Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.
Page 1 Page 2 Page 3 Page 4 Page 5
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
2321 |
Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2320 |
Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2319 |
Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: 5/19/2014 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2318 |
Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2317 |
Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2316 |
Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 |
Order Re: Motion to Approve |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2315 |
Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2314 |
Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2313 |
Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2312) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of GCG, Inc. (Ferrante, Angela)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2312 |
Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 |
Motion to Approve |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Approve BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust's Abandonment and Destruction of Books and Records filed by Brent C. Strickland on behalf of John DeGroote Services, LLC as Liquidating Trustee to the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust with hearing to be held on 2/25/2014 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 2/18/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion # 2 Proposed Order) (Strickland, Brent)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2311 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2310) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of GCG, Inc. (Ferrante, Angela)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2310 |
Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from October 1, 2013 to December 31, 2013 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2309 |
Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 |
Withdrawal of Claim |
|
Docket Text: Withdrawal of Claim(s): in the amount of $10,537.85, filed by State of Delaware. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2308 |
Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2307) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of GCG, Inc. (Ferrante, Angela)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2307 |
Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from July 1, 2013 to September 30, 2013 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2306 |
Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2305) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of GCG, Inc. (Ferrante, Angela)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2305 |
Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 |
Operating Report |
|
Docket Text: Quarterly Operating Report / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from April 1, 2013 to June 30, 2013 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2304 |
Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2303) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2303 |
Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Second Amended Complaint Filed by the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trustee Against Ernst & Young, LLP in Adversary No. 11-01484 filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services, LLC as Liquidating Trustee to the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. with presentment to be held on 6/18/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 6/18/2013, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2302 |
Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (related document(s)2271) filed by John Longmire on behalf of John DeGroote. (Longmire, John)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2301 |
Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: 5/22/2013 |
Notice of Agenda |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 23, 2013 at 9:30 A.M. filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services, LLC as Liquidating Trustee to the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 5/23/2013 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2300 |
Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2299) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2299 |
Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from January 1, 2013 to March 31, 2013 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2298 |
Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: 4/25/2013 |
Notice of Change of Address of Debtor/Creditor |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Change of Address of Creditor for Thomas McKelvey filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc.. (Schoenfeld, Norman)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2297 |
Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: 4/19/2013 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2295) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2296 |
Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2293, 2291, 2294, 2292) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2295 |
Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013 |
Order Re: Motion to Approve Compromise |
|
Docket Text: Order Approving Settlement Between the Liquidating Trust and F. Edwin Harbach, Albert L. Lord, Roderick M. McGeary, J. Terry Strange, Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers and Edward Munson and Authorizing Settlement Payment (Related Doc # 2289) signed on 4/17/2013. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2294 |
Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013 |
Notice of Agenda |
|
Docket Text: Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 17, 2013 at 9:45AM filed by Sachin S. Bansal on behalf of BearingPoint Liquidating Trustee. (Bansal, Sachin)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2293 |
Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013 |
Declaration |
|
Docket Text: Declaration of Charles Hale In Support of Motion For Entry of Order Approving Settlement Between the Liquidating Trust And F. Edwin Harbach, Albert L. Lord, Roderick M. McGeary, J. Terry Strange, Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers And Edward Munson And Authorizing Settlement Payment (related document(s)2289) filed by Sachin S. Bansal on behalf of BearingPoint Liquidating Trustee. (Bansal, Sachin)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2292 |
Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013 |
Declaration |
|
Docket Text: Declaration of John DeGroote In Support Of Motion For Entry Of Order Approving Settlement Between The Liquidating Trust And F. Edwin Harbach, Albert L. Lord, Roderick M. McGeary, J. Terry Strange, Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers And Edward Munson And Authorizing Settlement Payment (related document(s)2289) filed by Sachin S. Bansal on behalf of BearingPoint Liquidating Trustee. (Bansal, Sachin)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2291 |
Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013 |
Notice of Agenda |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 17, 2013 at 9:45AM filed by Sachin S. Bansal on behalf of BearingPoint Liquidating Trustee. (Bansal, Sachin)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2290 |
Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: 3/26/2013 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2289) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2289 |
Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 |
Motion to Approve Compromise |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Approve Compromise Notice of Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement Between the Liquidating Trust and F. Edwin Harbach, Albert L. Lord, Roderick M. McGeary, J. Terry Strange, Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers and Edward Munson and Authorizing Settlement Payment filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services, LLC as Liquidating Trustee to the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 4/17/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 4/12/2013, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement# (2) Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2288 |
Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 3/5/2013 |
Transfer Order |
|
Docket Text: Copy of order signed on 2/22/2013 by U.S. District Court Judge Anthony J. Trenga transferring case number 12-1434 from the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virgina (Alexandria Division) to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court SDNY Filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court SDNY. (Attachments: # (1) Document No. 1 (Notice of Removal)# (2) USDC EDV Docket Sheet for Case No. 12-1434) (Bush, Brent)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2287 |
Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 |
Order Re: Motion to Authorize |
|
Docket Text: Order (A) Enforcing Confirmation Order; (B) Continuing Request to Hold F. Edwin Harbach, Roderick C. Mcgeary, and Eddie R. Munson in Contempt, and (C) Continuing Request to Impose Sanctions for Willful Violation of Confirmation Injunction (Related Doc # 2271) signed on 2/7/2013. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2286 |
Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 |
Transcript |
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 1/31/13 RE: MOTION TO AUTHORIZE / MOTION FOR ORDER (A) ENFORCING CONFIRMATION ORDER, (B) HOLDING F. EDWIN HARBACH, RODERICK C. MCGEARY, AND EDDIE R. MUNSON IN CONTEMPT, AND (C) IMPOSING SANCTIONS FOR WILLFUL VIOLATION OF CONFIRMATION INJUNCTION. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/6/2013. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: AAA Electronic Sound Reporters.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 2271). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/13/2013. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/8/2013. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/6/2013. (Peterson, Brent) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2285 |
Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtor's Post Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from October 1, 2012 (related document(s)2284) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2284 |
Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from October 1, 2012 to December 31, 2012 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2283 |
Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 |
Letter |
|
Letter from Sabin Willet, Esq. to Honorable Robert E. Gerber requesting a conference - filed by Sabin Willett on behalf of Liquidating Trustee. (Willett, Sabin) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2282 |
Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion for Order (A) Enforcing Confirmation Order, (B) Holding F. Edwin Harbach, Roderick C. McGeary, and Eddie R. Munson in Contempt, and (C) Imposing Sanctions for Willful Violation of Confirmation Injunction (related document(s)2271) filed by John Longmire on behalf of John DeGroote. with hearing to be held on 1/31/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Longmire, John) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2281 |
Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 |
Interrogatories |
|
Interrogatories responses and objections filed by George A. Borden on behalf of F. Edwin Harbach. (Borden, George) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2280 |
Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 |
Response |
|
Response to First Set of Interrogatories in Connection with the Liquidating Trustee's Motion to Enforce Plan Injunction filed by William T. Russell Jr. on behalf of Edward Munson. (Russell, William) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2279 |
Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 |
Response |
|
Response to First Set of Interrogatories in Connection with the Liquidating Trustee's Motion to Enforce Plan Injunction filed by William T. Russell Jr. on behalf of Roderick C. McGeary. (Russell, William) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2278 |
Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: 1/16/2013 |
Order Re: Application for Pro Hac Vice |
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Andrew W. Rudge, Esq. (Related Doc # 2277) signed on 1/16/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2277 |
Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/16/2013 |
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Andrew W. Rudge on behalf of F. Edwin Harbach. Filing fee collected, receipt #191138. (Cappiello, Karen) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2276 |
Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: 1/14/2013 |
Declaration |
|
Declaration of William T. Russell, Jr. in Opposition to the Motion for an Order Enforcing the Confirmation Order, Contempt and for Sanctions (related document(s)2271) filed by William T. Russell Jr. on behalf of F. Edwin Harbach, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Affidavit of Service) (Russell, William) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2275 |
Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: 1/14/2013 |
Opposition Brief |
|
Joint Opposition Brief (related document(s)2271) filed by Paul C. Curnin on behalf of F. Edwin Harbach, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Curnin, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2274 |
Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2273) filed by Jeffrey S. Sabin on behalf of John DeGroote Services, LLC as Liquidating Trustee to the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. (Sabin, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2273 |
Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 |
Motion to Join |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Join /BearingPoint, Inc., Liquidating Trustee's Motion and Joinder to Motion to Enforce the Plan Injunction (related document(s)2271) filed by Jeffrey S. Sabin on behalf of John DeGroote Services, LLC as Liquidating Trustee to the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. with hearing to be held on 1/28/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 12/14/2012, (Sabin, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2272 |
Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service of Alison R. Ambeault (related document(s)2271) filed by John Longmire on behalf of John DeGroote. (Longmire, John)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2271 |
Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 |
Motion to Authorize |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Authorize / Motion for Order (A) Enforcing Confirmation Order, (B) Holding F. Edwin Harbach, Roderick C. McGeary, and Eddie R. Munson in Contempt, and (C) Imposing Sanctions for Willful Violation of Confirmation Injunction filed by John Longmire on behalf of John DeGroote. with hearing to be held on 1/28/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 1/14/2013, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Complaint# (2) Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Longmire, John)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2270 |
Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: 10/31/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service ( Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report for the Period from July 1, 2012 to September 30, 2012) (related document(s)2269) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2269 |
Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report. - Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report for the Period from July 1, 2012 to September 30, 2012 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2268 |
Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 |
Operating Report |
|
Docket Text: Operating Report Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period July 1, 2012 to September 30, 2012 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2267 |
Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s)2266) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2266 |
Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/15/2012 at 09:40 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2265 |
Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 |
Order(Generic) |
|
Docket Text: Order signed on 9/19/2012 Liquidating Trustees Motion To Extend The Outside Date For The Dissolution Of The Bearingpoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. (related document(s)2261) (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2264 |
Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/10/2012 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal Liquidating Trustee's Withdrawal of Its Objection to Claim No. 1181 Filed by Anne Arundel County, Maryland (related document(s)2209) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2263 |
Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/10/2012 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal Liquidating Trustee's Withdrawal of Its Objection to Claim No. 705 Filed by Dr. Jack Taylor (Seventh Omnibus Objection) (related document(s)1626) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2262 |
Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2261) filed by Jeffrey S. Sabin on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Sabin, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2261 |
Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: 9/5/2012 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment OF ORDER APPROVING BEARINGPOINT, INC. LIQUIDATING TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND THE OUTSIDE DATE FOR THE DISSOLUTION OF THE BEARINGPOINT, INC. LIQUIDATING TRUST filed by Matthew John Cursio on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 9/13/2012 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 9/13/2012, (Attachments: # (1) Motion# (2) Proposed Order)(Cursio, Matthew)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2260 |
Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s)2259) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2259 |
Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/18/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2258 |
Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report (related document(s)2257) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2257 |
Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: 7/26/2012 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from April 1, 2012 to June 30, 2012 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2256 |
Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Final Decree Closing Three of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases (related document(s)2254) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2255 |
Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment (related document(s)2253) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2254 |
Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 |
Order(Generic) |
|
Docket Text: Order of Final Decree signed on 7/18/2012 Closing Three of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. In re: Case No.(s) 09-10693, 09-10707 and 09-10711 . (related document(s)2251) (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2253 |
Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: 7/17/2012 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/23/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2252 |
Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Notice of Presentment of Application (with Application) for Final Decree Closing Three of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases (related document(s)2251) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2251 |
Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 |
Application for Final Decree |
|
Docket Text: Application for Final Decree Closing Three of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Section 350(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 3022 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. Responses due by 7/17/2012, with presentment to be held on 7/17/2012 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2250 |
Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Notice of Adjournment (related document(s)2249) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2249 |
Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/18/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2248 |
Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service of Karen Petriano re Notice of Status Conference (re: Objection to John Taylor Claim No. 705 and Bowne Management Systems Adversary Proceeding); Notice of Status Conference (re: Ernst & Young Adversary (related document(s)2246, 2247) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2247 |
Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing / Notice of Status Conference filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/18/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2246 |
Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing / Notice of Status Conference filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/21/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2245 |
Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: 5/23/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 23, 2012 at 9:45 a.m. (related document(s)2244) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2244 |
Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012 |
Notice of Agenda |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 23, 2012 at 9:45 a.m. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/23/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2243 |
Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report (January 1, 2012 through March 31, 2012) (related document(s)2242) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2242 |
Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: 5/15/2012 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from January 1, 2012 to March 31, 2012 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2241 |
Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Notice of Adjournment (related document(s)2240) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2240 |
Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: 5/8/2012 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/23/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2239 |
Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/24/2012 |
Letter |
|
Docket Text: Letter Requesting to add Marie-Josee Dube to the Master Mailing List, filed by IBM Corporation. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2238 |
Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: 4/18/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Notice of Adjournment (related document(s)2236) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2237 |
Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/18/2012 |
Letter |
|
Docket Text: Letter /Notice of change of Firm Affiliation and Request for Removal from ECF Service List filed by Jonathan C. Bolton. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2236 |
Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: 4/17/2012 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/9/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2235 |
Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Notice of Adjournment (related document(s)2234) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of GCG, Inc. Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2234 |
Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: 3/21/2012 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/19/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2233 |
Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment [set for March 22, 2012 at 9:45 am (Eastern Time)] (related document(s)2232) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2232 |
Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/22/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2231 |
Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period From October 1, 2011 to December 31, 2011 (related document(s)2230) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2230 |
Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: 2/1/2012 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period From October 1, 2011 to December 31, 2011 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2229 |
Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s)2228) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2228 |
Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/16/2012 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2227 |
Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request to Be Removed from Distribution List (related document(s)238) filed by Michael S. Etkin on behalf of Lead Plaintiffs and the Class. (Etkin, Michael)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2226 |
Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 |
Order(Generic) |
|
Docket Text: Order signed on 12/27/2011 Granting Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 252 of Robert Wenzel. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2225 |
Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: 12/20/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2224, 2223) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2224 |
Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment Notice of Settlement of Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 252 of Robert Wenzel and Opportunity for Hearing (related document(s)1626) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 12/27/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/27/2011, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2223 |
Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment Notice of Settlement of Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 705 of John Taylor and Opportunity for Hearing (related document(s)1626) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 12/27/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/27/2011, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2222 |
Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: 12/15/2011 |
Order Re: Application for Final Decree |
|
Docket Text: Order of Final Decree signed on 12/13/2011 Closing Certain of the Detors' Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Section 350(a) of The Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 3022. (Related Doc #2218) (Cantrell, Deirdra)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
2221 |
Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: 12/7/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 7, 2011 (related document(s)2220) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2220 |
Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: 12/6/2011 |
Notice of Agenda |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 7, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/7/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2219 |
Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Notice of Presentment of Application (with Application) for Final Decree Closing Certain of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases (related document(s)2218) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2218 |
Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 |
Application for Final Decree |
|
Docket Text: Application for Final Decree Closing Certain of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Section 350(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 3022 (with Attached Closing Report as Exhibit A) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. Responses due by 12/12/2011, with presentment to be held on 12/12/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2217 |
Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 |
Opposition |
|
Docket Text: Opposition Of Anne Arundel County, Maryland, To Liquidating Trustee's Amended Objection To Claim No. 1181 Of Anne Arundel County Maryland filed by Hamilton F. Tyler. (Greene, Chantel)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2216 |
Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2213, 2215, 2214) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2215 |
Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing on the Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 1176 (related document(s)1921) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/7/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2214 |
Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing on the Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 705 (related document(s)1626) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/7/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2213 |
Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing on the Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 252 (related document(s)1626) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/7/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2212 |
Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/10/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 10, 2011 (related document(s)2210) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2211 |
Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/10/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Notice of Hearing on the Liquidating Trustees Amended Objection to Claim No. 1181 - Anne Arundel County Maryland (related document(s)2209) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2210 |
Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 |
Notice of Agenda |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 10, 2011 at 9:45 a.m. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2209 |
Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 |
Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 1181 Liquidating Trustee's Amended Objection to Claim No. 1181 of Anne Arundel County Maryland with hearing to be held on 12/7/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 11/29/2011, filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC.(Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2208 |
Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Re: Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from July 1, 2011 to September 30, 2011 (related document(s)2207) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2207 |
Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from July 1, 2011 to September 30, 2011 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2206 |
Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 10/18/2011 Resolving Claims Filed by QWEST and Allowing Claims in an Agreed Upon Amount. (Philbert, Gemma)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2205 |
Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and AGreed Order Resolving Claims Filed by Qwest and Allowing Claims in an Agreed Upon Amount (related document(s)1655) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 10/18/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 10/18/2011, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2204 |
Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: 9/20/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service - Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 20, 2011 at 9:45 a.m. (related document(s)2203) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2203 |
Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 |
Notice of Agenda |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 20, 2011 at 9:45 a.m. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/20/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2202 |
Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service of Edward J. Devane - Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 17, 2011 at 9:45 a.m. (related document(s)2201) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2201 |
Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 |
Notice of Agenda |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 17, 2011 at 9:45 a.m. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2200 |
Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011 |
Letter |
|
Docket Text: Letter Re: Change Of Address for Technology Resource Center of America, LLC (TRCA), telephone Data Systems, L.P. (TDS), and Telecom Remarketing of America, L.P. filed by David Hager. (Greene, Chantel)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2199 |
Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal The Liquidating Trustee's Withdrawal of Its Objection to Claim No. 548 Filed by Link2Gov Corp. (related document(s)1856) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2198 |
Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Objection to Claim of NIS Corporation of the BearingPoint Inc. Liquidating Trustee (related document(s)2196) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2197 |
Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing on the Liquidating Trustee's Motion (with Motion) to Stay Adversary Proceeding [Adv.Proc.No. 11-02439] (related document(s)2193) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2196 |
Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation signed on 8/3/2011 Resolving Objection to Claim of NIS Corporation. (related document(s)2187) (Blum, Helene)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2195 |
Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Docket Nos. 2188 and 2189 (related document(s)2189, 2188) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2194 |
Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service of Edward J. Devane - Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period From April 1, 2011 to June 30, 2011 (related document(s)2191) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2193 |
Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing on the Liquidating Trustee's Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding (related document(s)2192) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 8/10/2011, (Attachments: 1 Motion to Stay Case - Adv. No. 11-24392 Exhibit A to Motion to Stay Case)(Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2170 |
Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order (with Stipulation and Agreed Order) Resolving Claims Filed by Jones Lang LaSalle and Allowing Claims in Agreed Upon Amount (related document(s)2169) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2169 |
Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Claims Filed by JLL and Allowing Claims in an Agreed Upon Amount (related document(s)1651) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 7/12/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 7/12/2011, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2168 |
Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Consent Order Regarding Motions for Limited Relief (related document(s)2166) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2167 |
Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Docket Nos. 2163, 2164 and 2165 (related document(s)2163, 2165, 2164) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2116 |
Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 |
Order(Generic) |
|
Docket Text: Case Management Order #2 signed on 2/24/2011. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2115 |
Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Claim No. 699 Filed by Harry You filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 3/3/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 3/3/2011, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2114 |
Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 |
Order Re: Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Liquidating Trustees Objection To Claim No 463 Of Gregory E. Davis (Related Doc # 2012) signed on 2/22/2011. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2113 |
Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 |
Order Re: Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Motion of Liquidating Trustees Objection To Claim No 964 Of John Distefano (Related Doc # 2013) signed on 2/22/2011. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2112 |
Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 11-01501. Complaint against Martinez, Louie . Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2111 |
Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 11-01500. Complaint against Federal Express Corporation . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2110 |
Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 11-01499. Complaint against Benjamin E. Sherman & Sons, Inc. d/b/a Red Rock Villas . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2109 |
Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 11-01498. Complaint against Microlink, LLC . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2108 |
Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 11-01497. Complaint against CA, Inc. d/b/a Computer Associates . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2107 |
Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 11-01496. Complaint against Veotag, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2016 |
Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service of Diane C. Lavin re: Notice of Withdrawal (related document(s)2010) filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of J.E. Austin Associates, Inc.. (Teele, Samuel)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2015 |
Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 |
Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Liquidating Trustee's Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Claims with hearing to be held on 2/2/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 1/21/2011, filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC.(Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2014 |
Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 |
Motion to Approve |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Approve Liquidating Trustee's Second Omnibus Motion for Deemed Schedule Amendments (Claims Disputed Under Section 502(d)) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 1/21/2011, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2013 |
Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 |
Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Amended Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 964 (related document(s)1626, 1677) with hearing to be held on 2/2/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 1/21/2011, filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC.(Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2012 |
Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 |
Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Amended Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 463 (related document(s)1567, 1602) with hearing to be held on 2/2/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 1/21/2011, filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC.(Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2011 |
Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 |
Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Liquidating Trustee's Sixteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims with hearing to be held on 2/2/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 1/21/2011, filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC.(Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2010 |
Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of J.E. Austin Associates, Inc.'s Request for Allowance and Payment of Chapter 11 Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)1641) filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of J.E. Austin Associates, Inc.. (Teele, Samuel)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2009 |
Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 |
Objection to Motion |
|
Docket Text: Objection to Motion Objection of Liquidating Trustee to Motion of DLT Solutions for Allowance of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)1648) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2008 |
Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/29/2010 |
Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Liquidating Trustee's Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims with hearing to be held on 2/2/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 1/21/2011, filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC.(Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2007 |
Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/29/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Docket Nos. 2000, 2001 and 2006 (related document(s)2000, 2001, 2006) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2006 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Between Debtor BearingPoint, Inc. and Ace-USA/Westchester Fire Insurance Company filed by Yvette Ostolaza on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 12/29/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/28/2010, (Ostolaza, Yvette)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2005 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Proposed Order (related document(s)2002) filed by Joseph Pantoja on behalf of United States Of America. (Pantoja, Joseph)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2004 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)2002) filed by Joseph Pantoja on behalf of United States Of America. (Pantoja, Joseph)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2003 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 |
Affidavit |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit Declaration of Terrie L. Callahan (related document(s)2002) filed by Joseph Pantoja on behalf of United States Of America. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit 12 Exhibit 23 Exhibit 34 Exhibit 4)(Pantoja, Joseph)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2002 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 |
Motion to Reconsider FRCP 60 or FRBP 3008 |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Reconsider FRCP 60 or FRBP 3008 Motion for Relief from Injunction, or, in the Alternative, for Clarification that Injunction Does Not Affect Government's Setoff, Recoupment or Subrogation Rights filed by Joseph Pantoja on behalf of United States Of America. (Attachments: 1 Pleading Memorandum of Law) (Pantoja, Joseph)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2001 |
Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: Settlement Stipulation Order signed on 12/16/2010 by and Between The Liquidating Trustee and Booz Allen. (related document(s)1989) (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2000 |
Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 12/17/2010 Resolving Claims Filed by, and Asserted By Debtor and Liquidating Trustee Against, Oracle. (related document(s)1988) (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1999 |
Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on 12/16/10 (related document(s)1994) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1998 |
Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance filed by Craig S. Waldman on behalf of Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson, J. Terry Strange. (Waldman, Craig)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1997 |
Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance filed by Paul C. Gluckow on behalf of Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson, J. Terry Strange. (Gluckow, Paul)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1996 |
Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance filed by Paul C. Curnin on behalf of Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson, J. Terry Strange. (Curnin, Paul)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1995 |
Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance filed by William T. Russell Jr. on behalf of Edward Munson, Jill Kanin-Lovers, Spencer C. Fleischer, Betsy J. Bernard, Douglas C. Allred, J. Terry Strange, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary. (Russell, William)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1994 |
Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 |
Notice of Agenda |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 16, 2010 at 9:45 a.m. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/16/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1993 |
Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Docket Nos. 1988 and 1989 (related document(s)1989, 1988) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1992 |
Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 |
Scheduling Order |
|
Docket Text: Order signed on 12/14/2010 Scheduling Final Hearing on document(s)1977,and 1979 with hearing to be held on 1/21/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1991 |
Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: 12/13/2010 |
Order Re: Application for Pro Hac Vice |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Steven M. Pyser (Related Doc # 1987) signed on 12/13/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1990 |
Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: 12/13/2010 |
Order Re: Application for Pro Hac Vice |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Robert A. Van Kirk (Related Doc # 1986) signed on 12/13/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1989 |
Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION BY AND BETWEEN THE LIQUIDATING TRUSTEE AND BOOZ ALLEN filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 12/16/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/16/2010, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1988 |
Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment NOTICE OF PRESENTMENT OF STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER RESOLVING CLAIMS FILED BY, AND RELEASING CLAIMS ASSERTED AGAINST, ORACLE filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 12/16/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1987 |
Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 |
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Steven M. Pyser on behalf of F. Edwin Harbach. Filing fee collected, receipt #185319. (Hibbert, Stacey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1986 |
Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 |
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Robert A. Van Kirk on behalf of F. Edwin Harbach. Filing fee collected, receipt #185318. (Hibbert, Stacey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1985 |
Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 |
Master Service List (FOR CLAIMS AGENT USE) |
|
Docket Text: Master Service List (12/10/10) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1984 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 |
Order Re: Application for Pro Hac Vice |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Robert Manley (Related Doc # 1978) signed on 12/1/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1983 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 |
Order Re: Application for Pro Hac Vice |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Lewis T. LeClair (Related Doc # 1976) signed on 12/1/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1982 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Docket Nos. 1977 and 1979 (related document(s)1979, 1977) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1981 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim Nos. 1019 and 1076 of The Ministry of Finance for The Republic of Indonesia (related document(s)1973) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1980 |
Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)1977) filed by Jeffrey S. Sabin on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Sabin, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1979 |
Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 |
Motion to Authorize |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Authorize Motion of Liquidating Trustee for Limited Relief from Article XI of Debtors' Modified Second Amended Joint Plan and Sections 34(C) and 39 of Confirmation Order as to Certain Former Directors (related document(s)1977) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/16/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 11/9/2010, (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Proposed Order4 Hearing Notice) (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1978 |
Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 |
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert Manley filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1977 |
Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 |
Motion to Authorize |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Authorize /Motion of Liquidating Trustee For Limited Relief From Article XI of Debtors' Modified Second Amended Joint Plan and Sections 34(C) and 39 Of Confirmation Order As To F. Edwin Harbach filed by Jeffrey S. Sabin on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/16/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 12/9/2010, (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Sabin4 Proposed Order5 Notice of Hearing) (Sabin, Jeffrey)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1976 |
Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 |
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lewis T. LeClair filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1975 |
Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 |
Letter |
|
Docket Text: Letter filed by John Lihani. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1974 |
Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by County of Henrico, Virginia. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1973 |
Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 |
Order(Generic) |
|
Docket Text: Order signed on 11/17/2010 Granting Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim Nos. 1019 and 1076 of the Ministry of Finance for the Republic of Indonesia. (related document(s)1967) (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1972 |
Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 |
Withdrawal of Claim |
|
Docket Text: (INCORRECT PDF FILE SUBMITTED) Withdrawal of Claim(s): No(s). 1054, 1055, and 1087 filed by The County of Henrico, Virginia filed by Rhysa Griffith South.(Lopez, Mary) Modified on 12/6/2010 (Richards, Beverly).
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1971 |
Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: 11/11/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Claims Filed by AT&T and Allowing Claims in an Agreed Upon Amount (related document(s)1968) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1970 |
Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: 11/11/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Settlement of Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim Nos. 1019 and 1076 of The Ministry of Finance for The Republic of Indonesia (related document(s)1967) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1969 |
Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: 11/11/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Docket Nos. 1964, 1965 and 1966 (related document(s)1965, 1966, 1964) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1968 |
Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation signed on 11/9/2010 Resolving Claims Filed by AT&T and Allowing Claims in an Agreed Upon Amount. (related document(s)1960) (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1967 |
Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment Notice of Settlement of Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim Nos. 1019 and 1076 of the Ministry of Finance for the Republic of Indonesia and Opprtunity for Hearing (related document(s)1964) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 11/12/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 11/12/2010, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1966 |
Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 |
Order Re: Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Related Doc # 1921) signed on 11/5/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1965 |
Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 |
Order Re: Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Thirteenth Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Claims (Related Doc # 1920) signed on 11/5/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1964 |
Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 |
written opinion |
|
Docket Text: Bench Decision on Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim Nos. 1019 and 1076 of The Ministry of Finance for The Republic of Indonesia signed on 11/5/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1963 |
Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on 11/4/10 (related document(s)1961) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1962 |
Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order (with Stipulation and Agreed Order) Resolving Claims Filed by AT&T (related document(s)1960) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1961 |
Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 |
Notice of Agenda |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 4, 2010 at 9:45 a.m. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/4/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1960 |
Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Claims Filed by AT&T and Allowing Claims in an Agreed Upon Amount (related document(s)1642) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 11/8/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 11/8/2010, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
1959 |
Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Stipulation and Agreed Order Between the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust and the PA Dept of Revenue (related document(s)1946) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1958 |
Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 |
Opposition |
|
Docket Text: Opposition to Disallowance and Expungement of Claim No. 513 filed by Maitre Jean-Charles Guillard. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1957 |
Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 |
Objection |
|
Docket Text: Objection to Request to Dismiss Claim filed by Gwen Pope. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1956 |
Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)1955) filed by Leonora K. Baughman on behalf of Oakland County Treasurer. (Baughman, Leonora)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1955 |
Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal (related document(s)1944) filed by Leonora K. Baughman on behalf of Oakland County Treasurer. (Baughman, Leonora)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1954 |
Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Debtors Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report (7/1/10 to 9/30/10) (related document(s)1950) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1953 |
Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment of the Hearing on Debtors' Objection to Proof of Claim (Claim No. 417 filed by ACE-USE/Westchester Fire) (related document(s)1949) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1952 |
Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 |
Response |
|
Docket Text: Response to Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Proof of Claim (related document(s)1921) filed by Jean-Charles Guillard on behalf of Philip Greenfield. (Richards, Beverly)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1951 |
Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 |
Order Re: Application for Pro Hac Vice |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Blake Bailey (Related Doc # 1914) signed on 10/22/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1950 |
Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 |
Post-Confirmation Report |
|
Docket Text: Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from July 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1949 |
Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of the Hearing on Debtors' Objection to Proof of Claim (Claim No. 417 Filed by Ace-Use/Westchester Fire) and Extension of the Response Deadline (related document(s)1551) filed by Yvette Ostolaza on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/19/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 1/5/2011, (Ostolaza, Yvette)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1948 |
Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service Motion to Withdraw (related document(s)1947) filed by William L. Siegel on behalf of Ignite Techno.ogies, Inc.. (Siegel, William)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1947 |
Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 |
Motion to Withdraw Document |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Withdraw Document Motion for Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)1851) filed by William L. Siegel on behalf of Ignite Techno.ogies, Inc.. (Siegel, William)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1946 |
Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/19/2010 Between The Bearingpoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust And The Pennsylvania Department Of Revenue re: Claim Nos. 13, 14, 25, 26, 356, 645, 906, 1125, 1126, 1127, and 1128). (related document(s)1627) (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1945 |
Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/18/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)1944) filed by Leonora K. Baughman on behalf of Oakland County Treasurer. (Baughman, Leonora)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1944 |
Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/18/2010 |
Response to Motion |
|
Docket Text: (WITHDRAWN RE: DOCUMENT #1955) Response to Motion (related document(s)1921) filed by Leonora K. Baughman on behalf of Oakland County Treasurer. (Baughman, Leonora) Modified on 11/1/2010 (Richards, Beverly).
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1943 |
Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 |
Response |
|
Docket Text: Response to Liquidating Trustee's Amended Objection to Claim Nos. 1019 and 1076 of the Ministry of Finance for the Republic of Indonesia (related document(s)1917) filed by Ministry of Finance of the Republic of Indonesia. (White, Greg)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1942 |
Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order with Respect to Pennsylvania Dept of Revenue Claims (related document(s)1940) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1941 |
Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing on Liquidating Trustee's 13th Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Claims (with Objection); and; Notice of Liquidating Trustee's 14th Omnibus Objection to Claims (with Objection) (related document(s)1921, 1920) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1940 |
Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order with Respect to Pennsylvania Department of Revenue Proofs of Claim filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 10/14/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 10/14/2010, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1939 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03862. Complaint against Technology Automation & Management, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1938 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03861. Complaint against Technology Associates International Corp. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1937 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03860. Complaint against Talent Fusion . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1936 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03859. Complaint against Sparta Consulting, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1935 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03858. Complaint against Convergys Customer Management Group Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1934 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03857. Complaint against Computex, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1933 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03856. Complaint against Pocket Water, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1932 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03855. Complaint against Bowne Management Systems, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1931 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03854. Complaint against NIIT USA, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1930 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03853. Complaint against N & N Human Capital Management, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1929 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03852. Complaint against Mascon Global Consulting, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1928 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03851. Complaint against Global English Corporation . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1927 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03850. Complaint against Force V Technologies, LLC . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1926 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03849. Complaint against Data Networks Corporation . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1925 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03847. Complaint against Baker, Tilly, Beers & Cutler PLLC . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1924 |
Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03846. Complaint against First Advantage Corporation . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1923 |
Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Claim No. 519 (related document(s)1919) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1922 |
Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/5/2010 Between The Bearingpoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust and Ignite Technologies, Inc. (related document(s)1851) (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1921 |
Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 |
Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Liquidating Trustee's Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims with hearing to be held on 11/4/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 10/25/2010, filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC.(Goodman, Peter)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1920 |
Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 |
Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Liquidating Trustee's Thirteenth Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Claims with hearing to be held on 11/4/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 10/25/2010, filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC.(Goodman, Peter)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1919 |
Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation signed on 9/30/2010 Between All Parties Resolving Claim No. 519 Filed by Mary J Craig and Allowing Claim in an Agreed Upon Amount. (related document(s)1912) (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1918 |
Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order with Respect to Ignite Technologies Administrative Claim; and; Notice of Hearing on the Liquidating Trustee's Amended Objection to Claim Nos. 1019 and 1076 (related document(s)1917, 1915) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1917 |
Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 |
Objection |
|
Docket Text: Objection Liquidating Trustee's Amended Objection to Claim Nos. 1019 and 1076 of the Ministry of Finance for the Republic of Indonesia (related document(s)1626, 1799) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/4/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 10/14/2010, (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1916 |
Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Claim No. 519 (related document(s)1912) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1915 |
Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 |
Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order Between the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust and Ignite Technologies, Inc. (related document(s)1851) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter) Docket Text Added on 10/27/2010 (Bush, Brent).
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1914 |
Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 |
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission |
|
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Blake Bailey filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1913 |
Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Stipulation and Agreed Order between BearingPoint Inc. Liquidating Trust and OH Dept of Taxation; and; Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 552 (related document(s)1909, 1910) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1912 |
Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 |
Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Claim No. 519 Filed by Mary J Craig and Allowing Claim in an Agreed Upon Amount filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter) Docket Text Added Modified on 10/26/2010 (Bush, Brent)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1911 |
Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 15, 2010 at 9:45 a.m. (related document(s)1908) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1910 |
Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 |
Order Re: Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 552 of Dwight Nash (Related Doc # 1894) signed on 9/17/2010 (White, Greg)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1909 |
Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation and Agreed Order with Respect to Ohio Department of Taxation Proofs of Claim signed on 9/17/2010 (White, Greg)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1908 |
Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 15, 2010 at 9:45 a.m. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/15/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1907 |
Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses filed by William L. Siegel on behalf of Ignite Techno.ogies, Inc.. (Siegel, William)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1906 |
Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service Notice of Adjournment of Hearing set on 9/15/10 to 10/20/10 (related document(s)1905) filed by William L. Siegel on behalf of Ignite Techno.ogies, Inc.. (Siegel, William)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1905 |
Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses filed by William L. Siegel on behalf of Ignite Techno.ogies, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Siegel, William)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1904 |
Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 |
Master Service List (FOR CLAIMS AGENT USE) |
|
Docket Text: Master Service List as of 9/9/10 filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1903 |
Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order (with Stipulation and Order) with Respect to Ohio Department of Taxation Proofs of Claim (related document(s)1901) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1902 |
Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 |
Withdrawal of Claim |
|
Docket Text: Withdrawal of Claim(s): #1098 and #1157 filed by Marvin E. Clements Jr. on behalf of Tennessee Department of Revenue.(Clements, Marvin)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1898 |
Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Kaizen Company, LLC for Allowance and Immediate Payment of an Administrative Expense Claim filed by Martin Mayerchak. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1897 |
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick J. Potter. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1896 |
Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 |
Letter |
|
Docket Text: Letter In re: Notification and Request to Remove MasterCard International from the list of creditors filed by MasterCard Worldwide. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1895 |
Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing on the Liquidating Trustee's Objection (with Objection) to Claim No. 552 of Dwight Nash (related document(s)1894) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1894 |
Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 |
Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 552 with hearing to be held on 9/15/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 9/7/2010, filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC.(Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1893 |
Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: 8/10/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Docket Nos. 1872, 1886, 1887, 1888, 1889 and 1890 (related document(s)1888, 1887, 1889, 1890, 1886, 1872) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1892 |
Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 |
Master Service List (FOR CLAIMS AGENT USE) |
|
Docket Text: Master Service List dated August 6, 2010 filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1891 |
Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on 8/4/10 at 9:30 a.m. (related document(s)1885) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1890 |
Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation signed on 8/4/2010 with Respect to New York City Department of Finance Proofs of Claim. (related document(s)1871) (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1889 |
Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 |
Order Re: Motion for Mediation |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Motion for an Order Establishing Mediation Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Regarding Certain Preference Claims(Related Doc # 1869) signed on 8/4/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1888 |
Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 |
Order Re: Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Related Doc # 1857) signed on 8/4/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1887 |
Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 |
Order Re: Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Related Doc # 1856) signed on 8/4/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1886 |
Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 |
Order Re: Motion for Objection to Claims |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Tenth Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Claims (Related Doc # 1855) signed on 8/4/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1847 |
Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Stipulation and Protective Order (related document(s)1846) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1846 |
Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/10/2010 |
So Ordered Stipulation |
|
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation and Protective signed on 6/10/2010 Between Attorneys for Non-Party Cerberus Capital Management, L.P. and Attorneys for John DeGroote Services, LLC as Liquidating Trustee to the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1845 |
Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Order Granting Trustee Leave to Conduct Rule 2004 Discovery of Judy Ethell (related document(s)1838) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1844 |
Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03272. Complaint against Cartus Corporation Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 USC 547 and 550. Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC, as liquidating trustee of the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1843 |
Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03271. Complaint against Igate Mastech, Inc. Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 USC 547 and 550. Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC, as liquidating trustee of the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1842 |
Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03270. Complaint against Autonomy, Inc. Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 USC 547 and 550. Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC, as liquidating trustee of the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1841 |
Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-03269. Complaint against Canon Business Solutions Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 USC 547 and 550. Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC, as liquidating trustee of the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1840 |
Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance and Demand for Notices and Service of Papers filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES CO., INC.. (Reisman, Steven)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1839 |
Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 26, 2010 at 9:45 a.m. (related document(s)1837) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1838 |
Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 |
Order re: Application for FRBP 2004 Examination |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Trustee's Motion For Leave to Conduct Rule 2004 Discovery of Judy Ethell (Related Doc # 1815) signed on 5/26/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1837 |
Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 26, 2010 at 9:45 a.m. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/26/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1836 |
Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010 |
Response to Motion |
|
Docket Text: Response to Motion Response of Ohio Department of Taxation to Objection to Claim nos. 142, 143 and 925 (related document(s)1571) filed by Victoria D. Garry on behalf of Ohio Department of Taxation. (Garry, Victoria)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1835 |
Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers. (Power, Mark)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1834 |
Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010 |
Transcript |
|
Docket Text: Transcript regarding Hearing Held on May 5, 2010 10:20 AM RE: Trustee's Motion for Leave to Conduct Rule 2004 Discovery of Eileen Kamerick; Motion to Release Funds Held in Deferred Compensation Accounts. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/9/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/18/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/11/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/9/2010. (Richards, Beverly)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1833 |
Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment of the Hearing on the Debtors' Objection to Proof of Claim (Claim No. 417 filed by ACE-USA/Westchester Fire) and Extension of the Response Deadline (related document(s)1832) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1832 |
Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 |
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of the Hearing on Debtors' Objection to Proof of Claim (Claim No. 417 Filed by Ace-Use/Westchester Fire) and Extension of the Response Deadline (related document(s)1551) filed by Yvette Ostolaza on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/15/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 9/1/2010, (Ostolaza, Yvette)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1831 |
Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Docket Nos. 1827, 1828 and 1830 (related document(s)1830, 1827, 1828) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1809 |
Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on 4/21/10 at 10:30 a.m. (related document(s)1804) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1808 |
Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 |
Order Re: Administrative Entry - Professional Fees |
|
Docket Text: Order signed on 4/21/2010 Granting Final Fee Applications and Second Interim (Related Doc # 1704) for McKool Smith, P.C., fees awarded: $156,917.50, expense awarded: $7,103.74, (Related Doc # 1695) for Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, fees awarded: $2,911,089.75, expense awarded: $99,942.57, (Related Doc # 1686) for Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP, fees awarded: $923,307.50, expense awarded: $14,981.29, (Related Doc # 1692) for Allen & Overy LLP, In British Pound Currency, fees awarded: $97,052.98, expense awarded: $82,577.00, (Related Doc # 1693) for Ernst & Young LLP, fees awarded: $1,933,635.02, expense awarded: $22,469.22, (Related Doc # 1694) for Blake Dawson, In Australian Currency, fees awarded: $242,345.20, expense awarded: $4,733.80, (Related Doc # 1696) for Wiley Rein LLP, fees awarded: $627,146.90, expense awarded: $4,649.43, (Related Doc # 1697) for Baker Botts LLP, fees awarded: $617,545.00, expense awarded: $3,406.14, (Related Doc # 1698) for Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP, fees awarded: $92,943.00, expense awarded: $1,500.00, (Related Doc # 1699) for Manatt, Phelps & Philips LLP, fees awarded: $746,765.00, expense awarded: $27,918.46, (Related Doc # 1701) for Barclays Capital, Inc., fees awarded: $480,000.00, expense awarded: $4,259.80, (Related Doc # 1702) for Bingham McCutchen LLP, fees awarded: $1,156,182.00, expense awarded: $44,752.06, (Related Doc # 1705) for Sheppard, Mullin, Richter and Hampton LLP, fees awarded: $96,051.68, expense awarded: $3,557.22. (The Second Interim Fees and Expenses Are Reflected Above. Please See Exhibit A "Total Compensation Period" For Final Awarded Amounts of All Fee Periods.) (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1807 |
Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)1800) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Liquidating Trustee. (Mai, Stephanie)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1806 |
Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 |
Notice to Produce Documents |
|
Docket Text: Notice to Produce Documents Notice of Service of Discovery filed by Theodore A. Kittila on behalf of 3M Company. (Kittila, Theodore)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1805 |
Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices filed by Michael C. Seamands on behalf of Custom Hardware Engineering & Consulting, Inc.. (Seamands, Michael)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1691 |
Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment / Notice of Presentment of Amended Proposed Order Granting Authority to the Liquidating Trustee Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 2004 (related document(s)1673) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Amended Proposed Order)(Mai, Stephanie)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1690 |
Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 |
Objection to Motion |
|
Docket Text: Objection to Motion / Objection of the BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trustee to Motion of Yale University for Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)1638) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Mai, Stephanie)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1689 |
Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 |
Response to Motion |
|
Docket Text: Response to Motion (related document(s)1627) filed by Christopher R. Momjian on behalf of Pennsylvania Department of Revenue. (Momjian, Christopher)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1688 |
Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)1687) filed by Amish R. Doshi on behalf of Oracle USA, Inc.. (Doshi, Amish)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1687 |
Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 |
reply to motion |
|
Docket Text: Reply to Motion Oracle America, Inc.'s Reply to Debtors' Seventh Objection to Proofs of Claim - Overstated and Misclassified Claims (related document(s)1626) filed by Amish R. Doshi on behalf of Oracle USA, Inc.. (Doshi, Amish)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1686 |
Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 |
Application for Final Professional Compensation |
|
Docket Text: Final Application for Final Professional Compensation / Second and Final Application of Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP, Special Counsel, period: 2/18/2009 to 12/30/2009, fee:$5,362,646.50, expenses: $51,313.95. filed by Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP. (Graulich, Timothy)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1685 |
Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Order Approving a Settlement Between BearingPoint, Inc., BearingPoint, LLC and the United States Agency for International Development (related document(s)1675) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
1684 |
Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 |
Complaint |
|
Docket Text: Adversary case 10-02874. Complaint against Allied Network Solutions, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1683 |
Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 |
Order Re: Motion to Approve |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust's Motion Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of a Settlement Among the Liquidating Trustee, the Liquidating Trust, California Defendants and ACE(Related Doc # 1669) signed on 2/23/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1682 |
Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 |
Response |
|
Docket Text: Response in Opposition to Debtor's Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Christopher J. Major on behalf of Greensboro Drive Property LLC. (Major, Christopher)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1681 |
Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service (related document(s)1673) filed by Katherine Dobson on behalf of Liquidating Trustee. (Dobson, Katherine)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1680 |
Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 |
Response |
|
Docket Text: Response to Debtor's Seventh Omnibus Objection To Proofs of Claim Overstated Claims filed by Springfield Office Center, L.L.C.. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1679 |
Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Filing of AP Services, LLC's Fourth Quarterly Report (with Report) of Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred (10/1/09--12/30/09) (related document(s)1670) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1678 |
Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service Response by Claimant, John C. Distefano, to the Liquidating Trustee's Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)1677) filed by Alan D. Halperin on behalf of John C. Distefano. (Halperin, Alan)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1677 |
Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 |
Response to Motion |
|
Docket Text: Response to Motion Response by Claimant, John C. Distefano, to the Liquidating Trustees Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)1626) filed by Alan D. Halperin on behalf of John C. Distefano. (Halperin, Alan)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1676 |
Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 |
Order(Generic) |
|
Docket Text: Courts Order signed on 2/22/2010 re: Scheduling a Status Conference on All Motions for Payment of Administrative Expense Claims with hearing to be held on 3/5/2010 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1675 |
Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 |
Order Re: Motion to Approve |
|
Docket Text: Order Granting Motion to Approve a Settlement Between BearingPoint, Inc., BearingPoint, LLC and the United States Agency for International Development(Related Doc # 1614) signed on 2/22/2010. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1674 |
Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Order Granting Debtors' Third Omnibus (Non-Substantive) Objection to Claims, and, Order Granting Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)1616, 1615) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1673 |
Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of an Order Granting Authority to the Liquidating Trustee Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 2004 filed by Katherine Dobson on behalf of Liquidating Trustee. with presentment to be held on 3/1/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 3/1/2010, (Dobson, Katherine)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1672 |
Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)1662) filed by Elise Scherr Frejka on behalf of Deloitte US Firms. (Frejka, Elise)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1671 |
Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Stipulation and Order Authorizing and Approving BearingPoint, Inc.'s Entry into an Insurance Program with American International Specialty Lines Insurance Co. (related document(s)1635) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1670 |
Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 |
Statement |
|
Docket Text: Statement / AP Services, LLC's Fourth Quarterly Report of Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for the Period of October 1, 2009 through December 30, 2009 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. Objections due by 3/9/2010, (Perez, Alfredo)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1669 |
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 |
Motion to Approve |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Approve /BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust's Motion Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of a Settlement Among the Liquidating Trustee, the Liquidating Trust, California Defendants and ACE (related document(s)1663) filed by Katherine Dobson on behalf of BearingPoint Liquidating Trustee. (Dobson, Katherine)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1668 |
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 |
Motion to Authorize |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service for Motion to Authorize Adminstirtive Expense for DLT Solutions, LLC filed by Jill Levi on behalf of DLT Solutions, LLC. (Levi, Jill) Modified on 3/4/2010 (Richards, Beverly).
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1667 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 |
Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses |
|
Docket Text: Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses for The Kaizen Company, LLC., Other Professional, period: to, fee:$42,939.79, expenses: $. filed by The Kaizen Company, LLC.. (Attachments: 1 Motion for Payment of Administrative Expense Claim2 Exhibit A3 Exhibit B4 Exhibit B25 Exhibit C6 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1666 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 |
Notice of Withdrawal |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel filed by 3M Company. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1665 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 |
Withdrawal of Claim |
|
Docket Text: Withdrawal of Claim(s): No. 814, filed on 4/22/2009 in the amount of $1,000.00 filed by Idaho State Tax Commission.(Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1664 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 |
Opposition |
|
Docket Text: Opposition filed by Irina Swift. (Lopez, Mary)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1663 |
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 |
Order(Generic) |
|
Docket Text: Ex Parte Order signed on 2/17/2010 re: Shortening Notice of the Bearingpoint Inc. Liquidating Trust's Motion Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of a Settlement Amongt the Liquidating Trustee, the Liquidating Trust, California Defendants and Ace. (Blum, Helene)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1662 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 |
Motion to Allow |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Allow/Request of the Deloitte U.S. Firms for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense filed by Elise Scherr Frejka on behalf of Deloitte US Firms. (Frejka, Elise)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1661 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)1660) filed by John A. Zaloom on behalf of Duke University. (Zaloom, John)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1660 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 |
Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses |
|
Docket Text: Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by John A. Zaloom. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order)3 Exhibit C (Notice)) (Zaloom, John)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1659 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 |
Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses |
|
Docket Text: (Duplicate entry of document no. 1656) Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses for Johnson Technology Systems, Inc, Other Professional, period: to, fee:$0, expenses: $135,336.73. filed by Johnson Technology Systems, Inc. (Zisser, Peter) Modified on 2/17/2010 (Bush, Brent)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1658 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)1656) filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Johnson Technology Systems, Inc. (Wolf, Robert)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1657 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing (Hearing Date to be determined) (related document(s)1656) filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Johnson Technology Systems, Inc. (Wolf, Robert)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1656 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 |
Motion to Allow Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Allow Claims -- Application for Allowance of Administrative Expense Claim filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Johnson Technology Systems, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit "A"2 Exhibit "B" -- Proposed Order) (Wolf, Robert)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1655 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 |
Motion to Allow Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Allow Claims Motion of Qwest Government Services, Inc. for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 503(b)(1)(A) filed by Debra S. Turetsky on behalf of Qwest Government Services, Inc.. (Attachments: 1 Notice2 Exhibit A) (Turetsky, Debra)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1654 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)1653) filed by Joseph B. Koczko on behalf of Teradata Government Systems LLC. (Koczko, Joseph)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1653 |
Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 |
Motion to Allow Claims |
|
Docket Text: (WITHDRAWN AS PER DOCUMENT #2062 Motion to Allow Claims Application of Teradata Government Systems LLC seeking entry of an order allowing and directing payment of administative expense filed by Joseph B. Koczko on behalf of Teradata Government Systems LLC. (Attachments: 1 Declaration in Support2 Notice3 Proposed Order) (Koczko, Joseph) Modified on 6/2/2011 (Richards, Beverly).
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1652 |
Filed: 2/15/2010, Entered: 2/15/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service of Motion for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Claim (related document(s)1651) filed by Joseph D. Frank on behalf of Jones Lang LaSalle-Northeast, Inc.. (Frank, Joseph)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1651 |
Filed: 2/15/2010, Entered: 2/15/2010 |
Motion to Allow Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Allow Claims Motion for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 503(b)(1)(A) and 507(a)(2) filed by Joseph D. Frank on behalf of Jones Lang LaSalle-Northeast, Inc.. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 proposed Order) (Frank, Joseph)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1650 |
Filed: 2/15/2010, Entered: 2/15/2010 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Joseph D. Frank on behalf of Jones Lang LaSalle-Northeast, Inc.. (Frank, Joseph)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1649 |
Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)1646) filed by Amish R. Doshi on behalf of Oracle USA, Inc.. (Doshi, Amish)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1648 |
Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 |
Motion to Allow |
|
Docket Text: Motion to AllowPayment of Administrative Claim filed by Jill Levi on behalf of DLT Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: 1 Exhibits A through E2 Proposed Order) (Levi, Jill)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1647 |
Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 |
Notice of Appearance |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance and Demand for Notices and Papers filed by Jill Levi on behalf of DLT Solutions, LLC. (Levi, Jill)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1646 |
Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 |
Motion to Allow Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Allow Claims Request For Allowance and Payment of Chapter 11 Administrative Expenses filed by Amish R. Doshi on behalf of Oracle USA, Inc.. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A) (Doshi, Amish)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1645 |
Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing on Motion of Yale University for Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)1638) filed by James O. Moore on behalf of Yale University. (Moore, James)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1644 |
Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 |
Certificate Of Service. |
|
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)1641) filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of J.E. Austin Associates, Inc.. (Teele, Samuel)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1643 |
Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 |
Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Proposed Order Granting J.E. Austin Associates, Inc.'s Request For Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)1641) filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of J.E. Austin Associates, Inc.. (Teele, Samuel)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1642 |
Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 |
Motion to Allow Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Allow Claims Request of AT&T Corp. for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expense Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(1)(a) and 507(a) filed by Johnathan C. Bolton on behalf of AT&T. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Proposed Order) (Bolton, Johnathan)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1641 |
Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 |
Motion to Allow Claims |
|
Docket Text: Motion to Allow Claims /Request for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of J.E. Austin Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit "A" - Outstanding Invoices2 Exhibit "B" - Copies of Post-Petition Invoices) (Teele, Samuel)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1640 |
Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 |
Affidavit of Service |
|
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of BearingPoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust's Motion (with Motion) for Approval of Settlement; and; Notice of Hearing (related document(s)1636, 1637) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1639 |
Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 |
Notice of Hearing. |
|
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing on Motion of Yale University for Payment of Administrative Expense Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 503(b) and 507(a) and Request for Related Relief (related document(s)1638) filed by James O. Moore on behalf of Yale University. with hearing to be held on 3/5/2010 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 3/1/2010, (Moore, James)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1638 |
Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 |
Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses |
|
Docket Text: Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses Motion of Yale University for Payment of Administrative Expense Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 503(b) and 507(a) and Request for Related Relief. filed by Yale University. with hearing to be held on 3/5/2010 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 3/1/2010, (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration2 Exhibit B - Order) (Moore, James)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
18450 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18309 , 18327 , 18339 , 18326 , 18317 , 18320 , 18323 , 18331 , 18321 , 18333 , 18316 , 18334 , 18343 , 18312 , 18336 , 18344 , 18308 , 18332 , 18341 , 18347 , 18335 , 18324 , 18310 , 18350 , 18351 , 18337 , 18342 , 18349 , 18329 , 18319 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18449 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Regarding (1) Transfer and Turnover of Certain Deposits, (2) Preservation of Citibanks Setoff Rights, if any, in Respect of Deposits Transferred or Turned Over, (3) Maintenance of Certain Deposit Accounts, (4) Indemnification of Citibank in Respect of Any Third Party Claims Arising from the Turnover of Deposits and (5) Payment of Account Fees filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 7/19/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 7/18/2011, (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18448 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 9695 & 49436 filed on behalf of Albert Oelrich, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18447 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Application of the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 327(a) and 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Expand the Scope of Retention of CB Richard Ellis, Inc. as a Real Estate Consultant, Effective as of June 8, 2011 filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 7/26/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 7/26/2011, (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18446 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Limited Objection of The Steven G. Holder Living Trust to the Amended Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 502(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of Procedures for Determining the Allowed Amount of Claims Filed Based on Structured Securities Issued or Guaranteed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (related document(s) 18127 ) filed by Minyao Wang on behalf of Steven G. Holder Living Trust and other Clients listed on Schedule I. (Wang, Minyao) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18445 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Status Report : Monthly Report of Assets Disposed of Pursuant to the De Minimis Asset Sale or Abandonment Procedures filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18444 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) : Debtors' One Hundred Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivatives Claims) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 8/10/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18443 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBHI Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66012, Amount 631,565.93). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18442 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBHI Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66012, Amount 43,061.31). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18441 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBHI Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66011, Amount 240,915.43). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18440 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBHI Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66011, Amount 3,533,426.37). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18439 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBHI Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66010, Amount 487,546.73). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18438 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response /Response of U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, to the Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Ann E. Acker on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Acker, Ann) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18437 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBHI Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66010, Amount 7,150,685.45). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18436 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBHI Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66009, Amount 432,441.83). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18435 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBHI Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66009, Amount 6,342,480.19). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18434 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18306 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18433 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBHI Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66008, Amount 4,341,842.07). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18432 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBHI Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66008, Amount 296,034.69). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18431 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBCS Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66017, Amount 3,533,426.37). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18430 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBCS Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66017, Amount 240,915.43). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18429 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBCS Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc(Claim No.66016, Amount 487,546.73). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18428 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBCS Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc(Claim No.66016, Amount 7,150,685.45). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18427 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 7/12/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims). (Related Doc # 16856 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18426 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBCS Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66015, Amount 432,441.83). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18425 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Supplemental Order Signed on 7/12/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred and Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims). (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18424 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBCS Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66015, Amount 6,342,480.19). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18423 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Order Signed on 7/12/2011 Granting Debtors' Seventy-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (to Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity). (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18422 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBCS Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66013, Amount 4,341,842.07). To Anchorage Capital Master Fund, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18421 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Fourth Supplemental Order Signed on 7/12/2011 Granting Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims). (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18420 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Order Signed on 7/12/2011 Granting Debtors' Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims). (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18419 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Order Signed on 7/12/2011 Granting Debtors' Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims). (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18418 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBCS Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66013, Amount 296,034.69). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18417 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 11513 ) filed by Joshua W. Cohen on behalf of Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Cohen, Joshua) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18416 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Claim Other Than For Security (LBCS Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66014, Amount 631,565.93). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18415 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Claim Other Than For Security (LBCS Inc) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.(Claim No.66014, Amount 43,061.31). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18414 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Limited Reponse of LMA SPC, for and on behalf of Map 1 Segregated Portfolio to the Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 18045 ) filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of LMA SPC for and on behalf of MAP I Segregated Portfolio. (Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18413 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter to Honorable James M. Peck Regarding Twentieth ADR Status Report filed by Peter Gruenberger on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Gruenberger, Peter) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18412 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motions of Jason T. Taylor and Philip Walsh for a Determination that the Automatic Stay Does Not Apply or, Alternatively, for Relief from Automatic Stay filed by Anthony Paduano on behalf of Jason T. Taylor, Phillip Walsh. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 8/10/2011, (Paduano, Anthony) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4646 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:PREPRINT LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT, INC.(Claim No.6273, Amount 9,656.00). To CONTRARIAN FUNDS, LLC. filed by Alisa Mumola on behalf of Contrarian Funds, LLC.(Mumola, Alisa) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4645 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:PREPRINT LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT, INC.(Claim No.6273, Amount 23,835.00). To CONTRARIAN FUNDS, LLC. filed by Alisa Mumola on behalf of Contrarian Funds, LLC.(Mumola, Alisa) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4644 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:PREPRINT LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT, INC.(Claim No.6273, Amount 34,423.00). To CONTRARIAN FUNDS, LLC. filed by Alisa Mumola on behalf of Contrarian Funds, LLC.(Mumola, Alisa) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4643 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:PREPRINT LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT, INC.(Claim No.6273, Amount 2,150.00). To CONTRARIAN FUNDS, LLC. filed by Alisa Mumola on behalf of Contrarian Funds, LLC.(Mumola, Alisa) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4642 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:PREPRINT LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT, INC.(Claim No.6273, Amount 20,212.00). To CONTRARIAN FUNDS, LLC. filed by Alisa Mumola on behalf of Contrarian Funds, LLC.(Mumola, Alisa) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4641 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:PREPRINT LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT, INC.(Claim No.6273, Amount 31,218.09). To CONTRARIAN FUNDS, LLC. filed by Alisa Mumola on behalf of Contrarian Funds, LLC.(Mumola, Alisa) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4640 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:PREPRINT LOGISTICS MANAGEMENT, INC.(Claim No.6273, Amount 366,332.94). To CONTRARIAN FUNDS, LLC. filed by Alisa Mumola on behalf of Contrarian Funds, LLC.(Mumola, Alisa) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4278 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service for 7/26/2011 filed by John J Collins Jr. on behalf of AlixPartners LLP. (Collins, John) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4277 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service re Designation of Contents filed on behalf of Appellants Lemania SICA V-SIF et al., (related document(s) 4276 ) filed by Richard A. Cirillo on behalf of Lemania SICAV-SIF, NBK Banque Privee (Suisse) SA, National Bank of Kuwait, S.A.K.. (Cirillo, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4242 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4209 , 4193 ) filed by Martin L. Seidel on behalf of JSBR Associates LP, Eileen Lehrer, Peter M. Lehrer, The Apmont Group Inc. Pension Plan, US Trust Co UD Peter M. Lehrer. (Seidel, Martin) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4241 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 4230 ) filed by Karl Geercken on behalf of Aozora Bank Ltd.. (Geercken, Karl) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4240 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal Regarding Memorandum Decision And Order Granting, To The Extent Set Forth Herein, Trustees Motion To Affirm Trustees Determinations Denying Claims Of Claimants Without BLMIS Accounts In Their Names, Namely, Investors In Feeder Funds and Errata Order (related document(s) 4209 , 4193 ) filed by Jan Douglas Atlas on behalf of Scherr Barbara, Steven and Debra Fagien, Family Partners, LLP, Family Partners, LLP (Prime Fund), Gerald Greenspoon, Jane K. Mirande Revocable Trust, Levinson Enterprises, L.P., Susan Schneider, Allison Matz Sepielli, William Matz Revocable Trust. (Atlas, Jan) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4239 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 4238 ) filed by Chaya F. Weinberg-Brodt on behalf of Felkirk Limited. (Weinberg-Brodt, Chaya) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4238 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4193 ) filed by Chaya F. Weinberg-Brodt on behalf of Felkirk Limited. (Weinberg-Brodt, Chaya) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
4237 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4209 , 4193 ) filed by Martin L. Seidel on behalf of Milton Fine 1997 Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Milton Fine Revocable Trust. (Seidel, Martin) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4236 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 4235 ) filed by Chaya F. Weinberg-Brodt on behalf of Collace Services Limited. (Weinberg-Brodt, Chaya) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4235 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4193 ) filed by Chaya F. Weinberg-Brodt on behalf of Collace Services Limited. (Weinberg-Brodt, Chaya) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4234 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4232 ) filed by Jennifer A. Clark on behalf of Jennifer A. Clark. (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4233 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4193 ) filed by Dara Gilwit Hammerman on behalf of Saucelle Investment SA Panama. (Hammerman, Dara) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4232 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4209 , 4193 ) filed by Jennifer A. Clark on behalf of Jennifer A. Clark. (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4231 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 4229 ) filed by Dara Gilwit Hammerman on behalf of Angels Park Management SA. (Hammerman, Dara) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4230 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal of Aozora Bank LTD. (related document(s) 4209 , 4193 ) filed by Karl Geercken on behalf of Aozora Bank Ltd.. (Geercken, Karl) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4229 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4193 ) filed by Dara Gilwit Hammerman on behalf of Angels Park Management SA. (Hammerman, Dara) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4228 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal with Certificate of Service (related document(s) 4209 , 4193 ) filed by Ronald L. Israel on behalf of Braymar Holdings Limited. (Israel, Ronald) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4227 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 4226 ) filed by Dara Gilwit Hammerman on behalf of Bright Colors Design Center Inc. Panama. (Hammerman, Dara) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4226 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4193 ) filed by Dara Gilwit Hammerman on behalf of Bright Colors Design Center Inc. Panama. (Hammerman, Dara) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4225 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4209 ) filed by Jil Mazer-Marino on behalf of Charles & Miriam Wood Charitable Remainder Trust U/A 12803, Raymond M. Murphy, Roger A. Enrico IRA, William B. Korb IRA. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mazer-Marino, Jil) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4224 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4209 , 4193 ) filed by Helen Chaitman on behalf of Neva Rosamilia, Nicholas Rosamilia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4223 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal of NBK Banque Privee (Suisse) S.A. and National Bank of Kuwait S.A.K. filed by Richard A. Cirillo on behalf of NBK Banque Privee (Suisse) SA. (Cirillo, Richard) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4222 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4209 , 4193 ) filed by Ronald A. Hewitt on behalf of Mel Enterprises Ltd.. (Hewitt, Ronald) ($255.00 Filing Fee Paid, Receipt Number: 187161)Modified on 7/12/2011 (Porter, Minnie). (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4221 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal filed by Jessica L Margolis on behalf of John E. Guinness Revocable Trust Dtd. 6/11/92. (Margolis, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4220 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4193 ) filed by James Addison Wright III on behalf of Trustees of Tufts College. (Wright, James) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4219 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4193 ) filed by James Addison Wright III on behalf of Arthur I. Segel. (Wright, James) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4218 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4193 ) filed by James Addison Wright III on behalf of Peter P. Jenkins, Nader F. Dareshori, Hans L. Cartensen III. (Wright, James) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4217 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 7/12/2011 Approving an Initial Allocation of Property to the Fund of Customer Property and Authorizing an Interim Distribution to Customers (Related Doc # 4048 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4216 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4193 ) filed by James Addison Wright III on behalf of Stichting Shell Pensioenfonds. (Wright, James) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4215 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 4209 , 4193 ) filed by Fred W. Reinke on behalf of AXA Private Managment. (Reinke, Fred) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2843 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Allow Claims Affidavit of Service on parties counsel for each filed motion w/supptg docs (related document(s) 2842 , 2840 , 2841 ) filed by Stephen G Mayhew on behalf of Ivonne Tolentino. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 12/1/2011, (Mayhew, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2842 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Allow Claims allow claim as timely filed (related document(s) 2840 , 2841 ) filed by Stephen G Mayhew on behalf of Reyna Villacis. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 12/1/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through E# 2 Enclosure Ltr to the CT) (Mayhew, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2841 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Allow Claims Accept claim as Timely filed (related document(s) 2840 ) filed by Stephen G Mayhew on behalf of Carlota Reyes. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 12/1/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through D# 2 enclosure letter) (Mayhew, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2840 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Allow Claims claim be deemed timely filed filed by Stephen G Mayhew on behalf of Ivonne Tolentino. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 12/1/2011, (Attachments: # (1) Attorney Certification# 2 Exhibit Exhibits A through E) (Mayhew, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2839 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition to Motion for an Order Approving Certain Personal Injury Claims Resolution Procedures (related document(s) 2488 ) filed by Timothy Tanner. (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2472 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Mabel Soto (related document(s) 2470 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2471 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Post-Confirmation Report. Quarter ended September 30, 2011 filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2422 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Rejection of Executory Contracts filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2421 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of No Objection / Certificiate of No Objection (related document(s) 2095 ) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2420 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing re: Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A.; to be Held on November 15, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (related document(s) 2412 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2419 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 2418 ) filed by Shelly A. DeRousse on behalf of Frank Davenport. (DeRousse, Shelly) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2418 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion (related document(s) 2404 ) filed by Shelly A. DeRousse on behalf of Frank Davenport. (DeRousse, Shelly) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2397 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of James H. Myers (related document(s) 2389 , 2391 , 2390 , 2392 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2396 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on July 28, 2011 AT 10:00 A.M. filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2395 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of No Objection Certificate Under 28 U.S.C. § 1746 Regarding Certain Claims Listed in FairPoint's Eighty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims ((A) Claims Satisfied by Cure, (B) Shareholder Claims, (C) Amended Claims, (D) Abandoned Account Receivable Claims, (E) (related document(s) 2369 , 2377 , 2378 ) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2394 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of FairPoint's Second Omnibus Motion to Estimate the Maximum Allowed Amount of Proofs of Claim Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 502(a) Solely as to proof of Claim Number 7043 Filed by Nicole Arey (related document(s) 1479 , 1592 ) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2372 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Limited Objection Pursuant To Section 502(b) Of The Bankruptcy Code Seeking Reclassification Of Proof Of Claim Number 842 Filed By KGP Logistics, Inc. filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 8/18/2011, (Grogan, James) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2363 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 6/22/2011 Granting Fairpoints Eighty-Second Omnibus Objection To Claims (Claims To Be Reduced, Allowed And, In Certain Instances, Reclassified)(Related Doc # 2285 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Signature Date Modified on 6/24/2011) (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 06/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2362 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Order signed on 6/22/2011 Granting Fairpoint's Eighty-First Omnibus Objection To Claims (A) Shareholder Claims, (B) No Basis In Books And Records, (C) No Basis - Noncompliant Claims, (D) Duplicate Claims, (E) Amended Claims, (F) Wrong Debtor Duplicate Claims (G) Duplicative Bank And Bondholder Claims, (H) Duplicative Priority Claims, And (I) As Applicable, Late-Filed Claims) (Related Doc # 2249 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2192 |
Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 11-02439. Complaint against F. Edwin Harbach, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary, J. Terry Strange, Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers, Edward Munson Complaint to Recover Claims for Breaches of Fiduciary Duties. Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by John DeGroote Services LLC, John DeGroote. (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2191 |
Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period From April 1, 2011 to June 30, 2011 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2190 |
Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Docket Nos. 2186 and 2187 (related document(s) 2187 , 2186 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2189 |
Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 7/28/2011 Resolving the Adversary Proceeding Commenced by John DeGroote Services, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee, Against American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (related document(s) 2179 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2188 |
Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 7/28/2011 Resolving Objection to Claim of New York State Department of Taxation and Finance . (related document(s) 2173 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2187 |
Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Objection to Claim of NIS Corporation (related document(s) 2008 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 8/3/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 8/3/2011, (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2186 |
Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on July 28, 2011 at 9:45 A.M. filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2185 |
Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Docket Nos. 2181 and 2182 (related document(s) 2181 , 2182 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2184 |
Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Motion (with Motion) Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 to Approve a Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving the Adversary Proceeding Commenced by John DeGroote Services, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee, against American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (related document(s) 2179 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2183 |
Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Settlement of an Order Annexation of Order to Notice (related document(s) 2181 , 2182 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2182 |
Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Settlement of an Order Notice of Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9006(c) Shortening Notice of the Liquidating Trustee's Motion Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Adversary 11-01483 (related document(s) 2180 , 2179 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/28/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 7/27/2011, (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2181 |
Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting The Liquidating Trustees Motion to Shorten Time re: Motion Pursuant To Bankruptcy Rule 9019 For Approval Stipulation And Agreed Order Resolving The Adversary Proceeding Commenced By John Degroote Services, Llc, As Liquidating Trustee, Against American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc (Related Doc # 2180 ) signed on 7/25/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2180 |
Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time (related document(s) 2179 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Basil Umari in Support# 2 Annex A - Proposed Order) (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2179 |
Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Compromise Motion of Liquidating Trustee for Approval of a Stipulation and Agreed Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Resolving the Adversary Proceeding Commenced by John DeGroote Services, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee, Against American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/28/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 7/27/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulation and Agreed Order) (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2178 |
Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting The Liquidating Trustee Limited Relief From Article XI of Debtors' Modified Second Amended Joint Plan and Sections 34(C) and 39 Of Confirmation Order (Related Doc # 1977 ), (Related Doc # 1979 ) signed on 7/19/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2177 |
Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Matthew L. Corwin (related document(s) 2173 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2176 |
Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Counter-Proposed Order Granting the Liquidating Trustee Limited Relief From Article XI of Debtors' Modified Second Amended Joint Plan and Sections 34(C) and 39 of Confirmation Order (related document(s) 2172 ) filed by Robert A. Van Kirk on behalf of Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, F. Edwin Harbach, Spencer C. Fleischer, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson, J. Terry Strange. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Kirk, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2175 |
Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
(This document is superseded by document no. 2176 ) Notice of Counter-Proposed Order Granting the Liquidating Trustee Limited Relief from Article XI of Debtors' Modified Second Amended Joint Plan and Section 34(C) and 39 of Confirmation Order (related document(s) 2172 ) filed by Robert A. Van Kirk on behalf of Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, F. Edwin Harbach, Jill Kanin-Lovers, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson, J. Terry Strange. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Redline of Proposed Order)(Van Kirk, Robert) Modified on 7/15/2011 (Bush, Brent). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2174 |
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 7/12/2011 Resolving Claims Filed by JLL and Allowing Claims in an Agreed Upon Amount. (related document(s) 2169 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2173 |
Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Objection to Claim of New York State Department of Taxation and Finance (related document(s) 2008 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 7/19/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 7/19/2011, (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2172 |
Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Settlement of an Order Granting the Liquidating Trustee Limited Relief from Article XI of Debtors' Modified Second Amended Joint Plan and Sections 34(c) and 39 of Confirmation Order (related document(s) 1979 , 1977 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/14/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 7/14/2011, (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2171 |
Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Bench Decision On Liquidating Trustees Motion For Relief From Plan And Confirmation Order signed on 7/11/2011. (related document(s) 1979 , 1977 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2166 |
Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Consent Order Regarding Motions For Limited Relief [Corresponds To Docket Nos. 1977, 1979, 1992, 2020, 2123, 2135 And 2145] signed on 6/28/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2165 |
Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/28/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2164 |
Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda - Notice of Change of Time of June 29, 2011 Hearing filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2011 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2163 |
Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 29, 2011 at 11:00 A.M. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2011 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2162 |
Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None |
 |
|
Letter to Judge Gerber regarding Stern v. Marshall filed by Robert A. Van Kirk on behalf of F. Edwin Harbach. (Van Kirk, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2161 |
Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Kevin G. Hroblak (Related Doc # 2156 ) signed on 6/20/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2160 |
Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: William F. Ryan, Jr. (Related Doc # 2155 ) signed on 6/20/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2159 |
Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Claim of Factiva, Inc. (related document(s) 2015 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2158 |
Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum Endorsed Order signed on 6/17/2011. The Motion is Denied Without Prejudice For Failure to Comply with Case Management Order #2, Paragraph 41. (related document(s) 2146 ) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2157 |
Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition to Liquidating Trustee's Motion to Strike and Reply in Support of Former Directors' Motion Requesting Access to Documents Obtained From Third Parties Pursuant to Rule 2004 Examination (related document(s) 2152 , 2146 ) filed by Robert A. Van Kirk on behalf of Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, F. Edwin Harbach, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson, J. Terry Strange. (Van Kirk, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2156 |
Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kevin G. Hroblak filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2155 |
Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of William F. Ryan, Jr. filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2154 |
Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Claim No. 513 Filed by Philip Greenfield (related document(s) 1921 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2153 |
Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: The Liquidating Trustee's Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, Opposition to Former Directors Motion Requesting Access to Documents Obtained from Third Parties Pursuant to Rule 2004 Examinations (related document(s) 2152 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2152 |
Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Strike or in the Alternative Opposition to Former Director's Motion Requesting Access to Documents Obtained from Third Parties Pursuant to Rule 2004 Examinations (related document(s) 2146 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/21/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 6/14/2011, (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2151 |
Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation Withdrawing Motion For Injunction, Or, In The Alternative, For Clarification That Injuntion Does Not Affect Government's Settoff, Recoupment Or Subrogation Rights (related document(s) 2002 ) filed by Joseph Pantoja on behalf of United States Of America. (Pantoja, Joseph) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2150 |
Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/16/10 RE: RE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCES FOR JOHN DEGROOTE SERVICES LLC V. FIRST ADVANTAGE CORPORATION; JOHN DEGROOTE SERVICES LLC V. BAKER, TILLY, BEERS & CUTLER PLLC; JOHN DEGROOTE SERVICES LLC V. DATA NETWORKS CORPORATION; JOHN DEGROOTE SERVICES LLC V. FORCE V TECHNOLOGIES, LLC; JOHN DEGROOTE SERVICES LLC V. MASCON GLOBAL CONSULTING, INC.; JOHN DEGROOTE SERVICES LLC V. N & N HUMAN CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, INC.; JOHN DEGROOTE SERVICES LLC V. NIIT USA, INC. ET AL;. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/24/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: AAA Electronic Sound Reporters.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 1079 , 1977 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/2/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/27/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/24/2011. (Frazier, Christopher) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2149 |
Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Consent Order Regarding Motions for Limited Relief (related document(s) 2145 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2148 |
Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order Granting the Former Directors' Motion Requesting Access to Documents Obtained From Third Parties Pursuant to Rule 2004 (related document(s) 2146 ) filed by Robert A. Van Kirk on behalf of Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, F. Edwin Harbach, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson, J. Terry Strange. with hearing to be held on 6/21/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 6/14/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Van Kirk, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2147 |
Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing on Former Directors' Motion Requesting Access to Documents Obtained By Third Parties Pursuant to Rule 2004 (related document(s) 2146 ) filed by Robert A. Van Kirk on behalf of Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, F. Edwin Harbach, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson, J. Terry Strange. with hearing to be held on 6/21/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 6/14/2011, (Van Kirk, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2146 |
Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to AllowAccess to Documents Obtained From Third Parties Pursuant to Rule 2004 Examinations filed by Robert A. Van Kirk on behalf of Douglas C. Allred, Betsy J. Bernard, F. Edwin Harbach, Spencer C. Fleischer, Jill Kanin-Lovers, Albert L. Lord, Roderick C. McGeary, Edward Munson, J. Terry Strange. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16) (Van Kirk, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2145 |
Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 5/23/2011 Consent Order Regarding Motions For Limited Relief [Corresponds To Docket Nos. 1977, 1979, 1992, 2020, 2123, And 2135]. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2144 |
Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on 5/19/11 (related document(s) 2143 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2143 |
Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 19, 2011 at 9:45 a.m. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/19/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2142 |
Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from 1/1/11 through 3/31/11 (related document(s) 2141 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2141 |
Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Post-Confirmation Report. / Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from January 1, 2011 to March 31, 2011 filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of BearingPoint, Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2140 |
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment (related document(s) 2138 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2139 |
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Supplemental Stipulation and Agreed Order Between the Liquidating Trust and the PA Dept of Revenue; and; Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Between the Liquidating Trust and IMG Worldwide, Inc. (related document(s) 2136 , 2137 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of Garden City Group Claims Agent. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2138 |
Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 2011 , 2008 , 2015 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/19/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2137 |
Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 4/26/2011 Resolving Claim Filed by IMG Worldwide, Inc. and Allowing Claims in an Agreed Upon Amount. (related document(s) 2134 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2136 |
Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Stipulation And Agreed Order Between The Bearingpoint, Inc. Liquidating Trust And The Pennsylvania Department Of Revenue signed on 4/26/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2135 |
Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Consent Order signed on 4/21/2011 Regarding Motions For Limited Relief. (related document(s) 2123 , 1992 , 2020 , 1979 , 1977 ). (Rodriguez, Maria) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2134 |
Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Claim Filed by IMG Worldwide, Inc. and Allowing Claims in an Agreed Upon Amount (related document(s) 2008 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 4/22/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 4/22/2011, (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2133 |
Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Stipulation and Agreed Order with Respect to Pennsylvania Department of Revenue (related document(s) 1946 ) filed by Peter S. Goodman on behalf of John DeGroote Services LLC. with presentment to be held on 4/22/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 4/22/2011, (Goodman, Peter) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2132 |
Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter (related document(s) 2002 ) filed by Joseph Pantoja on behalf of United States Of America. (Pantoja, Joseph) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2131 |
Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter filed by CT Corporation. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|