Ibrahim v. Department of Homeland et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-00545-WHA
District Judge William H Alsup, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 17, 2020 at 8:04 PM ST (6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rahinah Ibrahim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McManis Faulkner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marwa Elzankaly +1 408 279 8700 +1 408 279 3244 melzankaly@mcmanislaw.com
Space Rubina Kazi +1 408 279 8700 +1 408 279 3244 rkazi@mcmanislaw.com
Space James McManis +1 408 279 8700 +1 408 279 3244 jmcmanis@mcmanislaw.com
Space Christine Peek +1 408 279 8700 +1 408 279 3244 cpeek@mcmanislaw.com
Space Elizabeth Marie Pipkin +1 408 279 8700 +1 408 279 3244 epipkin@mcmanislaw.com
v.
No Logo Arthur M. Cummings, II, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of State"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
No Logo Donna A. Bucella, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
No Logo Elizabeth Maron, Defendant
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric H. Holder, Jr."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
No Logo Hilary Clinton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
No Logo Janet Napolitano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Bondanella, Defendant
No Logo John Cunningham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
No Logo Leonard C. Boyle, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael E. Leiter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
United States National Counterterrorism Center United States National Counterterrorism Center, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Counterterrorism Center"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
No Logo Richard Pate, Defendant
No Logo Robert Mueller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
No Logo San Francisco Airport, Defendant
No Logo San Francisco Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Terrorist Screening Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
No Logo Tom Ridge, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
Space Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Defendant
United Air Lines, Inc. United Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "United Airlines"
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Conor Kells +1 202 616 4273 +1 202 616 5200 conor.kells@usdoj.gov
No Logo US Investigation Services, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "US Investigations Services, Inc."
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Office San Francisco
Filed 1/27/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Court Trial
County Santa Clara
Terminated 1/14/2014
Origin 3
Reopened 8/1/2012
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 09-17160[Ninth Circuit], 10-15352[Ninth Circuit], 10-15873[U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CLOSED,E-Filing,REFSET-JSC
  Entries (1320) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 8/15/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 3/2/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 8/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              **This transcript is unlocked and available for immediate downloading, as it wasn't efiled in May 2008 as required. **Transcript of Proceedings held on March 12, 2009, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Sahar McVickar. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, normally this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript Designation Form re 763 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 8/12/2014. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript Designation Form re 761 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 8/12/2014. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Rahinah Ibrahim for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ** ORDER CANCELLED - 03/12/09 HEARING TRANSCRIPT EFILED AT DOCKET #782. **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Rahinah Ibrahim for Court Reporter Sahar McVickar. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Rahinah Ibrahim for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Gina Moon Pursuant to July 11 Order filed byGina Moon. (Moon, Gina) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER APPOINTING GINA MOON AS SPECIAL MASTER re 739 , 740 , 748 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses. Report and recommendation due September 18, 2014 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 11, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to re 773 Order by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/11/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST RE APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER. Response due July 11 at noon. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 9, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement re 771 Order Joint Statement Regarding Special Master by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE SPECIAL MASTER. Response due July 9 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 26, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS SECOND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William Alsup denying 765 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA Case Number 14-16161. for 763 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 761 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of 740 Order Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Response to Paragraph 10 of the Court's April 16, 2014 Order Re Attorney's Fees and Expenses [Docket No. 740] filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s) 740 ) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 765 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 16, 2014 Orders Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses; Declaration ) filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE RESPONSE TO SECOND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Response due June 20 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 16, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 16, 2014 Orders Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses; Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement re 763 Notice of Appeal, Plaintiff's Representation Statement by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA by Rahinah Ibrahim.(Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-8694404 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Dkt. 741, # 2 Exhibit B - Dkt. 755)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/13/2014) Modified on 6/13/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement re 761 Notice of Appeal, Plaintiff's Representation Statement by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA by Rahinah Ibrahim.(Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-8694362 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Dkt. 739, # 2 Exhibit B - Dkt. 740, # 3 Exhibit C - Dkt. 748, # 4 Exhibit D - Dkt. 758)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/13/2014) Modified on 6/13/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Paul G. Freeborne in Support of 757 Objection, 758 Order filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 757 , 758 ) (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Rahinah Ibrahim re 758 Order Plaintiff's Submission Pursuant to the Court's June 2, 2014 Order Regarding Attorneys' Fees (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE NON-COMPLIANT DECLARATIONS. Responses due June 9 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 2, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to re 756 Declaration in Support,, by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul G. Freeborne)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 5/29/2014) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of 740 Order, 741 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 739 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin Regarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6A, # 7 Exhibit 6B, # 8 Exhibit 6C, # 9 Exhibit 6D, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 740 , 741 , 739 ) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/13/2014) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 755 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE STATEMENT OF SERVICE COSTS TO BE TAXED re 741 Order, 754 Statement. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 1, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement re 741 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Joint Statement re Costs Taxed for Service of Federal Defendants and Trial Witnesses Pursuant to Docket No. 741 by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/30/2014) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lily Sara Farel (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 4/30/2014) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DECLARATION RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES by Hon. William Alsup granting 749 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order Plaintiff's Unopposed Administrative Motion for Extension of Time to File Declaration Re: Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses in Compliance with April 16, 2014 Order (Docket No. 740) by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of 749 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Unopposed Administrative Motion for Extension of Time to File Declaration Re: Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses in Compliance with April 16, 2014 Order (Docket No. 740) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 749 ) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Unopposed Administrative Motion for Extension of Time to File Declaration Re: Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses in Compliance with April 16, 2014 Order (Docket No. 740) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 748 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND ORDER RE OBJECTIONS TO THE SPECIAL-MASTER PROCEDURE by Hon. William Alsup denying 742 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 742 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 16, 2014 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses; Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin ) filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Theis, John) (Filed on 4/23/2014) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to re 740 Order by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 4/23/2014) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of 744 Objection, Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of Plaintiff's Objections to, and Proposed Modifications to, Procedures Set Forth in the Court's April 16, 2014 Orders (Docket Nos. 739 & 740) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 744 ) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/23/2014) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to re 740 Order, 739 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Objections to, and Proposed Modifications to, Procedures Set Forth in the Court's April 16, 2014 Orders (Docket Nos. 739 & 740) by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/23/2014) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Response due by noon on 04/23/2014.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 18, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 16, 2014 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses; Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/17/2014) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE REVIEW OF CLERKS BILL OF COSTS by Judge Alsup re 717 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to re [693] Bill of Costs by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Paul G. Freeborne)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES re 739 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 15, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Paul G. Freeborne in Support of [708] Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Related document(s)[708]) (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES by Judge Alsup re 694 Motion for Attorney Fees (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re [694] MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) ) (Redacted) filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE RE UNSEALING OF JANUARY 2014 ORDER re 682 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 15, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to Bill of Costs, Copying Costs by Rahinah Ibrahim re [693] Bill of Costs , (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/7/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/7/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Paul G. Freeborne in Support of 736 Notice (Other), filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brenda M. Atkinson, # 2 Declaration of G. Clayton Grigg, # 3 Declaration of Luke J. McCormack, # 4 Declaration of Margaret Cooperman, # 5 Declaration Timothy Goyer, # 6 Declaration Matthew McNeil, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 736 ) (Theis, John) (Filed on 4/15/2014) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT to Bill of Costs, Fees for Transcripts by Rahinah Ibrahim re [693] Bill of Costs (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/7/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center of Compliance with the Court's January 14, 2014 Order (Theis, John) (Filed on 4/15/2014) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT to Bill of Costs, Fees for Service of Summons and Subpoenas by Rahinah Ibrahim re [693] Bill of Costs (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/7/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/25/2014, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2014. (Related documents(s) 732 , 731 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to Bill of Costs, Fees for the Clerk by Rahinah Ibrahim re [693] Bill of Costs (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/7/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re 730 Order by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Theis, John) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re Redacted Order by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center re [701] Notice (Other),, (Attachments: # (1) Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Relief [Redacted])(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/7/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2014 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 3/25/2014) re 694 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Rahinah Ibrahim re [694] MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) Notice of Continuance of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Rahinah Ibrahim for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/27/2014) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Compliance re [700] Order by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center Attachment # (1) Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Relief [Redacted])(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 2/6/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 3/27/2014) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [694] MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to [694] MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 25, 2014. Response due noon on March 28. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 700 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR RELIEF. Response due February 6.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 3, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 717 MOTION For Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs ) filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 3/21/2014) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Christine Peek in Support of [694] MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [695] filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Related document(s)[694]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 694 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) ) Response filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Rahinah Ibrahim in Support of [694] MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s)[694]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 727 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER CONTINUING HEARING TO MARCH 25 AND VACATING HEARING Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 17, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Allen J. Ruby in Support of [694] MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s)[694]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 719 MOTION Reschedule Hearings filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Kazi, Rubina) (Filed on 3/14/2014) Modified on 3/17/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of James McManis in Support of [694] MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[694]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of 724 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s) 724 ) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/14/2014) Modified on 3/14/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Christine Peek in Support of [694] MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Related document(s)[694]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 717 MOTION For Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs ) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/14/2014) Modified on 3/14/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 2/11/2014. Replies due by 2/18/2014. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 723 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE by Hon. William Alsup re 722 Motion to Strike 720 Supplemental Brief, 722 MOTION to Strike 720 Supplemental Brief, 721 Declaration in Support, , 721 Declaration in Support,.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BILL OF COSTS by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike 720 Supplemental Brief, 721 Declaration in Support, filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 3/27/2014. Replies due by 4/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Theis, John) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Compliance with [686] Order by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Maureen Dugan)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 1/28/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of 694 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 720 ) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 691 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Redacted Response to Defendants' Post Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Correction of Entry [687] by Rahinah Ibrahim (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 718 Order re Fees and Costs filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Compliance with [685] Order by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Defendants' Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law [redacted], # (2) Exhibit B: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law [redacted], # (3) Exhibit C: Defendants' Response to the Court's Order Regarding Plaintiff's Response Regarding Plaintiff's Daughter [redacted], # (4) Declaration of Paul G. Freeborne)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/27/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Requesting Rescheduling the Hearings re Motion for Fees and Costs and Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. Responses due by 3/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified on 3/10/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 689 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (Redacted) Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law After Bench Trial. by Rahinah Ibrahim (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/24/2014) Modified on 1/24/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 718 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST REGARDING ENTITLEMENT TO FEES AND COSTS re 709 Declaration in Support,, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, 699 Declaration in Support, filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 6, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 688 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (Redacted) Responses to Defendants' Brief and Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding Plaintiff's Daughter. by Rahinah Ibrahim (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/24/2014) Modified on 1/24/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION For Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 3/14/2014. Replies due by 3/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 2/28/2014) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 687 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (Redacted) Responses to Defendants' Brief and Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/24/2014) Modified on 1/24/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 716 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to re 714 Objection,, Plaintiff's Objection to and Request for Order Striking Defendants' Surreply Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/27/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 686 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING FILINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 21, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 715 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER STRIKING REPLY DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS re 712 Declaration in Support, filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 714 Objection,, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 26, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 685 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE FILING PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 15, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to re 712 Declaration in Support, 711 Reply to Opposition/Response, Defendants' Local Rule 7-3(d)(1) Objection to Reply Evidence by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # 1 Sur-Reply)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 684 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 14, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 713 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Costs Taxed in amount of $53,699.13, Re: ECF No. 693, against Defendants. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 683 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLIC NOTICE AND SUMMARY OF FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 14, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of 711 Reply to Opposition/Response, Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 711 ) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALEDFINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW and ORDER FOR RELIEF. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/14/2014. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 711 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 694 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Redacted) ) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Sealed TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Note: The redacted version of this 12-6-2013 transcript has been efiled at docket entry #676. Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-6-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Sealed TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Note: The redacted version of this 12-5-2013 transcript has been efiled at docket entry #675.Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-5-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Sealed TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Note: The redacted version of this 12-4-2013 transcript has been efiled at docket entry #673.Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-4-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Sealed TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Note: The redacted version of this 12-3-2013 transcript has been efiled at docket entry #671. Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-3-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Sealed TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Note: The redacted version of this 12-2-2013 transcript has been efiled at docket entry No. 671.Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-2-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Bench Trial Proceedings (Redacted) held on 12-6-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2014. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Bench Trial Proceedings (Redacted) held on 12-5-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2014. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 674 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE ACCESS TO CLASSIFIED DOCUMENTS re [669] Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, [665] Notice (Other) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 30, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Bench Trial Proceedings (Redacted) held on 12-4-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2014. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Bench Trial Proceedings (Redacted) held on 12-3-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2014. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Bench Trial Proceedings (Redacted) held on 12-2-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2014. (Related documents(s) [621], [622]) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 670 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to the Court's Order Requesting Briefing on Access by Opposing Counsel to Classified Information by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center re [666] Order (Theis, John) (Filed on 12/23/2013) Modified on 12/23/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 669 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re [666] Order by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/23/2013) Modified on 12/23/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 668 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER VACATING JANUARY 2 AND 9 HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 23, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Lodging in Camera Ex Parte Materials. by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 12/20/2013) Modified on 12/20/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE CLEARANCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 18, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF re SSI vs Secret Standards by Rahinah Ibrahim re [657] Order (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/13/2013) Modified on 12/16/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 664 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re [657] Order by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Theis, John) (Filed on 12/13/2013) Modified on 12/13/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 663 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Lodging in Camera, Ex Parte Materials by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 12/13/2013) Modified on 12/13/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 662 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit (Sealed and Non-Sealed) Location, Bench Trial Dec 3 - 6, 2013. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 661 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE RE PLAINTIFFS DAUGHTER re [658] Notice (Other) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 10, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 658 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Rahinah Ibrahim Plaintiff's Response to the Court Regarding Plaintiff's Daughter (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 657 Filed: 12/7/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR SUBMISSIONS RE SSI VERSUS SECRET STANDARDS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 7, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 655 Filed: 12/7/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [648] Notice (Other), PLAINTIFFS BRIEF RE: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO THE COURTS QUESTION REGARDING SENSITIVE SECURITY INFORMATION by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 660 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Bench Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Bench Trial completed on 12/6/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/6/2013). Trial Exhibits deposited in the Clerk's Office. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 659 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *SEALED* Joint Exhibit List. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 652 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING FORMAT OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 6, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 651 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Raihan Binti Mustafa Kamal in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Declaration of Maureen Dugan filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 650 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Rahinah Ibrahim Re: Visa Application filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MAIN DOCUMENT LOCKED. SEE ATTACHMENT. Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 12/5/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/5/2013). Witnesses called. Further Bench Trial set for 12/6/2013 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2013) Modified on 12/6/2013 (dtS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2013: # (1) Amended Minute Order) (dtS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/23/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Assertion of the Law Enforcement Privilege filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/19/2013. Replies due by 12/26/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Maureen Dugan)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 648 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to the Court's Question Regarding Sensitive Security Information by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 12/5/2013) Modified on 12/6/2013 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 647 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE HEARSAY AND LEADING OBJECTIONS RE TX 30 AND ASSOCIATED QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 5, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 646 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE EXPERT JEFFREY KAHN by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot [623] Discovery Letter Brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 645 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Kelleher on behalf of Federal Defendants (Kelleher, Diane) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/23/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Retain Confidentiality of Materials Subject to Protective Order filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Terrorist Screening Center. Motion Hearing set for 1/2/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/18/2013. Replies due by 12/26/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Paul Freeborne, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Theis, John) (Filed on 12/4/2013) Modified on 12/5/2013 (farS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Bench Trial - HeldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 12/3/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/3/2013). Witnesses called. Further Bench Trial set for 12/4/2013 7:30 AM. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [638] Notice (Other) by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center Memorandum Regarding Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Theis, John) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Bench Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 12/2/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/6/2013). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Rahinah Ibrahim Plaintiff's Brief Re: Trial Exhibit 30 and Plaintiff's Testimony (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jeffrey Kahn in Support of [638] Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Brief Regarding Expert Jeffrey Kahn's Documents filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s)[638]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Rahinah Ibrahim Plaintiff's Brief Regarding Expert Jeffrey Kahn's Documents (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Terrorist Screening Center Re Tentative Ruling on the Admissibility of Evidence (Theis, John) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief in Response to the Court's Question Regarding the Sensitivity of Information Related to Status in the Terrorist Screening Database filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Terrorist Screening Center. (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Bench Trial Proceedings, Volume 1, held on 12-2-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2014. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT AND SEALING DKT. NO. 599 by Hon. William Alsup denying [610] Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Second Stipulation re Trial Exhibits filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 661 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE RE PLAINTIFFS DAUGHTER re 658 Notice (Other) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 10, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 632 Filed: 12/1/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 1, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 12/1/2013, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [629] Notice (Other),,,, Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice at Trial - Redacted (Part 3) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B, # (2) Exhibit C, # (3) Exhibit D, # (4) Exhibit E, # (5) Exhibit F, # (6) Exhibit G)(Related document(s)[629]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 12/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 12/1/2013, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [629] Notice (Other),,,, Plaintiff's Request for Judical Notice at Trial - Redacted (Part 2) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Part 30 of 57, # (2) Exhibit A - Part 31 of 57, # (3) Exhibit A - Part 32 of 57, # (4) Exhibit A - Part 33 of 57, # (5) Exhibit A - Part 34 of 57, # (6) Exhibit A - Part 35 of 57, # (7) Exhibit A - Part 36 of 57, # (8) Exhibit A - Part 37 of 57, # (9) Exhibit A - Part 38 of 57, # (10) Exhibit A - Part 39 of 57, # (11) Exhibit A - Part 40 of 57, # (12) Exhibit A - Part 41 of 57, # (13) Exhibit A - Part 42 of 57, # (14) Exhibit A - Part 43 of 57, # (15) Exhibit A - Part 44 of 57, # (16) Exhibit A - Part 45 of 57, # (17) Exhibit A - Part 46 of 57, # (18) Exhibit A - Part 47 of 57, # (19) Exhibit A - Part 48 of 57, # (20) Exhibit A - Part 49 of 57, # (21) Exhibit A - Part 50 of 57, # (22) Exhibit A - Part 51 of 57, # (23) Exhibit A - Part 52 of 57, # (24) Exhibit A - Part 53 of 57, # (25) Exhibit A - Part 54 of 57, # (26) Exhibit A - Part 55 of 57, # (27) Exhibit A - Part 56 of 57, # (28) Exhibit A - Part 57 of 57)(Related document(s)[629]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 12/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 12/1/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Rahinah Ibrahim Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice at Trial - Redacted (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Part 1 of 57, # (2) Exhibit A - Part 2 of 57, # (3) Exhibit A - Part 3 of 57, # (4) Exhibit A - Part 4 of 57, # (5) Exhibit A - Part 5 of 57, # (6) Exhibit A - Part 6 of 57, # (7) Exhibit A - Part 7 of 57, # (8) Exhibit A - Part 8 of 57, # (9) Exhibit A - Part 9 of 57, # (10) Exhibit A - Part 10 of 57, # (11) Exhibit A - Part 11 of 57, # (12) Exhibit A - Part 12 of 57, # (13) Exhibit A - Part 13 of 57, # (14) Exhibit A - Part 14 of 57, # (15) Exhibit A - Part 15 of 57, # (16) Exhibit A - Part 16 of 57, # (17) Exhibit A - Part 17 of 57, # (18) Errata A - Part 18 of 57, # (19) Exhibit A - Part 19 of 57, # (20) Exhibit A - Part 20 of 57, # (21) Exhibit A - Part 21 of 57, # (22) Exhibit A - Part 22 of 57, # (23) Exhibit A - Part 23 of 57, # (24) Exhibit A - Part 24 of 57, # (25) Exhibit A - Part 25 of 57, # (26) Exhibit A - Part 26 of 57, # (27) Exhibit A - Part 27 of 57, # (28) Exhibit A - Part 28 of 57, # (29) Exhibit A - Part 29 of 57)(Peek, Christine) (Filed on 12/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 11/30/2013, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION RE: TRIAL EXHIBITS filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 11/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 627 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND ORDER RE EXPERT DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/29/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Elizabeth Pipkin pursuant to Court's Order re Briefing Expert Discovery Dispute (Dkt. No. 625). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 625 Filed: 11/28/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE BRIEFING EXPERT DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 27, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Brief (Amended) filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/5/2013 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery Letter Brief filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Transcript Order - Daily Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 11/24/2013, Entered: None Transcript Order - Daily Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Theis, John) (Filed on 11/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [609] Brief, Plaintiff's Response Regarding Public Access to Information Designated by Defendants as "Sensitive Security Information" by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-15-2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2014. (Related documents(s) [614]) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on November 18, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 11/18/2013). Further facilitated discussions contemplated. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Theis, John) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearing re [616] Pretrial Order. Bench Trial set for 12/2/2013 07:30 AM, 12/3/2013 07:30 AM, 12/4/2013 07:30 AM, 12/5/2013 07:30 AM, 12/6/2013 07:30 AM, 12/9/2013 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearing re [616] Pretrial Order. Bench Trial set for 12/2/2013 07:30 AM, 12/3/2013 07:30 AM, 12/4/2013 07:30 AM, 12/5/2013 07:30 AM, 12/6/2013 07:30 AM, 12/9/2013 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 616 Filed: 11/16/2013, Entered: None Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER, Motions terminated: [604] MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Proferred Expert Testimony filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, [595] MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Witnesses Not Permitted to be Deposed by Plaintiff filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, [606] MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Proffered Exhibits filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Robert Mueller, [605] MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Proffered Fact Witnesses filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Robert Mueller, [594] MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Submitted Ex Parte by Defendants and Not Ordered Produced to Plaintiff filed by Rahinah Ibrahim.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 15, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 11/15/2013). Bench Trial set for 12/2/2013 7:30 AM. Each side shall have 10 hours for case-in-chief. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Rahinah Ibrahim for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 613 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE CLASSIFIED EXHIBIT AND BRIEF ON PUBLIC ACCESS re [609] Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, [602] Trial Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Robert Mueller. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 14, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 612 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiff's Trial Brief - Redacted - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 599 by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [610] MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document from Docket; Docket Number 599 by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/2/2013 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document from Docket; Docket Number 599 filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief in Response to the Court's Inquiry Regarding Public Access to Sensitive Information (Redacted) filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Theis, John) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADDENDUM to [604] Motion in Limine No 1 by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 11/13/2013) Modified on 11/13/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Christine Peek in Support of [606] MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Proffered Exhibits, [605] MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Proffered Fact Witnesses, [604] MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Proferred Expert Testimony Declaration of Christine Peek in Support of Plaintiff's Oppositions to Defendants' Motions in Limine Nos. 1, 2 and 3 filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Lodged Under Seal, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B - Lodged Under Seal, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C - Lodged Under Seal, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit L - Lodged Under Seal, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit N)(Related document(s)[606], [605], [604]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/15/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Proffered Exhibits filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/8/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff's Opposition)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/15/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Proffered Fact Witnesses filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/8/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff's Opposition)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/15/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Proferred Expert Testimony filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/8/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff's Opposition)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center re [602] Trial Brief, Notice of Lodging Exhibit B to Trial Brief for in camera, ex parte review (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF Redacted by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Theis, John) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Appendix A - Joint Exhibit List, # (2) Appendix Appendix B - Plaintiff's Witness List, # (3) Appendix Appendix C - Defendants' Fed.R. Civ. P 26(a)(3) Witness List)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Findings of Fact by Rahinah Ibrahim Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law - Redacted. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *LOCKED*, Document Contains Sealed InformationTRIAL BRIEF Plaintiff's Trial Brief - Redacted by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/12/2013) Modified on 11/14/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/14/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Findings of Fact by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center [redacted]. (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 625 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE BRIEFING EXPERT DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 27, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTION Plaintiff's Witness Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(3)(A)(i)-(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Guidelines for Trial and Final Pretrial Conference in Civil Bench Cases Before The Honorable William Alsup - REDACTED by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTION Plaintiff's Document Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(3)(A)(iii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Guidelines for Trial and Final Pretrial Conference in Civil Bench Cases Before The Honorable William Alsup - REDACTED by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/15/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Witnesses Not Permitted to be Deposed by Plaintiff filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Responses due by 11/25/2013. Replies due by 12/2/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Opposition)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/15/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Submitted Ex Parte by Defendants and Not Ordered Produced to Plaintiff filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Responses due by 11/25/2013. Replies due by 12/2/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Opposition)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center of Compliance with the Court's Order (Attachments: # (1) Redacted Order)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting in part and denying in part [534] Motion for Summary Judgment. FILED UNDER SEAL (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/31/13, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2014. (Related documents(s) [587], [589]) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit Location for Court Exhibit 1 from 10/31/2013 Hearing. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 616 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER, Motions terminated: 604 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Proferred Expert Testimony filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, 595 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Witnesses Not Permitted to be Deposed by Plaintiff filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 606 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Proffered Exhibits filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Robert Mueller, 605 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Proffered Fact Witnesses filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Robert Mueller, 594 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Submitted Ex Parte by Defendants and Not Ordered Produced to Plaintiff filed by Rahinah Ibrahim.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 15, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/31/2013) re [534] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella. (Court Reporter Joann Bryce.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Rahinah Ibrahim for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 586 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 30, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 613 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE CLASSIFIED EXHIBIT AND BRIEF ON PUBLIC ACCESS re 609 Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, 602 Trial Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Robert Mueller. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 14, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 585 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 29, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [582] Response ( Non Motion ) by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re [579] Order Letter in Response to the Court's Request re Sealed Information at the October 31 Hearing by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re [580] Order,, Letter in Response to Court's Order Re Expert Discovery Disputes by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re [579] Order by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 580 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE EXPERT DISCOVERY DISPUTES re [552] Letter Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, [576] Status Report Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 24, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 579 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST RE SEALED INFORMATION AT THE OCTOBER 31 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 24, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Brief re [534] MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Related document(s)[534]) (Theis, John) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT ON PENDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE Status Report due by 10/24/2013 at Noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 23, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Brief re [574] Order, Case Management Scheduling Order, Set Trial Management Order Deadlines,,, Redacted Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Federal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s)[574]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to [534] MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [534] MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 574 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE (CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER): Bench Trial set for 12/2/2013 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 21, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECT DATE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE [11/15/2013]. Set/Reset Hearing re [574] Order, Case Management Scheduling Order, Set Trial Management Order Deadlines, Set/Reset Hearings. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECT DATE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE [11/15/2013]. Set/Reset Hearing re [574] Order, Case Management Scheduling Order, Set Trial Management Order Deadlines, Set/Reset Hearings. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearing re [574] Order, Case Management Scheduling Order, Set Trial Management Order Deadlines. Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearing re [574] Order, Case Management Scheduling Order, Set Trial Management Order Deadlines. Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to the Court's Order [571] by Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Terrorist Screening Center re [571] Order (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 10/18/2013) Modified on 10/18/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re [571] Order Plaintiff's Submission Regarding Summary Judgment and Trial Deadlines by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 571 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER LIFTING STAY AND REQUESTING SUBMISSIONS RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 17, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Rahinah Ibrahim Notice of Unavailability of Counsel (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 569 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER STAYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Hon. William Alsup granting [553] Motion to Continue.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearing re [552] Letter Brief, [534] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [569] Order on Motion to Continue (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearing re [552] Letter Brief, [534] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [569] Order on Motion to Continue (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTION Plaintiff's Witness Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(3)(A)(i)-(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Guidelines for Trial and Final Pretrial Conference in Civil Bench Cases Before the Honorable William Alsup by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTION Plaintiff's Document Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(3)(A)(iii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Guidelines for Trial and Final Pretrial Conference in Civil Bench Cases Before the Honorable William Alsup by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re [563] Opposition/Response to Motion, by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List (REDACTED) by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center.. (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center . (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re [534] MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Plaintiff's Objection to and Motion to Strike Reply Evidence Submitted in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 586 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 30, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re [553] MOTION to Continue Deadlines in Light of Lapse in Appropriations ) Plaintiff's Response to Administrative Motion for a Stay of Summary Judgment and Pretrial Deadlines, and Trial, in Light of Lapse of Appropriations filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 585 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 29, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 561 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE SERVICE LIST. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 2, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re [552] Letter Brief, Plaintiff's Redacted Response to Defendants Sept. 27, 2013 Letter Brief (Dkt. #552) by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 559 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE ISSUES by Judge Alsup deferring ruling on [553] Motion to Continue; granting in part and denying in part [554] Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [543] Exhibits,,, Exhibit JJ to the Declaration of Christine Peek in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #543-10 filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s)[543]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [542] Declaration in Opposition,,,, Exhibit A to Declaraton of Christine Peek in Support of Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #542-1 filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s)[542]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 580 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE EXPERT DISCOVERY DISPUTES re 552 Letter Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, 576 Status Report Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 24, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re [554] MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 579 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST RE SEALED INFORMATION AT THE OCTOBER 31 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 24, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Christine Peek in Support of [554] MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s)[554]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/1/2013 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/8/2013 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue Deadlines in Light of Lapse in Appropriations filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Paul G. Freeborne, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearing re [552] Letter Brief, Discovery Hearing set for 10/10/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearing re [552] Letter Brief, Discovery Hearing set for 10/10/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief re: Expert Discovery filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Theis, John) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 574 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE (CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER): Bench Trial set for 12/2/2013 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 21, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 551 Filed: 9/28/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE SEALED DOCUMENT re [548] Order,. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Paul Freeborne in Support of [549] Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 14A, # (2) Exhibit 21A, # (3) Exhibit 37, # (4) Exhibit 38, # (5) Exhibit 39)(Related document(s)[549]) (Theis, John) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re [534] MOTION for Summary Judgment ) (Redacted) filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Theis, John) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 548 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNCLASSIFIED DOCUMENTS (DKT. NO. 515) (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) re [515] Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice re [546] Opposition/Response to Motion PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s)[546]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re [534] MOTION for Summary Judgment ) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [542] Declaration in Opposition,,,, filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit AAAA, # (2) Exhibit BBBB, # (3) Exhibit CCCC (lodged under seal), # (4) Exhibit DDDD (lodged under seal), # (5) Exhibit EEEE (lodged under seal), # (6) Exhibit FFFF (lodged under seal), # (7) Exhibit GGGG, # (8) Exhibit HHHH)(Related document(s)[542]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [542] Declaration in Opposition,,,, filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit AAA (lodged under seal), # (2) Exhibit BBB, # (3) Exhibit CCC, # (4) Exhibit DDD, # (5) Exhibit EEE, # (6) Exhibit FFF, # (7) Exhibit GGG, # (8) Exhibit HHH, # (9) Exhibit III, # (10) Exhibit JJJ, # (11) Exhibit KKK, # (12) Exhibit LLL, # (13) Exhibit MMM, # (14) Exhibit NNN, # (15) Exhibit OOO, # (16) Exhibit PPP, # (17) Exhibit QQQ, # (18) Exhibit RRR, # (19) Exhibit SSS, # (20) Exhibit TTT, # (21) Exhibit UUU, # (22) Exhibit VVV (lodged under seal), # (23) Exhibit WWW (lodged under seal), # (24) Exhibit XXX (lodged under seal), # (25) Exhibit YYY (lodged under seal), # (26) Exhibit ZZZ)(Related document(s)[542]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [542] Declaration in Opposition,,,, filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit AA, # (2) Exhibit BB, # (3) Exhibit CC, # (4) Exhibit DD (lodged under seal), # (5) Exhibit EE, # (6) Exhibit FF, # (7) Exhibit GG (lodged under seal), # (8) Exhibit HH (lodged under seal), # (9) Exhibit II (lodged under seal), # (10) Exhibit JJ, # (11) Exhibit KK (lodged under seal), # (12) Exhibit LL (lodged under seal), # (13) Exhibit MM (lodged under seal), # (14) Exhibit NN (part 1 of 2), # (15) Exhibit NN (part 2 of 2), # (16) Exhibit OO, # (17) Exhibit PP, # (18) Exhibit QQ, # (19) Exhibit RR, # (20) Exhibit SS, # (21) Exhibit TT, # (22) Exhibit UU (lodged under seal), # (23) Exhibit VV, # (24) Exhibit WW (lodged under seal), # (25) Exhibit XX, # (26) Exhibit YY, # (27) Exhibit ZZ)(Related document(s)[542]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Christine Peek in Opposition to [534] Federal Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B (part 1 of 2), # (3) Exhibit B (part 2 of 2), # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D (part 1 of 5), # (6) Exhibit D (part 2 of 5), # (7) Exhibit D (part 3 of 5), # (8) Exhibit D (part 4 of 5), # (9) Exhibit D (part 5 of 5), # (10) Exhibit E, # (11) Exhibit F (lodged under seal), # (12) Exhibit G (lodged under seal), # (13) Exhibit H (lodged under seal), # (14) Exhibit I (part 1 of 2), # (15) Exhibit I (part 2 of 2), # (16) Exhibit J, # (17) Exhibit K, # (18) Exhibit L (lodged under seal), # (19) Exhibit M (lodged under seal), # (20) Exhibit N (lodged under seal), # (21) Exhibit O (lodged under seal), # (22) Exhibit P (lodged under seal), # (23) Exhibit Q (lodged under seal), # (24) Exhibit R (lodged under seal), # (25) Exhibit S (lodged under seal), # (26) Exhibit T, # (27) Exhibit U (lodged under seal), # (28) Exhibit V (lodged under seal), # (29) Exhibit W (lodged under seal), # (30) Exhibit X (lodged under seal), # (31) Exhibit Y, # (32) Exhibit Z (lodged under seal))(Peek, Christine) (Filed on 9/19/2013) Modified on 9/20/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re [540] Order re Withheld Documents by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Theis, John) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 540 Filed: 9/14/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE WITHHELD DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 539 Filed: 9/14/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF CLASSIFIED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 561 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE SERVICE LIST. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 2, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 538 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ON THREE DISCOVERY MOTIONS (DKT. NOS. 517-18, 521) by Judge Alsup denying [517] Discovery Letter Brief; denying [518] Discovery Letter Brief; denying [521] Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to re [536] Order and Notice of Lodging Materials Under Seal and Ex Parte, In Camera by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Declaration)(Theis, John) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 559 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE ISSUES by Judge Alsup deferring ruling on 553 Motion to Continue; granting in part and denying in part 554 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 536 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL (DKT. NO. 515). Signed by Judge Alsup on September 6, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (Redacted) Declaration of Paul G. Freeborne in Support of [534] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Part 1 of 4), # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Part 2 of 4), # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Part 3 of 4), # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Part 4 of 4), # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 7, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 8, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 9, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit 10, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit 11, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit 12, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit 13, # (17) Exhibit Exhibit 14, # (18) Exhibit Exhibit 15, # (19) Exhibit Exhibit 16, # (20) Exhibit Exhibit 17, # (21) Exhibit Exhibit 18, # (22) Exhibit Exhibit 19, # (23) Exhibit Exhibit 20, # (24) Exhibit Exhibit 21, # (25) Exhibit Exhibit 22, # (26) Exhibit Exhibit 23, # (27) Exhibit Exhibit 24, # (28) Exhibit Exhibit 25, # (29) Exhibit Exhibit 26, # (30) Exhibit Exhibit 27, # (31) Exhibit Exhibit 28, # (32) Exhibit Exhibit 29, # (33) Exhibit Exhibit 30, # (34) Exhibit Exhibit 31, # (35) Exhibit Exhibit 32, # (36) Exhibit Exhibit 33, # (37) Exhibit Exhibit 34, # (38) Exhibit Exhibit 35, # (39) Exhibit Exhibit 36)(Related document(s)[534]) (Theis, John) (Filed on 9/5/2013) Modified on 9/6/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/4/2013 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (Redacted) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 9/19/2013. Replies due by 9/26/2013. (Theis, John) (Filed on 9/5/2013) Modified on 9/6/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re [517] Discovery Letter BriefRe Depositions (REDACTED), [518] Discovery Letter BriefRe Interrogatory Responses (REDACTED), [521] Discovery Letter Briefre Production of Documents and Responses to Special Interrogatories - REDACTED ) filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 532 Filed: 8/24/2013, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OMNIBUS ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup denying [494] Discovery Letter Brief; denying [499] Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part [506] Motion to Continue; granting in part and denying in part [515] Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING by Hon. William Alsup [granting [525] Motion to Continue].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re [525] MOTION to Continue ) Defendants' Administrative Motion to Move September 5, 2013 Hearing Date filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 551 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE SEALED DOCUMENT re 548 Order,. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of [528] Reply to Opposition/Response REDACTED REPLY DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH PIPKIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M)(Related document(s)[528]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re [506] MOTION to Continue Trial ) PLAINTIFF'S REDACTED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Rahinah Ibrahim re [517] Discovery Letter BriefRe Depositions (REDACTED) NOTICE OF LODGING OF ATTACHMENT TO PLAINTIFF'S AUGUST 6, 2013 DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (Dkt#517) UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 548 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNCLASSIFIED DOCUMENTS (DKT. NO. 515) (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) re 515 Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA re [507] Declaration in Support,,, NOTICE OF ERRATA TO THE DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH PIPKIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit CC)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/20/2013 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION To CONTINUE Motions Currently set for September 5, 2013 filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. Responses due by 8/26/2013. Replies due by 9/3/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lily Sara Farel, # (2) Proposed Order)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 8/12/2013) Modified on 8/12/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING and of Redactions in Defendants' July 31, 2013 Production by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 8/8/2013) Modified on 8/8/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of [499] Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Related document(s)[522]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/7/2013) Modified on 8/8/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re [499] MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ) filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/11/2013 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Discovery Letter Briefre Production of Documents and Responses to Special Interrogatories - REDACTED filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re [506] MOTION to Continue Trial ) REDACTED filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Theis, John) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [516] Order REDACTED by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Theis, John) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 540 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE WITHHELD DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/11/2013 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery Letter BriefRe Interrogatory Responses (REDACTED) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 539 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF CLASSIFIED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/11/2013 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Discovery Letter BriefRe Depositions (REDACTED) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 538 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON THREE DISCOVERY MOTIONS (DKT. NOS. 517-18, 521) by Judge Alsup denying 517 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 518 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 521 Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 516 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY LETTER re [515] Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/23/2013 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re [499] MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ) filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 513 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT FROM DOCKET by Hon. William Alsup granting [510] Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re [510] MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document from Docket; Docket #[508] by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of [510] MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document from Docket; Docket #[508] filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Related document(s)[510]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 532 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OMNIBUS ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup denying 494 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 499 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 506 Motion to Continue; granting in part and denying in part 515 Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/31/2013 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document from Docket; Docket #[508] filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in Support of [506] MOTION to Continue Trial (Corrected Entry [508] ) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Related document(s)[506]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/25/2013) Modified on 7/26/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/26/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT REMOVED PER COURT ORDER. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of[506] MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Related document(s)[506]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/24/2013) Modified on 7/25/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/25/2013 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redacted Declaration of Elizabeth Pipkin in Support of [506] MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit T, # (21) Exhibit U, # (22) Exhibit V, # (23) Exhibit W, # (24) Exhibit X, # (25) Exhibit Y, # (26) Exhibit Z, # (27) Exhibit AA, # (28) Exhibit BB)(Related document(s)[506]) (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/24/2013) Modified on 7/25/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/23/2013 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 505 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying [503] Motion for Hearing.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re [503] MOTION for Hearing Plaintiff's Request for Hearing ) filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/23/2013 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Hearing Plaintiff's Request for Hearing filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed in Error, See Entry [503]Letter from Elizabeth Pipkin Plaintiff's Request for Hearing. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/17/2013) Modified on 7/18/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA re [500] Declaration in Support, [499] MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Christine Peek in Support of [499] MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L)(Related document(s)[499]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/23/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to [499] MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to [499] MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Karen S Bloom (Bloom, Karen) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 497 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE DEPOSITION OATH re [493] Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 2, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [495] Order re Deposition Oath filed by Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Related document(s)[495]) (Theis, John) (Filed on 7/2/2013) Modified on 7/2/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 516 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY LETTER re 515 Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 495 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE DISPUTE OVER DEPOSITION OATH re [493] Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 1, 2013.. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/23/2013 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Discovery Letter Briefre Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions of FBI and Department of State filed by Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Theis, John) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Christine Peek (Admissibility of Plaintiff's Deposition Testimony). (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 513 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT FROM DOCKET by Hon. William Alsup granting 510 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Christine Peek re FBI Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Christine Peek re DOS Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Lodging and of Redactions in Defendants' May 20, 2013 Production by Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Theis, John) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/25/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Redacted REPLY in Support of Request for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Objection to Declaration of Jennifer L. Hudson by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/20/2013) Modified on 6/20/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief re [487] Order Regarding Motions for Reconsideration filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jennifer L. Hudson)(Related document(s)[487]) (Theis, John) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 487 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION re [486] Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, [485] Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 13, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Elizabeth Pipkin to Judge Alsup (reconsideration of order re deposition) . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Elizabeth Pipkin, Esq. to The Honorable William Alsup (reconsideration). (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 505 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying 503 Motion for Hearing.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 484 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE DEPOSITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part [482] Discovery Letter Brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Brief Seeking Protective Order/Quash of Subpoenas filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Kevin Kelley, # (2) Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Paul Woods)(Theis, John) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/4/2013 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Discovery Letter Brief filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Peek, Christine) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 481 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH re [480] Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, [477] Letter Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Department of Homeland Security, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 23, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Elizabeth Pipkin and Exhibits A and B to the Hon. William Alsup (REDACTED). (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Rahinah Ibrahim Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Response Pursuant to Court's Order re Motion to Quash, Dated May 20, 2013 (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 478 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE MOTION TO QUASH re [477] Letter Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Department of Homeland Security, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 20, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Brief filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 497 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE DEPOSITION OATH re 493 Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 2, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center of Lodging and of Redactions in Defendants' May 3, 2013 Production (Theis, John) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING MATERIALS IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS APRIL 19, 2013 ORDER REGARDING SEALED SUBMISSIONS by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center re [465] Order (Theis, John) (Filed on 5/8/2013) Modified on 5/8/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 495 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE DISPUTE OVER DEPOSITION OATH re 493 Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 1, 2013.. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE re Appellate Review by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center re [461] Order on Motion to Compel (Theis, John) (Filed on 5/2/2013) Modified on 5/2/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [470] Order, by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Theis, John) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Eric Holder Jr, Attorney General of the United States. filed byDepartment of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of James R. Clapper, Director of National Intelligence, Filed (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 470 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST REGARDING SSI CLEARANCES re [466] Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Department of Homeland Security, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 22, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Rahinah Ibrahim for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Pipkin, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/18/2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2013. (Related documents(s) [467]) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Theis, John) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to re [461] Order on Motion to Compel by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Theis, John) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 465 Filed: 4/20/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING SEALED SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 462 Filed: 4/20/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part [458] Motion ; granting in part and denying in part [460] Motion]. Formerly filed under seal and ex parte now unsealed. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 484 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE DEPOSITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 482 Discovery Letter Brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 461 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part [425] Motion to Compel (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013) Modified on 4/19/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2013 before William Alsup re [425] MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. The Court will make its Order of April 2, 2013, available to Plaintiff's counsel; the document will remain restricted from the public. Defense to make the declarations of Eric Holder and James Clapper available to Plaintiff's counsel. Plaintiff granted leave to take three depositions. Remaining issues taken under submission. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/19/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended MOTION For Release of April 2, 2013 Order to Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to Protective Order re [452] Received Document ; Declaration of Christine Peek filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Responses due by 4/22/2013. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 481 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH re 480 Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 477 Letter Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Department of Homeland Security, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 23, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re [458] MOTION For Release of April 2, 2013 Order to Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to Protective Order re [452] Received Document and Declaration of Christine Peek by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/19/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION For Release of April 2, 2013 Order to Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to Protective Order re [452] Received Document and Declaration of Christine Peek filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Responses due by 4/22/2013. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center Regarding Correction to FBI-TSC's First Amended Privilege Log and Notice of Lodging (Theis, John) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 478 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE MOTION TO QUASH re 477 Letter Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Department of Homeland Security, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 20, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Lodging Ex Parte and Under Seal Response to Court's 4/2/2013 Order; by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center re [452] Received Document (Theis, John) (Filed on 4/8/2013) Modified on 4/9/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 455 Filed: 4/6/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING NON-SENSITIVE SECURITY INFORMATION re [453] Proposed Order filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 4, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal, by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center re [440] Order, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,, (Theis, John) (Filed on 4/4/2013) Modified on 4/4/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING NON-SENSITIVE SECURITY INFORMATION by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order FILED UNDER SEAL. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Lodging Materials in Response to the Court's 3/28/2013 Order, by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center re [450] Order, (Theis, John) (Filed on 4/2/2013) Modified on 4/2/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 450 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING IN CAMERA SUBMISSIONS OF WITHHELD DOCUMENTS re [425] MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 28, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 449 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting [447] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 470 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST REGARDING SSI CLEARANCES re 466 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Department of Homeland Security, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 22, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re [447] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL: (1) PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL ALLEGEDLY CLASSIFIED DOCUMENTS AND (2) SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE PE by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/28/2013 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL: (1) PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL ALLEGEDLY CLASSIFIED DOCUMENTS AND (2) SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE PEEK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS AND ALL EXHIBITS; DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE PEEK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEAL filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 446 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting [443] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re [443] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS; DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE PE by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Christine Peek REPLY DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE PEEK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Peek, Christine) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 465 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING SEALED SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/25/2013 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Written Discovery and to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions; Declaration of Christine Peek in Support of Motion to Seal filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 3/22/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Lodging by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center re [441] Order, (Theis, John) (Filed on 3/21/2013) Modified on 3/21/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 441 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER CHANGING SCHEDULE re [437] Order on Discovery Letter Brief,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 20, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 462 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 458 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part 460 Motion]. Formerly filed under seal and ex parte now unsealed. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 440 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** FILED IN ERROR. SEE Dkt No. #[441] *** ORDER CHANGING SCHEDULE re [437] Order on Discovery Letter Brief,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines as to [437] Order on Discovery Letter Brief,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, [425] MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 20, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013) Modified on 3/20/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Lodging Materials in Response to the Court's [436] Order by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Theis, John) (Filed on 3/18/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Lodging Materials in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center (Theis, John) (Filed on 3/15/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 437 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING NON-SSI PRIVILEGE LOG, MOTION TO SEAL, REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, AND CLASSIFIED SUBMISSIONS by Judge Alsup terminating [405] Discovery Letter Brief; terminating [406] Discovery Letter Brief; granting [423] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying [433] Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING GOVERNMENT SUBMISSIONS re [431] Notice (Other), filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Paul G. Freeborne in Support of [424] Proposed Order, [423] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL; DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE PEEK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEAL filed byLeonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. (Related document(s)[424], [423]) (Theis, John) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re [433] MOTION Administrative Motion for a Stay of Briefing Related to Classified Information, or in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to File their Opposition to Motion to Compel re [425] MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVER ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR A STAY OF BRIEFING RELATED TO CLASSIFIED INFORMATION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 455 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING NON-SENSITIVE SECURITY INFORMATION re 453 Proposed Order filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 4, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/13/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative MOTION for a Stay of Briefing Related to Classified Information, or in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to File their Opposition to [425] Motion to Compel , filed by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center. Responses due by 3/19/2013. Replies due by 3/26/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Theis, John) (Filed on 3/5/2013) Modified on 3/5/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/5/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to re [422] Objection to Plaintiff's Proposed Non SSI Protective Order, by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 3/5/2013) Modified on 3/5/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re Lodging of Ex Parte, In Camera Materials, by Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Michael Chertoff, Hilary Clinton, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael E. Leiter, Robert Mueller, Janet Napolitano, National Counterterrorism Center, Tom Ridge, Terrorist Screening Center re [414] Order, (Theis, John) (Filed on 3/5/2013) Modified on 3/5/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [425] MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30 (b)(6) DEPOSITIONS by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Christine Peek in Support of [425] MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS filed byRahinah Ibrahim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit T, # (21) Exhibit U, # (22) Exhibit V, # (23) Exhibit W, # (24) Exhibit X, # (25) Exhibit Y, # (26) Exhibit Z, # (27) Exhibit AA, # (28) Exhibit BB, # (29) Exhibit CC, # (30) Exhibit DD, # (31) Exhibit EE, # (32) Exhibit FF, # (33) Exhibit GG, # (34) Supplement HH)(Related document(s)[425]) (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 450 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING IN CAMERA SUBMISSIONS OF WITHHELD DOCUMENTS re 425 MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 28, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement re [425] MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS [PART THREE OF THREE] by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 449 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 447 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement re [425] MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS [PART TWO OF THREE] by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement re [425] MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS [PART ONE OF THREE] by Rahinah Ibrahim. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/19/2013 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 3/14/2013. Replies due by 3/21/2013. (Peek, Christine) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 433 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?