Asustek Computer Inc. et al v. Round Rock Research, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-06636
District Judge Claudia Wilken, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 3:42 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Asus Computer International, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Schnurer +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 schnurer@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Charles Pistorino +1 650 798 3500 +1 650 798 3600 PistorinoJ@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheng Chieh Ko +1 858 720 5700 +1 858 720 5799 jko@perkinscoie.com
TERMINATED: 03/19/2012 Joseph P. Reid +1 858 720 5741 +1 858 720 5799 JReid@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Asustek Computer, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Schnurer +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 schnurer@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Charles Pistorino +1 650 798 3500 +1 650 798 3600 PistorinoJ@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheng Chieh Ko +1 858 720 5700 +1 858 720 5799 jko@perkinscoie.com
TERMINATED: 03/19/2012 Joseph P. Reid +1 858 720 5741 +1 858 720 5799 JReid@perkinscoie.com
v.
No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Represented by Desmarais LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Bondor +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 6460 paul.bondor@kirkland.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (143) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER Granting 135 STIPULATION of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/2/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Round Rock Research, LLC., Asus Computer International Inc, Asustek Computer Inc (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 133 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 4/28/2014) Modified on 4/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/28/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
            Redacted Joint Letter Brief re 123 -4 pursuant to order 126 filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 (redacted version of letter brief))(Related document(s) 123 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/28/2014) Modified on 4/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/28/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              Transcript of the Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on April 24, 2014, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Transcriber Carrie McKee-Parks, Telephone number 510-637-9897; mckee-parks65@att.net. FTR 3:00-3:46. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (Related documents(s) 127 ) (cmp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2014) (Entered: 04/27/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/25/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/25/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 4/24/2014) re 109 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (FTR Recording 3:00-3:46) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2014) Modified on 4/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/24/2014) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Re: Dkt. Nos. 108, 113, 119, 123). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/23/2014 (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that the hearing on Defendants Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Infringement Contentions (Dkt. No. 109) currently scheduled for April 17, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. is continued to April 24, 2014 at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. The Court will also address the joint discovery letter (Dkt. No. 123-4) at that time. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                            Declaration of Tawen Chang ISO the Parties' Joint Letter Brief and Exhibits filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 4A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 4B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 10)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/11/2014) Modified on 4/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 123 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in the Parties' Joint Letter Brief filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tawen Chang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 4 Exhibit Joint Letter Brief (sealed), # 5 Exhibit Ex. 1 (sealed), # 6 Exhibit Ex. 2 (sealed), # 7 Exhibit Ex. 3 (sealed), # 8 Exhibit Ex. 6 (sealed), # 9 Exhibit Ex. 7 (sealed), # 10 Exhibit Ex. 11 (sealed), # 11 Exhibit Ex. 12 (sealed), # 12 Exhibit Ex. 13 (sealed), # 13 Exhibit Ex. 14 (sealed), # 14 Exhibit Ex. 15 (sealed), # 15 Exhibit Ex. 16 (sealed), # 16 Exhibit Ex. 17 (sealed))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/11/2014) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                Declaration of Yun Lu in Support of 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply in support of its Motion to Supplement its Infringement Contentions filed byAsus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 119 ) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 4/4/2014) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                  REPLY (re 109 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS ) (Declaration of Lauren Nowierski) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 118 filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Y)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2014) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply in support of its Motion to Supplement its Infringement Contentions (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/31/2014) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 119 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply in support of its Motion to Supplement its Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lauren Nowierski, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Reply Brief (redacted), # 4 Reply Brief (sealed))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/31/2014) Modified on 4/1/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                        REPLY (re 109 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS ) (Declaration of Lauren Nowierski) filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Y)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/31/2014) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Motion Hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that the hearing on Defendants Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Infringement Contentions (Dkt. No. 109 ) is rescheduled for April 17, 2014 at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. The briefing schedule shall remain the same. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER REGARDING FEBRUARY 25, 2014 DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/28/2014 (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes RE: 104 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, 108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 109 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS, and 113 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/26/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. re 113 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle, # 2 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Amend, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Opposition, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Opposition, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Opposition, # 6 Exhibit 7 to Opposition, # 7 Exhibit 8 to Opposition, # 8 Proposed Order)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE (re 109 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS ) Opposition filed byAsus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit 9)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John Dudley Esterhay (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 3/20/2014) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Declaration of Yun Lu in Support of 108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Motion to Supplement Its Infringement Contentions filed byAsus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 108 ) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 3/14/2014) Modified on 3/17/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 3/24/2014. Replies due by 3/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lauren Nowierski, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit U, # 14 Exhibit X)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified on 3/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Motion to Supplement Its Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lauren Nowierski, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions (under seal), # 4 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions (redacted), # 5 Exhibit C (under seal), # 6 Exhibit L (under seal), # 7 Exhibit M (under seal), # 8 Exhibit N (under seal), # 9 Exhibit O (under seal), # 10 Exhibit P (under seal), # 11 Exhibit Q (under seal), # 12 Exhibit R (under seal), # 13 Exhibit S (under seal), # 14 Exhibit T (under seal), # 15 Exhibit V (under seal), # 16 Exhibit W (under seal))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Yun Louise Lu (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Order granting 105 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 2/26/2014) Modified on 2/27/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel Jose Bombach (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Chart of Disputed Terms)(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/10/2014) Modified on 1/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Alcide Morin for Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants ASUS Computer International and ASUSTeK Computer Inc. (Morin, Philip) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Karim Oussayef. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Karim Oussayef. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Ameet A. Modi. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Ameet A. Modi. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Karim Oussayef ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8137393.) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Oussayef, Karim) (Filed on 11/5/2013) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Ameet A. Modi ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8135868.) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service A. Modi Certificate of Good Standing)(Modi, Ameet) (Filed on 11/5/2013) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry: Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Matter did not settle. Parties instructed to call Judge Ryu if developments warrant further settlement discussions. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2013) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Order granting 93 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Edward Terchunian ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8042341.) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Terchunian, Edward) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                ANSWER to Counterclaim byAsus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 9/16/2013) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC of Firm Name Change (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 9/16/2013) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Andrew Grant Hamill (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 9/11/2013) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 87 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Round Rock Research LLC. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 9/4/2013) Modified on 9/5/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 8/23/2013) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on August 14, 2013, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, Diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2013. (Related documents(s) 84 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 8/19/2013) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 78 Stipulation to Remove Case From ADR Program (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 78 Stipulation to Remove Case From ADR Program (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Round rock Research LLC, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 8/7/2013) Modified on 8/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Grant Hamill as counsel for Round Rock Research, LLC (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 8/5/2013) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for Wednesday, July 31, 2013, is continued to Wednesday, August 14, 2013, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by August 7, 2013. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Case Management Conference NOT held on 7/10/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 7/10/2013). Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2013 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Jennifer Macato.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2013) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 79
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Remove Case From ADR Program filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Round Rock Research LLC, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 7/12/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear by Telephone at July 10, 2013 Case Management Conference filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (McKitterick, Nathaniel) (Filed on 7/9/2013) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Round Rock Research, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 7/3/2013) Modified on 7/5/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Eighth Stipulation Extending Time In Which To Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Asustek Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc. (McKitterick, Nathaniel) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, July 1, 2013 at 2:00 PM pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 72 Parties' Stipulated Motion for Continuance of the Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, Notice of Rescheduled Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tawen Chang ISO Stipulated Motion for Continuance of Settlement Conference)(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/31/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Seventh Stipulation Extending Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Asustek Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc. (McKitterick, Nathaniel) (Filed on 4/12/2013) Modified on 4/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Round Rock Research LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/3/2013) Modified on 4/4/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference set for 6/18/2013 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/29/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Sixth Stipulation Extending Time in which to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Asustek Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc. (McKitterick, Nathaniel) (Filed on 1/15/2013) Modified on 1/16/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ryu for Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Round Rock Research LLC. (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 1/2/2013) Modified on 1/3/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Fifth Stipulation Extending Time In Which to Answer Or Otherwise Respond filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Asustek Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc. (McKitterick, Nathaniel) (Filed on 11/28/2012) Modified on 11/29/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Fourth Stipulation Extending Time In Which To Answer Or Otherwise Respond filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Asustek Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc. (McKitterick, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/27/2012) Modified on 9/28/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Round Rock Research, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2012) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Beth H. Parker as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Order granting in part and denying in part 60 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. The mediation deadline is extended until Jan. 14, 2013. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Completion of Mediation filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Tawen Chang (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 8/13/2012) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, August 13, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Third Stipulation Extending Time In Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (McKitterick, Nathaniel) (Filed on 7/31/2012) Modified on 8/2/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Order granting 55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Lauren M. Nowierski (Filing fee $305, receipt number 44611009140.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/20/12 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ROUND ROCK'S 12 MOTION FOR STAY AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/5/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012) . (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Second Stipulation Extending Time In Which To Answer Or Otherwise Respond filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Asustek Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 6/1/2012) Modified on 6/4/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter H. Chang (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 5/24/2012) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 45 Statement of Order Vacating Stay re Elpida Components (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chang, Peter) (Filed on 5/10/2012) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Extending Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Asustek Computer Inc, Asus Computer International Inc. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 5/10/2012) Modified on 5/11/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE re Motion to Relate Cases: The Court has reviewed the motion and has determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order denying 46 Motion to Relate Case entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 46 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER CASES RELATED ) filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chang, Peter) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER CASES RELATED filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 4/27/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement OF RECENT DECISION STAYING CASE AS IT RELATES TO ELPIDA COMPONENTS by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schnurer, John) (Filed on 4/25/2012) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of American Megatrends Inc. by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 4/25/2012) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 45 . *** Statement OF RECENT DECISION STAYING CASE AS IT RELATES TO ELPIDA COMPONENTS by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 4/25/2012) Modified on 4/25/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 4/19/2012) Modified on 4/20/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. Proof of Service Summons and Complaint on Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by serving U.S. Subsdiary Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Joseph P. Reid (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 3/19/2012) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 3/15/2012) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order granting 36 Stipulation selecting Mediation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. However, the mediation shall be held no later than Sept. 14, 2012. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 3/14/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. filed by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 3/14/2012) Modified on 3/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Round Rock Research LLC (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/14/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed byAsus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order granting 28 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Declaration of Gerard A. deBlasi in Support of 12 to Motion to Dismiss filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 12 ) (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 2/21/2012) Modified on 2/22/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit in Support of 30 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 30 ) (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 2/21/2012) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 12 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 2/21/2012) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 12 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byAsus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 3 Exhibit Ex 2 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 4 Exhibit Ex 3 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 5 Exhibit Ex 4 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 6 Exhibit Ex 5 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 7 Exhibit Ex 6 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 8 Exhibit Ex 7 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 9 Exhibit Ex 8 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 10 Exhibit Ex 9 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 11 Exhibit Ex 10 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 12 Exhibit Ex 11 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 13 Exhibit Ex 12 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 14 Exhibit Ex 13 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 15 Exhibit Ex 14 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 16 Exhibit Ex 15 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 17 Exhibit Ex 16 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 18 Exhibit Ex 17 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer, # 19 Exhibit Ex 18 of Michael Engle ISO Plaintiffs Asustek Computer Inc. and ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, To Transfer)(Schnurer, John) (Filed on 2/14/2012) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue Case Management Conference, and hearing on Round Rock's Motion to Dismiss to April 26, 2012 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC, Asus Computer International Inc, Asustek Computer Inc. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Renotice motion hearing re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Related document(s) 12 ) (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 2/9/2012) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. re 25 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 2/9/2012) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on February 8, 2012. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Round Rock Research, LLC . (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 2/7/2012) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 19 Jonas R. McDavit's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 18 Paul A. Bondor's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of Jonas R. McDavit for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611070036.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/31/2012 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION of Paul A. Bondor for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611070036.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/31/2012 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE TO PARTIES Re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge with deadline set. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford John Black for Defendant Round Rock Research LLC (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/31/2012) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit in Support of 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2012) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Paul J. Riley in Support of 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 12 ) (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2012) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Gerard A. deBlasi in Support of 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 12 ) (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2012) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 2/14/2012. Replies due by 2/21/2012. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2012) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC of Pendency of Other Action (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2012) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Round Rock Research, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Micron Technology Inc., Other Affiliate John M. Desmarais, Other Affiliate Desmarais LLP, Other Affiliate IPValue Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Gemas Capital, Inc. for Round Rock Research, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2012) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter H. Chang for Defendant Round Rock Research LLC (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 1/31/2012) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 1/11/2012) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. Proof of Service of Summons on Round Rock Research LLC (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 1/11/2012) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patents (cc: form mailed to register). (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2012 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Round Rock Research, LLC. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011) (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011) (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to American Megatrends Inc.. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011) (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT with jury demand against American Megatrends Inc., Round Rock Research, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Filing fee $350, receipt number 54611011051). Filed byAsus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2012: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet) (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 601 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?