Nguyen v. Mukasey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-06277-JCS
District Judge Joseph C. Spero, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ha, Nguyen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by peerallylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shah Iqbal Nawaaz Peerally +1 510 742 5887 +1 510 742 5877 shah@peerallylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert J Beles Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erich Keefe +1 510 742 5887 +1 510 742 5877 ekeefe@lmi.net
v.
No Logo Christina Poulos, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Emilio Gonzalez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Chertoff, Michael Chertoff, Michael, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Chertoff"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert S. Mueller, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robin Barrett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A. Olsen +1 415 436 6915 +1 415 436 6927 edward.olsen@usdoj.gov
Office San Francisco
Filed 12/12/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Alameda
Terminated 3/11/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, CLOSED, E-Filing
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
STIPULATIO AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/11/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Stipulation
    STIPULATION to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order by Michael Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Robert S. Mueller, III, Christina Poulos, Robin Barrett. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
      CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Robert S. Mueller, III, Christina Poulos, Robin Barrett.. (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 3/10/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
        CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ha Nguyen.. (Keefe, Erich) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
          CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE: Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by Jan. 4, 2008. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 ADR Scheduling Order
            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2008 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) CMC Standing Order, # (2) JCS Standing Order, # (3) New Standing Order)(gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Complaint
            COMPLAINT for Mandamus to Compel Defendants to Complete Adjudication of Adjustment of Status Application against Michael Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Robert S. Mueller, III, Christina Poulos, Robin Barrett ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 44611001609). Filed by Ha Nguyen. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007) (gba, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2008: # (1) Exhibits to Complaint) (gba, COURT STAFF).
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Case Referred to ECF
            CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Summons Issued
              Summons Issued as to Michael Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Robert S. Mueller, III, Christina Poulos, Robin Barrett. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 358 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?