Curtis A. Westwood
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-22755
District Judge Robert S. Bardwil, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 5:58 PM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo August B. Landis, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Allen C. Massey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen C. Massey +1 916 930 2100
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
No Logo Curtis A. Westwood, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg, Stinnett, Meyers and Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meyers, Merle Cooper +1 415 362 5045

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Merle C. Meyers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
4423 Via Palagio
Fair Oaks, CA 95628
SSN / ITIN: xxx-xx-7090 Merle C. Meyers +1 415 362 7500
No Logo Jonathan E. Tesar, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 277 Motion/Application for Examination [DB-2] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
    Motion/Application for Examination [DB-2] Filed by Debtor Curtis A. Westwood, Creditor Deborah Westwood (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
      Certificate/Proof of Service of 273 Opposition/Objection, 274 Declaration, 275 Exhibit(s) [DNL-2] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
        Exhibit(s) in support of 274 Declaration [DNL-2] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
          Declaration of Russ J. Wunderli in support of 273 Opposition/Objection [DNL-2] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
            Opposition/Objection Filed by Debtor Curtis A. Westwood, Creditor Deborah Westwood Re: 226 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Comerica Bank [DNL-2] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
              Certificate/Proof of Service of 270 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [DB-1], 271 Notice of Hearing (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                Notice of Hearing Re: 270 Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [DB-1] to be held on 1/11/2012 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 270 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                  Motion/Application to Compel Abandonment [DB-1] Filed by Debtor Curtis A. Westwood, Creditor Deborah Westwood (Fee Paid $0.00) (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 268 Document (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                      Document - Statement Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 329; Fed. R. Bank. P. 2016, 2017 Filed by Attorneys for Debtor Curtis A. Westwood, Creditor Deborah Westwood (nkrs) Modified on 12/28/2011 (nkrs). (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 266 Joinder [MLG-7] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                          Joinder to 214 Response/Reply [MLG-7] Filed by Debtor Curtis A. Westwood, Creditor Deborah Westwood (nkrs) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 263 Opposition/Objection, 264 Declaration [DNL-2] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                              Declaration of Deborah Westwood in support of 263 Opposition/Objection [DNL-2] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                                Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor Deborah Westwood Re: 226 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Comerica Bank [DNL-2] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                  Stipulation and Order Amending Briefing Schedule [MLG-7] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                    Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 226 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Comerica Bank [DNL-2] continued; Hearing to be held on 1/11/2012 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (nwis) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of Stipulation and Proposed Order Re: [MLG-7] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                        Order to Continue Hearing Re: 73 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions [FWP-1]; Hearing to be held on 2/22/2012 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (nkrs) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 257 Notice of Entry [DNL-2] (jris) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Entry of 254 Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing [DNL-2] (jris) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 255 Stipulation [FWP-1] (jris) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Comerica Bank's Objection to Debtor Curtis A. Westwood's Claim of Exemptions [FWP-1] (jris) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Order to Continue Hearing Re: 226 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy with Comerica Bank [DNL-2]; Hearing to be held on 1/11/2012 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (jris) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 249 Support Document, 250 Declaration, 251 Request for Judicial Notice, 252 Exhibit(s) [MLG-7] (jris) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Exhibit(s) to 250 Declaration [MLG-7] (jris) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Request for Judicial Notice Re: 249 Support Document [MLG-7] Filed by Creditor Comerica Bank (jris) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Declaration of Donald W. Fitzgerald in support of 249 Support Document [MLG-7] (jris) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Support Document/Comerica Bank's Further Statement Regarding Report of Chapter 11 Trustee Jon Tesar on Post-Petition Activity of Affiliated Entities Re: 189 Motion/Application for Compensation [MLG-7] for Merle C. Meyers, Debtor's Attorney(s), Fee: $324102.00, Expenses: $5426.31. [MLG-7] Filed by Creditor Comerica Bank (jris) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Stipulation to Continue Motion to Approve Comerica Compromise [DNL-2] (jris) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 246 Operating Report (nkrs) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 2011 (nkrs) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 241 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-4] by the Law Office of Desmond, Nolan, Livaich and Cunningham for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $38933.00, Expenses: $560.72., 242 Notice of Hearing, 243 Declaration, 244 Exhibit(s) (msts) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Exhibit(s) in support of 241 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-4] by the Law Office of Desmond, Nolan, Livaich and Cunningham for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $38933.00, Expenses: $560.72. (msts) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 241 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-4] by the Law Office of Desmond, Nolan, Livaich and Cunningham for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $38933.00, Expenses: $560.72. (msts) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of Hearing Re: 241 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-4] by the Law Office of Desmond, Nolan, Livaich and Cunningham for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $38933.00, Expenses: $560.72. to be held on 1/11/2012 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 34, Department D. (msts) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-4] by the Law Office of Desmond, Nolan, Livaich and Cunningham for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney(s), Fee: $38933.00, Expenses: $560.72. Filed by Attorney J. Russell Cunningham (msts) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 233 Support Document, 234 Exhibit(s), 235 Exhibit(s), 238 Exhibit(s), 239 Exhibit(s) (nkrs) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Exhibit(s) to 233 Support Document [MLG-7] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Exhibit(s) to 233 Support Document [MLG-7] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 236 Response/Reply [MLG-7] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Response/Reply [MLG-7] Filed by Creditor Comerica Bank Re: 233 Support Document (nkrs) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Exhibit(s) to 233 Support Document [MLG-7] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Exhibit(s) to 233 Support Document [MLG-7] (nkrs) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Support Document/Report Of Chapter 11 Trustee Jon Tesar On Post-Petition Activity Of Affiliated Entities Re: 189 Motion/Application for Compensation [MLG-7] for Merle C. Meyers, Debtor's Attorney(s), Fee: $324102.00, Expenses: $5426.31. Filed by Trustee Jonathan E. Tesar (nkrs) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Exhibit D - Statement of Compliance with Credit Counseling Requirement as to Debtor with Certificate of Credit Counseling attached (jris) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Statement of Social Security Number(s) (jris) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Master Address List (auto) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. (ears) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Missing Document(s): Statement of SSN - Form B21 due by 02/09/2011; Summary of Schedules; Statistical Summary; Schedule A - Real Property; Schedule B - Personal Property; Schedule C - Exempt Property; Schedule D - Secured Creditors; Schedule E - Unsecured Priority Creditor; Schedule F - Unsecured Nonpriority Creditor; Schedule G - Executory Contracts; Schedule H - Codebtors; Schedule I - Current Income; Schedule J - Current Expend.; Statement of Financial Affairs; Means Test - Form 22B; List - 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors; Attorney's Disclosure Stmt.; Document(s) due by 02/16/2011. (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 439 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?