CAREY, ADRIAN CRONAUER, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, STEVEN B. KANTROWITZ, JACK W. KLIMP, ALFRED L. MICHAUD, NATIONAL DEFENSE COMMITTEE, WILLIAM D. PIVARNIK, PETER J. REYNIERSE, ERIC ROJO, NORMAN T. SAUNDERS, THOMAS A. SMITH, WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                        MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by JACK W. KLIMP, JOHN D ALTENBURG, JAMES J. CAREY, STEVEN B. KANTROWITZ, NORMAN T. SAUNDERS, THOMAS L. HEMINGWAY, ALFRED L. MICHAUD, WILLIAM D. PIVARNIK, ERIC ROJO, PETER J. REYNIERSE, THOMAS A. SMITH, ADRIAN CRONAUER, WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, NATIONAL DEFENSE COMMITTEE, ALLIED EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Amicus Brief)(znmw, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Amicus Brief
                          AMICUS BRIEF by VETERANS OF FOREIGN WARS OF THE US. (dr) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                            MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae by VETERANS OF FOREIGN WARS OF THE US (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Amicus Curiae)(rdj) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/25/2010, Entered: 9/25/2010 ~Notice (other)
                              NOTICE of Lodging of in camera, ex parte classified declaration by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA re 15 MOTION to Dismiss (Leary, Peter) (Entered: 09/25/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/25/2010, Entered: 9/25/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of Lodging of in camera, ex parte classified declaration by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA re 15 MOTION to Dismiss (Leary, Peter) (Entered: 09/25/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/25/2010, Entered: 9/25/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Lodging of in camera, ex parte classified declaration by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA re 15 MOTION to Dismiss (Leary, Peter) (Entered: 09/25/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/25/2010, Entered: 9/25/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Leary, Peter) (Entered: 09/25/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/25/2010, Entered: 9/25/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      MOTION for leave to file out of time by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA (Leary, Peter) (Entered: 09/25/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leary, Peter) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 09/02/2010. (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Maria C. LaHood, :Firm- Center for Constitutional Rights, :Address- 666 Broadway, 7th fl., New York, NY 10012. Phone No. - 212-614-6430. Fax No. - (212) 614-6499 by NASSER AL-AULAQI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maria C. LaHood, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Pardiss Kebriaei, :Firm- Center for Constitutional Rights, :Address- 666 Broadway, 7th fl., New York, NY 10012. Phone No. - (212) 614-6452. Fax No. - (212) 614-6499 by NASSER AL-AULAQI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Pardiss Kebriaei, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ben Wizner, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, :Address- 125 Broad Street, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-519-7860. Fax No. - 212-549-2651 by NASSER AL-AULAQI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ben Wizner, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jameel Jaffer, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, :Address- 125 Broad Street, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-519-7814. Fax No. - 212-549-2651 by NASSER AL-AULAQI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jameel Jaffer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and for Entry of an Order Setting Forth Deadlines by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leary, Peter) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Decklin Leary on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA (Leary, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Coppolino on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA (Coppolino, Anthony) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. BARACK H. OBAMA served on 8/30/2010, answer due 10/29/2010 (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NASSER AL-AULAQI (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Ben Wizner, # 3 Exhibits, # 4 Declaration Nassar Al-Aulaqi, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(dr) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Notice of Related Case
                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NASSER AL-AULAQI. Case related to Case No. 10-1303. (dr) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT against ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, LEON C. PANETTA ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616032287) filed by NASSER AL-AULAQI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?