Volodymyr Dubinsky
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 2:09-ap-2617
District Judge Michael S. McManus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Hank Spacone, Trustee

Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
No Logo Svetlana Dubinsky, Joint Debtor

Represented by Law Offices of Walter R. Dahl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter R. Dahl +1 916 446 8800
No Logo Volodymyr Dubinsky, Debtor

Represented by Law Offices of Maralee MacDonald

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maralee MacDonald +1 916 321 4444

Represented by Law Offices of Walter R. Dahl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter R. Dahl +1 916 446 8800
  Entries (223) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011 Notice of Entry
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Order on Motion/Application for Compensation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/22/2011 Hearing Held/Concluded
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011 Exhibits
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011 Declaration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Change of Address
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Opposition/Objection
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Amended Notice of Hearing
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Change of Address
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Memo to File Re: Calendar Correction
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Memo to File Re: Calendar Correction
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Exhibits
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Declaration
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Notice of Hearing.
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Motion/Application for Compensation
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/14/2011 Change of Address
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/25/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Exhibits
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Declaration
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Declaration
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Notice of Hearing.
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Exhibits
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Declaration
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Declaration
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Hearing Held/Concluded
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Response/Reply
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Motion/Application
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                    Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 151 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [BRI-1] GRANTED IN PART; DISMISSED IN PART (shes) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order Re: 151 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [BRI-1] (smis) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 151 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [BRI-1], 152 Notice of Hearing, 153 Declaration, 154 Exhibit(s), 155 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (jlns) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                          Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 151 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [BRI-1] (jlns) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) in support of 151 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [BRI-1] (jlns) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Randolph Boyd Jr. in support of 151 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [BRI-1] (jlns) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Re: 151 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [BRI-1] to be held on 4/26/2010 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (jlns) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                  Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [BRI-1] Filed by Creditor First Horizon Home Loans (Fee Paid $150) (jlns) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/17/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service (jtis) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                      Civil Minute Order Dismissing 134 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-2] (pdes) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Hearing Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                        Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 134 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-2] DISMISSED (shes) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Civil Minutes -- Opposed Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                            Civil Minutes -- Opposed Hearing Held Re: 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] GRANTED IN PART; DENIED IN PART (jlasc) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 144 Response/Reply [EJV-2] (dhes) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                Response/Reply Filed by Trustee Hank Spacone Re: 134 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-2] (dhes) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 142 Memorandum of Points and Authorities [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 135 Notice of Hearing [EJV-2] (jtis) (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Support Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Support Document - First Amended Verified Complaint from Superior Court Re: 134 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-2] (jtis) Modified on 12/24/2009 (jtis). CASE NUMBER MISSING FROM DOCUMENT (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Support Document
                                                                                                                                                                          Support Document - Desist and Refrain Order Re: 134 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-2] (jtis) CASE NUMBER MISSING FROM DOCUMENT (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of 134 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-2] (jtis) (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                              Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 134 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-2] (jtis) (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of E. John Vodonick in support of 134 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-2] (jtis) (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing Re: 134 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-2] to be held on 1/19/2010 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (jtis) (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-2] Filed by Creditors John Bright, Roy Bright, John Chamorro, Rhonda Chamorro (Fee Paid $150) (jtis) (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 131 Opposition/Objection, 132 Declaration [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Walter R. Dahl in support of 131 Opposition/Objection [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Opposition/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition/Objection Filed by Joint Debtor Svetlana Dubinsky, Debtor Volodymyr Dubinsky Re: 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Discharge of Debtor
                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing of Discharge of Debtor as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 128 Response/Reply [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                Response/Reply Filed by Trustee Hank Spacone Re: 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Discharge of Debtor
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discharge of Debtor as Transmitted to BNC for Service (jtis) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 125 Notice of Hearing [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Re: 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] to be held on 1/4/2010 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (jtis) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Memorandum/Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum/Letter Re: 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1], 120 Declaration, 122 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (jtis) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of E. John Vodonick in support of 119 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] (jtis) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [EJV-1] Filed by Creditors Rhonda Chamorro, John Chamorro, Roy Bright, John Bright (Fee Paid $150) (jtis) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009 Memorandum/Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum/Letter (dhes) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Memorandum/Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum/Letter (dhes) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting 55 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1] (jtis) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Civil Minute Order Denying 100 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] (jtis) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Hearing Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 100 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] DENIED (jlasc) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 55 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1] GRANTED (jlasc) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order Re: 55 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1] (shbs) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 Memorandum/Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum/Letter (pdes) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 109 Response/Reply [JMO-1] (npas) DCN MISSING FROM PLEADING (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response/Reply [JMO-1] Filed by Creditor BLDCO, Inc. Re: 107 Opposition/Objection (npas) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 107 Opposition/Objection [JMO-1] (pdes) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Opposition/Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition/Objection Filed by Debtor Volodymyr Dubinsky Re: 100 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] (pdes) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 100 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1], 101 Notice of Hearing, 102 Declaration, 103 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 104 Exhibit(s), 105 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (npas) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 100 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] (npas) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit(s) to 100 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] (npas) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of 100 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] (npas) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Matthew C. McCartney in support of 100 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] (npas) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Re: 100 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] to be held on 10/26/2009 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (npas) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JMO-1] Filed by Creditor BLDCO, Inc. (Fee Paid $150) (npas) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/7/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting 83 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-2] (pdes) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting 48 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGM-1] (pdes) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order Re: 83 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-2] (pdes) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Hearing Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 83 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-2] GRANTED (jlasc) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Civil Minute Order Dismissing 72 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JHW-1] (pdes) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Hearing Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 72 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JHW-1] DISMISSED AS MOOT (jlasc) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order Re: 48 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGM-1] (pdes) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 90 Summary/Schedule(s)/Statement of Financial Affairs/Intention/Disclosure (pdes) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 55 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1] continued; Hearing to be held on 10/26/2009 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (shes) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Summary/Schedule(s)/Statement of Financial Affairs/Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Summary of Schedules Statistical Summary Schedule F Schedule I Statement of Financial Affairs (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required) (pdes) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Amended Verification and Master Address List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Master Address List (Fee Paid $26) (pdes) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 83 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-2], 84 Notice of Hearing, 85 Declaration, 86 Exhibit(s), 87 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (npas) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 83 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-2] (npas) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit(s) in support of 83 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-2] (npas) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Sherian Hopkins in support of 83 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-2] (npas) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing Re: 83 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-2] to be held on 8/31/2009 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (npas) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-2] Filed by Creditor First Horizon Home Loans (Fee Paid $150) (npas) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order RE: 48 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGM-1] (lbes) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 Order on Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File a Complaint Objecting to Discharge of the Deb
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting 79 Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File a Complaint Objecting to Discharge of the Debtor. [HMS-1] Last day to oppose discharge: 11/30/2009. (lbes) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 79 Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File a Complaint Objecting to Discharge of the Debtor. [HMS-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation Re: 79 Motion/Application to Extend Deadline to File a Complaint Objecting to Discharge of the Debtor. [HMS-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 71 Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing [KAT-1] (jtis) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 72 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JHW-1], 73 Notice of Hearing, 74 Declaration, 75 Exhibit(s), 76 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (npas) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 72 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JHW-1] (npas) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit(s) in support of 72 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JHW-1] (npas) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Lakesha Washington in support of 72 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JHW-1] (npas) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Re: 72 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JHW-1] to be held on 8/31/2009 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (npas) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [JHW-1] Filed by Creditor DCFS USA LLC (Fee Paid $150) (npas) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation And Order to Continue Hearing Re: 55 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1]; Hearing to be held on 8/17/2009 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (lbes) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting 32 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [FWK-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 32 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [FWK-1] GRANTED (shes) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Hearing Held/Concluded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 48 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGM-1] GRANTED (shes) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 66 Notice of Entry [DNL-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Entry of 65 Amended Order [DNL-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Amended Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Order RE: 16 Order Granting Motion/Application to Employ [DNL-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting 46 Motion/Application for Examination (lbes) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 62 Declaration [DNL-1], Amended Proposed Order (lbes) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 10 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Order on Motion/Application for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting 23 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 55 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1], 56 Notice of Hearing, 57 Declaration, 58 Exhibit(s), 59 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (lbes) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 55 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) in support of 55 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Bobbie Cole in support of 55 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1] (lbes) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Re: 55 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1] to be held on 8/17/2009 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (lbes) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [KAT-1] Filed by Creditor Thornburg Mortgage Home Loans, Inc. (Fee Paid $150) (lbes) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 48 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGM-1], 49 Notice of Hearing, 51 Declaration, 52 Exhibit(s), 53 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (nkrs) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 48 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGM-1] (nkrs) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit(s) in support of 48 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGM-1] (nkrs) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Venetia Steward in support of 48 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGM-1] (nkrs) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Civil Minutes -- Hearing/Motion Resolved without Oral Argument Re: 23 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] GRANTED (shes) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Re: 48 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGM-1] to be held on 7/24/2009 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (nkrs) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [WGM-1] Filed by Creditor Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Fee Paid $150) (nkrs) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 46 Motion/Application for Examination (nkrs) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Motion/Application for Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion/Application for Examination Filed by Creditor Asiatech Management, LLC (nkrs) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/2/2009 Financial Management Course Certificate as to Debtor
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Financial Management Course Certificate as to Debtor (lbes) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/2/2009 Financial Management Course Certificate as to Joint Debtor
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Financial Management Course Certificate as to Joint Debtor (lbes) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 42 Non-Opposition [FWK-1] (stps) INCORRECT DCN ON PLEADING (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Non-Opposition Filed by Trustee Hank Spacone Re: 32 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [FWK-1] (stps) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 40 Non-Opposition [FWK-1] (lbes) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009 Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Non-Opposition Filed by Joint Debtor Svetlana Dubinsky, Debtor Volodymyr Dubinsky Re: 32 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [FWK-1] (lbes) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 38 Non-Opposition [DMM-1] (lbes) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Non-Opposition Filed by Joint Debtor Svetlana Dubinsky, Debtor Volodymyr Dubinsky Re: 23 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] (lbes) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 32 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [FWK-1], 33 Notice of Hearing, 34 Declaration, 35 Exhibit(s), 36 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (npas) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 32 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [FWK-1] (npas) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit(s) in support of 32 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [FWK-1] (npas) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Bob Prescott in support of 32 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [FWK-1] (npas) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Re: 32 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [FWK-1] to be held on 7/24/2009 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (npas) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [FWK-1] Filed by Creditor Joemar, Ltd (Fee Paid $150) (npas) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Asia Tech Management, LLC (lbes) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 29 Non-Opposition [DMM-1] (lbes) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Non-Opposition Filed by Trustee Hank Spacone Re: 23 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] (lbes) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 23 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1], 24 Notice of Hearing, 25 Declaration, 26 Exhibit(s), 27 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (lbes) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 23 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] (lbes) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) To 25 Declaration [DMM-1] (lbes) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert Martinez in support of 23 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] (lbes) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Re: 23 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] to be held on 7/6/2009 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (lbes) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] Filed by Creditor Wachovia Mortgage, FSB (Fee Paid $150) (lbes) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor GE Money Bank (lbes) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor DCFS USA, LLC (lbes) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (shbs) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/25/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Requirement to File a Statement of Completion of Course in P
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Requirement to File a Statement of Completion of Course in Personal Financial Management as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 17 Notice of Entry [DNL-1] (lbes) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Notice of Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of 16 Order on Motion/Application to Employ [DNL-1] (lbes) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009 Order on Motion/Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting 10 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham [DNL-1](lbes) Modified on 5/27/2009 (lbes). (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/23/2009, Entered: 5/23/2009 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management Course Certificate as Transmitted to BNC for Service. (Admin) (Entered: 05/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Disclosure of Attorney Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Disclosure of Attorney Compensation Re: 1 Voluntary Petition (lbes) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 10 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-1], 11 Declaration, 12 Exhibit(s), Proposed Order (lbes) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit(s) To 10 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-1] (lbes) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 10 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-1] (lbes) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Motion/Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney For Trustee [DNL-1] Filed by Trustee Hank Spacone (lbes) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Trainor Fairbrook (jtis) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Request for special notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor American Express Bank, FSB (jlas) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/25/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 04/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Notice of Meeting of Creditors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC 341 Notice Requested (CMX) (auto) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: 4/22/2009 Statement of Social Security Numbers
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of Social Security Number(s) (sjas) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: 4/22/2009 Verification and Master Address List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Master Address List (auto) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: 4/22/2009 Notice of Incomplete Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Incomplete Filing (sjas) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: 4/22/2009 Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Hank Spacone (auto) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: 4/22/2009 Voluntary Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Missing Document(s): Attorney Disclosure Statement; Document(s) due by 5/7/2009. (sjas) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?