Laura Heintz v. American Honda Motor Co Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-09311
District Judge Stephen V. Wilson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Laura Heintz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Initiative Legal Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sue Jin Kim +1 310 556 5637 +1 310 861 9051 skim@initiativelegal.com
TERMINATED: 02/09/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Medby +1 562 216 5270 +1 562 216 5271 dmedby@lawgarcia.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene F Williams +1 310 556 5637 +1 310 861 9051 gwilliams@initiativelegal.com
v.
American Honda Motor Company, Inc. American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "American Honda Motor Co Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry W Bird +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 twb@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
Honda Motor Company, Ltd. Honda Motor Company, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry W Bird +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 twb@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
Honda North America, Inc. Honda North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry W Bird +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 twb@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 2301
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Laura Heintz. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Williams, Gene) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Laura Heintz. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Sokolowski, Andrew) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER re Stipulation for Extension of Time to Amend 12 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff shall file her First Amended Complaint on or before May 27, 2012; and 2. Defendants shall have thirty days to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Defendants need not file any response to the Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kti) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
        Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Plaintiff Laura Heintz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Gene) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Terry W Bird counsel for Defendants American Honda Motor Co Inc, Honda Motor Company Ltd, Honda North America Inc. Adding Terry W. Bird as attorney as counsel of record for American Honda Motor Co., Inc.; Honda North America, Inc.; and Honda Motor Company, Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc., and Honda Motor Company, Ltd. (Bird, Terry) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer 8 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court hereby orders that Plaintiffs June 5, 2012 deadline to file her Motion for Class Certification is hereby vacated, and that the parties will submit a proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification in connection with the parties Rule 26 Conference Report and will stipulate to a briefing schedule at the Initial Scheduling Conference in this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kti) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) 8 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Gene) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by defendants Honda North America Inc, Honda Motor Company Ltd, American Honda Motor Co Inc.(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                  PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Laura Heintz, upon Defendant Honda North America Inc served on 3/7/2012, answer due 3/28/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margaret Wilson, Process Clerk, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Williams, Gene) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Laura Heintz, upon Defendant American Honda Motor Co Inc served on 3/7/2012, answer due 3/28/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margaret Wilson, Process Clerk, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Williams, Gene) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Sue Jin Kim counsel for Plaintiff Laura Heintz.David M. Medby is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Laura Heintz (Kim, Sue) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, (im) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of SUE J KIM in support of plaintiffs selection of forum for trail of claims arising under the california consumer legal remedies act filed by Plaintiff Laura Heintz. (et) (mg). (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Laura Heintz. (et) (mg). (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants American Honda Motor Co Inc, Honda Motor Company Ltd, Honda North America Inc. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner.(Filing fee $ 350 Paid.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Laura Heintz. (et) (mg). (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 978 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?